Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1892 |
1266 |
Snapshot |
20 |
Buxton (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1892 |
1267 |
Snapshot |
25 |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1892 |
1268 |
Snapshot |
25 |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1892 |
1269 |
Snapshot |
25 |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1892 |
1270 |
Snapshot |
3W |
Walsall Pleck |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1892 |
1271 |
Snapshot |
3W |
Walsall Pleck |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1892 |
1272 |
Snapshot |
3W |
Walsall Pleck |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1892 |
1273 |
Snapshot |
3W |
Walsall Pleck |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1892 |
1274 |
Snapshot |
8 |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1892 |
1275 |
Snapshot |
8 |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1892 |
1276 |
Snapshot |
8 |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1892 |
1277 |
Snapshot |
8 |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1892 |
1278 |
Snapshot |
8 |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1892 |
1279 |
Snapshot |
8B |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1892 |
1280 |
Snapshot |
3W |
Walsall Pleck |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1892 |
1281 |
Snapshot |
3W |
Walsall Pleck |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1892 |
1730 |
Snapshot |
8 |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1892 |
1733 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
02/1895 |
2237 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
02/1895 |
2255 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
1266 |
Snapshot |
29 |
Manningham |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
1267 |
Snapshot |
13 |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
1268 |
Snapshot |
13 |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
1269 |
Snapshot |
3W |
Walsall Pleck |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
1270 |
Snapshot |
3W |
Walsall Pleck |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
1271 |
Snapshot |
3W |
Walsall Pleck |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
1272 |
Snapshot |
3B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
1273 |
Snapshot |
3W |
Walsall Pleck |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
1274 |
Snapshot |
3W |
Walsall Pleck |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
1275 |
Snapshot |
3W |
Walsall Pleck |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
1276 |
Snapshot |
3W |
Walsall Pleck |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
1277 |
Snapshot |
3W |
Walsall Pleck |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
1278 |
Snapshot |
3W |
Walsall Pleck |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
1279 |
Snapshot |
3B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
1280 |
Snapshot |
3B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
1281 |
Snapshot |
3B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
6 |
0-4-4T |
|
01/1899 |
147 |
Snapshot |
16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
1730 |
Snapshot |
3B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
1733 |
Snapshot |
3B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
2237 |
Snapshot |
8 |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
2255 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
2255 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
6 |
0-4-4T |
|
12/1902 |
147 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
6 |
0-4-4T |
|
12/1902 |
147 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1902 |
2255 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1902 |
2255 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
6 |
0-4-4T |
|
05/1908 |
1235 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
6 |
0-4-4T |
|
05/1908 |
1235 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1243 |
Snapshot |
3W |
Walsall Pleck |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1244 |
Snapshot |
3W |
Walsall Pleck |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1245 |
Snapshot |
3W |
Walsall Pleck |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1246 |
Snapshot |
3B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1247 |
Snapshot |
3W |
Walsall Pleck |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1248 |
Snapshot |
3W |
Walsall Pleck |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1249 |
Snapshot |
3W |
Walsall Pleck |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1250 |
Snapshot |
3W |
Walsall Pleck |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1251 |
Snapshot |
3W |
Walsall Pleck |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1252 |
Snapshot |
3W |
Walsall Pleck |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1253 |
Snapshot |
3B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1254 |
Snapshot |
3B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1255 |
Snapshot |
3B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1322 |
Snapshot |
3B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1323 |
Snapshot |
3B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1324 |
Snapshot |
3B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1325 |
Snapshot |
3B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1326 |
Snapshot |
3B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1327 |
Snapshot |
3R |
Redditch |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1328 |
Snapshot |
3W |
Walsall Pleck |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1386 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1386 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1387 |
Snapshot |
5 |
Brecon |
|
|
Steam |
6 |
0-4-4T |
|
04/1914 |
1235 |
Snapshot |
18 |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1243 |
Snapshot |
18 |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1244 |
Snapshot |
28 |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1245 |
Snapshot |
28 |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1246 |
Snapshot |
18 |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1247 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1247 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1248 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1248 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1249 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1249 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1250 |
Snapshot |
25 |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1251 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1251 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1252 |
Snapshot |
14 |
Bedford |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1253 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1253 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1254 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1255 |
Snapshot |
25 |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1322 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1322 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1323 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1323 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1324 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1324 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1325 |
Snapshot |
18 |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1326 |
Snapshot |
23 |
Hasland |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1327 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1327 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1328 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1328 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1386 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1386 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1387 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1387 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1391 |
Snapshot |
25 |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
|
Steam |
6 |
0-4-4T |
|
12/1921 |
1226 |
Snapshot |
4 |
Worcester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1921 |
1247 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1921 |
1247 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1921 |
1248 |
Snapshot |
2 |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1921 |
1249 |
Snapshot |
2 |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1921 |
1251 |
Snapshot |
4 |
Worcester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1921 |
1253 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1921 |
1253 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1921 |
1322 |
Snapshot |
4 |
Worcester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1921 |
1323 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1921 |
1323 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1921 |
1324 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1921 |
1324 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1921 |
1327 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1921 |
1327 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1921 |
1328 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1921 |
1328 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1921 |
1335 |
Snapshot |
8 |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1921 |
1386 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1921 |
1386 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1921 |
1387 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1921 |
1387 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1921 |
1391 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1921 |
1391 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
4w/e |
12/07/1925 |
1323 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
4w/e |
12/07/1925 |
1335 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6 |
0-4-4T |
|
03/1930 |
1226 |
Snapshot |
32 |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
03/1930 |
1247 |
Snapshot |
20 |
Buxton (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
03/1930 |
1253 |
Snapshot |
WD |
LNWR Western Division |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
03/1930 |
1324 |
Snapshot |
7 |
Gloucester Barnwood |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
03/1930 |
1327 |
Snapshot |
20 |
Buxton (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
03/1930 |
1328 |
Snapshot |
8 |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
03/1930 |
1386 |
Snapshot |
7 |
Gloucester Barnwood |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
03/1930 |
1387 |
Snapshot |
8 |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
03/1930 |
1391 |
Snapshot |
8 |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
09/1933 |
1348 |
Snapshot |
M18 |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
09/1933 |
1361 |
Snapshot |
7 |
Gloucester Barnwood |
|
|
Steam |
2000 |
0-6-4T |
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
2001 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2000 |
0-6-4T |
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
2003 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2000 |
0-6-4T |
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
2018 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1400 |
2-4-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
20254 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2000 |
0-6-4T |
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
2029 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
4250 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
3621 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
4250 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/04/1936 |
2771 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
29/04/1944 |
4304 |
Transfer in from: |
20D |
Normanton |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
11/1945 |
1338 |
Snapshot |
8 |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
11/1945 |
1348 |
Snapshot |
22C |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
11/1945 |
1361 |
Snapshot |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
11/1945 |
1367 |
Snapshot |
M10 |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
11/1945 |
1411 |
Snapshot |
30 |
Skipton |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
4w/e |
05/10/1947 |
1338 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1029 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1035 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1046 |
Snapshot |
20G |
Hellifield |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
115 |
Snapshot |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
117 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1377 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1699 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
175 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1377 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1777 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1121 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1856 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1121 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1879 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2326 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2337 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2685 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2754 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2758 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2764 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2771 |
Snapshot |
20B |
Stourton |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2784 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2790 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2793 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2799 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2818 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2822 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2824 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2825 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2826 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2827 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2829 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2850 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2857 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2890 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2900 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2903 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3201 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3203 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3210 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3223 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3225 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3284 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3321 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3336 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3339 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3374 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3433 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3435 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3441 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3443 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3484 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3490 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3491 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3531 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3540 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3544 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3594 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3620 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3621 |
Snapshot |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3621 |
Snapshot |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3624 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3627 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3644 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3667 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3673 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3674 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3680 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3684 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3686 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3690 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3698 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3812 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3843 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3845 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1808 |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
385 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3858 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3879 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3891 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3911 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3912 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3940 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3941 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3946 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3949 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3951 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3986 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4026 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4049 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4084 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4088 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4092 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4108 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4137 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4139 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4145 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4176 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4184 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4185 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4186 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4190 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4200 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4203 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4207 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4213 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4224 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4248 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4317 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4406 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4413 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4427 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4475 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4515 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4516 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4520 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4524 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4525 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4538 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4545 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4567 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4571 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4580 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4583 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4584 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4591 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
463 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4805 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4806 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4810 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4811 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4813 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4814 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4840 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4842 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4852 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
486 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4919 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4920 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
493 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4966 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
511 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
512 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5186 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5265 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5268 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5269 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5273 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5274 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5447 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2781 |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
715 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7273 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7276 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2781 |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
745 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7638 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7639 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8010 |
Snapshot |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8093 |
Snapshot |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8336 |
Snapshot |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8337 |
Snapshot |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8351 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8389 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8400 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8401 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8402 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8403 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8405 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8417 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8420 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8424 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8669 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8687 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
928 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9329 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9360 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9377 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
97 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
4847 |
Transfer in from: |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
4848 |
Transfer in from: |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
2781 |
4-4-0 |
on |
17/01/1948 |
715 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
3939 |
Transfer in from: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
2793 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
2850 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
4806 |
Transfer out to: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/04/1948 |
4776 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
17/04/1948 |
8388 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
17/04/1948 |
8400 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
4840 |
Transfer out to: |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
8389 |
Transfer out to: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
4-4-0 |
on |
05/06/1948 |
1029 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
9329 |
Transfer out to: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
9360 |
Transfer out to: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
9377 |
Transfer out to: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
7432 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
4010 |
Transfer in from: |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
4023 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
4150 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
4187 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
4263 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
4418 |
Transfer in from: |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
8027 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
3507 |
Transfer in from: |
22B |
Gloucester Barnwood |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
3791 |
Transfer in from: |
22B |
Gloucester Barnwood |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
43214 |
Transfer in from: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
4776 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
4847 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
4848 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
3257 |
Transfer in from: |
22B |
Gloucester Barnwood |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
3759 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
43246 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
43263 |
Transfer in from: |
22B |
Gloucester Barnwood |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
43762 |
Transfer in from: |
16D |
Mansfield |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
43800 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
47545 |
Transfer in from: |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
48612 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
48748 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
8539 |
Transfer in from: |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
8741 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
8743 |
Transfer in from: |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
4-4-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
41035 |
Transfer out to: |
15D |
Bedford |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
43014 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
43017 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
43019 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
8743 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
3968 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
4289 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
43203 |
Transfer out to: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
43263 |
Transfer out to: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
05/02/1949 |
493 |
Transfer out to: |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
19/02/1949 |
7558 |
Transfer in from: |
13B |
Devons Road (Bow) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
7558 |
Transfer out to: |
13B |
Devons Road (Bow) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
05/03/1949 |
48700 |
Transfer in from: |
20C |
Royston |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
05/03/1949 |
8533 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
8763 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/04/1949 |
44362 |
Transfer in from: |
15D |
Bedford |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/04/1949 |
3321 |
Transfer out to: |
21C |
Bromsgrove |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/04/1949 |
43667 |
Transfer out to: |
21C |
Bromsgrove |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
16/04/1949 |
8010 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
4207 |
Transfer out to: |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
43225 |
Transfer out to: |
21D |
Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
44584 |
Transfer out to: |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
44811 |
Transfer out to: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
45274 |
Transfer out to: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
4852 |
Transfer out to: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
8533 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/06/1949 |
43225 |
Transfer in from: |
21D |
Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/06/1949 |
44186 |
Transfer out to: |
21D |
Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
02/07/1949 |
40463 |
Transfer out to: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/07/1949 |
48319 |
Transfer in from: |
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/07/1949 |
8339 |
Transfer in from: |
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
|
Steam |
1808 |
4-4-0 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
40385 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
20/08/1949 |
48612 |
Transfer out to: |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
43869 |
Transfer in from: |
22C |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
43686 |
Transfer out to: |
21C |
Bromsgrove |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
48402 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
48403 |
Transfer out to: |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
48405 |
Transfer out to: |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
29/10/1949 |
48748 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
44666 |
Transfer in from: |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
44804 |
Transfer in from: |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
48093 |
Transfer out to: |
20C |
Royston |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
48337 |
Transfer out to: |
20C |
Royston |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1949 |
42784 |
Transfer out to: |
20G |
Hellifield |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
26/11/1949 |
47273 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
28/11/1949 |
44304 |
Transfer out to: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
03/12/1949 |
44139 |
Transfer out to: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1949 |
43011 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1949 |
43017 |
Transfer out to: |
22C |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1949 |
43019 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1949 |
44583 |
Transfer out to: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
17/12/1949 |
47545 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
17/12/1949 |
47639 |
Transfer out to: |
20H |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
1377 |
0-6-0T |
5w/e |
24/12/1949 |
41777 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
1377 |
0-6-0T |
5w/e |
24/12/1949 |
41777 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
31/12/1949 |
12062 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
31/12/1949 |
7432 |
Transfer out to: |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
40512 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/01/1950 |
3855 |
Transfer in from: |
20B |
Stourton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/01/1950 |
4179 |
Transfer in from: |
20B |
Stourton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
3w/e |
14/01/1950 |
3855 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
3w/e |
14/01/1950 |
4179 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
3w/e |
14/01/1950 |
3855 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
3w/e |
14/01/1950 |
4179 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
3w/e |
14/01/1950 |
48027 |
Transfer out to: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
11/02/1950 |
42791 |
Transfer in from: |
20E |
Manningham |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/02/1950 |
44112 |
Transfer in from: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
11/02/1950 |
47313 |
Transfer in from: |
21C |
Bromsgrove |
|
|
Steam |
1377 |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
04/03/1950 |
41777 |
Transfer out to: |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1950 |
44165 |
Transfer in from: |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
|
Steam |
1357 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/03/1950 |
58230 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2781 |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
18/03/1950 |
40745 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
15/04/1950 |
43891 |
Transfer out to: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1950 |
3321 |
Transfer in from: |
21C |
Bromsgrove |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
3321 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
40928 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
44814 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
3321 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
40928 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
42685 |
Transfer out to: |
20E |
Manningham |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
44814 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
08/07/1950 |
42791 |
Transfer out to: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
08/07/1950 |
42799 |
Transfer out to: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
30/09/1950 |
12074 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
30/09/1950 |
12075 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
45040 |
Transfer in from: |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
06/10/1950 |
42053 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
42685 |
Transfer in from: |
20E |
Manningham |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
45040 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
45040 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
16/10/1950 |
42054 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/10/1950 |
44201 |
Transfer in from: |
20H |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
31/10/1950 |
12076 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
31/10/1950 |
12077 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
44201 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
44201 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
43985 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
44888 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
44524 |
Transfer out to: |
21D |
Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
47276 |
Transfer out to: |
21C |
Bromsgrove |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
48401 |
Transfer out to: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
43381 |
Transfer in from: |
21D |
Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
43523 |
Transfer in from: |
21D |
Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
43693 |
Transfer in from: |
21D |
Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
48401 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
43381 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
43523 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
43693 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
48401 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
43381 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
43523 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
43693 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
48401 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
17/03/1951 |
44112 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
43027 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
42685 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
43011 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
1377 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
31/03/1951 |
41699 |
Transfer out to: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/04/1951 |
48391 |
Transfer in from: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
14/04/1951 |
43938 |
Transfer in from: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
14/04/1951 |
44226 |
Transfer in from: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
14/04/1951 |
42754 |
Transfer out to: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
14/04/1951 |
42890 |
Transfer out to: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/04/1951 |
44112 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/04/1951 |
44545 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/05/1951 |
44112 |
Transfer out to: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
42685 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
43938 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
44226 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
48391 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
43938 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
44226 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
48391 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
1121 |
0-6-0T |
m/e |
06/1951 |
41856 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
02/06/1951 |
43862 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
02/06/1951 |
44112 |
Transfer in from: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
02/06/1951 |
48391 |
Transfer out to: |
19C |
Canklow |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
02/06/1951 |
48401 |
Transfer out to: |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/06/1951 |
43862 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/06/1951 |
44112 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/06/1951 |
43862 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/06/1951 |
44112 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/07/1951 |
44852 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/07/1951 |
45274 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
28/07/1951 |
41046 |
Transfer out to: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1951 |
44852 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1951 |
45274 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1951 |
44852 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1951 |
45274 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
41180 |
Transfer in from: |
28C |
Carstairs |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
42342 |
Transfer in from: |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
13/10/1951 |
41180 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
13/10/1951 |
41180 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
20/10/1951 |
44333 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/10/1951 |
44841 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/10/1951 |
45059 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
20/10/1951 |
44520 |
Transfer out to: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
27/10/1951 |
48331 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
27/10/1951 |
48397 |
Transfer in from: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
27/10/1951 |
48523 |
Transfer in from: |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
27/10/1951 |
48609 |
Transfer in from: |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
27/10/1951 |
48647 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
27/10/1951 |
48690 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/10/1951 |
43968 |
Transfer out to: |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/10/1951 |
44010 |
Transfer out to: |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/10/1951 |
44112 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/10/1951 |
44145 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/10/1951 |
44200 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/10/1951 |
44475 |
Transfer out to: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
03/11/1951 |
43852 |
Transfer in from: |
20D |
Normanton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
03/11/1951 |
44209 |
Transfer in from: |
17D |
Rowsley |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
03/11/1951 |
43321 |
Transfer out to: |
20D |
Normanton |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
03/11/1951 |
43759 |
Transfer out to: |
17D |
Rowsley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
03/11/1951 |
48523 |
Transfer out to: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
44962 |
Transfer in from: |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
40117 |
Transfer out to: |
20E |
Manningham |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
42826 |
Transfer out to: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
43852 |
Transfer out to: |
20D |
Normanton |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
40168 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
42685 |
Transfer out to: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
44209 |
Transfer out to: |
22B |
Gloucester Barnwood |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
31/12/1951 |
40097 |
Transfer out to: |
86K |
Abergavenny |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
42685 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
43027 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
43875 |
Transfer in from: |
22C |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
44204 |
Transfer in from: |
21D |
Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
44235 |
Transfer in from: |
22C |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
44535 |
Transfer in from: |
22C |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
43027 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
44525 |
Transfer out to: |
21D |
Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
44567 |
Transfer out to: |
21D |
Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
44888 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
44535 |
Transfer out to: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
44888 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
19/03/1952 |
43875 |
Transfer out to: |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
19/03/1952 |
44235 |
Transfer out to: |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1952 |
43878 |
Transfer in from: |
20B |
Stourton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1952 |
43963 |
Transfer in from: |
20B |
Stourton |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
22/03/1952 |
42342 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1952 |
43014 |
Transfer out to: |
20B |
Stourton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
43865 |
Transfer in from: |
17C |
Coalville |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
44227 |
Transfer in from: |
17C |
Coalville |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
43013 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
48125 |
Transfer in from: |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
48212 |
Transfer in from: |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
43027 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
43225 |
Transfer out to: |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
43257 |
Transfer out to: |
20F |
Skipton |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3w/e |
17/05/1952 |
43491 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
43531 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3w/e |
17/05/1952 |
43621 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
43800 |
Transfer out to: |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
43909 |
Transfer in from: |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
44004 |
Transfer in from: |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
44211 |
Transfer in from: |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
48125 |
Transfer out to: |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
48212 |
Transfer out to: |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
8w/e |
14/06/1952 |
42327 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
8w/e |
14/06/1952 |
43013 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
14/06/1952 |
43909 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
14/06/1952 |
44004 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
14/06/1952 |
44211 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
8w/e |
14/06/1952 |
43013 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
14/06/1952 |
43909 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
14/06/1952 |
44004 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
14/06/1952 |
44211 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
44138 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
44520 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
40486 |
Transfer out to: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
48609 |
Transfer out to: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
48690 |
Transfer out to: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
23/08/1952 |
43336 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/09/1952 |
42857 |
Transfer out to: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
42857 |
Transfer in from: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
48216 |
Transfer in from: |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
48284 |
Transfer in from: |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
40099 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
43046 |
Transfer in from: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
44821 |
Transfer in from: |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
44855 |
Transfer in from: |
SR |
To Southern Region |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
44317 |
Transfer out to: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
40099 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
43046 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
44821 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
44855 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
40099 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
43046 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
44821 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
44855 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
44855 |
Transfer out to: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
3w/e |
24/01/1953 |
48216 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
3w/e |
24/01/1953 |
48284 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
40099 |
Transfer out to: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
40928 |
Transfer out to: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
42685 |
Transfer out to: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
42824 |
Transfer out to: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
42825 |
Transfer out to: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
43246 |
Transfer out to: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
44520 |
Transfer out to: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
44821 |
Transfer out to: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
45269 |
Transfer out to: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
48420 |
Transfer out to: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
48669 |
Transfer out to: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
21/02/1953 |
43540 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/03/1953 |
44855 |
Transfer in from: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
42824 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
42825 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
44520 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
48420 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
48669 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
40099 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
40928 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
42685 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
43246 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
45269 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
45447 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
44855 |
Transfer out to: |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
45447 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
19/05/1953 |
80063 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/05/1953 |
43201 |
Transfer out to: |
71J |
Highbridge |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
41140 |
Transfer in from: |
22B |
Gloucester Barnwood |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
43017 |
Transfer in from: |
22C |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
43036 |
Transfer in from: |
22C |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
43047 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
42790 |
Transfer out to: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
48741 |
Transfer out to: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/08/1953 |
42790 |
Transfer in from: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/08/1953 |
43932 |
Transfer in from: |
22B |
Gloucester Barnwood |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
08/08/1953 |
40168 |
Transfer out to: |
16D |
Mansfield |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/08/1953 |
43036 |
Transfer out to: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
08/08/1953 |
48397 |
Transfer out to: |
19C |
Canklow |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
05/09/1953 |
43520 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
05/09/1953 |
43568 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
05/09/1953 |
44804 |
Transfer out to: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
43036 |
Transfer in from: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
44603 |
Transfer in from: |
20D |
Normanton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
44804 |
Transfer in from: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
40175 |
Transfer out to: |
16D |
Mansfield |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
43932 |
Transfer out to: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
43219 |
Transfer in from: |
18C |
Hasland |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
43599 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
43771 |
Transfer in from: |
18C |
Hasland |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
43798 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
43803 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
43817 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
47225 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
44088 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
44190 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
44289 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
44362 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
44603 |
Transfer out to: |
18C |
Hasland |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
45059 |
Transfer out to: |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
43444 |
Transfer in from: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
44775 |
Transfer in from: |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
44776 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
44852 |
Transfer out to: |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
45186 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
58080 |
Transfer out to: |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
02/01/1954 |
43858 |
Transfer out to: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
02/01/1954 |
44538 |
Transfer out to: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
02/01/1954 |
44591 |
Transfer out to: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/01/1954 |
43012 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/01/1954 |
43344 |
Transfer in from: |
22B |
Gloucester Barnwood |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/01/1954 |
44463 |
Transfer in from: |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
27/02/1954 |
40149 |
Transfer in from: |
20E |
Manningham |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
27/02/1954 |
42685 |
Transfer out to: |
20E |
Manningham |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/03/1954 |
43041 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/03/1954 |
44664 |
Transfer in from: |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/03/1954 |
44964 |
Transfer in from: |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/03/1954 |
43012 |
Transfer out to: |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/04/1954 |
42816 |
Transfer in from: |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
24/04/1954 |
48319 |
Transfer out to: |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
24/04/1954 |
48331 |
Transfer out to: |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
08/05/1954 |
43862 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
44160 |
Transfer in from: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
44583 |
Transfer in from: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
44964 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
48138 |
Transfer in from: |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
42327 |
Transfer out to: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
43041 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
43879 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
44964 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/07/1954 |
43482 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/07/1954 |
43598 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
17/07/1954 |
48319 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/07/1954 |
45447 |
Transfer out to: |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
17/07/1954 |
48420 |
Transfer out to: |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
14/08/1954 |
40164 |
Transfer in from: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
14/08/1954 |
42327 |
Transfer in from: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
14/08/1954 |
40099 |
Transfer out to: |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/08/1954 |
42903 |
Transfer out to: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/08/1954 |
43869 |
Transfer out to: |
17C |
Coalville |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
14/08/1954 |
48319 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
14/08/1954 |
48763 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/09/1954 |
42754 |
Transfer in from: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/09/1954 |
42761 |
Transfer in from: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/09/1954 |
42791 |
Transfer in from: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/09/1954 |
42846 |
Transfer in from: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
11/09/1954 |
40164 |
Transfer out to: |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/09/1954 |
42818 |
Transfer out to: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/09/1954 |
42822 |
Transfer out to: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/09/1954 |
42825 |
Transfer out to: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/09/1954 |
42829 |
Transfer out to: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
09/10/1954 |
13082 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
42903 |
Transfer in from: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
43344 |
Transfer out to: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
43444 |
Transfer out to: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
43598 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
42383 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
45273 |
Transfer out to: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
45274 |
Transfer out to: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
80063 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
44821 |
Transfer in from: |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
44859 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
44945 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
44963 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
44965 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
45186 |
Transfer in from: |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
45272 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
45280 |
Transfer in from: |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
45342 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
45407 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
43843 |
Transfer out to: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
44023 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
44049 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
44184 |
Transfer out to: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
44224 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/01/1955 |
44171 |
Transfer in from: |
20D |
Normanton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/01/1955 |
44230 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
01/01/1955 |
48138 |
Transfer out to: |
19C |
Canklow |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/01/1955 |
42890 |
Transfer in from: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/01/1955 |
42824 |
Transfer out to: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
1121 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
26/03/1955 |
41879 |
Transfer out to: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
21/05/1955 |
43568 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
8w/e |
16/07/1955 |
42900 |
Transfer out to: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
8w/e |
16/07/1955 |
42903 |
Transfer out to: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
06/08/1955 |
43909 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
13/08/1955 |
42900 |
Transfer in from: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
13/08/1955 |
42903 |
Transfer in from: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
13/08/1955 |
44150 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
13/08/1955 |
44418 |
Transfer out to: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
13/08/1955 |
44427 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
24/08/1955 |
13167 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
26/08/1955 |
13168 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
10/09/1955 |
43803 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
10/09/1955 |
43817 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1357 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
11/1955 |
58230 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
42791 |
Transfer out to: |
20E |
Manningham |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
19/11/1955 |
43791 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
13180 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
58168 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
43520 |
Transfer out to: |
22B |
Gloucester Barnwood |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
03/12/1955 |
43544 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
42791 |
Transfer in from: |
20E |
Manningham |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
43869 |
Transfer in from: |
17C |
Coalville |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
5w/e |
21/01/1956 |
58065 |
Transfer out to: |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/01/1956 |
12066 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
28/01/1956 |
42823 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
28/01/1956 |
12077 |
Transfer out to: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
28/01/1956 |
45342 |
Transfer out to: |
15D |
Bedford |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
43624 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
43869 |
Transfer out to: |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
44204 |
Transfer out to: |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1956 |
13180 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1956 |
45407 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/04/1956 |
43762 |
Transfer out to: |
21C |
Bromsgrove |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
48035 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
48152 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
48417 |
Transfer out to: |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
48424 |
Transfer out to: |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
43010 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
43049 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
48269 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
48338 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
48668 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
48692 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
43845 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
43855 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
43865 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
43941 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
43946 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
44176 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/09/1956 |
43698 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/09/1956 |
42764 |
Transfer out to: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
42764 |
Transfer in from: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
27/10/1956 |
43246 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
03/11/1956 |
48700 |
Transfer out to: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
48700 |
Transfer in from: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
44966 |
Transfer out to: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
45040 |
Transfer out to: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
45280 |
Transfer out to: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/12/1956 |
43558 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
48280 |
Transfer in from: |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
16/02/1957 |
43912 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
16/03/1957 |
41180 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
40332 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
40413 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
40443 |
Transfer in from: |
5C |
Stafford |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
92109 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
92121 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
20/04/1957 |
44966 |
Transfer in from: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
20/04/1957 |
45040 |
Transfer in from: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
20/04/1957 |
45280 |
Transfer in from: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
20/04/1957 |
48692 |
Transfer out to: |
2E |
Northampton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
on |
30/04/1957 |
92129 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
on |
30/04/1957 |
92130 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
41078 |
Transfer in from: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
43965 |
Transfer in from: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
40332 |
Transfer out to: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
42754 |
Transfer out to: |
17D |
Rowsley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
48152 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
48269 |
Transfer out to: |
2E |
Northampton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
48280 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
41140 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
25/05/1957 |
43684 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
on |
31/05/1957 |
92131 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
on |
31/05/1957 |
92132 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
4w/e |
16/06/1957 |
92008 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
4w/e |
16/06/1957 |
92009 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
4w/e |
16/06/1957 |
92048 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
4w/e |
16/06/1957 |
92049 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
4w/e |
16/06/1957 |
92051 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
16/06/1957 |
48035 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
4w/e |
16/06/1957 |
92109 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
4w/e |
16/06/1957 |
92121 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
4w/e |
16/06/1957 |
92129 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
4w/e |
16/06/1957 |
92130 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
4w/e |
16/06/1957 |
92131 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1957 |
12033 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1957 |
12034 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1957 |
12035 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
on |
30/06/1957 |
92133 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
on |
30/06/1957 |
92134 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
on |
30/06/1957 |
92135 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
on |
31/07/1957 |
92136 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
on |
31/07/1957 |
92137 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
on |
31/07/1957 |
92138 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
on |
31/07/1957 |
92139 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
76085 |
Transfer in from: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
76087 |
Transfer in from: |
17F |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
12074 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
12075 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
12076 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
40413 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
42053 |
Transfer out to: |
17D |
Rowsley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
48668 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
24/08/1957 |
43690 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
07/09/1957 |
41165 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/09/1957 |
43965 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/09/1957 |
44463 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/09/1957 |
43965 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/09/1957 |
44463 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
05/10/1957 |
12077 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
05/10/1957 |
13248 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
8w/e |
05/10/1957 |
41066 |
Transfer in from: |
19G |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
8w/e |
05/10/1957 |
42326 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
8w/e |
05/10/1957 |
92009 |
Transfer out to: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
on |
31/10/1957 |
92151 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
on |
31/10/1957 |
92152 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
on |
30/11/1957 |
92155 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
44810 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
44821 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
14/12/1957 |
43443 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
4w/e |
28/12/1957 |
92015 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
4w/e |
28/12/1957 |
92016 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
4w/e |
28/12/1957 |
92017 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
28/12/1957 |
43523 |
Transfer out to: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
28/12/1957 |
44203 |
Transfer out to: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
28/12/1957 |
44248 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
4w/e |
28/12/1957 |
92132 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
4w/e |
28/12/1957 |
92133 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
4w/e |
28/12/1957 |
92134 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/01/1958 |
12033 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
40012 |
Transfer in from: |
17F |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
92009 |
Transfer in from: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
92053 |
Transfer in from: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
41165 |
Transfer out to: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
48338 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
22/03/1958 |
40928 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
on |
30/04/1958 |
92165 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
10/05/1958 |
41066 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/05/1958 |
45280 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
on |
31/05/1958 |
92166 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
on |
31/05/1958 |
92167 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
45280 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
48000 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
45186 |
Transfer out to: |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
28/06/1958 |
43798 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
12/07/1958 |
41165 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
12/07/1958 |
42340 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
12/07/1958 |
48261 |
Transfer in from: |
11E |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
12/07/1958 |
48286 |
Transfer in from: |
11E |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
12/07/1958 |
48342 |
Transfer in from: |
11E |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
4w/e |
12/07/1958 |
92015 |
Transfer out to: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
4w/e |
12/07/1958 |
92016 |
Transfer out to: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
4w/e |
12/07/1958 |
92017 |
Transfer out to: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
19/07/1958 |
12034 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/08/1958 |
13250 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/09/1958 |
44013 |
Transfer in from: |
17D |
Rowsley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/09/1958 |
44184 |
Transfer in from: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
4w/e |
06/09/1958 |
92166 |
Transfer out to: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
06/09/1958 |
41078 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
44143 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
44664 |
Transfer out to: |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
44841 |
Transfer out to: |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
44842 |
Transfer out to: |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
48000 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
48261 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
48286 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
16/10/1958 |
D3582 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
25/10/1958 |
92009 |
Transfer out to: |
16D |
Annesley |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
03/11/1958 |
D3583 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
07/11/1958 |
D3584 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
08/11/1958 |
41121 |
Transfer in from: |
11E |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
08/11/1958 |
41173 |
Transfer in from: |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
08/11/1958 |
44841 |
Transfer in from: |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/11/1958 |
43932 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/11/1958 |
44203 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
22/11/1958 |
92009 |
Transfer in from: |
16D |
Annesley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/11/1958 |
44516 |
Transfer out to: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/11/1958 |
44571 |
Transfer out to: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
29/11/1958 |
44842 |
Transfer in from: |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
29/11/1958 |
43441 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/12/1958 |
44091 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/12/1958 |
44589 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/12/1958 |
44664 |
Transfer in from: |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
06/12/1958 |
92120 |
Transfer in from: |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
03/01/1959 |
45186 |
Transfer in from: |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
42775 |
Transfer in from: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
42788 |
Transfer in from: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
43041 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
43242 |
Transfer in from: |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
43355 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
43379 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
43468 |
Transfer in from: |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
48220 |
Transfer in from: |
16D |
Annesley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
48315 |
Transfer in from: |
16D |
Annesley |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
41121 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
41165 |
Transfer out to: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
41173 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
43558 |
Transfer out to: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
44589 |
Transfer out to: |
27F |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
47225 |
Transfer out to: |
27E |
Walton on the Hill |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
47313 |
Transfer out to: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
47638 |
Transfer out to: |
16D |
Annesley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
76085 |
Transfer out to: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
76087 |
Transfer out to: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
02/1959 |
43771 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/02/1959 |
43253 |
Transfer in from: |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/02/1959 |
48105 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
07/02/1959 |
92150 |
Transfer in from: |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
07/02/1959 |
92157 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
14/02/1959 |
48101 |
Transfer in from: |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/02/1959 |
D3583 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/02/1959 |
D3584 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/03/1959 |
48002 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/03/1959 |
48523 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
14/03/1959 |
42813 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
28/03/1959 |
40115 |
Transfer out to: |
16C |
Mansfield |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/03/1959 |
43374 |
Transfer out to: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
04/04/1959 |
44842 |
Transfer out to: |
27F |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/04/1959 |
43435 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/04/1959 |
48002 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
02/05/1959 |
42054 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
02/05/1959 |
43253 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
02/05/1959 |
43355 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/05/1959 |
44138 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
16/05/1959 |
43052 |
Transfer in from: |
50C |
Selby |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
16/05/1959 |
43103 |
Transfer in from: |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
16/05/1959 |
43122 |
Transfer in from: |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/05/1959 |
44413 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
30/05/1959 |
92166 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/05/1959 |
44664 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
13/06/1959 |
43223 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
13/06/1959 |
43939 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
43027 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
43040 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
44981 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
44463 |
Transfer out to: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
27/06/1959 |
43381 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
11/07/1959 |
43052 |
Transfer out to: |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/07/1959 |
43389 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
08/08/1959 |
44775 |
Transfer out to: |
27F |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
08/08/1959 |
43210 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
15/08/1959 |
D3582 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/08/1959 |
44964 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/08/1959 |
44888 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
22/08/1959 |
43339 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
22/08/1959 |
43674 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
29/08/1959 |
92166 |
Transfer out to: |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/09/1959 |
43523 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
12/09/1959 |
92248 |
Transfer in from: |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
12/09/1959 |
40012 |
Transfer out to: |
14E |
Bedford |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/09/1959 |
44201 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/09/1959 |
44888 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/10/1959 |
D3582 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/10/1959 |
44775 |
Transfer in from: |
27F |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
10/10/1959 |
43010 |
Transfer out to: |
14D |
Neasden |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
43263 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
43309 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
43359 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
43453 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
43855 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
43948 |
Transfer in from: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
44168 |
Transfer in from: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
92050 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
92081 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
44663 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
44810 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
44812 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
44818 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
44825 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
44839 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
44856 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
44858 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
44944 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
45088 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
45253 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
45263 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
45447 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
45649 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
92008 |
Transfer out to: |
17C |
Rowsley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
92009 |
Transfer out to: |
17C |
Rowsley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
92048 |
Transfer out to: |
17C |
Rowsley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
92049 |
Transfer out to: |
17C |
Rowsley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
92050 |
Transfer out to: |
17C |
Rowsley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
92051 |
Transfer out to: |
17C |
Rowsley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
92053 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
92081 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
92120 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
45649 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
28/11/1959 |
43219 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
28/11/1959 |
43379 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/12/1959 |
43321 |
Transfer in from: |
20D |
Normanton |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/12/1959 |
43639 |
Transfer in from: |
20D |
Normanton |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
05/12/1959 |
42775 |
Transfer out to: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
05/12/1959 |
42788 |
Transfer out to: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
05/12/1959 |
42813 |
Transfer out to: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
05/12/1959 |
42816 |
Transfer out to: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
05/12/1959 |
43433 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
05/12/1959 |
43878 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
05/12/1959 |
43965 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/12/1959 |
44084 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/12/1959 |
44108 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/12/1959 |
44227 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/12/1959 |
44230 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
19/12/1959 |
43490 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
26/12/1959 |
43693 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/01/1960 |
12049 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/01/1960 |
43583 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/01/1960 |
43975 |
Transfer in from: |
17C |
Coalville |
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
20/02/1960 |
40439 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
20/02/1960 |
43012 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
20/02/1960 |
43033 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
20/02/1960 |
43521 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
20/02/1960 |
43668 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
20/02/1960 |
43687 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
20/02/1960 |
44463 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
20/02/1960 |
44516 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
20/02/1960 |
44571 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
20/02/1960 |
58138 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
20/02/1960 |
58143 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
20/02/1960 |
92166 |
Transfer in from: |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
|
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
20/02/1960 |
58168 |
Transfer out to: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/03/1960 |
44406 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/03/1960 |
44515 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
12/03/1960 |
48000 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/03/1960 |
44856 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
92014 |
Transfer in from: |
38B |
Annesley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
92070 |
Transfer in from: |
38B |
Annesley |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
23/04/1960 |
40149 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
23/04/1960 |
40439 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
23/04/1960 |
40443 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
23/04/1960 |
40511 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
23/04/1960 |
42383 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
23/04/1960 |
43027 |
Transfer out to: |
12D |
Kirkby Stephen |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
23/04/1960 |
43103 |
Transfer out to: |
12D |
Kirkby Stephen |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
30/04/1960 |
42160 |
Transfer in from: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
30/04/1960 |
42446 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Market Harborough |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
07/05/1960 |
42137 |
Transfer in from: |
27F |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/05/1960 |
45269 |
Transfer out to: |
27F |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
21/05/1960 |
42182 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
13/06/1960 |
42446 |
Transfer out to: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
48183 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
18/06/1960 |
43627 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/07/1960 |
45269 |
Transfer in from: |
27F |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
30/07/1960 |
42754 |
Transfer in from: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
30/07/1960 |
43484 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/08/1960 |
42398 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/08/1960 |
42400 |
Transfer in from: |
5C |
Stafford |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/08/1960 |
42415 |
Transfer in from: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/08/1960 |
42416 |
Transfer in from: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/08/1960 |
42417 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/08/1960 |
42421 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/08/1960 |
42422 |
Transfer in from: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/08/1960 |
42137 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/08/1960 |
42160 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/08/1960 |
42182 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/08/1960 |
42327 |
Transfer out to: |
5C |
Stafford |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/08/1960 |
42337 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/08/1960 |
42340 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
20/08/1960 |
43359 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
20/08/1960 |
43523 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
20/08/1960 |
43639 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/08/1960 |
43529 |
Transfer in from: |
15D |
Bedford |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1960 |
43036 |
Transfer out to: |
14D |
Neasden |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
4w/e |
10/09/1960 |
92248 |
Transfer out to: |
82E |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
45186 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
48000 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
92014 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
92070 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
15/10/1960 |
43644 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
29/10/1960 |
43594 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
05/11/1960 |
42419 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1960 |
43986 |
Transfer out to: |
15D |
Coalville |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1960 |
D3576 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1960 |
D3577 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1960 |
D3865 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1960 |
42754 |
Transfer out to: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1960 |
43911 |
Transfer out to: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1960 |
44026 |
Transfer out to: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1960 |
48687 |
Transfer out to: |
15D |
Coalville |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
26/11/1960 |
43036 |
Transfer in from: |
14D |
Neasden |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
03/12/1960 |
42398 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/01/1961 |
48105 |
Transfer out to: |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/01/1961 |
48342 |
Transfer out to: |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
21/01/1961 |
42415 |
Transfer out to: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/01/1961 |
12035 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/01/1961 |
12035 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/02/1961 |
12035 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/02/1961 |
48330 |
Transfer in from: |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/02/1961 |
48415 |
Transfer in from: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/02/1961 |
12035 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/02/1961 |
48523 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/02/1961 |
48647 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
18/02/1961 |
43321 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
04/03/1961 |
45006 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
04/03/1961 |
45186 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
04/03/1961 |
45221 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
04/03/1961 |
45260 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
04/03/1961 |
45579 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
04/03/1961 |
45648 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
04/03/1961 |
45649 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
18/03/1961 |
48415 |
Transfer out to: |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/04/1961 |
43309 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/04/1961 |
43482 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
08/04/1961 |
43948 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/04/1961 |
44112 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/04/1961 |
48635 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
11/04/1961 |
92026 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
29/04/1961 |
92026 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
27/05/1961 |
43468 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
03/06/1961 |
92052 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
03/06/1961 |
43284 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/06/1961 |
45532 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/06/1961 |
45540 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/06/1961 |
46103 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/06/1961 |
46122 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/06/1961 |
46123 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/06/1961 |
46141 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/06/1961 |
46157 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/06/1961 |
46160 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/06/1961 |
46162 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
17/06/1961 |
42758 |
Transfer out to: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
17/06/1961 |
42761 |
Transfer out to: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
17/06/1961 |
42791 |
Transfer out to: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
17/06/1961 |
42846 |
Transfer out to: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
17/06/1961 |
42857 |
Transfer out to: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
17/06/1961 |
42890 |
Transfer out to: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
17/06/1961 |
48635 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
17/06/1961 |
92052 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
17/06/1961 |
43214 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
17/06/1961 |
43812 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
08/07/1961 |
48315 |
Transfer out to: |
15D |
Coalville |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
15/07/1961 |
43435 |
Transfer in from: |
14E |
Bedford |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/08/1961 |
44013 |
Transfer out to: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/08/1961 |
44804 |
Transfer out to: |
27F |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/08/1961 |
46118 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
26/08/1961 |
43529 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
26/08/1961 |
43673 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/09/1961 |
46106 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/09/1961 |
46137 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/09/1961 |
44804 |
Transfer in from: |
27F |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
09/09/1961 |
48330 |
Transfer out to: |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
23/09/1961 |
43507 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/10/1961 |
46132 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
18/11/1961 |
46443 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
18/11/1961 |
46454 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/11/1961 |
45579 |
Transfer out to: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/11/1961 |
45648 |
Transfer out to: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/11/1961 |
45649 |
Transfer out to: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/11/1961 |
58138 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/11/1961 |
58143 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
09/12/1961 |
42053 |
Transfer in from: |
14D |
Neasden |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
09/12/1961 |
42082 |
Transfer in from: |
14D |
Neasden |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
09/12/1961 |
42225 |
Transfer in from: |
34E |
Neasden |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
09/12/1961 |
42230 |
Transfer in from: |
34E |
Neasden |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
09/12/1961 |
42284 |
Transfer in from: |
14D |
Neasden |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1961 |
48007 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1961 |
48109 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1961 |
48127 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1961 |
48177 |
Transfer in from: |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1961 |
48523 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1961 |
92107 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1961 |
92129 |
Transfer in from: |
16D |
Annesley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1961 |
44333 |
Transfer out to: |
15D |
Coalville |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/12/1961 |
43855 |
Transfer out to: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/12/1961 |
43932 |
Transfer out to: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/12/1961 |
44091 |
Transfer out to: |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/12/1961 |
44171 |
Transfer out to: |
14E |
Bedford |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/12/1961 |
44463 |
Transfer out to: |
18C |
Hasland |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/12/1961 |
44516 |
Transfer out to: |
17C |
Rowsley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
30/12/1961 |
44516 |
Transfer in from: |
17C |
Rowsley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
30/12/1961 |
44203 |
Transfer out to: |
17C |
Rowsley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
13/01/1962 |
48133 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
20/01/1962 |
92118 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
20/01/1962 |
43975 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
20/01/1962 |
42764 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/02/1962 |
44213 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
17/03/1962 |
43940 |
Transfer out to: |
18C |
Hasland |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
24/03/1962 |
43063 |
Transfer in from: |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
31/03/1962 |
43106 |
Transfer in from: |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
31/03/1962 |
92056 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
31/03/1962 |
43985 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/04/1962 |
43958 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/04/1962 |
44047 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/04/1962 |
44131 |
Transfer in from: |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/04/1962 |
44218 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/04/1962 |
44289 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/04/1962 |
44394 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/04/1962 |
43620 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/04/1962 |
44818 |
Transfer out to: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/04/1962 |
44825 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/04/1962 |
44839 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/04/1962 |
44858 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/04/1962 |
45532 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/04/1962 |
45540 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/04/1962 |
43938 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
14/04/1962 |
43979 |
Transfer in from: |
15D |
Coalville |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
14/04/1962 |
44180 |
Transfer in from: |
17C |
Coalville |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/04/1962 |
43435 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
28/04/1962 |
48625 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/05/1962 |
46106 |
Transfer out to: |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
12/05/1962 |
48133 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
12/05/1962 |
92056 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
12/05/1962 |
92167 |
Transfer out to: |
52H |
Tyne Dock |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
19/05/1962 |
43940 |
Transfer in from: |
18C |
Hasland |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/05/1962 |
46118 |
Transfer out to: |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/05/1962 |
45265 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
02/06/1962 |
43263 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
44413 |
Transfer in from: |
17C |
Rowsley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
44419 |
Transfer in from: |
17C |
Rowsley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
92008 |
Transfer in from: |
17C |
Rowsley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
92009 |
Transfer in from: |
17C |
Rowsley |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
43106 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
48177 |
Transfer out to: |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
48625 |
Transfer out to: |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
92165 |
Transfer out to: |
6F |
Bidston |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
92166 |
Transfer out to: |
6F |
Bidston |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/06/1962 |
46106 |
Transfer in from: |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/06/1962 |
46118 |
Transfer in from: |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
30/06/1962 |
92128 |
Transfer in from: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
30/06/1962 |
92164 |
Transfer in from: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/06/1962 |
46103 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/06/1962 |
46122 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/06/1962 |
46123 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/06/1962 |
46132 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/06/1962 |
46137 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/06/1962 |
46157 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/06/1962 |
46160 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/06/1962 |
46162 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/06/1962 |
46106 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/06/1962 |
46118 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/07/1962 |
46141 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
07/07/1962 |
92009 |
Transfer out to: |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
14/07/1962 |
48523 |
Transfer out to: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
21/07/1962 |
42784 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/07/1962 |
44187 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/08/1962 |
43242 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/08/1962 |
43389 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/08/1962 |
43583 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/08/1962 |
43668 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/08/1962 |
43680 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/08/1962 |
43687 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
18/08/1962 |
42903 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
01/09/1962 |
42707 |
Transfer in from: |
24F |
Fleetwood |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
43063 |
Transfer out to: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
44289 |
Transfer out to: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
44394 |
Transfer out to: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
42225 |
Transfer out to: |
17C |
Rowsley |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
42230 |
Transfer out to: |
17C |
Rowsley |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
43012 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
43013 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
43033 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
43036 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
43040 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
43041 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
43046 |
Transfer out to: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
43047 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
43049 |
Transfer out to: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
43453 |
Transfer out to: |
14E |
Bedford |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
43521 |
Transfer out to: |
14E |
Bedford |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
48220 |
Transfer out to: |
16D |
Annesley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
48700 |
Transfer out to: |
16D |
Annesley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
06/10/1962 |
48127 |
Transfer out to: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
06/10/1962 |
48388 |
Transfer out to: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/10/1962 |
44038 |
Transfer in from: |
27E |
Walton on the Hill |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/10/1962 |
44040 |
Transfer in from: |
27E |
Walton on the Hill |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/10/1962 |
44605 |
Transfer in from: |
27E |
Walton on the Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
13/10/1962 |
92028 |
Transfer in from: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
13/10/1962 |
92029 |
Transfer in from: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
13/10/1962 |
92085 |
Transfer in from: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
13/10/1962 |
42082 |
Transfer out to: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/10/1962 |
44776 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/10/1962 |
45253 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
13/10/1962 |
48007 |
Transfer out to: |
16D |
Annesley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
13/10/1962 |
48183 |
Transfer out to: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
13/10/1962 |
48336 |
Transfer out to: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/10/1962 |
44143 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
15/12/1962 |
48220 |
Transfer in from: |
16D |
Annesley |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
22/12/1962 |
42053 |
Transfer out to: |
17C |
Rowsley |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
22/12/1962 |
42284 |
Transfer out to: |
17C |
Rowsley |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
22/12/1962 |
42422 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
22/12/1962 |
42784 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/12/1962 |
44004 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/12/1962 |
43599 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/01/1963 |
43951 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/01/1963 |
44047 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/01/1963 |
44168 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/01/1963 |
44184 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
19/01/1963 |
44112 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
26/01/1963 |
48167 |
Transfer in from: |
16D |
Annesley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/02/1963 |
48010 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
16/02/1963 |
48010 |
Transfer out to: |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
23/02/1963 |
92082 |
Transfer in from: |
16D |
Annesley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
02/03/1963 |
44413 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
45253 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
45584 |
Transfer in from: |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
45617 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
45631 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
45647 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
45653 |
Transfer in from: |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
45674 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
45676 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
45709 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/03/1963 |
45253 |
Transfer out to: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
06/04/1963 |
48000 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
06/04/1963 |
48095 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
06/04/1963 |
48133 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/04/1963 |
45221 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/05/1963 |
44815 |
Transfer in from: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/05/1963 |
44856 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/05/1963 |
45264 |
Transfer in from: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/05/1963 |
45333 |
Transfer in from: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/05/1963 |
44804 |
Transfer out to: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/05/1963 |
44888 |
Transfer out to: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/05/1963 |
44920 |
Transfer out to: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/05/1963 |
44962 |
Transfer out to: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/05/1963 |
45269 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
44776 |
Transfer in from: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
44040 |
Transfer out to: |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
44815 |
Transfer out to: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
45333 |
Transfer out to: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
48000 |
Transfer out to: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1963 |
45709 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/07/1963 |
44843 |
Transfer in from: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
13/07/1963 |
92008 |
Transfer out to: |
17C |
Rowsley |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
27/07/1963 |
42790 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/08/1963 |
44038 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/08/1963 |
45088 |
Transfer out to: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/08/1963 |
45260 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
09/1963 |
44419 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/09/1963 |
45709 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/10/1963 |
44829 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/10/1963 |
45369 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
05/10/1963 |
D5390 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/10/1963 |
45250 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
12/10/1963 |
76047 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
12/10/1963 |
76052 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
12/10/1963 |
76085 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
12/10/1963 |
76086 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
12/10/1963 |
76087 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
12/10/1963 |
76088 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
12/10/1963 |
92057 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
12/10/1963 |
48167 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
m/e |
11/1963 |
42419 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/11/1963 |
44691 |
Transfer in from: |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/11/1963 |
44777 |
Transfer in from: |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/11/1963 |
45709 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
16/11/1963 |
D5390 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
23/11/1963 |
92125 |
Transfer in from: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
30/11/1963 |
48085 |
Transfer in from: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
30/11/1963 |
48430 |
Transfer in from: |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
30/11/1963 |
48629 |
Transfer in from: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
30/11/1963 |
48646 |
Transfer in from: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
30/11/1963 |
48724 |
Transfer in from: |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/11/1963 |
45584 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/11/1963 |
45617 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/11/1963 |
45676 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
30/11/1963 |
92028 |
Transfer out to: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
30/11/1963 |
92029 |
Transfer out to: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
30/11/1963 |
92082 |
Transfer out to: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
30/11/1963 |
92085 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
30/11/1963 |
92107 |
Transfer out to: |
2D |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
07/12/1963 |
46448 |
Transfer in from: |
21C |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
07/12/1963 |
46505 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
07/12/1963 |
46526 |
Transfer in from: |
1C |
Watford |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
07/12/1963 |
92125 |
Transfer in from: |
2E |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/12/1963 |
48539 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
07/12/1963 |
92125 |
Transfer out to: |
2E |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/12/1963 |
43940 |
Transfer out to: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/12/1963 |
44179 |
Transfer out to: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/12/1963 |
44218 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/12/1963 |
44583 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
04/01/1964 |
D5187 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/01/1964 |
44516 |
Transfer out to: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/01/1964 |
44520 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/02/1964 |
45647 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
22/02/1964 |
42823 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
14/03/1964 |
48101 |
Transfer out to: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
14/03/1964 |
48724 |
Transfer out to: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/04/1964 |
D5183 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/04/1964 |
D5188 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/04/1964 |
D5197 |
Transfer in from: |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/04/1964 |
D5232 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/04/1964 |
D5233 |
Transfer in from: |
16C |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/04/1964 |
D5234 |
Transfer in from: |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/04/1964 |
D5236 |
Transfer in from: |
16C |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/04/1964 |
D7570 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/04/1964 |
D7582 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/04/1964 |
D7587 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
11/04/1964 |
42417 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/04/1964 |
44180 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
43940 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
44179 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
44516 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
92028 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
92029 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
12049 |
Transfer out to: |
2H |
Monument Lane |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
44813 |
Transfer out to: |
1F |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
44814 |
Transfer out to: |
1F |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
44859 |
Transfer out to: |
2J |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
44945 |
Transfer out to: |
2J |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
44963 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
44966 |
Transfer out to: |
2J |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
45250 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
45268 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
45272 |
Transfer out to: |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
92057 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
92157 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/04/1964 |
43963 |
Transfer out to: |
12D |
Workington |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/04/1964 |
43979 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/04/1964 |
44092 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/04/1964 |
44131 |
Transfer out to: |
9M |
Bury |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/04/1964 |
44160 |
Transfer out to: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/04/1964 |
44165 |
Transfer out to: |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/04/1964 |
44185 |
Transfer out to: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/04/1964 |
44211 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/04/1964 |
44263 |
Transfer out to: |
10H |
Lower Darwen |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/05/1964 |
45653 |
Transfer out to: |
10B |
Blackpool Central |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
16/05/1964 |
42400 |
Transfer out to: |
5C |
Stafford |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
16/05/1964 |
42416 |
Transfer out to: |
5C |
Stafford |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1964 |
92150 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/06/1964 |
D5226 |
Transfer in from: |
16C |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/06/1964 |
D5188 |
Transfer out to: |
16C |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
42416 |
Transfer in from: |
5C |
Stafford |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
92150 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
42421 |
Transfer out to: |
5C |
Stafford |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
42707 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
42827 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
42900 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
27/06/1964 |
42416 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
18/07/1964 |
92118 |
Transfer out to: |
2D |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
18/07/1964 |
92128 |
Transfer out to: |
2D |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
18/07/1964 |
92129 |
Transfer out to: |
2D |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
25/07/1964 |
76048 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/07/1964 |
44571 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
01/08/1964 |
76040 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
01/08/1964 |
76042 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
01/08/1964 |
76043 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
08/08/1964 |
76036 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
08/08/1964 |
76038 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
15/08/1964 |
44179 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/08/1964 |
45631 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/08/1964 |
43949 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
09/1964 |
44226 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
09/1964 |
44516 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
09/1964 |
44605 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
05/09/1964 |
43958 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/09/1964 |
44137 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
44945 |
Transfer in from: |
2J |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
44966 |
Transfer in from: |
2J |
Aston |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
03/10/1964 |
D3973 |
Transfer in from: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
03/10/1964 |
D3974 |
Transfer in from: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
03/10/1964 |
D3975 |
Transfer in from: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
03/10/1964 |
12062 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
03/10/1964 |
12066 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
03/10/1964 |
12077 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
03/10/1964 |
D5187 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/10/1964 |
45674 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
17/10/1964 |
44137 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
24/10/1964 |
43949 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
24/10/1964 |
44179 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
24/10/1964 |
46505 |
Transfer out to: |
2L |
Leamington |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
24/10/1964 |
43940 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1964 |
45272 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1964 |
45283 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1964 |
45422 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1964 |
48718 |
Transfer in from: |
3D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1964 |
44580 |
Transfer out to: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1964 |
48220 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/11/1964 |
44580 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/11/1964 |
44580 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
28/11/1964 |
43017 |
Transfer out to: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
28/11/1964 |
43122 |
Transfer out to: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/12/1964 |
44137 |
Transfer out to: |
|
Crewe Works |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/12/1964 |
44179 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
26/12/1964 |
43949 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/01/1965 |
44859 |
Transfer in from: |
2J |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/01/1965 |
45052 |
Transfer in from: |
21D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/01/1965 |
45058 |
Transfer in from: |
3D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
23/01/1965 |
76085 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
30/01/1965 |
D5239 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
30/01/1965 |
D5245 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
30/01/1965 |
D5266 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
30/01/1965 |
D7508 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
30/01/1965 |
D7518 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
30/01/1965 |
76040 |
Transfer out to: |
2J |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
20/02/1965 |
48095 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/02/1965 |
D3106 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
27/02/1965 |
48220 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
D134 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
D43 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
D5298 |
Transfer in from: |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
D67 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
D69 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
D7519 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
D7520 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
44810 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
44859 |
Transfer out to: |
2J |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
45052 |
Transfer out to: |
2J |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
45058 |
Transfer out to: |
2J |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
45422 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
92028 |
Transfer out to: |
2D |
Banbury |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
13/03/1965 |
D7519 |
Transfer out to: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
30 |
A1A-A1A |
w/e |
20/03/1965 |
D5811 |
Transfer in from: |
41F.1 |
Wath |
|
|
Diesel |
30 |
A1A-A1A |
w/e |
27/03/1965 |
D5811 |
Transfer out to: |
41C |
Wath |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
27/03/1965 |
76036 |
Transfer out to: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
27/03/1965 |
76042 |
Transfer out to: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
27/03/1965 |
76047 |
Transfer out to: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
27/03/1965 |
76086 |
Transfer out to: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
27/03/1965 |
76087 |
Transfer out to: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
27/03/1965 |
76088 |
Transfer out to: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
03/04/1965 |
44873 |
Transfer in from: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
03/04/1965 |
44910 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
03/04/1965 |
45180 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
03/04/1965 |
45410 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
30 |
A1A-A1A |
w/e |
03/04/1965 |
D5851 |
Transfer in from: |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
03/04/1965 |
44691 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
03/04/1965 |
44805 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
03/04/1965 |
44812 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
03/04/1965 |
44841 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
03/04/1965 |
44856 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
03/04/1965 |
44919 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
03/04/1965 |
45006 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
03/04/1965 |
45040 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
03/04/1965 |
45186 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
03/04/1965 |
45263 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
03/04/1965 |
45272 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
03/04/1965 |
45283 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
10/04/1965 |
D1834 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
10/04/1965 |
D5242 |
Transfer in from: |
D14 |
London (Midland) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
10/04/1965 |
D5243 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
10/04/1965 |
D5246 |
Transfer in from: |
D14 |
London (Midland) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
10/04/1965 |
D5247 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
10/04/1965 |
D5281 |
Transfer in from: |
D14 |
London (Midland) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
10/04/1965 |
D5284 |
Transfer in from: |
D14 |
London (Midland) |
|
|
Diesel |
30 |
A1A-A1A |
w/e |
10/04/1965 |
D5851 |
Transfer out to: |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
24/04/1965 |
48718 |
Transfer out to: |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
24/04/1965 |
48430 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
30 |
A1A-A1A |
w/e |
01/05/1965 |
D5683 |
Transfer in from: |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
01/05/1965 |
D3106 |
Transfer out to: |
2D |
Banbury |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
08/05/1965 |
D1814 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
08/05/1965 |
D134 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
08/05/1965 |
D43 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
08/05/1965 |
D67 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
08/05/1965 |
D69 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
30 |
A1A-A1A |
w/e |
15/05/1965 |
D5828 |
Transfer in from: |
41C |
Wath |
|
|
Diesel |
30 |
A1A-A1A |
w/e |
15/05/1965 |
D5683 |
Transfer out to: |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
30 |
A1A-A1A |
w/e |
29/05/1965 |
D5828 |
Transfer out to: |
41C |
Wath |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
29/05/1965 |
76052 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Diesel |
30 |
A1A-A1A |
w/e |
05/06/1965 |
D5538 |
Transfer in from: |
41F.1 |
Wath |
|
|
Diesel |
30 |
A1A-A1A |
w/e |
12/06/1965 |
D5830 |
Transfer in from: |
41C |
Wath |
|
|
Diesel |
30 |
A1A-A1A |
w/e |
12/06/1965 |
D5538 |
Transfer out to: |
41C |
Wath |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
D1813 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
D1815 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
46505 |
Transfer in from: |
2L |
Leamington |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
48016 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
48755 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
48762 |
Transfer in from: |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
D5193 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
D5202 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
D5223 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
D7585 |
Transfer in from: |
16C |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
D7596 |
Transfer in from: |
16C |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
44775 |
Transfer out to: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
44829 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
44843 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
44873 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
44910 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
44966 |
Transfer out to: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
44981 |
Transfer out to: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
45180 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
45264 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
45280 |
Transfer out to: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
45369 |
Transfer out to: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
45410 |
Transfer out to: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
45447 |
Transfer out to: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Diesel |
30 |
A1A-A1A |
w/e |
03/07/1965 |
D5830 |
Transfer out to: |
41C |
Wath |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
17/07/1965 |
44057 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
30 |
A1A-A1A |
w/e |
17/07/1965 |
D5839 |
Transfer in from: |
41C |
Wath |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
17/07/1965 |
D7519 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
17/07/1965 |
76052 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
17/07/1965 |
92028 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Banbury |
|
|
Diesel |
30 |
A1A-A1A |
w/e |
24/07/1965 |
D5843 |
Transfer in from: |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
30 |
A1A-A1A |
w/e |
24/07/1965 |
D5839 |
Transfer out to: |
41C |
Wath |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
07/08/1965 |
D5242 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
07/08/1965 |
76052 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Diesel |
30 |
A1A-A1A |
w/e |
21/08/1965 |
D5856 |
Transfer in from: |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
30 |
A1A-A1A |
w/e |
21/08/1965 |
D5843 |
Transfer out to: |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
30 |
A1A-A1A |
w/e |
18/09/1965 |
D5856 |
Transfer out to: |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
48385 |
Transfer in from: |
1H |
Northampton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
48603 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
30 |
A1A-A1A |
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
D5827 |
Transfer in from: |
41F.1 |
Wath |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
44663 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
44666 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
44776 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
44777 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
44944 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
44945 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
44965 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/10/1965 |
D3020 |
Transfer in from: |
3D |
Aston |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/10/1965 |
D3107 |
Transfer in from: |
2J |
Aston |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/10/1965 |
D3774 |
Transfer in from: |
21D |
Aston |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/10/1965 |
D3775 |
Transfer in from: |
21D |
Aston |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/10/1965 |
D3838 |
Transfer in from: |
21D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
16/10/1965 |
46492 |
Transfer in from: |
3D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
16/10/1965 |
76040 |
Transfer in from: |
2J |
Aston |
|
|
Diesel |
30 |
A1A-A1A |
w/e |
23/10/1965 |
D5827 |
Transfer out to: |
41C |
Wath |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/11/1965 |
44057 |
Transfer out to: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
27/11/1965 |
48016 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
03/01/1966 |
48101 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
03/01/1966 |
48375 |
Transfer in from: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
03/01/1966 |
48522 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
03/01/1966 |
48725 |
Transfer in from: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
03/01/1966 |
48729 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
03/01/1966 |
92074 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
22/01/1966 |
48109 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
26/02/1966 |
48762 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/03/1966 |
45067 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/03/1966 |
45410 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
26/03/1966 |
46421 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
26/03/1966 |
46429 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
26/03/1966 |
46445 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
26/03/1966 |
46490 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
26/03/1966 |
48336 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
26/03/1966 |
48517 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
26/03/1966 |
48529 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
26/03/1966 |
48556 |
Transfer in from: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
26/03/1966 |
48659 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
26/03/1966 |
76086 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1813 |
Transfer out to: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1814 |
Transfer out to: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1815 |
Transfer out to: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1834 |
Transfer out to: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D5183 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D5193 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D5197 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D5202 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D5223 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D5226 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D5232 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D5234 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D5236 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D5239 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D5243 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D5245 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D5246 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D5247 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D5266 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D5281 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D5284 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D5298 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D7508 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D7518 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D7519 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D7520 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D7570 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D7582 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D7585 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D7587 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D7596 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
D5233 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/05/1966 |
48669 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
21/05/1966 |
48659 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
45067 |
Transfer out to: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
92029 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
92074 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
92125 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
92135 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
18/06/1966 |
76038 |
Transfer out to: |
6F |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
18/06/1966 |
76043 |
Transfer out to: |
6F |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
18/06/1966 |
76086 |
Transfer out to: |
6F |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
02/07/1966 |
46429 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
02/07/1966 |
46445 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
16/07/1966 |
46526 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
30/07/1966 |
92164 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
06/08/1966 |
92029 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
06/08/1966 |
46490 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
06/08/1966 |
46505 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
06/08/1966 |
92137 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
20/08/1966 |
92138 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
20/08/1966 |
92155 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
m/e |
09/1966 |
48101 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
m/e |
09/1966 |
48629 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
m/e |
09/1966 |
48755 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1966 |
92013 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1966 |
92128 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1966 |
76040 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1966 |
76048 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1966 |
45410 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1966 |
48153 |
Transfer in from: |
31E |
Dawsholm |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1966 |
48339 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1966 |
48385 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1966 |
92013 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
92030 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
92234 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
46421 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
46454 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
15/10/1966 |
D3049 |
Transfer in from: |
86A |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
15/10/1966 |
46443 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
15/10/1966 |
46448 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
15/10/1966 |
46492 |
Transfer out to: |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
22/10/1966 |
92028 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
29/10/1966 |
92030 |
Transfer out to: |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
29/10/1966 |
92150 |
Transfer out to: |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
29/10/1966 |
92136 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
92002 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
92223 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
92128 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
92151 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
92152 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
03/12/1966 |
48085 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
03/12/1966 |
48375 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
03/12/1966 |
48522 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
03/12/1966 |
48133 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
48073 |
Transfer in from: |
16B |
Colwick |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
48128 |
Transfer in from: |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
48645 |
Transfer in from: |
40E |
Colwick |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
D3049 |
Transfer out to: |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
92002 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
92029 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
92139 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
92223 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
92234 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
04/02/1967 |
48538 |
Transfer in from: |
16B |
Colwick |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
04/02/1967 |
48690 |
Transfer in from: |
16B |
Colwick |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
04/02/1967 |
48728 |
Transfer in from: |
16B |
Colwick |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
04/02/1967 |
48153 |
Transfer out to: |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
04/02/1967 |
48517 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
04/02/1967 |
48646 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
04/03/1967 |
48529 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
48073 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
48128 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
48220 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
48336 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
48351 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
48603 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
48645 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
48725 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
48729 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
48538 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
48690 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
48728 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
18/03/1967 |
48556 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
D3027 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
D3985 |
Transfer in from: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
12035 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
D3577 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
02/11/1968 |
12112 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/12/1968 |
D4132 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/12/1968 |
D4133 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
29/12/1968 |
D3221 |
Transfer in from: |
70B |
Feltham |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
29/12/1968 |
D4132 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
29/12/1968 |
D4133 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
01/02/1969 |
D3221 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
17/05/1969 |
D3511 |
Transfer in from: |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
17/05/1969 |
D3864 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/09/1969 |
D4149 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/09/1969 |
D3864 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
31/10/1969 |
12112 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
01/11/1969 |
D4138 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/12/1969 |
D3102 |
Transfer in from: |
82C |
Swindon |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/12/1969 |
D3103 |
Transfer in from: |
86B |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
24/01/1970 |
D3102 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
14/02/1970 |
D3103 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/09/1970 |
D4150 |
Transfer in from: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
19/09/1970 |
D3082 |
Transfer out to: |
16F |
Burton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
14/11/1970 |
D3107 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/01/1971 |
D3027 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
24/04/1971 |
D3511 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
08/05/1971 |
D3112 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/10/1971 |
D3774 |
Transfer out to: |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/10/1971 |
D3775 |
Transfer out to: |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
30/10/1971 |
D3985 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/12/1971 |
D3864 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
2w/e |
01/01/1972 |
D3864 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
08/01/1972 |
D3951 |
Transfer in from: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
15/04/1972 |
D3510 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
20/05/1972 |
D3112 |
Transfer out to: |
30A |
Stratford |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
20/05/1972 |
D3248 |
Transfer out to: |
30A |
Stratford |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
20/05/1972 |
D3838 |
Transfer out to: |
30A |
Stratford |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
20/05/1972 |
D3865 |
Transfer out to: |
30A |
Stratford |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
15/07/1972 |
D4006 |
Transfer in from: |
86B |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/01/1973 |
D3700 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
03/02/1973 |
D3764 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
23/06/1973 |
D6773 |
Transfer in from: |
31B |
March |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
21/07/1973 |
D6778 |
Transfer in from: |
31B |
March |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
21/07/1973 |
D6773 |
Transfer out to: |
MC |
March |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
3w/e |
06/10/1973 |
08013 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/10/1973 |
08838 |
Transfer out to: |
AN |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
27/10/1973 |
D6820 |
Transfer in from: |
31B |
March |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
27/10/1973 |
D6778 |
Transfer out to: |
MR |
March |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
24/11/1973 |
D3426 |
Transfer in from: |
16C |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
15/12/1973 |
D6820 |
Transfer out to: |
MR |
March |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/01/1974 |
D3426 |
Transfer out to: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/02/1974 |
D3908 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
23/02/1974 |
D6827 |
Transfer in from: |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
09/03/1974 |
D6827 |
Transfer out to: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1974 |
08134 |
Transfer in from: |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
3w/e |
03/05/1975 |
08647 |
Transfer in from: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
3w/e |
03/05/1975 |
08783 |
Transfer out to: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
14/06/1975 |
08893 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
3w/e |
04/01/1976 |
08102 |
Transfer out to: |
DR |
Doncaster |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
2w/e |
24/01/1976 |
08928 |
Transfer in from: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
10/1976 |
08199 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
10/1976 |
08806 |
Transfer out to: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
05/1977 |
08742 |
Transfer in from: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
01/1978 |
08199 |
Transfer out to: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
30/11/1979 |
08635 |
Transfer in from: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
30/11/1979 |
08908 |
Transfer out to: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
15/03/1981 |
08182 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
20/08/1981 |
08134 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
09/1981 |
08928 |
Transfer out to: |
TS |
Tyseley |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
29/11/1981 |
08467 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
25/09/1983 |
08103 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
11/10/1987 |
08461 |
Transfer out to: |
SF |
Stratford |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
27/07/1988 |
08395 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
02/04/1997 |
08647 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
26/06/1998 |
08893 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
31/08/2005 |
08740 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
28/02/2007 |
08635 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
28/02/2007 |
08807 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
30/09/2008 |
08919 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|