Depot: Lydney
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 2039 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 2039 | Transfer out to: | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 2115 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 2350 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 29/12/1945 | 4856 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | 2146 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 1409 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 1456 | Snapshot | LYD | Lydney | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 1456 | Snapshot | LYD | Lydney | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2025 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2034 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2039 | Snapshot | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2043 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2044 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2045 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2080 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2091 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2114 | Snapshot | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2115 | Snapshot | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2121 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2131 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2132 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2144 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2146 | Snapshot | LYD | Lydney | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2146 | Snapshot | LYD | Lydney | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2153 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2155 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2160 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2350 | Snapshot | LYD | Lydney | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2350 | Snapshot | LYD | Lydney | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | 2096 | Transfer in from: | HFD | Hereford | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | 2160 | Transfer out to: | HFD | Hereford | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | m/e | 30/04/1948 | 1404 | Transfer in from: | HFD | Hereford | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 30/04/1948 | 2045 | Transfer out to: | HFD | Hereford | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 31/05/1948 | 2045 | Transfer in from: | HFD | Hereford | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 2515 | Transfer in from: | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | 2515 | Transfer out to: | HFD | Hereford | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 1404 | Transfer out to: | HFD | Hereford | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | 1406 | Transfer in from: | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | 1404 | Transfer in from: | HFD | Hereford | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | 1406 | Transfer out to: | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | 1409 | Transfer out to: | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 1424 | Transfer in from: | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 30/11/1949 | 1612 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1949 | 2045 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1949 | 2114 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | 1409 | Transfer in from: | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | 1424 | Transfer out to: | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 13/12/1949 | 1616 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 04/1950 | 2039 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 04/1950 | 2091 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 05/1950 | 2096 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 08/1950 | 2132 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 11/1950 | 2155 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1950 | 2153 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 2025 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 2121 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 2043 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 2144 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 1409 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 2034 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 07/1951 | 2044 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 2146 | Transfer out to: | 87C | Danygraig | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 11/1951 | 2131 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 2350 | Transfer out to: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 03/1952 | 2080 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 1612 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 1456 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | m/e | 02/1956 | 1404 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 1616 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |