Depot: Tyseley
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 4600 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 13/06/1914 | 4600 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 4600 | 4-4-2T | on | 20/05/1915 | 4600 | Transfer out to: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 27/07/1929 | 4037 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/08/1929 | 4037 | Transfer out to: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/10/1932 | 4093 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 24/10/1932 | 4093 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Duke | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 3274 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 4355 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 5116 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 5316 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 1747 | Transfer in from: | LMTN | Leamington | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 4501 | Transfer in from: | LMTN | Leamington | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 5166 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Duke | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 3274 | Transfer out to: | Tys | Stratford-on-Avon (GWR) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 4993 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 4355 | Transfer out to: | SALOP | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/02/1936 | 5037 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1936 | 5037 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 5182 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 5370 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1938 | 4000 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 04/1938 | 4000 | Transfer out to: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | 5182 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | 5182 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | 2209 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | 2297 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | 3180 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1946 | 2238 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1947 | 9008 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | on | 15/06/1947 | 1747 | Snapshot | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2065 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2071 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2090 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2152 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2209 | Snapshot | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2209 | Snapshot | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2238 | Snapshot | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2238 | Snapshot | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2257 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2292 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2296 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2297 | Snapshot | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2297 | Snapshot | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | on | 15/06/1947 | 2719 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2733 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2903 | Snapshot | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2916 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2988 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 31xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 3101 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 3151 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 3158 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 3180 | Snapshot | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 3180 | Snapshot | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3613 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3624 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3625 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3650 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3653 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3657 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3660 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3664 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3673 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3689 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3693 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3743 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4058 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4106 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4107 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4111 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4116 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4147 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4501 | Snapshot | MCH | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4605 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4620 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4648 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4683 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4917 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4924 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4930 | Snapshot | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4934 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4939 | Snapshot | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4959 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4967 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4992 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4993 | Snapshot | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4993 | Snapshot | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4999 | Snapshot | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5102 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5103 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5106 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5117 | Snapshot | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5121 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5125 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5129 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5152 | Snapshot | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5156 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5162 | Snapshot | Tys | Stratford-on-Avon (GWR) | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5164 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5166 | Snapshot | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5166 | Snapshot | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5171 | Snapshot | Tys | Stratford-on-Avon (GWR) | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5175 | Snapshot | Tys | Stratford-on-Avon (GWR) | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5182 | Snapshot | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5182 | Snapshot | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5188 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5190 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5198 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5199 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5316 | Snapshot | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5346 | Snapshot | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5369 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5370 | Snapshot | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5370 | Snapshot | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5634 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5700 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5701 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5738 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5742 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5745 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5790 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5907 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5993 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5997 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6336 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6611 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6831 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6833 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6843 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6847 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6853 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6855 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6858 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6860 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6866 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6904 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6914 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7402 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7735 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7758 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 8107 | Snapshot | WTD | Whitland | ||
Steam | 81xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 8108 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8700 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8784 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 9007 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 9008 | Snapshot | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 9008 | Snapshot | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 9010 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 9019 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9608 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9610 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9635 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9724 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9733 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9748 | Snapshot | WLN | Wellington | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9753 | Snapshot | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9793 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9798 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | on | 02/08/1947 | 2733 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | 2203 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | 2257 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | 2257 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | 2203 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | 2206 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | 2238 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | 3151 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | 5198 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Duke | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | 9091 | Transfer in from: | MCH | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | 2203 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | 2238 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | 3151 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | 5121 | Transfer out to: | WLN | Wellington | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | 5198 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1948 | 2257 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 31/03/1948 | 5187 | Transfer in from: | LMTN | Leamington | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1948 | 2257 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 04/1948 | 3158 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/04/1948 | 2209 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/04/1948 | 2238 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 30/04/1948 | 5166 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 30/04/1948 | 5198 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/04/1948 | 6855 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | m/e | 30/04/1948 | 9019 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 30/04/1948 | 2071 | Transfer out to: | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/04/1948 | 2209 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/04/1948 | 2238 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 30/04/1948 | 5166 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 30/04/1948 | 5198 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/04/1948 | 6855 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | m/e | 30/04/1948 | 9019 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | 2257 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 31/05/1948 | 3769 | Transfer in from: | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | 2257 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 31/05/1948 | 4620 | Transfer out to: | LTS | Llantrisant | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | 2988 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 2203 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 2209 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 2297 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 4107 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 4159 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 5166 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 6855 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 2203 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 2209 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 2297 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 4107 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 5129 | Transfer out to: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 5166 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 6855 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | m/e | 07/1948 | 9007 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 2203 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 2292 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 2297 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 6831 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 2203 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 2292 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 2297 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 6831 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/07/1948 | 2916 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 2209 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 2292 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 4930 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 6831 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 2209 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 2292 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 4930 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 6831 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 2292 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 4107 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 4110 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 4930 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 7317 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 2292 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 4107 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 4930 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 18/10/1948 | 4166 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 2292 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 4107 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 6858 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 2292 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 4107 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 4934 | Transfer out to: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 4967 | Transfer out to: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 4992 | Transfer out to: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 5125 | Transfer out to: | WLN | Wellington | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 5745 | Transfer out to: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 6858 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | m/e | 11/1948 | 9019 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 4917 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 5745 | Transfer in from: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 6858 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 4917 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 4930 | Transfer out to: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 6858 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 2292 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 4107 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 4917 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 6866 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 7438 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 2065 | Transfer out to: | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 2292 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 2719 | Transfer out to: | WLN | Wellington | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 4107 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 4917 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 4939 | Transfer out to: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 6866 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 2292 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 2719 | Transfer in from: | WLN | Wellington | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 4964 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 6942 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 2152 | Transfer out to: | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 2292 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Duke | 4-4-0 | m/e | 02/1949 | 9091 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/02/1949 | 4076 | Transfer in from: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | 2065 | Transfer in from: | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | 2203 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | 5190 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | 6866 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | 2203 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | 5190 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | 6866 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | 6914 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1949 | 4076 | Transfer out to: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 2203 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 2206 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 4980 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 5916 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 5927 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 2203 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 2206 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 5103 | Transfer out to: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 6831 | Transfer out to: | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 6860 | Transfer out to: | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | 2206 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | 2238 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | 2849 | Transfer in from: | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | 4101 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | 2206 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | 2209 | Transfer out to: | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | 2238 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 05/1949 | 5117 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 2297 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 3658 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 5190 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 2297 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 5190 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | 2238 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | 2257 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | 2297 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | 4101 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | 4110 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | 7317 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | 9614 | Transfer in from: | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | 2238 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | 2257 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | 2297 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | 4058 | Transfer out to: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | 4101 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | 4110 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | 7317 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | 9614 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | 9614 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 2238 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 2257 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 2292 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 4110 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5190 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5909 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 7317 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 2238 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 2257 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 2292 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 4110 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 4648 | Transfer out to: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5190 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 7317 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | 7800 | Transfer in from: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | 2719 | Transfer out to: | WLN | Wellington | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | 2238 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | 3837 | Transfer in from: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | 2238 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | 2206 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | 2238 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | 4648 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | 2206 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | 2238 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | 3613 | Transfer out to: | WLN | Wellington | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | 5199 | Transfer out to: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | 6833 | Transfer out to: | LMTN | Leamington | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 31/10/1949 | 8452 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 11/1949 | 2065 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 2206 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 2238 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 2292 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 2296 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 3646 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 5190 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 2206 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 2238 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 2292 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 2296 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 5190 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 2903 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | 4917 | Transfer out to: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | 4993 | Transfer out to: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | 4999 | Transfer out to: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 31/12/1949 | 8405 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 31/12/1949 | 8407 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 2206 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 2238 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 2848 | Transfer in from: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 2867 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 3619 | Transfer in from: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 5190 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 5909 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 2206 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 2238 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 5162 | Transfer out to: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 5190 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 5909 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | 2297 | Transfer out to: | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | 5701 | Transfer out to: | WLN | Wellington | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 2203 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 2296 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 3751 | Transfer in from: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 5182 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 5190 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 5736 | Transfer in from: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 2203 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 2296 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 5182 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 5190 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 8405 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 8407 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 2203 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 4157 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 4159 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 5182 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 2203 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 4159 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 5182 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 5742 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 6855 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 2203 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 2206 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 8417 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 2203 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 2206 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 2203 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 2206 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 7713 | Transfer in from: | DID | Didcot | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 2203 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 2206 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 2296 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 2203 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 2296 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 2203 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 2206 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 2292 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 2203 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 2257 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 5333 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 2203 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 2257 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 2932 | Transfer in from: | HFD | Hereford | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 6971 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 7912 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 7913 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 7918 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 2932 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 6971 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 7912 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 7913 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 7918 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 2932 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 6971 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 7912 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 7913 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 7918 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 6942 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 30/11/1950 | 9432 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 4337 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 7929 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 4980 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 7800 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 2206 | Transfer in from: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 2292 | Transfer in from: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 7929 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 4337 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 7929 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 8784 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 2206 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 2257 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 2292 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 5909 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 8463 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 2206 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 2257 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 2292 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 4683 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 5909 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 5993 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 2257 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 4159 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 5909 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 7922 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 8463 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 8468 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 2206 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 2257 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 4159 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 5909 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 8463 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 2257 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 4159 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 7922 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 8468 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 2257 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 4159 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 7922 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 8468 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 2203 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 5909 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 2203 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 5909 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 7922 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 12071 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 12072 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 12087 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 5151 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 05/1951 | 5346 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 2257 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 5102 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 2257 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 3658 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 4605 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 5102 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 5151 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1951 | 2932 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 2257 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 4157 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 2257 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 3664 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 3743 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 3751 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 4157 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 6611 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 8452 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 9793 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 15101 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 15103 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 2257 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 4157 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 2257 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 4157 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 2257 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 2292 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 7800 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 2090 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 2257 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 2292 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 5369 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 2257 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 2292 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 7800 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 2257 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 2292 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 7800 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 4159 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 5102 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 2238 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 4159 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 5102 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 4159 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 5102 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 4159 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 5102 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 2292 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 2296 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 2292 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 2296 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 3619 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 3624 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 5700 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 2292 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 2296 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 2292 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 2296 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 4159 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 5106 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 5972 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 5993 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 4159 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 5106 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 7800 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 2238 | Transfer in from: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 5369 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 2203 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 2203 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 5102 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 5106 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 2203 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 5102 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 5106 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 2203 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 2203 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 2203 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 5102 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 5106 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 2203 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 5102 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 5106 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | on | 13/02/1952 | 9008 | To Store | ||||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | on | 13/02/1952 | 9010 | To Store | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 2292 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 2296 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 4172 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 5106 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 2292 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 2296 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 5106 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/02/1952 | 2203 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 03/1952 | 3151 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 5634 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 2292 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 2296 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 4172 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 5106 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 2292 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 2296 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 4172 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 5106 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | on | 04/04/1952 | 82000 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | on | 18/04/1952 | 82001 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 82000 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 82001 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 5993 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 5997 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 82000 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 82001 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | on | 28/04/1952 | 82002 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | on | 02/05/1952 | 82003 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | on | 14/05/1952 | 82004 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | on | 16/05/1952 | 82005 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 82002 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 82003 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 82004 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 82005 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 82002 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 82003 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 82004 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 82005 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | on | 27/05/1952 | 82006 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | on | 30/05/1952 | 82007 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | on | 05/06/1952 | 82008 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | on | 13/06/1952 | 82009 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 5102 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 5106 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 5912 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 7800 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 82001 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 82002 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 82003 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 82006 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 82007 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 82008 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 82009 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 2292 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 5102 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 5106 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 82001 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 82002 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 82003 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 82006 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 82007 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 82008 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 82009 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 5102 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 5106 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 5912 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 7800 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 5102 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 5106 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 5912 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 7800 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 2826 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 3829 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 4166 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 5187 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 5916 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 9798 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 2257 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 5738 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 7735 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 2292 | Transfer in from: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 5391 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/11/1952 | 13000 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 13001 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 13002 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 2257 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 2856 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 3839 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 5386 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 6321 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 31xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 3101 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 4101 | Transfer out to: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 4106 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 4107 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 4147 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 4157 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 4159 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 4959 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 5102 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 5171 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 5175 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 5182 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 5188 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 5190 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 5972 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 6847 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 7800 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/11/1952 | 13003 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/11/1952 | 13004 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 31xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 3101 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 7735 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 9798 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 2292 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 4924 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 5106 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 5391 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 12071 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 6938 | Transfer in from: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 12072 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 12087 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 15101 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 5112 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 5163 | Transfer in from: | LMTN | Leamington | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 5738 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 5900 | Transfer in from: | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 6307 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 7309 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 7818 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 3180 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 2203 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 4934 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 5322 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 82001 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 82002 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 82003 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 7309 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 7402 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 82001 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 82002 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 82003 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 6342 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 5745 | Transfer out to: | 84H | Wellington | ||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 5112 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 82000 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/09/1953 | 13025 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 5195 | Transfer in from: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 3657 | Transfer out to: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 9748 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/10/1953 | 13026 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/10/1953 | 13027 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/10/1953 | 13028 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/10/1953 | 13029 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 3694 | Transfer in from: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5181 | Transfer in from: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5724 | Transfer in from: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6105 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6118 | Transfer in from: | DID | Didcot | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6121 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6134 | Transfer in from: | DID | Didcot | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6139 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6166 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6614 | Transfer in from: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6620 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6668 | Transfer in from: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6669 | Transfer in from: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 8462 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 3653 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 3837 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5195 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82001 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82002 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82003 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82004 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82005 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82006 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82007 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82008 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82009 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 8463 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 4103 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6116 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6646 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 3650 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6121 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 8462 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 9610 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 6394 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 9303 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 9319 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 15103 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 3694 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 4103 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 4934 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 5724 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 5907 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 6646 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 6938 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 7821 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 13000 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 13001 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 13002 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 13003 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 2279 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 6327 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 4171 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 4904 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 5192 | Transfer in from: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 2826 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 2867 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 3829 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 4171 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 6858 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 5322 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 6336 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 4178 | Transfer in from: | 84H | Wellington | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 5909 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 6327 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 4178 | Transfer out to: | 84H | Wellington | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 6394 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 31/03/1955 | 9498 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 6105 | Transfer out to: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 4155 | Transfer in from: | 84H | Wellington | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 4915 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 6105 | Transfer in from: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 6980 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 8407 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 9426 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 5164 | Transfer out to: | 84H | Wellington | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 7912 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 7913 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 2857 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 5986 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 7912 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 7913 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 4915 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 6843 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 6980 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 7929 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 8407 | Transfer out to: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 9426 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 6644 | Transfer in from: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 4988 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 7908 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 5152 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 5986 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 7763 | Transfer in from: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 3646 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 6861 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 4964 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 5900 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 13192 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 6620 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 8713 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 3769 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 5736 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Newport Pill | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 6644 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 03/1956 | 6321 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 5317 | Transfer in from: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 2851 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 2898 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 7812 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 7813 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 2296 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 6614 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 6669 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 5325 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 7812 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 7813 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 9319 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 6620 | Transfer in from: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 9308 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 6620 | Transfer out to: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 9303 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 11/1956 | 5317 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 73036 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 73037 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 9308 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 2897 | Transfer in from: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 2848 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 4110 | Transfer out to: | 84H | Wellington | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 2841 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 4146 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 5391 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 4943 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 5984 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 03/1957 | 5391 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 13037 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 4125 | Transfer in from: | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 4127 | Transfer in from: | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 6631 | Transfer in from: | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 2841 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 13037 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 4146 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 5738 | Transfer out to: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 7758 | Transfer out to: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 6160 | Transfer in from: | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 4904 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 08/1957 | 5325 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 31xx | 2-6-2T | on | 09/1957 | 3101 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 5378 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 6160 | Transfer out to: | 81B | Slough | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 5341 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 5651 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 5984 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 4125 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 4127 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 5156 | Transfer out to: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 5166 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 5181 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 5198 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 5790 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 6166 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 9608 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 6134 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 9498 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 2809 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 2898 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 5386 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 6342 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 73036 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 73037 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 4943 | Transfer out to: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 2886 | Transfer in from: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 3831 | Transfer in from: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 4161 | Transfer in from: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 4162 | Transfer in from: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 6357 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 4988 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 7913 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 4125 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 2885 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 2809 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 2857 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 5345 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 6305 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 6337 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 6360 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 6367 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 6377 | Transfer in from: | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 6391 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 9305 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 4125 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 6118 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 2812 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 2882 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 4116 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 5345 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 6305 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 6360 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 6367 | Transfer out to: | 85D | Kidderminster | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 6391 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5606 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5658 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 6377 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 9305 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 4161 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 4162 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 5651 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 6337 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 4974 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 4982 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 4126 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 6399 | Transfer in from: | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1959 | 2279 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 01/1959 | 2812 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 3689 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 5333 | Transfer out to: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 5606 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 02/1959 | 7438 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 2267 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 03/1959 | 8417 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 7420 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 48402 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 48412 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 48415 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 48417 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 48418 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 48424 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 48430 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 48444 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 48471 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 75005 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 75006 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 75020 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 75026 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 2851 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 2856 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 2882 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 2885 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 2897 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 3831 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 3839 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 5378 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 6307 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 6357 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 05/1959 | 7735 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 06/1959 | 2238 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/06/1959 | 2211 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/06/1959 | 48475 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 13/06/1959 | 8737 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/06/1959 | 48412 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 07/1959 | 5341 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 07/1959 | 7420 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 5318 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 5322 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 75020 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 75026 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 7818 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 7821 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 7424 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 75000 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 75024 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 7824 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 5322 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 5370 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 6904 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 7713 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 5959 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 5318 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 8713 | Transfer out to: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 8737 | Transfer out to: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 11/1959 | 5163 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 11/1959 | 6399 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 11/1959 | 7763 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 11/1959 | 9432 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 5930 | Transfer in from: | MC | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 6871 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 8713 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 2849 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 6105 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 6139 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 4902 | Transfer in from: | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 9614 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 9733 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 5167 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 6364 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 9614 | Transfer in from: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 9733 | Transfer in from: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 6871 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | D3518 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 48460 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 4902 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 6855 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 6879 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 2886 | Transfer out to: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 4974 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 5167 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 5912 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 5930 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 05/1960 | 8468 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 3693 | Transfer out to: | 87D | Swansea East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/05/1960 | D3966 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | D3748 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | D3950 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | D3951 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | D3952 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | D3956 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | D3957 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | D3958 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 5921 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/06/1960 | D3973 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | D3968 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | D3969 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 4120 | Transfer in from: | 84H | Wellington | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 4910 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 75003 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | D3026 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | D3027 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | D3028 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | D3748 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 75005 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/07/1960 | D3981 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/07/1960 | D3982 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/08/1960 | D3984 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/08/1960 | D3983 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/08/1960 | D3985 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/08/1960 | D3986 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | D3965 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | D3974 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | D3975 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | D3025 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | D3029 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 48444 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 48471 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 48475 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/08/1960 | D3987 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/08/1960 | D3988 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/09/1960 | D3989 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/09/1960 | D3990 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/09/1960 | D3991 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | D3004 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | D3192 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | D3981 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | D3982 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/09/1960 | D3992 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/09/1960 | D3993 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/10/1960 | D3994 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/10/1960 | D3996 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/10/1960 | D3995 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/10/1960 | D3997 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 4105 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 5174 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 7806 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 7816 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | D3986 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | D3988 | Transfer out to: | 85D | Bromsgrove | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | D3989 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | D3991 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 4910 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 5921 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/10/1960 | D3998 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/10/1960 | D3999 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/10/1960 | D4000 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/11/1960 | D4001 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 7813 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | D3987 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | D3990 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | D3993 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 5369 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 6364 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 81xx | 2-6-2T | on | 29/11/1960 | 8108 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 81xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 8109 | Transfer in from: | LMTN | Leamington | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 2211 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 2257 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 2267 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | D3995 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | D3996 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | D3997 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | D3998 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | D3999 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 4120 | Transfer out to: | 84H | Wellington | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 7317 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 19/12/1960 | 5026 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 6101 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | D3994 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | D4000 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | D4001 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 48418 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 75029 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 7808 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 48415 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 4982 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 75000 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 7806 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 7824 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 3831 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 3839 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 5965 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 6618 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 7426 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 48402 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 48417 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 48424 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 48430 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 48460 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 19/05/1961 | 5026 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 3816 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 4167 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 9733 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 4125 | Transfer in from: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 6618 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 9614 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 4110 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 4157 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 4954 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 5926 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 5983 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 6604 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 6609 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 6926 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 6930 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 3831 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | D3973 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 7816 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 11/1961 | 5174 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D3992 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D3992 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 5192 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 05/11/1961 | 4133 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 3776 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | D3973 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/12/1961 | D3992 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 01/1962 | 4126 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 4125 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 02/1962 | 8700 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 03/1962 | 6101 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 03/1962 | 8713 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 9635 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 5926 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 7912 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1962 | 5965 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 4120 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 7929 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 92000 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 92212 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | D3518 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 4110 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 4157 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 6116 | Transfer out to: | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 92234 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1962 | 5959 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 4158 | Transfer in from: | 84H | Wellington | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6604 | Transfer out to: | 89B | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6631 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 6952 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 3816 | Transfer out to: | 88J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 3839 | Transfer out to: | 88J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 4105 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 4120 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 6855 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 75006 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 7808 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 3802 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 3829 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 3865 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 7915 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 3776 | Transfer out to: | 84H | Wellington | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 4133 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 7813 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 6845 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 7802 | Transfer in from: | MCH | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 7823 | Transfer in from: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 92001 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 5658 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 6668 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 6952 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 75024 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 75029 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 92000 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | D3965 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | D3966 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | 9798 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/03/1963 | 48412 | Transfer in from: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/03/1963 | 48474 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/03/1963 | 48475 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 3829 | Transfer out to: | 89B | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 3865 | Transfer out to: | 89B | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 3770 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 3802 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 3660 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 92002 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 15/05/1963 | 92002 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 15/05/1963 | 92002 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1963 | 48110 | Transfer in from: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1963 | 48452 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1963 | 5988 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1963 | 7805 | Transfer in from: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 4933 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 5942 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6646 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 4172 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 07/1963 | 7426 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 14/07/1963 | 7413 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Hereford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/08/1963 | D3956 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 09/1963 | 6609 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 48415 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 48424 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 92204 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 92215 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 92217 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 4933 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 5942 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 7802 | Transfer out to: | 6F | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 06/10/1963 | 6137 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/10/1963 | 75003 | Transfer out to: | 83E | Yeovil Town | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 92085 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 6137 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 01/12/1963 | 6633 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/02/1964 | 48110 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | w/e | 21/03/1964 | 5606 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | w/e | 21/03/1964 | 5684 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 21/03/1964 | 7413 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 21/03/1964 | 7424 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 11/04/1964 | 4179 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1964 | 6834 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1964 | 6842 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1964 | 6925 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1964 | 6933 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 05/1964 | 3673 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 05/1964 | 4167 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 05/1964 | 6646 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 17/05/1964 | 3635 | Transfer in from: | 87D | Swansea East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 17/05/1964 | 4635 | Transfer in from: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 23/05/1964 | 92223 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 23/05/1964 | 92150 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1964 | 6834 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 14/06/1964 | 5014 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 14/06/1964 | 5091 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 6667 | Transfer in from: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/06/1964 | 7013 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 75014 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 48452 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 6925 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 6933 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 92150 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 27/06/1964 | 7014 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 27/06/1964 | 7026 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1964 | 7823 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 4954 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 92002 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 9774 | Transfer in from: | 84H | Wellington | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 9724 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1964 | 4648 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1964 | 6845 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1964 | 7013 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 06/09/1964 | 6681 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 75014 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 92085 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 92234 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1964 | 5927 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1964 | 6971 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1964 | 7026 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 12062 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 12066 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 12077 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/10/1964 | D3973 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/10/1964 | D3974 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/10/1964 | D3975 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 03/10/1964 | 5091 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 4178 | Transfer in from: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1964 | 6842 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 6922 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 6964 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 92002 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 92118 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 48475 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1964 | 7805 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 02/1965 | 4179 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1965 | 5014 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1965 | 7014 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1965 | 7918 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/02/1965 | 48412 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/02/1965 | 48424 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 4125 | Transfer in from: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 04/1965 | 3635 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 04/1965 | 3770 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 04/1965 | 5983 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 04/1965 | 6922 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 25/04/1965 | 5605 | Transfer in from: | 88D | Rhymney | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 05/1965 | 6633 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1965 | 6866 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1965 | 6926 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 05/1965 | 9753 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 6855 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 6857 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 6864 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 6964 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/05/1965 | 6862 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/05/1965 | 6930 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 06/1965 | 4125 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 06/1965 | 4158 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1965 | 6862 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 81xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 06/1965 | 8109 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1965 | 6858 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 46428 | Transfer in from: | 2L | Leamington | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 46442 | Transfer in from: | 2L | Leamington | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 46457 | Transfer in from: | 2L | Leamington | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 46470 | Transfer in from: | 2L | Leamington | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 6644 | Transfer in from: | 2L | Leamington | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 6851 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 6854 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 73026 | Transfer in from: | 2L | Leamington | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 73066 | Transfer in from: | 2L | Leamington | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 73069 | Transfer in from: | 2L | Leamington | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 73156 | Transfer in from: | 2L | Leamington | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 4178 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 48415 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 48474 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 07/1965 | 5684 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 07/1965 | 6644 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 17/07/1965 | 4147 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 17/07/1965 | 4168 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | w/e | 17/07/1965 | 6625 | Transfer in from: | 89B | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | w/e | 17/07/1965 | 6665 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/07/1965 | 75006 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1965 | 6851 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1965 | 7929 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 09/1965 | 4111 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 09/1965 | 4155 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1965 | 6854 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 10/1965 | 4147 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 10/1965 | 4168 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1965 | 5988 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 10/1965 | 6665 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 10/1965 | 6681 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1965 | 6853 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1965 | 6855 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1965 | 6857 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1965 | 6858 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1965 | 6861 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1965 | 6864 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1965 | 6879 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1965 | 7908 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1965 | 7915 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 44661 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 44663 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 44666 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 44760 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 44774 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 44776 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 44777 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 44780 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 44865 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 44985 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45038 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45051 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45052 | Transfer in from: | 2J | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45134 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45287 | Transfer in from: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45292 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45302 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45349 | Transfer in from: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 92087 | Transfer in from: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 44859 | Transfer in from: | 2J | Aston | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | w/e | 23/10/1965 | 6697 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/10/1965 | 6951 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/10/1965 | 6952 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/10/1965 | 12077 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 11/1965 | 6625 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 11/1965 | 6667 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | D3026 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 6697 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 75006 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 45264 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 5606 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1965 | 6951 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1965 | 6952 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 44762 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 5605 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 46509 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/01/1966 | 44760 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/01/1966 | 44985 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/01/1966 | 45038 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/01/1966 | 45302 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 48035 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 48061 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 48477 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/02/1966 | D3956 | Transfer in from: | 2H | Monument Lane | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/03/1966 | D3085 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/03/1966 | 46522 | Transfer in from: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/03/1966 | D3984 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 46522 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/04/1966 | 46522 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1966 | 44777 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1966 | 45264 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1966 | 73026 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1966 | 73066 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1966 | 73069 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1966 | 73156 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1966 | 48669 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 07/1966 | 3625 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 07/1966 | 4635 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 16/07/1966 | 3607 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 16/07/1966 | 3619 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/07/1966 | 46427 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 16/07/1966 | 4646 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 16/07/1966 | 4696 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/07/1966 | 46522 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 30/07/1966 | 92217 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/08/1966 | 44666 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/08/1966 | 44774 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 20/08/1966 | 92204 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1966 | 3619 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1966 | 44859 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/09/1966 | 48477 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 44780 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 45134 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 45287 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 10/1966 | 3607 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1966 | 12062 | Transfer out to: | Crewe Works | |||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D3105 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D3106 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D3108 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D3109 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D3110 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 46428 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 46427 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 46442 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 46509 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/10/1966 | 46457 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/10/1966 | 46470 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 29/10/1966 | 92001 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 29/10/1966 | 92212 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 29/10/1966 | 92215 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 11/1966 | 4646 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 11/1966 | 4696 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 11/1966 | 9774 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 44661 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 44663 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 44762 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 44776 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 44865 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 45051 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 45052 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 45292 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 45349 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 48061 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 48669 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 92002 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 92087 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 92118 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 92223 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D2386 | Transfer in from: | 21E | Monument Lane | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D2387 | Transfer in from: | 21E | Monument Lane | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D2395 | Transfer in from: | 21E | Monument Lane | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D2386 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D2387 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D2395 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 48035 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 12066 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3085 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/10/1967 | D3109 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/10/1967 | D3950 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/10/1967 | D3985 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/06/1968 | D3026 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/10/1968 | D3105 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/09/1969 | D3112 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/09/1969 | D3191 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/09/1969 | D3106 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/09/1969 | D3108 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/11/1969 | D3191 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D3110 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D3112 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D3983 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/10/1971 | D3905 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1971 | D3957 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D3951 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D3969 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/07/1972 | D3908 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/07/1972 | D3905 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/02/1974 | D3908 | Transfer out to: | SY | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | 08800 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 24/01/1976 | 08788 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/1981 | 08928 | Transfer in from: | SY | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/05/1988 | 08928 | Transfer out to: | AF | Ashford Chart Leacon |