Depot: Stafford
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 2350 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Precursor | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 5285 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 2350 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 25648 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Precursor | 4-4-0 | m/e | 03/1936 | 25285 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1151 | Snapshot | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2345 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2346 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2347 | Snapshot | 23C | Southport | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2391 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25648 | Snapshot | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25648 | Snapshot | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25673 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25752 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25787 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 377 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 443 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 461 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 46876 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 528 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7294 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7588 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7598 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7606 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7649 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7653 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7670 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8940 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9091 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9098 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9144 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9194 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9320 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 46876 | Transfer in from: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 46876 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 413 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 2349 | Transfer in from: | 9C | Macclesfield | ||
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 46876 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 413 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 25722 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 25827 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | on | 06/03/1948 | 25722 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | on | 06/03/1948 | 25827 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 7294 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 49324 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | on | 29/05/1948 | 25787 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1948 | 25752 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 8913 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 8940 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 9144 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 5143 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 377 | Transfer out to: | 7D | Rhyl | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 9034 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 5143 | Transfer out to: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 528 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 31/07/1948 | 42320 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 08/1948 | 8913 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 9098 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 9319 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 16/10/1948 | 9047 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | on | 16/10/1948 | 25648 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 40471 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 42349 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1949 | 58001 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Coal Engines | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/01/1949 | 58342 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 40322 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 23/04/1949 | 47665 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 23/04/1949 | 7670 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 40405 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 41151 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 10/1949 | 49194 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 49158 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 49284 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 49291 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 9114 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 49324 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 12/1949 | 49320 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 49410 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 49319 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | m/e | 03/1950 | 49284 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 48922 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Warwick | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 08/04/1950 | 49229 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 20/05/1950 | 49291 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 29/07/1950 | 40507 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 19/08/1950 | 9034 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 42309 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 49091 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 42309 | Transfer in from: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 42309 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 47590 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 47598 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 47590 | Transfer in from: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 47590 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 05/01/1952 | 40471 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 40413 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 40646 | Transfer in from: | 7D | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 40413 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 48922 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 40405 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 40678 | Transfer in from: | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 07/1952 | 40507 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 40522 | Transfer in from: | 19G | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 42391 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | m/e | 02/1953 | 40322 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 42538 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 42562 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 42578 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 40522 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 40583 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 47379 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 48922 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 49048 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 49198 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 47379 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 47359 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Coventry | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 42320 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 42418 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 42421 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 42425 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 48263 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 48727 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 49061 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 49061 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 48727 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 48263 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 40443 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 40461 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 47606 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Alsager | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 42323 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 42389 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 42418 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 42421 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 49430 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 49430 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 42468 | Transfer in from: | 5F | Uttoxeter | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 42494 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 42605 | Transfer in from: | 5F | Uttoxeter | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 49081 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 49114 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 40675 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 49119 | Transfer in from: | 4D | Abergavenny | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 49450 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 42468 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 42494 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 42605 | Transfer out to: | 5F | Uttoxeter | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 04/01/1958 | 49047 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 49446 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Market Harborough | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 49119 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 49450 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 42578 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 48943 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 42345 | Transfer out to: | 11C | Oxenholme | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 48922 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 49048 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 49158 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 49229 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 42538 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 42400 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 49126 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 49357 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 42323 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 42346 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/01/1959 | 47475 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 09/05/1959 | 40122 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 42347 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 42425 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 42562 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 18/07/1959 | 40122 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 08/08/1959 | 49234 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 08/08/1959 | 49377 | Transfer in from: | 26F | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 22/08/1959 | 40675 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 05/09/1959 | 48943 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 40678 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 49410 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 90147 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 40646 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 48755 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 48762 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 90147 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 49234 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 42327 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 42400 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 47648 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 48366 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 48453 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 48705 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 49081 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 49126 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 49377 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 40583 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 47648 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 48697 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 40108 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 40010 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/01/1961 | 48174 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 48697 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 18/03/1961 | 40010 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 47310 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 40108 | Transfer out to: | 21E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 49446 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 47653 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 42069 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 49357 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 04/11/1961 | 42069 | Transfer out to: | 21E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 25/11/1961 | 47518 | Transfer in from: | 13B | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/12/1961 | 42069 | Transfer in from: | 21E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 47286 | Transfer in from: | Wolverton Works | |||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 47665 | Transfer out to: | Wolverton Works | |||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 47475 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 47474 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 42069 | Transfer out to: | 5F | Uttoxeter | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 47665 | Transfer in from: | Wolverton Works | |||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 47286 | Transfer out to: | Wolverton Works | |||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 47310 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 42186 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 42267 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 42488 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42544 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42309 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42327 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42389 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 48705 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 48755 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 48762 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 01/09/1962 | 47474 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 08/09/1962 | 47280 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 47588 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 47598 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 47280 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 42544 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 47478 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 47478 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/08/1963 | 48366 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/08/1963 | 47590 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/08/1963 | 47598 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 45344 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 48602 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 48453 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 47518 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 47266 | Transfer in from: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 47622 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 47266 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 28/12/1963 | 47590 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 28/12/1963 | 47598 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 42104 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 45110 | Transfer in from: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 45147 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/03/1964 | D2221 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/03/1964 | D2236 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/03/1964 | D2385 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 47598 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/05/1964 | 42400 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/05/1964 | 42416 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 06/06/1964 | 42186 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 42350 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 42400 | Transfer in from: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 42421 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 42104 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 42267 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 42400 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 42416 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 42488 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 45344 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 42381 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 47590 | Transfer out to: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 47622 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 47649 | Transfer out to: | 5F | Uttoxeter | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 42104 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 42247 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 22/08/1964 | 42421 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 44963 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 42104 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 42247 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 45374 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 23/01/1965 | 42400 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 13/02/1965 | 42350 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 44813 | Transfer in from: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 08/05/1965 | 42381 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/07/1965 | 47359 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/07/1965 | 47665 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 44813 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 44963 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 45110 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 45147 | Transfer out to: | 8L | Aintree | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 45374 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 48174 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 48602 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/07/1965 | D2221 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/07/1965 | D2236 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/07/1965 | D2385 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South |