Depot: Manchester Division
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 17/06/1968 | D200 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 17/06/1968 | D201 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 17/06/1968 | D202 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 17/06/1968 | D203 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 17/06/1968 | D204 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 17/06/1968 | D205 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 17/06/1968 | D212 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 17/06/1968 | D213 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 17/06/1968 | D214 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 17/06/1968 | D225 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 17/06/1968 | D226 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 17/06/1968 | D227 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 17/06/1968 | D228 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 17/06/1968 | D290 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 17/06/1968 | D291 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 17/06/1968 | D292 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 17/06/1968 | D293 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 17/06/1968 | D294 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 17/06/1968 | D344 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 17/06/1968 | D369 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 17/06/1968 | D370 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 17/06/1968 | D371 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 17/06/1968 | D372 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 17/06/1968 | D373 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 17/06/1968 | D374 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 17/06/1968 | D375 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 17/06/1968 | D376 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 17/06/1968 | D377 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 17/06/1968 | D378 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 17/06/1968 | D379 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 17/06/1968 | D380 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5050 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5052 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5053 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5054 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5055 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5056 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5061 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5062 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5063 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5064 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5065 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5066 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5134 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5135 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5136 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5137 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5138 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5139 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5142 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5144 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5145 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5146 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5151 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5152 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5153 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5154 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5155 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5156 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5197 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5198 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5199 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5200 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5211 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5212 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5273 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5274 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5275 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5276 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5277 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5278 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5279 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D5293 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D7513 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D7538 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D7539 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D7540 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D7541 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D7542 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D7543 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D7544 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D7545 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D7558 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D7573 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D7588 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D7589 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D7590 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D7591 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D7592 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D7594 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D7595 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D7597 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D7629 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D7630 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D7631 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D7647 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D7648 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D7649 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D7650 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D7651 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D7653 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D7674 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D7675 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D7676 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1968 | D7677 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 29/06/1968 | D229 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 29/06/1968 | D230 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 29/06/1968 | D231 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 20/07/1968 | D7626 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 27/07/1968 | D7614 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/08/1968 | D7613 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/08/1968 | D7590 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/08/1968 | D7591 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D295 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D296 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D300 | Transfer in from: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D5050 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D5052 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D5053 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D5054 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D5055 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D5056 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D5061 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D5062 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D7613 | Transfer out to: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D7614 | Transfer out to: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D301 | Transfer in from: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D302 | Transfer in from: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D303 | Transfer in from: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D304 | Transfer in from: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D7558 | Transfer out to: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D232 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D234 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D235 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D326 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D327 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D328 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D329 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D330 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D333 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D334 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D296 | Transfer out to: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D5063 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D5064 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D5065 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D5066 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D5134 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D5135 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D5136 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D5137 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D5138 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D5139 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D5142 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D5144 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D5145 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D5146 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D7626 | Transfer out to: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/11/1968 | D5210 | Transfer in from: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/11/1968 | D7585 | Transfer in from: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/11/1968 | D7629 | Transfer out to: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/11/1968 | D7630 | Transfer out to: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 25/01/1969 | D7513 | Transfer out to: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 25/01/1969 | D7545 | Transfer out to: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 25/01/1969 | D7631 | Transfer out to: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/05/1969 | D305 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/05/1969 | D318 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/05/1969 | D335 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/05/1969 | D336 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/05/1969 | D337 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/05/1969 | D7649 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/05/1969 | D7650 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/05/1969 | D7651 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/05/1969 | D7653 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D319 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D320 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D5292 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D7577 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D7538 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D7539 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D7588 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D7589 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D7647 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D7648 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 13/12/1969 | D5266 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 13/12/1969 | D5292 | Transfer out to: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 07/01/1970 | D306 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 07/01/1970 | D307 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 07/01/1970 | D308 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 07/01/1970 | D309 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/01/1970 | D5272 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D310 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D311 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D312 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D313 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D314 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D315 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D321 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D323 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D7569 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D7570 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D7574 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D7575 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D344 | Transfer out to: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D377 | Transfer out to: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D378 | Transfer out to: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D379 | Transfer out to: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D380 | Transfer out to: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 23/05/1970 | D201 | Transfer in from: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 23/05/1970 | D202 | Transfer in from: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 23/05/1970 | D203 | Transfer in from: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 23/05/1970 | D205 | Transfer in from: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 23/05/1970 | D206 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 23/05/1970 | D201 | Transfer out to: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 23/05/1970 | D202 | Transfer out to: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 23/05/1970 | D203 | Transfer out to: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 23/05/1970 | D205 | Transfer out to: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/06/1970 | D201 | Transfer in from: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/06/1970 | D202 | Transfer in from: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/06/1970 | D203 | Transfer in from: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/06/1970 | D205 | Transfer in from: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/06/1970 | D201 | Transfer out to: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/06/1970 | D202 | Transfer out to: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/06/1970 | D203 | Transfer out to: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/06/1970 | D205 | Transfer out to: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/06/1970 | D206 | Transfer out to: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/06/1970 | D228 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/06/1970 | D302 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 13/06/1970 | D302 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 13/06/1970 | D302 | Transfer out to: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/07/1970 | D7545 | Transfer in from: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 29/08/1970 | D228 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 29/08/1970 | D302 | Transfer in from: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D295 | Transfer out to: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D203 | Transfer in from: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D205 | Transfer in from: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D208 | Transfer in from: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D209 | Transfer in from: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D7589 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D203 | Transfer out to: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D205 | Transfer out to: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D5266 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D7545 | Transfer out to: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D7675 | Transfer out to: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D7676 | Transfer out to: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D7677 | Transfer out to: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/01/1971 | D7540 | Transfer out to: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/02/1971 | D316 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/02/1971 | D7645 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/02/1971 | D7646 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/02/1971 | D7654 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/02/1971 | D7659 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/02/1971 | D319 | Transfer out to: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/02/1971 | D5272 | Transfer out to: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/02/1971 | D5293 | Transfer out to: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/02/1971 | D7544 | Transfer out to: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/02/1971 | D7674 | Transfer out to: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 27/02/1971 | D5293 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 27/02/1971 | D7543 | Transfer out to: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 02/05/1971 | D5278 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D294 | Transfer out to: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D300 | Transfer out to: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D301 | Transfer out to: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D302 | Transfer out to: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D7542 | Transfer out to: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 05/06/1971 | D206 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 05/06/1971 | D332 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 05/06/1971 | D293 | Transfer out to: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 05/06/1971 | D330 | Transfer out to: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/07/1971 | D7536 | Transfer in from: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/07/1971 | D7539 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/07/1971 | D7540 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/07/1971 | D332 | Transfer out to: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 07/08/1971 | D303 | Transfer out to: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/08/1971 | D7536 | Transfer out to: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 14/08/1971 | D302 | Transfer in from: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 14/08/1971 | D303 | Transfer in from: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 14/08/1971 | D291 | Transfer out to: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 14/08/1971 | D371 | Transfer out to: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D291 | Transfer in from: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D371 | Transfer in from: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D7587 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D7588 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D7600 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D7601 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D290 | Transfer out to: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D7539 | Transfer out to: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D7540 | Transfer out to: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D7541 | Transfer out to: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D7573 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D7574 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D7575 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D7577 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/11/1971 | D7598 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/11/1971 | D7599 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 18/12/1971 | D302 | Transfer out to: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 18/12/1971 | D333 | Transfer out to: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5207 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5208 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D334 | Transfer out to: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7569 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7588 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 05/02/1972 | D319 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 05/02/1972 | D330 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 05/02/1972 | D377 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 05/02/1972 | D335 | Transfer out to: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 05/02/1972 | D336 | Transfer out to: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 05/02/1972 | D337 | Transfer out to: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/02/1972 | D5204 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/02/1972 | D7536 | Transfer in from: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/02/1972 | D5207 | Transfer out to: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/03/1972 | D5269 | Transfer in from: | D15 | Leicester Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/03/1972 | D5294 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/03/1972 | D5296 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/03/1972 | D7536 | Transfer out to: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/03/1972 | D7599 | Transfer out to: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 25/03/1972 | D317 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 25/03/1972 | D228 | Transfer out to: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 08/04/1972 | D5020 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 08/04/1972 | D5021 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 08/04/1972 | D5022 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 08/04/1972 | D5023 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 08/04/1972 | D5024 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 08/04/1972 | D5273 | Transfer out to: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 08/04/1972 | D5277 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 08/04/1972 | D5279 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D221 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D222 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D223 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D5274 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D5275 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D5276 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D5293 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D7659 | Transfer out to: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 2w/e | 10/06/1972 | D298 | Transfer in from: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 10/06/1972 | D5238 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 10/06/1972 | D5247 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 2w/e | 10/06/1972 | D212 | Transfer out to: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 2w/e | 10/06/1972 | D213 | Transfer out to: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 01/07/1972 | D5024 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/07/1972 | D7659 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 19/08/1972 | D5212 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/09/1972 | D5293 | Transfer in from: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/09/1972 | D7570 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/09/1972 | D5176 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/09/1972 | D5177 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/09/1972 | D5155 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/09/1972 | D5156 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5024 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5232 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 2w/e | 07/10/1972 | D292 | Transfer out to: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 07/10/1972 | D7598 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 07/10/1972 | D7646 | Transfer out to: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 07/10/1972 | D7659 | Transfer out to: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 04/11/1972 | D7523 | Transfer in from: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 04/11/1972 | D7539 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 04/11/1972 | D7540 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 04/11/1972 | D5151 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 04/11/1972 | D5152 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 04/11/1972 | D5153 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 04/11/1972 | D5154 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D7598 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D303 | Transfer out to: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/01/1973 | D7539 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/01/1973 | D7540 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/02/1973 | D255 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/02/1973 | D369 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/02/1973 | D233 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/03/1973 | D5295 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/03/1973 | D7600 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/03/1973 | D7601 | Transfer out to: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/03/1973 | D7645 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D7523 | Transfer out to: | WN | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D7595 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D7598 | Transfer out to: | KM | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 07/07/1973 | D255 | Transfer out to: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/08/1973 | D304 | Transfer out to: | KM | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/08/1973 | D5198 | Transfer out to: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/08/1973 | D5238 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/08/1973 | D5293 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/08/1973 | D5295 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/08/1973 | D7592 | Transfer out to: | WN | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/09/1973 | D7597 | Transfer out to: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D202 | Transfer out to: | HM | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D206 | Transfer out to: | HM | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 3w/e | 06/10/1973 | D298 | Transfer out to: | KM | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/11/1973 | D291 | Transfer out to: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/02/1974 | 40005 | Transfer out to: | KM | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 25146 | Transfer out to: | KM | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 40003 | Transfer out to: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 40021 | Transfer out to: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 40022 | Transfer out to: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 40173 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 40175 | Transfer out to: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 40176 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/08/1974 | 25026 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 12/10/1974 | 40170 | Transfer out to: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 12/10/1974 | 40171 | Transfer out to: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 12/10/1974 | 40172 | Transfer out to: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 12/10/1974 | 40174 | Transfer out to: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 12/10/1974 | 40177 | Transfer out to: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/11/1974 | 25237 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/01/1975 | 25058 | Transfer out to: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 22/03/1975 | 25050 | Transfer out to: | KD | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/07/1975 | 24020 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/07/1975 | 24021 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/07/1975 | 24022 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/07/1975 | 24024 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/08/1975 | 25235 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/08/1975 | 24023 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 23/08/1975 | 25244 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 25047 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 25049 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 25060 | Transfer out to: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 25119 | Transfer out to: | KD | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 25144 | Transfer out to: | KD | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 25239 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 25304 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 40123 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 3w/e | 29/11/1975 | 40111 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 2w/e | 07/02/1976 | 40026 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 08/05/1976 | 25061 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 26/06/1976 | 40106 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 10/1976 | 25082 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 04/1977 | 25054 | Transfer out to: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 2w/e | 12/03/1978 | 40114 | Transfer out to: | KD | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 2w/e | 12/03/1978 | 40121 | Transfer out to: | KD | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 11/1978 | 40105 | Transfer out to: | KD | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 11/1978 | 40109 | Transfer out to: | KD | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 24/08/1980 | 40108 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 14/12/1980 | 40119 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 28/12/1980 | 40110 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 28/12/1980 | 40112 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 01/02/1981 | 40032 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 01/02/1981 | 40116 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 31/05/1981 | 40023 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 31/05/1981 | 40031 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 31/05/1981 | 40120 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 07/1981 | 40009 | Transfer out to: | LO | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 07/09/1981 | 40117 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/10/1981 | 40113 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 08/11/1981 | 40014 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 20/12/1981 | 40107 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 14/02/1982 | 40127 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 14/03/1982 | 40115 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 14/03/1982 | 40130 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 20/09/1982 | 40128 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 17/10/1982 | 40025 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 14/11/1982 | 40008 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 24/04/1983 | 40027 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 29/04/1983 | 40030 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 08/05/1983 | 25027 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 13/11/1983 | 25097 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 06/01/1984 | 40034 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 15/02/1984 | 40126 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 25/04/1984 | 40029 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 24/05/1984 | 40129 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 23/07/1984 | 40001 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 13/08/1984 | 40035 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 02/09/1984 | 40004 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 03/09/1984 | 40033 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 01/02/1985 | 40118 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 04/10/1987 | 40122 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel |