Depot: Westbury
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 2482 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 2779 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 3306 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 4310 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 4321 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 4349 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 7728 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 8745 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 907 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 2133 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 2399 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 2780 | Transfer in from: | YEO | Yeovil Pen Mill | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 4932 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 6303 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 2482 | Transfer out to: | wes | Salisbury (GWR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 8745 | Transfer out to: | YEO | Yeovil Pen Mill | ||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 907 | Transfer out to: | YEO | Yeovil Pen Mill | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 2482 | Transfer in from: | wes | Salisbury (GWR) | ||
Steam | Bird | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 3446 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 7309 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2361 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 2372 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 2562 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 3408 | Transfer in from: | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 08/1936 | 4310 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 09/1937 | 4321 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2361 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 02/1938 | 2372 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 06/1938 | 4349 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | m/e | 01/1939 | 3306 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/07/1939 | 2482 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | on | 10/1940 | 124 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | on | 12/1940 | 94 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1944 | 6961 | Transfer in from: | SAL | Salisbury | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1944 | 6961 | Transfer in from: | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1944 | 6961 | Transfer out to: | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1944 | 6961 | Transfer out to: | HFD | Hereford | ||
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 11/1945 | 2779 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | 2322 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | 5509 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | 5554 | Transfer in from: | YEO | Yeovil Pen Mill | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | 6365 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | 6384 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1946 | 6351 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1946 | 6365 | Transfer in from: | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1946 | 6365 | Transfer out to: | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1946 | 6384 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/09/1946 | 4520 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 1027 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2023 | Snapshot | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2053 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2181 | Snapshot | SBZ | St Blazey | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2322 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2445 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2780 | Snapshot | SBZ | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2803 | Snapshot | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2818 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2928 | Snapshot | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2941 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2946 | Snapshot | HFD | Hereford | ||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3363 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3364 | Snapshot | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3408 | Snapshot | DID | Didcot | ||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3438 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Bird | 4-4-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3446 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3696 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3731 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3735 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3758 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3842 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3849 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3850 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3863 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4028 | Snapshot | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4038 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4045 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4365 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4377 | Snapshot | sdn | Andover Junction (MSWJR) | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4508 | Snapshot | SBZ | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4520 | Snapshot | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4520 | Snapshot | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4572 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4573 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4636 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4926 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4927 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4932 | Snapshot | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4963 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5306 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5311 | Snapshot | wes | Salisbury (GWR) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5326 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5402 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5403 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5406 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5419 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5422 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5423 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5508 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5509 | Snapshot | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5509 | Snapshot | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5554 | Snapshot | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5554 | Snapshot | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5689 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5718 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5757 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5771 | Snapshot | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5781 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5785 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5900 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5924 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5925 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5961 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5971 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5974 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5985 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6303 | Snapshot | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6314 | Snapshot | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6351 | Snapshot | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6351 | Snapshot | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6365 | Snapshot | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6365 | Snapshot | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6368 | Snapshot | wes | Salisbury (GWR) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6369 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6375 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6399 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6690 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6699 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6804 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6845 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6955 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6966 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 7300 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 7302 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 7309 | Snapshot | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 7309 | Snapshot | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7727 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7728 | Snapshot | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7784 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8744 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8745 | Snapshot | YEO | Yeovil Pen Mill | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9612 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9615 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9628 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9762 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | 5509 | Transfer in from: | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | 5509 | Transfer out to: | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1948 | 3850 | Transfer out to: | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 04/1948 | 4365 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 4510 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 4543 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 5784 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 3731 | Transfer out to: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 9642 | Transfer in from: | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 8745 | Transfer out to: | YEO | Yeovil Pen Mill | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/08/1948 | 2928 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 9642 | Transfer out to: | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 7726 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 23/11/1948 | 6991 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 7726 | Transfer out to: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 5385 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 2578 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 4520 | Transfer out to: | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 2445 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 5306 | Transfer out to: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 5326 | Transfer out to: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | m/e | 06/1949 | 3364 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | 2426 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | 2578 | Transfer out to: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | 4647 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | 5784 | Transfer out to: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | m/e | 10/1949 | 3363 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | m/e | 10/1949 | 3438 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 6351 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 2946 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | 2444 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | 6935 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | 90630 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | 90701 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | 3863 | Transfer out to: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | 5311 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 2803 | Transfer out to: | LLY | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 3849 | Transfer out to: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/12/1949 | 2941 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 2818 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 3842 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 08/1950 | 4543 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 2426 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 7917 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 7924 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 7917 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 7924 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 7917 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 7924 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1950 | 4045 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/11/1950 | 4080 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 4985 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 5924 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 4985 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 4985 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 4034 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 4933 | Transfer in from: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 5975 | Transfer in from: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 1027 | Transfer out to: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 4963 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 5971 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 6804 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 6845 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 7309 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 2534 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 4034 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 4933 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 5975 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 4034 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 4933 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 5975 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 4933 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 7309 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 4933 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 6966 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1951 | 5025 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1951 | 5037 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/02/1951 | 5037 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 4933 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 5037 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 7309 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 90225 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 4933 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 5025 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 5925 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 7309 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 90701 | Transfer out to: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 4551 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 4034 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 5509 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 4536 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 4508 | Transfer out to: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/04/1951 | 5037 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 90630 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 4551 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 4551 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 5508 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 5508 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 90225 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 5508 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 5508 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 5771 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 5771 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 5718 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1951 | 4028 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 5718 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 5718 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 5718 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 01/1952 | 2023 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 4647 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | m/e | 04/1952 | 4038 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 4647 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 6375 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 4647 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 4647 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | on | 12/06/1952 | 1401 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 1456 | Transfer in from: | LYD | Lydney | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 9764 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 30/06/1952 | 8479 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 1456 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 9764 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 1456 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 9764 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 8479 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 8479 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 9764 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Yeovil Pen Mill | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 2850 | Transfer in from: | LLY | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 5978 | Transfer in from: | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 4933 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 5781 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | on | 20/08/1952 | 1401 | To Store | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 2850 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 5978 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 2850 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 5978 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 06/09/1952 | 5771 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/09/1952 | 5978 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1952 | 2444 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 5512 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 6314 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 6690 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 5771 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 1456 | Transfer out to: | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 6368 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 6625 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 4926 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1953 | 2534 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 2340 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 2426 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 5757 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 2053 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 4573 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 8744 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 03/1953 | 4510 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 5757 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 5512 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 5900 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 7309 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 7748 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Newport Pill | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 5785 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 5358 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 5368 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 6339 | Transfer in from: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 6358 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 4985 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 5985 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 19/05/1953 | 4080 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 5356 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 6375 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 5356 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 8744 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5368 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6339 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 4133 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 4930 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6914 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6922 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 4647 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Yeovil Pen Mill | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 5975 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6375 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 4607 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 4647 | Transfer in from: | 82E | Yeovil Pen Mill | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 5338 | Transfer in from: | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 5767 | Transfer in from: | YEO | Yeovil Pen Mill | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 3758 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 6369 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | m/e | 12/1953 | 2426 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 5701 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 2850 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 5961 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 5327 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 6365 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 4917 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 4965 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 6994 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 4965 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | m/e | 06/1954 | 2340 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 4166 | Transfer in from: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 4965 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 4965 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 6922 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 6991 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 4133 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 6699 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 4133 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 5910 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 5950 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 2208 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 2268 | Transfer in from: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 4133 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 4166 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 4377 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 5182 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 6822 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 5910 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 5950 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 6935 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 6915 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 5963 | Transfer in from: | CARM | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 5422 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 3614 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 5182 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 4945 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 4956 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 5422 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 07/1956 | 5327 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 6338 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 5422 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 5422 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 2811 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 4927 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 4956 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 6915 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 2827 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 6320 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 5403 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 5403 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 5975 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 5982 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 6338 | Transfer out to: | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 08/1957 | 5403 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1957 | 5406 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 5414 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 2208 | Transfer out to: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 4555 | Transfer in from: | MCH | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 5542 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 7728 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 5422 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 4909 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 7728 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 01/1958 | 5701 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 8482 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 02/1958 | 4551 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 02/1958 | 5419 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 4567 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 6408 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 6822 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 4930 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | q/e | 06/06/1958 | 6914 | Transfer out to: | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 07/1958 | 5718 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 08/1958 | 2827 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 08/1958 | 5338 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 9668 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1958 | 5402 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1958 | 5767 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 3819 | Transfer in from: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 4933 | Transfer in from: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 3629 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5416 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5945 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 6945 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 7909 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5385 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 12/1958 | 4572 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 5982 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 6399 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 5526 | Transfer in from: | TR | Truro | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 04/1959 | 4536 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 5904 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 5935 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 6951 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1959 | 5423 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/06/1959 | 5532 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/06/1959 | 6973 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 3212 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 5945 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 4555 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 5554 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 6408 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 6973 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 10/1959 | 2811 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 10/1959 | 5414 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 10/1959 | 6358 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 5532 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 7924 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 5410 | Transfer in from: | 81B | Slough | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 5771 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 6945 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 01/1960 | 7727 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 7300 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 5967 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 3840 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 4957 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 4961 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 6968 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 3212 | Transfer out to: | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 2846 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 2875 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 5975 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 3212 | Transfer in from: | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 6363 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 92221 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 92223 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 2200 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 5921 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 92205 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 92206 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 9769 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 3614 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 6363 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 92221 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 3614 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 4945 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 5508 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 5967 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 7909 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 25/11/1960 | 2846 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1960 | 5757 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 5904 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 01/01/1961 | 92205 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 01/01/1961 | 92206 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 8482 | Transfer out to: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 2871 | Transfer in from: | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 5358 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 2883 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 92223 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 04/1961 | 7748 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 3675 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 4963 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 5950 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 5980 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 6957 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 92211 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 3840 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 92239 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 8714 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 7w/e | 23/08/1961 | 92211 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 7w/e | 23/08/1961 | 92239 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 4941 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 5920 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 5999 | Transfer in from: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 2871 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 3819 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 6320 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 18/10/1961 | D7007 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1961 | 5950 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D4021 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D7002 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D7005 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 3675 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 4909 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 4963 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 5980 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 6951 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 6957 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 6994 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 12/1961 | 5542 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | D3998 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | D4023 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 5935 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 8479 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 8714 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/12/1961 | D4016 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/12/1961 | 3696 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/12/1961 | 7302 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/12/1961 | 9615 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1962 | 5920 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1962 | 5921 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | D3511 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | D4019 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 4174 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 5180 | Transfer in from: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 4567 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 6968 | Transfer out to: | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 9668 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 03/1962 | 3614 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1962 | 4957 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 03/1962 | 7784 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 5744 | Transfer in from: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 04/1962 | 5744 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 6999 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | D7002 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | D7005 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 05/1962 | 9762 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 06/1962 | 5526 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 07/1962 | 5180 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 4150 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 4157 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 4949 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 4972 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 5929 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 5964 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 3212 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | D7007 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 4150 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/1962 | 2200 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1962 | 4917 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1962 | 5964 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1962 | 5999 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 05/10/1962 | 8744 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 2273 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 4956 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 5925 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 5986 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 6319 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 6977 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 7332 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 4949 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 22/10/1962 | 4941 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 22/10/1962 | 5925 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 23/10/1962 | 4647 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 1442 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 3787 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 6356 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 9674 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 05/11/1962 | 4961 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 1442 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 2875 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 4933 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 5929 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 6625 | Transfer out to: | 89B | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 19/11/1962 | 2883 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 2886 | Transfer in from: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 6353 | Transfer in from: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 3739 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 7308 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 9754 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 5689 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 5963 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 3629 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 3787 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6356 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 03/1963 | 9628 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 03/1963 | 9769 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 3746 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | D4016 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 5410 | Transfer out to: | 72C | Yeovil Town | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 5416 | Transfer out to: | 72C | Yeovil Town | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 7917 | Transfer out to: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 4661 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 05/1963 | 6353 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 4569 | Transfer in from: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 5573 | Transfer in from: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 4157 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 4174 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 6346 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 6319 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 6346 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 7308 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 7332 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1963 | 4956 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 4989 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 5967 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 6968 | Transfer in from: | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1963 | 5986 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1963 | 6968 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 6988 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 6147 | Transfer in from: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 81xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 8102 | Transfer in from: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 2218 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 3669 | Transfer in from: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 4673 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 9729 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 4569 | Transfer out to: | 83E | Yeovil Town | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 12/1963 | 2273 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1963 | 4661 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1963 | 6977 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1963 | 9612 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 5573 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 4989 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 6147 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 81xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 8102 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1964 | 4972 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 04/1964 | 9674 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 2218 | Transfer out to: | 82G | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 5932 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 06/1964 | 2886 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1964 | 5967 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/06/1964 | 2268 | Transfer out to: | 6F | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 4978 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 07/1964 | 3746 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 4697 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 4978 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 5932 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 5974 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 6955 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1964 | 6988 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 10/1964 | 3739 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 10/1964 | 9729 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 5992 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 7909 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 7909 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 22/11/1964 | 9605 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 22/11/1964 | 9790 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/01/1965 | 5992 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/01/1965 | 6999 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | D3511 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 9754 | Transfer out to: | 83E | Yeovil Town | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1965 | 4673 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 07/1965 | 4697 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 3669 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Westbury | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D4163 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 3669 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Westbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 4607 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 4607 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Westbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1965 | 3669 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1965 | 3735 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1965 | 4607 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1965 | 4636 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1965 | 9605 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1965 | 9790 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | D3516 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Exmouth Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 15/01/1967 | D3516 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 15/01/1967 | D3998 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | D4019 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | D4021 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | D4023 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | D4163 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |