Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
15/04/1966 |
D1939 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
16/04/1966 |
D1616 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
16/04/1966 |
D1617 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
16/04/1966 |
D1618 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
16/04/1966 |
D1619 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
16/04/1966 |
D1620 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
16/04/1966 |
D1621 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
16/04/1966 |
D1622 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
16/04/1966 |
D1623 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
16/04/1966 |
D1624 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
16/04/1966 |
D1629 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1631 |
Transfer in from: |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1632 |
Transfer in from: |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1633 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1634 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1635 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1682 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1683 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1684 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1685 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1686 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1687 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1688 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1689 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1690 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1691 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1692 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1693 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1694 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1695 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1696 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1697 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1698 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1813 |
Transfer in from: |
2E |
Saltley |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1814 |
Transfer in from: |
2E |
Saltley |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1815 |
Transfer in from: |
2E |
Saltley |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1834 |
Transfer in from: |
2E |
Saltley |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1837 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1838 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1839 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1840 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1841 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1842 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1843 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1844 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1845 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1846 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1847 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1848 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1849 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1850 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1851 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1852 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1853 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1854 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1855 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1856 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1857 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1858 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1859 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1860 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1861 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1962 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1963 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D1964 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D210 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D211 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D212 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D213 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D214 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D215 |
Transfer in from: |
1F |
Rugby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D217 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D226 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D229 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D230 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D231 |
Transfer in from: |
1F |
Rugby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D232 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D233 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D234 |
Transfer in from: |
1F |
Rugby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D235 |
Transfer in from: |
1F |
Rugby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D268 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D269 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D287 |
Transfer in from: |
1F |
Rugby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D288 |
Transfer in from: |
1F |
Rugby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D289 |
Transfer in from: |
1F |
Rugby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D290 |
Transfer in from: |
1F |
Rugby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D292 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D293 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D296 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D297 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D298 |
Transfer in from: |
1F |
Rugby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D299 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D300 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D301 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D302 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D303 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D304 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D305 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D306 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D307 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D308 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D309 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D310 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D311 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D312 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D313 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D314 |
Transfer in from: |
1F |
Rugby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D315 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D316 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D318 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D319 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D320 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D321 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D322 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D323 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D324 |
Transfer in from: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D325 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D326 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D327 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D328 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D329 |
Transfer in from: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D330 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D331 |
Transfer in from: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D332 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D333 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D334 |
Transfer in from: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D335 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D336 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D337 |
Transfer in from: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D338 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D339 |
Transfer in from: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D340 |
Transfer in from: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D341 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D342 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D343 |
Transfer in from: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D344 |
Transfer in from: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D369 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D370 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D371 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D372 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D373 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D374 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D375 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D376 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D377 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D378 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D379 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D380 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D381 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D382 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D383 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D384 |
Transfer in from: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
D1699 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
D1700 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
D1701 |
Transfer in from: |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
D1707 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
D1708 |
Transfer in from: |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
D1709 |
Transfer in from: |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
D1710 |
Transfer in from: |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
D1711 |
Transfer in from: |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
D1712 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
D1713 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
D1813 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
D1814 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
D1815 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
D1834 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
D216 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
D218 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
D219 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
D220 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
D221 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
D222 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
D223 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
D224 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
D225 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
D227 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
D228 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
D236 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
D255 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
D267 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
D291 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
D294 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
D295 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
D317 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
16/06/1966 |
D1940 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
16/06/1966 |
D1942 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
16/06/1966 |
D1942 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
16/06/1966 |
D1942 |
Transfer out to: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
18/06/1966 |
D1625 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
18/06/1966 |
D1626 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
18/06/1966 |
D1627 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
18/06/1966 |
D1628 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
18/06/1966 |
D1630 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
18/06/1966 |
D1714 |
Transfer in from: |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
18/06/1966 |
D1715 |
Transfer in from: |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
18/06/1966 |
D1716 |
Transfer in from: |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
18/06/1966 |
D1717 |
Transfer in from: |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
18/06/1966 |
D1718 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
18/06/1966 |
D1719 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
18/06/1966 |
D1720 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
18/06/1966 |
D1721 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
18/06/1966 |
D1722 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
18/06/1966 |
D1965 |
Transfer in from: |
86A |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
18/06/1966 |
D1966 |
Transfer in from: |
86A |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
18/06/1966 |
D1967 |
Transfer in from: |
86A |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
18/06/1966 |
D1940 |
Transfer out to: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
27/06/1966 |
D1943 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
29/06/1966 |
D1944 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
02/07/1966 |
D1627 |
Transfer out to: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
16/07/1966 |
D1942 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
16/07/1966 |
D1629 |
Transfer out to: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
16/07/1966 |
D1630 |
Transfer out to: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
16/07/1966 |
D1942 |
Transfer out to: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
23/07/1966 |
D1940 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
23/07/1966 |
D1626 |
Transfer out to: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
23/07/1966 |
D1628 |
Transfer out to: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
27/07/1966 |
D1941 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
01/08/1966 |
D1948 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
25/08/1966 |
D1949 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
27/08/1966 |
D1626 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
27/08/1966 |
D1627 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
27/08/1966 |
D1628 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
27/08/1966 |
D1629 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
27/08/1966 |
D1630 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
03/09/1966 |
D1626 |
Transfer out to: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
03/09/1966 |
D1627 |
Transfer out to: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
03/09/1966 |
D1628 |
Transfer out to: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
03/09/1966 |
D1629 |
Transfer out to: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
03/09/1966 |
D1630 |
Transfer out to: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
09/09/1966 |
D1950 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
14/10/1966 |
D1951 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
15/10/1966 |
D1945 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
15/10/1966 |
D1945 |
Transfer out to: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
22/10/1966 |
D1616 |
Transfer out to: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
27/10/1966 |
D1952 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
11/11/1966 |
D1954 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
D1954 |
Transfer out to: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
16/11/1966 |
D1953 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
19/11/1966 |
D1954 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
19/11/1966 |
D1624 |
Transfer out to: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
26/11/1966 |
D1625 |
Transfer out to: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
29/11/1966 |
D1955 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
03/12/1966 |
D1955 |
Transfer out to: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
17/12/1966 |
D1623 |
Transfer out to: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
22/12/1966 |
D1956 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
31/12/1966 |
D1617 |
Transfer out to: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
21/01/1967 |
D1618 |
Transfer out to: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
28/01/1967 |
D1957 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/02/1967 |
D1619 |
Transfer out to: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
18/02/1967 |
D1620 |
Transfer out to: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
25/02/1967 |
D1958 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
25/02/1967 |
D1959 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
D1723 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
D1724 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
D1725 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
D1726 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
D1727 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
D1801 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
D1802 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
D1803 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
D1804 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
D1805 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
D1806 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
D1807 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
18/03/1967 |
D1518 |
Transfer in from: |
34G |
Finsbury Park |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
18/03/1967 |
D1519 |
Transfer in from: |
34G |
Finsbury Park |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
22/04/1967 |
D1616 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
22/04/1967 |
D1617 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
22/04/1967 |
D1618 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
29/04/1967 |
D1616 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
29/04/1967 |
D1617 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
29/04/1967 |
D1618 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
06/05/1967 |
D1623 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
06/05/1967 |
D1624 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
06/05/1967 |
D1728 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
06/05/1967 |
D1729 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
13/05/1967 |
D1612 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
13/05/1967 |
D1615 |
Transfer in from: |
87E |
Landore |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
13/05/1967 |
D1619 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
10/06/1967 |
D1518 |
Transfer out to: |
34G |
Finsbury Park |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
10/06/1967 |
D1519 |
Transfer out to: |
34G |
Finsbury Park |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
05/07/1967 |
D200 |
Transfer in from: |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
05/07/1967 |
D201 |
Transfer in from: |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
05/07/1967 |
D202 |
Transfer in from: |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
05/07/1967 |
D203 |
Transfer in from: |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
05/07/1967 |
D205 |
Transfer in from: |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
05/07/1967 |
D206 |
Transfer in from: |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
05/07/1967 |
D208 |
Transfer in from: |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
05/07/1967 |
D209 |
Transfer in from: |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
22/07/1967 |
D7638 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
19/08/1967 |
D204 |
Transfer in from: |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
19/08/1967 |
D207 |
Transfer in from: |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
19/08/1967 |
D211 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
19/08/1967 |
D212 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
26/08/1967 |
D210 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
26/08/1967 |
D213 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
07/10/1967 |
D400 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D1730 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D1731 |
Transfer in from: |
86A |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D1732 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D1733 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D1735 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D1736 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D1737 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D1739 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D1740 |
Transfer in from: |
86A |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D1741 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D1742 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D1743 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D1744 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D1745 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D1746 |
Transfer in from: |
86A |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D1747 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D1748 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D1945 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D1946 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D1947 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D1955 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D214 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D215 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D216 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D217 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D218 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D219 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D220 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D221 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D222 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D223 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D224 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
21/10/1967 |
D217 |
Transfer in from: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
21/10/1967 |
D225 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
28/10/1967 |
D322 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
11/11/1967 |
D1960 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/11/1967 |
D1738 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/11/1967 |
D1742 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/11/1967 |
D1742 |
Transfer out to: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
D1616 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
D1617 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
D255 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
D267 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
D268 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
D269 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
D310 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
D311 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
D312 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
D324 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
D325 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
D331 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
D332 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
09/12/1967 |
D401 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
D289 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
D290 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
D316 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
D317 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
23/12/1967 |
D402 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
23/12/1967 |
D404 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
30/12/1967 |
D1749 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
30/12/1967 |
D1750 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
30/12/1967 |
D1751 |
Transfer in from: |
86A |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
30/12/1967 |
D200 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
30/12/1967 |
D201 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
30/12/1967 |
D202 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
30/12/1967 |
D203 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
30/12/1967 |
D204 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
30/12/1967 |
D205 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
12/01/1968 |
D403 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
13/01/1968 |
D225 |
Transfer in from: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
13/01/1968 |
D339 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
13/01/1968 |
D340 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
13/01/1968 |
D341 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
13/01/1968 |
D342 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
13/01/1968 |
D343 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
13/01/1968 |
D344 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
15/01/1968 |
D405 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
03/02/1968 |
D1618 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
03/02/1968 |
D225 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
17/02/1968 |
D1626 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
17/02/1968 |
D1627 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
23/02/1968 |
D410 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
05/03/1968 |
D413 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D370 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D371 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D377 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
12/03/1968 |
D407 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
16/03/1968 |
D1808 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
16/03/1968 |
D1809 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
16/03/1968 |
D1810 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
16/03/1968 |
D1811 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
16/03/1968 |
D1812 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
16/03/1968 |
D1813 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
16/03/1968 |
D1814 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
16/03/1968 |
D1728 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
16/03/1968 |
D1729 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
16/03/1968 |
D1730 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
16/03/1968 |
D1731 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
16/03/1968 |
D1732 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
16/03/1968 |
D1733 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
9w/e |
18/03/1968 |
D1615 |
Transfer out to: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
19/03/1968 |
D409 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
19/03/1968 |
D411 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
22/03/1968 |
D408 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
23/03/1968 |
D369 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
27/03/1968 |
D412 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
28/03/1968 |
D406 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
02/04/1968 |
D415 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
06/04/1968 |
D417 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/04/1968 |
D206 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/04/1968 |
D207 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/04/1968 |
D208 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/04/1968 |
D209 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/04/1968 |
D226 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/04/1968 |
D287 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/04/1968 |
D378 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/04/1968 |
D380 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
11/04/1968 |
D418 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
23/04/1968 |
D419 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
24/04/1968 |
D414 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
24/04/1968 |
D416 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
27/04/1968 |
D227 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
29/04/1968 |
D420 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
01/05/1968 |
D421 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
03/05/1968 |
D1961 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
07/05/1968 |
D422 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
08/05/1968 |
D423 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D1815 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D1816 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D228 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D288 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D291 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D292 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D293 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D294 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
D7638 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
21/05/1968 |
D424 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
31/05/1968 |
D425 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
15/06/1968 |
D372 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
15/06/1968 |
D373 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
15/06/1968 |
D374 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
15/06/1968 |
D375 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
15/06/1968 |
D376 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
15/06/1968 |
D379 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1616 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1617 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1618 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1619 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1621 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1622 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1623 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1624 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1626 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1627 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1631 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1632 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1633 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1634 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1635 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1682 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1683 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1684 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1685 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1686 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1687 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1688 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1689 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1690 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1691 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1692 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1693 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1694 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1695 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1696 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1697 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1698 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1699 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1700 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1701 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1707 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1708 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1709 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1710 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1711 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1712 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1713 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1714 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1715 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1716 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1717 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1718 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1719 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1720 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1721 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1722 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1723 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1724 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1725 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1726 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1727 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1735 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1736 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1737 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1738 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1739 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1740 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1741 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1742 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1743 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1744 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1745 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1746 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1747 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1748 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1749 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1750 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1751 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1801 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1802 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1803 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1804 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1805 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1806 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1807 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1808 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1809 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1810 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1811 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1812 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1813 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1814 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1815 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1816 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1837 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1838 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1839 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1840 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1841 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1842 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1843 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1844 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1845 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1846 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1847 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1848 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1849 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1850 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1851 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1852 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1853 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1854 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1855 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1856 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1857 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1858 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1859 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1860 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1861 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1939 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1940 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1941 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1942 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1943 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1944 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1945 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1946 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1947 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1948 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1949 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1950 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1951 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1952 |
Transfer out to: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1953 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1954 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1955 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1956 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1957 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1958 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1959 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1960 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1961 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1962 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1963 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1964 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1965 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1966 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D1967 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D217 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D229 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D230 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D231 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D232 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D233 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D234 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D235 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D236 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D295 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D296 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D297 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D298 |
Transfer out to: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D299 |
Transfer out to: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D300 |
Transfer out to: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D301 |
Transfer out to: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D302 |
Transfer out to: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D303 |
Transfer out to: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D304 |
Transfer out to: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D305 |
Transfer out to: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D306 |
Transfer out to: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D307 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D308 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D309 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D313 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D314 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D315 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D318 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D319 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D320 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D321 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D323 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D326 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D327 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D328 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D329 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D330 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D333 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D334 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D335 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D336 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D337 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D338 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D381 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D382 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D383 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D384 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D400 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D401 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D402 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D403 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D404 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D405 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D406 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D407 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D408 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D409 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D410 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D411 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D412 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D413 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D414 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D415 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D416 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D417 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D418 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D419 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D420 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D421 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D422 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D423 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D424 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
50 |
Co-Co |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D425 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
5w/e |
15/03/1969 |
D1612 |
Transfer out to: |
87E |
Landore |
|
|