Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
16/11/1935 |
5613 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
11/01/1936 |
5210 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
8w/e |
23/03/1946 |
5210 |
Transfer in from: |
SED |
Swansea East Dock |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
8w/e |
23/03/1946 |
9625 |
Transfer in from: |
LDR |
Landore |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
8w/e |
23/03/1946 |
5210 |
Transfer out to: |
SED |
Swansea East Dock |
|
|
Steam |
1854 |
0-6-0PT |
on |
15/06/1947 |
1754 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Unclassified |
0-6-0T |
on |
15/06/1947 |
2166 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2721 |
0-6-0PT |
on |
15/06/1947 |
2789 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
O4 |
0-6-2T |
on |
15/06/1947 |
289 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
15/06/1947 |
3633 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
15/06/1947 |
3641 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
15/06/1947 |
3679 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
A |
0-6-2T |
on |
15/06/1947 |
408 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
on |
15/06/1947 |
4207 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
on |
15/06/1947 |
4265 |
Snapshot |
NEA |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
on |
15/06/1947 |
4282 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
on |
15/06/1947 |
4283 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
on |
15/06/1947 |
4296 |
Snapshot |
LLY |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
A |
0-6-2T |
on |
15/06/1947 |
438 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
on |
15/06/1947 |
5210 |
Snapshot |
SED |
Swansea East Dock |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
on |
15/06/1947 |
5210 |
Snapshot |
SED |
Swansea East Dock |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
on |
15/06/1947 |
5214 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
on |
15/06/1947 |
5221 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
on |
15/06/1947 |
5227 |
Snapshot |
NEA |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
on |
15/06/1947 |
5232 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
on |
15/06/1947 |
5246 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
on |
15/06/1947 |
5253 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
on |
15/06/1947 |
5613 |
Snapshot |
THT |
Treherbert |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
15/06/1947 |
5704 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
15/06/1947 |
5743 |
Snapshot |
CARM |
Carmarthen |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
on |
15/06/1947 |
6695 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
15/06/1947 |
6714 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
P&M ST |
0-4-0ST |
on |
15/06/1947 |
696 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Unclassified |
0-4-0ST |
on |
15/06/1947 |
701 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
72xx |
2-8-2T |
on |
15/06/1947 |
7211 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
15/06/1947 |
7704 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
15/06/1947 |
7756 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
P&M ST |
0-4-0ST |
on |
15/06/1947 |
935 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
15/06/1947 |
9625 |
Snapshot |
SED |
Swansea East Dock |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
15/06/1947 |
9625 |
Snapshot |
SED |
Swansea East Dock |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
15/06/1947 |
9645 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Unclassified |
0-4-0ST |
on |
15/06/1947 |
974 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
15/06/1947 |
9744 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
m/e |
30/06/1948 |
4282 |
Transfer out to: |
NPT |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
m/e |
30/06/1948 |
4296 |
Transfer out to: |
NPT |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
m/e |
30/06/1948 |
5214 |
Transfer out to: |
NPT |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
m/e |
30/06/1948 |
5221 |
Transfer out to: |
NPT |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
m/e |
30/06/1948 |
5253 |
Transfer out to: |
NPT |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
30/10/1948 |
4296 |
Transfer in from: |
NPT |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
30/10/1948 |
5221 |
Transfer in from: |
NPT |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
|
Steam |
72xx |
2-8-2T |
4w/e |
30/10/1948 |
7211 |
Transfer out to: |
LDR |
Landore |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
26/02/1949 |
4265 |
Transfer out to: |
DYD |
Duffryn Yard |
|
|
Steam |
2721 |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
05/1949 |
2789 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
O4 |
0-6-2T |
m/e |
08/1949 |
289 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
10/09/1949 |
5603 |
Transfer in from: |
NPT |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
10/09/1949 |
5616 |
Transfer in from: |
OXF |
Oxford |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
10/09/1949 |
6622 |
Transfer in from: |
ABDR |
Aberdare |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
08/10/1949 |
5628 |
Transfer in from: |
LLY |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
08/10/1949 |
6662 |
Transfer in from: |
OXF |
Oxford |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
08/10/1949 |
5603 |
Transfer out to: |
NEA |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
08/10/1949 |
6622 |
Transfer out to: |
OXF |
Oxford |
|
|
Steam |
1854 |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
12/1949 |
1754 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
03/12/1949 |
6613 |
Transfer in from: |
NEA |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
Unclassified |
0-6-0ST |
4w/e |
22/04/1950 |
1085 |
Transfer in from: |
DG |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
Unclassified |
0-6-0ST |
4w/e |
22/04/1950 |
1146 |
Transfer in from: |
DG |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
15/07/1950 |
4283 |
Transfer out to: |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
Unclassified |
0-6-0ST |
m/e |
01/1951 |
1085 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Unclassified |
0-6-0ST |
m/e |
01/1951 |
1146 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
5211 |
Transfer in from: |
LDR |
Landore |
|
|
Steam |
16xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
20/03/1951 |
1640 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
31/03/1951 |
5211 |
Transfer in from: |
87D |
Swansea East Dock |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
31/03/1951 |
5211 |
Transfer out to: |
87D |
Swansea East Dock |
|
|
Steam |
16xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
21/04/1951 |
1641 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
16xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
30/04/1951 |
1640 |
Transfer in from: |
87D |
Swansea East Dock |
|
|
Steam |
16xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
30/04/1951 |
1640 |
Transfer out to: |
87D |
Swansea East Dock |
|
|
Steam |
16xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
01/05/1951 |
1646 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
16xx |
0-6-0PT |
3w/e |
19/05/1951 |
1641 |
Transfer in from: |
87D |
Swansea East Dock |
|
|
Steam |
16xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
1646 |
Transfer in from: |
87D |
Swansea East Dock |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
3w/e |
19/05/1951 |
6355 |
Transfer in from: |
NEY |
Neyland |
|
|
Steam |
16xx |
0-6-0PT |
3w/e |
19/05/1951 |
1641 |
Transfer out to: |
87D |
Swansea East Dock |
|
|
Steam |
16xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
1646 |
Transfer out to: |
87D |
Swansea East Dock |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
31/03/1952 |
4296 |
Transfer out to: |
86J |
Aberdare |
|
|
Steam |
16xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
1640 |
Transfer out to: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
16xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
1640 |
Transfer in from: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
4207 |
Transfer out to: |
87B |
Duffryn Yard |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
6355 |
Transfer out to: |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
29/11/1952 |
6644 |
Transfer in from: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
4259 |
Transfer in from: |
NEA |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
72xx |
2-8-2T |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
7226 |
Transfer in from: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
72xx |
2-8-2T |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
7248 |
Transfer in from: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
31/01/1953 |
8431 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
31/01/1953 |
9489 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
A |
0-6-2T |
on |
16/02/1953 |
309 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
16xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
1646 |
Transfer out to: |
84J |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
5731 |
Transfer in from: |
DYD |
Duffryn Yard |
|
|
Steam |
16xx |
0-6-0PT |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
1640 |
Transfer out to: |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
72xx |
2-8-2T |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
7224 |
Transfer in from: |
STJ |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
24/04/1954 |
7718 |
Transfer in from: |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
24/04/1954 |
8443 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
24/04/1954 |
6714 |
Transfer out to: |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
A |
0-6-2T |
m/e |
19/06/1954 |
308 |
Transfer out to: |
88B |
Cardiff East Dock |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
4259 |
Transfer out to: |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
5227 |
Transfer out to: |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
|
Steam |
72xx |
2-8-2T |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
7248 |
Transfer out to: |
87E |
Landore |
|
|
Steam |
16xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
31/12/1954 |
1652 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
23/04/1955 |
5240 |
Transfer in from: |
83E |
St Blazey |
|
|
Steam |
Unclassified |
0-6-0T |
m/e |
05/1955 |
2166 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
16/07/1955 |
4221 |
Transfer in from: |
NEA |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
Unclassified |
0-4-0ST |
4w/e |
16/07/1955 |
1144 |
Transfer out to: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
13/08/1955 |
6644 |
Transfer out to: |
87H |
Neyland |
|
|
Steam |
Unclassified |
0-4-0ST |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
1144 |
Transfer in from: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
Unclassified |
0-4-0ST |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
1140 |
Transfer out to: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
28/01/1956 |
5731 |
Transfer out to: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
Unclassified |
0-4-0ST |
w/e |
24/03/1956 |
1140 |
Transfer in from: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
24/03/1956 |
5731 |
Transfer in from: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
21/04/1956 |
4232 |
Transfer in from: |
NEA |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
5262 |
Transfer in from: |
CDF |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
08/09/1956 |
8408 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
08/09/1956 |
8475 |
Transfer in from: |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
08/09/1956 |
8476 |
Transfer in from: |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
08/09/1956 |
8483 |
Transfer in from: |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
08/09/1956 |
9491 |
Transfer in from: |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
08/09/1956 |
3633 |
Transfer out to: |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
08/09/1956 |
3679 |
Transfer out to: |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
08/09/1956 |
5704 |
Transfer out to: |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
08/09/1956 |
5743 |
Transfer out to: |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
08/09/1956 |
9744 |
Transfer out to: |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
9448 |
Transfer in from: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
9485 |
Transfer in from: |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
9492 |
Transfer in from: |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
5731 |
Transfer out to: |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
9448 |
Transfer out to: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
7756 |
Transfer out to: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
9492 |
Transfer out to: |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
8w/e |
20/04/1957 |
7756 |
Transfer in from: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
72xx |
2-8-2T |
4w/e |
13/07/1957 |
7224 |
Transfer out to: |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
72xx |
2-8-2T |
4w/e |
13/07/1957 |
7226 |
Transfer out to: |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
9645 |
Transfer out to: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
72xx |
2-8-2T |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
7215 |
Transfer in from: |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
72xx |
2-8-2T |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
7225 |
Transfer in from: |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
72xx |
2-8-2T |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
7226 |
Transfer in from: |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
72xx |
2-8-2T |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
7248 |
Transfer in from: |
87B |
Duffryn Yard |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
8414 |
Transfer in from: |
88B |
Cardiff East Dock |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
5221 |
Transfer out to: |
87B |
Duffryn Yard |
|
|
Steam |
Unclassified |
0-4-0ST |
m/e |
05/1958 |
1140 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
09/08/1958 |
6613 |
Transfer out to: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
4221 |
Transfer out to: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
5246 |
Transfer out to: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
24/01/1959 |
8423 |
Transfer in from: |
87B |
Duffryn Yard |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
24/01/1959 |
9431 |
Transfer in from: |
87B |
Duffryn Yard |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/03/1959 |
5361 |
Transfer in from: |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
06/1959 |
8443 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
06/1959 |
9491 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
13/06/1959 |
4232 |
Transfer out to: |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
13/06/1959 |
5210 |
Transfer out to: |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
13/06/1959 |
5211 |
Transfer out to: |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
13/06/1959 |
5232 |
Transfer out to: |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
13/06/1959 |
5262 |
Transfer out to: |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
13/06/1959 |
5361 |
Transfer out to: |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
13/06/1959 |
5616 |
Transfer out to: |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
13/06/1959 |
5628 |
Transfer out to: |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
72xx |
2-8-2T |
4w/e |
13/06/1959 |
7215 |
Transfer out to: |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
72xx |
2-8-2T |
4w/e |
13/06/1959 |
7225 |
Transfer out to: |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
72xx |
2-8-2T |
4w/e |
13/06/1959 |
7226 |
Transfer out to: |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
72xx |
2-8-2T |
4w/e |
13/06/1959 |
7248 |
Transfer out to: |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
11/07/1959 |
8418 |
Transfer in from: |
87B |
Duffryn Yard |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
09/1959 |
8408 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
05/09/1959 |
3694 |
Transfer in from: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
05/09/1959 |
47478 |
Transfer in from: |
4C |
Swansea (Upper Bank) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
05/09/1959 |
47479 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
05/09/1959 |
6700 |
Transfer in from: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
05/09/1959 |
6702 |
Transfer in from: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
05/09/1959 |
6712 |
Transfer in from: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
05/09/1959 |
6714 |
Transfer in from: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
05/09/1959 |
6720 |
Transfer in from: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
05/09/1959 |
6738 |
Transfer in from: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
05/09/1959 |
6749 |
Transfer in from: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
05/09/1959 |
6753 |
Transfer in from: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
05/09/1959 |
6763 |
Transfer in from: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
05/09/1959 |
6767 |
Transfer in from: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
05/09/1959 |
6768 |
Transfer in from: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
05/09/1959 |
6770 |
Transfer in from: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
05/09/1959 |
6773 |
Transfer in from: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
05/09/1959 |
6774 |
Transfer in from: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
05/09/1959 |
6776 |
Transfer in from: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
05/09/1959 |
6777 |
Transfer in from: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
05/09/1959 |
6778 |
Transfer in from: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
74xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
05/09/1959 |
7408 |
Transfer in from: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
05/09/1959 |
5240 |
Transfer out to: |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
10/1959 |
6773 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
03/10/1959 |
3661 |
Transfer in from: |
DG |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
03/10/1959 |
4232 |
Transfer in from: |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
03/10/1959 |
5675 |
Transfer in from: |
88A |
Radyr |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
03/10/1959 |
6613 |
Transfer in from: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
03/10/1959 |
47478 |
Transfer out to: |
|
Wolverton Works |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
03/10/1959 |
47479 |
Transfer out to: |
|
Wolverton Works |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
03/10/1959 |
9485 |
Transfer out to: |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
31/10/1959 |
4271 |
Transfer in from: |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
31/10/1959 |
5210 |
Transfer in from: |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
31/10/1959 |
5211 |
Transfer in from: |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
31/10/1959 |
5230 |
Transfer in from: |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
31/10/1959 |
5232 |
Transfer in from: |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
31/10/1959 |
5246 |
Transfer in from: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
31/10/1959 |
5616 |
Transfer in from: |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
31/10/1959 |
5628 |
Transfer in from: |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
31/10/1959 |
6762 |
Transfer in from: |
DG |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
72xx |
2-8-2T |
4w/e |
31/10/1959 |
7215 |
Transfer in from: |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
72xx |
2-8-2T |
4w/e |
31/10/1959 |
7225 |
Transfer in from: |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
72xx |
2-8-2T |
4w/e |
31/10/1959 |
7226 |
Transfer in from: |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
72xx |
2-8-2T |
4w/e |
31/10/1959 |
7248 |
Transfer in from: |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
28/11/1959 |
3694 |
Transfer out to: |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
28/11/1959 |
7756 |
Transfer out to: |
85E |
Gloucester Barnwood |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
28/11/1959 |
8418 |
Transfer out to: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
12/1959 |
6774 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
12/1959 |
8423 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Unclassified |
0-4-0ST |
m/e |
01/1960 |
1144 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
16xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
01/1960 |
1652 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
30/01/1960 |
5704 |
Transfer in from: |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
30/01/1960 |
6719 |
Transfer in from: |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
30/01/1960 |
9744 |
Transfer in from: |
87C |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
16xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
30/01/1960 |
1641 |
Transfer out to: |
88E |
Abercynon |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
30/01/1960 |
6770 |
Transfer out to: |
83F |
Truro |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
05/1960 |
5704 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
21/05/1960 |
3693 |
Transfer in from: |
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
21/05/1960 |
4650 |
Transfer in from: |
SLO |
Slough |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
21/05/1960 |
5783 |
Transfer in from: |
81E |
Didcot |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
21/05/1960 |
6754 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
21/05/1960 |
8488 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
21/05/1960 |
8750 |
Transfer in from: |
81C |
Southall |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
21/05/1960 |
8774 |
Transfer in from: |
SHL |
Southall |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
21/05/1960 |
8798 |
Transfer in from: |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
Unclassified |
0-4-0ST |
4w/e |
18/06/1960 |
1338 |
Transfer in from: |
TN |
Taunton |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
18/06/1960 |
5232 |
Transfer out to: |
87B |
Duffryn Yard |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
18/06/1960 |
5246 |
Transfer out to: |
87B |
Duffryn Yard |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
07/1960 |
6702 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
07/1960 |
6712 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
07/1960 |
6719 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
13/08/1960 |
6755 |
Transfer in from: |
84B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
13/08/1960 |
6757 |
Transfer in from: |
84B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
13/08/1960 |
6765 |
Transfer in from: |
88C |
Barry |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
08/10/1960 |
9749 |
Transfer in from: |
RDG |
Reading (W.R.) |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
05/11/1960 |
5609 |
Transfer in from: |
CV.BRY |
Barry |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
05/11/1960 |
5623 |
Transfer in from: |
88E |
Abercynon |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
05/11/1960 |
6754 |
Transfer out to: |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
09/11/1960 |
9749 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
12/1960 |
7704 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
01/1961 |
6753 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
01/1961 |
6776 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
01/1961 |
8476 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
28/01/1961 |
3648 |
Transfer in from: |
PDN |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
28/01/1961 |
9441 |
Transfer in from: |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
|
Steam |
74xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
28/01/1961 |
7408 |
Transfer out to: |
87G |
Carmarthen |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
25/02/1961 |
6763 |
Transfer out to: |
86B |
Newport Pill |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
25/03/1961 |
6741 |
Transfer in from: |
SDN |
Swindon |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
20/05/1961 |
6764 |
Transfer in from: |
PILL |
Newport Pill |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
20/05/1961 |
9744 |
Transfer out to: |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
06/1961 |
6700 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
06/1961 |
8798 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
17/06/1961 |
3785 |
Transfer in from: |
LDR |
Landore |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
17/06/1961 |
3797 |
Transfer in from: |
LDR |
Landore |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
17/06/1961 |
42182 |
Transfer in from: |
87E |
Landore |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
17/06/1961 |
42305 |
Transfer in from: |
87E |
Landore |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
17/06/1961 |
42307 |
Transfer in from: |
87E |
Landore |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
17/06/1961 |
42385 |
Transfer in from: |
87E |
Landore |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
17/06/1961 |
42387 |
Transfer in from: |
87E |
Landore |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
17/06/1961 |
42388 |
Transfer in from: |
87E |
Landore |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
17/06/1961 |
42394 |
Transfer in from: |
87E |
Landore |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
17/06/1961 |
5631 |
Transfer in from: |
LDR |
Landore |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
17/06/1961 |
6650 |
Transfer in from: |
87E |
Landore |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
17/06/1961 |
6688 |
Transfer in from: |
87E |
Landore |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
17/06/1961 |
8794 |
Transfer in from: |
87E |
Landore |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
17/06/1961 |
9416 |
Transfer in from: |
87E |
Landore |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
17/06/1961 |
9484 |
Transfer in from: |
87E |
Landore |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
17/06/1961 |
9715 |
Transfer in from: |
87E |
Landore |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
17/06/1961 |
9761 |
Transfer in from: |
LDR |
Landore |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
17/06/1961 |
3693 |
Transfer out to: |
87G |
Carmarthen |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
17/06/1961 |
6695 |
Transfer out to: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
17/06/1961 |
8774 |
Transfer out to: |
88A |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
07/1961 |
6720 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
15/07/1961 |
3648 |
Transfer out to: |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
15/07/1961 |
3661 |
Transfer out to: |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
15/07/1961 |
4650 |
Transfer out to: |
86F |
Aberbeeg |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
15/07/1961 |
9715 |
Transfer out to: |
87B |
Duffryn Yard |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
12/08/1961 |
6602 |
Transfer in from: |
87H |
Neyland |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
09/09/1961 |
6688 |
Transfer out to: |
88B |
Radyr |
|
|
Steam |
72xx |
2-8-2T |
4w/e |
09/09/1961 |
7225 |
Transfer out to: |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
27/09/1961 |
42307 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
72xx |
2-8-2T |
4w/e |
02/12/1961 |
7225 |
Transfer in from: |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
01/1962 |
9416 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
02/1962 |
8483 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
03/1962 |
5783 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
m/e |
04/1962 |
42387 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
04/1962 |
7718 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
21/04/1962 |
9752 |
Transfer in from: |
OXY |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
05/1962 |
6778 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
05/1962 |
8750 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
19/05/1962 |
3635 |
Transfer in from: |
83G |
Penzance |
|
|
Steam |
72xx |
2-8-2T |
4w/e |
19/05/1962 |
7244 |
Transfer in from: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
19/05/1962 |
9744 |
Transfer in from: |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
19/05/1962 |
9625 |
Transfer out to: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
06/1962 |
6755 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
07/1962 |
3785 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
14/07/1962 |
4271 |
Transfer out to: |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
15/07/1962 |
80069 |
Transfer in from: |
33B |
Tilbury |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
15/07/1962 |
80072 |
Transfer in from: |
33B |
Tilbury |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
15/07/1962 |
80097 |
Transfer in from: |
30A |
Stratford |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
15/07/1962 |
80099 |
Transfer in from: |
30A |
Stratford |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
15/07/1962 |
80133 |
Transfer in from: |
33C |
Shoeburyness |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
15/07/1962 |
80134 |
Transfer in from: |
33B |
Tilbury |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
08/1962 |
3641 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
12/08/1962 |
42182 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
12/08/1962 |
42394 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
m/e |
09/1962 |
5631 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/09/1962 |
42305 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
08/09/1962 |
42385 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
01/10/1962 |
6738 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
22/10/1962 |
9761 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
30/10/1962 |
6749 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
02/11/1962 |
42388 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
03/11/1962 |
6724 |
Transfer in from: |
86B |
Newport Pill |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
03/11/1962 |
6742 |
Transfer in from: |
86B |
Newport Pill |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
03/11/1962 |
6754 |
Transfer in from: |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
2w/e |
17/11/1962 |
5656 |
Transfer in from: |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
2w/e |
17/11/1962 |
9746 |
Transfer in from: |
LTS |
Llantrisant |
|
|
Steam |
72xx |
2-8-2T |
2w/e |
17/11/1962 |
7244 |
Transfer out to: |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
12/12/1962 |
6757 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
12/12/1962 |
6767 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1153 |
0-4-0ST |
4w/e |
15/12/1962 |
51218 |
Transfer in from: |
82E |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
15/12/1962 |
6760 |
Transfer in from: |
87B |
Duffryn Yard |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
15/12/1962 |
6763 |
Transfer in from: |
86B |
Newport Pill |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
15/12/1962 |
6772 |
Transfer in from: |
86B |
Newport Pill |
|
|
Steam |
72xx |
2-8-2T |
4w/e |
15/12/1962 |
7248 |
Transfer out to: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
18/12/1962 |
6754 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
12/01/1963 |
6764 |
Transfer in from: |
87D |
Swansea East Dock |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
12/01/1963 |
6764 |
Transfer out to: |
87D |
Swansea East Dock |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
09/02/1963 |
8714 |
Transfer in from: |
87B |
Duffryn Yard |
|
|
Steam |
72xx |
2-8-2T |
4w/e |
09/02/1963 |
7225 |
Transfer out to: |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
09/02/1963 |
5628 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
09/02/1963 |
9744 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
03/1963 |
6762 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
09/03/1963 |
5230 |
Transfer in from: |
87D |
Swansea East Dock |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
09/03/1963 |
6680 |
Transfer in from: |
87B |
Duffryn Yard |
|
|
Steam |
72xx |
2-8-2T |
4w/e |
09/03/1963 |
7248 |
Transfer in from: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
09/03/1963 |
5230 |
Transfer out to: |
87D |
Swansea East Dock |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
09/03/1963 |
6613 |
Transfer out to: |
88D |
Merthyr Tydfil |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
09/03/1963 |
6650 |
Transfer out to: |
88C |
Barry |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
m/e |
04/1963 |
6662 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
06/04/1963 |
80133 |
Transfer out to: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
72xx |
2-8-2T |
m/e |
06/1963 |
7215 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
29/06/1963 |
4264 |
Transfer in from: |
86B |
Newport Pill |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
29/06/1963 |
5675 |
Transfer out to: |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
m/e |
07/1963 |
4264 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
07/1963 |
8794 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
0F |
0-4-0ST |
on |
14/07/1963 |
47003 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
14/07/1963 |
80097 |
Transfer out to: |
89D |
Oswestry |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
14/07/1963 |
80099 |
Transfer out to: |
89C |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
27/07/1963 |
4295 |
Transfer in from: |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
27/07/1963 |
5602 |
Transfer in from: |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
27/07/1963 |
9606 |
Transfer in from: |
87G |
Carmarthen |
|
|
Steam |
Unclassified |
0-4-0ST |
m/e |
09/1963 |
1338 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
m/e |
09/1963 |
5616 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
08/09/1963 |
80072 |
Transfer out to: |
2L |
Leamington |
|
|
Steam |
1528 |
0-4-0T |
4w/e |
28/09/1963 |
41535 |
Transfer in from: |
22B |
Gloucester Barnwood |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
m/e |
10/1963 |
4232 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
11/1963 |
6724 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
11/1963 |
9441 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
02/11/1963 |
4227 |
Transfer in from: |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
30/11/1963 |
3671 |
Transfer in from: |
72C |
Yeovil Town |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
30/11/1963 |
3733 |
Transfer in from: |
72C |
Yeovil Town |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
30/11/1963 |
6765 |
Transfer in from: |
87D |
Swansea East Dock |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
30/11/1963 |
9732 |
Transfer in from: |
72C |
Yeovil Town |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
30/11/1963 |
5602 |
Transfer out to: |
88D |
Merthyr Tydfil |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
30/11/1963 |
6765 |
Transfer out to: |
87D |
Swansea East Dock |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
12/1963 |
3733 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
12/1963 |
6714 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
12/1963 |
6741 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
12/1963 |
6742 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
12/1963 |
6760 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
12/1963 |
6763 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
12/1963 |
6764 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
12/1963 |
6772 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
12/1963 |
9752 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
28/12/1963 |
3721 |
Transfer in from: |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
28/12/1963 |
4658 |
Transfer in from: |
87H |
Neyland |
|
|
Steam |
74xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
28/12/1963 |
7404 |
Transfer in from: |
OXF |
Oxford |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
28/12/1963 |
8732 |
Transfer in from: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
28/12/1963 |
8739 |
Transfer in from: |
87J |
Fishguard Goodwick |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
28/12/1963 |
9677 |
Transfer in from: |
87J |
Fishguard Goodwick |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
28/12/1963 |
9748 |
Transfer in from: |
87H |
Neyland |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
28/12/1963 |
4227 |
Transfer out to: |
86B |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
28/12/1963 |
4295 |
Transfer out to: |
88H |
Tondu |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
28/12/1963 |
5210 |
Transfer out to: |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
28/12/1963 |
5211 |
Transfer out to: |
88J |
Aberdare |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
28/12/1963 |
5230 |
Transfer out to: |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
28/12/1963 |
5609 |
Transfer out to: |
88D |
Merthyr Tydfil |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
28/12/1963 |
5623 |
Transfer out to: |
88B |
Radyr |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
28/12/1963 |
5656 |
Transfer out to: |
87E |
Landore |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
28/12/1963 |
6602 |
Transfer out to: |
87E |
Landore |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
28/12/1963 |
6680 |
Transfer out to: |
88B |
Radyr |
|
|
Steam |
72xx |
2-8-2T |
4w/e |
28/12/1963 |
7226 |
Transfer out to: |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
|
Steam |
72xx |
2-8-2T |
4w/e |
28/12/1963 |
7248 |
Transfer out to: |
87E |
Landore |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
01/1964 |
6768 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
01/1964 |
9748 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
25/01/1964 |
3672 |
Transfer in from: |
88A |
Cardiff Cathays |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
25/01/1964 |
4699 |
Transfer in from: |
82E |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
74xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
25/01/1964 |
7427 |
Transfer in from: |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
25/01/1964 |
9660 |
Transfer in from: |
82E |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
25/01/1964 |
9780 |
Transfer in from: |
88H |
Tondu |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
22/02/1964 |
3610 |
Transfer in from: |
87B |
Duffryn Yard |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
03/1964 |
9746 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
04/1964 |
3672 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
04/1964 |
3721 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
04/1964 |
8414 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
04/1964 |
8732 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
04/1964 |
9431 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
04/1964 |
9484 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
04/1964 |
9489 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
04/1964 |
9732 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
6w/e |
13/04/1964 |
80134 |
Transfer out to: |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
0F |
0-4-0ST |
2w/e |
15/04/1964 |
47003 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
05/1964 |
4658 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
05/1964 |
6765 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
05/1964 |
6777 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
3w/e |
04/05/1964 |
3603 |
Transfer in from: |
86J |
Aberdare |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
3w/e |
04/05/1964 |
3615 |
Transfer in from: |
88C |
Barry |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
3w/e |
04/05/1964 |
4663 |
Transfer in from: |
88H |
Tondu |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
3w/e |
04/05/1964 |
9446 |
Transfer in from: |
86F |
Aberbeeg |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
3w/e |
04/05/1964 |
9472 |
Transfer in from: |
88B |
Radyr |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
3w/e |
04/05/1964 |
9473 |
Transfer in from: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
3w/e |
04/05/1964 |
9480 |
Transfer in from: |
88B |
Radyr |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
3w/e |
04/05/1964 |
9675 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
3w/e |
04/05/1964 |
9678 |
Transfer in from: |
88J |
Aberdare |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
17/05/1964 |
3635 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
17/05/1964 |
8739 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
06/1964 |
4699 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
74xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
06/1964 |
7404 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
74xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
06/1964 |
7427 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
7w/e |
22/06/1964 |
3603 |
Transfer out to: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
7w/e |
22/06/1964 |
3610 |
Transfer out to: |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
7w/e |
22/06/1964 |
3615 |
Transfer out to: |
88C |
Barry |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
7w/e |
22/06/1964 |
3671 |
Transfer out to: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
7w/e |
22/06/1964 |
3797 |
Transfer out to: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
1528 |
0-4-0T |
7w/e |
22/06/1964 |
41535 |
Transfer out to: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
7w/e |
22/06/1964 |
4663 |
Transfer out to: |
86F |
Aberbeeg |
|
|
Steam |
1153 |
0-4-0ST |
7w/e |
22/06/1964 |
51218 |
Transfer out to: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
7w/e |
22/06/1964 |
8431 |
Transfer out to: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
7w/e |
22/06/1964 |
8475 |
Transfer out to: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
7w/e |
22/06/1964 |
8488 |
Transfer out to: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
7w/e |
22/06/1964 |
9446 |
Transfer out to: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
7w/e |
22/06/1964 |
9472 |
Transfer out to: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
7w/e |
22/06/1964 |
9473 |
Transfer out to: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
7w/e |
22/06/1964 |
9480 |
Transfer out to: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
7w/e |
22/06/1964 |
9660 |
Transfer out to: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
7w/e |
22/06/1964 |
9675 |
Transfer out to: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
7w/e |
22/06/1964 |
9677 |
Transfer out to: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
7w/e |
22/06/1964 |
9678 |
Transfer out to: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
7w/e |
22/06/1964 |
9780 |
Transfer out to: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
20/07/1964 |
9606 |
Transfer out to: |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
09/08/1964 |
80069 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
6w/e |
12/10/1964 |
8714 |
Transfer out to: |
82E |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|