Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 945 Today
» 1090 Yesterday
» 3260 Week
» 31218 Month
» 65860 Year
» 1287425 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Redhill


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1406 Snapshot        
Steam E 4-4-0 01/01/1948 1587 Snapshot HOR Horsham    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 01/01/1948 1728 Snapshot        
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 01/01/1948 1729 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1815 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1816 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1817 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1818 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1843 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1849 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1851 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1852 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1858 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1863 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1864 Snapshot        
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1895 Snapshot        
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1896 Snapshot        
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1897 Snapshot        
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1898 Snapshot        
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1899 Snapshot        
Steam Small Vulcans 0-6-0 01/01/1948 2435 Snapshot        
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 01/01/1948 2450 Snapshot        
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 2507 Snapshot        
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 2517 Snapshot        
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 01/01/1948 2541 Snapshot        
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 2560 Snapshot        
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 2568 Snapshot        
Steam E5X 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 2586 Snapshot        
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 2592 Snapshot        
Steam Q 0-6-0 01/01/1948 533 Snapshot        
Steam Q 0-6-0 01/01/1948 537 Snapshot        
Steam Q 0-6-0 01/01/1948 538 Snapshot        
Steam Q 0-6-0 01/01/1948 539 Snapshot BM Bournemouth    
Steam Q 0-6-0 01/01/1948 545 Snapshot        
Steam Q 0-6-0 01/01/1948 546 Snapshot        
Steam Q 0-6-0 01/01/1948 547 Snapshot        
Steam E 4-4-0 4w/e 02/01/1948 1587 Transfer in from: RED Redhill    
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 02/01/1948 2592 Transfer in from: RED Redhill    
Steam Q 0-6-0 4w/e 02/01/1948 545 Transfer in from: RED Redhill    
Steam Q 0-6-0 4w/e 02/01/1948 546 Transfer in from: RED Redhill    
Steam E 4-4-0 4w/e 02/01/1948 1587 Transfer out to: RED Redhill    
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 02/01/1948 2592 Transfer out to: RED Redhill    
Steam Q 0-6-0 4w/e 02/01/1948 545 Transfer out to: RED Redhill    
Steam Q 0-6-0 4w/e 02/01/1948 546 Transfer out to: RED Redhill    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 01/04/1948 1859 Transfer in from: TON Tonbridge    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 01/04/1948 1862 Transfer in from: TON Tonbridge    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 01/04/1948 1815 Transfer out to: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 01/04/1948 1816 Transfer out to: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam Small Vulcans 0-6-0 08/05/1948 2435 Condemned      
Steam E 4-4-0 7w/e 01/06/1948 1273 Transfer in from: HOR Horsham    
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 7w/e 01/06/1948 2346 Transfer in from: BTN Brighton    
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 7w/e 01/06/1948 2347 Transfer in from: BTN Brighton    
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 7w/e 01/06/1948 2590 Transfer in from: TWW Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 7w/e 01/06/1948 1406 Transfer out to: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam Q 0-6-0 7w/e 01/06/1948 545 Transfer out to: HOR Horsham    
Steam Q 0-6-0 7w/e 01/06/1948 546 Transfer out to: HOR Horsham    
Steam Q 0-6-0 7w/e 01/06/1948 547 Transfer out to: 3B Three Bridges    
Steam E5X 0-6-2T 8w/e 01/08/1948 32586 To Store      
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 8w/e 01/08/1948 2350 Transfer in from: NORW Norwood Junction    
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 8w/e 01/08/1948 2351 Transfer in from: NORW Norwood Junction    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 8w/e 01/08/1948 70811 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 8w/e 01/08/1948 77296 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 8w/e 01/08/1948 78666 Transfer in from:        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 8w/e 01/08/1948 1843 Transfer out to: AFD Ashford    
Steam Q 0-6-0 8w/e 01/08/1948 533 Transfer out to: NORW Norwood Junction    
Steam Q 0-6-0 8w/e 01/08/1948 537 Transfer out to: NORW Norwood Junction    
Steam Q 0-6-0 8w/e 01/08/1948 538 Transfer out to: NORW Norwood Junction    
Steam Q 0-6-0 8w/e 01/08/1948 539 Transfer out to: NORW Norwood Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 30/06/1949 31843 Transfer in from: AFD Ashford    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 30/06/1949 31844 Transfer in from: AFD Ashford    
Steam E 4-4-0 4w/e 30/06/1949 1273 Transfer out to: FAV Faversham    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 17/06/1950 31900 Transfer in from: BTN Brighton    
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 4w/e 17/06/1950 32346 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 4w/e 17/06/1950 32347 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 31729 Transfer out to: 73D Gillingham (Kent)    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 07/10/1950 32512 Transfer in from: TWW Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 31899 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 31900 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 31488 Transfer in from: TON Tonbridge    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 31490 Transfer in from:        
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 08/12/1950 32568 Transfer in from: RED Redhill    
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 08/12/1950 32571 Transfer in from: HOR Horsham    
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 08/12/1950 32593 Transfer in from: 3B Three Bridges    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 31859 Transfer out to: 74C Dover    
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 08/12/1950 32568 Transfer out to: 75B Redhill    
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 08/12/1950 32592 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 05/02/1951 31309 Transfer in from: FAV Faversham    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 05/02/1951 31310 Transfer in from: FAV Faversham    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 31860 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 31861 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 90354 Transfer in from:        
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 31488 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 31490 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 31843 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 31844 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 05/02/1951 32568 Transfer out to: 71D Fratton    
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 05/02/1951 32571 Transfer out to: 75G Eastbourne    
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 05/02/1951 32593 Transfer out to: 75G Eastbourne    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 20/03/1951 31899 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 20/03/1951 31900 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 20/03/1951 31895 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 11/04/1951 31866 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 11/04/1951 31867 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 11/04/1951 31868 Transfer in from: RDG Reading (S.R.)    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 11/04/1951 31869 Transfer in from: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 11/04/1951 31849 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 11/04/1951 31851 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 11/04/1951 31852 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 11/04/1951 32590 Transfer out to: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31899 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31900 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 32448 Transfer in from: BA Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 32451 Transfer in from: 3B Three Bridges    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31899 Transfer out to: 75B Redhill    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31900 Transfer out to: 75B Redhill    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 32541 Transfer out to: 75G Eastbourne    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 31896 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam E 4-4-0 m/e 07/1951 31587 Condemned      
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 1577 Transfer in from: AFD Ashford    
Steam S15 4-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 30835 Transfer in from: FEL Feltham    
Steam S15 4-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 30836 Transfer in from: FEL Feltham    
Steam S15 4-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 30837 Transfer in from: FEL Feltham    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31586 Transfer in from: 73D Gillingham (Kent)    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31591 Transfer in from: 73E Faversham    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31631 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31638 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31817 Transfer out to: 74C Dover    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31818 Transfer out to: 74C Dover    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31858 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31860 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31861 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31862 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31899 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31900 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 90354 Transfer out to: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 90360 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 90641 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 31894 Transfer in from: BTN Brighton    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 31895 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 31896 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 31631 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 31638 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 19/03/1952 32507 Transfer in from: RED Redhill    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 19/03/1952 32507 Transfer out to: 75B Redhill    
Steam H 0-4-4T 9w/e 30/06/1952 31311 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 8w/e 07/10/1952 80018 Transfer in from: 75G Eastbourne    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 8w/e 07/10/1952 80019 Transfer in from: 75G Eastbourne    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 8w/e 07/10/1952 32517 Transfer out to: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam H 0-4-4T 5w/e 11/12/1952 31307 Transfer in from: 73D Gillingham (Kent)    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 5w/e 14/02/1953 31638 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam D1 4-4-0 5w/e 14/02/1953 31735 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam D1 4-4-0 5w/e 14/02/1953 31739 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam D1 4-4-0 5w/e 14/02/1953 31749 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 5w/e 14/02/1953 31805 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 5w/e 14/02/1953 31863 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 5w/e 14/02/1953 31864 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 14/02/1953 80018 Transfer out to: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 14/02/1953 80019 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 m/e 05/1953 31728 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 26/05/1953 31856 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 26/05/1953 31862 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 26/05/1953 31864 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 4w/e 26/05/1953 31586 Transfer out to: 70E Reading (S.R.)    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 31863 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 8w/e 20/07/1953 32571 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 31638 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Steam D1 4-4-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 31735 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam D1 4-4-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 31739 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam D1 4-4-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 31749 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 31805 Transfer out to: 71D Fratton    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 31856 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 01/10/1953 31550 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 01/10/1953 31551 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 01/10/1953 31899 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 01/10/1953 31900 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 01/10/1953 31310 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 10/12/1953 30022 Transfer in from: GFD Guildford    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 10/12/1953 30123 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 10/12/1953 30245 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 10/12/1953 30377 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 10/12/1953 42068 Transfer in from: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 10/12/1953 42077 Transfer in from: 74C Dover    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 10/12/1953 31551 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 10/12/1953 32571 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 30/12/1953 31551 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 30/12/1953 30022 Transfer out to: 70E Reading (S.R.)    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 08/02/1954 30123 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 08/02/1954 30245 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 08/02/1954 30377 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 4w/e 08/02/1954 31591 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 08/02/1954 42068 Transfer out to: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 08/02/1954 42077 Transfer out to: 74C Dover    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 8w/e 13/05/1954 31610 Transfer in from: RDG Reading (S.R.)    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 8w/e 13/05/1954 31611 Transfer in from: RDG Reading (S.R.)    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 8w/e 13/05/1954 31612 Transfer in from: 70E Reading (S.R.)    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 8w/e 13/05/1954 31614 Transfer in from: GFD Guildford    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 8w/e 13/05/1954 31615 Transfer in from: RDG Reading (S.R.)    
Steam H 0-4-4T 8w/e 13/05/1954 31551 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam H 0-4-4T 6w/e 18/06/1954 31550 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 18/06/1954 31900 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 06/11/1954 31610 Transfer out to: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam H 0-4-4T w/e 06/11/1954 31311 Condemned      
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 4w/e 11/12/1954 31075 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 4w/e 11/12/1954 31591 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 9w/e 08/02/1955 31591 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 21/04/1955 76053 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 26/04/1955 76054 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 29/04/1955 76055 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 05/1955 76056 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 05/1955 76057 1st Allocation        
Steam H 0-4-4T 3w/e 09/05/1955 31263 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 3w/e 09/05/1955 31896 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 3w/e 09/05/1955 31897 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 3w/e 09/05/1955 31898 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 06/1955 76058 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 06/1955 76059 1st Allocation        
Steam H 0-4-4T m/e 06/1955 31309 Condemned      
Steam H 0-4-4T 6w/e 21/06/1955 31319 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 31611 Transfer out to: 70F Fratton    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 31614 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 31615 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 31894 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 31895 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 31899 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 07/1955 76060 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 07/1955 76061 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 07/1955 76062 1st Allocation        
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 5w/e 12/08/1955 31075 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 5w/e 16/09/1955 31577 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 10/10/1955 31817 Transfer in from: 74C Dover    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 10/10/1955 31319 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 10/10/1955 31612 Transfer out to: 70E Reading (S.R.)    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 10/10/1955 32512 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam H 0-4-4T 7w/e 19/12/1955 31307 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam H 0-4-4T 6w/e 15/06/1956 31263 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 7w/e 27/08/1956 76009 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 7w/e 27/08/1956 76014 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 3w/e 17/11/1956 32448 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 6w/e 25/01/1957 76009 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 6w/e 25/01/1957 76014 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 7w/e 08/10/1957 32560 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 22/03/1958 32507 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31861 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31870 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31871 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31872 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 76059 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 76060 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 76061 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 76062 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam S15 4-6-0 5w/e 18/07/1959 30847 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 15/08/1959 90317 Transfer out to: 8D Widnes    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 5w/e 26/11/1959 31850 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 5w/e 26/11/1959 31851 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 5w/e 26/11/1959 31852 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 5w/e 26/11/1959 76056 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 5w/e 26/11/1959 76057 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 5w/e 26/11/1959 76058 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 09/02/1960 31616 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 09/02/1960 31799 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 09/02/1960 31807 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 06/05/1960 30914 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 06/05/1960 30915 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 06/05/1960 30916 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 06/05/1960 76053 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 06/05/1960 76054 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 06/05/1960 76055 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 4w/e 24/11/1960 32450 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 10/02/1961 31819 Transfer in from: DOV Dover    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 10/02/1961 31820 Transfer in from: DOV Dover    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 m/e 10/02/1961 32552 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 m/e 10/02/1961 32553 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 5w/e 18/03/1961 32552 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 5w/e 18/03/1961 32553 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 m/e 07/1961 30914 Condemned      
Steam S15 4-6-0 5w/e 06/07/1961 30837 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 5w/e 06/07/1961 31819 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 5w/e 06/07/1961 31820 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 5w/e 06/07/1961 32451 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 7w/e 23/08/1961 30924 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 04/01/1962 30911 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 w/e 13/01/1962 30924 Condemned      
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 01/02/1962 30930 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 w/e 24/11/1962 32350 Condemned      
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 w/e 24/11/1962 32351 Condemned      
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 17/12/1962 30911 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 17/12/1962 30916 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 17/12/1962 30930 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 17/12/1962 31616 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 17/12/1962 31799 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 17/12/1962 31807 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 23/12/1962 30915 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 05/1963 31861 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 05/1963 31872 Condemned      
Steam S15 4-6-0 4w/e 24/06/1963 30835 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam S15 4-6-0 4w/e 24/06/1963 30836 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam S15 4-6-0 4w/e 24/06/1963 30847 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 07/1963 31863 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 07/1963 31867 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 22/07/1963 31400 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 22/07/1963 31411 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 22/07/1963 31824 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 19/08/1963 31825 Transfer in from: 75D Stewarts Lane    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 09/1963 31825 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 09/1963 31851 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 09/1963 31852 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 16/09/1963 31410 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 16/09/1963 31412 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 16/09/1963 31823 Transfer in from:        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 16/09/1963 31827 Transfer in from: 75D Stewarts Lane    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 10/1963 31824 Condemned      
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 14/10/1963 31797 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 11/1963 31871 Condemned      
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 m/e 01/1964 31797 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 01/1964 31817 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 01/1964 31850 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 01/1964 31864 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 01/1964 31868 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 31828 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 31831 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 31873 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T m/e 06/01/1964 80031 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T m/e 06/01/1964 80032 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T m/e 06/01/1964 80033 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T m/e 06/01/1964 80034 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T m/e 06/01/1964 80068 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T m/e 06/01/1964 80084 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T m/e 06/01/1964 80085 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T m/e 06/01/1964 80088 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T m/e 06/01/1964 80089 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T m/e 06/01/1964 80094 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T m/e 06/01/1964 80138 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T m/e 06/01/1964 80139 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T m/e 06/01/1964 80140 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T m/e 06/01/1964 80141 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T m/e 06/01/1964 80142 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T m/e 06/01/1964 80144 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T m/e 06/01/1964 80145 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T m/e 06/01/1964 80149 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T m/e 06/01/1964 80151 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T m/e 06/01/1964 80152 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T m/e 06/01/1964 80153 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 31410 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 31412 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 31869 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 04/1964 31870 Condemned      
Steam Q 0-6-0 4w/e 25/05/1964 30531 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Q 0-6-0 4w/e 25/05/1964 30543 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 06/1964 31400 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 06/1964 31827 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 22/06/1964 31405 Transfer in from: 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 22/06/1964 31816 Transfer in from: 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 22/06/1964 80011 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 22/06/1964 80019 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Q 0-6-0 m/e 07/1964 30531 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 09/1964 31828 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 20/09/1964 80031 Condemned      
Steam Q 0-6-0 m/e 12/1964 30543 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 31405 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 31411 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 31816 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 31831 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 31862 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 31866 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 31873 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 07/03/1965 80149 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 07/03/1965 80153 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 15/03/1965 80138 Transfer out to: 70F Bournemouth    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 15/03/1965 80139 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 08/06/1965 80011 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 08/06/1965 80019 Transfer out to: 70F Bournemouth    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 08/06/1965 80032 Transfer out to: 70F Bournemouth    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 08/06/1965 80033 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 08/06/1965 80034 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 08/06/1965 80068 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 08/06/1965 80085 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 08/06/1965 80089 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 08/06/1965 80094 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 08/06/1965 80140 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 08/06/1965 80141 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 08/06/1965 80142 Transfer out to: 70E Salisbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 08/06/1965 80144 Transfer out to: 70E Salisbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 08/06/1965 80145 Transfer out to: 70E Salisbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 08/06/1965 80151 Transfer out to: 70E Salisbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 08/06/1965 80152 Transfer out to: 70E Salisbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 13/06/1965 80084 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 13/06/1965 80088 Condemned