Depot: Wellington
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 2717 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Barnum | 2-4-0 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 3223 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 4409 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 9748 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Duke | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 3258 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 5127 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Bird | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 3445 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Duke | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 3258 | Transfer out to: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Barnum | 2-4-0 | m/e | 05/1936 | 3223 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1945 | 5332 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | 5309 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2030 | Snapshot | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | on | 15/06/1947 | 2717 | Snapshot | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3417 | Snapshot | Tys | Stratford-on-Avon (GWR) | ||
Steam | Bird | 4-4-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3445 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3732 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3749 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3775 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4400 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4401 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4403 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4406 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4409 | Snapshot | WLN | Wellington | ||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4409 | Snapshot | WLN | Wellington | ||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5127 | Snapshot | WLN | Wellington | ||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5127 | Snapshot | WLN | Wellington | ||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5135 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5139 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5146 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5178 | Snapshot | LMTN | Leamington | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5309 | Snapshot | WLN | Wellington | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5309 | Snapshot | WLN | Wellington | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5332 | Snapshot | WLN | Wellington | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5332 | Snapshot | WLN | Wellington | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5758 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9624 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9630 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9639 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9748 | Snapshot | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | 5121 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | m/e | 04/1948 | 3417 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 30/04/1948 | 5332 | Transfer out to: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 05/1948 | 5127 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 05/1948 | 5146 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | 5309 | Transfer out to: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 10/1948 | 5121 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 5125 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 5138 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 2719 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 2719 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 7754 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 08/1949 | 5135 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | 2719 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | 3687 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | 2067 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | 2719 | Transfer in from: | WLN | Wellington | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | 3613 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | 5109 | Transfer in from: | LMTN | Leamington | ||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | 2719 | Transfer out to: | WLN | Wellington | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 23/12/1949 | 1619 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 3760 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 2067 | Transfer out to: | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 2719 | Transfer out to: | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 4409 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | 5701 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 3760 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 3760 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 3760 | Transfer in from: | 84H | Wellington | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 3760 | Transfer out to: | 84H | Wellington | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 3775 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 04/1951 | 4400 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 9742 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 5701 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 4403 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 4605 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 4605 | Transfer in from: | 84H | Wellington | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 4605 | Transfer out to: | 84H | Wellington | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 3782 | Transfer in from: | SALOP | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 3687 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 3782 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 4401 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 3782 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 02/1952 | 2030 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/02/1952 | 3782 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 4406 | Transfer out to: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 07/1952 | 5125 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 11/1952 | 5138 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 11/1952 | 5139 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 4158 | Transfer in from: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 2061 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 4178 | Transfer in from: | CARM | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 5712 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 1619 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 5745 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 9774 | Transfer in from: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 4155 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 9435 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 9435 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 3744 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 4178 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 4178 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 31/03/1955 | 1663 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 04/1955 | 2061 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 5164 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 4155 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 5109 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/06/1955 | 5167 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 3613 | Transfer out to: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 9774 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 4142 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 9774 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 9624 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 82004 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 82006 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 4178 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 82009 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 82034 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 5164 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 5178 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 82034 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 4110 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 4120 | Transfer in from: | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 9742 | Transfer out to: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 9741 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 10/1957 | 5712 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 4142 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 82007 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 82007 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5758 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Newport Pill | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 1663 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 3749 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 3760 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 01/1959 | 7754 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 3626 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/06/1959 | 82004 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/06/1959 | 82009 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 82004 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 82009 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 82038 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 4110 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 5167 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 41201 | Transfer in from: | 86K | Abergavenny | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 41241 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 82030 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 82004 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 11/1959 | 5745 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 9621 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 41204 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 82006 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 82009 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 82030 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 82038 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 41232 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 41231 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 4120 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 9636 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 4178 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 9630 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 9630 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 9741 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 4120 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 9741 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 41204 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 9621 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 41204 | Transfer in from: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 6421 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 6429 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 41231 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 3626 | Transfer out to: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 03/1962 | 6429 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 05/1962 | 3732 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 4120 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 08/1962 | 9741 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 4178 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 4158 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 23/10/1962 | 4605 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 3776 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 6421 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 41204 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 10/1963 | 9636 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 01/02/1964 | 41201 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 01/02/1964 | 41241 | Transfer out to: | 2L | Leamington | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 08/02/1964 | 41232 | Transfer out to: | 2L | Leamington | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 41201 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 41241 | Transfer in from: | 2L | Leamington | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 41201 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 41241 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 3744 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 3776 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 9630 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 9639 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 9774 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley |