Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 694 Today
» 1106 Yesterday
» 7846 Week
» 27491 Month
» 62133 Year
» 1283698 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Barry


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam A 0-6-0T m/e 11/1888 1 1st Allocation        
Steam A 0-6-0T m/e 11/1888 2 1st Allocation        
Steam A 0-6-0T m/e 11/1888 3 1st Allocation        
Steam A 0-6-0T m/e 11/1888 4 1st Allocation        
Steam A 0-6-0T m/e 10/1926 700 Condemned      
Steam A 0-6-0T m/e 04/1931 699 Condemned      
Steam A 0-6-0T m/e 04/1931 702 Condemned      
Steam A 0-6-0T m/e 05/1932 703 Condemned      
Steam B 0-6-2T 01/01/1934 210 Snapshot        
Steam B 0-6-2T 01/01/1934 212 Snapshot        
Steam B 0-6-2T 01/01/1934 224 Snapshot        
Steam B 0-6-2T 01/01/1934 229 Snapshot        
Steam B 0-6-2T 01/01/1934 231 Snapshot        
Steam B 0-6-2T m/e 11/1934 229 Condemned      
Steam B 0-6-2T m/e 07/1938 210 Condemned      
Steam 1901 0-6-0PT 4w/e 22/07/1939 1993 Transfer in from:        
Steam B1 0-6-2T 4w/e 22/07/1939 277 Transfer in from:        
Steam O4 0-6-2T 4w/e 22/07/1939 302 Transfer in from:        
Steam B 0-6-2T m/e 07/1947 224 Condemned      
Steam B 0-6-2T 4w/e 01/11/1947 212 Transfer out to: CED Cardiff East Dock    
Steam A 0-6-2T 4w/e 29/11/1947 57 Transfer in from:        
Steam A 0-6-2T 4w/e 29/11/1947 58 Transfer in from:        
Steam A 0-6-2T 4w/e 29/11/1947 59 Transfer in from:        
Steam AP 0-6-2T 4w/e 29/11/1947 78 Transfer in from:        
Steam AP 0-6-2T 4w/e 27/12/1947 78 Transfer out to: RHY Rhymney    
Steam A 0-6-2T m/e 31/03/1948 58 Transfer out to: AYN Abercynon    
Steam O4 0-6-2T m/e 30/04/1948 302 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 30/06/1948 5664 Transfer in from: FDL Ferndale    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 30/06/1948 6712 Transfer in from: AYN Abercynon    
Steam A 0-6-2T 4w/e 10/07/1948 58 Transfer in from: THT Treherbert    
Steam O4 0-6-2T 4w/e 04/09/1948 283 Transfer in from: THT Treherbert    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T m/e 30/09/1948 4160 1st Allocation        
Steam 5101 2-6-2T m/e 30/09/1948 4161 1st Allocation        
Steam 5101 2-6-2T m/e 30/09/1948 4163 1st Allocation        
Steam 5100 2-6-2T 4w/e 30/10/1948 5128 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 30/10/1948 5667 Transfer in from: FDL Ferndale    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 31/10/1948 5622 Transfer in from: THT Treherbert    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 31/10/1948 5665 Transfer in from: MTHR Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 5100 2-6-2T m/e 11/1948 5128 Condemned      
Steam O4 0-6-2T m/e 03/1949 283 Condemned      
Steam B1 0-6-2T m/e 04/1949 277 Condemned      
Steam B 0-6-2T m/e 10/1949 231 Condemned      
Steam 1901 0-6-0PT 4w/e 05/11/1949 2008 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 05/11/1949 5614 Transfer in from:        
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 05/11/1949 8451 Transfer in from:        
Steam 16xx 0-6-0PT m/e 31/12/1949 1615 1st Allocation        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 31/12/1949 8735 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 31/12/1949 9776 Transfer in from:        
Steam 1901 0-6-0PT 4w/e 31/12/1949 2008 Transfer out to: AYN Abercynon    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 20/05/1950 4692 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 20/05/1950 5751 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 31/08/1950 5665 Transfer in from: BRY Barry    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 31/08/1950 5665 Transfer out to: 88C Barry    
Steam 1901 0-6-0PT 4w/e 31/10/1950 2008 Transfer in from: AYN Abercynon    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 31/10/1950 4177 Transfer in from: THT Treherbert    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 31/10/1950 5619 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 30/11/1950 6774 1st Allocation        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 30/11/1950 6775 1st Allocation        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 31/01/1951 9776 Transfer out to: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/02/1951 6664 Transfer in from:        
Steam 1901 0-6-0PT m/e 04/1951 1993 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 3w/e 19/05/1951 6664 Transfer out to: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 31/05/1951 8470 1st Allocation        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 31/07/1951 6602 Transfer in from: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam A 0-6-2T 4w/e 30/09/1951 58 Transfer out to: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam A 0-6-2T 4w/e 30/09/1951 59 Transfer out to: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam A 0-6-2T 4w/e 31/12/1951 375 Transfer in from: 88E Abercynon    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 29/02/1952 8465 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam A 0-6-2T m/e 04/1952 57 Condemned      
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 3w/e 17/05/1952 4267 Transfer in from: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 3w/e 17/05/1952 6602 Transfer out to: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 31/05/1952 8478 1st Allocation        
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 2w/e 12/07/1952 8484 Transfer in from: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 2w/e 12/07/1952 8478 Transfer out to: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 7w/e 31/08/1952 8484 Transfer out to: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam O4 0-6-2T w/e 06/09/1952 236 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 04/10/1952 7726 Transfer in from: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 04/10/1952 7779 Transfer in from:        
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 31/10/1952 8495 1st Allocation        
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 01/11/1952 8470 Transfer out to: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 27/12/1952 8495 Transfer out to: 88F Treherbert    
Steam O4 0-6-2T m/e 01/1953 236 Condemned      
Steam A 0-6-2T 4w/e 24/01/1953 357 Transfer in from:        
Steam O4 0-6-2T 4w/e 21/03/1953 210 Transfer in from: 88F Treherbert    
Steam O4 0-6-2T 4w/e 21/03/1953 285 Transfer in from:        
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 21/03/1953 8465 Transfer out to: 88F Treherbert    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 18/04/1953 6620 Transfer in from: 86H Aberbeeg    
Steam O4 0-6-2T m/e 08/1953 285 Condemned      
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 08/08/1953 5183 Transfer in from: 88F Treherbert    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 08/08/1953 82000 Transfer in from: 84E Tyseley    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 05/09/1953 4224 Transfer in from:        
Steam A 0-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1953 303 Transfer in from:        
Steam A 0-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1953 393 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam A 0-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1953 399 Transfer in from: 58 Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1953 4578 Transfer in from: GLO Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1953 5527 Transfer in from: 32 St Philips Marsh    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1953 5529 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1953 5534 Transfer in from: 82C Swindon    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1953 82001 Transfer in from: 84E Tyseley    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1953 82002 Transfer in from: 84E Tyseley    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1953 82003 Transfer in from: 84E Tyseley    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1953 82004 Transfer in from: 84E Tyseley    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1953 82005 Transfer in from: 84E Tyseley    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1953 82006 Transfer in from: 84E Tyseley    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1953 82007 Transfer in from: 84E Tyseley    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1953 82008 Transfer in from: 84E Tyseley    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1953 82009 Transfer in from: 84E Tyseley    
Steam 1901 0-6-0PT 4w/e 03/10/1953 2008 Transfer out to: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1953 4160 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1953 4161 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1953 4163 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 03/10/1953 5751 Transfer out to: 83B Taunton    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1953 6620 Transfer out to: 84E Tyseley    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1953 82000 Transfer out to: 88F Treherbert    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 03/10/1953 8451 Transfer out to: 83A Newton Abbot    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4w/e 31/10/1953 5534 Transfer out to: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam A 0-6-2T 4w/e 25/11/1953 390 Transfer in from:        
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 25/11/1953 8455 Transfer in from: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 25/11/1953 9470 Transfer in from: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam A 0-6-2T 4w/e 25/11/1953 399 Transfer out to: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 25/11/1953 7779 Transfer out to: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam O4 0-6-2T 4w/e 26/12/1953 210 Transfer out to: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 26/12/1953 7726 Transfer out to: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam A 0-6-2T 22/11/1954 375 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 21/12/1954 82030 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 30/12/1954 82031 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 01/01/1955 82032 1st Allocation        
Steam A 0-6-2T 4w/e 01/01/1955 349 Transfer in from: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Steam A 0-6-2T 4w/e 01/01/1955 376 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 29/01/1955 82031 Transfer out to: 83D Laira    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 03/03/1955 82035 1st Allocation        
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 8w/e 26/03/1955 7252 Transfer in from: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8w/e 26/03/1955 9470 Transfer out to: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 01/04/1955 82036 1st Allocation        
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 23/04/1955 4224 Transfer out to: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 23/04/1955 82004 Transfer out to: 83A Newton Abbot    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 23/04/1955 82009 Transfer out to: 83A Newton Abbot    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 10/05/1955 82039 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 19/05/1955 82040 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 21/05/1955 82030 Transfer out to: 84G Shrewsbury    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 17/06/1955 82041 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 20/06/1955 82042 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 27/06/1955 82043 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 16/07/1955 82037 Transfer in from: 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 16/07/1955 9622 Transfer in from:        
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 16/07/1955 82001 Transfer out to: 83A Newton Abbot    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 16/07/1955 82002 Transfer out to: 83A Newton Abbot    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 16/07/1955 82005 Transfer out to: 83A Newton Abbot    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 16/07/1955 82006 Transfer out to: 83A Newton Abbot    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 16/07/1955 82007 Transfer out to: 88F Treherbert    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 16/07/1955 82032 Transfer out to: 83A Newton Abbot    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 16/07/1955 8455 Transfer out to: 88F Treherbert    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 12/08/1955 82044 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 10/09/1955 82008 Transfer out to: 85D Kidderminster    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 08/10/1955 4177 Transfer out to: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 08/10/1955 5665 Transfer out to: 88F Treherbert    
Steam A 0-6-2T 02/01/1956 357 Condemned      
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 28/01/1956 7230 Transfer in from:        
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 28/01/1956 7241 Transfer in from: 87B Duffryn Yard    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 28/01/1956 4267 Transfer out to: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam A 0-6-2T 4w/e 25/02/1956 377 Transfer in from: 88E Abercynon    
Steam A 0-6-2T 05/05/1956 303 Condemned      
Steam A 0-6-2T 14/05/1956 377 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 16/06/1956 8450 Transfer in from: 86E Severn Tunnel Junction    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 16/06/1956 8457 Transfer in from:        
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 16/06/1956 8459 Transfer in from: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 16/06/1956 6774 Transfer out to: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 16/06/1956 6775 Transfer out to: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T m/e 16/06/1956 82037 Transfer out to: 88E Abercynon    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 14/07/1956 82037 Transfer in from: 88E Abercynon    
Steam A 0-6-2T 4w/e 11/08/1956 390 Transfer out to: 88E Abercynon    
Steam A 0-6-2T 4w/e 11/08/1956 393 Transfer out to: 88E Abercynon    
Steam A 0-6-2T 4w/e 08/09/1956 349 Transfer out to: 88E Abercynon    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 08/09/1956 5183 Transfer out to: 83A Newton Abbot    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 06/10/1956 6619 Transfer in from: 88F Treherbert    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 06/10/1956 8446 Transfer in from: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 06/10/1956 8465 Transfer in from: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 06/10/1956 9453 Transfer in from: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Steam A 0-6-2T 4w/e 06/10/1956 376 Transfer out to: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 06/10/1956 8457 Transfer out to: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 26/01/1957 4610 Transfer in from:        
Steam 16xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 26/01/1957 1615 Transfer out to: 87F Llanelly    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 26/01/1957 5622 Transfer out to: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 15/06/1957 5769 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 07/09/1957 6770 Transfer in from: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 07/09/1957 6771 Transfer in from: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 05/10/1957 8437 Transfer in from: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 02/11/1957 6712 Transfer out to: 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 25/01/1958 5622 Transfer in from: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 25/01/1958 6408 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4w/e 25/01/1958 4578 Transfer out to: 88F Treherbert    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 22/02/1958 6765 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 22/02/1958 6769 Transfer in from: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4w/e 22/02/1958 5527 Transfer out to: 88A Radyr    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4w/e 22/02/1958 5529 Transfer out to: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 03/1958 6771 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 22/03/1958 6767 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 22/03/1958 6773 Transfer in from: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 22/03/1958 6775 Transfer in from: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 22/03/1958 5769 Transfer out to: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 22/03/1958 6408 Transfer out to: 82D Westbury    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 22/03/1958 82003 Transfer out to: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 22/03/1958 82036 Transfer out to: 88A Radyr    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 19/04/1958 7227 Transfer in from: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 19/04/1958 82037 Transfer out to: 88A Radyr    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 19/04/1958 6751 Transfer in from: 88A Radyr    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 17/05/1958 82035 Transfer out to: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 17/05/1958 82039 Transfer out to: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 12/06/1958 82040 Transfer out to: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 12/06/1958 82041 Transfer out to: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 12/06/1958 82043 Transfer out to: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 12/06/1958 82044 Transfer out to: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4w/e 14/06/1958 5527 Transfer in from: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4w/e 14/06/1958 5534 Transfer in from: 86G Pontypool Road    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4w/e 14/06/1958 5568 Transfer in from: 86H Aberbeeg    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 09/08/1958 7726 Transfer in from: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 09/08/1958 82042 Transfer out to: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4w/e 04/10/1958 5527 Transfer out to: 87H Neyland    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 01/11/1958 6751 Transfer out to: 86B Newport Pill    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 01/11/1958 7227 Transfer out to: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 29/11/1958 13258 Transfer in from: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 29/11/1958 13267 Transfer in from: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 29/11/1958 13366 Transfer in from: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 29/11/1958 3405 Transfer in from: 88A Radyr    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 29/11/1958 3406 Transfer in from: 88A Radyr    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 29/11/1958 D3406 Transfer in from: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 29/11/1958 D3419 Transfer in from: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 29/11/1958 D3424 Transfer in from: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 29/11/1958 D3426 Transfer in from: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 29/11/1958 D3527 Transfer in from: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 29/11/1958 D3593 Transfer in from: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 29/11/1958 4616 Transfer in from: 88A Radyr    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 29/11/1958 4632 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 29/11/1958 4634 Transfer in from: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 29/11/1958 5615 Transfer in from: 88A Radyr    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 29/11/1958 4692 Transfer out to: 88E Abercynon    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 29/11/1958 7726 Transfer out to: 88E Abercynon    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 29/11/1958 8735 Transfer out to: 88E Abercynon    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 29/11/1958 9622 Transfer out to: 88E Abercynon    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 27/12/1958 4618 Transfer in from: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 27/12/1958 4667 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 27/12/1958 7717 Transfer in from: 88A Radyr    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 27/12/1958 7751 Transfer in from: 88A Radyr    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 27/12/1958 7766 Transfer in from: 88A Radyr    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 27/12/1958 3405 Transfer out to: 88A Radyr    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 27/12/1958 3406 Transfer out to: 88A Radyr    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 27/12/1958 8465 Transfer out to: 82C Swindon    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 24/01/1959 8459 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 24/01/1959 9453 Transfer out to: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 21/02/1959 8419 Transfer in from: 88A Radyr    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 21/02/1959 8780 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 21/02/1959 6767 Transfer out to: 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 21/02/1959 6769 Transfer out to: 82C Swindon    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 21/02/1959 6770 Transfer out to: 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 21/02/1959 7230 Transfer out to: 86E Severn Tunnel Junction    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 21/02/1959 8437 Transfer out to: 86H Aberbeeg    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT w/e 11/03/1959 4610 Transfer out to: 73H Dover    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT w/e 11/03/1959 4616 Transfer out to: 73H Dover    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT w/e 11/03/1959 4634 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 21/03/1959 9425 Transfer in from: 88A Radyr    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4w/e 21/03/1959 5534 Transfer out to: 86F Tondu    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 18/04/1959 4632 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 18/04/1959 5615 Transfer out to: 88A Radyr    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 18/04/1959 5622 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 16/05/1959 3727 Transfer in from: 88A Radyr    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 16/05/1959 8780 Transfer out to: 88A Radyr    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 06/1959 8450 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 11/07/1959 6773 Transfer out to: 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 05/09/1959 7252 Transfer out to: 88A Radyr    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 10/1959 7751 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 01/1960 8419 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 30/01/1960 8481 Transfer in from: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 27/02/1960 5637 Transfer in from: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 03/1960 7717 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 26/03/1960 5636 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 26/03/1960 6655 Transfer in from: 81B Slough    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 26/03/1960 6657 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 26/03/1960 8764 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 23/04/1960 6697 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 23/04/1960 6657 Transfer out to: 88A Radyr    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 21/05/1960 5634 Transfer in from: 84G Shrewsbury    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 16/07/1960 5639 Transfer in from: 81E Didcot    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 16/07/1960 6775 Transfer out to: 86B Newport Pill    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 13/08/1960 6765 Transfer out to: 87D Swansea East Dock    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 10/09/1960 3710 Transfer in from: 84F Stourbridge Junction    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4w/e 05/11/1960 5568 Transfer out to: 83D Laira    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 09/11/1960 7766 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 03/12/1960 5685 Transfer in from: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/01/1961 5636 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 17/06/1961 5643 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 17/06/1961 5668 Transfer in from: 88F Treherbert    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 12/08/1961 5685 Transfer in from: 88C Barry    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 12/08/1961 9780 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 12/08/1961 5685 Transfer out to: 88C Barry    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 09/09/1961 5685 Transfer out to: 88A Cardiff Canton    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 07/10/1961 5614 Transfer out to: 85A Worcester    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 07/10/1961 5634 Transfer out to: 87F Llanelly    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 02/12/1961 5634 Transfer in from: 87F Llanelly    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 30/12/1961 6696 Transfer in from: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 05/1962 5639 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 05/1962 8764 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 19/05/1962 3690 Transfer in from: 87F Llanelly    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 19/05/1962 6656 Transfer in from: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 16/06/1962 3668 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 14/07/1962 5653 Transfer in from: 88F Treherbert    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 08/1962 5664 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 08/09/1962 3663 Transfer in from: 88A Cardiff Canton    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 08/09/1962 3748 Transfer in from: 88A Cardiff Canton    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 08/09/1962 8425 Transfer in from: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 08/09/1962 8728 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 08/09/1962 8776 Transfer in from: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 08/09/1962 9437 Transfer in from: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 08/09/1962 9603 Transfer in from: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 08/09/1962 9648 Transfer in from: CDF Cardiff Canton    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 08/09/1962 9681 Transfer in from: 88A Cardiff Canton    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 08/09/1962 9713 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 08/09/1962 9727 Transfer in from: 88A Cardiff Canton    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 08/09/1962 9775 Transfer in from: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 08/09/1962 9794 Transfer in from: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 08/09/1962 6656 Transfer out to: 88B Radyr    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 06/10/1962 7202 Transfer in from: RYR Radyr    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 06/10/1962 7208 Transfer in from: 88J Aberdare    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 06/10/1962 7221 Transfer in from:        
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 06/10/1962 7228 Transfer in from: 86E Severn Tunnel Junction    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 06/10/1962 7231 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 06/10/1962 5634 Transfer out to: 87H Neyland    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 06/10/1962 8425 Transfer out to: 88L Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 06/10/1962 9437 Transfer out to: 88L Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 03/11/1962 9442 Transfer in from: 87A Neath (Court Sart)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 05/11/1962 9775 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 09/11/1962 9727 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 2w/e 17/11/1962 3615 Transfer in from:        
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 2w/e 17/11/1962 9442 Transfer out to: 87A Neath (Court Sart)    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 26/11/1962 7241 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 15/12/1962 3689 Transfer in from: 84J Croes Newydd    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 15/12/1962 9472 Transfer in from: 84G Shrewsbury    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 18/12/1962 3663 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 18/12/1962 8776 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 01/1963 5653 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 12/01/1963 5679 Transfer in from: 89B Croes Newydd    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 09/02/1963 5689 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 09/02/1963 3689 Transfer out to: 88L Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 09/02/1963 3748 Transfer out to: 88L Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 09/02/1963 5679 Transfer out to: 89B Croes Newydd    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 09/02/1963 8728 Transfer out to: 88L Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 09/02/1963 9472 Transfer out to: 88B Radyr    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 09/02/1963 9603 Transfer out to: 88L Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 09/02/1963 9648 Transfer out to: 88L Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 09/02/1963 9681 Transfer out to: 88L Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 09/02/1963 9713 Transfer out to: 88L Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 09/02/1963 9780 Transfer out to: 88H Tondu    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 09/02/1963 9794 Transfer out to: 88L Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 03/1963 6619 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 09/03/1963 6650 Transfer in from: 87D Swansea East Dock    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 09/03/1963 9425 Transfer in from: 88C Barry    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 09/03/1963 4618 Transfer out to: 88L Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 09/03/1963 8481 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 09/03/1963 9425 Transfer out to: 88C Barry    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 05/1963 3710 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 04/05/1963 4618 Transfer in from: 88L Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 29/06/1963 7232 Transfer in from: 87F Llanelly    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 29/06/1963 7238 Transfer in from: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 29/06/1963 7231 Transfer out to: 88B Radyr    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 07/1963 3668 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 07/1963 5643 Condemned      
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T m/e 07/1963 7228 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 27/07/1963 6670 Transfer in from: 88G Llantrisant    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 27/07/1963 7223 Transfer in from: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 27/07/1963 6655 Transfer out to: 88F Treherbert    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 5w/e 31/08/1963 9425 Transfer out to: 86F Aberbeeg    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T w/e 14/09/1963 5667 Transfer out to: 6C Croes Newydd    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 10/1963 4618 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 10/1963 6670 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 02/11/1963 3689 Transfer in from: 88L Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 02/11/1963 3784 Transfer in from: 88L Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 02/11/1963 9426 Transfer in from: 88L Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 02/11/1963 9437 Transfer in from: 88L Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 02/11/1963 9461 Transfer in from: 88L Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 02/11/1963 9603 Transfer in from: 88L Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 02/11/1963 9794 Transfer in from: 88L Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 30/11/1963 3690 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 30/11/1963 7223 Transfer out to: 87F Llanelly    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 30/11/1963 7232 Transfer out to: 87F Llanelly    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 12/1963 6696 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 12/1963 9603 Condemned      
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T w/e 07/12/1963 7221 Transfer out to: 2D Banbury    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 28/12/1963 3727 Transfer in from: 88C Barry    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 28/12/1963 9798 Transfer in from: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 28/12/1963 3727 Transfer out to: 88C Barry    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 28/12/1963 9437 Transfer out to: 88A Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 04/1964 3727 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 04/1964 4667 Condemned      
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T m/e 04/1964 7208 Condemned      
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T m/e 04/1964 7238 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 05/1964 3689 Condemned      
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 3w/e 04/05/1964 4273 Transfer in from: 88H Tondu    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 3w/e 04/05/1964 4283 Transfer in from: 88H Tondu    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3w/e 04/05/1964 4675 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3w/e 04/05/1964 3615 Transfer out to: 87D Swansea East Dock    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 06/1964 5619 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 06/1964 5637 Condemned      
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T m/e 06/1964 7202 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 7w/e 22/06/1964 3615 Transfer in from: 87D Swansea East Dock    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 7w/e 22/06/1964 6621 Transfer in from: 88F Treherbert    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 7w/e 22/06/1964 6654 Transfer in from: 88F Treherbert    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7w/e 22/06/1964 7209 Transfer in from: 88J Aberdare    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T m/e 07/1964 7209 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 20/07/1964 6621 Transfer out to: 88B Radyr    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 20/07/1964 6697 Transfer out to: 88B Radyr    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 09/1964 5668 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 09/1964 8446 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 09/1964 9794 Condemned      
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T m/e 10/1964 4273 Condemned      
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T m/e 10/1964 4283 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 10/1964 9798 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6w/e 12/10/1964 3615 Transfer out to: 87A Neath (Court Sart)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6w/e 12/10/1964 3784 Transfer out to: 88B Radyr    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6w/e 12/10/1964 4675 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6w/e 12/10/1964 5689 Transfer out to: 88B Radyr    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6w/e 12/10/1964 6650 Transfer out to: 88B Radyr    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6w/e 12/10/1964 6654 Transfer out to: 88E Abercynon    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 6w/e 12/10/1964 9426 Transfer out to: 88B Radyr    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 6w/e 12/10/1964 9461 Transfer out to: 88B Radyr