Depot: Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 1710 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 1775 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 2714 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 4803 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 517 | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 1485 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 3408 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 517 | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 1427 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 3432 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 4939 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 8358 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 3408 | Transfer out to: | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 02/1937 | 1710 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1937 | 5084 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1937 | 5084 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1938 | 5006 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1938 | 5006 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | m/e | 10/1938 | 1775 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 04/1939 | 5091 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1939 | 5091 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 03/11/1945 | 4803 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | 2955 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | 6867 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | 7782 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | 6867 | Transfer out to: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | 7782 | Transfer out to: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 1367 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 1368 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 1370 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 1403 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 1454 | Snapshot | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 1467 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | on | 15/06/1947 | 1789 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | on | 15/06/1947 | 2714 | Snapshot | HFD | Hereford | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2912 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2955 | Snapshot | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2955 | Snapshot | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3432 | Snapshot | HFD | Hereford | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4527 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4562 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4660 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4939 | Snapshot | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4988 | Snapshot | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5305 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5314 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5328 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5337 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5338 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5340 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5358 | Snapshot | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5359 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5384 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5968 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5969 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6945 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7408 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9642 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | 5978 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | 6902 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | 6912 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | 5969 | Transfer out to: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 1366 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Achilles | 4-2-2 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 3022 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 4089 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 7711 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1948 | 4089 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 3763 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 6988 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 9642 | Transfer out to: | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 09/1948 | 5340 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 9642 | Transfer in from: | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | Achilles | 4-2-2 | on | 14/10/1948 | 3032 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 1366 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 3763 | Transfer out to: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 4930 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 7711 | Transfer out to: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 3763 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 4520 | Transfer in from: | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 3032 | Transfer out to: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 4660 | Transfer out to: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | 4563 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 1453 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 6993 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 1403 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 4563 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | 1002 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | 1002 | Transfer in from: | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | 1002 | Transfer out to: | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | 1433 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | 6836 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | 1002 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | 1433 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | 3022 | Transfer out to: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 1436 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 5536 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 6836 | Transfer out to: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | 8746 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | 1436 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 5536 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 8746 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1950 | 2955 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 4539 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Unclassified | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 28 | Transfer in from: | KDR | Kidderminster | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/06/1950 | 4080 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 4080 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 4507 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 4080 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | m/e | 10/1950 | 1789 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 9620 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/11/1950 | 4080 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 9620 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 9620 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 5328 | Transfer in from: | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 4539 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 5328 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 5328 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 5328 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 5968 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 6912 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1951 | 2912 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 5508 | Transfer in from: | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 7418 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1951 | 5094 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 1403 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 5094 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 5094 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 5508 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 1403 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 1403 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1951 | 5094 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 7418 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 5771 | Transfer in from: | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 1403 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 5771 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 5771 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 10/1951 | 5359 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 4538 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 5718 | Transfer in from: | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 5771 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 5718 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 4907 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 4538 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 4907 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 4907 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 4647 | Transfer in from: | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 7726 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 4930 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 4647 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 4647 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 6375 | Transfer in from: | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 4527 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Yeovil Pen Mill | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 4647 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 7726 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 7726 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 4527 | Transfer in from: | 82E | Yeovil Pen Mill | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6375 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 9764 | Transfer in from: | 82E | Yeovil Pen Mill | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6375 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 7726 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 5932 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 9764 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 5932 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 5932 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 07/1952 | 5305 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 4934 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 5932 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 5781 | Transfer in from: | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 5978 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 5781 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 5781 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 06/09/1952 | 5771 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/09/1952 | 5978 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 1403 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 3764 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Unclassified | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 28 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 4507 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 4934 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 3764 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 5771 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 6945 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 01/1953 | 4520 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 5757 | Transfer in from: | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 1454 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 3739 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 4507 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 8744 | Transfer in from: | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 4907 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 03/1953 | 4527 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 7415 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 7418 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 7421 | Transfer in from: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 1367 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 5757 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 1368 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 1370 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 5190 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 6945 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 3739 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 4150 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 5784 | Transfer in from: | 82E | Yeovil Pen Mill | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 6375 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 1367 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 1370 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 3692 | Transfer in from: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6389 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 4507 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Yeovil Pen Mill | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5328 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 7415 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 7418 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 8744 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 5784 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6389 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 5338 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 6988 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 4624 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 6919 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 4965 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 7421 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 1454 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 5997 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 8793 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 4965 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 7749 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 1454 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 4562 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 8793 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 7749 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 1366 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 4562 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 1368 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 1366 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 4562 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 4562 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 7408 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 4133 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 4166 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 4988 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 3643 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 7421 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 4150 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 5337 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 3643 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 7421 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 5190 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 3692 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 3737 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 5422 | Transfer in from: | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 5548 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 9601 | Transfer in from: | YEO | Yeovil Pen Mill | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 3763 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 5781 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Yeovil Pen Mill | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 4507 | Transfer in from: | 82E | Yeovil Pen Mill | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 5422 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 5548 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Yeovil Pen Mill | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 7782 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 5964 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 6977 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 8799 | Transfer in from: | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 6902 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 6977 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 6993 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 6967 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 9642 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 6945 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 6967 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 5392 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 6945 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 7780 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 9626 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 9601 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 9626 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 1410 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 3746 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 5981 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 07/1957 | 5314 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 1418 | Transfer in from: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 6309 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 1410 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 7303 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 7415 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | m/e | 11/1957 | 1403 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 7415 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 1459 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 6344 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 3746 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 6309 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 6919 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 6945 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 7303 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | q/e | 06/06/1958 | 6914 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 5392 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | m/e | 09/1958 | 1459 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 5964 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 5978 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 5981 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 5997 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | m/e | 10/1958 | 1418 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 1472 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 1474 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 73017 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 73018 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 73020 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 73022 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 73029 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 4689 | Transfer in from: | YEO | Yeovil Pen Mill | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 7303 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 1467 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 1472 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 6914 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 3759 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 73041 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 73042 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 73080 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 01/1960 | 1370 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1361 | 0-6-0ST | 6w/e | 09/02/1960 | 1361 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 03/1960 | 4562 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 1369 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 1361 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 1361 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | w/e | 05/04/1960 | 1453 | Transfer out to: | 81B | Slough | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | w/e | 05/04/1960 | 1474 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 4507 | Transfer out to: | 72C | Yeovil Town | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 06/05/1960 | 9756 | Transfer in from: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/10/1960 | 5384 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 73041 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 73042 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 73080 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 03/05/1961 | D2292 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 03/05/1961 | 73041 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 03/05/1961 | 73042 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 03/05/1961 | 73080 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 31405 | Transfer in from: | 73J | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 31406 | Transfer in from: | 73J | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 31407 | Transfer in from: | 73J | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 05/11/1961 | 4133 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 05/11/1961 | 4166 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/02/1962 | D2397 | Transfer in from: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/02/1962 | D2398 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/03/1962 | D2292 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/03/1962 | 31406 | Transfer out to: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/05/1962 | D2295 | Transfer in from: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 01/05/1962 | 1368 | Transfer out to: | 72F | Wadebridge | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/05/1962 | D2399 | Transfer in from: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Steam | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/08/1962 | 1367 | Transfer out to: | 72F | Wadebridge | ||
Steam | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/08/1962 | 1369 | Transfer out to: | 72F | Wadebridge | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 8799 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 9756 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 02/12/1962 | 6344 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 02/12/1962 | 7303 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1963 | D2082 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1963 | D2399 | Transfer out to: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1963 | 7780 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 4610 | Transfer in from: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1963 | 31407 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 14/07/1963 | 3737 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 14/07/1963 | 4624 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/07/1963 | 31816 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/07/1963 | 80081 | Transfer in from: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/07/1963 | 80147 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/08/1963 | 41261 | Transfer in from: | 71B | Bournemouth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 19/08/1963 | 80081 | Transfer out to: | 71B | Bournemouth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 19/08/1963 | 80147 | Transfer out to: | 71B | Bournemouth | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | on | 08/09/1963 | 41297 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 08/09/1963 | 3759 | Transfer out to: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 08/09/1963 | 4610 | Transfer out to: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 41293 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 41298 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 41305 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 41310 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 41311 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 41324 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 73002 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 4689 | Transfer out to: | 70E | Salisbury | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | on | 05/10/1963 | 41297 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 06/10/1963 | 7782 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 06/10/1963 | 9620 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 12/01/1964 | 41311 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/06/1964 | 31405 | Transfer out to: | 75B | Redhill | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/06/1964 | 31816 | Transfer out to: | 75B | Redhill | ||
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 35005 | Transfer in from: | 71B | Bournemouth | ||
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 35012 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 35014 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 35016 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 35017 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 35019 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 35020 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 35022 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 35024 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 35026 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 35028 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 35029 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 35030 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 73029 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 73041 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | on | 04/10/1964 | 41284 | Transfer in from: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/10/1964 | 73017 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/10/1964 | 73022 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 18/10/1964 | 41310 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 73083 | Transfer in from: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | D2280 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 35007 | Transfer in from: | SAL | Salisbury | ||
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | w/e | 24/01/1965 | 35024 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | w/e | 14/02/1965 | 35020 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 21/03/1965 | 41293 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 41301 | Transfer in from: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 13/06/1965 | 41305 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 18/07/1965 | 41261 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | w/e | 08/08/1965 | 35016 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/08/1965 | 73042 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | w/e | 05/09/1965 | 35019 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 03/10/1965 | 41324 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | on | 10/10/1965 | 35005 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/10/1965 | 73113 | Transfer in from: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/10/1965 | 73114 | Transfer in from: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/11/1965 | 73016 | Transfer in from: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | w/e | 22/05/1966 | 35022 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D2043 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D2280 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1966 | 73114 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | w/e | 17/07/1966 | 35017 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1966 | D2043 | Transfer in from: | 70G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1966 | D2043 | Transfer out to: | 70G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/09/1966 | 73083 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | w/e | 11/09/1966 | 35029 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | m/e | 10/1966 | 41301 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 17/10/1966 | 35003 | Transfer in from: | 70F | Bournemouth | ||
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 17/10/1966 | 35008 | Transfer in from: | 71B | Bournemouth | ||
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 17/10/1966 | 35013 | Transfer in from: | 70F | Bournemouth | ||
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 17/10/1966 | 35023 | Transfer in from: | 71B | Bournemouth | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/10/1966 | 41284 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/10/1966 | 41298 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/12/1966 | 73016 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/12/1966 | 73080 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/01/1967 | 73113 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | m/e | 02/1967 | 35013 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/03/1967 | 73002 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | w/e | 26/03/1967 | 35014 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | w/e | 26/03/1967 | 35026 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | 5w/e | 17/04/1967 | 35003 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | 5w/e | 17/04/1967 | 35007 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | 5w/e | 17/04/1967 | 35008 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | 5w/e | 17/04/1967 | 35012 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | 5w/e | 17/04/1967 | 35023 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | 5w/e | 17/04/1967 | 35028 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | 5w/e | 17/04/1967 | 35030 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 17/04/1967 | 73018 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 17/04/1967 | 73020 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | D2043 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | D2082 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | D2295 | Transfer out to: | 70F | Bournemouth | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | D2397 | Transfer out to: | 70F | Bournemouth | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | D2398 | Transfer out to: | 70F | Bournemouth |