Depot: Stirling
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/08/1924 | 6351 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/08/1924 | 6370 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 11/1935 | 9132 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 13109 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 17328 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1939 | 6370 | Transfer out to: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/07/1943 | 6351 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 16343 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 14455 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 113 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 14466 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 14485 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 14491 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 14496 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 19 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15122 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 92 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15126 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15212 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15222 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17232 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17233 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17243 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17246 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17252 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17257 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17264 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17328 | Snapshot | 28A | Motherwell | ||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17423 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17424 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17425 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17460 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17468 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2209 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D33 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2461 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2809 | Snapshot | 30D | Ayr | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4283 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4330 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4331 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4461 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4471 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4497 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4501 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4520 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4525 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4542 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4544 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4556 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4569 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4585 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5281 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5307 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5322 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5346 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 19 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 55117 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 56254 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 56343 | Snapshot | 31B | Stirling | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 56343 | Snapshot | 31B | Stirling | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 56365 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 56366 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57402 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57422 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57466 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7462 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7618 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7650 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8342 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8346 | Snapshot | STG | Stirling | ||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8346 | Snapshot | STG | Stirling | ||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8354 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 14485 | Transfer out to: | 30D | Ayr | ||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 20/03/1948 | 2153 | Transfer in from: | 29C | Dundee West | ||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 8342 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/06/1948 | 57422 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 41971 | Transfer out to: | 20F | Skipton | ||
Steam | 19 | 0-4-4T | on | 19/06/1948 | 55117 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 54491 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 54496 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 45358 | Transfer in from: | 31A | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 45359 | Transfer in from: | 31A | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 40924 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Aviemore | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 7675 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | 43 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 54455 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Aviemore | ||
Steam | 113 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 01/01/1949 | 54466 | Transfer out to: | 60B | Aviemore | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 4525 | Transfer out to: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 4556 | Transfer out to: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 5307 | Transfer out to: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 5322 | Transfer out to: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 65281 | Transfer out to: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 68346 | Transfer out to: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 67618 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 04/1949 | 57466 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 08/1949 | 57402 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 65346 | Transfer out to: | BGT | Bathgate | ||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 62426 | Transfer in from: | PTH | Perth (LNER) | ||
Steam | 879 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 01/04/1950 | 55145 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 01/04/1950 | 55212 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/10/1950 | 43884 | Transfer in from: | 28A | Motherwell | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 43884 | Transfer in from: | 63B | Stirling | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 43884 | Transfer out to: | 63B | Stirling | ||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/11/1950 | 57425 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | on | 11/11/1950 | 62209 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D33 | 4-4-0 | on | 06/06/1951 | 62461 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 57339 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 67462 | Transfer out to: | 64E | Polmont | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 09/09/1951 | 57339 | Transfer in from: | 63B | Stirling | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 09/09/1951 | 57339 | Transfer out to: | 63B | Stirling | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 40921 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 62714 | Transfer in from: | PTH | Perth (LNER) | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 64461 | Transfer out to: | 68E | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 64471 | Transfer out to: | 68E | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | 19 | 0-4-4T | on | 17/01/1952 | 55122 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/02/1952 | 57468 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 57450 | Transfer in from: | 63C | Forfar | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 40921 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 44283 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 19/04/1952 | 40923 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/04/1952 | 45084 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 55212 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 40938 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 92 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 55126 | Transfer in from: | 31B | Stirling | ||
Steam | 92 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 55126 | Transfer out to: | 63B | Stirling | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 55222 | Transfer in from: | 31B | Stirling | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 40924 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 55212 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 55222 | Transfer out to: | 63B | Stirling | ||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 54502 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 67454 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 40923 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 02/1953 | 57450 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/03/1953 | 57423 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 21/03/1953 | 57324 | Transfer in from: | 29D | Forfar | ||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 21/03/1953 | 57396 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Oban | ||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 21/03/1953 | 57424 | Transfer out to: | 63E | Oban | ||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | 8w/e | 21/03/1953 | 67454 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1953 | 44318 | Transfer in from: | 63C | Forfar | ||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1953 | 57441 | Transfer in from: | 29D | Forfar | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 40938 | Transfer out to: | 63C | Forfar | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 40938 | Transfer in from: | 63C | Forfar | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 62725 | Transfer in from: | PTH | Perth (LNER) | ||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 54502 | Transfer out to: | 68B | Dumfries | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 44318 | Transfer out to: | 63C | Forfar | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 17/04/1954 | 64520 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1954 | 44330 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1954 | 44318 | Transfer in from: | 63C | Forfar | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1954 | 44331 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 30/10/1954 | 54504 | Transfer in from: | 30B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 879 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 18/04/1955 | 55145 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 14/05/1955 | 55195 | Transfer in from: | 63E | Oban | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 09/07/1955 | 44314 | Transfer in from: | 63C | Forfar | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 8w/e | 09/07/1955 | 55176 | Transfer in from: | 63C | Forfar | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/08/1955 | 45213 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/08/1955 | 45357 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/08/1955 | 44314 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/10/1955 | 45119 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/10/1955 | 45214 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/10/1955 | 45396 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/10/1955 | 45400 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/10/1955 | 45423 | Transfer in from: | 31A | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 06/10/1955 | 80125 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 40938 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/09/1956 | 45049 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 02/11/1956 | 56366 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 8w/e | 22/12/1956 | 56375 | Transfer in from: | 31D | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 22/12/1956 | 45119 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 22/12/1956 | 45358 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/01/1957 | 57460 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 56281 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/05/1957 | 45389 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/07/1957 | 64542 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/07/1957 | 64544 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/07/1957 | 64585 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/11/1957 | 44318 | Transfer out to: | 63C | Forfar | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 44318 | Transfer in from: | 63C | Forfar | ||
Steam | 113 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 54476 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 16/04/1958 | 56254 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/05/1958 | 57396 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/07/1958 | 43884 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/07/1958 | 44318 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/07/1958 | 57441 | Transfer out to: | 63C | Forfar | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/07/1958 | D3535 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 07/08/1958 | 56375 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/08/1958 | D3536 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/08/1958 | D3537 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/08/1958 | D3538 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/08/1958 | D3539 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/08/1958 | D3540 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 10/10/1958 | 55176 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/10/1958 | 45125 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 10/11/1958 | 62725 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 13/11/1958 | 56281 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/11/1958 | 57276 | Transfer in from: | 63D | Oban | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/11/1958 | D3535 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 92 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 22/11/1958 | 55126 | Transfer out to: | 63D | Oban | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 11/12/1958 | D2739 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 16/12/1958 | D2740 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/12/1958 | 45125 | Transfer out to: | 68C | Stranraer | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 16/01/1959 | D2741 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 30/01/1959 | D2742 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 14/03/1959 | 42690 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 14/03/1959 | 42693 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | 652 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/03/1959 | 57642 | Transfer in from: | 29D | Forfar | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/03/1959 | 67650 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1959 | 57576 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1959 | 57681 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1959 | 64497 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1959 | 64501 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1959 | 64569 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 15/05/1959 | 56365 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/06/1959 | 57243 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/06/1959 | 57339 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 26/08/1959 | 62714 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | on | 20/10/1959 | 54504 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/11/1959 | 57276 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 431 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 13/02/1960 | 55238 | Transfer in from: | 31D | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 29/02/1960 | 80060 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | 80062 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | 80063 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 113 | 4-4-0 | on | 15/03/1960 | 54476 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 09/04/1960 | 42693 | Transfer out to: | 68D | Beattock | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 04/06/1960 | 42690 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | on | 25/06/1960 | 62426 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 09/1960 | 68351 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/10/1960 | D3540 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 01/1961 | 56343 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/05/1961 | 57232 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/05/1961 | 57324 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 27/06/1961 | 55195 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 431 | 0-4-4T | on | 13/09/1961 | 55238 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 14/09/1961 | 55222 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/10/1961 | 57233 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/10/1961 | 57246 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/10/1961 | 57257 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/10/1961 | 57264 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/10/1961 | 57576 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 65304 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 65310 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | D2741 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | 652 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/07/1962 | 57642 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/07/1962 | 65310 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1962 | 65304 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/11/1962 | 57252 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/12/1962 | 57261 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 78053 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 29/08/1963 | 45049 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 07/09/1963 | 45320 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 28/10/1963 | 45320 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1963 | 57681 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 46403 | Transfer in from: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/11/1963 | 57261 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 45361 | Transfer in from: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D3533 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 13/02/1964 | 45361 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 04/05/1964 | 45400 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/05/1964 | D3533 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | on | 29/06/1964 | 46403 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 07/07/1964 | 80125 | Transfer out to: | |||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/07/1964 | 78053 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 31/07/1964 | 80060 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 22/08/1964 | D2739 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 22/08/1964 | D2740 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 22/08/1964 | D2742 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/08/1964 | 80062 | Transfer out to: | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/08/1964 | 80063 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/08/1964 | 80062 | Transfer in from: | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 12/10/1964 | 80062 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/08/1965 | 45423 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 08/10/1965 | 45389 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 45362 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 73007 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 73105 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1965 | 73154 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/02/1966 | 45396 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/03/1966 | 73007 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/04/1966 | 45214 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/04/1966 | 45357 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 25/06/1966 | 45084 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 25/06/1966 | 45213 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 25/06/1966 | 45359 | Transfer out to: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 25/06/1966 | 73105 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 25/06/1966 | 73154 | Transfer out to: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | 73149 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | 73150 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | 73153 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | D3536 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | D3537 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | D3538 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | D3539 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 73149 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 73150 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 73153 | Condemned |