Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1157 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 1157 Week
» 3739 Month
» 268372 Year
» 1489937 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Plaistow


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 11/1945 1290 Snapshot 29 Manningham    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 11/1945 1360 Snapshot M18 Nottingham    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 22/06/1946 1324 Transfer in from: 22C Bath Green Park (S&D)    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 22/06/1946 2136 Transfer in from:        
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 22/06/1946 2137 Transfer in from:        
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 22/06/1946 2139 Transfer in from:        
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 22/06/1946 2146 Transfer in from:        
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 22/06/1946 2147 Transfer in from:        
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 22/06/1946 2149 Transfer in from:        
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 22/06/1946 2150 Transfer in from:        
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 22/06/1946 2151 Transfer in from:        
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 22/06/1946 2153 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 22/06/1946 2522 Transfer in from:        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 22/06/1946 7300 Transfer in from:        
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 22/06/1946 1290 Transfer out to: 13E Upminster    
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 1261 Snapshot 13E Upminster    
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 1981 Snapshot        
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 1982 Snapshot        
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 1983 Snapshot        
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 1984 Snapshot        
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 1985 Snapshot        
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 1986 Snapshot        
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 1987 Snapshot        
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 1988 Snapshot        
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 1989 Snapshot        
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 1990 Snapshot        
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 1993 Snapshot        
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 01/01/1948 2112 Snapshot        
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 01/01/1948 2113 Snapshot 13C Tilbury    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 01/01/1948 2114 Snapshot        
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 01/01/1948 2117 Snapshot        
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 01/01/1948 2124 Snapshot        
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 01/01/1948 2126 Snapshot        
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 01/01/1948 2127 Snapshot        
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 01/01/1948 2130 Snapshot        
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 01/01/1948 2131 Snapshot        
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 01/01/1948 2132 Snapshot 13C Tilbury    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 01/01/1948 2133 Snapshot 13C Tilbury    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 01/01/1948 2134 Snapshot        
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 01/01/1948 2136 Snapshot 13A Plaistow    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 01/01/1948 2136 Snapshot 13A Plaistow    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 01/01/1948 2137 Snapshot 13C Tilbury    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 01/01/1948 2139 Snapshot 13A Plaistow    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 01/01/1948 2139 Snapshot 13A Plaistow    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 01/01/1948 2141 Snapshot        
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 01/01/1948 2145 Snapshot        
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 01/01/1948 2146 Snapshot 13C Tilbury    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 01/01/1948 2147 Snapshot 13C Tilbury    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 01/01/1948 2149 Snapshot 13D Northwich    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 01/01/1948 2150 Snapshot 13D Northwich    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 01/01/1948 2151 Snapshot 13A Plaistow    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 01/01/1948 2151 Snapshot 13A Plaistow    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 01/01/1948 2152 Snapshot        
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 01/01/1948 2153 Snapshot 13D Northwich    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 01/01/1948 2156 Snapshot        
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 01/01/1948 2157 Snapshot        
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 01/01/1948 2158 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2225 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2226 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2227 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2248 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2249 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2250 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2251 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2252 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2253 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2254 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2255 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2256 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2257 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2522 Snapshot 13A Plaistow    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2522 Snapshot 13A Plaistow    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2523 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2524 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2525 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2526 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2527 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2528 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2529 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2530 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2531 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2532 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2533 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2534 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2535 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2536 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 01/01/1948 3905 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 01/01/1948 4228 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 01/01/1948 4297 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 01/01/1948 4530 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 7300 Snapshot 13A Plaistow    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 7300 Snapshot 13A Plaistow    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 7311 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 7328 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 7351 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 7458 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 7484 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 7512 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 3w/e 11/12/1948 42681 Transfer in from: 14C St Albans    
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 5w/e 16/07/1949 1987 Transfer out to: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T m/e 30/11/1949 42231 Transfer in from: 14C St Albans    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T m/e 30/11/1949 42232 Transfer in from: 14C St Albans    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T m/e 30/11/1949 42681 Transfer in from: 13A Plaistow    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T m/e 30/11/1949 42684 Transfer in from: 14C St Albans    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T m/e 30/11/1949 42687 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T m/e 30/11/1949 42681 Transfer out to: PLS Plaistow    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 24/12/1949 42681 Transfer out to: 91E To Eastern Region    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 24/12/1949 42684 Transfer out to: 91E To Eastern Region    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 25/11/1950 58045 Transfer in from: 15A Wellingborough    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 23/12/1950 58045 Transfer in from: 33A Plaistow    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 23/12/1950 58045 Transfer out to: 33A Plaistow    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 4w/e 17/02/1951 58200 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 21/02/1951 41963 Condemned      
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T w/e 10/03/1951 41931 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 5w/e 24/03/1951 47262 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 5w/e 24/03/1951 47282 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 5w/e 24/03/1951 47306 Transfer in from: 13B Devons Road (Bow)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 5w/e 24/03/1951 47312 Transfer in from: 13B Devons Road (Bow)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 5w/e 24/03/1951 47429 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 5w/e 24/03/1951 47555 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 5w/e 24/03/1951 58200 Transfer in from: 33A Plaistow    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1951 44228 Transfer out to: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1951 44530 Transfer out to: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 5w/e 24/03/1951 58200 Transfer out to: 33A Plaistow    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 19/05/1951 58045 Transfer out to: 15A Wellingborough    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 14/07/1951 42535 Transfer out to: 91X To Scottish Region    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 21/07/1951 41934 Transfer in from: 13D Northwich    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 21/07/1951 41953 Transfer in from: 13C Tilbury    
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 4w/e 21/07/1951 41980 Transfer in from: 13C Tilbury    
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 4w/e 21/07/1951 41992 Transfer in from: 13D Northwich    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 21/07/1951 41930 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 21/07/1951 41944 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 21/07/1951 41945 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 21/07/1951 41951 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 21/07/1951 41959 Transfer out to: 33C Shoeburyness    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 21/07/1951 41969 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 21/07/1951 41970 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 4w/e 21/07/1951 41981 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 4w/e 21/07/1951 41985 Transfer out to: 33C Shoeburyness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 21/07/1951 42531 Transfer out to: 33C Shoeburyness    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 21/07/1951 47300 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 18/08/1951 42190 Transfer in from:        
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 25/08/1951 41953 Condemned      
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 25/08/1951 41954 Condemned      
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T m/e 09/1951 41934 Condemned      
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 01/09/1951 41932 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 09/09/1951 42530 Transfer out to: 66D Greenock Ladyburn    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 22/09/1951 42191 Transfer in from:        
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 28/09/1951 41935 Condemned      
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 28/09/1951 41957 Condemned      
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 20/10/1951 41949 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 16/02/1952 42530 Transfer in from: 66D Greenock Ladyburn    
Steam J17 0-6-0 5w/e 16/02/1952 65533 Transfer in from: 31A Cambridge    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 22/03/1952 42530 Transfer in from: 33A Plaistow    
Steam J17 0-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 65545 Transfer in from: 31A Cambridge    
Steam J17 0-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 65566 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Steam J17 0-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 65588 Transfer in from: 31A Cambridge    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 22/03/1952 42530 Transfer out to: 33A Plaistow    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 44297 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 19/04/1952 41930 Transfer in from: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 19/04/1952 41951 Transfer in from: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 19/04/1952 41978 Transfer in from: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 4w/e 19/04/1952 41981 Transfer in from: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 4w/e 19/04/1952 41991 Transfer in from: 13D Northwich    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 19/04/1952 47300 Transfer in from: 33B Tilbury    
Steam 1142 0-6-0 4w/e 19/04/1952 58129 Transfer in from:        
Steam J17 0-6-0 4w/e 19/04/1952 65552 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 19/04/1952 41950 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 4w/e 19/04/1952 41982 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 4w/e 19/04/1952 41990 Transfer out to: 33C Shoeburyness    
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 4w/e 19/04/1952 41993 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 19/04/1952 42190 Transfer out to: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 19/04/1952 42191 Transfer out to: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 19/04/1952 42225 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 19/04/1952 42530 Transfer out to: 33C Shoeburyness    
Steam J17 0-6-0 4w/e 19/04/1952 65545 Transfer out to: 33C Shoeburyness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 21/06/1952 42535 Transfer in from: 66D Greenock Ladyburn    
Steam J68 0-6-0T 5w/e 21/06/1952 68648 Transfer in from: STR Stratford    
Steam J69 0-6-0T 5w/e 21/06/1952 8568 Transfer in from: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T w/e 23/08/1952 41930 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 15/11/1952 42230 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 5w/e 17/01/1953 41975 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 21/02/1953 58050 Condemned      
Steam J68 0-6-0T 4w/e 16/05/1953 68648 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Steam J69 0-6-0T 4w/e 25/07/1953 8568 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 30/09/1953 80069 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 09/10/1953 80070 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 21/10/1953 80071 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 03/11/1953 80072 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 13/11/1953 80073 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 27/11/1953 80074 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 10/12/1953 80075 1st Allocation        
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 19/12/1953 41952 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 23/12/1953 80076 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 12/01/1954 80077 1st Allocation        
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 23/01/1954 41950 Transfer in from: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 23/01/1954 41969 Transfer in from: 33B Tilbury    
Steam J17 0-6-0 4w/e 23/01/1954 65552 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 23/01/1954 80069 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 23/01/1954 80070 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 23/01/1954 80071 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 23/01/1954 80072 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 23/01/1954 80073 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 02/02/1954 80078 1st Allocation        
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 20/02/1954 41951 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 20/02/1954 41976 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 05/03/1954 80079 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 18/03/1954 80080 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 24/04/1954 80079 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 22/05/1954 80080 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 17/06/1954 58200 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 19/06/1954 42221 Transfer in from: 13C Tilbury    
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 4w/e 19/06/1954 58038 Condemned      
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 5w/e 24/07/1954 58087 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 23/11/1954 80096 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 09/12/1954 80097 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 22/12/1954 80098 1st Allocation        
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 6w/e 25/12/1954 58091 Transfer in from: 15A Wellingborough    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 17/01/1955 80099 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 22/01/1955 42250 Transfer out to: 34E Neasden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 22/01/1955 42251 Transfer out to: 34E Neasden    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 31/01/1955 80100 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 07/02/1955 80101 1st Allocation        
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T w/e 12/02/1955 41974 Condemned      
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 19/02/1955 11110 Transfer in from: 30F Parkeston Quay    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 19/02/1955 42231 Transfer out to: 34E Neasden    
Steam 1142 0-6-0 25/02/1955 58129 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 01/03/1955 80102 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 16/03/1955 80103 1st Allocation        
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 19/03/1955 11101 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 4w/e 19/03/1955 58197 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 19/03/1955 90443 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 19/03/1955 90526 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 19/03/1955 90668 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 19/03/1955 90709 Transfer in from: 36B Mexborough    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 19/03/1955 42248 Transfer out to: 34E Neasden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 19/03/1955 42249 Transfer out to: 34E Neasden    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 31/03/1955 80104 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 19/04/1955 80105 1st Allocation        
Diesel 04 0-6-0 5w/e 23/04/1955 11101 Transfer out to: 31B March    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 23/04/1955 42230 Transfer out to: 34E Neasden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 23/04/1955 42232 Transfer out to: 34E Neasden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 23/04/1955 42252 Transfer out to: 34E Neasden    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 3w/e 14/05/1955 90196 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 3w/e 14/05/1955 90442 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 3w/e 14/05/1955 90526 Transfer in from: 33A Plaistow    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 3w/e 14/05/1955 90653 Transfer in from: 36B Mexborough    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 3w/e 14/05/1955 42256 Transfer out to: 34E Neasden    
Steam J17 0-6-0 3w/e 14/05/1955 65533 Transfer out to: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 3w/e 14/05/1955 90443 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 3w/e 14/05/1955 90526 Transfer out to: 33A Plaistow    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 3w/e 14/05/1955 90668 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Steam J17 0-6-0 5w/e 18/06/1955 65566 Transfer out to: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam J17 0-6-0 5w/e 18/06/1955 65588 Transfer out to: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 4w/e 16/07/1955 58087 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 5w/e 23/07/1955 90256 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 5w/e 23/07/1955 90709 Transfer out to: 35A New England    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 20/08/1955 11110 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 20/08/1955 42253 Transfer out to: 34E Neasden    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 5w/e 17/12/1955 47282 Transfer out to: 35C Spital Bridge    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 5w/e 17/12/1955 47306 Transfer out to: 35C Spital Bridge    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 5w/e 17/12/1955 47429 Transfer out to: 35A New England    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 5w/e 17/12/1955 47458 Transfer out to: 35A New England    
Steam N7 0-6-2T 5w/e 21/01/1956 69691 Transfer in from: 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam N7 0-6-2T 5w/e 21/01/1956 69695 Transfer in from: 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 02/03/1956 80131 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 15/03/1956 80132 1st Allocation        
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 24/03/1956 58062 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 28/03/1956 80133 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 20/04/1956 80134 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 30/04/1956 80135 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 11/05/1956 80136 1st Allocation        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 25/05/1956 47300 Transfer out to: 35B Grantham    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 4w/e 22/09/1956 58091 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam N7 0-6-2T 4w/e 22/09/1956 69691 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam N7 0-6-2T 4w/e 22/09/1956 69695 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 15/12/1956 41945 Transfer in from: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 15/12/1956 41946 Transfer in from: 13C Tilbury    
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 4w/e 15/12/1956 41982 Transfer in from: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 4w/e 15/12/1956 41990 Transfer in from: 33C Shoeburyness    
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 4w/e 15/12/1956 41993 Transfer in from: 33B Tilbury    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 15/12/1956 42218 Transfer in from: 13C Tilbury    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 15/12/1956 42219 Transfer in from: 13C Tilbury    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 15/12/1956 42220 Transfer in from: 13C Tilbury    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 15/12/1956 42223 Transfer in from: 13D Northwich    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 15/12/1956 42224 Transfer in from: 13D Northwich    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 15/12/1956 41969 Transfer out to: 33C Shoeburyness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 15/12/1956 42532 Transfer out to: 33C Shoeburyness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 15/12/1956 42533 Transfer out to: 33C Shoeburyness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 15/12/1956 42534 Transfer out to: 33C Shoeburyness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 15/12/1956 42535 Transfer out to: 33C Shoeburyness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 15/12/1956 42536 Transfer out to: 33C Shoeburyness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 15/12/1956 42687 Transfer out to: 33C Shoeburyness    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 15/12/1956 47311 Transfer out to: 35C Spital Bridge    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 15/12/1956 80074 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 15/12/1956 80075 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 15/12/1956 80076 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 15/12/1956 80077 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 15/12/1956 80078 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 19/12/1956 41942 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 07/04/1957 64883 Transfer in from: 35C Spital Bridge    
Steam J39 0-6-0 07/04/1957 64891 Transfer in from: 35C Spital Bridge    
Steam J39 0-6-0 07/04/1957 64896 Transfer in from: 35C Spital Bridge    
Steam J39 0-6-0 07/04/1957 64901 Transfer in from: 35C Spital Bridge    
Steam J39 0-6-0 07/04/1957 64951 Transfer in from: 35C Spital Bridge    
Steam J39 0-6-0 07/04/1957 64981 Transfer in from: 35C Spital Bridge    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 4w/e 18/05/1957 58197 Transfer out to: 55D Royston    
Steam J39 0-6-0 26/05/1957 64953 Transfer in from: PKS Parkeston Quay    
Steam J39 0-6-0 26/05/1957 64954 Transfer in from: 35C Spital Bridge    
Steam J39 0-6-0 26/05/1957 64956 Transfer in from: 36A Doncaster    
Steam J39 0-6-0 26/05/1957 64957 Transfer in from: IPS Ipswich    
Steam J39 0-6-0 26/05/1957 64883 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam J39 0-6-0 26/05/1957 64891 Transfer out to: 32B Ipswich    
Steam J39 0-6-0 26/05/1957 64896 Transfer out to: 30F Parkeston Quay    
Steam J39 0-6-0 26/05/1957 64901 Transfer out to: 35C Spital Bridge    
Steam J39 0-6-0 02/06/1957 64952 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam J39 0-6-0 02/06/1957 64981 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 09/04/1958 41988 Condemned      
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 09/04/1958 41989 Condemned      
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 02/05/1958 41980 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 08/06/1958 64958 Transfer in from: 31A Cambridge    
Steam J39 0-6-0 08/06/1958 64962 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Steam J39 0-6-0 08/06/1958 64968 Transfer in from: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam J39 0-6-0 29/06/1958 64965 Transfer in from: 35C Spital Bridge    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 5w/e 15/11/1958 41969 Transfer in from: 33C Shoeburyness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 15/11/1958 42218 Transfer out to: 33C Shoeburyness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 15/11/1958 42219 Transfer out to: 33C Shoeburyness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 15/11/1958 42220 Transfer out to: 33C Shoeburyness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 15/11/1958 42221 Transfer out to: 33C Shoeburyness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 15/11/1958 42223 Transfer out to: 33C Shoeburyness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 15/11/1958 42224 Transfer out to: 33C Shoeburyness    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 5w/e 15/11/1958 90442 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T w/e 31/01/1959 41969 Transfer out to: 31F Spital Bridge    
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 16/02/1959 41945 Condemned      
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 17/02/1959 41946 Condemned      
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 17/02/1959 41948 Condemned      
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 17/02/1959 41950 Condemned      
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 17/02/1959 41978 Condemned      
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 19/02/1959 41982 Condemned      
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 19/02/1959 41983 Condemned      
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 19/02/1959 41984 Condemned      
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 19/02/1959 41986 Condemned      
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 19/02/1959 41990 Condemned      
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 19/02/1959 41991 Condemned      
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 19/02/1959 41992 Condemned      
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 19/02/1959 41993 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 10/10/1959 90093 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 10/10/1959 90106 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 10/10/1959 90244 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 10/10/1959 90514 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Steam J39 0-6-0 30/10/1959 64953 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam J39 0-6-0 31/10/1959 64951 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam J39 0-6-0 31/10/1959 64952 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam J39 0-6-0 31/10/1959 64954 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam J39 0-6-0 31/10/1959 64956 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam J39 0-6-0 31/10/1959 64957 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam J39 0-6-0 31/10/1959 64958 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam J39 0-6-0 31/10/1959 64962 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam J39 0-6-0 31/10/1959 64965 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam J39 0-6-0 31/10/1959 64968 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T w/e 07/11/1959 41981 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/11/1959 42226 Transfer out to: 33C Shoeburyness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/11/1959 42227 Transfer out to: 33C Shoeburyness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/11/1959 42254 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/11/1959 42255 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/11/1959 42257 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 07/11/1959 47262 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 07/11/1959 47312 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 07/11/1959 47328 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 07/11/1959 47351 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 07/11/1959 47484 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 07/11/1959 47512 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 07/11/1959 47555 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 07/11/1959 80096 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 07/11/1959 80097 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 07/11/1959 80098 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 07/11/1959 80099 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 07/11/1959 80100 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 07/11/1959 80101 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 07/11/1959 80102 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 07/11/1959 80103 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 07/11/1959 80104 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 07/11/1959 80105 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 07/11/1959 80131 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 07/11/1959 80132 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 07/11/1959 80133 Transfer out to: 33C Shoeburyness    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 07/11/1959 80134 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 07/11/1959 80135 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 07/11/1959 80136 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 07/11/1959 90093 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 07/11/1959 90106 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 07/11/1959 90196 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 07/11/1959 90244 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 07/11/1959 90256 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 07/11/1959 90514 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 07/11/1959 90653 Transfer out to: 33B Tilbury    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 22/07/1961 43905 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 29/09/1961 42524 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 18/06/1962 42522 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 18/06/1962 42523 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 18/06/1962 42525 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 18/06/1962 42526 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 18/06/1962 42527 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 18/06/1962 42528 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 18/06/1962 42529 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 29/12/1962 90526 Condemned