Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
13/07/1935 |
13252 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
13/07/1935 |
2951 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
05/10/1935 |
13252 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
05/10/1935 |
2951 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
02/11/1935 |
12023 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
02/11/1935 |
12053 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Coal Engine Saddle Tank |
0-6-0ST |
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
27477 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Coal Engine Saddle Tank |
0-6-0ST |
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
27484 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Coal Engine Saddle Tank |
0-6-0ST |
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
27492 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
7476 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
25730 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
25756 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
8598 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
12/1936 |
25730 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
13/11/1937 |
2974 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
13/11/1937 |
2979 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
12/1937 |
5294 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
05/03/1938 |
2974 |
Transfer out to: |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
05/03/1938 |
2979 |
Transfer out to: |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
02/07/1938 |
2961 |
Transfer in from: |
3D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
02/07/1938 |
2981 |
Transfer in from: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
02/07/1938 |
2984 |
Transfer in from: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
29/10/1938 |
2961 |
Transfer out to: |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
05/11/1938 |
2981 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
12/1938 |
25756 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
03/12/1938 |
2984 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Engine Saddle Tank |
0-6-0ST |
m/e |
06/1939 |
27492 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Coal Engine Saddle Tank |
0-6-0ST |
m/e |
10/1939 |
27477 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Coal Engine Saddle Tank |
0-6-0ST |
m/e |
01/1946 |
27484 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
12021 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
12022 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
12023 |
Snapshot |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
12023 |
Snapshot |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
12024 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
12032 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
12045 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
12053 |
Snapshot |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
12053 |
Snapshot |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
12063 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
12064 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
12172 |
Snapshot |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
12269 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2303 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2379 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2455 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2456 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2465 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2539 |
Snapshot |
1C |
Watford |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2563 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2572 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2588 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
397 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4892 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5019 |
Snapshot |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5030 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5141 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
52208 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5294 |
Snapshot |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5413 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5425 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5449 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
561 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7476 |
Snapshot |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
1185 |
0-8-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7885 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1185 |
0-8-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7888 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1185 |
0-8-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7896 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8930 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9014 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9023 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9024 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9026 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9029 |
Snapshot |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9030 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9043 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9053 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9090 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9124 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9125 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9129 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9134 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9141 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9149 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9159 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9176 |
Snapshot |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9192 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9197 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9207 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9221 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9257 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9306 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9310 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9311 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9422 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9424 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/01/1948 |
12032 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
2348 |
Transfer in from: |
5E |
Alsager |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
12172 |
Transfer out to: |
7D |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
24/01/1948 |
9331 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
14/02/1948 |
28559 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
8962 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
9190 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
12269 |
Transfer out to: |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
52208 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
13/03/1948 |
9341 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/03/1948 |
2379 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
12140 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
12233 |
Transfer in from: |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
12250 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
12269 |
Transfer in from: |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
12064 |
Transfer out to: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
10/04/1948 |
5235 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
17/04/1948 |
28559 |
Transfer out to: |
12D |
Workington |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
5070 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
9023 |
Transfer out to: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
9134 |
Transfer out to: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
9141 |
Transfer out to: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
9149 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
9192 |
Transfer out to: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
9197 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
5070 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/05/1948 |
28594 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
28594 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
9208 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
9263 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
9257 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Plodder Lane |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
9018 |
Transfer in from: |
20B |
Stourton |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
31/07/1948 |
9023 |
Transfer in from: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
9259 |
Transfer in from: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
28/08/1948 |
9190 |
Transfer out to: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
52063 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
52023 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
52023 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
9259 |
Transfer out to: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
16/10/1948 |
49424 |
Transfer out to: |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
49264 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
5030 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
2442 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
42610 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
2348 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
42303 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
42465 |
Transfer out to: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
48929 |
Transfer in from: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
9053 |
Transfer out to: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
8962 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1185 |
0-8-2T |
on |
04/12/1948 |
7888 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
42465 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
48929 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
49306 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
48929 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
49306 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
08/01/1949 |
45045 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
08/01/1949 |
42455 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
49352 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/01/1949 |
12341 |
Transfer in from: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
1185 |
0-8-2T |
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
47881 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
19/02/1949 |
49092 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
103 |
Transfer in from: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
40144 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
52051 |
Transfer in from: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
49263 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
12/03/1949 |
9422 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
9394 |
Transfer in from: |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
09/04/1949 |
49014 |
Transfer out to: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
49159 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
21/05/1949 |
9402 |
Transfer in from: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
28525 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
45045 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
58424 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/06/1949 |
12269 |
Transfer out to: |
7B |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
5w/e |
16/07/1949 |
40561 |
Transfer out to: |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
16/07/1949 |
49207 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
09/1949 |
49026 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
09/1949 |
49043 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
09/1949 |
49221 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
17/09/1949 |
42588 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
24/09/1949 |
52022 |
Transfer out to: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
42454 |
Transfer in from: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
45313 |
Transfer in from: |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
45495 |
Transfer in from: |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
52233 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
08/10/1949 |
9346 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
9129 |
Transfer out to: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
42453 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
49032 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
52107 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
5w/e |
24/12/1949 |
40397 |
Transfer out to: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
3w/e |
14/01/1950 |
49228 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
3w/e |
14/01/1950 |
49378 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
14/01/1950 |
45495 |
Transfer out to: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
2w/e |
14/01/1950 |
49176 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
21/01/1950 |
49228 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
21/01/1950 |
49378 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
21/01/1950 |
49228 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
21/01/1950 |
49378 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/02/1950 |
52126 |
Transfer in from: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
1185 |
0-8-2T |
m/e |
03/1950 |
47885 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1950 |
49381 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1950 |
49208 |
Transfer out to: |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
|
Steam |
1185 |
0-8-2T |
w/e |
25/03/1950 |
47884 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
08/04/1950 |
28616 |
Transfer in from: |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
08/04/1950 |
49081 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
08/04/1950 |
52023 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
22/04/1950 |
49268 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
29/04/1950 |
42266 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
29/04/1950 |
40144 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
13/05/1950 |
49029 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
20/05/1950 |
28616 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
27/05/1950 |
48895 |
Transfer in from: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
03/06/1950 |
49032 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1950 |
44892 |
Transfer out to: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
45235 |
Transfer in from: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
48895 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
49050 |
Transfer in from: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
49160 |
Transfer in from: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
58398 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
48895 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
29/07/1950 |
48929 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1185 |
0-8-2T |
w/e |
12/08/1950 |
47877 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
12/08/1950 |
49018 |
Transfer out to: |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
19/08/1950 |
9034 |
Transfer in from: |
5C |
Stafford |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
26/08/1950 |
49018 |
Transfer in from: |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
26/08/1950 |
49346 |
Transfer out to: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
49018 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
9034 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
49018 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
9034 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
23/09/1950 |
49081 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
23/09/1950 |
49394 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
44708 |
Transfer in from: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
45026 |
Transfer in from: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
45289 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
48930 |
Transfer out to: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
49024 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
10/1950 |
49050 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
44708 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
45026 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
45289 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
44708 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
45026 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
45289 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
14/10/1950 |
58368 |
Transfer in from: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
14/10/1950 |
40103 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
28/10/1950 |
49163 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
28/10/1950 |
49393 |
Transfer in from: |
1C |
Watford |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/10/1950 |
44708 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
28/10/1950 |
49160 |
Transfer out to: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
28/10/1950 |
9034 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Plodder Lane |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
28/10/1950 |
49331 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
49163 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
49393 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
49163 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
49393 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
58398 |
Transfer out to: |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
1185 |
0-8-2T |
on |
04/11/1950 |
47896 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
45313 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
45313 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
16/12/1950 |
49090 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
49408 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
13/01/1951 |
49264 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
49401 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
49436 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
58398 |
Transfer in from: |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
58418 |
Transfer in from: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
49401 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
49436 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
58418 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
49401 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
49436 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
58418 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
45019 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
49125 |
Transfer out to: |
1C |
Watford |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
03/03/1951 |
49092 |
Transfer out to: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
10/03/1951 |
49288 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
10/03/1951 |
49322 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
10/03/1951 |
9007 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
46428 |
Transfer in from: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
46430 |
Transfer in from: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
49253 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
49288 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
49322 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
9007 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
49288 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
49322 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
9007 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
14/04/1951 |
49124 |
Transfer out to: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/04/1951 |
58400 |
Transfer out to: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
05/1951 |
52126 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
05/05/1951 |
49288 |
Transfer out to: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
06/1951 |
58368 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/06/1951 |
45454 |
Transfer in from: |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
09/06/1951 |
46428 |
Transfer out to: |
10F |
Lower Ince |
|
|
Steam |
1185 |
0-8-2T |
w/e |
09/06/1951 |
47884 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/06/1951 |
45454 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/06/1951 |
45141 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/06/1951 |
45454 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1951 |
49030 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/07/1951 |
45425 |
Transfer out to: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
07/07/1951 |
46430 |
Transfer out to: |
7D |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
1185 |
0-8-2T |
w/e |
21/07/1951 |
47881 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1951 |
49025 |
Transfer in from: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1951 |
49144 |
Transfer in from: |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1951 |
9385 |
Transfer in from: |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1951 |
49310 |
Transfer out to: |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
49025 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
49154 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
9385 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
49025 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
52140 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
9385 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
27/10/1951 |
46430 |
Transfer in from: |
7D |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/10/1951 |
52250 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
08/12/1951 |
49163 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
45408 |
Transfer in from: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
52598 |
Transfer in from: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
58396 |
Transfer in from: |
12D |
Workington |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
46430 |
Transfer out to: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
58418 |
Transfer out to: |
7D |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
45249 |
Transfer in from: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
45425 |
Transfer in from: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
52107 |
Transfer out to: |
7D |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/02/1952 |
58398 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
15/03/1952 |
49253 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1952 |
58377 |
Transfer in from: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
46428 |
Transfer in from: |
10F |
Lower Ince |
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
65144 |
Transfer in from: |
10F |
Lower Ince |
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
65148 |
Transfer in from: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
65151 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
65159 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
65162 |
Transfer in from: |
NTH |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
65164 |
Transfer in from: |
10F |
Lower Ince |
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
65170 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
65173 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
65175 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
65176 |
Transfer in from: |
WIG |
Lower Ince |
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
65189 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
65196 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
65199 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
65203 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
52107 |
Transfer in from: |
7D |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
14/06/1952 |
52107 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
898 |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
14/06/1952 |
52551 |
Transfer in from: |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
14/06/1952 |
52107 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/06/1952 |
58377 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
46432 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
45235 |
Transfer out to: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
58396 |
Transfer out to: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/08/1952 |
52598 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/09/1952 |
52322 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/09/1952 |
65189 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
45055 |
Transfer in from: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
45235 |
Transfer in from: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
52118 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
42563 |
Transfer out to: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
52053 |
Transfer out to: |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
42663 |
Transfer in from: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
46489 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
52449 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
52045 |
Transfer out to: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
65144 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
65164 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
65170 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
3w/e |
24/01/1953 |
42666 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
40003 |
Transfer in from: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
45235 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
1185 |
0-8-2T |
w/e |
21/02/1953 |
47877 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/03/1953 |
52107 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/03/1953 |
52143 |
Transfer in from: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/03/1953 |
65196 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
45249 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
45289 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
05/09/1953 |
42462 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
05/09/1953 |
45289 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
05/09/1953 |
40003 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
05/09/1953 |
45413 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
42121 |
Transfer in from: |
1C |
Watford |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
46434 |
Transfer in from: |
6K |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
42121 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
45004 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
45135 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
45314 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
30/01/1954 |
42442 |
Transfer out to: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/01/1954 |
46489 |
Transfer out to: |
12D |
Workington |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/02/1954 |
46448 |
Transfer in from: |
12D |
Workington |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
27/02/1954 |
49155 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
27/03/1954 |
42423 |
Transfer in from: |
27B |
Greenock Ladyburn |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
8w/e |
17/04/1954 |
42266 |
Transfer out to: |
66D |
Greenock Ladyburn |
|
|
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/05/1954 |
52024 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
46448 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
46428 |
Transfer out to: |
6K |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
46448 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
04/09/1954 |
52118 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
46428 |
Transfer in from: |
6K |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
49144 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
49203 |
Transfer in from: |
10D |
Plodder Lane |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
49315 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
52366 |
Transfer in from: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
42453 |
Transfer out to: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
49144 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/02/1955 |
45004 |
Transfer out to: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
26/03/1955 |
42423 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/05/1955 |
45347 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/05/1955 |
45055 |
Transfer out to: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
8w/e |
16/07/1955 |
49093 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/08/1955 |
52021 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
28/01/1956 |
44827 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/02/1956 |
52051 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
52393 |
Transfer in from: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
58203 |
Transfer in from: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
65131 |
Transfer in from: |
9G |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
44827 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
49007 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
10/03/1956 |
49322 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1956 |
58203 |
Transfer out to: |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
21/04/1956 |
49007 |
Transfer in from: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/05/1956 |
46422 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/05/1956 |
46432 |
Transfer out to: |
6K |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
46459 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
49073 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
42465 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
45289 |
Transfer out to: |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
42465 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
48915 |
Transfer in from: |
1C |
Watford |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
49145 |
Transfer in from: |
1C |
Watford |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
49323 |
Transfer in from: |
1C |
Watford |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
42610 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
46459 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
52322 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
52366 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
898 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
52551 |
Transfer out to: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/09/1956 |
45057 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
08/09/1956 |
49323 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
898 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
52551 |
Transfer in from: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
03/11/1956 |
49025 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
on |
07/12/1956 |
65176 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
on |
10/12/1956 |
65148 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
on |
13/12/1956 |
65162 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
on |
14/12/1956 |
65173 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
15/12/1956 |
65203 |
Transfer out to: |
51A |
Darlington |
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/12/1956 |
65138 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/12/1956 |
65140 |
Transfer in from: |
6D |
Chester Northgate |
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/12/1956 |
65146 |
Transfer in from: |
6D |
Chester Northgate |
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/12/1956 |
65156 |
Transfer in from: |
6D |
Chester Northgate |
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/12/1956 |
65170 |
Transfer in from: |
6D |
Chester Northgate |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/12/1956 |
52341 |
Transfer out to: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
49025 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
42571 |
Transfer in from: |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
52393 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
42119 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
42120 |
Transfer in from: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
42235 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
42463 |
Transfer in from: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
42454 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
42539 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
42663 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
23/03/1957 |
49341 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
898 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
23/03/1957 |
52551 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
20/04/1957 |
49267 |
Transfer in from: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1957 |
49393 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
11/07/1957 |
D3367 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
11/07/1957 |
D3368 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
26/07/1957 |
D3369 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
02/08/1957 |
D3370 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
07/08/1957 |
D3371 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
13291 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
13292 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
42471 |
Transfer in from: |
5E |
Alsager |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
45454 |
Transfer out to: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
10/1957 |
52449 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
8w/e |
05/10/1957 |
49093 |
Transfer out to: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
8w/e |
05/10/1957 |
49144 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
8w/e |
05/10/1957 |
49306 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
8w/e |
05/10/1957 |
49315 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
26/10/1957 |
52143 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
52230 |
Transfer in from: |
7B |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
52269 |
Transfer in from: |
7B |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
21/12/1957 |
49385 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/12/1957 |
65159 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
28/12/1957 |
42571 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
04/01/1958 |
49145 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
11/01/1958 |
49073 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
42571 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
49049 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
49321 |
Transfer in from: |
2C |
Northampton |
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
15/02/1958 |
65156 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
03/1958 |
65175 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
44069 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
44280 |
Transfer in from: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
44303 |
Transfer in from: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
46423 |
Transfer in from: |
6K |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
49422 |
Transfer in from: |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
D3367 |
Transfer out to: |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
19/04/1958 |
49139 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
44438 |
Transfer in from: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
48905 |
Transfer in from: |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
49020 |
Transfer in from: |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
52230 |
Transfer out to: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
52269 |
Transfer out to: |
26E |
Lees (Oldham) |
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/06/1958 |
65170 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
12071 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
12099 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
12102 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
45092 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
D3368 |
Transfer out to: |
24K |
Preston |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
D3369 |
Transfer out to: |
24K |
Preston |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
D3371 |
Transfer out to: |
24K |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
08/11/1958 |
49079 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
08/11/1958 |
49150 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
08/11/1958 |
42463 |
Transfer out to: |
24K |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
06/12/1958 |
46423 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/12/1958 |
65146 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/12/1958 |
65199 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
20/12/1958 |
65177 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
20/12/1958 |
65192 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
14/02/1959 |
49438 |
Transfer in from: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
21/02/1959 |
49009 |
Transfer in from: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
14/03/1959 |
90509 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
14/03/1959 |
90667 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Market Harborough |
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
on |
28/03/1959 |
65131 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
04/04/1959 |
49228 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
11/04/1959 |
49352 |
Transfer out to: |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/05/1959 |
45017 |
Transfer in from: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/05/1959 |
45019 |
Transfer in from: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
49436 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
06/06/1959 |
48905 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
44758 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
45373 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
42119 |
Transfer out to: |
11A |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
42120 |
Transfer out to: |
11A |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
42666 |
Transfer out to: |
11A |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/07/1959 |
12003 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/07/1959 |
13291 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/07/1959 |
13292 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
25/07/1959 |
42235 |
Transfer out to: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
26/07/1959 |
12019 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
on |
08/08/1959 |
65138 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
15/08/1959 |
48942 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
15/08/1959 |
49008 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
15/08/1959 |
49134 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
15/08/1959 |
49143 |
Transfer in from: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
15/08/1959 |
49451 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
15/08/1959 |
65198 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
05/09/1959 |
42235 |
Transfer in from: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
05/09/1959 |
49018 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/09/1959 |
45108 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/09/1959 |
45109 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/09/1959 |
45372 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
26/09/1959 |
65177 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
10/10/1959 |
49311 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
24/10/1959 |
44355 |
Transfer in from: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
24/10/1959 |
44537 |
Transfer in from: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
44780 |
Transfer in from: |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
45340 |
Transfer in from: |
24K |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
45431 |
Transfer in from: |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
65157 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
44355 |
Transfer out to: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
44537 |
Transfer out to: |
11A |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
49079 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
49134 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
14/11/1959 |
49150 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
14/11/1959 |
49203 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
14/11/1959 |
49268 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
14/11/1959 |
49378 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
58120 |
Transfer in from: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
58123 |
Transfer in from: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
28/11/1959 |
49009 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/12/1959 |
65140 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
12/12/1959 |
46447 |
Transfer in from: |
12D |
Workington |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
12/12/1959 |
49141 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
02/01/1960 |
D3836 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
02/01/1960 |
D3837 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
02/01/1960 |
49191 |
Transfer in from: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
02/01/1960 |
49401 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
09/01/1960 |
42303 |
Transfer in from: |
6D |
Chester Northgate |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
09/01/1960 |
42317 |
Transfer in from: |
6D |
Chester Northgate |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/01/1960 |
43973 |
Transfer in from: |
5E |
Alsager |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
09/01/1960 |
47392 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
09/01/1960 |
47659 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
09/01/1960 |
47669 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
09/01/1960 |
47671 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
16/01/1960 |
46448 |
Transfer out to: |
5F |
Uttoxeter |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
06/02/1960 |
42456 |
Transfer out to: |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
27/02/1960 |
47270 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
27/02/1960 |
47281 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/03/1960 |
D3370 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
12/03/1960 |
46448 |
Transfer in from: |
5F |
Uttoxeter |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/03/1960 |
44438 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
02/04/1960 |
90702 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/04/1960 |
45092 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
90173 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
90214 |
Transfer in from: |
OXY |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
90257 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
90317 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
90686 |
Transfer in from: |
CHR |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
46422 |
Transfer out to: |
12D |
Kirkby Stephen |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
30/04/1960 |
78017 |
Transfer in from: |
51H |
Kirkby Stephen |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
30/04/1960 |
78019 |
Transfer in from: |
51H |
Kirkby Stephen |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
07/05/1960 |
46434 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
14/05/1960 |
65192 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
11/06/1960 |
42571 |
Transfer out to: |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
44758 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
44780 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
46447 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
25/06/1960 |
42564 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
25/06/1960 |
45092 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
25/06/1960 |
49321 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
02/07/1960 |
12003 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
02/07/1960 |
12003 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
02/07/1960 |
90214 |
Transfer out to: |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
09/07/1960 |
49447 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Market Harborough |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
09/07/1960 |
43973 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
06/08/1960 |
49444 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Market Harborough |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
13/08/1960 |
42303 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/08/1960 |
58120 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
27/08/1960 |
49155 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
27/08/1960 |
49444 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
27/08/1960 |
90702 |
Transfer out to: |
24K |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1960 |
58120 |
Transfer in from: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
44445 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
46470 |
Transfer in from: |
51H |
Kirkby Stephen |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
47669 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/09/1960 |
45394 |
Transfer in from: |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
15/10/1960 |
42303 |
Transfer in from: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/10/1960 |
58123 |
Transfer out to: |
21E |
Monument Lane |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/11/1960 |
45388 |
Transfer in from: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
05/11/1960 |
47281 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
31/12/1960 |
45394 |
Transfer out to: |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
21/01/1961 |
47444 |
Transfer in from: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
21/01/1961 |
47520 |
Transfer in from: |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/01/1961 |
12019 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/01/1961 |
12071 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/01/1961 |
12099 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/01/1961 |
12102 |
Transfer out to: |
5G |
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
28/01/1961 |
49122 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
28/01/1961 |
49164 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
28/01/1961 |
49344 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
04/02/1961 |
42462 |
Transfer out to: |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
04/02/1961 |
47520 |
Transfer out to: |
12E |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
11/02/1961 |
47659 |
Transfer out to: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
04/03/1961 |
49352 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
18/03/1961 |
47659 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
01/04/1961 |
58120 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
08/04/1961 |
47659 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
11/04/1961 |
49142 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
11/04/1961 |
49352 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
15/04/1961 |
42607 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/04/1961 |
45340 |
Transfer out to: |
24K |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/04/1961 |
44076 |
Transfer in from: |
2C |
Northampton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/04/1961 |
44121 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/04/1961 |
44125 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
06/05/1961 |
42317 |
Transfer out to: |
12C |
Carlisle Canal |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
12031 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
12032 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
78017 |
Transfer out to: |
6K |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
78019 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
17/06/1961 |
46422 |
Transfer in from: |
12D |
Kirkby Stephen |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
17/06/1961 |
49142 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/08/1961 |
45408 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
19/08/1961 |
12003 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/08/1961 |
45408 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
19/08/1961 |
12003 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
26/08/1961 |
65157 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
26/08/1961 |
65198 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
02/09/1961 |
49422 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/09/1961 |
46161 |
Transfer in from: |
24K |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/09/1961 |
46165 |
Transfer in from: |
24K |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/09/1961 |
46167 |
Transfer in from: |
24K |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/09/1961 |
46168 |
Transfer in from: |
24K |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
09/09/1961 |
49002 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
09/09/1961 |
49104 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
45521 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
07/10/1961 |
42471 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
48915 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
48942 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
49007 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
49020 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
49023 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
49154 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
14/10/1961 |
49164 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
14/10/1961 |
49191 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/10/1961 |
44445 |
Transfer out to: |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
11/11/1961 |
42462 |
Transfer in from: |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
25/11/1961 |
47517 |
Transfer in from: |
11A |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1961 |
45024 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1961 |
45281 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
09/12/1961 |
42564 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/12/1961 |
45024 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/12/1961 |
45024 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
10/02/1962 |
42426 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
10/02/1962 |
42664 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
10/02/1962 |
76022 |
Transfer in from: |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
10/02/1962 |
76051 |
Transfer in from: |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
10/02/1962 |
46422 |
Transfer out to: |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
10/02/1962 |
46428 |
Transfer out to: |
21B |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
10/02/1962 |
46448 |
Transfer out to: |
21B |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
10/02/1962 |
46470 |
Transfer out to: |
21D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
05/05/1962 |
49314 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
05/05/1962 |
49431 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
05/05/1962 |
47392 |
Transfer out to: |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/06/1962 |
45092 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
42327 |
Transfer in from: |
5C |
Stafford |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/06/1962 |
46167 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
14/07/1962 |
44110 |
Transfer in from: |
21D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
14/07/1962 |
44301 |
Transfer in from: |
21D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
14/07/1962 |
44444 |
Transfer in from: |
21D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
14/07/1962 |
44492 |
Transfer in from: |
3D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
14/07/1962 |
44514 |
Transfer in from: |
21D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
14/07/1962 |
44517 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/07/1962 |
46161 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/07/1962 |
46165 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
14/07/1962 |
76022 |
Transfer out to: |
21D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
14/07/1962 |
76051 |
Transfer out to: |
21D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
on |
15/07/1962 |
90148 |
Transfer in from: |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
on |
15/07/1962 |
90261 |
Transfer in from: |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
on |
15/07/1962 |
90268 |
Transfer in from: |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
on |
15/07/1962 |
90585 |
Transfer in from: |
84C |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
21/07/1962 |
42751 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
21/07/1962 |
42777 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
21/07/1962 |
42894 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/07/1962 |
45073 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/07/1962 |
45140 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
21/07/1962 |
47314 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
21/07/1962 |
47493 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
21/07/1962 |
90440 |
Transfer in from: |
65D |
Dawsholm |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
21/07/1962 |
90493 |
Transfer in from: |
65D |
Dawsholm |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
18/08/1962 |
48895 |
Transfer out to: |
21C |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
08/09/1962 |
47270 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
45055 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
45070 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
45188 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
45278 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
46128 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
44110 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
49002 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
49025 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
06/10/1962 |
47603 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
27/10/1962 |
42303 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/11/1962 |
44246 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/11/1962 |
44517 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
10/11/1962 |
49143 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
49049 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
49122 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
49267 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
49314 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
49344 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
49381 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
49402 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
49408 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
49431 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
49438 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
49447 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
49451 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
08/12/1962 |
49008 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/01/1963 |
44125 |
Transfer out to: |
24G |
Skipton |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
16/03/1963 |
90140 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
16/03/1963 |
90423 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/03/1963 |
90157 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/03/1963 |
90192 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/03/1963 |
45380 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
30/03/1963 |
90686 |
Transfer out to: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/04/1963 |
44041 |
Transfer in from: |
20F |
Skipton |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
06/04/1963 |
90585 |
Transfer out to: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
04/05/1963 |
90192 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
01/06/1963 |
90242 |
Transfer in from: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
01/06/1963 |
90585 |
Transfer in from: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
01/06/1963 |
90686 |
Transfer in from: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
01/06/1963 |
90261 |
Transfer out to: |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
01/06/1963 |
90268 |
Transfer out to: |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
08/06/1963 |
90140 |
Transfer out to: |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
44864 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
45069 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
45181 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
45244 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
45312 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
45329 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
45375 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
45413 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
44492 |
Transfer out to: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
29/06/1963 |
46110 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1963 |
90147 |
Transfer in from: |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1963 |
44514 |
Transfer out to: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1963 |
45069 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1963 |
45312 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1963 |
45375 |
Transfer out to: |
27C |
Southport |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1963 |
45413 |
Transfer out to: |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1963 |
46110 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
13/07/1963 |
90125 |
Transfer in from: |
27B |
Aintree |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
13/07/1963 |
90173 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
13/07/1963 |
90535 |
Transfer in from: |
27B |
Aintree |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/07/1963 |
44076 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/07/1963 |
44864 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/07/1963 |
45181 |
Transfer out to: |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/07/1963 |
45244 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/07/1963 |
45329 |
Transfer out to: |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
13/07/1963 |
90173 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
45017 |
Transfer out to: |
27C |
Southport |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
45055 |
Transfer out to: |
27C |
Southport |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
45347 |
Transfer out to: |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
45373 |
Transfer out to: |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
27/07/1963 |
45026 |
Transfer out to: |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
27/07/1963 |
45057 |
Transfer out to: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
27/07/1963 |
45073 |
Transfer out to: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
27/07/1963 |
45109 |
Transfer out to: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
27/07/1963 |
45380 |
Transfer out to: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
27/07/1963 |
45388 |
Transfer out to: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
17/08/1963 |
44302 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
17/08/1963 |
44348 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/08/1963 |
45135 |
Transfer out to: |
27C |
Southport |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/08/1963 |
45188 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
17/08/1963 |
90440 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
09/1963 |
44303 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
09/1963 |
44444 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/09/1963 |
44823 |
Transfer in from: |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
14/09/1963 |
90125 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
14/09/1963 |
90535 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
on |
28/09/1963 |
45521 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/10/1963 |
44069 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/10/1963 |
45531 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/10/1963 |
45296 |
Transfer in from: |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/10/1963 |
45385 |
Transfer in from: |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
02/11/1963 |
44486 |
Transfer in from: |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
09/11/1963 |
42601 |
Transfer in from: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/11/1963 |
44395 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/11/1963 |
44536 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/11/1963 |
44548 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
16/11/1963 |
90242 |
Transfer out to: |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/11/1963 |
75011 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/11/1963 |
75039 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/11/1963 |
75041 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/11/1963 |
75042 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/11/1963 |
75044 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/11/1963 |
75051 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/11/1963 |
75057 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/11/1963 |
75059 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
30/11/1963 |
44041 |
Transfer out to: |
10G |
Skipton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
30/11/1963 |
44486 |
Transfer out to: |
10G |
Skipton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
12/1963 |
44395 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/12/1963 |
90183 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
07/12/1963 |
42327 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
14/12/1963 |
42948 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
14/12/1963 |
42977 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/12/1963 |
75017 |
Transfer in from: |
27C |
Southport |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/12/1963 |
75019 |
Transfer in from: |
27C |
Southport |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
14/12/1963 |
42777 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
14/12/1963 |
44548 |
Transfer out to: |
10H |
Lower Darwen |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
14/12/1963 |
44280 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
21/12/1963 |
42959 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/01/1964 |
44041 |
Transfer in from: |
10G |
Skipton |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
11/01/1964 |
42572 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
25/01/1964 |
42174 |
Transfer in from: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/01/1964 |
44486 |
Transfer in from: |
10G |
Skipton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
25/01/1964 |
75058 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/02/1964 |
42607 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
08/02/1964 |
42560 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
29/02/1964 |
90316 |
Transfer in from: |
9K |
Bolton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/02/1964 |
44536 |
Transfer out to: |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
21/03/1964 |
78037 |
Transfer in from: |
24G |
Skipton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/03/1964 |
44348 |
Transfer out to: |
12D |
Workington |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/03/1964 |
44302 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
04/1964 |
44301 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
m/e |
04/1964 |
90147 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
m/e |
04/1964 |
90667 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/04/1964 |
44041 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/04/1964 |
44486 |
Transfer out to: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
42494 |
Transfer in from: |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
42554 |
Transfer in from: |
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
42555 |
Transfer in from: |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
42589 |
Transfer in from: |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
42631 |
Transfer in from: |
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
42634 |
Transfer in from: |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
42647 |
Transfer in from: |
8P |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
42680 |
Transfer in from: |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
42730 |
Transfer in from: |
8P |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
42734 |
Transfer in from: |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
42878 |
Transfer in from: |
8P |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
45218 |
Transfer in from: |
8P |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
46419 |
Transfer in from: |
26E |
Lees (Oldham) |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
46484 |
Transfer in from: |
26E |
Lees (Oldham) |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
46486 |
Transfer in from: |
26E |
Lees (Oldham) |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
46487 |
Transfer in from: |
9P |
Lees (Oldham) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
78020 |
Transfer in from: |
8P |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
78027 |
Transfer in from: |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
78057 |
Transfer in from: |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
78061 |
Transfer in from: |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
78062 |
Transfer in from: |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
18/04/1964 |
42560 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
25/04/1964 |
75015 |
Transfer in from: |
8L |
Aintree |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
25/04/1964 |
90369 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
25/04/1964 |
90669 |
Transfer in from: |
1G |
Woodford Halse |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
05/1964 |
42963 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
05/1964 |
42968 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
on |
02/05/1964 |
46168 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
09/05/1964 |
42680 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1964 |
46402 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1964 |
46440 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1964 |
46447 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1964 |
46499 |
Transfer in from: |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1964 |
46506 |
Transfer in from: |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1964 |
42730 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1964 |
78020 |
Transfer out to: |
16C |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1964 |
78027 |
Transfer out to: |
16C |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1964 |
78037 |
Transfer out to: |
16C |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1964 |
78057 |
Transfer out to: |
16C |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1964 |
78061 |
Transfer out to: |
16C |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1964 |
78062 |
Transfer out to: |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/06/1964 |
46115 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
27/06/1964 |
42734 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
27/06/1964 |
45218 |
Transfer out to: |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
27/06/1964 |
46499 |
Transfer out to: |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
27/06/1964 |
46506 |
Transfer out to: |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
27/06/1964 |
47517 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
07/1964 |
42952 |
Transfer in from: |
8L |
Aintree |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
07/1964 |
42953 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
07/1964 |
42956 |
Transfer in from: |
8L |
Aintree |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
07/1964 |
42960 |
Transfer in from: |
8L |
Aintree |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
07/1964 |
42961 |
Transfer in from: |
8L |
Aintree |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
m/e |
07/1964 |
90257 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
04/07/1964 |
90157 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/07/1964 |
90173 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
18/07/1964 |
90724 |
Transfer in from: |
9K |
Bolton |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
25/07/1964 |
90283 |
Transfer in from: |
27B |
Aintree |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
25/07/1964 |
90399 |
Transfer in from: |
8L |
Aintree |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
25/07/1964 |
90561 |
Transfer in from: |
8L |
Aintree |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
25/07/1964 |
90687 |
Transfer in from: |
27B |
Aintree |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
25/07/1964 |
45531 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
25/07/1964 |
46115 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
08/1964 |
42954 |
Transfer in from: |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
08/08/1964 |
12024 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
08/08/1964 |
46503 |
Transfer in from: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
08/08/1964 |
46517 |
Transfer in from: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
08/08/1964 |
90697 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
15/08/1964 |
42894 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
22/08/1964 |
90687 |
Transfer out to: |
8L |
Aintree |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
12/09/1964 |
90283 |
Transfer out to: |
36C |
Frodingham |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
12/09/1964 |
90316 |
Transfer out to: |
40E |
Colwick |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
12/09/1964 |
90369 |
Transfer out to: |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
12/09/1964 |
90423 |
Transfer out to: |
40E |
Colwick |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
12/09/1964 |
90509 |
Transfer out to: |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
12/09/1964 |
90697 |
Transfer out to: |
41D |
Canklow |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
12/09/1964 |
42589 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
12/09/1964 |
42631 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
on |
12/09/1964 |
42952 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
42295 |
Transfer in from: |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
42558 |
Transfer in from: |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
on |
19/09/1964 |
42956 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
42460 |
Transfer in from: |
26C |
Bolton |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
42565 |
Transfer in from: |
26C |
Bolton |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
03/10/1964 |
42670 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
03/10/1964 |
42751 |
Transfer out to: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
17/10/1964 |
90632 |
Transfer in from: |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
17/10/1964 |
90725 |
Transfer in from: |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
24/10/1964 |
42878 |
Transfer out to: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1964 |
46440 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1964 |
46503 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1964 |
90725 |
Transfer out to: |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
14/11/1964 |
42587 |
Transfer in from: |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
21/11/1964 |
42426 |
Transfer out to: |
9K |
Bolton |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
21/11/1964 |
42554 |
Transfer out to: |
9K |
Bolton |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/11/1964 |
12023 |
Transfer in from: |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/11/1964 |
12070 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/11/1964 |
12075 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/11/1964 |
12076 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/11/1964 |
12078 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/11/1964 |
12100 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/11/1964 |
12102 |
Transfer in from: |
5G |
|
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/11/1964 |
12024 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
28/11/1964 |
42555 |
Transfer out to: |
9K |
Bolton |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
28/11/1964 |
42565 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
29/11/1964 |
42084 |
Transfer in from: |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
05/12/1964 |
48114 |
Transfer in from: |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
05/12/1964 |
48125 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
05/12/1964 |
48187 |
Transfer in from: |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
05/12/1964 |
48379 |
Transfer in from: |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
05/12/1964 |
48494 |
Transfer in from: |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
05/12/1964 |
48675 |
Transfer in from: |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
05/12/1964 |
42664 |
Transfer out to: |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
05/12/1964 |
42084 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
05/12/1964 |
42670 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/12/1964 |
44246 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
26/12/1964 |
44500 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
02/01/1965 |
48278 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/01/1965 |
48261 |
Transfer in from: |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/01/1965 |
48275 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/01/1965 |
D3836 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/01/1965 |
D3837 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
09/01/1965 |
42494 |
Transfer out to: |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
09/01/1965 |
42634 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/01/1965 |
44121 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/01/1965 |
44930 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/01/1965 |
44935 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
30/01/1965 |
42460 |
Transfer out to: |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
30/01/1965 |
90632 |
Transfer out to: |
8L |
Aintree |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
30/01/1965 |
90724 |
Transfer out to: |
8L |
Aintree |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/02/1965 |
45313 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/02/1965 |
45375 |
Transfer in from: |
27C |
Southport |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
13/02/1965 |
42465 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
m/e |
03/1965 |
90585 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
44658 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
44918 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
45221 |
Transfer in from: |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
75051 |
Transfer out to: |
10G |
Skipton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
75057 |
Transfer out to: |
10G |
Skipton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
75058 |
Transfer out to: |
10G |
Skipton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
75059 |
Transfer out to: |
10G |
Skipton |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
13/03/1965 |
90148 |
Transfer out to: |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
13/03/1965 |
90317 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/03/1965 |
44779 |
Transfer in from: |
9M |
Bury |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/03/1965 |
75011 |
Transfer out to: |
10G |
Skipton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/03/1965 |
75015 |
Transfer out to: |
10G |
Skipton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/03/1965 |
75017 |
Transfer out to: |
10G |
Skipton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/03/1965 |
75019 |
Transfer out to: |
10G |
Skipton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/03/1965 |
75039 |
Transfer out to: |
10G |
Skipton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/03/1965 |
75041 |
Transfer out to: |
10G |
Skipton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/03/1965 |
75042 |
Transfer out to: |
10G |
Skipton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/03/1965 |
75044 |
Transfer out to: |
10G |
Skipton |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
27/03/1965 |
90399 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
27/03/1965 |
90561 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
03/04/1965 |
42601 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
03/04/1965 |
90686 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/04/1965 |
44658 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/04/1965 |
44930 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/04/1965 |
44935 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
17/04/1965 |
90493 |
Transfer out to: |
36C |
Frodingham |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
17/04/1965 |
90669 |
Transfer out to: |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
17/04/1965 |
42558 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
05/1965 |
42948 |
Transfer out to: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
05/1965 |
42960 |
Transfer out to: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
05/1965 |
42961 |
Transfer out to: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
05/1965 |
42968 |
Transfer out to: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
05/1965 |
42977 |
Transfer out to: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
01/05/1965 |
42374 |
Transfer in from: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/05/1965 |
46128 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
08/05/1965 |
42369 |
Transfer in from: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
15/05/1965 |
42369 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
22/05/1965 |
42343 |
Transfer in from: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
29/05/1965 |
90183 |
Transfer out to: |
36C |
Frodingham |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
48221 |
Transfer in from: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
48764 |
Transfer in from: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
26/06/1965 |
42102 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
26/06/1965 |
48715 |
Transfer in from: |
8L |
Aintree |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/06/1965 |
44779 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/06/1965 |
45070 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/06/1965 |
45221 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/06/1965 |
45375 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
03/07/1965 |
44918 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
03/07/1965 |
46402 |
Transfer out to: |
8K |
Bank Hall |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
03/07/1965 |
46484 |
Transfer out to: |
8K |
Bank Hall |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
24/07/1965 |
42577 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
24/07/1965 |
42611 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/07/1965 |
44873 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/07/1965 |
45091 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/07/1965 |
45128 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/07/1965 |
45321 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
07/08/1965 |
42174 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
14/08/1965 |
42295 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
14/08/1965 |
46486 |
Transfer out to: |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
21/08/1965 |
42665 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/08/1965 |
45305 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
04/09/1965 |
42343 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
04/09/1965 |
47493 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
11/09/1965 |
42374 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
10/1965 |
45314 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
42665 |
Transfer out to: |
8M |
Southport |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/11/1965 |
44823 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
12/1965 |
42968 |
Transfer in from: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/12/1965 |
44500 |
Transfer out to: |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/12/1965 |
45108 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
on |
25/12/1965 |
42959 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
on |
15/01/1966 |
42953 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/01/1966 |
44678 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/01/1966 |
44679 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
22/01/1966 |
46419 |
Transfer out to: |
8L |
Aintree |
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/02/1966 |
D2557 |
Transfer in from: |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/02/1966 |
D2558 |
Transfer in from: |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/02/1966 |
D2560 |
Transfer in from: |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/02/1966 |
D2561 |
Transfer in from: |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/02/1966 |
D2562 |
Transfer in from: |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/02/1966 |
D2565 |
Transfer in from: |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/02/1966 |
D2568 |
Transfer in from: |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/02/1966 |
44842 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/02/1966 |
45395 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
19/02/1966 |
48319 |
Transfer in from: |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
19/02/1966 |
48338 |
Transfer in from: |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
19/02/1966 |
46487 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/04/1966 |
44962 |
Transfer in from: |
16F |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
30/04/1966 |
46432 |
Transfer in from: |
12C |
Workington |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
07/05/1966 |
47444 |
Transfer out to: |
8L |
Aintree |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
14/05/1966 |
42462 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
44732 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
46515 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/06/1966 |
D2566 |
Transfer in from: |
82C |
Swindon |
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/06/1966 |
D2570 |
Transfer in from: |
82C |
Swindon |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
18/06/1966 |
42233 |
Transfer in from: |
8M |
Southport |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
25/06/1966 |
48082 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
25/06/1966 |
48165 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
02/07/1966 |
D2569 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
on |
16/07/1966 |
42963 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/07/1966 |
48410 |
Transfer in from: |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
23/07/1966 |
42611 |
Transfer out to: |
12E |
Tebay |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
23/07/1966 |
42647 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
23/07/1966 |
47314 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/08/1966 |
44710 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/08/1966 |
45331 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
09/1966 |
45140 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1966 |
45091 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1966 |
45128 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
10/1966 |
45385 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/10/1966 |
D3198 |
Transfer in from: |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/10/1966 |
44737 |
Transfer in from: |
8K |
Bank Hall |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
22/10/1966 |
47603 |
Transfer out to: |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
22/10/1966 |
47671 |
Transfer out to: |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
12097 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
45267 |
Transfer in from: |
40E |
Colwick |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
48678 |
Transfer in from: |
16B |
Colwick |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
42233 |
Transfer out to: |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
42235 |
Transfer out to: |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
42587 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/11/1966 |
45372 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/11/1966 |
45408 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
12/1966 |
46517 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
12072 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
D3791 |
Transfer in from: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
45048 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
48117 |
Transfer in from: |
16B |
Colwick |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
17/12/1966 |
42102 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/12/1966 |
44710 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
on |
31/12/1966 |
42968 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
31/12/1966 |
46447 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/01/1967 |
48187 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
14/01/1967 |
42577 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/01/1967 |
44737 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
04/02/1967 |
48132 |
Transfer in from: |
40E |
Colwick |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
04/02/1967 |
48705 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
04/02/1967 |
48752 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
04/02/1967 |
48221 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
on |
11/02/1967 |
42954 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
04/03/1967 |
48705 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
44711 |
Transfer in from: |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
45198 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
45282 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
45350 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
48325 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
48724 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
18/03/1967 |
48165 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
18/03/1967 |
48379 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
on |
25/03/1967 |
D2565 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
01/04/1967 |
48114 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
01/04/1967 |
48494 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
on |
15/04/1967 |
D2557 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
15/04/1967 |
48082 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/04/1967 |
12004 |
Transfer in from: |
2G |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/04/1967 |
12013 |
Transfer in from: |
2G |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/04/1967 |
12020 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
06/05/1967 |
46432 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
06/05/1967 |
46515 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/05/1967 |
45019 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/05/1967 |
45024 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/05/1967 |
44658 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/05/1967 |
44819 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/05/1967 |
44831 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/05/1967 |
44920 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/05/1967 |
44985 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/05/1967 |
45116 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/05/1967 |
45268 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
27/05/1967 |
44776 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1967 |
45278 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
44683 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
44761 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
45310 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
48033 |
Transfer in from: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
48153 |
Transfer in from: |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
48167 |
Transfer in from: |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
48192 |
Transfer in from: |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
48193 |
Transfer in from: |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
48206 |
Transfer in from: |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
48279 |
Transfer in from: |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
48362 |
Transfer in from: |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
48614 |
Transfer in from: |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
48676 |
Transfer in from: |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
76075 |
Transfer in from: |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
76077 |
Transfer in from: |
10D |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
76079 |
Transfer in from: |
10D |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
76080 |
Transfer in from: |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
76081 |
Transfer in from: |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
76084 |
Transfer in from: |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
48275 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
on |
15/07/1967 |
D2558 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/07/1967 |
44732 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/07/1967 |
D2088 |
Transfer in from: |
16C |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
22/07/1967 |
D7639 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
on |
22/07/1967 |
D2570 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
22/07/1967 |
76081 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/07/1967 |
D2376 |
Transfer in from: |
16C |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/07/1967 |
D2377 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/07/1967 |
D2378 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/07/1967 |
D2379 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
29/07/1967 |
45116 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
19/08/1967 |
D211 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/08/1967 |
44682 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/08/1967 |
44780 |
Transfer in from: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
19/08/1967 |
48261 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
26/08/1967 |
D2126 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
26/08/1967 |
D2560 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
26/08/1967 |
D2562 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
26/08/1967 |
D2566 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
on |
26/08/1967 |
D2561 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
on |
26/08/1967 |
D2568 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
on |
26/08/1967 |
D2569 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/09/1967 |
D7554 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/09/1967 |
D7555 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/09/1967 |
D7556 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/09/1967 |
D7557 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/09/1967 |
D7640 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/09/1967 |
D7642 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/09/1967 |
D7643 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
16/09/1967 |
D243 |
Transfer in from: |
56B |
Healey Mills |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
16/09/1967 |
D244 |
Transfer in from: |
56B |
Healey Mills |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
16/09/1967 |
D245 |
Transfer in from: |
56B |
Healey Mills |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
16/09/1967 |
D247 |
Transfer in from: |
56B |
Healey Mills |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
16/09/1967 |
D249 |
Transfer in from: |
56B |
Healey Mills |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
16/09/1967 |
D7641 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
16/09/1967 |
D7642 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
16/09/1967 |
D7642 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
16/09/1967 |
48675 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/09/1967 |
44679 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/09/1967 |
45198 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
10/1967 |
44985 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
12017 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
12021 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
D3184 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
D5273 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
D7549 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
D7552 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
D245 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
D247 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
D249 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
45321 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
76075 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D241 |
Transfer in from: |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D242 |
Transfer in from: |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D246 |
Transfer in from: |
56B |
Healey Mills |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D248 |
Transfer in from: |
56B |
Healey Mills |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D385 |
Transfer in from: |
56B |
Healey Mills |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D386 |
Transfer in from: |
56B |
Healey Mills |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D387 |
Transfer in from: |
56B |
Healey Mills |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D388 |
Transfer in from: |
56B |
Healey Mills |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D5198 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D5199 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D5200 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D5201 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D5259 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D5260 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D5261 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D5262 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D5263 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D5264 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D5265 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D7506 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D7609 |
Transfer in from: |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D7610 |
Transfer in from: |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D7633 |
Transfer in from: |
41C |
Wath |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D7634 |
Transfer in from: |
41C |
Wath |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D7635 |
Transfer in from: |
41C |
Wath |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D7636 |
Transfer in from: |
41C |
Wath |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D7637 |
Transfer in from: |
41C |
Wath |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
45267 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
48279 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/10/1967 |
D3366 |
Transfer in from: |
86A |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/10/1967 |
44776 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/10/1967 |
45425 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
21/10/1967 |
48676 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/10/1967 |
D3361 |
Transfer in from: |
87E |
Landore |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
on |
28/10/1967 |
12017 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
on |
28/10/1967 |
12021 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
28/10/1967 |
48125 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
28/10/1967 |
48724 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
11/1967 |
44682 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
11/1967 |
44819 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
11/1967 |
44831 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
11/1967 |
44873 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
11/1967 |
44920 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
11/1967 |
45048 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
11/1967 |
45281 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
11/1967 |
45331 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
11/1967 |
45449 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/11/1967 |
D389 |
Transfer in from: |
56B |
Healey Mills |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/11/1967 |
D241 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/11/1967 |
D242 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/11/1967 |
D248 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/11/1967 |
D7549 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/11/1967 |
D7554 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/11/1967 |
D7555 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/11/1967 |
D7556 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
on |
18/11/1967 |
12003 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
on |
18/11/1967 |
12013 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
on |
18/11/1967 |
12020 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/11/1967 |
44658 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
D255 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
D267 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
D268 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
D269 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
D310 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
D311 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
D312 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
D5293 |
Transfer in from: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
D7502 |
Transfer in from: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
D7560 |
Transfer in from: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
44678 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
D324 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
D325 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
D331 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
D332 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
D5202 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
D5203 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
D5204 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
D5205 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
D7546 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
D7547 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
D7548 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
45431 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
76077 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
76079 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
76080 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
76084 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
D289 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
D290 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
D316 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
D317 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
44683 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
44711 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
44761 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
44780 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
44842 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
44962 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
45268 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
45282 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
45296 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
45305 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
45310 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
45350 |
Transfer out to: |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
45395 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
48033 |
Transfer out to: |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
48117 |
Transfer out to: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
48132 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
48153 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
48167 |
Transfer out to: |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
48192 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
48193 |
Transfer out to: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
48206 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
48278 |
Transfer out to: |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
48319 |
Transfer out to: |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
48325 |
Transfer out to: |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
48338 |
Transfer out to: |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
48362 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
48410 |
Transfer out to: |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
48614 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
48678 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
48715 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
48752 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
48764 |
Transfer out to: |
9K |
Bolton |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
on |
09/12/1967 |
12004 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/12/1967 |
12038 |
Transfer in from: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
on |
16/12/1967 |
12032 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
on |
23/12/1967 |
12023 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
30/12/1967 |
D5206 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
30/12/1967 |
D5207 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
30/12/1967 |
D5273 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
30/12/1967 |
D5293 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
on |
30/12/1967 |
12031 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
D5151 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
D5152 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
D5153 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
D5154 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
D5155 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
D5156 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
D5248 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
D5249 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
D7551 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
D243 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
D244 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
D267 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
D268 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
D269 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
D289 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
D5204 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
D5205 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
03/02/1968 |
D5250 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D267 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D268 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D269 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D289 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D340 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D341 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D342 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D343 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D5263 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D5264 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D5265 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
12065 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D3089 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D5255 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D5256 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D5257 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D246 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D5198 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D5199 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D5200 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D5248 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D5249 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D5250 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D5259 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D5260 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D5261 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D5262 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D7546 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D7547 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D7548 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D7551 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D7552 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
on |
11/05/1968 |
D2376 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
on |
11/05/1968 |
D2377 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
on |
11/05/1968 |
D2379 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
12073 |
Transfer in from: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
12074 |
Transfer in from: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Diesel |
04 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
D2214 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
04 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
D2225 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
04 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
D2228 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
D2389 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
D2391 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
D5242 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
D5244 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
D5263 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
D5264 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
D5265 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
D7570 |
Transfer in from: |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
D7638 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
D5151 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
D5152 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
D5153 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
D5154 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
D5155 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
D5156 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
15/06/1968 |
D7632 |
Transfer in from: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
15/06/1968 |
D290 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D211 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D255 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D267 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D268 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D269 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D289 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D310 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D311 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D312 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D316 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D317 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D324 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D325 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D331 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D332 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D340 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D341 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D342 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D343 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D385 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D386 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D387 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D388 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D389 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5201 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5202 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5203 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5206 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5207 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5242 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5244 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5255 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5256 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5257 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5263 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5264 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5265 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7502 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7506 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7557 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7560 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7570 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7609 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7610 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7632 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7633 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7634 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7635 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7636 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7637 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7638 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7639 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7640 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7641 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7642 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7643 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
04 |
0-6-0 |
on |
13/07/1968 |
D2214 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
04 |
0-6-0 |
on |
13/07/1968 |
D2228 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
20/07/1968 |
D2389 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/12/1968 |
D2088 |
Transfer out to: |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
21/12/1968 |
12072 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
25/01/1969 |
12038 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/02/1969 |
D3177 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
15/03/1969 |
D2198 |
Transfer in from: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
31/03/1969 |
12100 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
04 |
0-6-0 |
on |
19/04/1969 |
D2225 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/05/1969 |
12065 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/05/1969 |
D3361 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
30/09/1969 |
12070 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
01/11/1969 |
D3192 |
Transfer in from: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/11/1969 |
12088 |
Transfer in from: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/01/1970 |
D3858 |
Transfer in from: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/01/1970 |
D3192 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/01/1970 |
D3366 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/03/1970 |
D2391 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/03/1970 |
D2199 |
Transfer in from: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/03/1970 |
D2198 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/03/1970 |
D2392 |
Transfer in from: |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/04/1970 |
D2372 |
Transfer in from: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/04/1970 |
D2372 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/05/1970 |
D2383 |
Transfer in from: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/08/1970 |
D2117 |
Transfer in from: |
98S |
|
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/09/1970 |
D2383 |
Transfer out to: |
16C |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/10/1970 |
D3006 |
Transfer in from: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
14/11/1970 |
12071 |
Transfer in from: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
14/11/1970 |
D3782 |
Transfer in from: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
14/11/1970 |
12088 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
14/11/1970 |
D3858 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
17/01/1971 |
12078 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
17/01/1971 |
12102 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
23/01/1971 |
12063 |
Transfer in from: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/02/1971 |
12098 |
Transfer in from: |
98W |
|
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
28/03/1971 |
12097 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
03/04/1971 |
D2378 |
Transfer out to: |
87A |
Landore |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/04/1971 |
12065 |
Transfer in from: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
08/05/1971 |
12077 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
10/05/1971 |
12065 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
on |
19/06/1971 |
D2392 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1971 |
D3538 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
D3104 |
Transfer in from: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
D3335 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
D3372 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
D3373 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
D3832 |
Transfer in from: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
D3858 |
Transfer in from: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
D3983 |
Transfer in from: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
D2199 |
Transfer out to: |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
09/10/1971 |
12071 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
09/10/1971 |
12077 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
on |
09/10/1971 |
D2117 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
on |
09/10/1971 |
D2126 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
06/11/1971 |
12073 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/11/1971 |
D3407 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
13/11/1971 |
12075 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
12/12/1971 |
12076 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/12/1971 |
D3354 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/12/1971 |
12074 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/12/1971 |
D3104 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
2w/e |
01/01/1972 |
D3104 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
2w/e |
01/01/1972 |
D3104 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1972 |
12063 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
08/01/1972 |
D3102 |
Transfer in from: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
08/01/1972 |
D3783 |
Transfer in from: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
15/01/1972 |
D3793 |
Transfer in from: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
26/02/1972 |
D3784 |
Transfer in from: |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/03/1972 |
D3006 |
Transfer out to: |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/05/1972 |
D3005 |
Transfer in from: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/05/1972 |
D3367 |
Transfer in from: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/05/1972 |
D3368 |
Transfer in from: |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/05/1972 |
D3369 |
Transfer in from: |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/05/1972 |
D3371 |
Transfer in from: |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/05/1972 |
D3374 |
Transfer in from: |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/05/1972 |
D3410 |
Transfer in from: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/05/1972 |
D3412 |
Transfer in from: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/05/1972 |
D3846 |
Transfer in from: |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/05/1972 |
D3912 |
Transfer in from: |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/05/1972 |
D4117 |
Transfer in from: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/05/1972 |
D4139 |
Transfer in from: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/05/1972 |
D3462 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
20/05/1972 |
D4139 |
Transfer out to: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/05/1972 |
D3083 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
08/07/1972 |
D3425 |
Transfer in from: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/07/1972 |
D3109 |
Transfer in from: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
2w/e |
05/08/1972 |
D3283 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
2w/e |
05/08/1972 |
D3343 |
Transfer in from: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
2w/e |
05/08/1972 |
D4000 |
Transfer in from: |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
2w/e |
05/08/1972 |
D4117 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/10/1972 |
D3832 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/01/1973 |
08072 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/01/1973 |
D3202 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/01/1973 |
D3740 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
24/02/1973 |
D3696 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
14/04/1973 |
D3793 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
D5194 |
Transfer in from: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
D5195 |
Transfer in from: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
D5253 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
D5260 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
D7626 |
Transfer in from: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
D7639 |
Transfer in from: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
D7646 |
Transfer in from: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
D7651 |
Transfer in from: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
D7659 |
Transfer in from: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/06/1973 |
08072 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/06/1973 |
D3740 |
Transfer out to: |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
30/06/1973 |
D3202 |
Transfer out to: |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
07/07/1973 |
D255 |
Transfer in from: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
07/07/1973 |
D5281 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
07/07/1973 |
D5282 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
07/07/1973 |
D5283 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
07/07/1973 |
D5284 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
07/07/1973 |
D5285 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
07/07/1973 |
D5286 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
07/07/1973 |
D7599 |
Transfer in from: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
07/07/1973 |
D7659 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/08/1973 |
D5198 |
Transfer in from: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/08/1973 |
D7542 |
Transfer in from: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/08/1973 |
D7543 |
Transfer in from: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/08/1973 |
D7544 |
Transfer in from: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
25/08/1973 |
D7583 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
25/08/1973 |
D7584 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
25/08/1973 |
D5281 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
25/08/1973 |
D5282 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/09/1973 |
D7582 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/09/1973 |
D7590 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/09/1973 |
D7597 |
Transfer in from: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/09/1973 |
D5283 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/09/1973 |
D5284 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
3w/e |
06/10/1973 |
D287 |
Transfer in from: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
3w/e |
06/10/1973 |
D288 |
Transfer in from: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
3w/e |
06/10/1973 |
D3109 |
Transfer out to: |
NH |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
06/10/1973 |
D7626 |
Transfer out to: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
20/10/1973 |
25284 |
Transfer in from: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
20/10/1973 |
D5285 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
10/11/1973 |
D291 |
Transfer in from: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
08/12/1973 |
D3283 |
Transfer out to: |
NH |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
09/12/1973 |
D3089 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
12/01/1974 |
D325 |
Transfer in from: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1974 |
40090 |
Transfer in from: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/03/1974 |
25136 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
23/03/1974 |
08925 |
Transfer in from: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/04/1974 |
08068 |
Transfer out to: |
NH |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/04/1974 |
D4120 |
Transfer in from: |
85A |
Worcester |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/04/1974 |
08111 |
Transfer out to: |
WS |
Worcester |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
25290 |
Transfer in from: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
25291 |
Transfer in from: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
25292 |
Transfer in from: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
25297 |
Transfer in from: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
40003 |
Transfer in from: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
40021 |
Transfer in from: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
40022 |
Transfer in from: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
40104 |
Transfer in from: |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
40175 |
Transfer in from: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
08002 |
Transfer out to: |
DR |
Doncaster |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
08298 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
18/05/1974 |
40180 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1974 |
08377 |
Transfer out to: |
BR |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1974 |
08679 |
Transfer out to: |
AN |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/07/1974 |
40138 |
Transfer in from: |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/07/1974 |
40139 |
Transfer in from: |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/07/1974 |
40140 |
Transfer in from: |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/07/1974 |
25194 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/07/1974 |
25290 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/07/1974 |
25291 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/07/1974 |
25292 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/07/1974 |
40104 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/07/1974 |
D4120 |
Transfer out to: |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
10/08/1974 |
25205 |
Transfer in from: |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
10/08/1974 |
25266 |
Transfer in from: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
10/08/1974 |
40137 |
Transfer in from: |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
07/09/1974 |
25190 |
Transfer in from: |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/09/1974 |
08617 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
07/09/1974 |
25249 |
Transfer out to: |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
25093 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
25094 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
25186 |
Transfer in from: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
40170 |
Transfer in from: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
40171 |
Transfer in from: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
40172 |
Transfer in from: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
40174 |
Transfer in from: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
40177 |
Transfer in from: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
25289 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
40003 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
40021 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
40125 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
40137 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
40138 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/11/1974 |
25289 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/11/1974 |
25308 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/11/1974 |
25190 |
Transfer out to: |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/11/1974 |
25240 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
07/12/1974 |
25036 |
Transfer in from: |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
07/12/1974 |
25278 |
Transfer in from: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/01/1975 |
08846 |
Transfer in from: |
86B |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/01/1975 |
25058 |
Transfer in from: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/01/1975 |
25197 |
Transfer in from: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/01/1975 |
25249 |
Transfer in from: |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/01/1975 |
40003 |
Transfer in from: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/01/1975 |
40021 |
Transfer in from: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/01/1975 |
40045 |
Transfer in from: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/01/1975 |
08117 |
Transfer out to: |
EJ |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/01/1975 |
25232 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/01/1975 |
25233 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/01/1975 |
25234 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/02/1975 |
25093 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/02/1975 |
25094 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
08/02/1975 |
40003 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
08/02/1975 |
40139 |
Transfer out to: |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
08/02/1975 |
40140 |
Transfer out to: |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/03/1975 |
25064 |
Transfer in from: |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/03/1975 |
25078 |
Transfer in from: |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/03/1975 |
25079 |
Transfer in from: |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
08/03/1975 |
25094 |
Transfer in from: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
12/04/1975 |
40131 |
Transfer in from: |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/04/1975 |
25192 |
Transfer out to: |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/04/1975 |
25193 |
Transfer out to: |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
10/05/1975 |
25094 |
Transfer out to: |
BR |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
10/05/1975 |
25197 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
10/05/1975 |
40021 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
10/05/1975 |
40045 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
10/05/1975 |
40055 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
12/07/1975 |
25186 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/08/1975 |
25205 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
23/08/1975 |
25045 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
25048 |
Transfer in from: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
25060 |
Transfer in from: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
25048 |
Transfer out to: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
25249 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
25266 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
08/11/1975 |
25302 |
Transfer in from: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
4w/e |
08/11/1975 |
40131 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
3w/e |
20/12/1975 |
08303 |
Transfer out to: |
DY |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
10/01/1976 |
25266 |
Transfer in from: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
2w/e |
10/01/1976 |
40055 |
Transfer in from: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
2w/e |
10/01/1976 |
40131 |
Transfer in from: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
2w/e |
10/01/1976 |
40181 |
Transfer in from: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/01/1976 |
08077 |
Transfer out to: |
DR |
Doncaster |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
01/02/1976 |
40036 |
Transfer in from: |
HM |
Healey Mills |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
01/02/1976 |
40046 |
Transfer in from: |
55C |
Healey Mills |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
28/02/1976 |
25137 |
Transfer in from: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
25112 |
Transfer in from: |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
25114 |
Transfer in from: |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
25115 |
Transfer in from: |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
25192 |
Transfer in from: |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
25248 |
Transfer in from: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
40093 |
Transfer in from: |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
40140 |
Transfer in from: |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
40141 |
Transfer in from: |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
25078 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
25079 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
25266 |
Transfer out to: |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
25278 |
Transfer out to: |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
25308 |
Transfer out to: |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
40036 |
Transfer out to: |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
40046 |
Transfer out to: |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
40087 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
40088 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
12/06/1976 |
25031 |
Transfer in from: |
ED |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
03/07/1976 |
25064 |
Transfer out to: |
IS |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
10/07/1976 |
25169 |
Transfer in from: |
LA |
Laira |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
2w/e |
10/07/1976 |
40175 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
07/08/1976 |
25046 |
Transfer in from: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
07/08/1976 |
25047 |
Transfer in from: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
07/08/1976 |
25169 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
25/09/1976 |
25287 |
Reinstated |
98W |
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
10/1976 |
08126 |
Transfer in from: |
LJ |
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
10/1976 |
25070 |
Transfer in from: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
10/1976 |
08534 |
Transfer out to: |
AN |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
10/1976 |
25044 |
Transfer out to: |
ED |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/12/1976 |
25172 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/12/1976 |
25301 |
Transfer out to: |
ED |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
m/e |
01/1977 |
40134 |
Transfer in from: |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
m/e |
01/1977 |
40179 |
Transfer in from: |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
03/1977 |
25302 |
Transfer out to: |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
04/1977 |
25147 |
Transfer in from: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
04/1977 |
25192 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
m/e |
04/1977 |
40179 |
Transfer out to: |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/05/1977 |
25046 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
m/e |
07/1977 |
40191 |
Transfer in from: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
07/1977 |
25147 |
Transfer out to: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
07/1977 |
25289 |
Transfer out to: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
m/e |
10/1977 |
40191 |
Transfer in from: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
10/1977 |
25031 |
Transfer out to: |
ED |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
10/1977 |
25112 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
10/1977 |
25114 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
10/1977 |
25115 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
m/e |
10/1977 |
40191 |
Transfer out to: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
20/11/1977 |
25137 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
02/1978 |
25313 |
Transfer in from: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
26/02/1978 |
25213 |
Transfer in from: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
2w/e |
12/03/1978 |
40020 |
Transfer in from: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
07/09/1980 |
25047 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
07/09/1980 |
25103 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
02/11/1980 |
08126 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
02/11/1980 |
25070 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
02/11/1980 |
25110 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
14/12/1980 |
25083 |
Transfer in from: |
IS |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
14/12/1980 |
25086 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/02/1981 |
25172 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
31/05/1981 |
40134 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
28/06/1981 |
08472 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
29/06/1981 |
08302 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
07/1981 |
25323 |
Transfer in from: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
19/07/1981 |
08299 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
16/08/1981 |
08129 |
Transfer in from: |
NH |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
16/08/1981 |
08340 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
09/1981 |
25219 |
Transfer in from: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
09/1981 |
25268 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
m/e |
09/1981 |
40063 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
m/e |
09/1981 |
40157 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
m/e |
09/1981 |
40160 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
m/e |
09/1981 |
40164 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
m/e |
09/1981 |
40194 |
Transfer in from: |
TE |
Thornaby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
13/12/1981 |
40171 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
31/12/1981 |
08265 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
31/12/1981 |
08301 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
07/03/1982 |
40140 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
04/07/1982 |
08342 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
29/08/1982 |
40020 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
14/11/1982 |
40055 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
28/11/1982 |
25248 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
19/12/1982 |
08130 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
19/12/1982 |
08273 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
19/12/1982 |
25036 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
03/04/1983 |
25219 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
09/05/1983 |
08355 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
01/06/1983 |
40180 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
04/07/1983 |
40164 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
17/07/1983 |
08129 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
24/07/1983 |
25247 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
26/07/1983 |
40157 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
12/09/1983 |
40172 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
16/09/1983 |
40191 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
03/10/1983 |
40131 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
09/10/1983 |
25086 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
09/10/1983 |
40141 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
08/11/1983 |
40090 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
02/12/1983 |
40093 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
02/12/1983 |
40170 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
09/03/1984 |
40022 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
16/04/1984 |
40063 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
24/05/1984 |
40174 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/07/1984 |
25083 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
09/07/1984 |
40177 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
02/09/1984 |
40091 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
26/11/1984 |
40160 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
21/01/1985 |
25284 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
21/01/1985 |
40181 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
23/01/1985 |
40194 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/05/1985 |
08284 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
19/05/1985 |
08304 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
02/12/1985 |
25287 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
09/12/1985 |
25060 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
20/02/1986 |
25048 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/09/1986 |
25907 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/10/1986 |
25906 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
03/02/1987 |
25058 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
06/02/1987 |
08337 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/03/1987 |
25902 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/03/1987 |
25313 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
19/03/1987 |
25213 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
19/03/1987 |
25323 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/05/1988 |
08468 |
Reinstated |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
16/08/1988 |
08297 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
04/09/1988 |
08534 |
Transfer in from: |
AN |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
23/11/1988 |
08468 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
24/11/1988 |
08423 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
13/10/1989 |
08846 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
31/03/1992 |
08744 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/12/1993 |
08615 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/04/1996 |
08815 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
31/08/2005 |
08534 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|