Depot: West Hartlepool
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | m/e | 03/1911 | 1181 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | m/e | 05/1911 | 1191 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/11/1926 | 1458 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/11/1926 | 1459 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/11/1926 | 1481 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 13/06/1935 | 1215 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/12/1935 | 1506 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 17/11/1936 | 2235 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/11/1936 | 1540 | Transfer in from: | SBK | Starbeck | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/12/1936 | 1545 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/12/1936 | 1547 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | on | 19/03/1937 | 901 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 27/05/1937 | 1181 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 27/05/1937 | 1191 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | on | 06/12/1937 | 625 | Transfer in from: | HAV | Haverton Hill | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/03/1938 | 1215 | Transfer out to: | EHL | East Hartlepool | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 27/09/1938 | 1176 | Transfer in from: | SBK | Starbeck | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 27/09/1938 | 1191 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 28/09/1938 | 1180 | Transfer in from: | SBK | Starbeck | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 28/09/1938 | 1182 | Transfer in from: | SBK | Starbeck | ||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | on | 04/11/1938 | 625 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/11/1938 | 1458 | Transfer out to: | HAV | Haverton Hill | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/11/1938 | 1459 | Transfer out to: | HAV | Haverton Hill | ||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | on | 25/11/1938 | 901 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 26/11/1938 | 2223 | Transfer in from: | HAV | Haverton Hill | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 26/11/1938 | 2249 | Transfer in from: | HAV | Haverton Hill | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 23/03/1939 | 2259 | Transfer in from: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 29/03/1939 | 2254 | Transfer in from: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 30/03/1939 | 2257 | Transfer in from: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 10/04/1939 | 1176 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 10/04/1939 | 1180 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 17/04/1939 | 1215 | Transfer in from: | EHL | East Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 17/04/1939 | 1284 | Transfer in from: | EHL | East Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 17/04/1939 | 2230 | Transfer in from: | EHL | East Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 17/04/1939 | 2239 | Transfer in from: | EHL | East Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 17/04/1939 | 2262 | Transfer in from: | EHL | East Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 13/05/1939 | 1215 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 08/06/1939 | 1182 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 10/06/1939 | 1191 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/07/1939 | 2249 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 16/10/1939 | 2223 | Transfer out to: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 16/10/1939 | 2235 | Transfer out to: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 16/10/1939 | 2254 | Transfer out to: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/01/1940 | 2275 | Transfer in from: | TDK | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 10/01/1940 | 2227 | Transfer in from: | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 02/03/1940 | 2244 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 02/03/1940 | 2291 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/04/1940 | 2235 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/04/1940 | 2254 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 06/05/1940 | 2227 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/05/1940 | 6631 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 07/05/1940 | 2257 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/05/1940 | 6615 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 08/05/1940 | 2244 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/05/1940 | 6581 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/05/1940 | 6616 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 10/05/1940 | 1284 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/05/1940 | 6612 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/05/1940 | 6608 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/05/1940 | 6578 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/05/1940 | 2254 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 23/05/1940 | 2239 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 25/05/1940 | 2291 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/06/1940 | 6549 | Transfer in from: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/05/1941 | 6584 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 10/05/1941 | 2275 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 16/05/1941 | 1518 | Transfer in from: | SALT | Saltburn | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 20/05/1941 | 2161 | Transfer in from: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | on | 06/09/1941 | 626 | Transfer in from: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 06/09/1941 | 2230 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/09/1941 | 700 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 27/12/1941 | 1329 | Transfer in from: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 28/02/1942 | 1522 | Transfer in from: | SALT | Saltburn | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 28/02/1942 | 2157 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 11/06/1942 | 1329 | Transfer out to: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 25/08/1942 | 1328 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/09/1942 | 5404 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/09/1942 | 5008 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/09/1942 | 6211 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/09/1942 | 6501 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 03/09/1942 | 2235 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 03/09/1942 | 2259 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 03/09/1942 | 2262 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | on | 03/09/1942 | 626 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 07/11/1942 | 2155 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 01/02/1943 | 2156 | Transfer in from: | AUK | West Auckland | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/03/1943 | 6265 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/03/1943 | 6566 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/03/1943 | 6594 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/03/1943 | 6595 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/03/1943 | 6350 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 1031 | Transfer in from: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 1213 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 1215 | Transfer in from: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 2116 | Transfer in from: | MAL | Malton | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 2119 | Transfer in from: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 2122 | Transfer in from: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 2124 | Transfer in from: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 443 | Transfer in from: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 651 | Transfer in from: | HAV | Haverton Hill | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 764 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 783 | Transfer in from: | HAV | Haverton Hill | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 1481 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 1506 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 1540 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 1545 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 1547 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 28/06/1943 | 1326 | Transfer in from: | SBK | Starbeck | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/01/1944 | 6606 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/01/1944 | 6594 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 19/02/1944 | 1149 | Transfer in from: | NLN | Northallerton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/03/1944 | 6352 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/03/1944 | 6595 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 01/04/1944 | 2161 | Transfer out to: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/06/1944 | 1213 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/06/1944 | 6631 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/10/1944 | 5008 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/10/1944 | 5404 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/10/1944 | 6352 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/10/1944 | 6606 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/10/1944 | 6616 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/10/1944 | 5008 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/10/1944 | 5404 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/10/1944 | 6352 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/10/1944 | 6606 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/10/1944 | 6616 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/01/1945 | 5404 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/01/1945 | 6615 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/01/1945 | 6211 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/01/1945 | 6616 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/01/1945 | 6352 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/01/1945 | 5008 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/01/1945 | 6501 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/01/1945 | 6606 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/01/1945 | 6581 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/02/1945 | 6578 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/03/1945 | 6350 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/03/1945 | 1257 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/03/1945 | 1294 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/03/1945 | 1361 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/03/1945 | 2224 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/03/1945 | 2226 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/03/1945 | 2235 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/03/1945 | 2237 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/03/1945 | 2238 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/03/1945 | 2264 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/03/1945 | 2267 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/03/1945 | 2270 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/03/1945 | 2278 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/03/1945 | 2295 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/03/1945 | 2297 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/03/1945 | 2300 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/03/1945 | 6265 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/03/1945 | 6566 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/03/1945 | 6584 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/03/1945 | 6608 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/03/1945 | 6612 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 20/06/1945 | 2155 | Transfer out to: | AUK | West Auckland | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 23/07/1945 | 1362 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 23/07/1945 | 1363 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 26/11/1945 | 2155 | Transfer in from: | AUK | West Auckland | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 06/10/1946 | 9891 | Transfer out to: | SALT | Saltburn | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 06/10/1946 | 9892 | Transfer out to: | SALT | Saltburn | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 07/12/1946 | 3309 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 26/04/1947 | 3258 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 04/05/1947 | 3410 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 04/05/1947 | 3414 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 20/07/1947 | 3293 | Transfer in from: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 20/07/1947 | 3300 | Transfer in from: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 20/07/1947 | 3318 | Transfer in from: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 07/09/1947 | 3422 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 07/09/1947 | 3327 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/10/1947 | 3364 | Transfer out to: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/10/1947 | 3368 | Transfer out to: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/10/1947 | 3381 | Transfer out to: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/10/1947 | 3394 | Transfer out to: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 02/11/1947 | 3367 | Transfer out to: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 02/11/1947 | 3369 | Transfer out to: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2359 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2384 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2387 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5732 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5747 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5748 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5790 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5803 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5816 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5830 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5842 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5851 | Snapshot | AUK | West Auckland | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5871 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7271 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7291 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7314 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7316 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7331 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7343 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8053 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8054 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8055 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8056 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8057 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8233 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8244 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8248 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8258 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8263 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8276 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8290 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8291 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8295 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8301 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8302 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8306 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J73 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8355 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J73 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8358 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J73 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8359 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J73 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8364 | Snapshot | ||||
Diesel | Y11 | 0-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8434 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8684 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8685 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8689 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8692 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8694 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8697 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8703 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8716 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8734 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8742 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 2384 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/04/1948 | 3355 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/04/1948 | 3300 | Transfer out to: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 10/04/1948 | 3355 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 10/04/1948 | 3355 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 12/05/1948 | 3397 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 12/05/1948 | 3419 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 3397 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 3419 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 3397 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 3419 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/06/1948 | 3396 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 26/06/1948 | 3250 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/06/1948 | 3405 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/06/1948 | 63415 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/06/1948 | 3256 | Transfer out to: | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/06/1948 | 3294 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 3405 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 3415 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 3405 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 11/07/1948 | 63453 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 11/07/1948 | 3303 | Transfer out to: | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 63453 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 63453 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 8742 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 31/07/1948 | 68711 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 31/07/1948 | 68689 | Transfer out to: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 07/08/1948 | 3396 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 07/08/1948 | 3396 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 62387 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 07/11/1948 | 3405 | Transfer out to: | HAV | Haverton Hill | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 07/11/1948 | 63453 | Transfer out to: | HAV | Haverton Hill | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 65818 | Transfer in from: | HAV | Haverton Hill | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 65866 | Transfer in from: | HAV | Haverton Hill | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 14/11/1948 | 3311 | Transfer in from: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 14/11/1948 | 63290 | Transfer in from: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 14/11/1948 | 3336 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 3311 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 63290 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 3311 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 63290 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 22/11/1948 | 3253 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/12/1948 | 3401 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/12/1948 | 3430 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/12/1948 | 63431 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/12/1948 | 3293 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/12/1948 | 3318 | Transfer out to: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 11/12/1948 | 3401 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 11/12/1948 | 3430 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 11/12/1948 | 63431 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 11/12/1948 | 3401 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 11/12/1948 | 3430 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 11/12/1948 | 63431 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 12/12/1948 | 63438 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/12/1948 | 64862 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/12/1948 | 64916 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 12/12/1948 | 63431 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 63438 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 64862 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 64916 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 63438 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 64862 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 64916 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 06/02/1949 | 63281 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 06/02/1949 | 63290 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 06/02/1949 | 63311 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 5732 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 22/02/1949 | 63297 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/03/1949 | 4978 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/03/1949 | 4978 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/03/1949 | 4978 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 2372 | Transfer in from: | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 62359 | Transfer out to: | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 04/09/1949 | 63348 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 04/09/1949 | 63395 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 13/11/1949 | 3373 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 13/11/1949 | 63430 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 3373 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 3373 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 68042 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/02/1950 | 65846 | Transfer in from: | SUN | Sunderland | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 65782 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 65820 | Transfer in from: | SUN | Sunderland | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 65865 | Transfer in from: | SUN | Sunderland | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 65871 | Transfer out to: | 54A | Sunderland | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 25/03/1950 | 62379 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/03/1950 | 65865 | Transfer out to: | 51G | Haverton Hill | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 04/06/1950 | 69852 | Transfer in from: | WBY | Whitby | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 04/06/1950 | 69864 | Transfer out to: | 50G | Whitby | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 69852 | Transfer in from: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 69852 | Transfer out to: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Diesel | Y11 | 0-4-0 | on | 30/06/1950 | 15097 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 16/07/1950 | 3373 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 22/10/1950 | 67272 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 22/10/1950 | 67294 | Transfer in from: | AUK | West Auckland | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 22/10/1950 | 67291 | Transfer out to: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 29/10/1950 | 67316 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 67272 | Transfer in from: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 67294 | Transfer in from: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 67272 | Transfer out to: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 67294 | Transfer out to: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1951 | 3359 | Transfer in from: | CON | Consett | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1951 | 63427 | Transfer out to: | 54D | Consett | ||
Steam | J3 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 3359 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J73 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 68359 | Transfer out to: | 51J | Northallerton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/02/1951 | 64862 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 68715 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 68042 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 68715 | Transfer in from: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 68715 | Transfer out to: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | on | 10/04/1951 | 62379 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 62388 | Transfer in from: | NLN | Northallerton | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 67316 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 67331 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 62388 | Transfer in from: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 67316 | Transfer in from: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 2372 | Transfer out to: | 51J | Northallerton | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 62388 | Transfer out to: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 67316 | Transfer out to: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 03/07/1951 | 68248 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 67342 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 67316 | Transfer out to: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 30/08/1951 | 68302 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 68281 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 68281 | Transfer in from: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 68281 | Transfer out to: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 43055 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 67324 | Transfer in from: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 67342 | Transfer out to: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 43055 | Transfer in from: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 67324 | Transfer in from: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 43055 | Transfer out to: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 67324 | Transfer out to: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 06/07/1952 | 63359 | Transfer out to: | 54B | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 06/07/1952 | 69852 | Transfer out to: | 51E | Stockton | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 06/07/1952 | 69862 | Transfer out to: | 51E | Stockton | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 06/07/1952 | 69863 | Transfer out to: | 54A | Sunderland | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 65842 | Transfer out to: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 23/08/1952 | 67333 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 23/08/1952 | 67346 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 23/08/1952 | 67324 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 23/08/1952 | 67343 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 31/08/1952 | 63401 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 67333 | Transfer in from: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 67346 | Transfer in from: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 67333 | Transfer out to: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 67346 | Transfer out to: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/09/1952 | 64817 | Transfer in from: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/09/1952 | 64862 | Transfer in from: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/09/1952 | 64910 | Transfer in from: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 14/09/1952 | 63355 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 14/09/1952 | 63435 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 14/09/1952 | 63452 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 64817 | Transfer in from: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 64862 | Transfer in from: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 64910 | Transfer in from: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 64817 | Transfer out to: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 64862 | Transfer out to: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 64910 | Transfer out to: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 62388 | Transfer out to: | 51J | Northallerton | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 62359 | Transfer in from: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 62359 | Transfer in from: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 62359 | Transfer out to: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/03/1953 | 11105 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/03/1953 | 11106 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 68692 | Transfer out to: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/04/1953 | 11107 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 68281 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | D2/1 | 0-4-0 | on | 25/07/1953 | 11700 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 67324 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 67314 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 65865 | Transfer in from: | 51G | Haverton Hill | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 65790 | Transfer out to: | 51G | Haverton Hill | ||
Diesel | D2/1 | 0-4-0 | on | 19/12/1953 | 11701 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 62372 | Transfer in from: | 51J | Northallerton | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 14/02/1954 | 69883 | Transfer in from: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 20/02/1954 | 68697 | Transfer out to: | 54C | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 68694 | Transfer out to: | 54C | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 62359 | Transfer out to: | 51J | Northallerton | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 67278 | Transfer in from: | 51E | Stockton | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 67314 | Transfer in from: | 51J | Northallerton | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 67343 | Transfer in from: | 51E | Stockton | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 67271 | Transfer out to: | 51E | Stockton | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 67272 | Transfer out to: | 51J | Northallerton | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 67346 | Transfer out to: | 51E | Stockton | ||
Diesel | D2/1 | 0-4-0 | on | 21/08/1954 | 11702 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/09/1954 | 64817 | Transfer out to: | 51J | Northallerton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/09/1954 | 64910 | Transfer out to: | 51J | Northallerton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/09/1954 | 64916 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/09/1954 | 64978 | Transfer out to: | 51J | Northallerton | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 67294 | Transfer out to: | 54A | Sunderland | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 68263 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 67338 | Transfer in from: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/11/1954 | 61275 | Transfer in from: | 51E | Stockton | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/11/1954 | 68258 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 18/12/1954 | 67278 | Transfer out to: | 51J | Northallerton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/03/1955 | 64862 | Transfer out to: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | J73 | 0-6-0T | on | 14/03/1955 | 68358 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J73 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 68359 | Transfer in from: | 51J | Northallerton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 76023 | Transfer in from: | 54A | Sunderland | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 43055 | Transfer out to: | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 17/07/1955 | 69873 | Transfer in from: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 43015 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 62372 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/08/1955 | 90067 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 14/08/1955 | 63396 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 14/08/1955 | 63424 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 90012 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 90092 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 02/10/1955 | 69871 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 68021 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 68051 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 90344 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 68290 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 68684 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 90048 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 12/12/1955 | 67314 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 67338 | Transfer out to: | 54A | Sunderland | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/01/1956 | 11149 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/01/1956 | 11150 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/02/1956 | 11151 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 67343 | Transfer out to: | 54A | Sunderland | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 67333 | Transfer out to: | 54A | Sunderland | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 25/05/1956 | 68707 | Transfer in from: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 25/05/1956 | 68685 | Transfer out to: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 26/05/1956 | 68291 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 68716 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 43128 | Transfer in from: | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 76023 | Transfer out to: | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 19/11/1956 | 68276 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 26/11/1956 | 68301 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 68295 | Transfer out to: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 90012 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 08/09/1957 | 69878 | Transfer in from: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 15/09/1957 | 69830 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 15/09/1957 | 69831 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 15/09/1957 | 69834 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 15/09/1957 | 69842 | Transfer in from: | 51E | Stockton | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 15/09/1957 | 69873 | Transfer out to: | 54a | Durham | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 15/09/1957 | 69878 | Transfer out to: | 54A | Sunderland | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 15/09/1957 | 69883 | Transfer out to: | 54a | Durham | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 15/09/1957 | 69893 | Transfer out to: | 54a | Durham | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 65700 | Transfer in from: | 54C | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 10/11/1957 | 69880 | Transfer in from: | 51K | Saltburn | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 10/11/1957 | 69884 | Transfer in from: | SALT | Saltburn | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 10/11/1957 | 69892 | Transfer in from: | SALT | Saltburn | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 10/11/1957 | 69894 | Transfer in from: | 51K | Saltburn | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 10/11/1957 | 69830 | Transfer out to: | 51K | Saltburn | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 10/11/1957 | 69831 | Transfer out to: | 51K | Saltburn | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 10/11/1957 | 69834 | Transfer out to: | 51K | Saltburn | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 10/11/1957 | 69842 | Transfer out to: | 51K | Saltburn | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 11/11/1957 | 67324 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 82027 | Transfer in from: | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 82029 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 12/04/1958 | 68244 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 08/06/1958 | 63391 | Transfer in from: | 51G | Haverton Hill | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 08/06/1958 | 63412 | Transfer in from: | 51G | Haverton Hill | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 65840 | Transfer in from: | HAV | Haverton Hill | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 68941 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 68951 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 68698 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 19/07/1958 | 68306 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/09/1958 | 61267 | Transfer in from: | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 14/09/1958 | 63440 | Transfer in from: | 51E | Stockton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/10/1958 | 61061 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 67759 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 67765 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 68722 | Transfer in from: | 51G | Haverton Hill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 82027 | Transfer out to: | 50F | Malton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 82029 | Transfer out to: | 50F | Malton | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 04/11/1958 | 69884 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 05/11/1958 | 69892 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 65805 | Transfer in from: | HAV | Haverton Hill | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 67759 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | J73 | 0-6-0T | on | 18/12/1958 | 68355 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/01/1959 | 65748 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J77 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/01/1959 | 68410 | Transfer in from: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 65865 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/03/1959 | 65700 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/04/1959 | 65803 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/05/1959 | 65840 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/05/1959 | 65747 | Transfer out to: | 51E | Stockton | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/06/1959 | 65866 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 68316 | Transfer in from: | 54C | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 68941 | Transfer out to: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 04/07/1959 | 67765 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 11/07/1959 | 68744 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 11/07/1959 | 69017 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 69017 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/08/1959 | 90048 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 08/08/1959 | 68744 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/09/1959 | D2068 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/09/1959 | D2069 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/10/1959 | D2070 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/10/1959 | 65816 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 43053 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 43100 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/12/1959 | D2077 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J73 | 0-6-0T | on | 07/12/1959 | 68359 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | D2076 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/02/1960 | D3672 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 29/02/1960 | 68722 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J73 | 0-6-0T | on | 14/04/1960 | 68364 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | D2069 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 23/06/1960 | 69880 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 23/06/1960 | 69894 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1960 | D2077 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | D2/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 27/08/1960 | D2700 | Transfer out to: | 50D | Goole | ||
Diesel | D2/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 27/08/1960 | D2701 | Transfer out to: | 50D | Goole | ||
Diesel | D2/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 27/08/1960 | D2702 | Transfer out to: | 50D | Goole | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 68032 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 68737 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/10/1960 | 64815 | Transfer in from: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/10/1960 | 64849 | Transfer in from: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 14/10/1960 | 68316 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J77 | 0-6-0T | on | 19/10/1960 | 68410 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 20/02/1961 | 68233 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 43123 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 65830 | Transfer out to: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 68951 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 26/07/1961 | 68715 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/08/1961 | 64815 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/08/1961 | D2331 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 19/08/1961 | 69021 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 21/08/1961 | 68711 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 23/08/1961 | 68737 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 68036 | Transfer in from: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 68041 | Transfer in from: | 54A | Sunderland | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 68044 | Transfer in from: | 54A | Sunderland | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 68058 | Transfer in from: | 54A | Sunderland | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 68054 | Transfer out to: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 69022 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 02/10/1961 | 68698 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 02/10/1961 | 68703 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 02/10/1961 | 68734 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 04/11/1961 | 69003 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/11/1961 | 65782 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/12/1961 | 63457 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 90426 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 69019 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 02/04/1962 | 68707 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 68053 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 08/04/1962 | 63380 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 08/04/1962 | 63382 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 08/04/1962 | 63432 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 08/04/1962 | 63450 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 08/04/1962 | 63451 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/04/1962 | 65846 | Transfer out to: | 52G | Sunderland | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/04/1962 | 90426 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 18/06/1962 | 68057 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 43015 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 65818 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 65820 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 16/07/1962 | 68055 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 15/10/1962 | 68056 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 29/10/1962 | 68044 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 29/10/1962 | 68058 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/11/1962 | 64849 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/11/1962 | 61061 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/12/1962 | 61257 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/12/1962 | 61267 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 31/12/1962 | 69022 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 43075 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 69009 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 69011 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1963 | 90092 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/03/1963 | 61220 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/05/1963 | 61275 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/06/1963 | 90479 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/06/1963 | D2331 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60806 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60901 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/06/1963 | 61176 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 23/06/1963 | 63349 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 23/06/1963 | 63435 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 90092 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 15/07/1963 | 63380 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/08/1963 | 43075 | Transfer out to: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 31/08/1963 | 90092 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 43053 | Transfer out to: | 55F | Manningham | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 18/09/1963 | 69009 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 68023 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 68039 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 30/09/1963 | 69021 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 69016 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 68019 | Transfer in from: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 68053 | Transfer in from: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 68054 | Transfer in from: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 14/10/1963 | 68021 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 14/10/1963 | 68039 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 14/10/1963 | 68041 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/11/1963 | 63392 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 24/11/1963 | 63341 | Transfer in from: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 24/11/1963 | 63351 | Transfer in from: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 24/11/1963 | 63403 | Transfer in from: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/12/1963 | 69011 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/12/1963 | 69019 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/12/1963 | 61176 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/12/1963 | D2149 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 28/12/1963 | 69003 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1964 | 63451 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 04/01/1964 | 68062 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 04/01/1964 | 69016 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 12/01/1964 | 63347 | Transfer in from: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/01/1964 | D2587 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/01/1964 | D2589 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/02/1964 | D2591 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/02/1964 | D2592 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/02/1964 | D2586 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/02/1964 | D2588 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 04/04/1964 | 68051 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 04/04/1964 | 68053 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 04/04/1964 | 68054 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 04/04/1964 | 68062 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 12/04/1964 | 63343 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 12/04/1964 | 63407 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 13/04/1964 | 63383 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 15/04/1964 | 63415 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/05/1964 | D2590 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/05/1964 | D2618 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/05/1964 | D2206 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/05/1964 | D2231 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 17/05/1964 | 63361 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/05/1964 | 63422 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/05/1964 | 90082 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/05/1964 | 90445 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 25/05/1964 | 68032 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 25/05/1964 | 68036 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/05/1964 | 90593 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 05/07/1964 | 60806 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/07/1964 | 63403 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/09/1964 | 63382 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1964 | D2232 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/09/1964 | 63446 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 05/10/1964 | 68019 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/10/1964 | 90067 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 65851 | Transfer out to: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 31/10/1964 | 90588 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 12/11/1964 | 63341 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 12/11/1964 | 63438 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 15/11/1964 | 63443 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/11/1964 | 90344 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 90621 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/12/1964 | 62004 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 68023 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 13/12/1964 | 60901 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/12/1964 | 65839 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/12/1964 | 65839 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/01/1965 | 63351 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1965 | 90016 | Transfer in from: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 65805 | Transfer out to: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 12/04/1965 | 63391 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 17/05/1965 | 63414 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 17/05/1965 | 63432 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 23/05/1965 | 63368 | Transfer in from: | 52K | Consett | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 23/05/1965 | 63394 | Transfer in from: | 52K | Consett | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 07/06/1965 | 63343 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 07/06/1965 | 63361 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 07/06/1965 | 63419 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1965 | 90434 | Transfer in from: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1965 | 90459 | Transfer in from: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1965 | D2594 | Transfer in from: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 12/07/1965 | 43128 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1965 | D2070 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1965 | D2076 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/10/1965 | 61220 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/10/1965 | 61257 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/10/1965 | 63347 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/10/1965 | 63443 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1965 | 90230 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/11/1965 | 90621 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1965 | 43055 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1965 | 43057 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1965 | 43055 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 13/03/1966 | 62048 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1966 | D3137 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1966 | 43056 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1966 | 90011 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1966 | 90014 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1966 | 90309 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1966 | 90016 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1966 | 90479 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 27/03/1966 | 62001 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 27/03/1966 | 62008 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 27/03/1966 | 62041 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 27/03/1966 | 62044 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 27/03/1966 | 62045 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1966 | D2067 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1966 | D2078 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1966 | D2099 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1966 | D2232 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1966 | D2340 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1966 | 43050 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1966 | 45055 | Transfer in from: | 27C | Southport | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1966 | 43050 | Transfer out to: | 55F | Manningham | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1966 | 45055 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1966 | 43123 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/06/1966 | 63349 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/06/1966 | 63410 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/06/1966 | 63421 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/06/1966 | 63435 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/06/1966 | 63446 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/06/1966 | 63454 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/06/1966 | 90011 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 11/07/1966 | 63412 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/07/1966 | 90082 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/07/1966 | 90445 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/07/1966 | 90593 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 90254 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 90339 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 90347 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 90482 | Transfer in from: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 90061 | Transfer in from: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 90116 | Transfer in from: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/12/1966 | 62004 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 31/12/1966 | 43056 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 31/12/1966 | 43057 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 31/12/1966 | 62008 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 31/12/1966 | 63368 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 31/12/1966 | 63440 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 31/12/1966 | 63450 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/01/1967 | 90254 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/02/1967 | 62001 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 05/02/1967 | 43100 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/02/1967 | 90588 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D2070 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D2076 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D2077 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D2153 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 43070 | Transfer in from: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/03/1967 | D2586 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/03/1967 | D2588 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/03/1967 | D2591 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/03/1967 | D2594 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 90074 | Transfer in from: | 52G | Sunderland | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 90210 | Transfer in from: | 52G | Sunderland | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D2230 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D2232 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 10/04/1967 | 62041 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/04/1967 | D2587 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/04/1967 | D2589 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/04/1967 | D2590 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/04/1967 | D2592 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/04/1967 | D2618 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/04/1967 | 90014 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/05/1967 | 90230 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/05/1967 | 90347 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 28/05/1967 | 62026 | Transfer in from: | 52G | Sunderland | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 28/05/1967 | 62042 | Transfer in from: | 52G | Sunderland | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 31/05/1967 | 63397 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 07/06/1967 | 63394 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 19/06/1967 | 62048 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/06/1967 | 90459 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/06/1967 | 90061 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/06/1967 | 90116 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/06/1967 | 90434 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/07/1967 | 62026 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/07/1967 | 62042 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/07/1967 | 62044 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/07/1967 | 63407 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/07/1967 | 90210 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/07/1967 | 90309 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/07/1967 | 90339 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 02/07/1967 | 63344 | Transfer in from: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 02/07/1967 | 63387 | Transfer in from: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 02/07/1967 | 63431 | Transfer in from: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 02/07/1967 | 62045 | Transfer out to: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/07/1967 | 90482 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 90478 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 90627 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 90677 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 90695 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 43070 | Transfer out to: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 08/1967 | 90627 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 07/08/1967 | 63431 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1967 | 90076 | Transfer in from: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1967 | 90360 | Transfer in from: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 09/09/1967 | 63344 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 09/09/1967 | 63387 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | 90074 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | 90076 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | 90360 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | 90478 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | 90677 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | 90695 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | D2067 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | D2068 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | D2070 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | D2076 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | D2077 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | D2078 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | D2099 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | D2149 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | D2153 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | D2204 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | D2205 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | D2340 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | D3137 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | D3672 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby |