Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 100 Today
» 1048 Yesterday
» 2085 Week
» 9269 Month
» 317250 Year
» 1201631 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Southampton Docks


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam B4 0-4-0T 01/01/1948 101 Snapshot        
Steam B4 0-4-0T 01/01/1948 147 Snapshot        
Steam B4 0-4-0T 01/01/1948 176 Snapshot        
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 2112 Snapshot        
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 2156 Snapshot        
Steam E1-1 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 2162 Snapshot        
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 2689 Snapshot        
Steam USA 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 61 Snapshot        
Steam USA 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 62 Snapshot        
Steam USA 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 63 Snapshot        
Steam USA 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 64 Snapshot        
Steam USA 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 65 Snapshot        
Steam USA 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 66 Snapshot        
Steam USA 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 67 Snapshot        
Steam USA 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 68 Snapshot        
Steam USA 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 69 Snapshot        
Steam USA 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 70 Snapshot        
Steam USA 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 71 Snapshot        
Steam USA 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 72 Snapshot        
Steam USA 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 73 Snapshot        
Steam USA 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 74 Snapshot        
Steam B4 0-4-0T 01/01/1948 81 Snapshot        
Steam B4 0-4-0T 01/01/1948 85 Snapshot        
Steam B4 0-4-0T 01/01/1948 89 Snapshot        
Steam B4 0-4-0T 01/01/1948 97 Snapshot        
Steam B4 0-4-0T 01/01/1948 98 Snapshot        
Steam B4 0-4-0T 8w/e 01/03/1948 101 Transfer out to: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam B4 0-4-0T 8w/e 01/03/1948 176 Transfer out to: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam B4 0-4-0T 8w/e 01/03/1948 89 Transfer out to: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam B4 0-4-0T 7w/e 01/06/1948 98 Transfer out to: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam USA 0-6-0T 8w/e 01/08/1948 69 Transfer out to: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam B4 0-4-0T m/e 02/1949 30081 Condemned      
Steam B4 0-4-0T m/e 02/1949 30085 Condemned      
Steam B4 0-4-0T m/e 02/1949 30147 Condemned      
Steam B4 0-4-0T m/e 03/1949 30097 Condemned      
Steam E1-1 0-6-0T 26/11/1949 32162 Condemned      
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T m/e 12/1949 32112 Condemned      
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 6w/e 20/03/1951 32128 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 6w/e 20/03/1951 32133 Transfer in from: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 6w/e 20/03/1951 32689 Transfer in from: SOT Southampton Docks    
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 6w/e 20/03/1951 32689 Transfer out to: 71I Southampton Docks    
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 4w/e 11/04/1951 32128 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T m/e 05/1951 32156 Condemned      
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 4w/e 12/05/1951 32133 Transfer in from: 71I Southampton Docks    
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 4w/e 12/05/1951 32138 Transfer in from: TON Tonbridge    
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 4w/e 12/05/1951 32689 Transfer in from: 71I Southampton Docks    
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 4w/e 12/05/1951 32133 Transfer out to: 71I Southampton Docks    
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 4w/e 12/05/1951 32689 Transfer out to: 71I Southampton Docks    
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 4w/e 19/03/1952 32133 Transfer in from: 71I Southampton Docks    
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 4w/e 19/03/1952 32138 Transfer in from: 71I Southampton Docks    
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 4w/e 19/03/1952 32133 Transfer out to: 71I Southampton Docks    
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 4w/e 19/03/1952 32138 Transfer out to: 71I Southampton Docks    
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 8w/e 07/10/1952 32138 Transfer out to: 71D Fratton    
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T m/e 12/1952 32133 Condemned      
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 4w/e 10/10/1955 32113 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 6w/e 15/06/1956 32694 Transfer in from: FRA Fratton    
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 4w/e 11/07/1956 32694 Transfer out to: 70F Fratton    
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 7w/e 27/08/1956 32694 Transfer in from: 70F Fratton    
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 3w/e 17/11/1956 32151 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 3w/e 17/11/1956 32694 Transfer out to: 70F Fratton    
Steam E2 0-6-0T 6w/e 25/01/1957 32101 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam E2 0-6-0T 6w/e 25/01/1957 32108 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam E2 0-6-0T 6w/e 25/01/1957 32109 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T m/e 09/1958 32113 Condemned      
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 5w/e 26/11/1959 32694 Transfer in from: 70F Fratton    
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 5w/e 31/12/1959 32694 Transfer in from: 71I Southampton Docks    
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 5w/e 31/12/1959 32694 Transfer out to: 71I Southampton Docks    
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T m/e 01/1960 32151 Condemned      
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T m/e 02/1960 32689 Condemned      
Steam E2 0-6-0T 4w/e 10/03/1960 32107 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam E2 0-6-0T m/e 02/1961 32107 Condemned      
Steam E2 0-6-0T 3w/e 26/05/1961 32100 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam E2 0-6-0T 3w/e 26/05/1961 32102 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam E2 0-6-0T 3w/e 26/05/1961 32103 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam E2 0-6-0T 3w/e 26/05/1961 32106 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam E2 0-6-0T m/e 06/1961 32108 Condemned      
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T m/e 07/1961 32694 Condemned      
Steam E2 0-6-0T m/e 10/1961 32102 Condemned      
Steam E2 0-6-0T w/e 11/11/1961 32100 Condemned      
Steam E2 0-6-0T m/e 08/12/1961 32105 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam USA 0-6-0T w/e 02/06/1962 30063 Condemned      
Diesel 07 0-6-0 16/06/1962 D2986 1st Allocation        
Diesel 07 0-6-0 16/06/1962 D2987 1st Allocation        
Diesel 07 0-6-0 16/06/1962 D2988 1st Allocation        
Diesel 07 0-6-0 27/06/1962 D2985 1st Allocation        
Diesel 07 0-6-0 27/06/1962 D2989 1st Allocation        
Diesel 07 0-6-0 13/07/1962 D2990 1st Allocation        
Diesel 07 0-6-0 21/07/1962 D2991 1st Allocation        
Diesel 07 0-6-0 28/07/1962 D2992 1st Allocation        
Diesel 07 0-6-0 21/08/1962 D2993 1st Allocation        
Diesel 07 0-6-0 05/09/1962 D2994 1st Allocation        
Steam E2 0-6-0T w/e 15/09/1962 32101 Condemned      
Steam E2 0-6-0T w/e 15/09/1962 32105 Condemned      
Diesel 07 0-6-0 22/09/1962 D2995 1st Allocation        
Diesel 07 0-6-0 06/10/1962 D2996 1st Allocation        
Steam USA 0-6-0T w/e 06/10/1962 30065 Condemned      
Steam USA 0-6-0T w/e 06/10/1962 30070 Condemned      
Steam E2 0-6-0T w/e 06/10/1962 32103 Condemned      
Steam E2 0-6-0T w/e 06/10/1962 32106 Condemned      
Diesel 07 0-6-0 20/10/1962 D2997 1st Allocation        
Steam USA 0-6-0T w/e 20/10/1962 30061 Condemned      
Diesel 07 0-6-0 10/11/1962 D2998 1st Allocation        
Steam USA 0-6-0T w/e 01/12/1962 30062 Condemned      
Steam USA 0-6-0T 30/12/1962 30066 Condemned      
Steam USA 0-6-0T m/e 03/1963 30074 Condemned      
Steam USA 0-6-0T 5w/e 04/03/1963 30072 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam E2 0-6-0T m/e 04/1963 32109 Condemned      
Steam USA 0-6-0T 4w/e 24/06/1963 30064 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam USA 0-6-0T 4w/e 24/06/1963 30067 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam USA 0-6-0T 4w/e 24/06/1963 30068 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam USA 0-6-0T 4w/e 24/06/1963 30071 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam USA 0-6-0T 4w/e 24/06/1963 30073 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh