Depot: Old Oak Common
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 31/07/1907 | 2912 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 31/07/1907 | 2913 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 31/07/1907 | 2914 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 05/08/1907 | 2915 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 13/08/1907 | 2917 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1907 | 2924 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 26/09/1907 | 2926 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Great Bear | 4-6-2 | m/e | 02/1908 | 111 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 16/08/1915 | 4037 | Transfer in from: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 23/06/1917 | 4032 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 01/07/1919 | 4037 | Transfer out to: | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 25/07/1919 | 4037 | Transfer in from: | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1919 | 4037 | Transfer out to: | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 06/10/1920 | 4037 | Transfer in from: | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 11/08/1923 | 4073 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/02/1924 | 4075 | Transfer in from: | n/a | Unallocated | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/02/1924 | 4076 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 10/02/1924 | 4077 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 24/02/1924 | 4078 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/03/1924 | 4079 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 23/03/1924 | 4080 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 04/1924 | 4074 | Transfer in from: | n/a | Unallocated | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 06/04/1924 | 4081 | Transfer in from: | n/a | Unallocated | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 12/04/1924 | 4082 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1924 | 4073 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1924 | 4073 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 06/11/1924 | 4073 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 06/11/1924 | 4073 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 14/01/1925 | 4032 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/05/1925 | 4083 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/05/1925 | 4079 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/05/1925 | 4079 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 08/07/1925 | 4089 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 01/08/1925 | 4091 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 06/08/1925 | 4092 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/08/1925 | 4090 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 27/02/1926 | 4016 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 01/04/1926 | 4016 | Transfer out to: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 10/04/1926 | 4009 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/04/1926 | 4079 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/04/1926 | 4075 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 25/05/1926 | 4016 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 26/05/1926 | 4093 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 26/05/1926 | 4092 | Transfer out to: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 05/06/1926 | 4094 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 25/06/1926 | 4079 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 25/06/1926 | 4009 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 30/06/1926 | 4097 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 02/07/1926 | 4037 | Transfer out to: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 29/07/1926 | 4098 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 03/08/1926 | 4099 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/08/1926 | 4016 | Transfer out to: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 21/08/1926 | 5001 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 27/08/1926 | 4037 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 28/08/1926 | 5000 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 28/08/1926 | 5002 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/09/1926 | 4080 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 05/09/1926 | 4092 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 12/11/1926 | 4037 | Transfer out to: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 28/05/1927 | 5003 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 11/06/1927 | 5005 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 11/06/1927 | 5006 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 26/07/1927 | 5010 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 25/05/1928 | 4082 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1928 | 4089 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 05/03/1929 | 4081 | Transfer out to: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/03/1929 | 4081 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 18/06/1929 | 5002 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/08/1929 | 4097 | Transfer out to: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/09/1929 | 4089 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 19/09/1929 | 5009 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 08/10/1929 | 4077 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/12/1929 | 4098 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 22/12/1929 | 4094 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 27/01/1930 | 4037 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 01/04/1930 | 4085 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 30/06/1930 | 4091 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/07/1930 | 5005 | Transfer out to: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 26/07/1930 | 5010 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/12/1930 | 5008 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 23/12/1930 | 4097 | Transfer in from: | CARM | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 23/12/1930 | 5008 | Transfer out to: | CARM | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 06/01/1931 | 4097 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/01/1931 | 4081 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/03/1931 | 4099 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 23/04/1931 | 4078 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 28/04/1931 | 4092 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/06/1931 | 4090 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 01/08/1931 | 4000 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 23/08/1931 | 4082 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 26/08/1931 | 5001 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 11/09/1931 | 4079 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/09/1931 | 5001 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 10/10/1931 | 5012 | Transfer in from: | CARM | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1931 | 4074 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 12/02/1932 | 4085 | Transfer out to: | CARM | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 19/03/1932 | 4032 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 21/05/1932 | 5005 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 05/06/1932 | 4083 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1932 | 5012 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/07/1932 | 5012 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 08/07/1932 | 5009 | Transfer out to: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/07/1932 | 5016 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 28/07/1932 | 5018 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 30/08/1932 | 5022 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/09/1932 | 4075 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/10/1932 | 5007 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/10/1932 | 4093 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 24/10/1932 | 4093 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 30/11/1932 | 4076 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/12/1932 | 4082 | Transfer out to: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/12/1932 | 4078 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/12/1932 | 4089 | Transfer out to: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1933 | 5012 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/01/1933 | 4076 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/01/1933 | 4076 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1933 | 5000 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 22/02/1933 | 4082 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1933 | 4037 | Transfer out to: | CARM | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 01/04/1933 | 4032 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1933 | 4098 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1933 | 5008 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1933 | 5006 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1933 | 4083 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1933 | 4087 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1933 | 5017 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1933 | 4093 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1933 | 5016 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/03/1934 | 4073 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/04/1934 | 4009 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 01/05/1934 | 5025 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/05/1934 | 5023 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 12/05/1934 | 5027 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 18/05/1934 | 4037 | Transfer in from: | CARM | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 28/05/1934 | 5029 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 29/05/1934 | 4098 | Transfer out to: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/06/1934 | 5003 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/06/1934 | 4099 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 22/06/1934 | 4000 | Transfer out to: | SALOP | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1934 | 2917 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/10/1934 | 4086 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1934 | 4086 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 28/12/1934 | 4083 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 29/12/1934 | 5017 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 08/03/1935 | 5007 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 06/04/1935 | 4073 | Transfer in from: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 14/04/1935 | 5001 | Transfer out to: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 08/06/1935 | 5037 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 21/06/1935 | 5038 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 25/06/1935 | 5039 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 01/07/1935 | 5040 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 03/07/1935 | 4084 | Transfer in from: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 10/07/1935 | 4078 | Transfer out to: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 11/07/1935 | 5042 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 25/08/1935 | 4082 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/09/1935 | 5042 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 6137 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 6144 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 7731 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 30/11/1935 | 4090 | Transfer in from: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | 2361 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 2376 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 2818 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 4021 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 4938 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 14/12/1935 | 5010 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 7731 | Transfer out to: | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/12/1935 | 5006 | Transfer in from: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 19/12/1935 | 5014 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 21/12/1935 | 5004 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 31/12/1935 | 5010 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 4961 | Transfer in from: | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 23/01/1936 | 5018 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/02/1936 | 5037 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 5931 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 5939 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 6146 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 6151 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 2926 | Transfer out to: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 4021 | Transfer out to: | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 21/02/1936 | 4087 | Transfer out to: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1936 | 5037 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 6164 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 2913 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 2915 | Transfer out to: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/03/1936 | 5025 | Transfer out to: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/03/1936 | 5043 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 21/03/1936 | 5042 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 29/03/1936 | 5044 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 03/04/1936 | 5045 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 05/04/1936 | 4089 | Transfer in from: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 05/04/1936 | 5009 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/04/1936 | 5018 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 19/04/1936 | 5000 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 22/04/1936 | 5023 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/04/1936 | 4089 | Transfer out to: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1936 | 5009 | Transfer out to: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 24/05/1936 | 5042 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/06/1936 | 5054 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 14/06/1936 | 5055 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 28/06/1936 | 5056 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/10/1936 | 5042 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/10/1936 | 4099 | Transfer out to: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 10/11/1936 | 5042 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 28/02/1937 | 5036 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 03/03/1937 | 4088 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 22/03/1937 | 4090 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 28/03/1937 | 4074 | Transfer in from: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/05/1937 | 4085 | Transfer in from: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/07/1937 | 5066 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 21/07/1937 | 5067 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 29/08/1937 | 4074 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 18/11/1937 | 5023 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/12/1937 | 5001 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/03/1938 | 4082 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 21/03/1938 | 4084 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 01/04/1938 | 5054 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 24/04/1938 | 5006 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 21/06/1938 | 5069 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 03/07/1938 | 5070 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/07/1938 | 5014 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 31/07/1938 | 5074 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 23/08/1938 | 5077 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2361 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 12/1938 | 2376 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 06/12/1938 | 5008 | Transfer out to: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1939 | 5008 | Transfer in from: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1939 | 4085 | Transfer out to: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1939 | 5070 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1939 | 5074 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1939 | 4073 | Transfer out to: | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1939 | 4088 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 05/02/1939 | 5019 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/02/1939 | 5077 | Transfer out to: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1939 | 4073 | Transfer in from: | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1939 | 5055 | Transfer out to: | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 19/05/1939 | 5079 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 25/05/1939 | 5080 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 25/06/1939 | 5093 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1939 | 5055 | Transfer in from: | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/07/1939 | 5085 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/08/1939 | 5001 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 19/09/1939 | 4091 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/04/1940 | 5035 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/06/1940 | 5019 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 28/06/1940 | 5015 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1940 | 5080 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1940 | 5093 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/11/1940 | 5079 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 03/12/1940 | 5087 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1941 | 4082 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 26/04/1941 | 4074 | Transfer in from: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 05/08/1941 | 4091 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 01/11/1941 | 4091 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 01/11/1941 | 4074 | Transfer out to: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1941 | 5043 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/04/1942 | 5043 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 23/05/1942 | 5015 | Transfer out to: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1942 | 5055 | Transfer out to: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 24/07/1942 | 4076 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1942 | 5055 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1942 | 5014 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/03/1943 | 5067 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 21/04/1943 | 4073 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1943 | 4073 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/09/1943 | 5046 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 24/10/1943 | 5046 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 22/12/1944 | 5065 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/01/1945 | 5081 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1945 | 5018 | Transfer out to: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 21/12/1945 | 5005 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1946 | 2914 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | 4698 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | 4699 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | 6103 | Transfer in from: | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 21/03/1946 | 4091 | Transfer out to: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | 8757 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | 6103 | Transfer out to: | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | 7791 | Transfer in from: | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | 8738 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | 2924 | Transfer out to: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 25/05/1946 | 5099 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/09/1946 | 6102 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1946 | 6962 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 03/10/1946 | 4091 | Transfer in from: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 24/02/1947 | 5099 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1947 | 5099 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 23/05/1947 | 5043 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 1000 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 1003 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 1008 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 100A1 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 100A1 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 1010 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 1012 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 1015 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 1021 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 1026 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 111 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Great Bear | 4-6-2 | on | 15/06/1947 | 111 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 1912 | Snapshot | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2276 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2282 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2818 | Snapshot | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2826 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2827 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2840 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2843 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2850 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2855 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2856 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2868 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2875 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2881 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2912 | Snapshot | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3600 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3618 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3619 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3635 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3644 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3646 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3648 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3658 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3659 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3669 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3672 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3685 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3688 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3710 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3723 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3734 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3738 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3754 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3766 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3832 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3851 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3852 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3853 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3903 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3952 | Snapshot | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3954 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4037 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4037 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4073 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4073 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4075 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4075 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4076 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4076 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4091 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4091 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4606 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4609 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4615 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4642 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4644 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4665 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4666 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4667 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4680 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4691 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4698 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4698 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4699 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4699 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4700 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4701 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4702 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4705 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4707 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4800 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4853 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4854 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4900 | Snapshot | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4935 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4938 | Snapshot | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4943 | Snapshot | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4951 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4958 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4961 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4961 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4962 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4978 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4985 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4998 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5000 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5000 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5004 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5004 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5008 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5008 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5014 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5014 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5022 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5022 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5023 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5023 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5027 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5027 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5029 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5029 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5035 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5035 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5036 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5036 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5037 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5037 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5038 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5038 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5039 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5039 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5040 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5040 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5043 | Snapshot | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5044 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5044 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5045 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5045 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5055 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5055 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5056 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5056 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5065 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5065 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5066 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5066 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5069 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5069 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5081 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5081 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5085 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5085 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5087 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5087 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5099 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5099 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5717 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5764 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5922 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5931 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5931 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5932 | Snapshot | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5936 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5937 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5938 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5939 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5939 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5940 | Snapshot | DID | Didcot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5941 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5950 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5952 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5962 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5987 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5996 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6001 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6003 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6007 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6009 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6013 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6014 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6015 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6021 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6025 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6102 | Snapshot | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6111 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6112 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6117 | Snapshot | rdg | Basingstoke (GWR) | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6120 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6121 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6129 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6132 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6134 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6135 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6137 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6137 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6141 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6142 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6144 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6144 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6146 | Snapshot | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6149 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6151 | Snapshot | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6155 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6158 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6159 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6164 | Snapshot | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6166 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6168 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6865 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6869 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6900 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6910 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6959 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6960 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6961 | Snapshot | HFD | Hereford | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6962 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6962 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 77005 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 77015 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7713 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 77130 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 77184 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7734 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7738 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7754 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7760 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7791 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7791 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 78632 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 79234 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 8477 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8707 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8735 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8738 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8738 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8750 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8751 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8753 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8754 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8756 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8757 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8757 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8759 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8760 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8761 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8762 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8763 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8765 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8767 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8768 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8769 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8770 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8771 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8772 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8773 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8780 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 9302 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 9306 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 9308 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 9310 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9401 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9402 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9403 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9404 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9405 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9406 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9407 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9409 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9658 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9659 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9661 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9700 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9701 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9702 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9703 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9704 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9705 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9706 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9707 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9708 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9709 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9710 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9725 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9726 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9751 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9754 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9758 | Snapshot | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9784 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/06/1947 | 5043 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/06/1947 | 5043 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 30/09/1947 | 5069 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/10/1947 | 5022 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1947 | 5069 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Diesel | D3/10 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8477 | Snapshot | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | 2843 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 3901 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3901 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | 6117 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | 6121 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | 2843 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | 6117 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | 6121 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | 2843 | Transfer out to: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/03/1948 | 5022 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/03/1948 | 3152 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 31/03/1948 | 4665 | Transfer out to: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1948 | 4962 | Transfer out to: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/04/1948 | 7001 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 30/04/1948 | 2076 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1948 | 5099 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | 5397 | Transfer in from: | DID | Didcot | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | 6990 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | 7001 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 31/05/1948 | 3644 | Transfer out to: | LTS | Llantrisant | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | 7001 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 3803 | Transfer in from: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 77000 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 3766 | Transfer out to: | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 3852 | Transfer out to: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1948 | 5089 | Transfer in from: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 6988 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 78632 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1948 | 4076 | Transfer out to: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 5089 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 6017 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 3669 | Transfer out to: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 5089 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 6025 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 6988 | Transfer out to: | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1948 | 7007 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1948 | 5022 | Transfer out to: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 3803 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 7007 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 3803 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 7007 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 8738 | Transfer out to: | LLY | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1948 | 5000 | Transfer out to: | CARM | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 14/10/1948 | 3618 | Transfer out to: | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 14/10/1948 | 3659 | Transfer out to: | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 14/10/1948 | 5397 | Transfer out to: | DID | Didcot | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 14/10/1948 | 6111 | Transfer out to: | DID | Didcot | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 14/10/1948 | 6112 | Transfer out to: | DID | Didcot | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 14/10/1948 | 6168 | Transfer out to: | DID | Didcot | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 6970 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 2881 | Transfer out to: | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 7713 | Transfer out to: | DID | Didcot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1948 | 7017 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 4923 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 5918 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 5920 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 5947 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 6932 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 6985 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 2850 | Transfer out to: | LLY | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 2855 | Transfer out to: | LLY | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 2856 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 2875 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 3832 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 3851 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1948 | 7017 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 6028 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1949 | 7004 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/01/1949 | 5081 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 7004 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 2840 | Transfer out to: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 3803 | Transfer out to: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 4978 | Transfer out to: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 7004 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 9310 | Transfer out to: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1949 | 5000 | Transfer in from: | CARM | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1949 | 5081 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 10/02/1949 | 5087 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 24/02/1949 | 5087 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | 5000 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | 5000 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | 6961 | Transfer out to: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 1912 | Transfer out to: | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 2076 | Transfer out to: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 31/03/1949 | 5089 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/04/1949 | 5087 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | 3734 | Transfer out to: | RYR | Radyr | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | 4667 | Transfer out to: | RYR | Radyr | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | 7738 | Transfer out to: | RYR | Radyr | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | 8780 | Transfer out to: | RYR | Radyr | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/05/1949 | 5087 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 3658 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 4642 | Transfer out to: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 7754 | Transfer out to: | WLN | Wellington | ||
Steam | 15xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 24/06/1949 | 1500 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 7024 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 9304 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 9305 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 4680 | Transfer out to: | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 4998 | Transfer out to: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 6865 | Transfer out to: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 6869 | Transfer out to: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | 6168 | Transfer in from: | DID | Didcot | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | 9309 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | 9315 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | 3837 | Transfer out to: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | 4935 | Transfer out to: | DID | Didcot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | 4951 | Transfer out to: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | 4985 | Transfer out to: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | 3738 | Transfer out to: | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | 6132 | Transfer out to: | DID | Didcot | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | 3619 | Transfer out to: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | 3635 | Transfer out to: | SBZ | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | 3723 | Transfer out to: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | 5717 | Transfer out to: | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 21/10/1949 | 5008 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 26/10/1949 | 5065 | To Store | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 6944 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 3646 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 4609 | Transfer out to: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 4943 | Transfer out to: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 5922 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 7760 | Transfer out to: | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | 3839 | Transfer out to: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 3600 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 6134 | Transfer out to: | DID | Didcot | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 8735 | Transfer out to: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 23/01/1950 | 79234 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | |||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 23/01/1950 | 79234 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | |||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | 4606 | Transfer out to: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | 4691 | Transfer out to: | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1950 | 7007 | Transfer out to: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 28/02/1950 | 5023 | To Store | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1950 | 5036 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 01/03/1950 | 100A1 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 4907 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 8764 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 4907 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 6957 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 9407 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 4907 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/05/1950 | 79234 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/05/1950 | 79234 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 24/05/1950 | 111 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 05/06/1950 | 7030 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 11/06/1950 | 4091 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 7030 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 9418 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 7030 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 77184 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 30/06/1950 | 9419 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1950 | 4016 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1950 | 5000 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/07/1950 | 5037 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 10/07/1950 | 7032 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 4016 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 6018 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 6019 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 7032 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 7033 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 7911 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 4016 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/07/1950 | 4073 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 5920 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 7032 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1950 | 5065 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 2895 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 3813 | Transfer in from: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 3852 | Transfer in from: | SALOP | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 6002 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 6926 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 9422 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 3672 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 77015 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 9726 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 2895 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 3813 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 3852 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 6002 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 6926 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 9422 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 2895 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 3813 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 3852 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 6002 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 6926 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 9422 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1950 | 7036 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 7036 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 3710 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 4666 | Transfer out to: | 87C | Danygraig | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 6910 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 7036 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 28/09/1950 | 5045 | To Store | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 5717 | Transfer in from: | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 5952 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 23/10/1950 | 5056 | To Store | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 5717 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 5717 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/11/1950 | 5056 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/11/1950 | 5027 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 9305 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 06/11/1950 | 4075 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/11/1950 | 5026 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 11/11/1950 | 5034 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 90585 | Transfer out to: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1950 | 5034 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 5994 | Transfer in from: | SALOP | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/12/1950 | 5026 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 5918 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 6985 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 6990 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 5994 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | D3/10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 15100 | Transfer out to: | 87C | Danygraig | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 5994 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 77000 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 77005 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/01/1951 | 5060 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 4089 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 4097 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 5057 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 5060 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 5095 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 7027 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 1000 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 1003 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 1010 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 1012 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 1015 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 1021 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 4900 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 5060 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 5994 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 9409 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/02/1951 | 5076 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/02/1951 | 5095 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/02/1951 | 5095 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/02/1951 | 5043 | To Store | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/02/1951 | 5076 | To Store | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 3715 | Transfer in from: | 81B | Slough | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 9309 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 01/03/1951 | 5057 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 01/03/1951 | 5057 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 3715 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 3715 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 2858 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 5076 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 6926 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 6932 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Newport Pill | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 9315 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 2858 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 4978 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 2858 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 4958 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 9410 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 9411 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 9412 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 9414 | Transfer in from: | 81B | Slough | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 9420 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 6129 | Transfer out to: | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 6166 | Transfer out to: | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 9401 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 9402 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 9404 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 9405 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 9406 | Transfer out to: | 81B | Slough | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1951 | 5076 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 02/06/1951 | 70017 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 6954 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 70017 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 70017 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/07/1951 | 4089 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/07/1951 | 4089 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 31/07/1951 | 70020 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 6954 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 6954 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 6932 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Newport Pill | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 70020 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 6954 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 70020 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 9302 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 9304 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 9306 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 9308 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/08/1951 | 90693 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 6932 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 6932 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 70018 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 70023 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 90585 | Transfer in from: | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 9423 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 4978 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 6932 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 24/09/1951 | 4016 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 70018 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 70023 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 90585 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 9423 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 70018 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 70023 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 90585 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 9423 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/10/1951 | 4097 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/10/1951 | 4097 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/10/1951 | 7027 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 4704 | Transfer in from: | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 4961 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 6900 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 90585 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 9403 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/11/1951 | 7027 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 6990 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 7911 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 18/01/1952 | 4089 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 5057 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 6017 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 6990 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 6990 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | GT2 | Co-Co | on | 03/1952 | 18100 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 27/03/1952 | 7033 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 4908 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 4941 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 5906 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 6821 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 6834 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 6874 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 6927 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 6932 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 6961 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 6996 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 2826 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 2858 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 2868 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 2895 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 3813 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 3852 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 3853 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 6117 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 28/04/1952 | 7033 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 2243 | Transfer in from: | HFD | Hereford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 4908 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 4941 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 5906 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6821 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6834 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6874 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6927 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6932 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6961 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6996 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 4908 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 4941 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 5906 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6821 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6834 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6874 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6927 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6932 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6961 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6996 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1952 | 5093 | Transfer in from: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1952 | 5039 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 5932 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 5093 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 5932 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 5093 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 6014 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 2827 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1952 | 7010 | Transfer in from: | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1952 | 5085 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 1024 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 6000 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 1026 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 4908 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 5950 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 22/10/1952 | 5069 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1952 | 4090 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 4708 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 1008 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 1024 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 2872 | Transfer out to: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 6821 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 6834 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 6874 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/11/1952 | 5082 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 4090 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 5082 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 7010 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 4090 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 5082 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 7010 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 2222 | Transfer in from: | DID | Didcot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 4967 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 8750 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 15101 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 2208 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 28/02/1953 | 8432 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 28/02/1953 | 8434 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 4986 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 2208 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 5947 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 31/03/1953 | 8433 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 03/07/1953 | 4090 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 4943 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 4945 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 4962 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 6110 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 11/07/1953 | 7001 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/07/1953 | 7001 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1953 | 5093 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 70015 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 4941 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 4962 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 5937 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 5938 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 5962 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 6927 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 6932 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/10/1953 | 13030 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 4962 | Transfer in from: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 4945 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6121 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6960 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 90473 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/10/1953 | 13031 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/10/1953 | 13032 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/10/1953 | 13033 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6109 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6121 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 4962 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 15103 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1953 | 5034 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1953 | 5093 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 05/01/1954 | 7013 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 4908 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 3715 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 4699 | Transfer out to: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 3685 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 4698 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 5906 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1954 | 4089 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1954 | 5006 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 4939 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 4908 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/07/1954 | 7017 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 6012 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 6996 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 6024 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 6001 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 4939 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 5986 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 6944 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 10/12/1954 | 5081 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 6016 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 27/01/1955 | 5092 | Transfer in from: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 4907 | Transfer in from: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 4986 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 4907 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/07/1955 | 5084 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 6137 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 01/09/1955 | 5084 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 2237 | Transfer in from: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 6022 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1955 | 4090 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1955 | 4091 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 9400 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 9416 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 4707 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 8433 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 6132 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 8755 | Transfer in from: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 8432 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 8707 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1956 | 5039 | Transfer in from: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1956 | 5043 | Transfer in from: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 6155 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1956 | 5039 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1956 | 5004 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 6023 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 9405 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/06/1956 | 4037 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 4923 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 4967 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 6109 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 4919 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 4965 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 2237 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 13105 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 9405 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 4900 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 4977 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 5945 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 5954 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 13105 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 4943 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 4965 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 6021 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 19/10/1956 | 5084 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1956 | 5008 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/11/1956 | 5099 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1956 | 5074 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 4925 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 4928 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 21/12/1956 | 7020 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 70015 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 70017 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 70018 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 70020 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 30/12/1956 | 5008 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/01/1957 | 5052 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 18/01/1957 | 5095 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 6978 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 4705 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 4928 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 30/01/1957 | 5008 | Transfer in from: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 18/02/1957 | 5007 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 5996 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1957 | 4097 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1957 | 4082 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 6113 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1957 | 8755 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 22/01/1958 | 5001 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1958 | 5092 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 7722 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 26/02/1958 | 7006 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1958 | 7006 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/03/1958 | 4096 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/03/1958 | 5005 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/03/1958 | 5010 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/03/1958 | 5027 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/03/1958 | 5006 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/03/1958 | 5029 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/03/1958 | 5038 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/03/1958 | 5055 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 5923 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 6920 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 4925 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 6145 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 12/06/1958 | 5099 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 26/09/1958 | 5001 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 26/09/1958 | 5005 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 6966 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 7927 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5945 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/10/1958 | D3599 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/10/1958 | D3600 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/10/1958 | D3601 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/10/1958 | D3602 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/10/1958 | D3603 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | D3597 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | D3598 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 4915 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 5929 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 5958 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 5977 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 6942 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 92229 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 92230 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 15101 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/11/1958 | D3604 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/11/1958 | D3605 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/11/1958 | D3606 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/11/1958 | D3607 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 92240 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 92241 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 92244 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 9479 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 15103 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 2243 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 5931 | Transfer out to: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 9422 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 30/11/1958 | 92245 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 30/11/1958 | 92244 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/12/1958 | 4089 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 92238 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 92239 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | D3603 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | D3606 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | D3607 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 4977 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 5977 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 6016 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 31/12/1958 | 92246 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 31/12/1958 | 92247 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 01/1959 | 9708 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 10/01/1959 | 5010 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 19/01/1959 | 4091 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 5931 | Transfer in from: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 5976 | Transfer in from: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 8459 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 4915 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/02/1959 | 5007 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 6007 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 04/1959 | 4900 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 04/1959 | 7734 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 6010 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 6013 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 9469 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | D3605 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 5936 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 8761 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 8769 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1959 | 8434 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 13/06/1959 | 9405 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 6025 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 6029 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 5940 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 5941 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 6022 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/07/1959 | 4074 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 11/08/1959 | 4090 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 12/08/1959 | 4074 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 6973 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 30/09/1959 | 92211 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 6004 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 6021 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 6973 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 6125 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | D3604 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 5954 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/11/1959 | 4075 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/11/1959 | 5054 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 6027 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 6108 | Transfer in from: | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 6157 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 5987 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 6125 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 6149 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 6159 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1959 | 7791 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1959 | 9400 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 4903 | Transfer in from: | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 4921 | Transfer in from: | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 5907 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 6973 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 4644 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 6110 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | D3604 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | D3761 | Transfer in from: | 87C | Danygraig | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | D3762 | Transfer in from: | 87C | Danygraig | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 4644 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 48410 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 48412 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 48431 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 6163 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 6027 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 6144 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 92229 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 92230 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | D3196 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | D3406 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | D3758 | Transfer in from: | 87C | Danygraig | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | D3759 | Transfer in from: | 87C | Danygraig | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | D3760 | Transfer in from: | 87C | Danygraig | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 6026 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | D3761 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | D3762 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 6002 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/03/1960 | 5032 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 24/03/1960 | 5057 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | D3512 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 6013 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 4903 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 5907 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 6141 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 7722 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 8764 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/04/1960 | D3947 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/04/1960 | 4078 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/04/1960 | 5042 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/04/1960 | D3950 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/04/1960 | D3949 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/04/1960 | D3951 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/04/1960 | D3948 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/04/1960 | D3952 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/04/1960 | D3953 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/04/1960 | D3955 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 15xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 1507 | Transfer in from: | PILL | Newport Pill | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | D3196 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 4921 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 8751 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 8760 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 25/04/1960 | 7027 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/04/1960 | D3954 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/04/1960 | D3957 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 05/1960 | 2282 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 05/1960 | 5717 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 05/1960 | 5764 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 06/05/1960 | 4082 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/05/1960 | D3956 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/05/1960 | D3959 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/05/1960 | D3960 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/05/1960 | D3958 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/05/1960 | D3961 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/05/1960 | D3962 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/05/1960 | D3963 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/05/1960 | D3964 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | D3196 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 2222 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 2276 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | D3598 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 25/05/1960 | 5037 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/05/1960 | D3965 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/06/1960 | 5074 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | D3598 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | D3950 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | D3951 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | D3952 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | D3956 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | D3957 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | D3958 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 07/1960 | 6121 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/07/1960 | 5044 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 05/07/1960 | 4089 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 05/07/1960 | 7004 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | D3754 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | D3967 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | D3970 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | D3971 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | D3972 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | D3196 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 6108 | Transfer out to: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 08/1960 | 9414 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/08/1960 | 5001 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 6110 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | D3406 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | D3754 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | D3948 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | D3949 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | D3953 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | D3955 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | D3959 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | D3960 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | D3963 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | D3964 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | D3965 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | D3967 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | D3971 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | D3972 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 6113 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 8770 | Transfer out to: | 81B | Slough | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 18/08/1960 | 4085 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 06/09/1960 | 7037 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 06/09/1960 | 5035 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 06/09/1960 | 5052 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 8761 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 9407 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 8772 | Transfer out to: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 92238 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 92239 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 92240 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1960 | 5050 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 7921 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 92203 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | D3970 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 6019 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 7927 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 19/10/1960 | 5090 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 31/10/1960 | 7012 | Transfer in from: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 31/10/1960 | 5054 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 11/1960 | 8754 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | D3114 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 4945 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 4983 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 5967 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 6141 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 6164 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 6169 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 8435 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 8458 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 92204 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 6110 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 6120 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 6132 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 92241 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 92245 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 92246 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 9416 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/11/1960 | D4003 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/11/1960 | D4004 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/11/1960 | D4005 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1960 | 9703 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/12/1960 | D4006 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 9477 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 9640 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | D3961 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/12/1960 | 5011 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/12/1960 | D4007 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/12/1960 | D4008 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 29/12/1960 | 5036 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | D4000 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 6963 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 01/1961 | 9701 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/01/1961 | 5093 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 25/01/1961 | 5015 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 27/01/1961 | 5093 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 6998 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 3648 | Transfer out to: | 87D | Swansea East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 3688 | Transfer out to: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 4982 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | D4005 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | D4007 | Transfer out to: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | D4008 | Transfer out to: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 4644 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 3646 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | D3512 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 4945 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | D3196 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | D3406 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 9754 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 6013 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 6168 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1961 | 9751 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/06/1961 | 4078 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/06/1961 | 5037 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/06/1961 | 7012 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | D3758 | Transfer out to: | DG | Danygraig | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | D3760 | Transfer out to: | DG | Danygraig | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 92211 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 05/07/1961 | 7009 | Transfer in from: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 05/07/1961 | 5027 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | D3196 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 6157 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 9412 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 08/1961 | 8762 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 08/08/1961 | 7014 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 08/08/1961 | 5050 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | D3759 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 6158 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 18/08/1961 | 7001 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 18/08/1961 | 7024 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/09/1961 | 5040 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 4982 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 10/09/1961 | 70023 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 10/1961 | 9705 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 3750 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 6168 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 4700 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 4702 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 6010 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 6024 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/10/1961 | 7018 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 03/11/1961 | 4075 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 92226 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 5923 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 11/01/1962 | 5087 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 02/1962 | 8435 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 02/1962 | 8753 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/02/1962 | 7020 | To Store | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/02/1962 | 7030 | To Store | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 5929 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 5958 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 24/02/1962 | 7009 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 92247 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 03/1962 | 6168 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 03/1962 | 9469 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 19/03/1962 | 7006 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 92000 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 6125 | Transfer in from: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 9755 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 21/04/1962 | 5043 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 6012 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 05/1962 | 8761 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 05/1962 | 9702 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 05/1962 | 9709 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 05/1962 | 9758 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 01/05/1962 | 7030 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/05/1962 | 4085 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 15xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 1506 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 8436 | Transfer in from: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 31/05/1962 | 5090 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1962 | 6003 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1962 | 6004 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1962 | 6023 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1962 | 7014 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 6018 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 8420 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 6015 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 6018 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 22/06/1962 | 5060 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1962 | 6029 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 07/1962 | 8771 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 07/1962 | 9407 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 07/1962 | 9410 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/07/1962 | 5041 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/07/1962 | 7029 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/07/1962 | 5082 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 14/07/1962 | 4098 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 3666 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 4930 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 4970 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 6028 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 9440 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 9495 | Transfer in from: | 81B | Slough | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 14/07/1962 | 4096 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 5976 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 6028 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 6164 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 14/07/1962 | 7036 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 92000 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 15/07/1962 | 80070 | Transfer in from: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 15/07/1962 | 80098 | Transfer in from: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 15/07/1962 | 80102 | Transfer in from: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 15/07/1962 | 80104 | Transfer in from: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 15/07/1962 | 80131 | Transfer in from: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 15/07/1962 | 80132 | Transfer in from: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 08/1962 | 8763 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 11/08/1962 | 5042 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1962 | 3750 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1962 | 5931 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1962 | 6009 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1962 | 6021 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1962 | 6026 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1962 | 8757 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1962 | 8765 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/09/1962 | 5011 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/09/1962 | 5036 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/09/1962 | 4098 | To Store | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/09/1962 | 5008 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/09/1962 | 5032 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 8487 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 80098 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 80131 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 14/09/1962 | 5001 | To Store | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/09/1962 | 5066 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 20/09/1962 | D1040 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 21/09/1962 | 5034 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 24/09/1962 | D1009 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/10/1962 | 5015 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 06/10/1962 | 7015 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 06/10/1962 | 7036 | Reinstated | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | D1007 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | D1008 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 3711 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 6005 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 6011 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 92220 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 92230 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 4919 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 4930 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 4970 | Transfer out to: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 4983 | Transfer out to: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 5939 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 6920 | Transfer out to: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 10/10/1962 | D1041 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 15/10/1962 | D1010 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 19/10/1962 | D1042 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 22/10/1962 | 4089 | To Store | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 22/10/1962 | 7013 | To Store | ||||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | on | 22/10/1962 | 4708 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 22/10/1962 | 8756 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 22/10/1962 | 8773 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 26/10/1962 | D1043 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 27/10/1962 | D1011 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D1000 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D1001 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D1002 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D1003 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D1004 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D1005 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D1006 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D1035 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D1036 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D1037 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D1038 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D1039 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 4903 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 5900 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 5919 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 5984 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 5988 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 8472 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 9455 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 4701 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 4704 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 48410 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 92220 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 92226 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 92230 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 12/11/1962 | 7017 | To Store | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/11/1962 | 5070 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 4701 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 4703 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 4704 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 92243 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 48412 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 5900 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | on | 20/11/1962 | 6005 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | on | 20/11/1962 | 6028 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | on | 04/12/1962 | 6000 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 12/12/1962 | 3666 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 12/12/1962 | 9725 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 14/12/1962 | 5041 | To Store | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 48431 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 80070 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 80102 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 80104 | Transfer out to: | 89B | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 80132 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/12/1962 | 4074 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/12/1962 | 4096 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/12/1962 | 7009 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | on | 18/12/1962 | 6011 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | on | 18/12/1962 | 6018 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | on | 18/12/1962 | 6025 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | D3965 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | D3966 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | D1035 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/02/1963 | 5001 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 9700 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | D1043 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 9700 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 4096 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 5065 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6962 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 7030 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 7033 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 8759 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 11/02/1963 | D1053 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 25/02/1963 | 5001 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 03/1963 | 8472 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 03/1963 | 9419 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 03/1963 | 9423 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/03/1963 | 7035 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/03/1963 | 7037 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | D1049 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/03/1963 | 7008 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 8433 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 8481 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | D1053 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 22/03/1963 | 7009 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 92203 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 92204 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 04/1963 | 9455 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 02/04/1963 | D1018 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 05/04/1963 | 7015 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | D1013 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | D1014 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | D1015 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | D1035 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 5971 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 5985 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 6978 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | D1039 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | D1040 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | D1041 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | D1042 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 6978 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 11/04/1963 | D1060 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 19/04/1963 | D1061 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 05/1963 | 3711 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 05/1963 | 9755 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 05/1963 | 9784 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 02/05/1963 | D1019 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 03/05/1963 | D7076 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 03/05/1963 | D7078 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 03/05/1963 | 4074 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 3763 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 4606 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/05/1963 | 5039 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/05/1963 | 5076 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 6124 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | D7048 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 8768 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | D1013 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | D1014 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | D1037 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | D1038 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 5932 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 5984 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 6973 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 8768 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 06/05/1963 | D1062 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 06/05/1963 | 5098 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 17/05/1963 | D1063 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 21/05/1963 | D1020 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | D1060 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | D1061 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1963 | 5988 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 17/06/1963 | D1021 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 18/06/1963 | D1065 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D7056 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D7057 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D7059 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D7060 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D7061 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D7065 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D7067 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D1015 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D1062 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D1063 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 4903 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 07/1963 | 9440 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 07/1963 | 9479 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/07/1963 | 5084 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 12/07/1963 | D1068 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 14/07/1963 | 8464 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 14/07/1963 | 8498 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 14/07/1963 | 9435 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 14/07/1963 | 9463 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 14/07/1963 | 9470 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 14/07/1963 | 9498 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 14/07/1963 | 3754 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 14/07/1963 | 8767 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 14/07/1963 | 9640 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 14/07/1963 | 9658 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 14/07/1963 | 9661 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 16/07/1963 | D1022 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 26/07/1963 | 5056 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 5919 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | D7062 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | D7063 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | D7064 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 27/07/1963 | 5039 | Transfer out to: | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 5919 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 5967 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 5985 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 6942 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1963 | 5919 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 08/1963 | 8458 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 3618 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 4609 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 9763 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 9789 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 8464 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 09/1963 | 4701 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1963 | 9763 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/09/1963 | 7036 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/09/1963 | 7018 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 28/09/1963 | 4082 | Reinstated | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | D1015 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | D1041 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | D1043 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | D1051 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 3608 | Transfer in from: | 81B | Slough | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 3715 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 4638 | Transfer in from: | 81B | Slough | ||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 4706 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 4962 | Transfer in from: | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | D6326 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | D7058 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | D1011 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | D1018 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | D1021 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | D1022 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | D3954 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 92243 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 30/09/1963 | 5093 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 10/1963 | 9700 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 31/10/1963 | D1682 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 31/10/1963 | D1683 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 11/1963 | 8487 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | D1053 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 4705 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 4707 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 6961 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 6978 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 6990 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 07/11/1963 | D1071 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 07/11/1963 | D1072 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 11/11/1963 | D1684 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 4670 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 7910 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 9406 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 9415 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 9422 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 9707 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 15xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1963 | 1500 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 15xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1963 | 1506 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 15xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1963 | 1507 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 12/1963 | 4705 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1963 | 7921 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1963 | 9422 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1963 | 9704 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 03/12/1963 | D1073 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 05/12/1963 | D1030 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 11/12/1963 | D1694 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/12/1963 | 7006 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 20/12/1963 | D1031 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 24/12/1963 | D1026 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 28/12/1963 | D1699 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 28/12/1963 | 7020 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 4611 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 6974 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | D7026 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 31/12/1963 | D1032 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 11/01/1964 | D1701 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 11/01/1964 | D1707 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 13/01/1964 | D1698 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 13/01/1964 | D1700 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 17/01/1964 | D1033 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 18/01/1964 | D1708 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 20/01/1964 | D1710 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 20/01/1964 | D1711 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 8743 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D1006 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D1007 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D1008 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D1010 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D1015 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D1041 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D1043 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D1051 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D1053 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D1065 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D1068 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 6966 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 8420 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D1015 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 27/01/1964 | 7010 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 02/1964 | 4706 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/02/1964 | D1714 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 08/02/1964 | D1715 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 22/02/1964 | D1009 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 22/02/1964 | D1015 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 22/02/1964 | D1049 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/02/1964 | 6974 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 28/02/1964 | D1717 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 28/02/1964 | D1715 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 03/1964 | 9420 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 10/03/1964 | 5057 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/03/1964 | 5070 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/03/1964 | D1715 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/03/1964 | D1716 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 09/04/1964 | D1727 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/04/1964 | 7013 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/04/1964 | 4080 | Transfer in from: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 7904 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D1001 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D1002 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D1003 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D1004 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D1005 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D1019 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D1026 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D1030 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D1031 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D1032 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D1033 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D1035 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D1071 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/04/1964 | 5098 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/04/1964 | 7020 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 15/04/1964 | D1034 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 05/1964 | 4703 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 05/1964 | 4704 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 05/1964 | 4707 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | D7027 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | D7073 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | D1020 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 6124 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 6169 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 6963 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 7904 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 7910 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/05/1964 | D1695 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/05/1964 | D1696 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/05/1964 | D1709 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/05/1964 | D1682 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/05/1964 | D1683 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/05/1964 | D1684 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1964 | 3618 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1964 | 3646 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1964 | 6970 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1964 | 8743 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 01/06/1964 | 7035 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 12/06/1964 | D1733 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 12/06/1964 | D1740 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 14/06/1964 | 5014 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 19/06/1964 | D1743 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/06/1964 | 7013 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D6343 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 9726 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 22/06/1964 | 4080 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 4962 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 5971 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 6959 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 6998 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D7027 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 29/06/1964 | 5076 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/07/1964 | D1745 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/07/1964 | D1748 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 03/07/1964 | D1746 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 03/07/1964 | D1747 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 6110 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 6156 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 6165 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 9405 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 9726 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 3620 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 3622 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 8420 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 8486 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 9404 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 9405 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 9642 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | D3030 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 24/08/1964 | 4082 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 6110 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 6125 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 6141 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 6142 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 6156 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 6163 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 6165 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1964 | 3622 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1964 | 7008 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1964 | 7032 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1964 | 8768 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1964 | 9406 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1964 | 9435 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1964 | 9470 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1964 | 9498 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 10/1964 | 4615 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 10/1964 | 4670 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 10/1964 | 9710 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 05/10/1964 | 7029 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | D6335 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | D6351 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | D6352 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | D6354 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | D6357 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 6961 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 6978 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | D7081 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 7923 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | D1694 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | D1695 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | D1696 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | D1698 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 6135 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 11/1964 | 9642 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 11/1964 | 9706 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 2w/e | 01/11/1964 | D6355 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 2w/e | 01/11/1964 | D6356 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | w/e | 15/11/1964 | D6353 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/11/1964 | D9521 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/11/1964 | D3030 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/11/1964 | D9522 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 8436 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/12/1964 | D9523 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/12/1964 | D9524 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 2w/e | 10/01/1965 | D7072 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 23/01/1965 | 6961 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 02/1965 | 4606 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | D3955 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | D1699 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | 6978 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | 7923 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 03/1965 | 3715 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D3511 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D7071 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D7085 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1700 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1748 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | D3186 | Transfer in from: | 87B | Margam | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | D3756 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | D3804 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 3608 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 3620 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 3763 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 4609 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 4611 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 4638 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 8486 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 8498 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 9405 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 9418 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 9463 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 9477 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 9495 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 9659 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 9789 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1965 | 8420 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1965 | 8433 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1965 | 8459 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1965 | 8481 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1965 | 9404 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1965 | 9411 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1965 | 9415 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | D3762 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | D3954 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 16/06/1965 | 6145 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D7066 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D7080 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D7082 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D3762 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D3954 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D6347 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D6348 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D6349 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D6350 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D7034 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D7035 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D7036 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D3186 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | D3186 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | D6342 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | D6344 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | D6345 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | D6346 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | D6347 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | D6348 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | D6349 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | D6350 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | D6347 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | D6348 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | D6349 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | D6350 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | D9521 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | D9522 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | D9523 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | D9524 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 12/1965 | D1606 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1583 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1584 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1587 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1600 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1601 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1602 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1604 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1605 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1607 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1608 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1609 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1610 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1614 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1615 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1694 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1744 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D3352 | Transfer in from: | 87B | Margam | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D6327 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D6328 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D6332 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1000 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1034 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1036 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1072 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1073 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1743 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D1694 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D1694 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | D1609 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | D1610 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | D1614 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | D1615 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | D1707 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | D1727 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | D1694 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1701 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1708 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1709 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1710 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1711 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1592 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1593 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1594 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1595 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1596 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1609 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1610 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1614 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1615 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1751 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D6340 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D6341 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D7081 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D7082 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D7085 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/06/1966 | D1714 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/06/1966 | D1715 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/06/1966 | D1716 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/06/1966 | D1717 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D1585 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D1740 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | D1583 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 28/08/1966 | D1584 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | D1614 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | D1615 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | D3033 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D1636 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D1637 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D1638 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D1639 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D1640 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D1648 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D7088 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D1585 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D1587 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D1592 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D1593 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D1596 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D1600 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D1751 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D7080 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D1670 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 15/01/1967 | D3754 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D1744 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 28/02/1967 | D1641 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 28/02/1967 | D1594 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | m/e | 28/02/1967 | D6340 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | m/e | 31/03/1967 | D7027 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 31/03/1967 | D1595 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 31/03/1967 | D1601 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 31/03/1967 | D1745 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 31/03/1967 | D1746 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 31/03/1967 | D1747 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 30/04/1967 | D1642 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 30/04/1967 | D1649 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 30/04/1967 | D1650 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 30/04/1967 | D1602 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 30/04/1967 | D1604 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/04/1967 | D3352 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 14/05/1967 | D1733 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D3186 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D6341 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | m/e | 30/06/1967 | D6342 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | m/e | 30/06/1967 | D7048 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | on | 01/07/1967 | D846 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | w/e | 05/07/1967 | D846 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | w/e | 05/07/1967 | D846 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 22/07/1967 | D4026 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/07/1967 | D3030 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/07/1967 | D3031 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/07/1967 | D3032 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | w/e | 31/07/1967 | D833 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | m/e | 08/1967 | D843 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D846 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D846 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 2w/e | 14/08/1967 | D836 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | on | 14/08/1967 | D836 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | on | 14/08/1967 | D836 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D3196 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D6340 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D6341 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D834 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D835 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D840 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D842 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D847 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D7088 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | m/e | 09/1967 | D836 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | m/e | 09/1967 | D836 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D837 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D839 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D845 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D1605 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D3196 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D7078 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | m/e | 10/1967 | D850 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | D838 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | D841 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | D844 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | D848 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | D849 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | D851 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | D852 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | D853 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | D1606 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | D1607 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | D1608 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | D1609 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | D1610 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | m/e | 02/1968 | D836 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/02/1968 | D3511 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D3961 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D3963 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D854 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D855 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D1648 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D3114 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D3406 | Transfer out to: | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D6348 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D6349 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D7073 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D7076 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D837 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D838 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D839 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D851 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 31/03/1968 | D6347 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D7028 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D7029 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D7030 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D839 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D851 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D7056 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D7057 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D7059 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D7060 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D7063 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D7064 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D7067 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 14/09/1968 | D6335 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 14/09/1968 | D6344 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 14/09/1968 | D6345 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 14/09/1968 | D6350 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 14/09/1968 | D6355 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 23/09/1968 | D6353 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1648 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1680 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1681 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D3936 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D3999 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D6348 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D7045 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D7046 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D3597 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D3604 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D3804 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D4004 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 30/11/1968 | D5535 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 30/11/1968 | D6341 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 21/12/1968 | D6357 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 28/12/1968 | D5530 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 28/12/1968 | D5539 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | m/e | 01/1969 | D6351 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D1583 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D1587 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D1594 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D1650 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D1679 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D3761 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D3762 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D3936 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D3954 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D3972 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D6336 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D837 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D838 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D854 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D856 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D1650 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D3936 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D6354 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D854 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | m/e | 03/1969 | D833 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | m/e | 03/1969 | D850 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1596 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1636 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1637 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1648 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1652 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1653 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1678 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D3001 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D7100 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1636 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1637 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1648 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1650 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D834 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D838 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D844 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D847 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | on | 26/03/1969 | D848 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 29/03/1969 | D5528 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | m/e | 04/1969 | D842 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | m/e | 04/1969 | D855 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | on | 26/04/1969 | D840 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 5w/e | 05/1969 | D850 | Reinstated | 98S | |||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | D3605 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | D841 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | D855 | Transfer in from: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | D6348 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | D839 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | D841 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | D852 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | D854 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 03/05/1969 | D6346 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 24/05/1969 | D5536 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | D1674 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | D1675 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | D7050 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/06/1969 | D3001 | Transfer out to: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | D6352 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | D6356 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | D845 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 16/08/1969 | D1641 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 8w/e | 16/08/1969 | D856 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 5w/e | 27/09/1969 | D833 | Reinstated | 98S | |||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 5w/e | 27/09/1969 | D851 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | D1596 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | D841 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | D4166 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | D852 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | D854 | Transfer in from: | 98S | |||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | D1583 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | D1587 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | D1594 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | D3972 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 2w/e | 27/12/1969 | D835 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | D3605 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | D3961 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | D855 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D1650 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D3961 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D6356 | Transfer in from: | 98S | |||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D7051 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D6327 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D7051 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 21/05/1970 | D3518 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 29/05/1970 | D3269 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 29/05/1970 | D4179 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 29/05/1970 | D3754 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 29/05/1970 | D3756 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 29/05/1970 | D4006 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | m/e | 06/1970 | D846 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/06/1970 | D3936 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 22/08/1970 | D4177 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | q/e | 22/08/1970 | D841 | Transfer in from: | 98S | |||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | q/e | 22/08/1970 | D851 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | q/e | 22/08/1970 | D853 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | q/e | 22/08/1970 | D837 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | q/e | 22/08/1970 | D849 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | q/e | 22/08/1970 | D853 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1970 | D1659 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | m/e | 10/1970 | D833 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | m/e | 10/1970 | D843 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | m/e | 10/1970 | D850 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D1647 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D1651 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D1654 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D1655 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D1656 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D1657 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D1658 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D1660 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D7031 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D7032 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D7033 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D7037 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D3761 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D7058 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D7062 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D7065 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D7072 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D7100 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D841 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D851 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D852 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D853 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D854 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 02/01/1971 | D3762 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 7w/e | 02/01/1971 | D6328 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 8w/e | 27/02/1971 | D7100 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D6332 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D7048 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D7049 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D7051 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D7052 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D7053 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D6326 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D6336 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D6340 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D6343 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D6356 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/06/1971 | D3518 | Transfer out to: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | m/e | 10/1971 | D7044 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D7011 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D7016 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D7017 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D7022 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D7024 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D1647 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D1680 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | m/e | 11/1971 | D7019 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 3w/e | 29/11/1971 | D7027 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 3w/e | 29/11/1971 | D7066 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1972 | D7053 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 8w/e | 01/01/1972 | D7018 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1972 | D7036 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1972 | D7052 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1972 | D7024 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1972 | D7033 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1972 | D7034 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1972 | D7035 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1972 | D7046 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1972 | D7048 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1972 | D7049 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1972 | D7051 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1972 | D7061 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1972 | D7071 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 02/01/1972 | D7000 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 02/01/1972 | D7001 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | D1583 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | D1599 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5554 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5655 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5668 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5682 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5688 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5803 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5809 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5812 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5814 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5818 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7015 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7023 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7082 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7084 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7085 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7087 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7089 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7045 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7050 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7100 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 2w/e | 19/04/1972 | D7082 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 5w/e | 08/05/1972 | D7085 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 5w/e | 08/05/1972 | D7087 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 5w/e | 08/05/1972 | D7089 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 3w/e | 13/05/1972 | D7036 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 2w/e | 13/05/1972 | D7054 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 07/06/1972 | D7015 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 09/06/1972 | D7036 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/07/1972 | D5686 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/07/1972 | D5687 | Transfer in from: | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/07/1972 | D5689 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/07/1972 | D5690 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 08/07/1972 | D7019 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 08/07/1972 | D7054 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 05/08/1972 | D4000 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 02/09/1972 | D3953 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 08/09/1972 | D7019 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 09/09/1972 | D7084 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 15/09/1972 | D7054 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 15/09/1972 | D7085 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 15/09/1972 | D7019 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 15/09/1972 | D7037 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 30/09/1972 | D4180 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 11/10/1972 | D7085 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 28/10/1972 | D5684 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 28/10/1972 | D5685 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D1641 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D1644 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D5617 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D5692 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D5695 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D1583 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D1599 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D5803 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D5809 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D5814 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D5818 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D7028 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D7044 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D7054 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 02/12/1972 | D3269 | Transfer out to: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/12/1972 | D1664 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 23/12/1972 | D1639 | Transfer out to: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 30/12/1972 | D7028 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/12/1972 | D3600 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/12/1972 | D3601 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/12/1972 | D3602 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/02/1973 | 47057 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/03/1973 | D5842 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 10/03/1973 | D7044 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/03/1973 | D5528 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 24/03/1973 | D5814 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 24/03/1973 | D5617 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/04/1973 | D1658 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 06/05/1973 | D7030 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 06/05/1973 | D7032 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 06/05/1973 | D7044 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 11/05/1973 | D7017 | Reinstated | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 11/05/1973 | D7017 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 11/05/1973 | D7031 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1739 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1740 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1741 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D5617 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D5803 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D5809 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1644 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1652 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1653 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1659 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | 47073 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 02/06/1973 | D5824 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 02/06/1973 | D5530 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 05/06/1973 | D7017 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/06/1973 | D1681 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 09/06/1973 | D7023 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/07/1973 | D1647 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/07/1973 | D1653 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/07/1973 | D1672 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/07/1973 | 47073 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/07/1973 | D1739 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/07/1973 | D1740 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/07/1973 | D1741 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/07/1973 | D5617 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 30/07/1973 | D7000 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/08/1973 | D7093 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1673 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1676 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/10/1973 | 47092 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/10/1973 | D5554 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/10/1973 | D5655 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/10/1973 | D5668 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/11/1973 | D5668 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/11/1973 | D1676 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/12/1973 | D4178 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/12/1973 | D4003 | Transfer out to: | OX | Oxford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/02/1974 | 47065 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/03/1974 | 47068 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 31279 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 16/03/1974 | D7001 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/03/1974 | D3048 | Transfer in from: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/03/1974 | 08831 | Transfer out to: | EH | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 30/03/1974 | 47081 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 30/03/1974 | D1636 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 27/04/1974 | 31291 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 27/04/1974 | 31295 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 27/04/1974 | 31256 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 27/04/1974 | 31257 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 31279 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | D405 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 50001 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 50002 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 50004 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 50050 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47054 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47056 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47063 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47064 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 01/06/1974 | 47075 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 01/06/1974 | 47073 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 22/06/1974 | 47055 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 22/06/1974 | 47067 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/06/1974 | 47080 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/06/1974 | 47058 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/07/1974 | 47090 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 10/08/1974 | 47064 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/08/1974 | 47071 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/09/1974 | 08678 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/09/1974 | 47056 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/09/1974 | 08795 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 06/10/1974 | D7028 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 06/10/1974 | D7026 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 19/10/1974 | D7093 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 19/10/1974 | D7028 | Transfer in from: | 98S | |||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/11/1974 | 08108 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/11/1974 | 08858 | Transfer out to: | DY | Derby | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 26/11/1974 | D7028 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/12/1974 | 47060 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/12/1974 | 47061 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1975 | D7011 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1975 | D7029 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/01/1975 | 31257 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 03/02/1975 | D7029 | Reinstated | 98S | |||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 03/02/1975 | D7022 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 08/02/1975 | 47056 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 28/02/1975 | D7029 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | 31229 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | 31293 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | 31309 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | 47093 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 16/03/1975 | D7018 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/04/1975 | 31230 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/04/1975 | 31231 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 31256 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 31304 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 31261 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 31262 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47066 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47069 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47070 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47072 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47075 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/06/1975 | 08081 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/06/1975 | 08936 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 08109 | Transfer in from: | EJ | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 08081 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 31419 | Transfer in from: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 47056 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 31279 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 31291 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 31295 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 31309 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 47064 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 47085 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | 31136 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | 31286 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | 31229 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | 31293 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1976 | 08364 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1976 | 08108 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/01/1976 | 47055 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/01/1976 | 47056 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 28/02/1976 | 31421 | Transfer in from: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/03/1976 | 31421 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/03/1976 | 31136 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/03/1976 | 31254 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/03/1976 | 31421 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 10/04/1976 | 50001 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 10/04/1976 | 50002 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 10/04/1976 | 50004 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 10/04/1976 | 50005 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 10/04/1976 | 50050 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/07/1976 | 47060 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/07/1976 | 47061 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 07/08/1976 | 08596 | Transfer in from: | RG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 07/08/1976 | 08035 | Transfer out to: | EJ | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 18/09/1976 | 31260 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 31123 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 31163 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 47068 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 47076 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 47079 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 47080 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 47081 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 47086 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 47087 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 47088 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 47089 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 47090 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 12/1976 | 08596 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 12/1976 | 08936 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 06/12/1976 | 08484 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 11/12/1976 | 08656 | Transfer in from: | RG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 11/12/1976 | 08483 | Transfer out to: | EJ | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 05/1977 | 31265 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/05/1977 | 47483 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 07/1977 | 31209 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 07/1977 | 31265 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 08/1977 | 08483 | Transfer in from: | EJ | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 08/1977 | 31165 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 08/1977 | 08950 | Transfer out to: | WS | Worcester | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 08/1977 | 31421 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 09/1977 | 31213 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 09/1977 | 31296 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 09/1977 | 31414 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 09/1977 | 31416 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 10/1977 | 31124 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 10/1977 | 31136 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 10/1977 | 31254 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 10/1977 | 31260 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 10/1977 | 31419 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 26/11/1977 | 31258 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 09/01/1978 | 31132 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 19/02/1978 | 31131 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 25/02/1978 | 08786 | Transfer out to: | EJ | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 03/1978 | 47500 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 03/1978 | 47507 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 03/1978 | 47508 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 03/1978 | 47509 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 03/1978 | 47510 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 03/1978 | 47513 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 13/05/1978 | 08480 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 13/05/1978 | 08779 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 11/1978 | 47511 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 01/12/1979 | 31254 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 24/08/1980 | 31136 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/12/1980 | 08364 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/12/1980 | 08787 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/12/1980 | 08949 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/12/1980 | 08109 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/08/1981 | 08785 | Transfer out to: | SW | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 14/03/1982 | 31241 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 11/03/1987 | 31117 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47582 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47583 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 50036 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 50037 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 50038 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 50039 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 50040 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/10/1987 | 08793 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/10/1987 | 08936 | Transfer out to: | NC | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31118 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31123 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31165 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47713 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47714 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47716 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47473 | Transfer in from: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47540 | Transfer in from: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47547 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47587 | Transfer in from: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31131 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31230 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31231 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31260 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31286 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31304 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31412 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31430 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31459 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31465 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47500 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47508 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47509 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/06/1988 | 08819 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 01/09/1988 | 31121 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 27/09/1988 | 50038 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/10/1988 | 08678 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 02/03/1989 | 31259 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 04/06/1989 | 50039 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 25/05/1990 | 31124 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 03/08/1990 | 50040 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 10/09/1990 | 31257 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/11/1990 | 08797 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 12/04/1991 | 50036 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 09/09/1991 | 50037 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/11/1992 | 08794 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/02/1993 | 08656 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 01/12/1993 | 31296 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 01/07/1995 | 31415 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/03/1996 | 47547 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 01/05/1997 | 31413 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/05/1998 | 47540 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/06/1998 | 47473 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 19/01/1999 | 31163 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 16/06/2000 | 31132 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 12/04/2001 | 31273 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/2003 | 31209 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/08/2003 | 47587 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/02/2004 | 47582 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/02/2004 | 47583 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 28/02/2004 | 47513 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/02/2007 | 08947 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/06/2008 | 08819 | Condemned |