Depot: Aberdare
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 5245 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 2484 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/07/1939 | 2484 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | 3605 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 18/05/1946 | 6410 | Transfer in from: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 1769 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2117 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2801 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2806 | Snapshot | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2808 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2810 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2811 | Snapshot | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 282 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2822 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2823 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2828 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2831 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2836 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 284 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2841 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2870 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2880 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 311 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 314 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3605 | Snapshot | ABDR | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3605 | Snapshot | ABDR | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3610 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 362 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3655 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 374 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3747 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3753 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4228 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4257 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4264 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4285 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4297 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5237 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5245 | Snapshot | ABDR | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5245 | Snapshot | ABDR | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5258 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5263 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5520 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5770 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5787 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5796 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 6410 | Snapshot | ABDR | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 6410 | Snapshot | ABDR | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 6413 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 6437 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A1 | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 65 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6605 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6628 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6652 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6692 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6693 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 7205 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 7213 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 7221 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 7242 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7423 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7748 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7773 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9607 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9609 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9712 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 04/1948 | 1769 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 30/04/1948 | 7720 | Transfer in from: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 30/04/1948 | 5520 | Transfer out to: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | m/e | 30/04/1948 | 7205 | Transfer out to: | RYR | Radyr | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 31/05/1948 | 6622 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 2801 | Transfer out to: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 4285 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 5649 | Transfer in from: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 2811 | Transfer out to: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 6651 | Transfer in from: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 2810 | Transfer out to: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 2822 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | 2841 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | 6622 | Transfer out to: | SED | Swansea East Dock | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 6622 | Transfer in from: | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 12/1949 | 314 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | 2117 | Transfer out to: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 2159 | Transfer in from: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 8786 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 2159 | Transfer in from: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 2159 | Transfer out to: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 2823 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 8786 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 2806 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 7242 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 5638 | Transfer in from: | PILL | Newport Pill | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 7748 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Newport Pill | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 5638 | Transfer in from: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 5638 | Transfer out to: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 2159 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Newport Pill | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 6654 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 2880 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 6654 | Transfer in from: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 6654 | Transfer out to: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 357 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 282 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 4290 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 6693 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 4296 | Transfer in from: | SED | Swansea East Dock | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 4272 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 6685 | Transfer in from: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 7216 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 6692 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 4266 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 4272 | Transfer in from: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6685 | Transfer in from: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 7216 | Transfer in from: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 4272 | Transfer out to: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 4296 | Transfer out to: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 5638 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6685 | Transfer out to: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 7216 | Transfer out to: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 371 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 385 | Transfer in from: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 6692 | Transfer in from: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 6654 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 6685 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 371 | Transfer in from: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 385 | Transfer in from: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 6692 | Transfer in from: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 371 | Transfer out to: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 385 | Transfer out to: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 6692 | Transfer out to: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 2862 | Transfer in from: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 2863 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Newport Pill | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 2862 | Transfer in from: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 2863 | Transfer in from: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 2862 | Transfer out to: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 2863 | Transfer out to: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 3647 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 5741 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 11/1952 | 284 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 90323 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 90573 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 2862 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 208 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 371 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 4297 | Transfer out to: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 3695 | Transfer in from: | TDU | Tondu | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 4297 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 3699 | Transfer in from: | TDU | Tondu | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 5797 | Transfer in from: | TDU | Tondu | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 357 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 362 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | A1 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 65 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 282 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 374 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 385 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 90323 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 90573 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 6687 | Transfer in from: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 9731 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 4266 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 4290 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 2876 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 3680 | Transfer in from: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 5796 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 2810 | Transfer in from: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5644 | Transfer in from: | CV.AYN | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5698 | Transfer in from: | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6649 | Transfer in from: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6661 | Transfer in from: | CV.AYN | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5770 | Transfer out to: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6417 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 8724 | Transfer in from: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 3747 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 204 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 6692 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 8444 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 208 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 2808 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 06/1954 | 282 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 8445 | Transfer in from: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 3680 | Transfer out to: | 86D | Llantrisant | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 5787 | Transfer out to: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 8724 | Transfer out to: | 87C | Danygraig | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 4263 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Newport Pill | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/06/1955 | 5624 | Transfer in from: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 4264 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 4263 | Transfer out to: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 3647 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 3716 | Transfer in from: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 4255 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 5264 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 6361 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 6431 | Transfer in from: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 5741 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Newport Pill | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 9609 | Transfer out to: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 3605 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 5633 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 4297 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 5264 | Transfer out to: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 4262 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 6417 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 6431 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 7214 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 5644 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 6431 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1958 | 5797 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 6649 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 3603 | Transfer in from: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 5245 | Transfer out to: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 2813 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 2833 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 2836 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 01/1959 | 2828 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 3850 | Transfer in from: | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 03/1959 | 2833 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 3866 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 5249 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 06/1959 | 2863 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 06/1959 | 2870 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 18/07/1959 | 6413 | Transfer out to: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 5642 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 09/1959 | 2810 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 6750 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Newport Pill | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 7237 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 2873 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 4255 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 4272 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 6410 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 7203 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 7224 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1959 | 7773 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 8444 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 01/1960 | 2831 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 01/1960 | 6750 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 3627 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 2886 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 6437 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 5240 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 6664 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 30/11/1960 | 2813 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 7213 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 2874 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 4257 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 6362 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 6386 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 7322 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 7214 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 7224 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 4257 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 4225 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 4289 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 7208 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 6362 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 6386 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 7322 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 7237 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 4236 | Transfer in from: | TDU | Tondu | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 2857 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 6431 | Transfer out to: | 88H | Tondu | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 7216 | Transfer out to: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 6673 | Transfer in from: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 4228 | Transfer out to: | 88H | Tondu | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 7203 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 05/1962 | 6687 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 05/1962 | 7720 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 4688 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 6690 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 4272 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 3610 | Transfer out to: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 8445 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 6652 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 09/1962 | 4236 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 09/1962 | 5642 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 09/1962 | 5698 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1962 | 9712 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 3853 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 3860 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 4262 | Transfer out to: | 88H | Tondu | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | on | 05/10/1962 | 4289 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 3816 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 3822 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 3839 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 3843 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 3845 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 3847 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 5647 | Transfer in from: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 5680 | Transfer in from: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 4225 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 4257 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 4272 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 7208 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 7221 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 4252 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 4257 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 9600 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 3695 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 3845 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 3716 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 4279 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 7209 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 7214 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 7234 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 7247 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 2857 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 2873 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 2874 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 2886 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 3822 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 18/12/1962 | 3655 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | on | 19/12/1962 | 5258 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | 9747 | Transfer in from: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 02/1963 | 3627 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 8723 | Transfer in from: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 9711 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 4252 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6651 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 9747 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 03/1963 | 5649 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 03/1963 | 6673 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | m/e | 03/1963 | 7247 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 3716 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 9671 | Transfer in from: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 8723 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 5620 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 6627 | Transfer in from: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 7204 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 05/1963 | 9731 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 8723 | Transfer in from: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 3847 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 07/1963 | 5620 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 6649 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 7204 | Transfer out to: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 2876 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 4278 | Transfer in from: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 7251 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 3816 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 3843 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 3853 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 5633 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 6628 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 10/1963 | 4257 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 10/1963 | 5249 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | m/e | 10/1963 | 7234 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 11/1963 | 6627 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 3616 | Transfer in from: | TDU | Tondu | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 4122 | Transfer in from: | 88G | Llantrisant | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 4124 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 4237 | Transfer in from: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 5252 | Transfer in from: | 86F | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 6158 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 7212 | Transfer in from: | 86F | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 5624 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 6605 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 6649 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 4136 | Transfer in from: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 7435 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1963 | 3716 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 12/1963 | 3839 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1963 | 4688 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 12/1963 | 5263 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 12/1963 | 5680 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 12/1963 | 6664 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | m/e | 12/1963 | 7214 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 01/12/1963 | 3850 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 2895 | Transfer in from: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 3634 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 5211 | Transfer in from: | 87D | Swansea East Dock | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 6144 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 7222 | Transfer in from: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 4124 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 01/1964 | 4279 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | m/e | 01/1964 | 7251 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 5200 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 5256 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 2895 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 02/1964 | 5240 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | m/e | 02/1964 | 7212 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 22/02/1964 | 5210 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 22/02/1964 | 7253 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 03/1964 | 5647 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 03/1964 | 9607 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 04/1964 | 4237 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 9678 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 05/1964 | 5211 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 05/1964 | 6361 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 4121 | Transfer in from: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 3603 | Transfer out to: | 87D | Swansea East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 3616 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 3860 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 3866 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 6622 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 6661 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 6690 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 9678 | Transfer out to: | 87D | Swansea East Dock | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 06/1964 | 4122 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 06/1964 | 4136 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 06/1964 | 6144 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 06/1964 | 6158 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 5230 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 7209 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 9671 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 9711 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 07/1964 | 3634 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 07/1964 | 4278 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 07/1964 | 5230 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 07/1964 | 7423 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 07/1964 | 7435 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 07/1964 | 8723 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 3610 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 3796 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 5226 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 5242 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 09/1964 | 5210 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 09/1964 | 5237 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 4258 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 5223 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 4268 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 7226 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 9600 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 12/1964 | 5242 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 01/1965 | 3753 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | m/e | 01/1965 | 7222 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 2w/e | 10/01/1965 | 7205 | Transfer in from: | RYR | Radyr | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 2w/e | 23/01/1965 | 3610 | Transfer in from: | 88J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 2w/e | 23/01/1965 | 9615 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 2w/e | 23/01/1965 | 3610 | Transfer out to: | 88J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 02/1965 | 3610 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 02/1965 | 3699 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | 4268 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | 3796 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 03/1965 | 5200 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 03/1965 | 5223 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 03/1965 | 5226 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 03/1965 | 5256 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 4258 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 5252 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 7205 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 7253 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 9615 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 06/1965 | 4121 | Condemned |