Depot: Woodford Halse
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | m/e | 06/1915 | 338 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 08/11/1919 | 344 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 08/11/1919 | 368 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 16/05/1920 | 369 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/05/1922 | 462 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/07/1922 | 467 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/07/1922 | 468 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/07/1922 | 469 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/01/1923 | 36 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/01/1923 | 463 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/01/1923 | 464 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/01/1923 | 37 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/01/1923 | 38 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/05/1924 | 5469 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/05/1924 | 5036 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/07/1924 | 37 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/07/1924 | 5463 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 20/09/1924 | 452 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 23/09/1924 | 452 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/11/1924 | 5463 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/11/1924 | 37 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 30/01/1925 | 5369 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/07/1925 | 6501 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/07/1925 | 6502 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/07/1925 | 6506 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 09/08/1925 | 5342 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 09/08/1925 | 5338 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/10/1925 | 5037 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/11/1925 | 6499 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/11/1925 | 6536 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/11/1925 | 6542 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/11/1925 | 6517 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/11/1925 | 6521 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/11/1925 | 6518 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/11/1925 | 6537 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/02/1926 | 6521 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B18 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/04/1926 | 5196 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B18 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/04/1926 | 5195 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/06/1926 | 5462 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/06/1926 | 5467 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 01/08/1926 | 5368 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/08/1926 | 5184 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/08/1926 | 5186 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/09/1926 | 5467 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/12/1926 | 6506 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/04/1927 | 6366 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/04/1927 | 6623 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1927 | 6278 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1927 | 6312 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/06/1927 | 2165 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/06/1927 | 2082 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/06/1927 | 6640 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/08/1927 | 2162 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/11/1927 | 6553 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/01/1928 | 5481 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/01/1928 | 5467 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B18 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/03/1928 | 5196 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B18 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/04/1928 | 5196 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/06/1928 | 5280 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/06/1928 | 5445 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/07/1928 | 5280 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/07/1928 | 5445 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/07/1928 | 6068 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/07/1928 | 6071 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/08/1928 | 5462 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/09/1928 | 5462 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/09/1928 | 6501 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/09/1928 | 6553 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/09/1928 | 6626 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/09/1928 | 6537 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/09/1928 | 6642 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/09/1928 | 6641 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/11/1928 | 6553 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/11/1928 | 6626 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1928 | 6501 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/11/1928 | 6642 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/11/1928 | 6537 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/12/1928 | 6641 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/12/1928 | 6542 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/03/1929 | 5462 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 25/03/1929 | 5368 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 25/03/1929 | 5369 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 28/03/1929 | 5274 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 28/03/1929 | 5341 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 11/05/1929 | 5342 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 11/05/1929 | 5344 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/05/1929 | 5184 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 29/06/1929 | 5274 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 29/06/1929 | 5368 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 29/06/1929 | 5369 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/07/1929 | 5333 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/07/1929 | 5180 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/07/1929 | 5404 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/09/1929 | 6517 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/09/1929 | 6278 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/10/1929 | 5404 | Transfer out to: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/10/1929 | 6518 | Transfer out to: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/10/1929 | 6247 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/10/1929 | 6366 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/12/1929 | 5481 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/02/1930 | 6642 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/03/1930 | 5481 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/04/1930 | 6538 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/06/1930 | 5185 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/07/1930 | 5185 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/07/1930 | 5180 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/08/1930 | 5180 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/09/1930 | 6537 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/09/1930 | 6538 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/02/1931 | 6570 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 19/02/1931 | 5341 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/03/1931 | 5404 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/03/1931 | 5406 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 08/03/1931 | 5342 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 17/03/1931 | 5342 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1935 | 5471 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/10/1935 | 5460 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/10/1935 | 5468 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/10/1935 | 5461 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/10/1935 | 5465 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/10/1935 | 5462 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/10/1935 | 5482 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/02/1936 | 5479 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/02/1936 | 5078 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/03/1936 | 6068 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/03/1936 | 5186 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/01/1937 | 5484 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/01/1937 | 5073 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/03/1937 | 5072 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/06/1937 | 6641 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/01/1938 | 5471 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/03/1938 | 5481 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 03/10/1938 | 5449 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 04/10/1938 | 5165 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 03/12/1938 | 5449 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 25/06/1939 | 5449 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/07/1939 | 6169 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/07/1939 | 6164 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/07/1939 | 6071 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/07/1939 | 6165 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 31/07/1939 | 5449 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 17/08/1939 | 5165 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 06/12/1939 | 5169 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 06/12/1939 | 5450 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/12/1939 | 5036 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 30/12/1939 | 5169 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 30/12/1939 | 5450 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B18 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/03/1940 | 5195 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B18 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/03/1940 | 5196 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/10/1940 | 6626 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 02/02/1941 | 5276 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 02/02/1941 | 5336 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 02/02/1941 | 5340 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 02/02/1941 | 5341 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 02/02/1941 | 5342 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 02/02/1941 | 5344 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/02/1941 | 5466 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/02/1941 | 5468 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/09/1941 | 712 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/09/1941 | 716 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/09/1941 | 760 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/09/1941 | 5459 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/09/1941 | 5474 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 27/09/1941 | 5276 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 27/09/1941 | 5336 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 27/09/1941 | 5340 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 27/09/1941 | 5341 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 27/09/1941 | 5342 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 27/09/1941 | 5344 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/10/1941 | 774 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/10/1941 | 778 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/03/1942 | 6165 | Transfer out to: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/04/1942 | 6164 | Transfer out to: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/07/1942 | 6169 | Transfer out to: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/07/1942 | 5391 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/07/1942 | 6205 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/07/1942 | 6164 | Transfer in from: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/07/1942 | 6621 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/07/1942 | 6639 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/07/1942 | 6629 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/07/1942 | 6258 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/07/1942 | 6573 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/07/1942 | 6586 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/07/1942 | 6540 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 04/08/1942 | 5343 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 04/08/1942 | 5344 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 05/08/1942 | 5275 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 06/08/1942 | 5274 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/08/1942 | 6209 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 07/08/1942 | 5367 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/09/1942 | 5404 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/09/1942 | 5391 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/09/1942 | 6501 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/09/1942 | 6586 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/11/1942 | 5458 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/11/1942 | 5479 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/11/1942 | 6164 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/01/1943 | 6524 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/01/1943 | 6633 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 19/01/1943 | 5274 | Transfer out to: | 13D | Shoeburyness | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/01/1943 | 6562 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 22/01/1943 | 5343 | Transfer out to: | 13D | Shoeburyness | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/01/1943 | 6524 | Transfer out to: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/01/1943 | 6633 | Transfer out to: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/01/1943 | 6231 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/01/1943 | 6275 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/01/1943 | 6566 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/01/1943 | 6265 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/01/1943 | 6365 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/01/1943 | 6321 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 31/01/1943 | 5275 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 31/01/1943 | 5344 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/02/1943 | 6336 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/02/1943 | 6220 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/02/1943 | 6245 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/02/1943 | 6350 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/02/1943 | 6594 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/02/1943 | 6595 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/02/1943 | 6220 | Transfer out to: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/02/1943 | 6365 | Transfer out to: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 15/02/1943 | 5344 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 18/02/1943 | 5337 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/03/1943 | 6265 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/03/1943 | 6231 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/03/1943 | 6245 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/03/1943 | 6321 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/03/1943 | 6562 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/03/1943 | 6594 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/03/1943 | 6595 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/03/1943 | 6566 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/03/1943 | 6275 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/03/1943 | 6336 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/03/1943 | 6350 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/04/1943 | 5180 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/05/1943 | 5034 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/05/1943 | 5035 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/05/1943 | 5467 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/05/1943 | 5477 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/05/1943 | 5478 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/05/1943 | 5034 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/05/1943 | 5035 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/05/1943 | 5458 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/05/1943 | 5467 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/05/1943 | 5477 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/05/1943 | 5478 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/05/1943 | 5473 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/06/1943 | 5034 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/06/1943 | 5035 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/06/1943 | 5458 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/06/1943 | 5467 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/06/1943 | 5477 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/06/1943 | 5478 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 21/06/1943 | 5337 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 21/06/1943 | 5344 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 21/06/1943 | 5367 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/07/1943 | 5034 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/07/1943 | 5035 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/07/1943 | 5458 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/07/1943 | 5467 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/07/1943 | 5477 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/07/1943 | 5478 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/08/1943 | 5406 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/08/1943 | 6205 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/08/1943 | 6553 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/08/1943 | 6573 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/09/1943 | 5460 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/09/1943 | 5464 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/10/1943 | 5461 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/10/1943 | 5073 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/10/1943 | 5036 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/10/1943 | 5038 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/10/1943 | 5072 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/10/1943 | 5078 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/10/1943 | 5459 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/10/1943 | 5463 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/10/1943 | 5465 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/10/1943 | 5466 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/10/1943 | 5468 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/10/1943 | 5473 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/10/1943 | 5474 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/10/1943 | 5482 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/11/1943 | 5484 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/04/1944 | 6629 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/04/1944 | 6639 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/05/1944 | 6358 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/05/1944 | 6495 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/05/1944 | 6496 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/05/1944 | 6641 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/05/1944 | 6209 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/05/1944 | 6258 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/05/1944 | 6536 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/05/1944 | 6640 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/08/1944 | 5391 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/08/1944 | 6308 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/08/1944 | 6357 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/08/1944 | 6364 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/08/1944 | 5355 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/08/1944 | 5381 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/08/1944 | 6299 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/08/1944 | 6589 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/09/1944 | 6276 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/09/1944 | 5155 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/09/1944 | 6338 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/09/1944 | 6347 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/09/1944 | 6521 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/09/1944 | 6635 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/01/1946 | 6299 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/01/1946 | 6347 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/01/1946 | 5333 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/02/1946 | 3511 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/02/1946 | 5355 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/02/1946 | 5391 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/02/1946 | 6276 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/02/1946 | 6308 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/02/1946 | 6502 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/02/1946 | 6521 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/02/1946 | 6540 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/02/1946 | 6589 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/02/1946 | 6621 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/03/1946 | 6495 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 6338 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 6357 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 6358 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 6364 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 6496 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 6641 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/04/1946 | 5381 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/08/1946 | 3886 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 3706 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 3752 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 3868 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 3887 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 3890 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 6200 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 6304 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 6351 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 6374 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 6555 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 3752 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 3868 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 3887 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 3890 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 6374 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 6555 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/10/1946 | 70844 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/03/1947 | 1078 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/03/1947 | 1085 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/03/1947 | 1085 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/04/1947 | 1063 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/04/1947 | 1066 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/04/1947 | 1087 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/04/1947 | 1088 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/05/1947 | 1108 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/06/1947 | 1131 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/06/1947 | 1141 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/06/1947 | 3694 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/06/1947 | 3735 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/06/1947 | 3761 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/06/1947 | 3853 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 14/08/1947 | 9069 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 17/08/1947 | 9050 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3674 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3694 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3706 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3723 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3735 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3761 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3829 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3853 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1829 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1839 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1870 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1908 | Snapshot | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1913 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1943 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1956 | Snapshot | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8891 | Snapshot | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8894 | Snapshot | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8920 | Snapshot | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9269 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9310 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 9312 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 9324 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/09/1948 | 1943 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 07/11/1948 | 60817 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 07/11/1948 | 60818 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/11/1948 | 60820 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 60817 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 60818 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 60820 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 60817 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 60818 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 60820 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/11/1948 | 61087 | Transfer out to: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/11/1948 | 61141 | Transfer out to: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/12/1948 | 853 | Transfer in from: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 853 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 853 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/03/1949 | 61088 | Transfer out to: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/03/1949 | 61108 | Transfer out to: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/04/1949 | 61088 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 61088 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 61088 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 19/06/1949 | 60830 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 19/06/1949 | 60831 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 19/06/1949 | 60832 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/06/1949 | 1066 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/06/1949 | 61063 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/06/1949 | 61078 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/06/1949 | 61088 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/06/1949 | 61131 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 1664 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 1669 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 60830 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 60831 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 60832 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 61650 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 61651 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 69360 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 9263 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 1839 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 60830 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 60831 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 60832 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 68894 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 8891 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 8920 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 26/06/1949 | 60826 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 1664 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 1669 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 61650 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 61651 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 07/1949 | 69360 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 77042 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 77047 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 77372 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 78514 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 07/1949 | 9263 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 1664 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 1669 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 1908 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 1956 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 61650 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 61651 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 61829 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 61870 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 61913 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 07/1949 | 69360 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 07/1949 | 9263 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 02/07/1949 | 60826 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 02/07/1949 | 60826 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 77042 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 77047 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 77372 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 78514 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 77042 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 77047 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 77372 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 78514 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 69286 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 64375 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 69286 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 69286 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 61647 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/01/1950 | 77209 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 77047 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 77209 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 69560 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 77209 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 77261 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 08/04/1950 | 69324 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 09/04/1950 | 60815 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 09/04/1950 | 60845 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/04/1950 | 61647 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/04/1950 | 61669 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 09/04/1950 | 69312 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/04/1950 | 64798 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/04/1950 | 64838 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1950 | 90051 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1950 | 90638 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/10/1950 | 64798 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/10/1950 | 64838 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/10/1950 | 77209 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/10/1950 | 90051 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/10/1950 | 90638 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/01/1951 | 60871 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/01/1951 | 60915 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/01/1951 | 60818 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/01/1951 | 60820 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 60871 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 60915 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 64313 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 64394 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 60871 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 60915 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 64375 | Transfer out to: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/02/1951 | 60859 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/02/1951 | 60832 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 64225 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 64235 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 64238 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 64249 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 64257 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 64273 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 04/03/1951 | 60863 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 05/03/1951 | 60826 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 90638 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 90648 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 60863 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 90638 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 90648 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 60863 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 90638 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 90648 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 69560 | Transfer out to: | 34C | Hatfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 90672 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/05/1951 | 61368 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 61368 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 61368 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 61650 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 61664 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/05/1951 | 61367 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 61367 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 61367 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 90448 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 90484 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 90574 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 10/06/1951 | 60890 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 10/06/1951 | 60815 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 16/06/1951 | 60890 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 16/06/1951 | 60890 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 90448 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 90484 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 90574 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1951 | 64394 | Transfer out to: | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 90448 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 90484 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 90574 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 24/06/1951 | 60879 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 24/06/1951 | 60830 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 60879 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 60879 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 02/09/1951 | 60878 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 02/09/1951 | 60966 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 02/09/1951 | 60845 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 02/09/1951 | 60853 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 60876 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 60966 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 60966 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 90043 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 90411 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 90532 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 90697 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/09/1951 | 61110 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/09/1951 | 61376 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 61110 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 61376 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 90187 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 61110 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 61376 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 61651 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 90043 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 90187 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 90411 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 90532 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 90697 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 90043 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 90187 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 90411 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 90532 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 90697 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 90499 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 90187 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 90499 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/11/1951 | 61381 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/11/1951 | 61110 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/12/1951 | 61381 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/12/1951 | 61381 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 61381 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 64433 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 61381 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/12/1951 | 61367 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/12/1951 | 61376 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 64428 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C13 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 67408 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 64428 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | C13 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 67408 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 64428 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 64433 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | C13 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 67408 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 90411 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/05/1952 | 61078 | Transfer in from: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 61078 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 61078 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 90043 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 90532 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/07/1952 | 61078 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 90369 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 90369 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 90369 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 10/08/1952 | 60871 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 64331 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 90369 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/09/1952 | 61111 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/09/1952 | 60871 | Transfer in from: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/09/1952 | 61078 | Transfer in from: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/09/1952 | 61111 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 64331 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 64331 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 60871 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 61078 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 60871 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 61078 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 90263 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 90007 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 90263 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 90263 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 90486 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 90263 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 17/01/1953 | 90007 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 08/02/1953 | 60820 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 08/02/1953 | 60966 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 69621 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | C13 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 67408 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 15/03/1953 | 60831 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 15/03/1953 | 60890 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 69269 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 26/04/1953 | 60890 | Transfer in from: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 90263 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 90648 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 17/05/1953 | 60800 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 17/05/1953 | 60820 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 17/05/1953 | 60863 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 64418 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 69621 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/06/1953 | 60831 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/06/1953 | 60800 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 30/08/1953 | 60876 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/10/1953 | 13065 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/10/1953 | 13066 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 90474 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/11/1953 | 13067 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/11/1953 | 13068 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/11/1953 | 13069 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 69286 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 69360 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 64313 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 69263 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 69310 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 03/01/1954 | 60859 | Transfer out to: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/02/1954 | 60878 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/02/1954 | 61381 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/06/1954 | 61192 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/11/1954 | 61283 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/11/1954 | 61381 | Transfer in from: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/01/1955 | 61111 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 90299 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 90403 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/02/1955 | 61111 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/02/1955 | 61283 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/02/1955 | 61381 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 12/03/1955 | 69050 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 67789 | Transfer in from: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 13065 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 76035 | Transfer in from: | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 07/07/1955 | 69069 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 64300 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 64431 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 09/10/1955 | 60815 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 09/10/1955 | 60871 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 90208 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 90433 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 90491 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 43063 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 43106 | Transfer in from: | 31D | South Lynn | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 61841 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 61842 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 61843 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 61853 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 61866 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 90208 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 90484 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 90491 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/10/1956 | 64431 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 64438 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 90346 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Diesel | D3/14 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 15004 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 67771 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 64438 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/02/1957 | 90066 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Diesel | D3/14 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 15004 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 05/05/1957 | 60817 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/06/1957 | 61271 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/06/1957 | 60879 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 61804 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 61838 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/09/1957 | 61186 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 01/09/1957 | 60831 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/09/1957 | 64300 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 17/11/1957 | 60815 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 08/12/1957 | 60815 | Transfer in from: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 61966 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 61809 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 61824 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 61866 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 61966 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/02/1958 | 90065 | Transfer out to: | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/02/1958 | 90065 | Transfer in from: | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/07/1958 | 64225 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 67740 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/10/1958 | 64249 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 43330 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 43389 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 43394 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 64331 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 64418 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 64428 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 61882 | Transfer in from: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/05/1959 | 61853 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/07/1959 | 61028 | Transfer in from: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/07/1959 | 61832 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/07/1959 | 61913 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/07/1959 | 43389 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 25/07/1959 | 60815 | Transfer out to: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 25/07/1959 | 60915 | Transfer out to: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 15/08/1959 | 60890 | Transfer out to: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 90251 | Transfer in from: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 90701 | Transfer in from: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/10/1959 | 64238 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/10/1959 | 61187 | Transfer in from: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 90524 | Transfer in from: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 92013 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 92013 | Transfer out to: | 16D | Annesley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/11/1959 | 61106 | Transfer in from: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 42335 | Transfer in from: | 14C | St Albans | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 07/11/1959 | 42336 | Transfer in from: | 14C | St Albans | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 42349 | Transfer in from: | 18C | Hasland | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/11/1959 | 61085 | Transfer in from: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 12072 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/12/1959 | 64235 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 90563 | Transfer in from: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 90251 | Transfer out to: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/12/1959 | 64273 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/01/1960 | 61187 | Transfer out to: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 12072 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/02/1960 | 42336 | Transfer out to: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 42437 | Transfer in from: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 42453 | Transfer in from: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 42456 | Transfer in from: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 42335 | Transfer out to: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 42349 | Transfer out to: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/03/1960 | D3861 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 61910 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 67743 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 42437 | Transfer out to: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 42453 | Transfer out to: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 21/03/1960 | 61838 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 61865 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1960 | D3861 | Transfer out to: | 16D | Annesley | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 12072 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 28/05/1960 | 61882 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/06/1960 | 64742 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/06/1960 | 64747 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/06/1960 | 64809 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/06/1960 | 64257 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 61851 | Transfer in from: | 12C | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 43330 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 09/07/1960 | 43394 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 03/09/1960 | 67743 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 12072 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/09/1960 | 61192 | Transfer out to: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/10/1960 | 61085 | Transfer out to: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/12/1960 | D3059 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/02/1961 | D3059 | Transfer out to: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/05/1961 | D3059 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 06/1961 | 61865 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | D3059 | Transfer out to: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/07/1961 | 61824 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 67740 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 29/07/1961 | 67781 | Transfer in from: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/08/1961 | 61011 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 21/08/1961 | 61842 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 45223 | Transfer in from: | 16D | Annesley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/11/1961 | D3056 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/11/1961 | 61851 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/12/1961 | D3056 | Transfer out to: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/01/1962 | 61011 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/01/1962 | 64809 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/01/1962 | 61368 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/02/1962 | 61913 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 61809 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/03/1962 | 61192 | Transfer in from: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/03/1962 | 61116 | Transfer in from: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/03/1962 | 61136 | Transfer in from: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/03/1962 | D3059 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/03/1962 | 61063 | Transfer in from: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/03/1962 | 61187 | Transfer in from: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/03/1962 | 61206 | Transfer in from: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/03/1962 | 61380 | Transfer in from: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 45223 | Transfer out to: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 67710 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 67733 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 43063 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/03/1962 | 61063 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/03/1962 | 61380 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 43106 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 61804 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 61841 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/04/1962 | 64955 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/06/1962 | D3059 | Transfer out to: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 42157 | Transfer in from: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 42178 | Transfer in from: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 42250 | Transfer in from: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 42251 | Transfer in from: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 42252 | Transfer in from: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 42253 | Transfer in from: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 42281 | Transfer in from: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 73010 | Transfer in from: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 73032 | Transfer in from: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 73045 | Transfer in from: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 73053 | Transfer in from: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 76044 | Transfer in from: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 76035 | Transfer out to: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 76052 | Transfer in from: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 42291 | Transfer in from: | 17C | Rowsley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 42568 | Transfer in from: | 17C | Rowsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/07/1962 | 61008 | Transfer in from: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/07/1962 | 61269 | Transfer in from: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/07/1962 | 61369 | Transfer in from: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 61910 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 64742 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 64955 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/07/1962 | 64727 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/07/1962 | 64875 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/07/1962 | 61271 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/08/1962 | 61039 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 42291 | Transfer out to: | 17C | Rowsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/09/1962 | 61187 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/09/1962 | 61206 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 44688 | Transfer in from: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 44691 | Transfer in from: | 14E | Bedford | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 44846 | Transfer in from: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 45238 | Transfer in from: | 14E | Bedford | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 45285 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 45335 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 45342 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 73000 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 76087 | Transfer in from: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 44667 | Transfer in from: | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 45262 | Transfer in from: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 90403 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 06/10/1962 | 42568 | Transfer out to: | 17C | Rowsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/10/1962 | 61028 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/10/1962 | 61078 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/10/1962 | 61192 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 67710 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 67733 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 67781 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 67789 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/10/1962 | 64875 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/10/1962 | 61136 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/10/1962 | 64727 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 27/10/1962 | 67771 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/11/1962 | 61106 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/11/1962 | 61832 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/11/1962 | 61843 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/11/1962 | 61186 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/11/1962 | 61039 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 64747 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/11/1962 | D3058 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/11/1962 | 61369 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/11/1962 | 61269 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 45262 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 90701 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | D3058 | Transfer out to: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 90137 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 90638 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 73066 | Transfer in from: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 73159 | Transfer in from: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 45238 | Transfer out to: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 45335 | Transfer out to: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 45342 | Transfer out to: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 48650 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 90589 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 90669 | Transfer in from: | 26F | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 48385 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 48386 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/02/1963 | 48121 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/02/1963 | 90570 | Transfer in from: | 26F | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 48387 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/02/1963 | 48002 | Transfer in from: | 16D | Annesley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/02/1963 | 48007 | Transfer in from: | 16D | Annesley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/02/1963 | 48010 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/02/1963 | 73069 | Transfer in from: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/03/1963 | 73156 | Transfer in from: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 44846 | Transfer out to: | 16D | Annesley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/03/1963 | 61116 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/03/1963 | 61008 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/04/1963 | D3058 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 27/04/1963 | 42281 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/05/1963 | D3058 | Transfer out to: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 44777 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 45116 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 45279 | Transfer in from: | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 45444 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 73053 | Transfer out to: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 73066 | Transfer out to: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 73069 | Transfer out to: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 73156 | Transfer out to: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 90066 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 90524 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 48336 | Transfer in from: | 15B | Kettering | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 48611 | Transfer in from: | 15B | Kettering | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 44688 | Transfer out to: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45444 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 22/06/1963 | 42253 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 29/06/1963 | 42178 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/07/1963 | 48005 | Transfer in from: | 17C | Rowsley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/07/1963 | 48081 | Transfer in from: | 17C | Rowsley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/07/1963 | 48027 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/07/1963 | 48061 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/07/1963 | 48088 | Transfer in from: | 17C | Rowsley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/07/1963 | 48654 | Transfer in from: | 17D | Rowsley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 20/07/1963 | 42157 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/07/1963 | 48727 | Transfer in from: | 16D | Annesley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/08/1963 | 48011 | Transfer in from: | 16D | Annesley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/08/1963 | 48527 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/08/1963 | 73053 | Transfer in from: | 14E | Bedford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/08/1963 | 73071 | Transfer in from: | 14E | Bedford | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/08/1963 | 44667 | Transfer out to: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/08/1963 | 44777 | Transfer out to: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/08/1963 | 42082 | Transfer in from: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/08/1963 | 48517 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/08/1963 | 44691 | Transfer out to: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 48600 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 76052 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 76087 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 73011 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 73073 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 73157 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 45116 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 45279 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 45285 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 90218 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 90346 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 90365 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 90433 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 90672 | Transfer out to: | 16D | Nottingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 90697 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 90237 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Toton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 90237 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/02/1964 | 90486 | Transfer out to: | 16D | Nottingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/02/1964 | 90570 | Transfer out to: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/02/1964 | 90669 | Transfer out to: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/02/1964 | 90563 | Transfer out to: | 16D | Nottingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 90589 | Transfer out to: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 90574 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/02/1964 | 48600 | Transfer out to: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/02/1964 | 48727 | Transfer out to: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 90299 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 90448 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/03/1964 | 90065 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 90040 | Transfer in from: | 16D | Nottingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 90218 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Toton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 90299 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Toton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 90346 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Toton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 90365 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Toton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 90433 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Toton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 90448 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Toton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 90486 | Transfer in from: | 16D | Nottingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 90516 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Toton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 90520 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Toton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 90563 | Transfer in from: | 16D | Nottingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 90570 | Transfer in from: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 90589 | Transfer in from: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 90669 | Transfer in from: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 90672 | Transfer in from: | 16D | Nottingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 90697 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 48007 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 48650 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 90040 | Transfer out to: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 90346 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 90365 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 90448 | Transfer out to: | 9J | Agecroft | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 90474 | Transfer out to: | 8L | Aintree | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 90486 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 90516 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 90520 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 90563 | Transfer out to: | 8L | Aintree | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 90669 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 90697 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 90218 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 90299 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 90433 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 90570 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 90589 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 90672 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 48386 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 42251 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 42252 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 73045 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 76044 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 73032 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 73053 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 73073 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 73159 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 48654 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 48611 | Transfer out to: | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 12/12/1964 | 42250 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 19/12/1964 | 42103 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 44762 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 44763 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 44764 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 44814 | Transfer in from: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 45027 | Transfer in from: | 2J | Aston | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 73000 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 73010 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 73011 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 73071 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 73157 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 48757 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 48387 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/02/1965 | D4111 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/02/1965 | 45027 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/02/1965 | 48757 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/03/1965 | D4111 | Transfer out to: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/03/1965 | 48027 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/04/1965 | D3069 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | D3068 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 24/04/1965 | 42456 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/05/1965 | 48035 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 44763 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/05/1965 | 48506 | Transfer in from: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/05/1965 | 48385 | Transfer out to: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 22/05/1965 | 42103 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D3066 | Transfer out to: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D3067 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 44762 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 44764 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 44814 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 48002 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 48005 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 48010 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 48011 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 48035 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 48061 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 48081 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 48088 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 48121 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 48336 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 48506 | Transfer out to: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 48517 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 48527 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 19/06/1965 | 42082 | Condemned |