Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
4w/e |
02/11/1935 |
11444 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
02/11/1935 |
12059 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
02/11/1935 |
7711 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
2360 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
George V |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
25366 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
George V |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
5322 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
11/04/1936 |
7334 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
17/10/1936 |
2960 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
George V |
4-4-0 |
m/e |
11/1936 |
25366 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
09/01/1937 |
2960 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
22/01/1938 |
2948 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
22/01/1938 |
2953 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
22/01/1938 |
2955 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
04/06/1938 |
2948 |
Transfer out to: |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
George V |
4-4-0 |
m/e |
12/1938 |
25322 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
29/04/1939 |
2953 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
29/04/1939 |
2955 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
27/10/1945 |
2972 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
27/10/1945 |
2978 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
17/11/1945 |
2946 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
17/11/1945 |
2955 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
17/11/1945 |
2974 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1946 |
2946 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1946 |
2955 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1946 |
2972 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
20/07/1946 |
2946 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
20/07/1946 |
2972 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
19/10/1946 |
7080 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
19/10/1946 |
7093 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
26/10/1946 |
7090 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
26/10/1946 |
7097 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
13/09/1947 |
2976 |
Transfer in from: |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
25/10/1947 |
2976 |
Transfer out to: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
on |
01/01/1948 |
11397 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
on |
01/01/1948 |
11444 |
Snapshot |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
on |
01/01/1948 |
11444 |
Snapshot |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
12059 |
Snapshot |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
12088 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
12143 |
Snapshot |
26C |
Bolton |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
12163 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2360 |
Snapshot |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2788 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2810 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2815 |
Snapshot |
3D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2926 |
Snapshot |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2933 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2934 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
on |
01/01/1948 |
51342 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
on |
01/01/1948 |
51405 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
on |
01/01/1948 |
51427 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
on |
01/01/1948 |
51469 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
52219 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7088 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7284 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7334 |
Snapshot |
20D |
Normanton |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7388 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7439 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1185 |
0-8-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7875 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1185 |
0-8-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7877 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1185 |
0-8-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7881 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1185 |
0-8-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7884 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8904 |
Snapshot |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8942 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9027 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9057 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9060 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9065 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9066 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9086 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9140 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9218 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9219 |
Snapshot |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9253 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9281 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9293 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9297 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9341 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9365 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
w/e |
10/01/1948 |
11397 |
Transfer out to: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
21/02/1948 |
9074 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1948 |
2949 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1948 |
8631 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1948 |
9027 |
Transfer out to: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1948 |
9057 |
Transfer out to: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1948 |
9066 |
Transfer out to: |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
w/e |
13/03/1948 |
51318 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
13/03/1948 |
7711 |
Transfer out to: |
7B |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
13/03/1948 |
9297 |
Transfer out to: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
13/03/1948 |
9341 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
8129 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
8520 |
Transfer in from: |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
8521 |
Transfer in from: |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
8522 |
Transfer in from: |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
2972 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
2974 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
8684 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
9184 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
2810 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
8166 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
49065 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Plodder Lane |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
9281 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
17/07/1948 |
2965 |
Transfer in from: |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
17/07/1948 |
8166 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
9100 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
1185 |
0-8-2T |
on |
28/08/1948 |
7875 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
11/09/1948 |
9242 |
Transfer in from: |
4D |
Abergavenny |
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
w/e |
18/09/1948 |
51342 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
9120 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
42933 |
Transfer out to: |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
9141 |
Transfer in from: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
48129 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
on |
20/11/1948 |
51427 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
2979 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
42977 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
42982 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
42788 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
42815 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
42926 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
8904 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
04/12/1948 |
42979 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
04/12/1948 |
42982 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
04/12/1948 |
42979 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
04/12/1948 |
42982 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
11/12/1948 |
42962 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
48944 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
49143 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
52100 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
52175 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
58890 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
9302 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
11444 |
Transfer out to: |
|
Crewe Works |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
2934 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
on |
11/12/1948 |
51405 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
42962 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
48944 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
52175 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
9302 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
42962 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
48944 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
52175 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
9302 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
8743 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
9353 |
Transfer in from: |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
52219 |
Transfer out to: |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
8684 |
Transfer out to: |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
49184 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
08/01/1949 |
47373 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
42964 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
42973 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
m/e |
02/1949 |
51318 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1185 |
0-8-2T |
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
47881 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
19/02/1949 |
58341 |
Transfer in from: |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/03/1949 |
7091 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
19/03/1949 |
9249 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
26/03/1949 |
58341 |
Transfer out to: |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
09/04/1949 |
48966 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
09/04/1949 |
9212 |
Transfer in from: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
49060 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
49242 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
m/e |
05/1949 |
51469 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/06/1949 |
7094 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
25/06/1949 |
48502 |
Transfer in from: |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/06/1949 |
7092 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
25/06/1949 |
8504 |
Transfer in from: |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
25/06/1949 |
8506 |
Transfer in from: |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
25/06/1949 |
8511 |
Transfer in from: |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
25/06/1949 |
8529 |
Transfer in from: |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
16/07/1949 |
49365 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
w/e |
30/07/1949 |
11439 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
30/07/1949 |
7651 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/08/1949 |
12018 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
20/08/1949 |
8469 |
Transfer in from: |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
27/08/1949 |
42811 |
Transfer in from: |
3D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
27/08/1949 |
42892 |
Transfer in from: |
3D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
27/08/1949 |
42946 |
Transfer out to: |
3D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
27/08/1949 |
42973 |
Transfer out to: |
3D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
17/09/1949 |
47362 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
42971 |
Transfer in from: |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
52088 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
08/10/1949 |
49032 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
12008 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
22/10/1949 |
48630 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
29/10/1949 |
48436 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
29/10/1949 |
48748 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
29/10/1949 |
8528 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
29/10/1949 |
48966 |
Transfer out to: |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
29/10/1949 |
49100 |
Transfer out to: |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
m/e |
11/1949 |
58890 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
12012 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
49172 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
9244 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
49032 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1949 |
42849 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1949 |
42852 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1949 |
42978 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1949 |
42979 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
26/11/1949 |
48747 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
49353 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
10/12/1949 |
7699 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
5w/e |
24/12/1949 |
48747 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
5w/e |
24/12/1949 |
7699 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
5w/e |
24/12/1949 |
48747 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
24/12/1949 |
52163 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
5w/e |
24/12/1949 |
7699 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
49086 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/01/1950 |
12007 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
1185 |
0-8-2T |
w/e |
25/03/1950 |
47884 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
25/03/1950 |
58900 |
Transfer out to: |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
06/05/1950 |
42811 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
08/07/1950 |
42949 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
08/07/1950 |
48436 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
08/07/1950 |
48469 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
12/08/1950 |
49420 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
1185 |
0-8-2T |
w/e |
12/08/1950 |
47877 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
26/08/1950 |
9395 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
49395 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
49395 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
23/09/1950 |
49396 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
23/09/1950 |
49293 |
Transfer out to: |
2E |
Warwick |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
42786 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
48054 |
Transfer in from: |
2C |
Northampton |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
49219 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
42786 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
47309 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
48054 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
49396 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
42786 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
48054 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
49396 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
28/10/1950 |
49398 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
28/10/1950 |
47309 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
49398 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
42892 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
49398 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
02/12/1950 |
49451 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
02/12/1950 |
49212 |
Transfer out to: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1950 |
12024 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1950 |
12026 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1950 |
12028 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1950 |
7112 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1950 |
7114 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
16/12/1950 |
49074 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
23/12/1950 |
49140 |
Transfer out to: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
42892 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
49153 |
Transfer in from: |
2C |
Northampton |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
49451 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
49451 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
49406 |
Transfer in from: |
4D |
Abergavenny |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
42852 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
49172 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
49244 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
9120 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
49143 |
Transfer out to: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
03/1951 |
49218 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
49253 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/05/1951 |
12012 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/05/1951 |
12012 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
12/05/1951 |
49302 |
Transfer out to: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/06/1951 |
52143 |
Transfer out to: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
07/07/1951 |
49249 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
25/08/1951 |
49131 |
Transfer in from: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
25/08/1951 |
49396 |
Transfer out to: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
08/09/1951 |
49131 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
08/09/1951 |
49131 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1951 |
52100 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
52140 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
20/10/1951 |
42965 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
20/10/1951 |
42977 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
12/01/1952 |
42965 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
45000 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
45001 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
45327 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
26/01/1952 |
42965 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
02/02/1952 |
42982 |
Transfer out to: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
09/02/1952 |
42962 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
09/02/1952 |
42964 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
09/02/1952 |
42971 |
Transfer out to: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
48373 |
Transfer in from: |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
48736 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
49111 |
Transfer in from: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
49112 |
Transfer in from: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
45000 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
45001 |
Transfer out to: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
45327 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
49111 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
49112 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
14/07/1952 |
12018 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
09/08/1952 |
48323 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
09/08/1952 |
48529 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
09/08/1952 |
48736 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
09/08/1952 |
48743 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/10/1952 |
12018 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
48039 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
48510 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
47362 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
48039 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
48510 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
48039 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
48510 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/12/1952 |
12012 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/12/1952 |
12012 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
3w/e |
24/01/1953 |
42941 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/03/1953 |
12012 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/03/1953 |
12015 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/03/1953 |
12012 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/03/1953 |
12015 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
48520 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
48521 |
Transfer out to: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
48528 |
Transfer out to: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
02/05/1953 |
12012 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
02/05/1953 |
12012 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/05/1953 |
12007 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/05/1953 |
12027 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/05/1953 |
12007 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/05/1953 |
12027 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/05/1953 |
12015 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/05/1953 |
12015 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
48510 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
52140 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/06/1953 |
12007 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/06/1953 |
12027 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/06/1953 |
12007 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/06/1953 |
12027 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
42941 |
Transfer out to: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
19/09/1953 |
12012 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
47490 |
Transfer in from: |
13B |
Devons Road (Bow) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
47516 |
Transfer in from: |
13B |
Devons Road (Bow) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
48094 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
48748 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
49155 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/12/1953 |
12013 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/12/1953 |
12013 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/01/1954 |
48729 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/02/1954 |
52232 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
27/02/1954 |
49155 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
17/04/1954 |
12020 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/06/1954 |
12013 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
17/07/1954 |
9368 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
11/09/1954 |
47516 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
49266 |
Transfer in from: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
06/11/1954 |
13087 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
06/11/1954 |
13088 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
47269 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
47493 |
Transfer in from: |
13B |
Devons Road (Bow) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
04/12/1954 |
13089 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
01/01/1955 |
47269 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
08/01/1955 |
42964 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
02/04/1955 |
12026 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
02/04/1955 |
12026 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/08/1955 |
12026 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/08/1955 |
12026 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
13/08/1955 |
47439 |
Transfer out to: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
08/10/1955 |
48630 |
Transfer out to: |
9G |
Northwich |
|
|
Diesel |
DELTIC |
Co-Co |
on |
24/10/1955 |
DP1 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
47373 |
Transfer out to: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
48506 |
Transfer out to: |
9G |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
14/01/1956 |
42964 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
47309 |
Transfer in from: |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
13089 |
Transfer out to: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
48094 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1956 |
13089 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
21/04/1956 |
49109 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
DELTIC |
Co-Co |
m/e |
06/1956 |
DP1 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
w/e |
16/06/1956 |
51439 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
48729 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
47490 |
Transfer out to: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
03/11/1956 |
47284 |
Transfer out to: |
6E |
Wrexham Rhosddu |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
03/11/1956 |
47309 |
Transfer out to: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
12029 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
12081 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
12082 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
13087 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
13088 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
13089 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
42786 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
12082 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
49109 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
49266 |
Transfer out to: |
2C |
Warwick |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
20/04/1957 |
49109 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
20/04/1957 |
49214 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
20/04/1957 |
49395 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
12082 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
48206 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
48264 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
10/08/1957 |
49214 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
28/09/1957 |
48944 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
8w/e |
05/10/1957 |
49306 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
19/10/1957 |
52175 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
47314 |
Transfer in from: |
13B |
Devons Road (Bow) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
47560 |
Transfer in from: |
13B |
Devons Road (Bow) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
48203 |
Transfer in from: |
9G |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
49397 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
49433 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/02/1958 |
12011 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
22/02/1958 |
48203 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
49424 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
19/04/1958 |
48323 |
Transfer out to: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
17/05/1958 |
48323 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
48373 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
48502 |
Transfer out to: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
48504 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
12/07/1958 |
49424 |
Transfer out to: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
30/08/1958 |
12003 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
30/08/1958 |
12003 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/09/1958 |
D3019 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/10/1958 |
12003 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
08/11/1958 |
49008 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/11/1958 |
12025 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
13/12/1958 |
47493 |
Transfer out to: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
07/03/1959 |
47612 |
Transfer in from: |
2C |
Northampton |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
07/03/1959 |
49368 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
14/03/1959 |
47493 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/04/1959 |
48268 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/04/1959 |
48408 |
Transfer in from: |
6E |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
48206 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
48408 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/07/1959 |
12082 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
15/08/1959 |
12006 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
15/08/1959 |
48506 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
15/08/1959 |
48942 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
15/08/1959 |
49008 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
15/08/1959 |
49406 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
15/08/1959 |
49433 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
15/08/1959 |
49451 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
22/08/1959 |
48074 |
Transfer in from: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
22/08/1959 |
48247 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
22/08/1959 |
48535 |
Transfer in from: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
22/08/1959 |
48714 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
19/09/1959 |
52232 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
24/10/1959 |
49141 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
48531 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
48054 |
Transfer out to: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
48074 |
Transfer out to: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
48323 |
Transfer out to: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
48511 |
Transfer out to: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
49397 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
49398 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
49420 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
14/11/1959 |
49153 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
14/11/1959 |
49306 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
19/12/1959 |
47160 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
19/12/1959 |
47164 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
19/12/1959 |
47310 |
Transfer in from: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/01/1960 |
45041 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/01/1960 |
45312 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
09/01/1960 |
42849 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
09/01/1960 |
42892 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
30/01/1960 |
48479 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
30/01/1960 |
48039 |
Transfer out to: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/02/1960 |
D3870 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
27/02/1960 |
47647 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/03/1960 |
D3370 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
30/04/1960 |
48437 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
30/04/1960 |
48722 |
Transfer in from: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1960 |
48368 |
Transfer in from: |
9G |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1960 |
48479 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/06/1960 |
44065 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/06/1960 |
44445 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/06/1960 |
44493 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
48479 |
Transfer in from: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
48264 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
48268 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
16/07/1960 |
47560 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1960 |
44749 |
Transfer in from: |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1960 |
45140 |
Transfer in from: |
24K |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
44807 |
Transfer in from: |
24K |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
45386 |
Transfer in from: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
44065 |
Transfer out to: |
12F |
Workington |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
44445 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
44493 |
Transfer out to: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
48437 |
Transfer out to: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/09/1960 |
45329 |
Transfer in from: |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1960 |
44749 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1960 |
48631 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
08/10/1960 |
44864 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/10/1960 |
45370 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
05/11/1960 |
47310 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1960 |
45404 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
10/12/1960 |
47344 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
10/12/1960 |
47431 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
17/12/1960 |
47160 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/01/1961 |
48505 |
Transfer in from: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/01/1961 |
45137 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/01/1961 |
45147 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/01/1961 |
45284 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/01/1961 |
45375 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
28/01/1961 |
48247 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
28/01/1961 |
48368 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
28/01/1961 |
48531 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
04/02/1961 |
47164 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/02/1961 |
45184 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/02/1961 |
48479 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
04/03/1961 |
45032 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
25/03/1961 |
48479 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
15/04/1961 |
48166 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
22/04/1961 |
48250 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
06/05/1961 |
48297 |
Transfer in from: |
81E |
Didcot |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
06/05/1961 |
48166 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
48294 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
48692 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
48711 |
Transfer in from: |
9G |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
45041 |
Transfer out to: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
45147 |
Transfer out to: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
45184 |
Transfer out to: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
45284 |
Transfer out to: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
45386 |
Transfer out to: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
17/06/1961 |
47383 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
17/06/1961 |
48520 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
on |
29/06/1961 |
D2199 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
08/07/1961 |
45386 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
08/07/1961 |
44807 |
Transfer out to: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/08/1961 |
45375 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/08/1961 |
45375 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/09/1961 |
45034 |
Transfer in from: |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/09/1961 |
45073 |
Transfer in from: |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
D2385 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
D3855 |
Transfer in from: |
27F |
Brunswick |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
D3856 |
Transfer in from: |
27F |
Brunswick |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
D3857 |
Transfer in from: |
27F |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
42077 |
Transfer in from: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
42078 |
Transfer in from: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
42183 |
Transfer in from: |
27F |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
42186 |
Transfer in from: |
27F |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
42445 |
Transfer in from: |
17F |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
42580 |
Transfer in from: |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
42584 |
Transfer in from: |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
42598 |
Transfer in from: |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
42612 |
Transfer in from: |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
44127 |
Transfer in from: |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
44232 |
Transfer in from: |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
44494 |
Transfer in from: |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
44589 |
Transfer in from: |
27F |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
47344 |
Transfer out to: |
12F |
Workington |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
48505 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/09/1961 |
44741 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/09/1961 |
44742 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
30/09/1961 |
44127 |
Transfer out to: |
|
Crewe Works |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/10/1961 |
45071 |
Transfer in from: |
21E |
Monument Lane |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/11/1961 |
44232 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/11/1961 |
44494 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/11/1961 |
44589 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/11/1961 |
44749 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/11/1961 |
44750 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/11/1961 |
44751 |
Transfer in from: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/11/1961 |
44754 |
Transfer in from: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/01/1962 |
44742 |
Transfer out to: |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
17/02/1962 |
42183 |
Transfer out to: |
2E |
Northampton |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
31/03/1962 |
49131 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/05/1962 |
44827 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
26/05/1962 |
42186 |
Transfer out to: |
21D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
1153 |
0-4-0ST |
w/e |
09/06/1962 |
51253 |
Transfer in from: |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
42389 |
Transfer in from: |
5C |
Stafford |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
45329 |
Transfer out to: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
48479 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
48506 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
48522 |
Transfer out to: |
21B |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
48747 |
Transfer out to: |
21B |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/07/1962 |
48045 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/07/1962 |
48046 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
21/07/1962 |
48500 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/07/1962 |
45073 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/07/1962 |
45140 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
21/07/1962 |
47314 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
21/07/1962 |
47493 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
04/08/1962 |
44750 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/08/1962 |
44750 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/08/1962 |
D3370 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
45069 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
45329 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
45332 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
19/09/1962 |
D4146 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
25/09/1962 |
D4147 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
25/09/1962 |
D4148 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/10/1962 |
45131 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/10/1962 |
45181 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/10/1962 |
45412 |
Transfer in from: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/10/1962 |
45413 |
Transfer in from: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/10/1962 |
45441 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
13/10/1962 |
47431 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
02/11/1962 |
D4152 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/11/1962 |
D2385 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
10/11/1962 |
42077 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
10/11/1962 |
47383 |
Transfer out to: |
12C |
Carlisle Canal |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
10/11/1962 |
47388 |
Transfer out to: |
12C |
Carlisle Canal |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
10/11/1962 |
47612 |
Transfer out to: |
12F |
Workington |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
10/11/1962 |
47647 |
Transfer out to: |
12F |
Workington |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
13/11/1962 |
D4153 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
17/11/1962 |
42580 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
42121 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/12/1962 |
D3370 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/02/1963 |
45069 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
16/03/1963 |
48045 |
Transfer out to: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
16/03/1963 |
48714 |
Transfer out to: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
23/03/1963 |
42389 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
30/03/1963 |
D2393 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
30/03/1963 |
D3019 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
13/04/1963 |
47651 |
Transfer out to: |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/04/1963 |
42491 |
Transfer in from: |
24H |
Hellifield |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/04/1963 |
D3370 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
42445 |
Transfer out to: |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
42584 |
Transfer out to: |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
44864 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
45181 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
45312 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
45329 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
45375 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
45404 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
45413 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
1153 |
0-4-0ST |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
51253 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
09/1963 |
44750 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/09/1963 |
48425 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/09/1963 |
48469 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/09/1963 |
48702 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/09/1963 |
45181 |
Transfer in from: |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/09/1963 |
45329 |
Transfer in from: |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
28/09/1963 |
42491 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/10/1963 |
45057 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/10/1963 |
45103 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/10/1963 |
45388 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/10/1963 |
D2389 |
Transfer in from: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/10/1963 |
D2390 |
Transfer in from: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/10/1963 |
45188 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
19/10/1963 |
48469 |
Transfer out to: |
9M |
Bury |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/11/1963 |
44738 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/11/1963 |
44739 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/11/1963 |
45571 |
Transfer in from: |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/11/1963 |
45663 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/11/1963 |
45664 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
30/11/1963 |
42598 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
14/12/1963 |
D3858 |
Transfer in from: |
27E |
Walton on the Hill |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
14/12/1963 |
48702 |
Transfer out to: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
21/12/1963 |
42455 |
Transfer in from: |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/01/1964 |
45103 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/01/1964 |
48425 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
25/01/1964 |
42612 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
08/02/1964 |
45032 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
22/02/1964 |
48297 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/03/1964 |
44725 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/03/1964 |
45466 |
Transfer in from: |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
14/03/1964 |
48218 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
14/03/1964 |
48500 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/03/1964 |
45201 |
Transfer in from: |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
28/03/1964 |
48046 |
Transfer out to: |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/04/1964 |
44754 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
D2372 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
D2394 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
D3793 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
D3794 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
46410 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
46423 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
46424 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
48129 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
48296 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
48308 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
48709 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/05/1964 |
45197 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/05/1964 |
45417 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
on |
16/05/1964 |
45571 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
30/05/1964 |
48774 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/06/1964 |
44738 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
13/06/1964 |
92054 |
Transfer in from: |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
13/06/1964 |
92115 |
Transfer in from: |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
13/06/1964 |
92158 |
Transfer in from: |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
42078 |
Transfer out to: |
8M |
Southport |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
42121 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
42455 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
44827 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
45034 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
45466 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/07/1964 |
45034 |
Transfer in from: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/07/1964 |
45197 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/07/1964 |
12010 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/07/1964 |
D3367 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/07/1964 |
45663 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/07/1964 |
45664 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
08/08/1964 |
12024 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
09/1964 |
44751 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/09/1964 |
44749 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
44732 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
44950 |
Transfer in from: |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
48026 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
48297 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
48536 |
Transfer in from: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
48682 |
Transfer in from: |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
92020 |
Transfer in from: |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
92084 |
Transfer in from: |
15C |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
92089 |
Transfer in from: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
92111 |
Transfer in from: |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
10/10/1964 |
92117 |
Transfer in from: |
15C |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
10/10/1964 |
92127 |
Transfer in from: |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
10/10/1964 |
48026 |
Transfer out to: |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
10/10/1964 |
48218 |
Transfer out to: |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
10/10/1964 |
48297 |
Transfer out to: |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
10/10/1964 |
48536 |
Transfer out to: |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
10/10/1964 |
48682 |
Transfer out to: |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
24/10/1964 |
48029 |
Transfer in from: |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
24/10/1964 |
48509 |
Transfer in from: |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
31/10/1964 |
48250 |
Transfer out to: |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
31/10/1964 |
48535 |
Transfer out to: |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1964 |
46440 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1964 |
46503 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1964 |
92025 |
Transfer in from: |
16B |
Annesley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1964 |
92027 |
Transfer in from: |
16B |
Annesley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/11/1964 |
44743 |
Transfer in from: |
27C |
Southport |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/11/1964 |
44753 |
Transfer in from: |
8M |
Southport |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/11/1964 |
12010 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
05/12/1964 |
92008 |
Transfer in from: |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
05/12/1964 |
92104 |
Transfer in from: |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
05/12/1964 |
92131 |
Transfer in from: |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/01/1965 |
D3836 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/01/1965 |
D3837 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
16/01/1965 |
46423 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
23/01/1965 |
46515 |
Transfer in from: |
89A |
Oswestry |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
23/01/1965 |
46516 |
Transfer in from: |
89A |
Oswestry |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
23/01/1965 |
46518 |
Transfer in from: |
89D |
Oswestry |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
23/01/1965 |
92020 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
23/01/1965 |
92084 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
23/01/1965 |
92089 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
23/01/1965 |
92111 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
23/01/1965 |
92127 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/01/1965 |
44739 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/02/1965 |
45338 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/02/1965 |
45466 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
44877 |
Transfer in from: |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
45154 |
Transfer in from: |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
45212 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
48189 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
48425 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
48457 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
48476 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
48029 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
48129 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
48296 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/03/1965 |
44806 |
Transfer in from: |
16F |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/03/1965 |
45059 |
Transfer in from: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/03/1965 |
45407 |
Transfer in from: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/03/1965 |
44741 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
15/05/1965 |
92104 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
15/05/1965 |
92131 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
48029 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
48163 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
48296 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
26/06/1965 |
92153 |
Transfer in from: |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/06/1965 |
45212 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
03/07/1965 |
12010 |
Transfer in from: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
10/07/1965 |
48408 |
Transfer in from: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
10/07/1965 |
48493 |
Transfer in from: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
10/07/1965 |
46424 |
Transfer out to: |
12D |
Workington |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
24/07/1965 |
48251 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
24/07/1965 |
48292 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
24/07/1965 |
48398 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
24/07/1965 |
92154 |
Transfer in from: |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/07/1965 |
44753 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
24/07/1965 |
48189 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
24/07/1965 |
48774 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
31/07/1965 |
92091 |
Transfer in from: |
38B |
Annesley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/08/1965 |
44678 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/08/1965 |
44679 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
28/08/1965 |
48251 |
Transfer out to: |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/09/1965 |
D3858 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
18/09/1965 |
48305 |
Transfer in from: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
18/09/1965 |
48374 |
Transfer in from: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
18/09/1965 |
48398 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
18/09/1965 |
48408 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
08/01/1966 |
44743 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/01/1966 |
45181 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/01/1966 |
44678 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/01/1966 |
44679 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/01/1966 |
D3578 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/01/1966 |
D3836 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/02/1966 |
D2551 |
Transfer in from: |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/02/1966 |
D2552 |
Transfer in from: |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/02/1966 |
D2553 |
Transfer in from: |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/02/1966 |
D2555 |
Transfer in from: |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/02/1966 |
D2564 |
Transfer in from: |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/02/1966 |
45223 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
05/02/1966 |
92022 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
05/02/1966 |
92050 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
19/02/1966 |
92115 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
12/03/1966 |
48010 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
12/03/1966 |
48203 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
12/03/1966 |
48335 |
Transfer in from: |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
12/03/1966 |
48292 |
Transfer out to: |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
12/03/1966 |
48425 |
Transfer out to: |
9K |
Bolton |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
19/03/1966 |
46410 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
19/03/1966 |
46518 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
48010 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
48335 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
48203 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
21/05/1966 |
48722 |
Transfer out to: |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
on |
21/05/1966 |
12029 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
D3578 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
44732 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
46515 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/06/1966 |
D2569 |
Transfer in from: |
82C |
Swindon |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/06/1966 |
12081 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
18/06/1966 |
46440 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
02/07/1966 |
D2569 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
23/07/1966 |
92158 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/08/1966 |
D2389 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/08/1966 |
D2390 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/08/1966 |
D2394 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/08/1966 |
45370 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
20/08/1966 |
48412 |
Transfer in from: |
8L |
Aintree |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
20/08/1966 |
48648 |
Transfer in from: |
8L |
Aintree |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
20/08/1966 |
92138 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
20/08/1966 |
92155 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
20/08/1966 |
92204 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
m/e |
09/1966 |
48457 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
m/e |
09/1966 |
48520 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1966 |
D2556 |
Transfer in from: |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1966 |
D2559 |
Transfer in from: |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1966 |
D2563 |
Transfer in from: |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1966 |
D2567 |
Transfer in from: |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1966 |
D2571 |
Transfer in from: |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1966 |
D2573 |
Transfer in from: |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1966 |
48296 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
15/10/1966 |
92228 |
Transfer in from: |
84C |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/10/1966 |
45338 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
02 |
0-4-0 |
w/e |
22/10/1966 |
D2850 |
Transfer in from: |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
02 |
0-4-0 |
w/e |
22/10/1966 |
D2851 |
Transfer in from: |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
02 |
0-4-0 |
w/e |
22/10/1966 |
D2852 |
Transfer in from: |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
02 |
0-4-0 |
w/e |
22/10/1966 |
D2853 |
Transfer in from: |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
02 |
0-4-0 |
w/e |
22/10/1966 |
D2854 |
Transfer in from: |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
02 |
0-4-0 |
w/e |
22/10/1966 |
D2855 |
Transfer in from: |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
02 |
0-4-0 |
w/e |
22/10/1966 |
D2856 |
Transfer in from: |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
02 |
0-4-0 |
w/e |
22/10/1966 |
D2857 |
Transfer in from: |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
02 |
0-4-0 |
w/e |
22/10/1966 |
D2858 |
Transfer in from: |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
02 |
0-4-0 |
w/e |
22/10/1966 |
D2860 |
Transfer in from: |
8K |
Bank Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
02 |
0-4-0 |
w/e |
22/10/1966 |
D2867 |
Transfer in from: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
12038 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
45154 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
45329 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1966 |
46503 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1966 |
46516 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1966 |
45332 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1966 |
92155 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
12034 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
45043 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
48060 |
Transfer in from: |
40E |
Colwick |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
92139 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
45223 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
31/12/1966 |
D2199 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
31/12/1966 |
D2372 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
31/12/1966 |
D2393 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
31/12/1966 |
45137 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
31/12/1966 |
48412 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/01/1967 |
48711 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/01/1967 |
12012 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/01/1967 |
45406 |
Transfer in from: |
40E |
Colwick |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
28/01/1967 |
92228 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
04/02/1967 |
48674 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
04/02/1967 |
45441 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
18/02/1967 |
48098 |
Transfer in from: |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
25/02/1967 |
92022 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
25/02/1967 |
92025 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
25/02/1967 |
45466 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
04/03/1967 |
48253 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
92218 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
92227 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
48098 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/03/1967 |
45031 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/03/1967 |
45056 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
01/04/1967 |
45231 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/04/1967 |
12005 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/04/1967 |
12009 |
Transfer in from: |
1F |
Rugby |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/04/1967 |
12019 |
Transfer in from: |
1F |
Rugby |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/04/1967 |
12021 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/04/1967 |
12025 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
13/05/1967 |
48509 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
20/05/1967 |
12034 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
20/05/1967 |
12038 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
20/05/1967 |
D3367 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
06/1967 |
45031 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1967 |
D4147 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
17/06/1967 |
92058 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
17/06/1967 |
92119 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
17/06/1967 |
48163 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
D2556 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
D2559 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
on |
24/06/1967 |
12028 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
on |
24/06/1967 |
D2552 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/07/1967 |
D2556 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/07/1967 |
D2556 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
08/07/1967 |
45059 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
08/07/1967 |
45406 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
08/07/1967 |
92138 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
on |
15/07/1967 |
12008 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
15/07/1967 |
48709 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/07/1967 |
45071 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/07/1967 |
45188 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/07/1967 |
45417 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
22/07/1967 |
48648 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
22/07/1967 |
92154 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/07/1967 |
D2126 |
Transfer in from: |
16C |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
on |
29/07/1967 |
D2559 |
Transfer in from: |
98W |
|
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
on |
05/08/1967 |
D2563 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
on |
05/08/1967 |
D2564 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/08/1967 |
45412 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
05/08/1967 |
92027 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
12/08/1967 |
92008 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
12/08/1967 |
92050 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
12/08/1967 |
92058 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
12/08/1967 |
92119 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
12/08/1967 |
92139 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
12/08/1967 |
92218 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/08/1967 |
45057 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/08/1967 |
45056 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
26/08/1967 |
D2560 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
26/08/1967 |
D2562 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
26/08/1967 |
D2566 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
26/08/1967 |
D2126 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/09/1967 |
D3546 |
Transfer in from: |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
on |
09/09/1967 |
12005 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/09/1967 |
D3033 |
Transfer in from: |
86A |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/09/1967 |
D3184 |
Transfer in from: |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/09/1967 |
D3187 |
Transfer in from: |
86A |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/09/1967 |
D3352 |
Transfer in from: |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/09/1967 |
D3353 |
Transfer in from: |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/09/1967 |
D3354 |
Transfer in from: |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/09/1967 |
D3359 |
Transfer in from: |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/09/1967 |
D3360 |
Transfer in from: |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/09/1967 |
48374 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/09/1967 |
48692 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
on |
30/09/1967 |
12006 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
on |
30/09/1967 |
12009 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
on |
30/09/1967 |
12010 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
on |
30/09/1967 |
12016 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
12035 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
12061 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
12094 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
D3109 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
92055 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
12017 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
12021 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
D3184 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
48294 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
on |
14/10/1967 |
12007 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
on |
14/10/1967 |
12019 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
44725 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/10/1967 |
D3398 |
Transfer in from: |
86A |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
on |
21/10/1967 |
12014 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
on |
21/10/1967 |
12026 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/10/1967 |
D3399 |
Transfer in from: |
86A |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
on |
28/10/1967 |
12015 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
on |
28/10/1967 |
12018 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
on |
04/11/1967 |
12027 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
04/11/1967 |
92227 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/11/1967 |
D3197 |
Transfer in from: |
16C |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
11/11/1967 |
92069 |
Transfer in from: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
11/11/1967 |
92094 |
Transfer in from: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
11/11/1967 |
92160 |
Transfer in from: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
11/11/1967 |
92165 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
on |
11/11/1967 |
12025 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
on |
11/11/1967 |
D2567 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
D2198 |
Transfer in from: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
on |
25/11/1967 |
D2560 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
45043 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
D2396 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
45305 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
48153 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
48206 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
92204 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
04 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/12/1967 |
D2300 |
Transfer in from: |
40E |
Colwick |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/12/1967 |
48674 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
23/12/1967 |
92055 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
23/12/1967 |
92117 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
on |
30/12/1967 |
12012 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
12034 |
Transfer in from: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
D2117 |
Transfer in from: |
12D |
Workington |
|
|
Diesel |
04 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
D2209 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
04 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
D2221 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
04 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
D2253 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
04 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
D2274 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
92218 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
92233 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
92249 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
02 |
0-4-0 |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
D2858 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
48253 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
48476 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
on |
06/01/1968 |
D2551 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
on |
06/01/1968 |
D2553 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
on |
06/01/1968 |
D2566 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
on |
13/01/1968 |
D2555 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
on |
13/01/1968 |
D2573 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
13/01/1968 |
48305 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
on |
20/01/1968 |
D2562 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
on |
20/01/1968 |
D2571 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
on |
30/01/1968 |
92153 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
03/02/1968 |
48493 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
03/02/1968 |
45034 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
03/02/1968 |
92233 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
48493 |
Transfer in from: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
16/03/1968 |
48153 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
16/03/1968 |
92165 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
13/04/1968 |
48308 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/04/1968 |
44806 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/04/1968 |
44950 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/04/1968 |
45131 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
20/04/1968 |
48060 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
05/1968 |
45201 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
04/05/1968 |
48206 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
04/05/1968 |
92054 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
04/05/1968 |
92069 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
04/05/1968 |
92094 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
04/05/1968 |
92218 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
04/05/1968 |
92249 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
12034 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
12035 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
12061 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
12094 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D2117 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D2198 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
04 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D2209 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
04 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D2221 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
04 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D2253 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
04 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D2274 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
04 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D2300 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D2396 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
02 |
0-4-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D2850 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
02 |
0-4-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D2851 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
02 |
0-4-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D2852 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
02 |
0-4-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D2853 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
02 |
0-4-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D2854 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
02 |
0-4-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D2855 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
02 |
0-4-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D2856 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
02 |
0-4-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D2857 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
02 |
0-4-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D2860 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
02 |
0-4-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D2867 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D3033 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D3109 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D3187 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D3197 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D3352 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D3353 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D3360 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D3398 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D3399 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D3546 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D3793 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D3794 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D3837 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D3855 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D3856 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D3857 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D3870 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D4146 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D4148 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D4152 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D4153 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
44877 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
45231 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
45305 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
45386 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
45388 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
45407 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
48493 |
Transfer out to: |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
92091 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
92160 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/12/1971 |
D3354 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
15/12/1973 |
D3359 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|