Depot: Reddish
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Electric | EM2 | Co-Co | on | 01/06/1954 | 27000 | Transfer in from: | 36B.1 | Wath | ||
Electric | EM1 | Bo+Bo | on | 12/06/1954 | 26001 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Electric | EM1 | Bo+Bo | on | 12/06/1954 | 26002 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Electric | EM1 | Bo+Bo | on | 12/06/1954 | 26003 | Transfer in from: | 36B.1 | Wath | ||
Electric | EM1 | Bo+Bo | on | 12/06/1954 | 26004 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Electric | EM2 | Co-Co | on | 05/08/1954 | 27003 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Electric | EM2 | Co-Co | on | 18/09/1954 | 27004 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Electric | EM2 | Co-Co | on | 11/12/1954 | 27005 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Electric | EM2 | Co-Co | on | 31/12/1954 | 27006 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Electric | EM1 | Bo+Bo | on | 21/07/1967 | 26001 | To Store | ||||
Electric | EM1 | Bo+Bo | 09/1967 | 26001 | Reinstated | 98S | ||||
Electric | EM1 | Bo+Bo | on | 21/07/1968 | 26002 | To Store | ||||
Electric | EM1 | Bo+Bo | m/e | 09/1968 | 26002 | Reinstated | 98S | |||
Electric | EM2 | Co-Co | on | 05/10/1968 | 27000 | Condemned | ||||
Electric | EM2 | Co-Co | on | 05/10/1968 | 27003 | Condemned | ||||
Electric | EM2 | Co-Co | on | 05/10/1968 | 27004 | Condemned | ||||
Electric | EM2 | Co-Co | on | 05/10/1968 | 27005 | Condemned | ||||
Electric | EM2 | Co-Co | on | 05/10/1968 | 27006 | Condemned | ||||
Electric | EM1 | Bo+Bo | on | 28/11/1971 | 26037 | Reinstated | ||||
Electric | EM1 | Bo+Bo | on | 06/02/1977 | 76004 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Electric | EM1 | Bo+Bo | m/e | 07/1977 | 76002 | To Store | ||||
Electric | EM1 | Bo+Bo | on | 14/08/1977 | 76004 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Electric | EM1 | Bo+Bo | 4w/e | 09/04/1978 | 76054 | Reinstated | 98S | |||
Electric | EM1 | Bo+Bo | on | 06/1978 | 76004 | Condemned | ||||
Electric | EM1 | Bo+Bo | on | 22/08/1980 | 76036 | To Store | ||||
Electric | EM1 | Bo+Bo | on | 02/11/1980 | 76001 | Condemned | ||||
Electric | EM1 | Bo+Bo | on | 07/1981 | 76037 | Condemned | ||||
Electric | EM1 | Bo+Bo | on | 07/1981 | 76054 | Condemned |