Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 150 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 6539 Week
» 26981 Month
» 363827 Year
» 1585392 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Sunderland


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 13/07/1933 2374 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 19/01/1934 2374 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 05/07/1934 2214 Transfer in from: SEL Selby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 13/11/1935 1465 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 15/11/1935 1473 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 15/06/1936 1465 Transfer out to: CON Consett    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 06/05/1937 1585 Transfer in from: GOR Gorton    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 15/01/1938 2214 Transfer out to: BOR Borough Gardens    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 14/11/1938 2144 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 17/11/1938 2149 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 28/11/1938 1473 Transfer out to: CON Consett    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 18/01/1939 2154 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 18/01/1939 2144 Transfer out to: BLA Blaydon    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 08/07/1939 1585 Transfer out to: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 31/10/1941 1327 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 31/10/1941 2143 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 28/06/1943 1523 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 12/05/1946 2149 Transfer out to: WBY Whitby    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 05/08/1946 2154 Transfer out to: CON Consett    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 20/01/1947 9861 Transfer in from: CON Consett    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 05/10/1947 9887 Transfer out to: BLA Blaydon    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 15/11/1947 9887 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5785 Snapshot        
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5793 Snapshot        
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5798 Snapshot        
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5817 Snapshot        
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5820 Snapshot        
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5823 Snapshot        
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5834 Snapshot        
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5836 Snapshot        
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5843 Snapshot        
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5845 Snapshot        
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5850 Snapshot        
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5853 Snapshot        
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5856 Snapshot        
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5857 Snapshot        
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5865 Snapshot        
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5872 Snapshot        
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5878 Snapshot        
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5884 Snapshot        
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 7243 Snapshot        
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 7247 Snapshot        
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 7251 Snapshot        
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 7252 Snapshot        
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 7257 Snapshot        
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 7260 Snapshot        
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 7264 Snapshot        
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 7267 Snapshot        
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 7270 Snapshot        
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 7283 Snapshot        
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 7297 Snapshot        
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 7299 Snapshot        
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 7300 Snapshot        
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 7310 Snapshot        
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 7328 Snapshot        
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 7336 Snapshot        
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 7348 Snapshot        
Steam J94 0-6-0ST on 01/01/1948 8016 Snapshot        
Steam J72 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 8691 Snapshot        
Steam J72 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 8698 Snapshot        
Steam J72 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 8707 Snapshot        
Steam J72 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 8718 Snapshot        
Steam J72 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 8730 Snapshot        
Steam N8 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9400 Snapshot        
Steam N9 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9413 Snapshot Dar Barnard Castle    
Steam N9 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9421 Snapshot HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam N9 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9425 Snapshot HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam N9 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9427 Snapshot EHL East Hartlepool    
Steam N9 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9428 Snapshot EHL East Hartlepool    
Steam N9 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9429 Snapshot EHL East Hartlepool    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 30/05/1948 9853 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 07/11/1948 69857 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam N9 0-6-2T m/e 08/1949 9421 Condemned      
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 08/05/1950 67299 Condemned      
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 04/06/1950 69861 Transfer out to: 50G Whitby    
Steam N9 0-6-2T m/e 08/1950 9428 Condemned      
Steam N9 0-6-2T 4w/e 23/09/1950 69418 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam N9 0-6-2T m/e 11/1950 9425 Condemned      
Steam N9 0-6-2T m/e 12/1950 9413 Condemned      
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 23/12/1950 65884 Transfer out to: 51K Saltburn    
Steam J72 0-6-0T m/e 01/1951 69018 1st Allocation        
Steam N9 0-6-2T on 01/01/1951 69418 Condemned      
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 20/01/1951 65654 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 20/01/1951 65705 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 4w/e 17/02/1951 68017 Transfer in from: 54D Consett    
Steam N10 0-6-2T 4w/e 17/02/1951 69101 Transfer in from: NLN Northallerton    
Steam N9 0-6-2T 4w/e 17/02/1951 69426 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 5w/e 23/06/1951 68041 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 5w/e 23/06/1951 68058 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 23/06/1951 65654 Transfer out to: 51E Stockton    
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 23/06/1951 65705 Transfer out to: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 11/07/1951 67264 Condemned      
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 21/07/1951 67252 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 21/07/1951 67270 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 21/07/1951 67310 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam N8 0-6-2T m/e 10/1951 69400 Condemned      
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 06/07/1952 69863 Transfer in from: WHL West Hartlepool    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 4w/e 20/09/1952 69002 Transfer in from:        
Steam J72 0-6-0T 4w/e 20/09/1952 69007 Transfer in from:        
Steam J72 0-6-0T 4w/e 20/09/1952 68707 Transfer out to: 51F West Auckland    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 4w/e 20/09/1952 68718 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 4w/e 20/09/1952 69018 Transfer out to: 51F West Auckland    
Steam G5 0-4-4T w/e 24/11/1952 67260 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 12/1952 76023 1st Allocation        
Steam G5 0-4-4T w/e 12/01/1953 67348 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 01/02/1953 64919 Transfer in from: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 01/02/1953 64939 Transfer in from: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 14/02/1953 67344 Transfer in from: 51F West Auckland    
Steam N9 0-6-2T w/e 23/02/1953 69426 Condemned      
Steam N8 0-6-2T 5w/e 21/03/1953 69392 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam N9 0-6-2T 5w/e 21/03/1953 69427 Transfer out to: 54B Tyne Dock    
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 24/10/1953 65865 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam N8 0-6-2T 4w/e 20/02/1954 69390 Transfer in from: 54D Consett    
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 12/04/1954 67257 Condemned      
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 22/05/1954 67345 Transfer in from: 51J Northallerton    
Steam G5 0-4-4T w/e 14/06/1954 67267 Condemned      
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 24/07/1954 67315 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 09/08/1954 67283 Condemned      
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 25/09/1954 67294 Transfer in from: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 23/10/1954 65793 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam G5 0-4-4T w/e 06/12/1954 67247 Condemned      
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 22/03/1955 67336 Condemned      
Steam N8 0-6-2T on 04/05/1955 69392 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 5w/e 18/06/1955 76023 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam N9 0-6-2T on 04/07/1955 69429 Condemned      
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 23/07/1955 67316 Transfer in from: 52C Blaydon    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 23/07/1955 67334 Transfer in from: SBH Blyth (South)    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 23/07/1955 67347 Transfer in from: SBH Blyth (South)    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 23/07/1955 67294 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 23/07/1955 67315 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 19/09/1955 67243 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 25/09/1955 64817 Transfer in from: 51F West Auckland    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 25/09/1955 64910 Transfer in from: 51F West Auckland    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 25/09/1955 64940 Transfer in from: 51F West Auckland    
Steam J25 0-6-0 3w/e 12/11/1955 65708 Transfer in from: 51F West Auckland    
Steam N8 0-6-2T 3w/e 12/11/1955 69390 Transfer out to: 54B Tyne Dock    
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 21/11/1955 67328 Condemned      
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 06/12/1955 67300 Condemned      
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 13/12/1955 67316 Condemned      
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 13/12/1955 67345 Condemned      
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 17/12/1955 67259 Transfer in from: 52C Blaydon    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 17/12/1955 67321 Transfer in from: 53B Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 17/12/1955 67338 Transfer in from: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 17/12/1955 67342 Transfer in from: 51J Northallerton    
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 27/02/1956 67344 Condemned      
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 24/03/1956 67343 Transfer in from: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 26/03/1956 67251 Condemned      
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 26/03/1956 67334 Condemned      
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 26/03/1956 67347 Condemned      
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 21/04/1956 67270 Transfer in from: 52C Blaydon    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 21/04/1956 67278 Transfer in from: 51J Northallerton    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 21/04/1956 67294 Transfer in from: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 21/04/1956 67333 Transfer in from: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam J25 0-6-0 on 28/05/1956 65708 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 10/06/1956 64910 Transfer out to: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 10/06/1956 64939 Transfer out to: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 10/06/1956 64940 Transfer out to: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 10/06/1956 69887 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington    
Steam J27 0-6-0 3w/e 16/06/1956 65873 Transfer in from: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam J27 0-6-0 3w/e 16/06/1956 65892 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam J27 0-6-0 3w/e 16/06/1956 65893 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam J25 0-6-0 m/e 21/07/1956 65662 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 23/09/1956 63466 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 23/09/1956 63467 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 23/09/1956 63474 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 08/10/1956 67333 Condemned      
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 20/10/1956 65785 Transfer out to: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 20/10/1956 65823 Transfer out to: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 20/10/1956 65873 Transfer out to: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 15/12/1956 67248 Transfer in from: 52C Blaydon    
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 07/01/1957 67321 Condemned      
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 15/01/1957 67294 Condemned      
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 19/01/1957 67265 Transfer in from: 52C Blaydon    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 19/01/1957 67320 Transfer in from: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 16/02/1957 67246 Transfer in from: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 16/02/1957 67329 Transfer in from: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 30/07/1957 67278 Condemned      
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 24/08/1957 67253 Transfer in from: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 27/08/1957 67338 Condemned      
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 15/09/1957 69852 Transfer in from: 51K Saltburn    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 15/09/1957 69854 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 15/09/1957 69855 Transfer in from: 51K Saltburn    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 15/09/1957 69858 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 15/09/1957 69859 Transfer in from: 51K Saltburn    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 15/09/1957 69862 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 15/09/1957 69872 Transfer in from: AUK West Auckland    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 15/09/1957 69878 Transfer in from: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 15/09/1957 69889 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 4w/e 21/09/1957 68044 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 4w/e 21/09/1957 68698 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 04/11/1957 67343 Condemned      
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 17/12/1957 67259 Condemned      
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 08/01/1958 67248 Transfer out to: 50F Malton    
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 13/01/1958 67270 Condemned      
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 20/02/1958 67265 Condemned      
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 08/03/1958 67342 Transfer out to: 50F Malton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 12/04/1958 42411 Transfer in from: 25C Goole    
Steam J27 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65857 Transfer out to: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam J27 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65893 Transfer out to: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 22/06/1958 69870 Transfer in from: AUK West Auckland    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 22/06/1958 69875 Transfer in from: AUK West Auckland    
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 19/07/1958 65666 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam N10 0-6-2T 4w/e 19/07/1958 69101 Transfer out to: 54B Tyne Dock    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 30/07/1958 69862 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 16/08/1958 42411 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 15/09/1958 67297 Condemned      
Steam V1 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/10/1958 67637 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam V1 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/10/1958 67645 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam V1 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/10/1958 67673 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 16/10/1958 69872 Condemned      
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 31/10/1958 67253 Condemned      
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 03/11/1958 69863 Condemned      
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 15/11/1958 67261 Transfer in from: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 20/11/1958 67320 Condemned      
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 24/11/1958 67329 Condemned      
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 27/11/1958 67246 Condemned      
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 07/12/1958 69873 Transfer in from: 54a Durham    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 07/12/1958 69883 Transfer in from: 54a Durham    
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 11/12/1958 67261 Condemned      
Steam J94 0-6-0ST w/e 20/12/1958 68017 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 25/01/1959 63464 Transfer in from: 52C Blaydon    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 25/01/1959 63469 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 25/01/1959 64817 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 25/01/1959 64919 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam V1 2-6-2T w/e 31/01/1959 67637 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 14/03/1959 69007 Transfer out to: 51F West Auckland    
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 13/04/1959 65836 Condemned      
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 13/04/1959 65843 Condemned      
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 09/05/1959 65799 Transfer in from: 52E Percy Main    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 09/05/1959 65826 Transfer in from: PMN Percy Main    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 09/05/1959 65873 Transfer in from: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 16/05/1959 65799 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 02/06/1959 65798 Condemned      
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 14/06/1959 63463 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 65823 Transfer in from: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam V1 2-6-2T w/e 20/06/1959 67645 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam V1 2-6-2T w/e 20/06/1959 67673 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 20/06/1959 68730 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 21/06/1959 63473 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 26/08/1959 65826 Condemned      
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 26/08/1959 65856 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 19/09/1959 D2047 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 19/09/1959 D2050 Transfer in from: 52C Blaydon    
Steam J25 0-6-0 w/e 19/09/1959 65726 Transfer in from: 50D Starbeck    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 03/10/1959 65891 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam V1 2-6-2T w/e 03/10/1959 67645 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam V1 2-6-2T w/e 03/10/1959 67673 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 01/11/1959 64700 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 01/11/1959 64704 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 01/11/1959 64710 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 04/11/1959 69852 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 08/11/1959 64847 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 08/11/1959 64866 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 14/11/1959 65891 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 13/12/1959 64701 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 13/12/1959 64703 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 13/12/1959 64825 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 13/12/1959 64833 Transfer in from: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 13/12/1959 64853 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 13/12/1959 63463 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 13/12/1959 63464 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 13/12/1959 63466 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 13/12/1959 63473 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 13/12/1959 64866 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 25/01/1960 69853 Condemned      
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 25/01/1960 69855 Condemned      
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 05/02/1960 69857 Condemned      
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 08/02/1960 69859 Condemned      
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 08/02/1960 69873 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 20/03/1960 64942 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 10/05/1960 69854 Condemned      
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 10/05/1960 69858 Condemned      
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 20/05/1960 69874 Condemned      
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 20/05/1960 69875 Condemned      
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 30/05/1960 69889 Condemned      
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 01/06/1960 69883 Condemned      
Steam J25 0-6-0 on 06/06/1960 65662 Condemned      
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 21/06/1960 69850 Condemned      
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 24/06/1960 69870 Condemned      
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 24/06/1960 69878 Condemned      
Steam J25 0-6-0 w/e 04/07/1960 65666 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 09/07/1960 76024 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 11/09/1960 64854 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 D2092 Transfer in from: 52E Percy Main    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 43126 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 17/09/1960 69002 Transfer out to: 51F West Auckland    
Steam J25 0-6-0 w/e 24/09/1960 65726 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 13/11/1960 64707 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 26/11/1960 D2163 Transfer in from: 52E Percy Main    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 26/11/1960 D2164 Transfer in from: 52E Percy Main    
Steam J72 0-6-0T on 19/12/1960 68691 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 15/01/1961 64858 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 15/01/1961 63474 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 11/02/1961 43126 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 04/03/1961 D3241 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 08/04/1961 13242 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 08/04/1961 D3076 Transfer in from: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 17/04/1961 64700 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 17/04/1961 64710 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 30/04/1961 61038 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 30/04/1961 61237 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 20/05/1961 D2310 Transfer in from: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 11/06/1961 64713 Transfer in from: 52F Blyth (North)    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 15/07/1961 D2329 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 30/07/1961 64853 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 05/08/1961 65869 Transfer in from: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam V1 2-6-2T w/e 05/08/1961 67645 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam V1 2-6-2T w/e 05/08/1961 67673 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 20/08/1961 64812 Transfer in from: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 20/08/1961 64843 Transfer in from: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 20/08/1961 64846 Transfer in from: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 20/08/1961 64851 Transfer in from: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 20/08/1961 64853 Transfer in from: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 20/08/1961 64921 Transfer in from: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 20/08/1961 63467 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 20/08/1961 63469 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 25/08/1961 64707 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 26/08/1961 D3076 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST w/e 26/08/1961 68016 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST w/e 09/09/1961 68041 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST w/e 09/09/1961 68044 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST w/e 09/09/1961 68058 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 65883 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 65885 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 76024 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 02/11/1961 64825 Condemned      
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 11/11/1961 65874 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 12/11/1961 64921 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 09/12/1961 65887 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 14/01/1962 64806 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 14/01/1962 64942 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 21/01/1962 64706 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 29/03/1962 64703 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 29/03/1962 64706 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 29/03/1962 64843 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 29/03/1962 64858 Condemned      
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 07/04/1962 65788 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 07/04/1962 65833 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 07/04/1962 65865 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 07/04/1962 65870 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 18/04/1962 64713 Condemned      
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 21/04/1962 65787 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 21/04/1962 65840 Transfer in from:        
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 21/04/1962 65856 Transfer in from:        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 06/05/1962 63342 Transfer in from: 52K Consett    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 06/05/1962 63345 Transfer in from: 52K Consett    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 06/05/1962 63365 Transfer in from: CON Consett    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 06/05/1962 63404 Transfer in from: CON Consett    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 06/05/1962 63418 Transfer in from: CON Consett    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 06/05/1962 63456 Transfer in from: 52K Consett    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 14/05/1962 65787 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 w/e 17/05/1962 64806 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 17/06/1962 61038 Transfer out to: 52C Blaydon    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 17/06/1962 61237 Transfer out to: 52C Blaydon    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 65820 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 09/09/1962 63376 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 16/11/1962 64701 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 16/11/1962 64846 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 16/11/1962 64847 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 26/11/1962 64833 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 03/12/1962 64704 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 03/12/1962 64812 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 03/12/1962 64851 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 03/12/1962 64853 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 03/12/1962 64854 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 17/02/1963 63400 Transfer in from: 52C Blaydon    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 17/02/1963 63458 Transfer in from: 52C Blaydon    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 23/02/1963 65870 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 23/02/1963 65878 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 24/02/1963 63385 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 24/02/1963 63387 Transfer in from: 52C Blaydon    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 24/02/1963 63441 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 24/02/1963 63444 Transfer in from: 52C Blaydon    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 02/03/1963 65869 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 02/03/1963 65874 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 01/04/1963 65883 Condemned      
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 29/04/1963 65850 Condemned      
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 06/05/1963 65887 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 08/06/1963 D2047 Transfer out to: 52E Percy Main    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 08/06/1963 D2050 Transfer out to: 52E Percy Main    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 08/06/1963 D2092 Transfer out to: 52E Percy Main    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 08/06/1963 D2163 Transfer out to: 52E Percy Main    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 08/06/1963 D2164 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 08/06/1963 D2310 Transfer out to: 52E Percy Main    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 08/06/1963 D2329 Transfer out to: 52E Percy Main    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 08/06/1963 D3241 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 08/06/1963 D3242 Transfer out to: 52E Percy Main    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 10/06/1963 63365 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 16/06/1963 63437 Transfer in from: 52C Blaydon    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 65864 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 65870 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 65874 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 65882 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 01/07/1963 63376 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 07/07/1963 63367 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 15/07/1963 63418 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 21/07/1963 63405 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 12/08/1963 63400 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 18/08/1963 63423 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 08/09/1963 63406 Transfer in from: 52K Consett    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 08/09/1963 63433 Transfer in from: CON Consett    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 65870 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 65874 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 65882 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 30/09/1963 63433 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 06/10/1963 63388 Transfer in from: 51F West Auckland    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 13/10/1963 63436 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 13/10/1963 63445 Transfer in from: 55H Neville Hill    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 16/10/1963 63385 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 04/12/1963 63342 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 23/12/1963 63441 Condemned      
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 23/12/1963 65864 Condemned      
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 29/02/1964 65817 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 29/02/1964 65892 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 16/03/1964 63388 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 08/06/1964 63345 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 31/08/1964 63367 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 04/10/1964 63346 Transfer in from: 52K Consett    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 16/11/1964 63423 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 15/12/1964 63456 Condemned      
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 22/02/1965 65845 Condemned      
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 27/02/1965 65841 Transfer in from: PMN Percy Main    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 28/02/1965 62026 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 28/02/1965 62030 Transfer in from: 52d Alnmouth    
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 27/03/1965 65817 Transfer in from: 52E Percy Main    
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 27/03/1965 65823 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 27/03/1965 65856 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 07/05/1965 63395 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 17/05/1965 63404 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 17/05/1965 63444 Condemned      
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 09/08/1965 62030 Condemned      
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 30/08/1965 65841 Condemned      
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 03/10/1965 62007 Transfer in from: 55H Neville Hill    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 03/10/1965 63387 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 05/06/1966 65788 Condemned      
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 19/06/1966 62006 Transfer in from: 52d Alnmouth    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 19/06/1966 62021 Transfer in from: 52d Alnmouth    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 19/06/1966 62023 Transfer in from: 52d Alnmouth    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 19/06/1966 63445 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 19/06/1966 63458 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 31/07/1966 63406 Condemned      
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 04/09/1966 62006 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 10/09/1966 90200 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 10/09/1966 90210 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 10/09/1966 90357 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 on 13/09/1966 90357 Condemned      
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 08/10/1966 65894 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 23/10/1966 62007 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 23/10/1966 62021 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 23/10/1966 62023 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 23/10/1966 62026 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 30/10/1966 65873 Condemned      
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 05/11/1966 65880 Transfer in from: NBH Blyth (North)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 05/11/1966 90074 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 05/11/1966 90078 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 05/11/1966 90348 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 05/11/1966 90395 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 05/11/1966 90417 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 on 27/11/1966 90078 Condemned      
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 03/12/1966 65869 Transfer in from: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 03/12/1966 65892 Transfer in from: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 03/12/1966 90112 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 03/12/1966 90370 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 03/12/1966 65865 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 03/12/1966 65885 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 14/12/1966 63405 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1966 90056 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1966 90135 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1966 90321 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1966 90361 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1966 90382 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1966 90386 Transfer in from: 62C Dunfermline Upper    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1966 90560 Transfer in from: 62C Dunfermline Upper    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1966 90698 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 on 10/01/1967 90112 Condemned      
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 31/01/1967 65872 Condemned      
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 14/02/1967 65853 Condemned      
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 14/02/1967 65869 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 25/02/1967 90386 Transfer out to: 62C Dunfermline Upper    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 25/02/1967 90560 Transfer out to: 62C Dunfermline Upper    
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 25/03/1967 65823 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 25/03/1967 90074 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 25/03/1967 90210 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 24/04/1967 63436 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 on 24/04/1967 90361 Condemned      
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 30/04/1967 62012 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 30/04/1967 62042 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 01/05/1967 65817 Condemned      
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 01/05/1967 65833 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 on 03/05/1967 90056 Condemned      
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 14/05/1967 62026 Transfer in from: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 on 15/05/1967 90370 Condemned      
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 17/05/1967 62012 Condemned      
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 20/05/1967 65811 Transfer in from: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 20/05/1967 65860 Transfer in from: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 20/05/1967 65882 Transfer in from: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 20/05/1967 65885 Transfer in from: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 24/05/1967 65834 Condemned      
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 28/05/1967 62026 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 28/05/1967 62042 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 29/05/1967 63346 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 05/06/1967 63437 Condemned      
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 07/06/1967 65885 Condemned      
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 12/06/1967 65880 Condemned      
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 17/06/1967 65789 Transfer in from: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 17/06/1967 65795 Transfer in from: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 17/06/1967 65804 Transfer in from: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 17/06/1967 65812 Transfer in from:        
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 17/06/1967 65835 Transfer in from:        
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 17/06/1967 65879 Transfer in from: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 01/07/1967 65789 Condemned      
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 01/07/1967 65804 Condemned      
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 01/07/1967 65860 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 on 01/07/1967 90200 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 on 01/07/1967 90321 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 on 05/07/1967 90698 Condemned      
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 12/07/1967 65795 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 15/07/1967 90009 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 15/07/1967 90378 Transfer in from: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 07/08/1967 65892 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 on 01/09/1967 90009 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 09/09/1967 63395 Condemned      
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 09/09/1967 65811 Condemned      
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 09/09/1967 65879 Condemned      
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 09/09/1967 65882 Condemned      
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 09/09/1967 65894 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 09/09/1967 90135 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 09/09/1967 90348 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 09/09/1967 90378 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 09/09/1967 90382 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 09/09/1967 90417 Condemned