Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 708 Today
» 1270 Yesterday
» 7071 Week
» 9653 Month
» 274286 Year
» 1495851 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Southall


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 01/01/1934 9316 Snapshot        
Steam 54xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 01/12/1945 5420 Transfer in from: 172 Westbury    
Steam 54xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 29/12/1945 5411 Transfer in from:        
Steam 54xx 0-6-0PT 8w/e 23/03/1946 5418 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 30/10/1948 3618 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 30/10/1948 3659 Transfer in from:        
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 03/12/1949 4917 Transfer in from:        
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 03/12/1949 4944 Transfer in from:        
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 03/12/1949 4999 Transfer in from:        
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 03/12/1949 5983 Transfer in from:        
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 03/12/1949 5989 Transfer in from:        
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 20/05/1950 7910 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 31/08/1950 9726 Transfer in from:        
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 31/10/1950 5952 Transfer in from:        
Steam 15xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 30/11/1950 1501 Transfer in from:        
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 4956 Transfer in from:        
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 5918 Transfer in from:        
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 7309 Transfer in from: 162 Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 28/02/1951 4931 Transfer in from:        
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 28/02/1951 9409 Transfer in from:        
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 4w/e 28/02/1951 7309 Transfer out to: 82D Westbury    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 31/03/1951 4939 Transfer in from:        
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 4w/e 31/03/1951 9309 Transfer in from: 101 Old Oak Common    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 30/04/1951 77380 Transfer in from: 86B Newport Pill    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 3w/e 19/05/1951 4917 Transfer out to: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Steam 54xx 0-6-0PT 3w/e 19/05/1951 5411 Transfer out to: 83B Taunton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 m/e 31/07/1951 90207 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 31/08/1951 77408 Transfer in from:        
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 4w/e 31/08/1951 9302 Transfer in from: 121 Reading (W.R.)    
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 4w/e 31/08/1951 9304 Transfer in from: 41 Didcot    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 30/09/1951 1474 Transfer in from:        
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 4w/e 30/09/1951 2880 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 30/09/1951 77408 Transfer out to: 85A Worcester    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 31/12/1951 1426 Transfer in from: 84J Croes Newydd    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 29/02/1952 4999 Transfer out to: 83G Penzance    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 3w/e 17/05/1952 2899 Transfer in from:        
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 3w/e 17/05/1952 6300 Transfer in from: 24 Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 6w/e 30/06/1952 90174 Transfer in from:        
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 2w/e 12/07/1952 2845 Transfer in from: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 7w/e 31/08/1952 4381 Transfer in from: Sw Wks Swindon Works    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 2821 Transfer in from: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 3845 Transfer in from:        
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 4908 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 01/11/1952 90485 Transfer in from: 84C Banbury    
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 4w/e 01/11/1952 9302 Transfer out to: 81E Didcot    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 29/11/1952 1462 Transfer in from: 81F Oxford    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 4w/e 29/11/1952 2858 Transfer in from: 84B Oxley    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 27/12/1952 8750 Transfer in from:        
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 4w/e 21/02/1953 9300 Transfer in from: 81E Didcot    
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 4w/e 21/02/1953 9301 Transfer in from: 81E Didcot    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 4w/e 21/02/1953 2845 Transfer out to: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 4w/e 21/02/1953 6300 Transfer out to: 83E St Blazey    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 21/03/1953 4979 Transfer in from:        
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 21/03/1953 5953 Transfer in from:        
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 4w/e 21/03/1953 2821 Transfer out to: 86G Pontypool Road    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 18/04/1953 6934 Transfer in from:        
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 m/e 05/1953 4381 Condemned      
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 4w/e 16/05/1953 3845 Transfer out to: 81E Didcot    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1953 6655 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1953 6664 Transfer in from: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 30/01/1954 6654 Transfer in from: 81E Didcot    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 27/02/1954 4908 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 27/03/1954 1410 Transfer in from: 84J Croes Newydd    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 24/04/1954 90313 Transfer in from: 84C Banbury    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 4w/e 24/04/1954 2858 Transfer out to: 84C Banbury    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 24/04/1954 6664 Transfer out to: 81B Slough    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 19/06/1954 4908 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 19/06/1954 4939 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 4w/e 19/06/1954 9304 Transfer out to: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 4w/e 19/06/1954 9316 Transfer out to: 84B Oxley    
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1954 9300 Transfer out to: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 09/10/1954 6991 Transfer in from: WES Westbury    
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 4w/e 09/10/1954 9305 Transfer in from: 87H Neyland    
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 4w/e 09/10/1954 9313 Transfer in from: 87H Neyland    
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 4w/e 09/10/1954 9315 Transfer in from: 87H Neyland    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 04/12/1954 90284 Transfer in from: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 01/01/1955 4908 Transfer out to: 83G Penzance    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 01/01/1955 4931 Transfer out to: 83G Penzance    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 01/01/1955 5952 Transfer out to: 83G Penzance    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 01/01/1955 6934 Transfer out to: 83G Penzance    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 29/01/1955 1402 Transfer in from:        
Steam 54xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 29/01/1955 5418 Transfer out to: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 8w/e 26/03/1955 90284 Transfer out to: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 21/05/1955 1415 Transfer in from: BRD Bristol Bath Road    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 21/05/1955 1402 Transfer out to: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 4w/e 21/05/1955 9309 Transfer out to: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 16/07/1955 1446 Transfer in from:        
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 13/08/1955 1410 Transfer out to: 82C Swindon    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 4w/e 08/10/1955 2890 Transfer in from:        
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 4w/e 08/10/1955 3836 Transfer in from: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 08/10/1955 4979 Transfer out to: 81E Didcot    
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 4w/e 08/10/1955 9301 Transfer out to: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 4w/e 08/10/1955 9313 Transfer out to: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 4w/e 08/10/1955 9315 Transfer out to: 82C Swindon    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 05/11/1955 1436 Transfer in from: SDN Swindon    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 4w/e 05/11/1955 3814 Transfer in from: 81E Didcot    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 05/11/1955 1462 Transfer out to: 82C Swindon    
Steam 47xx 2-8-0 4w/e 03/12/1955 4707 Transfer in from: 114 Oxley    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 03/12/1955 9413 Transfer in from:        
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 03/12/1955 9417 Transfer in from:        
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 03/12/1955 9409 Transfer out to: 81E Didcot    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 28/01/1956 9409 Transfer in from: 81E Didcot    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1956 5990 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 24/03/1956 9789 Transfer in from:        
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 21/04/1956 5990 Transfer out to: 83G Penzance    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T m/e 16/06/1956 6109 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 m/e 16/06/1956 90355 Transfer in from: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 m/e 16/06/1956 90529 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 m/e 16/06/1956 90630 Transfer in from: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 16/06/1956 9469 Transfer in from: 87F Llanelly    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 m/e 16/06/1956 4956 Transfer out to: 82D Westbury    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 4w/e 11/08/1956 2853 Transfer in from: 84J Croes Newydd    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/08/1956 6119 Transfer in from: 86E Severn Tunnel Junction    
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 4w/e 03/11/1956 6313 Transfer in from: 81E Didcot    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 01/12/1956 6119 Transfer out to: 86E Severn Tunnel Junction    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 26/01/1957 8413 Transfer in from:        
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 26/01/1957 9405 Transfer in from: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T m/e 02/1957 1415 Condemned      
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 23/02/1957 1406 Transfer in from: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 23/02/1957 6109 Transfer out to: 81B Slough    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 8w/e 20/04/1957 5996 Transfer in from:        
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8w/e 20/04/1957 9479 Transfer in from: 87F Llanelly    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 8w/e 20/04/1957 90485 Transfer out to: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 4w/e 13/07/1957 2835 Transfer in from: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 13/07/1957 5989 Transfer out to: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 10/08/1957 5727 Transfer in from: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 02/11/1957 5727 Transfer out to: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 30/11/1957 1438 Transfer in from:        
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 5953 Transfer out to: 87F Llanelly    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 25/01/1958 1458 Transfer in from: 84F Stourbridge Junction    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 25/01/1958 90356 Transfer in from: 84G Shrewsbury    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 25/01/1958 4944 Transfer out to: 83D Laira    
Steam 54xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 25/01/1958 5420 Transfer out to: 84C Banbury    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 25/01/1958 5983 Transfer out to: 83D Laira    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 22/02/1958 4934 Transfer in from: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 22/02/1958 5933 Transfer in from:        
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T m/e 03/1958 1406 Condemned      
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1958 4907 Transfer in from: 81F Oxford    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 4w/e 22/03/1958 2835 Transfer out to: 82C Swindon    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 4w/e 22/03/1958 2880 Transfer out to: 81F Oxford    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 4w/e 22/03/1958 3814 Transfer out to: 81F Oxford    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 22/03/1958 90207 Transfer out to: 87G Carmarthen    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 22/03/1958 90529 Transfer out to: 87G Carmarthen    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 19/04/1958 1431 Transfer in from:        
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 19/04/1958 4925 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 19/04/1958 90313 Transfer out to: 84C Banbury    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 4w/e 17/05/1958 3823 Transfer in from: 86E Severn Tunnel Junction    
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 6313 Transfer out to: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 14/06/1958 6654 Transfer out to: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 14/06/1958 6655 Transfer out to: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 4w/e 09/08/1958 9305 Transfer out to: 84E Tyseley    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T m/e 09/1958 1446 Condemned      
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 4w/e 06/09/1958 3823 Transfer out to: 81F Oxford    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T m/e 10/1958 1436 Condemned      
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 04/10/1958 1420 Transfer in from: 81F Oxford    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 04/10/1958 6157 Transfer in from: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1958 6967 Transfer in from: 82C Swindon    
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1958 7923 Transfer in from: 82C Swindon    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 04/10/1958 1426 Transfer out to: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 04/10/1958 1438 Transfer out to: 82C Swindon    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 04/10/1958 1458 Transfer out to: 84J Croes Newydd    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 4w/e 04/10/1958 2853 Transfer out to: 84C Banbury    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 3w/e 13/10/1958 1474 Transfer out to: 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 01/11/1958 4996 Transfer in from: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 01/11/1958 5925 Transfer in from: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 4w/e 01/11/1958 2890 Transfer out to: 84C Banbury    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 29/11/1958 8456 Transfer in from:        
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 29/11/1958 9422 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 29/11/1958 9479 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 21/02/1959 3715 Transfer in from: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 21/02/1959 90466 Transfer in from: 84C Banbury    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 4w/e 21/02/1959 2899 Transfer out to: 83D Laira    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 18/04/1959 9642 Transfer in from: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 16/05/1959 8451 Transfer in from: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 16/05/1959 8761 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 16/05/1959 8769 Transfer in from:        
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 16/05/1959 9469 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 06/1959 9417 Condemned      
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 4w/e 13/06/1959 3836 Transfer out to: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 13/06/1959 9405 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 11/07/1959 90572 Transfer in from: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 11/07/1959 90268 Transfer out to: 84C Banbury    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 08/08/1959 1420 Transfer out to: 83D Laira    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 08/08/1959 90572 Transfer out to: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 31/10/1959 5918 Transfer out to: 81E Didcot    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 28/11/1959 6149 Transfer in from:        
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 28/11/1959 6159 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 28/11/1959 9791 Transfer in from:        
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 28/11/1959 4907 Transfer out to: 85A Worcester    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 28/11/1959 4996 Transfer out to: 85A Worcester    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 28/11/1959 5996 Transfer out to: 85A Worcester    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 28/11/1959 6157 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 26/12/1959 6110 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 26/12/1959 9490 Transfer in from: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 01/1960 8413 Condemned      
Steam 16xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 30/01/1960 1669 Transfer in from: 84K Wrexham Rhosddu    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 30/01/1960 6133 Transfer in from: 81F Oxford    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 30/01/1960 6144 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 30/01/1960 90485 Transfer in from: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 30/01/1960 1431 Transfer out to: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 27/02/1960 1407 Transfer in from:        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 27/02/1960 D3761 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 27/02/1960 D3762 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 27/02/1960 4995 Transfer in from: 81F Oxford    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 4w/e 27/02/1960 92004 Transfer in from: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 4w/e 27/02/1960 92207 Transfer in from: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 27/02/1960 3715 Transfer out to: 84A Stafford Road    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 27/02/1960 5933 Transfer out to: 81F Oxford    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 27/02/1960 8761 Transfer out to: 81F Oxford    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 27/02/1960 90485 Transfer out to: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 26/03/1960 6141 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 26/03/1960 90312 Transfer in from: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 4w/e 26/03/1960 92208 Transfer in from: 83D Laira    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 26/03/1960 9490 Transfer out to: 85A Worcester    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 23/04/1960 D3196 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 23/04/1960 D3753 Transfer in from: 87C Danygraig    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 23/04/1960 D3754 Transfer in from: 87C Danygraig    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 21/05/1960 1474 Transfer in from: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 21/05/1960 D3598 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 21/05/1960 D3196 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 21/05/1960 8750 Transfer out to: 87D Swansea East Dock    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T m/e 06/1960 1407 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 18/06/1960 D3598 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 16/07/1960 D3756 Transfer in from: 81B Slough    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 4w/e 16/07/1960 92224 Transfer in from: 83D Laira    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 4w/e 16/07/1960 92226 Transfer in from: 84C Banbury    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 16/07/1960 D3754 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 16/07/1960 4934 Transfer out to: 83A Newton Abbot    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 13/08/1960 D3754 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 13/08/1960 D3949 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 13/08/1960 D3955 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 16xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 13/08/1960 1669 Transfer out to: 87H Neyland    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 13/08/1960 6110 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 13/08/1960 6144 Transfer out to: 85D Kidderminster    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 13/08/1960 6159 Transfer out to: 81E Didcot    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 4w/e 10/09/1960 92238 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 4w/e 10/09/1960 92239 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 4w/e 10/09/1960 92240 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 4w/e 08/10/1960 92204 Transfer in from: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 05/11/1960 6110 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 05/11/1960 6132 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 05/11/1960 90685 Transfer in from: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 05/11/1960 6141 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 4w/e 05/11/1960 92004 Transfer out to: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 4w/e 05/11/1960 92204 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 4w/e 05/11/1960 92226 Transfer out to: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 03/12/1960 3622 Transfer in from:        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 03/12/1960 D3961 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/12/1960 6112 Transfer in from: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 03/12/1960 8731 Transfer in from: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 03/12/1960 90565 Transfer in from: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 23/12/1960 D4009 1st Allocation        
Steam 15xx 0-6-0PT m/e 01/1961 1501 Condemned      
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 28/01/1961 1474 Transfer out to: 81B Slough    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 25/02/1961 6162 Transfer in from:        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 25/02/1961 D4009 Transfer out to: 83E St Blazey    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 25/03/1961 D3512 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 25/03/1961 4945 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 25/03/1961 4986 Transfer in from: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 25/03/1961 5914 Transfer in from: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 25/03/1961 5945 Transfer in from: 82C Swindon    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 25/03/1961 8770 Transfer in from: 81B Slough    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 25/03/1961 90312 Transfer out to: 81E Didcot    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 25/03/1961 90565 Transfer out to: 81E Didcot    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 04/1961 8769 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 20/05/1961 8422 Transfer in from: 83D Laira    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 17/06/1961 1474 Transfer in from: 81B Slough    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 17/06/1961 6149 Transfer out to: 81F Oxford    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 15/07/1961 D3196 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 4w/e 15/07/1961 92239 Transfer out to: 82D Westbury    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 12/08/1961 D3759 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 47xx 2-8-0 4w/e 07/10/1961 4700 Transfer in from:        
Steam 47xx 2-8-0 4w/e 07/10/1961 4702 Transfer in from:        
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1961 4987 Transfer in from: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1961 5901 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 07/10/1961 90565 Transfer in from: 84C Banbury    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 07/10/1961 90693 Transfer in from: 84C Banbury    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 m/e 11/1961 4945 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 11/1961 8451 Condemned      
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 02/12/1961 4969 Transfer in from: 81E Didcot    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 02/12/1961 9495 Transfer in from: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 4w/e 02/12/1961 92208 Transfer out to: 88A Cardiff Canton    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 02/12/1961 9422 Transfer out to: 81B Slough    
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 30/12/1961 6974 Transfer in from:        
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 4w/e 30/12/1961 92238 Transfer out to: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 27/01/1962 4989 Transfer in from: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 27/01/1962 9789 Transfer out to: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 24/02/1962 6994 Transfer in from: 83C Exeter    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 24/02/1962 6112 Transfer out to: 81E Didcot    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 24/02/1962 9791 Transfer out to: 81E Didcot    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T m/e 03/1962 6162 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 24/03/1962 3659 Transfer out to: 83C Exeter    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 m/e 04/1962 4987 Condemned      
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 21/04/1962 4976 Transfer in from: 81E Didcot    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 21/04/1962 5901 Transfer out to: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 m/e 05/1962 4986 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 05/1962 9409 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 19/05/1962 9495 Transfer out to: 81B Slough    
Steam 47xx 2-8-0 m/e 06/1962 4702 Condemned      
Steam Hall 4-6-0 m/e 06/1962 4995 Condemned      
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 16/06/1962 6977 Transfer in from: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 16/06/1962 1474 Transfer out to: 81B Slough    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 07/1962 8422 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 07/1962 8731 Condemned      
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 14/07/1962 4956 Transfer in from: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 14/07/1962 5917 Transfer in from: 83C Exeter    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 14/07/1962 D3949 Transfer out to: 81F Oxford    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 14/07/1962 5914 Transfer out to: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 m/e 08/1962 4925 Condemned      
Steam 16xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 11/08/1962 1654 Transfer in from: 87F Llanelly    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 11/08/1962 4944 Transfer in from: 89A Shrewsbury    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 11/08/1962 8465 Transfer in from: 82C Swindon    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 11/08/1962 9415 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 25/08/1962 90466 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 m/e 09/1962 4944 Condemned      
Steam Hall 4-6-0 m/e 09/1962 4969 Condemned      
Steam Hall 4-6-0 m/e 09/1962 5917 Condemned      
Diesel D3/10 0-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1962 15100 Transfer in from: 82C Swindon    
Steam 47xx 2-8-0 4w/e 06/10/1962 4703 Transfer in from: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Steam 47xx 2-8-0 4w/e 06/10/1962 4705 Transfer in from: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Steam 47xx 2-8-0 4w/e 06/10/1962 4706 Transfer in from: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Steam Grange 4-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1962 6809 Transfer in from: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Steam Grange 4-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1962 6834 Transfer in from: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Steam Grange 4-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1962 6841 Transfer in from: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Steam Grange 4-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1962 6869 Transfer in from: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 06/10/1962 90069 Transfer in from: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 06/10/1962 90149 Transfer in from: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 06/10/1962 90572 Transfer in from: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 06/10/1962 90573 Transfer in from: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 06/10/1962 90579 Transfer in from: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1962 4956 Transfer out to: 82D Westbury    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1962 5925 Transfer out to: 82D Westbury    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1962 5945 Transfer out to: 81F Oxford    
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1962 6977 Transfer out to: 82D Westbury    
Steam 47xx 2-8-0 23/10/1962 4700 Condemned      
Steam 47xx 2-8-0 4w/e 03/11/1962 4701 Transfer in from:        
Steam 47xx 2-8-0 4w/e 03/11/1962 4704 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 03/11/1962 90544 Transfer in from: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 4w/e 03/11/1962 92245 Transfer in from: 81F Oxford    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 4w/e 03/11/1962 92224 Transfer out to: 81F Oxford    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 12/11/1962 90174 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 12/11/1962 90355 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 12/11/1962 90356 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 12/11/1962 90565 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 12/11/1962 90630 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 12/11/1962 90693 Condemned      
Steam Hall 4-6-0 2w/e 17/11/1962 5929 Transfer in from: 82D Westbury    
Steam 47xx 2-8-0 2w/e 17/11/1962 4701 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 47xx 2-8-0 2w/e 17/11/1962 4703 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 47xx 2-8-0 2w/e 17/11/1962 4704 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 08/12/1962 90069 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 08/12/1962 90149 Transfer out to: 41F Mexborough    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 08/12/1962 90544 Transfer out to: 36C Frodingham    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 08/12/1962 90572 Transfer out to: 41F Mexborough    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 08/12/1962 90573 Transfer out to: 36C Frodingham    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 08/12/1962 90579 Transfer out to: 41F Mexborough    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 08/12/1962 90685 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 12/12/1962 8770 Condemned      
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 4w/e 15/12/1962 2873 Transfer in from: 86J Aberdare    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 4w/e 15/12/1962 2899 Transfer in from: 83D Laira    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 4w/e 15/12/1962 3834 Transfer in from: 86E Severn Tunnel Junction    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 4w/e 15/12/1962 3854 Transfer in from: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 15/12/1962 5971 Transfer in from: 84G Shrewsbury    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 15/12/1962 5985 Transfer in from: 84B Oxley    
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 15/12/1962 6986 Transfer in from: 84F Stourbridge Junction    
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 15/12/1962 7922 Transfer in from: 84F Stourbridge Junction    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 12/01/1963 8426 Transfer in from: 84A Stafford Road    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 09/02/1963 3665 Transfer in from: 81B Slough    
Steam 16xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 09/02/1963 1654 Transfer out to: 81B Slough    
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 w/e 30/03/1963 6994 Transfer out to: 89A Shrewsbury    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 4w/e 06/04/1963 2841 Transfer in from: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 4w/e 06/04/1963 2851 Transfer in from: 84C Banbury    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 4w/e 06/04/1963 2856 Transfer in from: 84B Oxley    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 4w/e 06/04/1963 2875 Transfer in from: 84C Banbury    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 06/04/1963 4976 Transfer out to: 81F Oxford    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 06/04/1963 5971 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 06/04/1963 5985 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam Grange 4-6-0 4w/e 06/04/1963 6834 Transfer out to: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 04/05/1963 6991 Transfer out to: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 m/e 17/06/1963 2851 Condemned      
Steam Grange 4-6-0 4w/e 29/06/1963 6875 Transfer in from: 88L Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 4w/e 29/06/1963 3834 Transfer out to: 83B Taunton    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 29/06/1963 4989 Transfer out to: 86G Pontypool Road    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 29/06/1963 5929 Transfer out to: 86G Pontypool Road    
Steam Grange 4-6-0 m/e 07/1963 6809 Condemned      
Diesel D3/10 0-6-0 5w/e 31/08/1963 15100 Transfer out to: 82C Swindon    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5w/e 31/08/1963 3618 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 28/09/1963 D3954 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 28/09/1963 4903 Transfer in from: 83B Taunton    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 28/09/1963 9406 Transfer in from: 81B Slough    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 28/09/1963 9422 Transfer in from: 81B Slough    
Steam 47xx 2-8-0 4w/e 28/09/1963 4706 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 10/1963 8456 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 11/1963 8426 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 11/1963 8465 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 11/1963 9413 Condemned      
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 02/11/1963 6961 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 02/11/1963 6978 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 47xx 2-8-0 4w/e 02/11/1963 4705 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 47xx 2-8-0 4w/e 02/11/1963 4707 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4w/e 30/11/1963 5508 Transfer in from: 87H Neyland    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4w/e 30/11/1963 5531 Transfer in from: 84A Laira    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4w/e 30/11/1963 5545 Transfer in from: 87H Neyland    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4w/e 30/11/1963 5564 Transfer in from: 82C Swindon    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4w/e 30/11/1963 5569 Transfer in from: 82C Swindon    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4w/e 30/11/1963 5570 Transfer in from: 82C Swindon    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4w/e 30/11/1963 5571 Transfer in from: 87H Neyland    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 4w/e 30/11/1963 92229 Transfer in from: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 4w/e 30/11/1963 92241 Transfer in from: 88L Cardiff East Dock    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 4w/e 30/11/1963 92246 Transfer in from: 88L Cardiff East Dock    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 4w/e 30/11/1963 92250 Transfer in from: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 30/11/1963 9707 Transfer in from:        
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 4w/e 30/11/1963 2875 Transfer out to: 88A Cardiff East Dock    
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1963 6967 Transfer out to: 81F Oxford    
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1963 7910 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 30/11/1963 9406 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 30/11/1963 9415 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 30/11/1963 9422 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 m/e 12/1963 2841 Condemned      
Steam 4575 2-6-2T m/e 12/1963 5570 Condemned      
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T m/e 12/1963 6133 Condemned      
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 4w/e 28/12/1963 2879 Transfer in from: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4w/e 28/12/1963 5573 Transfer in from: 82D Westbury    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 4w/e 28/12/1963 92210 Transfer in from: 88L Cardiff East Dock    
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 28/12/1963 6974 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 01/1964 3665 Condemned      
Steam 4575 2-6-2T m/e 01/1964 5573 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 25/01/1964 4622 Transfer in from: 83B Taunton    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 25/01/1964 4919 Transfer in from: 82C Swindon    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 25/01/1964 6139 Transfer in from: 81E Didcot    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 22/02/1964 D3804 Transfer in from: 82C Swindon    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 22/02/1964 6117 Transfer in from: 81B Slough    
Steam Grange 4-6-0 4w/e 22/02/1964 6875 Transfer out to: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 m/e 04/1964 2856 Condemned      
Steam Castle 4-6-0 13/04/1964 7020 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 6w/e 13/04/1964 D3804 Transfer out to: 81F Oxford    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 3w/e 04/05/1964 3848 Transfer in from: 86E Severn Tunnel Junction    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 06/1964 4622 Condemned      
Steam Castle 4-6-0 22/06/1964 4080 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 7w/e 22/06/1964 4697 Transfer in from: 82C Swindon    
Steam Castle 4-6-0 22/06/1964 5002 Transfer in from: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 7w/e 22/06/1964 5971 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 7w/e 22/06/1964 6143 Transfer in from:        
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 7w/e 22/06/1964 6160 Transfer in from: 81B Slough    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 7w/e 22/06/1964 6167 Transfer in from:        
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 7w/e 22/06/1964 6959 Transfer in from:        
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 7w/e 22/06/1964 6998 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 7w/e 22/06/1964 5545 Transfer out to: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 7w/e 22/06/1964 92210 Transfer out to: 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 7w/e 22/06/1964 92229 Transfer out to: 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 7w/e 22/06/1964 92250 Transfer out to: 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 7w/e 22/06/1964 9726 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam Castle 4-6-0 29/06/1964 5076 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 20/07/1964 6110 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam Grange 4-6-0 4w/e 20/07/1964 6841 Transfer out to: 81F Oxford    
Steam Grange 4-6-0 4w/e 20/07/1964 6869 Transfer out to: 88A Cardiff East Dock    
Steam Castle 4-6-0 m/e 08/1964 7005 Transfer in from: WOS Worcester    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 m/e 08/1964 2879 Condemned      
Steam Castle 4-6-0 10/08/1964 4080 Condemned      
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 5w/e 24/08/1964 3810 Transfer in from: 87A Neath (Court Sart)    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 5w/e 24/08/1964 6110 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 5w/e 24/08/1964 6125 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 5w/e 24/08/1964 6141 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 5w/e 24/08/1964 6142 Transfer in from:        
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 5w/e 24/08/1964 6156 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 5w/e 24/08/1964 6163 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 5w/e 24/08/1964 6165 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5w/e 24/08/1964 3622 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5w/e 24/08/1964 4697 Transfer out to: 83C Westbury    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5w/e 24/08/1964 9642 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5w/e 24/08/1964 9707 Transfer out to: 83B Taunton    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T m/e 09/1964 6142 Condemned      
Steam Castle 4-6-0 m/e 09/1964 7020 Condemned      
Steam Castle 4-6-0 01/09/1964 5002 Condemned      
Steam Castle 4-6-0 07/09/1964 7005 Condemned      
Steam Castle 4-6-0 16/09/1964 5076 Condemned      
Steam Hall 4-6-0 m/e 10/1964 4903 Condemned      
Steam Hall 4-6-0 m/e 10/1964 4919 Condemned      
Steam 4575 2-6-2T m/e 10/1964 5571 Condemned      
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 6w/e 12/10/1964 2859 Transfer in from: 88A Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 6w/e 12/10/1964 3838 Transfer in from: 81E Didcot    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 6w/e 12/10/1964 3859 Transfer in from: 81E Didcot    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 6w/e 12/10/1964 92216 Transfer in from: 87A Neath (Court Sart)    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 6w/e 12/10/1964 92222 Transfer in from: 87A Neath (Court Sart)    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 6w/e 12/10/1964 5971 Transfer out to: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6w/e 12/10/1964 6156 Transfer out to: 81E Didcot    
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 6w/e 12/10/1964 6961 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 6w/e 12/10/1964 6978 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 6w/e 12/10/1964 7923 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 m/e 11/1964 3810 Condemned      
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 m/e 11/1964 3838 Condemned      
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T m/e 11/1964 6139 Condemned      
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T w/e 08/11/1964 6128 Transfer in from: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 22/11/1964 92207 Transfer out to: 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 w/e 29/11/1964 3866 Transfer in from: 87A Neath (Court Sart)    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 m/e 12/1964 2859 Condemned      
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 m/e 12/1964 2873 Condemned      
Steam 4575 2-6-2T m/e 12/1964 5508 Condemned      
Steam 4575 2-6-2T m/e 12/1964 5531 Condemned      
Steam 4575 2-6-2T m/e 12/1964 5564 Condemned      
Steam 4575 2-6-2T m/e 12/1964 5569 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 m/e 12/1964 92245 Condemned      
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 27/12/1964 6112 Transfer in from: 81E Didcot    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T m/e 01/1965 6125 Condemned      
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 2w/e 10/01/1965 3820 Transfer in from: 81E Didcot    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 2w/e 10/01/1965 3851 Transfer in from: 81E Didcot    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 2w/e 10/01/1965 6106 Transfer in from: 81E Didcot    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 2w/e 10/01/1965 6134 Transfer in from: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 2w/e 10/01/1965 6135 Transfer in from: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 2w/e 10/01/1965 6161 Transfer in from: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 2w/e 10/01/1965 9726 Transfer in from: 81E Didcot    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 2w/e 10/01/1965 6128 Transfer out to: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 2w/e 07/02/1965 D3955 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 m/e 03/1965 2899 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 m/e 03/1965 92222 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3w/e 28/03/1965 3608 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3w/e 28/03/1965 3620 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3w/e 28/03/1965 3763 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 3w/e 28/03/1965 3812 Transfer in from: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 3w/e 28/03/1965 3818 Transfer in from: 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3w/e 28/03/1965 4609 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3w/e 28/03/1965 4611 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3w/e 28/03/1965 4638 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 3w/e 28/03/1965 8498 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 3w/e 28/03/1965 9418 Transfer in from:        
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 3w/e 28/03/1965 9463 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 3w/e 28/03/1965 9477 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 3w/e 28/03/1965 9495 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3w/e 28/03/1965 9659 Transfer in from:        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 3w/e 28/03/1965 D3756 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 3w/e 28/03/1965 6110 Transfer out to: 81F Oxford    
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 3w/e 28/03/1965 6986 Transfer out to: 81E Didcot    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 m/e 05/1965 3818 Condemned      
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 m/e 05/1965 3859 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 05/1965 4609 Condemned      
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 5w/e 16/05/1965 6156 Transfer in from: 81E Didcot    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 06/1965 3608 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 06/1965 3620 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 06/1965 3763 Condemned      
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 m/e 06/1965 3812 Condemned      
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 m/e 06/1965 3854 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 06/1965 4611 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 06/1965 4638 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 06/1965 8498 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 06/1965 9418 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 06/1965 9463 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 06/1965 9477 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 06/1965 9495 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 06/1965 9659 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 06/1965 9726 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 4w/e 13/06/1965 92209 Transfer in from: 88A Cardiff East Dock    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 13/06/1965 D3762 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 13/06/1965 D3954 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 m/e 07/1965 3820 Condemned      
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 m/e 07/1965 3848 Condemned      
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 m/e 07/1965 3851 Condemned      
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 m/e 07/1965 3866 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 02/07/1965 92241 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 11/07/1965 D3762 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 11/07/1965 D3954 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 11/07/1965 D3963 Transfer in from: 81F Oxford    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 11/07/1965 D3972 Transfer in from: 81F Oxford    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 4w/e 11/07/1965 92209 Transfer out to: 88A Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 08/08/1965 6160 Transfer out to: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 08/08/1965 7922 Transfer out to: 81F Oxford    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T m/e 09/1965 6112 Condemned      
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T m/e 09/1965 6117 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 m/e 09/1965 92240 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 6w/e 19/09/1965 13186 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 6w/e 19/09/1965 D3354 Transfer in from: 87E Landore    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 6w/e 19/09/1965 D3527 Transfer in from: 86A Cardiff Canton    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6w/e 19/09/1965 6106 Transfer out to: 81F Oxford    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6w/e 19/09/1965 6132 Transfer out to: 81F Oxford    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6w/e 19/09/1965 6134 Transfer out to: 81F Oxford    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6w/e 19/09/1965 6135 Transfer out to: 81F Oxford    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6w/e 19/09/1965 6161 Transfer out to: 81F Oxford    
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 6w/e 19/09/1965 6959 Transfer out to: 81F Oxford    
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 6w/e 19/09/1965 6998 Transfer out to: 81F Oxford    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 6w/e 19/09/1965 92216 Transfer out to: 86E Severn Tunnel Junction    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 6w/e 19/09/1965 92246 Transfer out to: 86E Severn Tunnel Junction    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T m/e 10/1965 6163 Condemned      
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T m/e 10/1965 6167 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 7w/e 07/11/1965 13186 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 7w/e 07/11/1965 6141 Transfer out to: 82E Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 7w/e 07/11/1965 6143 Transfer out to: 81F Oxford    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 7w/e 07/11/1965 6156 Transfer out to: 81F Oxford    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 7w/e 07/11/1965 6165 Transfer out to: 85A Worcester    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 5w/e 01/05/1966 D3527 Transfer out to: 86A Cardiff Canton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 5w/e 01/05/1966 D3759 Transfer out to: 86A Cardiff Canton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 7w/e 19/06/1966 D3512 Transfer out to: 85A Worcester    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 2w/e 15/01/1967 D3754 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 31/08/1967 D3196 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 31/08/1967 D3354 Transfer out to: 91M To London Midland Region    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 9w/e 18/03/1968 D3961 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 9w/e 18/03/1968 D3963 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 9w/e 09/11/1968 D3753 Transfer out to: 86A Cardiff Canton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 9w/e 25/01/1969 D3761 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 9w/e 25/01/1969 D3762 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 9w/e 25/01/1969 D3954 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 9w/e 25/01/1969 D3972 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common