Depot: St Margarets
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 20/02/1925 | 4704 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1925 | 4692 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 12/1925 | 4702 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 12/1925 | 4703 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 1927 | 4704 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 16/02/1927 | 4419 | Transfer in from: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 01/03/1927 | 4419 | Transfer out to: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 31/07/1927 | 4694 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 30/08/1927 | 4695 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 27/11/1927 | 4696 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 1928 | 4692 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/06/1929 | 2735 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/06/1929 | 2736 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/06/1929 | 2737 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/01/1932 | 4689 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/01/1932 | 4686 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1935 | 2739 | Transfer in from: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 12/1935 | 9478 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 08/02/1938 | 2752 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/03/1938 | 2752 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/03/1938 | 2502 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/03/1938 | 1804 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/07/1938 | 2563 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 22/07/1938 | 4803 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/08/1938 | 4674 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 03/11/1938 | 4803 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/11/1938 | 2567 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 01/1939 | 4682 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/01/1939 | 4701 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/01/1939 | 4704 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 03/02/1939 | 4815 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 03/03/1939 | 4819 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/03/1939 | 2556 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/03/1939 | 2502 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/03/1939 | 2735 | Transfer out to: | TWD | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/03/1939 | 2736 | Transfer out to: | TWD | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 11/1939 | 4807 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 11/1939 | 4853 | Transfer in from: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/01/1940 | 2795 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/01/1940 | 2563 | Transfer out to: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 20/01/1940 | 4865 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 02/1940 | 4684 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/02/1940 | 2566 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/02/1940 | 2797 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/02/1940 | 2556 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/02/1940 | 2567 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 03/1940 | 4787 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/03/1940 | 4701 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/07/1940 | 4704 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 08/1940 | 2739 | Transfer out to: | POL | Polmont | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/10/1940 | 2797 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/10/1940 | 2795 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 26/11/1940 | 2566 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/03/1941 | 3085 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/04/1941 | 3088 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 05/1941 | 4787 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 05/1941 | 4807 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 05/1941 | 4815 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 05/1941 | 4819 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 05/1941 | 4853 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 05/1941 | 4865 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/05/1941 | 3092 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/07/1941 | 3096 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 09/1942 | 4684 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/09/1942 | 4682 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/09/1942 | 1804 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 10/1942 | 4686 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 10/1942 | 4694 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 10/1942 | 4695 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 10/1942 | 4696 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/10/1942 | 4702 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 15/10/1942 | 3670 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 23/10/1942 | 4805 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/11/1942 | 4787 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 12/1942 | 4807 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/12/1942 | 4695 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/12/1942 | 4674 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/04/1943 | 2731 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/04/1943 | 2732 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/04/1943 | 2733 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 17/04/1943 | 3670 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 17/04/1943 | 4787 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 17/04/1943 | 4805 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 17/04/1943 | 4807 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 24/04/1943 | 4689 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 24/04/1943 | 4695 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 24/04/1943 | 4703 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/11/1943 | 3088 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/11/1943 | 2788 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/05/1944 | 3092 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 02/1945 | 8545 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/03/1945 | 2731 | Transfer out to: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/08/1945 | 2732 | Transfer out to: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/08/1945 | 2733 | Transfer out to: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/08/1945 | 2737 | Transfer out to: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/08/1945 | 3085 | Transfer out to: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/08/1945 | 3096 | Transfer out to: | HAW | Hawick | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 13/10/1945 | 4795 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 13/10/1945 | 4796 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 13/10/1945 | 4798 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/07/1946 | 3445 | Transfer in from: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/07/1946 | 3445 | Transfer out to: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 30/09/1946 | 3445 | Transfer in from: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 29/10/1946 | 3445 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K5 | 2-6-0 | on | 15/01/1947 | 1863 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 27/01/1947 | 824 | Transfer out to: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 27/01/1947 | 825 | Transfer out to: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 27/01/1947 | 827 | Transfer out to: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/02/1947 | 4986 | Transfer in from: | HAW | Hawick | ||
Steam | K5 | 2-6-0 | on | 28/02/1947 | 1863 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/04/1947 | 4986 | Transfer out to: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/04/1947 | 4822 | Transfer out to: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1823 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1855 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1857 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1876 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1879 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1885 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1900 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1909 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1911 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1916 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1924 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1931 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1933 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1955 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1968 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1983 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1988 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1990 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1991 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1992 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D29 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2405 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2420 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2421 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2424 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2435 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D32 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2451 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2471 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2483 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2484 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2487 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2488 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2490 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2494 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2495 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2702 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2715 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4462 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4479 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4486 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4489 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4492 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4515 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4517 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4518 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4519 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4524 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4527 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4532 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4533 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4535 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4538 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4543 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4547 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4552 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4557 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4562 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4565 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4566 | Snapshot | TWD | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4572 | Snapshot | TWD | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4576 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4577 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4582 | Snapshot | TWD | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4586 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4592 | Snapshot | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4592 | Snapshot | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4594 | Snapshot | TWD | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4595 | Snapshot | TWD | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4599 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4603 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4605 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4606 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4607 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4608 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4614 | Snapshot | TWD | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4624 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4625 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4636 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4637 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5217 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5224 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5251 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5258 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5267 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5286 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5288 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5292 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5305 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5310 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5311 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5316 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5334 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5617 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5906 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5912 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5914 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5915 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5918 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5919 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5920 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5927 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5929 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D29 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 62400 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D29 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 62402 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D29 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 62404 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D32 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 62443 | Snapshot | TWD | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | D32 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 62444 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D32 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 62445 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D32 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 62450 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D32 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 62453 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D32 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 62454 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 65623 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 65625 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 68096 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F7 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7093 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F7 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7094 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7492 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7493 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7494 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7495 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7496 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7497 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7605 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7606 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7607 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7608 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7609 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7617 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7624 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7629 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7630 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7649 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7659 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7666 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7670 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8092 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8093 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8095 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8097 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8098 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8099 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8102 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8105 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8111 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8115 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8119 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8122 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8320 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8325 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8334 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8338 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8340 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8348 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8350 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8448 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8449 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8450 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8454 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8463 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8464 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8470 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8472 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8474 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8477 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8492 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8505 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8511 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8525 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8545 | Snapshot | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8562 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8568 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8623 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8952 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9130 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9133 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9134 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9140 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9144 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9146 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9147 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9148 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9149 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9152 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9167 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9168 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9172 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9173 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9175 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9186 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9187 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9219 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 5217 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 5217 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 4592 | Transfer out to: | POL | Polmont | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 5217 | Transfer out to: | KPS | Kipps | ||
Steam | D32 | 4-4-0 | on | 26/02/1948 | 62450 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D32 | 4-4-0 | on | 02/03/1948 | 62443 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/03/1948 | 4946 | Transfer in from: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/03/1948 | 4963 | Transfer in from: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/03/1948 | 4986 | Transfer in from: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 2712 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 2721 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 4946 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 4963 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 4986 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 4946 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 4963 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 4986 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | D29 | 4-4-0 | on | 20/04/1948 | 62400 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/05/1948 | 65625 | Transfer out to: | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | N4 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 5603 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 8342 | Transfer in from: | STG | Stirling | ||
Steam | D32 | 4-4-0 | on | 29/05/1948 | 62453 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/08/1948 | 1176 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/08/1948 | 61322 | Transfer in from: | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/08/1948 | 61336 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/08/1948 | 61337 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | D32 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 09/1948 | 62454 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D32 | 4-4-0 | on | 02/09/1948 | 62444 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 1176 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 61322 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 61336 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 61337 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 1176 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 61322 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 61336 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 61337 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/10/1948 | 1176 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/10/1948 | 61322 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/10/1948 | 61337 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/11/1948 | 61336 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | F7 | 2-4-2T | on | 08/11/1948 | 7093 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | F7 | 2-4-2T | on | 08/11/1948 | 7094 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/12/1948 | 77016 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/12/1948 | 77342 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | G4 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 22/01/1949 | 8122 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 13/02/1949 | 60959 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 19/02/1949 | 60959 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1949 | 61878 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1949 | 61881 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1949 | 61897 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1949 | 61928 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 19/02/1949 | 60959 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 19/02/1949 | 7493 | Transfer out to: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 06/03/1949 | 60959 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 67668 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | w/e | 26/03/1949 | 62711 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | D29 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 06/1949 | 62402 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D29 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 08/1949 | 62404 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/09/1949 | 61354 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/09/1949 | 61355 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 25/09/1949 | 60836 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 25/09/1949 | 60953 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/09/1949 | 61067 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/09/1949 | 61356 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 60836 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 60953 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 61067 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 64506 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 64512 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 64523 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 69141 | Transfer in from: | KPS | Kipps | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 60836 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 60953 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 61067 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | D29 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 62405 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/10/1949 | 61357 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/10/1949 | 61358 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/10/1949 | 61359 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/11/1949 | 61242 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 61242 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 61242 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 20/11/1949 | 60825 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/11/1949 | 61341 | Transfer in from: | PKD | Parkhead | ||
Steam | N19 | 0-6-2ST | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 3115 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 60825 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 61341 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 63172 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 90291 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 60825 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 61341 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | D32 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 12/1949 | 62445 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/12/1949 | 61277 | Transfer in from: | KEI | Keith | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 61277 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 61277 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/12/1949 | 60848 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/12/1949 | 60894 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 60848 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 60894 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 60848 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 60894 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/12/1949 | 64794 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 64794 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 90291 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 64794 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 90291 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 08/01/1950 | 60980 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/01/1950 | 47162 | Transfer in from: | 28B | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 14/01/1950 | 60980 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 14/01/1950 | 60980 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/02/1950 | 61002 | Transfer in from: | PTH | Perth (LNER) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/02/1950 | 61061 | Transfer in from: | PTH | Perth (LNER) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 45036 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 45085 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 61002 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 61061 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 61002 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 61061 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 09/04/1950 | 8568 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | 3w/e | 22/04/1950 | 68469 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 05/1950 | 46460 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 06/1950 | 46461 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 06/1950 | 46462 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | on | 28/08/1950 | 62420 | Transfer out to: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/10/1950 | 69563 | Transfer in from: | KPS | Kipps | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 69563 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 69563 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 90049 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 90071 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 90306 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 90569 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 45036 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 45085 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 69563 | Transfer out to: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90049 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90071 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90306 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90569 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90049 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90071 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90306 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90569 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 46464 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 46464 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 46464 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/01/1951 | 60836 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/01/1951 | 60894 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/01/1951 | 60980 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 45036 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 45117 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 45484 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 8562 | Transfer out to: | 68B | Dumfries | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 45036 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 45117 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 45484 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 45036 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 45117 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 45484 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 46464 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 61354 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 62435 | Transfer out to: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/02/1951 | 65292 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 68119 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 8122 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 25/02/1951 | 60813 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 25/02/1951 | 60823 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 25/02/1951 | 60892 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 25/02/1951 | 60922 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 04/03/1951 | 60836 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/03/1951 | 61067 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/03/1951 | 61277 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/03/1951 | 60882 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/03/1951 | 60894 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/03/1951 | 60980 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/03/1951 | 61002 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 65327 | Transfer in from: | BGT | Bathgate | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 68119 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 8122 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 45036 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 45117 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 45484 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 64512 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 68525 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 90071 | Transfer out to: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 90114 | Transfer out to: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | D32 | 4-4-0 | on | 29/03/1951 | 62451 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 60813 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 60823 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 60836 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 60882 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 60892 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 60894 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 60922 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 60980 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 65327 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 68119 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 60813 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 60823 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 60836 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 60882 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 60892 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 60894 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 60922 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 60980 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 65327 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 68119 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 65316 | Transfer out to: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 15/04/1951 | 60873 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/04/1951 | 61242 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/04/1951 | 61356 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 21/04/1951 | 60873 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 21/04/1951 | 60873 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 22/04/1951 | 60821 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 28/04/1951 | 60821 | Transfer out to: | 91X | To Scottish Region | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 60821 | Transfer in from: | 91X | To Scottish Region | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 64547 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 65311 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 5w/e | 19/05/1951 | 8098 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 03/06/1951 | 60814 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 05/06/1951 | 60814 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 05/06/1951 | 60814 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 60814 | Transfer out to: | 91X | To Scottish Region | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 68552 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 8098 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 90493 | Transfer out to: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 61916 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 68623 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 90248 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 90291 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 90306 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/09/1951 | 61061 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 65329 | Transfer in from: | 64D | Carstairs | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 09/09/1951 | 44820 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 09/09/1951 | 45180 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 09/09/1951 | 45318 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 09/09/1951 | 45334 | Transfer in from: | 28A | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 09/09/1951 | 45436 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 09/09/1951 | 65329 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 09/09/1951 | 65329 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/09/1951 | 61354 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/09/1951 | 61356 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45036 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45117 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 61354 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 61356 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 61354 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 61356 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1951 | 45180 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1951 | 45318 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1951 | 45436 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1951 | 45180 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1951 | 45318 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1951 | 45436 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 04/11/1951 | 67497 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 64613 | Transfer in from: | POL | Polmont | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 64636 | Transfer out to: | 64E | Polmont | ||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 67496 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 68511 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 67497 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 69185 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/12/1951 | 65617 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 46460 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 68952 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 03/02/1952 | 69014 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/02/1952 | 65286 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/02/1952 | 68552 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/02/1952 | 90569 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 69014 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 90545 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 69014 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/03/1952 | 61397 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 62718 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 68099 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 68105 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 62702 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 68099 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 68105 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/03/1952 | 61398 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 19/04/1952 | 62718 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 68095 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/04/1952 | 45117 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/04/1952 | 45334 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 19/04/1952 | 62718 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 68095 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 45036 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 68533 | Transfer in from: | 68B | Dumfries | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 69222 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 68505 | Transfer out to: | 68B | Dumfries | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 90498 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 90547 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 90560 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 90727 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 19/10/1952 | 60840 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 45487 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 60840 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 64547 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 64590 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 64597 | Transfer in from: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 65311 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 60840 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 68533 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 30/11/1952 | 60933 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 30/11/1952 | 60965 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 45486 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 25/01/1953 | 60818 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 25/01/1953 | 60900 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 25/01/1953 | 60821 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | on | 27/02/1953 | 68092 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | on | 04/03/1953 | 68111 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 21/03/1953 | 44994 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/05/1953 | 64794 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 64601 | Transfer in from: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/05/1953 | 61354 | Transfer out to: | SR | To Southern Region | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/06/1953 | 61354 | Transfer in from: | SR | To Southern Region | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1953 | 44994 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/09/1953 | 45018 | Transfer in from: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/09/1953 | 45043 | Transfer in from: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 8w/e | 05/09/1953 | 68103 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 05/09/1953 | 62484 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/09/1953 | 61029 | Transfer in from: | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/09/1953 | 61099 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/09/1953 | 61108 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/09/1953 | 61184 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/09/1953 | 61191 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/09/1953 | 61246 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/09/1953 | 61330 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/09/1953 | 61332 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/09/1953 | 61333 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/09/1953 | 61407 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/09/1953 | 90498 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/09/1953 | 90545 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 90464 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 45018 | Transfer out to: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 45043 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 45180 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 45318 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 45436 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 67494 | Transfer out to: | 64E | Polmont | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 42717 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 42865 | Transfer in from: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 42901 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 68098 | Transfer out to: | 64E | Polmont | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 65242 | Transfer in from: | HAW | Hawick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/01/1954 | 64794 | Transfer in from: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/01/1954 | 61333 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 20/02/1954 | 68103 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 42717 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 42865 | Transfer out to: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 42901 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | on | 07/05/1954 | 68096 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/05/1954 | 64517 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/05/1954 | 64527 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1954 | 44820 | Transfer out to: | 63D | Fort William | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1954 | 45487 | Transfer out to: | 63D | Fort William | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1954 | 90049 | Transfer out to: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1954 | 90464 | Transfer out to: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/09/1954 | 61355 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/10/1954 | 45486 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/11/1954 | 61398 | Transfer out to: | 64D | Carstairs | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1954 | 65916 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1954 | 65922 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1954 | 65934 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1954 | 46461 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1954 | 90560 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1954 | 90727 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/12/1954 | 61330 | Transfer out to: | 64D | Carstairs | ||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 25/12/1954 | 68334 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1954 | 90547 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 46461 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 67495 | Transfer out to: | 64E | Polmont | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/02/1955 | 61357 | Transfer out to: | 64D | Carstairs | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 68118 | Transfer in from: | 65G | Yoker | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/03/1955 | 61357 | Transfer in from: | 64D | Carstairs | ||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | 8w/e | 16/04/1955 | 56035 | Transfer in from: | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | 8w/e | 16/04/1955 | 67495 | Transfer in from: | 64E | Polmont | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | w/e | 25/04/1955 | 68105 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/05/1955 | 69173 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | 8w/e | 09/07/1955 | 67495 | Transfer out to: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | on | 01/08/1955 | 68122 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 06/08/1955 | 68108 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/08/1955 | 69172 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/08/1955 | 69173 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/08/1955 | 69172 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 02/09/1955 | 62437 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 02/09/1955 | 67489 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Diesel | D2/1 | 0-4-0 | on | 19/09/1955 | 11704 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D2/1 | 0-4-0 | on | 29/09/1955 | 11705 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 01/10/1955 | 67489 | Transfer out to: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 01/10/1955 | 68108 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | on | 28/10/1955 | 78048 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 11/1955 | 78049 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/11/1955 | 65267 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Diesel | D2/1 | 0-4-0 | on | 29/12/1955 | 11706 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/01/1956 | 65242 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 21/01/1956 | 68118 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/01/1956 | 61246 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/01/1956 | 61407 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Diesel | D2/1 | 0-4-0 | on | 02/02/1956 | 11707 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/02/1956 | 61398 | Transfer in from: | 64D | Carstairs | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 67630 | Transfer out to: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 68102 | Transfer out to: | 64E | Polmont | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/02/1956 | 61330 | Transfer in from: | 64D | Carstairs | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/05/1956 | 67630 | Transfer in from: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 12/05/1956 | 68102 | Transfer in from: | 64E | Polmont | ||
Diesel | D2/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 12/05/1956 | 11707 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/05/1956 | 67606 | Transfer out to: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/06/1956 | 65338 | Transfer in from: | POL | Polmont | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/06/1956 | 65311 | Transfer out to: | 64E | Polmont | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/06/1956 | 68492 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 09/09/1956 | 60883 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 09/09/1956 | 60957 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 09/09/1956 | 60848 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 09/09/1956 | 60922 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 05/10/1956 | 68469 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | on | 13/11/1956 | 68099 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 61857 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 61897 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/05/1957 | 61330 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/05/1957 | 61358 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/05/1957 | 64543 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/05/1957 | 64597 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/05/1957 | 65251 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/06/1957 | 45245 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | on | 04/07/1957 | 68115 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/07/1957 | 40159 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/07/1957 | 40186 | Transfer in from: | 31E | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/07/1957 | 45245 | Transfer out to: | 64D | Carstairs | ||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 06/07/1957 | 56035 | Transfer out to: | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/07/1957 | 61333 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/07/1957 | 61307 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | on | 05/08/1957 | 62424 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/08/1957 | 61308 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/08/1957 | 61351 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/08/1957 | 61349 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 8w/e | 31/08/1957 | 68118 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/10/1957 | 61333 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/10/1957 | 65338 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/10/1957 | 60816 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/10/1957 | 60927 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/10/1957 | 60951 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/10/1957 | 60959 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 11/11/1957 | 11719 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 05/12/1957 | 68450 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 20/12/1957 | 69167 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/12/1957 | 69013 | Transfer in from: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 27/12/1957 | 69130 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | on | 08/01/1958 | 68093 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/01/1958 | 45155 | Transfer in from: | 31A | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Diesel | D2/1 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 15/02/1958 | 11704 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 15/02/1958 | 62483 | Transfer out to: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 15/02/1958 | 62490 | Transfer out to: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 15/02/1958 | 62712 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/02/1958 | 61246 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | on | 28/02/1958 | 68340 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 10/03/1958 | 68464 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 62490 | Transfer in from: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 40159 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 40186 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 45155 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 62494 | Transfer out to: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 68470 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 18/04/1958 | 68474 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 21/04/1958 | 60816 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 21/04/1958 | 60927 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 21/04/1958 | 60951 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 21/04/1958 | 60959 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 68466 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 68470 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 69150 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 06/06/1958 | 69147 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 06/06/1958 | 69148 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 13/06/1958 | 69140 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 24/06/1958 | D2720 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 27/06/1958 | D2721 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 30/06/1958 | D2723 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 07/1958 | 62437 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 04/07/1958 | D2722 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/07/1958 | 69135 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/07/1958 | 69154 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 11/07/1958 | D2724 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 17/07/1958 | D2725 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 30/07/1958 | D2726 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 02/08/1958 | 67605 | Transfer out to: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 02/08/1958 | 67607 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 02/08/1958 | 67608 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 02/08/1958 | 67609 | Transfer out to: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 08/08/1958 | D2727 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/08/1958 | 64794 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/08/1958 | 64946 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/08/1958 | 64963 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/08/1958 | 64986 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | on | 14/08/1958 | 68348 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 18/08/1958 | 62721 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 20/08/1958 | D2728 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 17/09/1958 | D2729 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/09/1958 | 64486 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 17/09/1958 | 68449 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 18/09/1958 | D2731 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 19/09/1958 | D2730 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/09/1958 | 64536 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/09/1958 | 64574 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/09/1958 | 64591 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/09/1958 | 64612 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/09/1958 | 78052 | Transfer in from: | 60C | Helmsdale | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 03/10/1958 | D2732 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 07/10/1958 | 69175 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 13/10/1958 | 60931 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 13/10/1958 | 60937 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 13/10/1958 | 60971 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | on | 14/10/1958 | 68097 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 20/10/1958 | 60958 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 20/10/1958 | 60969 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | on | 24/10/1958 | 68118 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 13/11/1958 | 69172 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/11/1958 | 78052 | Transfer out to: | 60B | Aviemore | ||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 24/11/1958 | 68463 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | on | 23/12/1958 | 68102 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 23/12/1958 | 68466 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 30/12/1958 | 69152 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/01/1959 | 64574 | Transfer out to: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/01/1959 | D3728 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/01/1959 | D3729 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/01/1959 | D3730 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/02/1959 | D3731 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/02/1959 | 64492 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/02/1959 | 67629 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/02/1959 | 67630 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | on | 19/02/1959 | 62490 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/02/1959 | D3732 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/03/1959 | 64795 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/03/1959 | 64975 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/03/1959 | 64482 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/03/1959 | 64483 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/03/1959 | 65305 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/03/1959 | 65310 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/04/1959 | D3733 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1959 | D2724 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 11/04/1959 | 68352 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/04/1959 | D3734 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/04/1959 | D3735 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/05/1959 | 61991 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 09/05/1959 | 68325 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/05/1959 | 64536 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 22/05/1959 | 69222 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/06/1959 | D3735 | Transfer out to: | 60E | Forres | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/06/1959 | 61879 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 29/06/1959 | 62715 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/07/1959 | D3740 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/07/1959 | 67606 | Transfer in from: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/07/1959 | 78049 | Transfer out to: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/07/1959 | 61855 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 07/07/1959 | 69146 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 10/07/1959 | 61983 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 24/07/1959 | 61931 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 27/07/1959 | 69185 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 31/07/1959 | 69186 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/08/1959 | 67668 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/08/1959 | 61878 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/08/1959 | D3558 | Transfer in from: | 64E | Polmont | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/08/1959 | D3742 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 29/08/1959 | 68453 | Transfer in from: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | on | 10/09/1959 | 62487 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 17/09/1959 | 61876 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | on | 09/10/1959 | 67497 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1959 | 64523 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 03/11/1959 | 61885 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 10/11/1959 | 60816 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 10/11/1959 | 60819 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 10/11/1959 | 60824 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 10/11/1959 | 60827 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 10/11/1959 | 60920 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 10/11/1959 | 819 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/11/1959 | 61988 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 18/11/1959 | 69154 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/11/1959 | 64463 | Transfer in from: | HAW | Hawick | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/11/1959 | 64539 | Transfer in from: | HAW | Hawick | ||
Steam | Std 6P | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 21/11/1959 | 72003 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | Std 6P | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 21/11/1959 | 72004 | Transfer in from: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 21/11/1959 | 62488 | Transfer out to: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 30/11/1959 | 61911 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/12/1959 | 64506 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/12/1959 | 64538 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 08/12/1959 | 69187 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0T | on | 09/12/1959 | 47162 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Std 6P | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 19/12/1959 | 72000 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 29/12/1959 | 61823 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/01/1960 | 46461 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 29/01/1960 | D2745 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/02/1960 | 61928 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 05/02/1960 | 69168 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 13/02/1960 | 62689 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 13/02/1960 | 62693 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 15/02/1960 | D2746 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 15/02/1960 | D2747 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 19/02/1960 | D2748 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 25/02/1960 | 69144 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 26/02/1960 | D2749 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 29/02/1960 | D2750 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | on | 02/03/1960 | 67492 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/03/1960 | 61900 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 15/03/1960 | D2751 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 22/03/1960 | 69149 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | on | 24/03/1960 | 62471 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/04/1960 | 61909 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 09/04/1960 | 62729 | Transfer in from: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | Std 6P | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 09/04/1960 | 72000 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | Std 6P | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 09/04/1960 | 72003 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | Std 6P | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 09/04/1960 | 72004 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/04/1960 | 60927 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/04/1960 | 60951 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/04/1960 | 60959 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/04/1960 | D3877 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 21/04/1960 | 61881 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/04/1960 | D3878 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/04/1960 | D3879 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/04/1960 | D3880 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 02/05/1960 | D2745 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/05/1960 | D3881 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/05/1960 | D3882 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/05/1960 | 46461 | Transfer in from: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/05/1960 | 62716 | Transfer in from: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/05/1960 | 62733 | Transfer in from: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/05/1960 | 60823 | Transfer out to: | PTH | Perth (LNER) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/05/1960 | D3883 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/05/1960 | D3884 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/05/1960 | 61308 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/05/1960 | D3885 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/05/1960 | D3886 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 27/05/1960 | 61955 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/05/1960 | 61294 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/05/1960 | D3887 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/06/1960 | D3736 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/06/1960 | D3741 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/06/1960 | D3877 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/06/1960 | 61992 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/06/1960 | 64483 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 06/06/1960 | 68320 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/06/1960 | D3888 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1960 | D3889 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/06/1960 | D3890 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | on | 25/06/1960 | 62421 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/06/1960 | D3891 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/07/1960 | D3892 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | 62689 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | 62693 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/07/1960 | 60818 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/07/1960 | 60836 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/07/1960 | 60931 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/07/1960 | 60933 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/07/1960 | 60041 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/07/1960 | 60087 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/07/1960 | 60507 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/07/1960 | 60510 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 30/07/1960 | D2724 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 30/07/1960 | D5330 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 30/07/1960 | D5331 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 30/07/1960 | D5334 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/07/1960 | 78048 | Transfer out to: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 03/08/1960 | 69133 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/08/1960 | D3893 | Transfer in from: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/08/1960 | 64975 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 02/09/1960 | 69141 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/09/1960 | 64463 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 21/09/1960 | 67624 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/09/1960 | 65344 | Transfer in from: | BGT | Bathgate | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 13/10/1960 | 61990 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 17/11/1960 | 60818 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 17/11/1960 | 60836 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 17/11/1960 | 60931 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 17/11/1960 | 60933 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 21/11/1960 | 60510 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/11/1960 | 60087 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/12/1960 | 64462 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/12/1960 | 60507 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/12/1960 | 67660 | Transfer in from: | KPS | Kipps | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/12/1960 | 67665 | Transfer in from: | KPS | Kipps | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/12/1960 | 67669 | Transfer in from: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/12/1960 | 67674 | Transfer in from: | PKD | Parkhead | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/12/1960 | 60089 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/12/1960 | 60090 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 20/12/1960 | 61924 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 12/01/1961 | 69173 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/01/1961 | D3893 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/01/1961 | D3893 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/01/1961 | 67617 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/01/1961 | 67660 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/01/1961 | 67665 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/01/1961 | 67669 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/02/1961 | 67617 | Transfer in from: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/02/1961 | 62733 | Transfer out to: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/02/1961 | 67674 | Transfer out to: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/03/1961 | 64524 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 02/03/1961 | 69134 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 69013 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 08/04/1961 | 56313 | Transfer in from: | 28B | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/04/1961 | 64561 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | on | 10/04/1961 | 62495 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 24/04/1961 | 62718 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 28/04/1961 | 62716 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 30/04/1961 | D2745 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/05/1961 | 62711 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/05/1961 | 62729 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/05/1961 | 67665 | Transfer in from: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/05/1961 | 67668 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/05/1961 | 67669 | Transfer in from: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/05/1961 | 65906 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/05/1961 | 65916 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/06/1961 | D3732 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/06/1961 | D3733 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/06/1961 | 64482 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/06/1961 | 61308 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/06/1961 | 61345 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/06/1961 | 64489 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 23/06/1961 | 67665 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 69128 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 69138 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 69224 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 29/07/1961 | 56313 | Transfer out to: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 10/08/1961 | 67670 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/08/1961 | 64946 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 04/09/1961 | D2751 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/09/1961 | 64539 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | on | 15/09/1961 | 68338 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/09/1961 | 61242 | Transfer in from: | 12C | Carlisle Canal | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 25/09/1961 | D2779 | Transfer in from: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | on | 28/09/1961 | 67669 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/10/1961 | 61007 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/10/1961 | 61244 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/10/1961 | 61260 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | on | 02/10/1961 | 68119 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/10/1961 | 60519 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/10/1961 | 60529 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/10/1961 | 60530 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/10/1961 | 60535 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 67605 | Transfer in from: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 67660 | Transfer in from: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 67674 | Transfer in from: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | D2719 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 23/10/1961 | 61968 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/11/1961 | 60037 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/11/1961 | 60043 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/11/1961 | 60534 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/11/1961 | 60536 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/11/1961 | 60537 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/11/1961 | 64518 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/11/1961 | 64532 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/11/1961 | 64515 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/11/1961 | 64535 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 03/12/1961 | 60087 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 05/12/1961 | 69219 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/12/1961 | 60057 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/12/1961 | 60094 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/12/1961 | 60096 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/12/1961 | 60097 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/12/1961 | 64479 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 6w/e | 30/12/1961 | D2723 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/01/1962 | 64533 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/01/1962 | 64795 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 05/02/1962 | 67660 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 05/02/1962 | 67666 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 12/02/1962 | 67659 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 12/02/1962 | 68342 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 12/02/1962 | 68454 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 12/02/1962 | 68472 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/02/1962 | 64946 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 19/02/1962 | 69014 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | D2719 | Transfer in from: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 64510 | Transfer in from: | BGT | Bathgate | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 64527 | Transfer in from: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/03/1962 | 65258 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 80114 | Transfer in from: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | D2749 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/04/1962 | 64519 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/04/1962 | 64566 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 07/05/1962 | D2750 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 14/05/1962 | 60536 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/05/1962 | 64590 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/05/1962 | 61350 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 42168 | Transfer in from: | 60B | Aviemore | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 28/05/1962 | 60953 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/06/1962 | 64527 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 80006 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 80007 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 80022 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 80122 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 42168 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 64552 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 18/06/1962 | 60090 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 18/06/1962 | 60094 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 09/07/1962 | 67649 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 80003 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/08/1962 | 61117 | Transfer in from: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/08/1962 | 61344 | Transfer in from: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/08/1962 | 61404 | Transfer in from: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 13/08/1962 | 80054 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 13/08/1962 | 80055 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/08/1962 | 64607 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/08/1962 | 64637 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | on | 27/08/1962 | 67617 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 64588 | Transfer in from: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 80026 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/09/1962 | 61076 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/09/1962 | 61219 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 01/10/1962 | 69128 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 01/10/1962 | 69135 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 01/10/1962 | 69138 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 01/10/1962 | 69150 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 01/10/1962 | 69224 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 08/10/1962 | 60536 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1962 | 65334 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 08/10/1962 | 68448 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 08/10/1962 | 68453 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 08/10/1962 | 68470 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/10/1962 | 65344 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/11/1962 | 61933 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/11/1962 | 61324 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/11/1962 | 61332 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/11/1962 | 64510 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/12/1962 | 60512 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/12/1962 | 60524 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/12/1962 | 60519 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/12/1962 | 60536 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 03/12/1962 | 60927 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 61007 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 29/12/1962 | 60529 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 29/12/1962 | 60534 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 29/12/1962 | 60537 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/12/1962 | 60819 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/12/1962 | 60827 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/12/1962 | 60840 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/12/1962 | 60873 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/12/1962 | 60894 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/12/1962 | 60920 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/12/1962 | 60933 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/12/1962 | 60937 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/12/1962 | 60951 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/12/1962 | 60958 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/12/1962 | 60965 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/12/1962 | 60971 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/12/1962 | 60980 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 61108 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 61184 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 61246 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 61260 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 64594 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 64601 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 64612 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | on | 29/12/1962 | 67605 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | on | 29/12/1962 | 67606 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | on | 29/12/1962 | 67668 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | on | 29/12/1962 | 67674 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | on | 29/12/1962 | 68095 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 29/12/1962 | 68477 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/12/1962 | 819 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 31/12/1962 | 60522 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 31/12/1962 | 60524 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 31/12/1962 | 60959 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1963 | 64612 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/01/1963 | 60098 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/01/1963 | 60099 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/01/1963 | 60100 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/01/1963 | 60101 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | D2723 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | D2749 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 64557 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 64576 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 64577 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 64586 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 64588 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 64603 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 64605 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 65918 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 65934 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1963 | D2715 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1963 | D3732 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1963 | D3733 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1963 | D3734 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1963 | D3742 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 24/02/1963 | 60846 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 24/02/1963 | 60883 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/04/1963 | 60101 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/04/1963 | 60900 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 21/04/1963 | 60053 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 21/04/1963 | 60802 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/05/1963 | 60053 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/05/1963 | 65224 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60077 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/07/1963 | 65297 | Transfer in from: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/07/1963 | 65297 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/08/1963 | 64625 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/08/1963 | 65329 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 24/08/1963 | 60097 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 25/08/1963 | 60052 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 07/09/1963 | 42128 | Transfer in from: | 66E | Carstairs | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 07/09/1963 | 42163 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 07/09/1963 | 42239 | Transfer in from: | 66E | Carstairs | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 07/09/1963 | 42265 | Transfer in from: | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 07/09/1963 | 64625 | Transfer in from: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1963 | 60152 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1963 | 60159 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1963 | 60160 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1963 | 60161 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1963 | 60162 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1963 | 60096 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/09/1963 | 60512 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/09/1963 | 60522 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/09/1963 | 60530 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/09/1963 | 60535 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 14/10/1963 | 60089 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 14/10/1963 | 60159 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 14/10/1963 | 60161 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/10/1963 | 60006 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/10/1963 | 60007 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/10/1963 | 60026 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/10/1963 | 60034 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 21/10/1963 | D2745 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 27/10/1963 | 60042 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/10/1963 | 60005 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/10/1963 | 60016 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/10/1963 | 60019 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/10/1963 | 60023 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/10/1963 | 60057 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/10/1963 | 60087 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/10/1963 | 60098 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/10/1963 | 60099 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/10/1963 | 60162 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | D2746 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 10/11/1963 | 60005 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 10/11/1963 | 60016 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 10/11/1963 | 60019 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/11/1963 | 64562 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/11/1963 | 61081 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/11/1963 | 61178 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/11/1963 | 61221 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 21/11/1963 | 60892 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 24/11/1963 | 60818 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 24/11/1963 | 60836 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/11/1963 | 64582 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 64595 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 64608 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 64624 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/12/1963 | 61245 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/12/1963 | 60037 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/12/1963 | 60160 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/12/1963 | 60024 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 65288 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 65327 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/12/1963 | 61341 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/12/1963 | 61359 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/01/1964 | 61221 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/01/1964 | 64613 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 42691 | Transfer in from: | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 42265 | Transfer out to: | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 46461 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 64561 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/02/1964 | 61117 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/02/1964 | 61178 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 29/02/1964 | 64606 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 29/02/1964 | 64614 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 05/03/1964 | 60802 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/04/1964 | 60026 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/04/1964 | 64547 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/04/1964 | 64599 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/04/1964 | 64625 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 27/04/1964 | 60825 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/05/1964 | 60006 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 14/05/1964 | 60043 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 17/05/1964 | 60023 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 17/05/1964 | 60034 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 18/05/1964 | 60955 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 18/05/1964 | 60969 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | m/e | 06/1964 | 42239 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 08/06/1964 | 42163 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/06/1964 | 61219 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/06/1964 | 61242 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/06/1964 | 61307 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/06/1964 | 61351 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1964 | 61081 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 27/06/1964 | 42208 | Transfer in from: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/07/1964 | 60042 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/07/1964 | 60077 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 13/07/1964 | 60882 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 19/07/1964 | 60835 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 19/07/1964 | 60970 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/07/1964 | 60007 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/07/1964 | 61398 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/07/1964 | 61356 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 30/07/1964 | 42208 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/07/1964 | 61396 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 31/07/1964 | 80060 | Transfer in from: | 63B | Stirling | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 03/08/1964 | 80060 | Transfer out to: | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/08/1964 | 65919 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/09/1964 | 60027 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 06/09/1964 | D2779 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/09/1964 | 60152 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/09/1964 | 64572 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 26/09/1964 | 65234 | Transfer in from: | BGT | Bathgate | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 5w/e | 26/09/1964 | D2730 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 5w/e | 26/09/1964 | D2731 | Transfer out to: | 67E | Dumfries | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 26/09/1964 | 64555 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 26/09/1964 | 64591 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 26/09/1964 | 65922 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 26/09/1964 | 65927 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 12/10/1964 | D2754 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 12/10/1964 | D2755 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/10/1964 | 61245 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/10/1964 | 61308 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/10/1964 | 65912 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/10/1964 | 65920 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/11/1964 | 61294 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1964 | 65914 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 17/12/1964 | 60957 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/01/1965 | D3558 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 27/02/1965 | D2719 | Transfer out to: | Crewe Works | |||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 27/02/1965 | D2722 | Transfer out to: | Crewe Works | |||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 06/03/1965 | 80003 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 21/03/1965 | 60024 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1965 | 65915 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1965 | 65929 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/06/1965 | 61357 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/06/1965 | 60100 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/06/1965 | 61397 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 26/06/1965 | 80022 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/08/1965 | 61191 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 03/09/1965 | 60027 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 03/09/1965 | 60931 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/09/1965 | 61076 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/09/1965 | 61396 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/10/1965 | 61307 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/10/1965 | 61308 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/10/1965 | 61347 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 10/10/1965 | 60868 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 10/10/1965 | 60976 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/10/1965 | 61324 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 19/10/1965 | 60835 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 19/10/1965 | 60846 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 22/10/1965 | 60816 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/10/1965 | 61244 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | D3561 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 42273 | Transfer in from: | 28B | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 44925 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 45047 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 45053 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 45127 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 45162 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 45168 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 45469 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 45477 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 45483 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 76049 | Transfer in from: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 78047 | Transfer in from: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | D3893 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | D2726 | Transfer out to: | Wolverton Works | |||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | D2732 | Transfer out to: | Wolverton Works | |||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/11/1965 | 61404 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 21/11/1965 | 80054 | Transfer out to: | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 04/12/1965 | 80007 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 04/12/1965 | 80122 | Transfer out to: | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/12/1965 | 60041 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/01/1966 | 61099 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/01/1966 | 61307 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 17/01/1966 | 60052 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/01/1966 | 76049 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 29/01/1966 | 78049 | Transfer in from: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 29/01/1966 | 80113 | Transfer in from: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 29/01/1966 | 80124 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 29/01/1966 | D3879 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 29/01/1966 | 46462 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 29/01/1966 | 78047 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 07/02/1966 | 60970 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 8w/e | 26/03/1966 | D2710 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 8w/e | 26/03/1966 | D2712 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/04/1966 | 61029 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/04/1966 | 61308 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 10/04/1966 | D2745 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 10/04/1966 | D2750 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 24/04/1966 | 60813 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/04/1966 | 61344 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/04/1966 | 61347 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/04/1966 | 61349 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/04/1966 | 61354 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 5w/e | 30/04/1966 | D2714 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 5w/e | 30/04/1966 | D2746 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/04/1966 | D3547 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/04/1966 | D3548 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/07/1966 | 61345 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 17/07/1966 | 45047 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/07/1966 | D2744 | Transfer in from: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 17/08/1966 | 45477 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | on | 22/08/1966 | 78049 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/08/1966 | 61307 | Transfer in from: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | m/e | 09/1966 | 42691 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 02/09/1966 | 42273 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 02/09/1966 | 44925 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 02/09/1966 | 80006 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 02/09/1966 | 80026 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 02/09/1966 | 80055 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 02/09/1966 | 80113 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | 65319 | Transfer in from: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | 78046 | Transfer in from: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | 78047 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | 45127 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 26/09/1966 | 45168 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 26/09/1966 | 60824 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 26/09/1966 | 60868 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 26/09/1966 | 60955 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 26/09/1966 | 60976 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/09/1966 | 65319 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 3w/e | 30/09/1966 | 42691 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/10/1966 | D3736 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/10/1966 | D3740 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/10/1966 | D3741 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 19/11/1966 | 42128 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 19/11/1966 | 45053 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 19/11/1966 | 45162 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 19/11/1966 | 45469 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/11/1966 | 61307 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/11/1966 | 61350 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | on | 19/11/1966 | 78046 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 09/12/1966 | 80124 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1966 | 45483 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 31/12/1966 | 80114 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 11/02/1967 | D2750 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 12/02/1967 | D2754 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 12/02/1967 | D2755 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 18/02/1967 | D2745 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | D2/1 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D2705 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | D2/1 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D2706 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D2710 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D2712 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D2714 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D2715 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D2720 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D2721 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D2723 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D2724 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D2725 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D2727 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D2728 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D2729 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D2744 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D2746 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D2747 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D2748 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D2749 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D3547 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D3548 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D3561 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D3728 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D3729 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D3730 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D3731 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D3732 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D3733 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D3878 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D3880 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D3881 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D3882 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D3883 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D3884 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D3885 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D3886 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D3887 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D3888 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D3889 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D3890 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D3891 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D3892 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/04/1967 | 65234 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/03/1985 | 26030 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 08/09/1989 | 26034 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 04/10/1989 | 26031 | Condemned |