Depot: Parkeston Quay
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/01/1929 | 2720 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/01/1929 | 2719 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/04/1929 | 2721 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/04/1929 | 2722 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/05/1929 | 2724 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/05/1929 | 2723 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/09/1929 | 2770 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/09/1931 | 2964 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/10/1931 | 2965 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 26/03/1934 | 4667 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/03/1934 | 2724 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 03/04/1934 | 4631 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/04/1934 | 2722 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/01/1935 | 2770 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/01/1935 | 2965 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/01/1935 | 2771 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/01/1935 | 2723 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/02/1935 | 2770 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/03/1935 | 2723 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/10/1935 | 2991 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 11/1935 | 4667 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/11/1935 | 2992 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/11/1935 | 2720 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 14/11/1935 | 4631 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/12/1935 | 2989 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 01/1936 | 7048 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/01/1936 | 2993 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/02/1936 | 2770 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/02/1936 | 2949 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/02/1936 | 2964 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/03/1936 | 2771 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/07/1936 | 2719 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/08/1938 | 2703 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/08/1938 | 2772 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/03/1939 | 2703 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/03/1939 | 2772 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/09/1939 | 2721 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/09/1939 | 2723 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/09/1939 | 2992 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/09/1939 | 2949 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/12/1939 | 2992 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/12/1939 | 2989 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/09/1940 | 2723 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/09/1940 | 2726 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/09/1940 | 2728 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/09/1940 | 2991 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/09/1940 | 2992 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/09/1940 | 2993 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/04/1941 | 2718 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/04/1941 | 2726 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/11/1941 | 2714 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/11/1941 | 2714 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/07/1943 | 2984 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/11/1943 | 2778 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/06/1944 | 2721 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/06/1944 | 2771 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/06/1944 | 2942 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/01/1945 | 8309 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/01/1945 | 8310 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/01/1945 | 8307 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/01/1945 | 8302 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/02/1945 | 8302 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/02/1945 | 8307 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/03/1945 | 8309 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/03/1945 | 8310 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/06/1945 | 2721 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/06/1945 | 2728 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/06/1945 | 2771 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/06/1945 | 2942 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/01/1946 | 1267 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/01/1946 | 1277 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/01/1946 | 2718 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/01/1946 | 2723 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 09/02/1946 | 1777 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 09/02/1946 | 4677 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 21/02/1946 | 1778 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 21/02/1946 | 1780 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/06/1946 | 4727 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/06/1946 | 4733 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/10/1946 | 1000 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/10/1946 | 1005 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/12/1946 | 1001 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/12/1946 | 1005 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/01/1947 | 1004 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/01/1947 | 1005 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/01/1947 | 1006 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/01/1947 | 1008 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/02/1947 | 1003 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/03/1947 | 4888 | Transfer out to: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/03/1947 | 4787 | Transfer in from: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/05/1947 | 4788 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/05/1947 | 4787 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/05/1947 | 1135 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/05/1947 | 1149 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/05/1947 | 1004 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/09/1947 | 1004 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/09/1947 | 1104 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/09/1947 | 4727 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/09/1947 | 4765 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/09/1947 | 1767 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/09/1947 | 1777 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/09/1947 | 1778 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/09/1947 | 1780 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/12/1947 | 1264 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5365 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5376 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5453 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5458 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7204 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7206 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7229 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8519 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8521 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8571 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8596 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8638 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8642 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8644 | Snapshot | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8660 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/01/1948 | 1226 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/01/1948 | 4953 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 1226 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 4953 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 8554 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 8643 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 8650 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 1226 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 4953 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 8642 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 25/01/1948 | 7675 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/02/1948 | 1000 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/02/1948 | 1001 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/02/1948 | 1104 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 7201 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 8571 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 8596 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/02/1948 | 1232 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/02/1948 | 4783 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/02/1948 | 4789 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 1232 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 4783 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 4789 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 1232 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 4783 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 4789 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 7204 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 7206 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 7681 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 5453 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/05/1948 | 61008 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 7220 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 8500 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 8519 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 8521 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 31/07/1948 | 67677 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 31/07/1948 | 7229 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 7676 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 7679 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 7680 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 67677 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 7201 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 7220 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 12/12/1948 | 7676 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/12/1948 | 7681 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 9615 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 9619 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 9620 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 9621 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 7675 | Transfer out to: | STG | Stirling | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 7679 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 7680 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/01/1949 | 64730 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/01/1949 | 64787 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/01/1949 | 4765 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/01/1949 | 4783 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | 64730 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | 64787 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | 64730 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | 64787 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 68557 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 69614 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 69635 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 8571 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 8638 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 06/1949 | 65376 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 5434 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5434 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5434 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 03/09/1949 | 8650 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/10/1949 | 64873 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/10/1949 | 64727 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 64873 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 64873 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 8571 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 68556 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 69677 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 69620 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 65354 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/01/1950 | 68653 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/01/1950 | 8554 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/06/1950 | 4783 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/06/1950 | 64779 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/06/1950 | 64780 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/06/1950 | 64730 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/06/1950 | 64789 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/06/1950 | 64804 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/06/1950 | 64770 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/06/1950 | 64777 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/06/1950 | 4783 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/06/1950 | 64780 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 64770 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 64777 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 64779 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 64770 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 64777 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 64779 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 07/1950 | 65365 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/07/1950 | 65434 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/07/1950 | 65434 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 23/07/1950 | 68561 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 23/07/1950 | 8500 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/09/1950 | 68527 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/09/1950 | 68557 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 68527 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 68527 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/10/1950 | 61192 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/10/1950 | 61226 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/12/1950 | 61226 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/12/1950 | 61192 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 61226 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 61226 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 68649 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 02/1951 | 65354 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 68649 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 68649 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 18/02/1951 | 68601 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 18/02/1951 | 68527 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/02/1951 | 65446 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 65446 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 68601 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 65446 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 68601 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 68500 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 68556 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 68500 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 68500 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/05/1951 | 64781 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/05/1951 | 64787 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 64781 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 64781 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/06/1951 | 64787 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/06/1951 | 64874 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/06/1951 | 64770 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/06/1951 | 64781 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 64787 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 64874 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 68661 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 64787 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 64874 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 68653 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/07/1951 | 64770 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/07/1951 | 64779 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 65453 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 68661 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 65446 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 68661 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 64770 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 65453 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 64770 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 65453 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/08/1951 | 64773 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/08/1951 | 64773 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/08/1951 | 64773 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 69561 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 69566 | Transfer in from: | HSY | Hornsey | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 69614 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 69621 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 69561 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 69566 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 69561 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 69566 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 69502 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 69551 | Transfer in from: | HAT | Hatfield | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 69552 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 69635 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 69677 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 23/08/1952 | 69502 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 23/08/1952 | 69551 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 23/08/1952 | 69552 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 23/08/1952 | 69502 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 23/08/1952 | 69551 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 23/08/1952 | 69552 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/02/1953 | 11108 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/02/1953 | 11109 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/03/1953 | 11110 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 68561 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 68601 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 68649 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 68661 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/09/1954 | 11111 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/10/1954 | 11113 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/10/1954 | 11108 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/10/1954 | 11111 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/11/1954 | 11115 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 25/12/1954 | 11111 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 25/12/1954 | 11109 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 68554 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 11110 | Transfer out to: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 68500 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/03/1955 | 64810 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/11/1955 | 64985 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/11/1955 | 64810 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 69619 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/05/1956 | 11140 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 11138 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 11136 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 11111 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 11115 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/08/1956 | 11137 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/08/1956 | 11113 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1956 | 61384 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/10/1956 | 61005 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/10/1956 | 61006 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 68554 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/10/1956 | 61227 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/10/1956 | 64764 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/10/1956 | 64771 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/10/1956 | 64776 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/10/1956 | 64873 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/10/1956 | 64874 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/10/1956 | 64985 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 69672 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 69675 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 69721 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 69727 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 69733 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 69502 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 69551 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 69552 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 69561 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 69566 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 69721 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 69727 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 69733 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/05/1957 | 64896 | Transfer in from: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/05/1957 | 64953 | Transfer out to: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 13298 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/03/1958 | 61003 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/03/1958 | 61004 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/03/1958 | 61135 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 61815 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 61834 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 61942 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/03/1958 | 64787 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/03/1958 | 64788 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/03/1958 | 64896 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/03/1958 | 64770 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | D3501 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | D3502 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 61820 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 61921 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/04/1958 | 61003 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/04/1958 | 61004 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/04/1958 | 64764 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/04/1958 | 64773 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/04/1958 | 64771 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | D3500 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 12134 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 13299 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | D3500 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | D3501 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/08/1958 | 61311 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/08/1958 | 61834 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | D3495 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | D3680 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 12134 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | D3502 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/10/1958 | D3496 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/12/1958 | 61004 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/12/1958 | 61311 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 61840 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 61849 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 61862 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 61880 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 61963 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 61977 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/02/1959 | 61004 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/02/1959 | 61005 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/02/1959 | 61006 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/02/1959 | 61111 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/02/1959 | 61135 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/02/1959 | 61249 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/02/1959 | 61280 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/02/1959 | 61362 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/02/1959 | 61372 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/02/1959 | 61378 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 61840 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 61880 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 61849 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/03/1959 | D3302 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/04/1959 | 61280 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/05/1959 | 61119 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/05/1959 | 61233 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/05/1959 | 61111 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/05/1959 | 61249 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 61119 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 61233 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 64678 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 64679 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/08/1959 | 64776 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 05/10/1959 | 69672 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/10/1959 | 61373 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/10/1959 | 61135 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/11/1959 | 61311 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/11/1959 | 61003 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/11/1959 | 61005 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 46468 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 46469 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 65445 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 68526 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 68552 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 68563 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 68573 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 69613 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 69673 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 69732 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/11/1959 | 61006 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/11/1959 | 64777 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 09/11/1959 | 69613 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 61815 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 61820 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/11/1959 | 65434 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 16/11/1959 | 68643 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1959 | D2208 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1959 | D2209 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1959 | D2211 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 69730 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/12/1959 | 61361 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/12/1959 | 61336 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/12/1959 | 61004 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 69651 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 69690 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 69691 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 69708 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 68526 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 69673 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 69675 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 69730 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 69732 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 05/03/1960 | 68577 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 05/03/1960 | 68552 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 05/03/1960 | 68563 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 65389 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 65458 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/04/1960 | 61384 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/04/1960 | 65389 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 61862 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 61921 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 61942 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 61963 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/07/1960 | 64680 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 30/07/1960 | 69686 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 30/07/1960 | 69730 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/07/1960 | 64678 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 30/07/1960 | 69651 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 30/07/1960 | 69691 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/08/1960 | 68573 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 68633 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 69651 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 69694 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 69686 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 69730 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 10/11/1960 | 68577 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 68500 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 24/11/1960 | 68633 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 24/11/1960 | 69694 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 68578 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 69679 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/11/1960 | 61227 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/11/1960 | 61264 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/11/1960 | 61336 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/11/1960 | 61361 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/11/1960 | 61372 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/11/1960 | 61373 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 04/12/1960 | 68660 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/12/1960 | D5062 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 61977 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1961 | 61149 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1961 | 61226 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1961 | 61311 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1961 | 61362 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1961 | 61378 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | D2200 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 46468 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 46469 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 64679 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 64680 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 65445 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 65453 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 68500 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 68578 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 69651 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 69679 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 69690 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 69708 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 25/03/1961 | D5062 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D2553 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D2555 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D2564 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/07/1962 | D4186 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/07/1962 | D2208 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/09/1962 | D2572 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D2571 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D2573 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D2200 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D2209 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D2211 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/07/1963 | D2550 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/06/1964 | D4189 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/01/1965 | D3684 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/01/1965 | D4189 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/11/1965 | D2001 | Transfer in from: | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/11/1965 | D2003 | Transfer in from: | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/12/1965 | D2002 | Transfer in from: | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/01/1966 | D2000 | Transfer in from: | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | D2551 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | D2552 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | D2553 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | D2555 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | D2564 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/02/1966 | 61232 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D2278 | Transfer in from: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D2279 | Transfer in from: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D2280 | Transfer in from: | 70G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D2000 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D2001 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D2002 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D2003 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1966 | D2554 | Transfer out to: | 70H | Ryde (I.O.W.) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1966 | D3302 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1966 | D2277 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1966 | D3441 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | D2571 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | D2573 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | D3495 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/12/1966 | D3494 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | D2278 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1967 | D3494 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1967 | D3496 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D2277 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D2279 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D2280 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D2572 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D3298 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D3299 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D3441 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D3680 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D3684 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D4186 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester |