Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 1010 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7399 Week
» 27841 Month
» 364687 Year
» 1586252 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Blaydon


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 06/1906 766 1st Allocation        
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 08/1906 775 1st Allocation        
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 01/1909 756 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 m/e 06/1917 2222 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 m/e 12/1918 2238 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 m/e 02/1920 2258 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 m/e 02/1920 2260 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 m/e 02/1920 2261 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 m/e 02/1920 2262 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 m/e 03/1920 2266 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 m/e 03/1920 2267 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 m/e 04/1920 2269 1st Allocation        
Steam H1 4-4-4T m/e 11/1921 1329 1st Allocation        
Steam H1 4-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1330 1st Allocation        
Steam H1 4-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1521 1st Allocation        
Steam H1 4-4-4T m/e 02/1922 1328 1st Allocation        
Steam H1 4-4-4T m/e 05/1922 1522 1st Allocation        
Steam N9 0-6-2T by 01/01/1923 1645 Snapshot        
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 07/1924 775 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 01/07/1924 2271 Transfer in from: CAR Carlisle Canal    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 01/07/1924 2281 Transfer in from: CAR Carlisle Canal    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 01/07/1924 932 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 07/07/1924 766 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 07/09/1924 756 Transfer out to: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 01/1925 2007 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 m/e 01/1925 2365 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam A5 4-6-2T on 14/11/1925 1756 1st Allocation        
Steam A5 4-6-2T on 02/12/1925 1760 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam A5 4-6-2T on 14/01/1926 1768 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam A5 4-6-2T on 14/01/1926 1771 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam A5 4-6-2T on 21/01/1926 1782 1st Allocation        
Steam A5 4-6-2T m/e 02/1926 1738 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 m/e 03/1926 2240 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam A5 4-6-2T on 31/03/1926 1790 1st Allocation        
Steam H1 4-4-4T on 21/07/1926 1328 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam H1 4-4-4T on 21/07/1926 1329 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 01/1927 2002 Transfer in from: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 27/01/1927 2261 Transfer out to: BOR Borough Gardens    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 02/03/1927 2267 Transfer out to: BOR Borough Gardens    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 31/03/1927 2231 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 31/03/1927 2252 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 24/05/1927 669 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 26/05/1927 1002 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 25/11/1927 1451 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 25/11/1927 1452 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 25/11/1927 1454 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam A5 4-6-2T on 25/05/1928 1756 Transfer out to: SALT Saltburn    
Steam A5 4-6-2T on 25/05/1928 1760 Transfer out to: SALT Saltburn    
Steam A5 4-6-2T on 25/05/1928 1790 Transfer out to: SALT Saltburn    
Steam H1 4-4-4T on 28/05/1928 2149 Transfer in from: SALT Saltburn    
Steam H1 4-4-4T on 28/05/1928 2150 Transfer in from: SALT Saltburn    
Steam H1 4-4-4T on 28/05/1928 2151 Transfer in from: SALT Saltburn    
Steam H1 4-4-4T on 28/05/1928 2152 Transfer in from: SALT Saltburn    
Steam A5 4-6-2T on 28/05/1928 1738 Transfer out to: SALT Saltburn    
Steam H1 4-4-4T on 27/06/1928 1517 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam H1 4-4-4T on 27/06/1928 1523 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam A5 4-6-2T on 27/06/1928 1768 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam A5 4-6-2T on 27/06/1928 1771 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam A5 4-6-2T on 27/06/1928 1782 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 24/10/1928 2007 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 11/12/1929 1418 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 19/12/1929 1425 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 03/01/1930 1466 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 08/01/1930 1429 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 26/01/1931 2252 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 26/01/1931 2252 Transfer out to: BLA Blaydon    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 07/07/1931 2002 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 07/11/1931 2252 Transfer out to: BOR Borough Gardens    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 07/11/1931 2260 Transfer out to: GHD Gateshead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 07/11/1931 2269 Transfer out to: BOR Borough Gardens    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 07/11/1931 2271 Transfer out to: BOR Borough Gardens    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 26/11/1931 2260 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 26/11/1931 2269 Transfer in from: BOR Borough Gardens    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 26/11/1931 2271 Transfer in from: BOR Borough Gardens    
Steam H1 4-4-4T on 24/05/1934 1526 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam H1 4-4-4T on 24/05/1934 1330 Transfer out to: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam H1 4-4-4T on 29/05/1934 1522 Transfer out to: SKN Stockton    
Steam H1 4-4-4T on 12/07/1934 1517 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam H1 4-4-4T on 12/07/1934 1523 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam H1 4-4-4T on 09/10/1934 1503 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 09/10/1934 2218 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 09/10/1934 1002 Transfer out to: NBH Blyth (North)    
Steam H1 4-4-4T on 14/06/1935 2150 Transfer out to: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam H1 4-4-4T on 05/10/1935 1521 Transfer out to: GHD Gateshead    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 20/12/1935 1584 1st Allocation        
Steam H1 4-4-4T on 17/03/1936 2149 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam H1 4-4-4T on 20/05/1936 1526 Transfer out to: SCA Scarborough    
Steam H1 4-4-4T on 29/05/1936 1503 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam H1 4-4-4T on 29/05/1936 2152 Transfer out to: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam H1 4-4-4T on 11/06/1936 2151 Transfer out to: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 15/01/1937 2377 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 07/02/1937 2262 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 08/03/1937 2242 Transfer in from: EHL East Hartlepool    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 08/06/1937 2247 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 08/06/1937 669 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 28/09/1937 2377 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 30/09/1937 2365 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 30/09/1937 932 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 24/08/1938 1488 Transfer in from: FER Ferryhill (Co. Durham)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 24/08/1938 1563 Transfer in from: FER Ferryhill (Co. Durham)    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 16/01/1939 2158 Transfer in from: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 17/01/1939 2146 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 17/01/1939 2150 Transfer in from: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 17/01/1939 2151 Transfer in from: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 18/01/1939 2143 Transfer in from: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 18/01/1939 2144 Transfer in from: SUN Sunderland    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 30/01/1939 1327 Transfer in from: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 08/07/1939 2296 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 15/07/1939 2225 Transfer in from: AFP Annfield Plain    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 17/07/1939 2247 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/10/1939 2231 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 17/01/1940 1585 Transfer in from: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 28/03/1940 2151 Transfer out to: HLB Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 27/05/1940 410 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 18/11/1940 1329 Transfer in from: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 15/02/1941 2214 Transfer in from: BOR Borough Gardens    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 15/02/1941 2247 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 15/02/1941 2272 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 29/03/1941 1311 Transfer in from: BOR Borough Gardens    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 29/03/1941 2279 Transfer in from: BOR Borough Gardens    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 29/03/1941 2300 Transfer in from: BOR Borough Gardens    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 14/05/1941 2258 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 14/06/1941 2222 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 14/06/1941 2269 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 14/06/1941 2271 Transfer out to: SKN Stockton    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 14/06/1941 2281 Transfer out to: SKN Stockton    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 31/10/1941 1327 Transfer out to: SUN Sunderland    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 31/10/1941 2143 Transfer out to: SUN Sunderland    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 27/12/1941 1329 Transfer out to: WHL West Hartlepool    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 1002 Transfer in from: NBH Blyth (North)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 28/03/1943 1458 Transfer in from: HAV Haverton Hill    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 28/03/1943 1459 Transfer in from: HAV Haverton Hill    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 28/03/1943 1587 Transfer in from: HAV Haverton Hill    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 1685 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 2118 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 2121 Transfer in from: NBH Blyth (North)    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 2125 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 430 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 444 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 474 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 654 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 655 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 715 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 1311 Transfer out to: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 28/03/1943 1585 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 2214 Transfer out to: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 2218 Transfer out to: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 2225 Transfer out to: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 2238 Transfer out to: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 2240 Transfer out to: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 2242 Transfer out to: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 2247 Transfer out to: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 2260 Transfer out to: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 2266 Transfer out to: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 2272 Transfer out to: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 2279 Transfer out to: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 2296 Transfer out to: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 2300 Transfer out to: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 19/06/1943 1453 Transfer in from: HAV Haverton Hill    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 19/06/1943 1469 Transfer in from: HAV Haverton Hill    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 19/06/1943 1472 Transfer in from: HAV Haverton Hill    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 19/06/1943 1509 Transfer in from: SKN Stockton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 19/06/1943 1551 Transfer in from: SKN Stockton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 21/06/1943 1468 Transfer in from: SKN Stockton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 21/06/1943 1487 Transfer in from: SKN Stockton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 21/06/1943 1490 Transfer in from: SKN Stockton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 21/06/1943 1508 Transfer in from: SKN Stockton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 23/06/1943 1470 Transfer in from: SKN Stockton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 23/06/1943 1482 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 26/06/1943 1463 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 26/06/1943 1471 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 26/06/1943 1533 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 26/06/1943 1544 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 14/07/1943 1548 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 16/07/1943 1449 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 16/07/1943 1543 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 16/07/1943 1585 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 27/07/1943 1536 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 27/07/1943 1547 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 27/07/1943 1580 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 03/08/1943 1448 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 03/08/1943 1456 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 03/08/1943 1476 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 03/08/1943 1481 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 22/08/1943 1835 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 08/09/1943 1459 Transfer out to: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 08/09/1943 1508 Transfer out to: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 08/09/1943 1563 Transfer out to: Twd Alnmouth    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 08/09/1943 1587 Transfer out to: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 22/10/1944 578 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 22/03/1945 1429 Transfer out to: Twd Alnmouth    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 23/07/1945 130 Transfer in from: HAV Haverton Hill    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 23/07/1945 771 Transfer in from: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 23/07/1945 939 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 23/07/1945 1418 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 23/07/1945 1468 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 23/07/1945 1544 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 23/07/1945 1551 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 28/07/1945 1062 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 16/05/1946 3445 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam N9 0-6-2T m/e 06/1946 1645 Condemned      
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 05/07/1946 3445 Transfer out to: STM St Margarets    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 29/09/1946 4815 Transfer in from: Twd Alnmouth    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 29/09/1946 4924 Transfer in from: Twd Alnmouth    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 13/04/1947 4815 Transfer out to: Twd Alnmouth    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 13/04/1947 4924 Transfer out to: Twd Alnmouth    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 20/07/1947 3353 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 20/07/1947 3376 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 20/07/1947 3385 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 20/07/1947 3391 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 20/07/1947 3398 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 20/07/1947 3403 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 20/07/1947 3412 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 20/07/1947 3444 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 20/07/1947 3448 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 20/07/1947 3259 Transfer out to: BOR Borough Gardens    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 20/07/1947 3260 Transfer out to: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 20/07/1947 3262 Transfer out to: SEL Selby    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 20/07/1947 3272 Transfer out to: CUD Cudworth    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 20/07/1947 3277 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 20/07/1947 3293 Transfer out to: WHL West Hartlepool    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 20/07/1947 3300 Transfer out to: WHL West Hartlepool    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 20/07/1947 3317 Transfer out to: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 20/07/1947 3318 Transfer out to: WHL West Hartlepool    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 27/07/1947 3399 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 27/07/1947 3432 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 27/07/1947 3252 Transfer out to: HAV Haverton Hill    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 27/07/1947 3278 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 18/09/1947 3302 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 05/10/1947 3356 Transfer in from: SKN Stockton    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 05/10/1947 3381 Transfer in from: WHL West Hartlepool    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 05/10/1947 3390 Transfer in from: SKN Stockton    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 05/10/1947 3394 Transfer in from: WHL West Hartlepool    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 05/10/1947 3413 Transfer in from: SKN Stockton    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 05/10/1947 3428 Transfer in from: SKN Stockton    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 05/10/1947 3437 Transfer in from: SKN Stockton    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 05/10/1947 3441 Transfer in from: SKN Stockton    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 05/10/1947 9887 Transfer in from: SUN Sunderland    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 05/10/1947 3255 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 05/10/1947 3285 Transfer out to: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 05/10/1947 3295 Transfer out to: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 05/10/1947 3306 Transfer out to: HAV Haverton Hill    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 05/10/1947 3331 Transfer out to: HAV Haverton Hill    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 15/11/1947 9887 Transfer out to: SUN Sunderland    
Steam D20 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 2349 Snapshot        
Steam D20 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 2360 Snapshot        
Steam D20 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 2371 Snapshot        
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5025 Snapshot        
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5029 Snapshot        
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5035 Snapshot        
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5062 Snapshot        
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5080 Snapshot        
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5100 Snapshot        
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5101 Snapshot        
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5111 Snapshot        
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5112 Snapshot        
Steam J36 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5295 Snapshot        
Steam J36 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5331 Snapshot        
Steam J36 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5343 Snapshot        
Steam D32 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 62448 Snapshot        
Steam D32 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 62449 Snapshot        
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 7245 Snapshot        
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 7255 Snapshot        
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 7259 Snapshot        
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 7265 Snapshot        
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 7268 Snapshot        
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 7277 Snapshot        
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 7313 Snapshot        
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 7315 Snapshot        
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 7323 Snapshot        
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 7325 Snapshot        
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 7329 Snapshot        
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 7339 Snapshot        
Steam V1 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 7636 Snapshot        
Steam V1 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 7658 Snapshot        
Steam J94 0-6-0ST on 01/01/1948 8010 Snapshot        
Steam J94 0-6-0ST on 01/01/1948 8014 Snapshot        
Steam J94 0-6-0ST on 01/01/1948 8015 Snapshot        
Steam J94 0-6-0ST on 01/01/1948 8019 Snapshot        
Steam J94 0-6-0ST on 01/01/1948 8021 Snapshot        
Steam J94 0-6-0ST on 01/01/1948 8024 Snapshot        
Steam J94 0-6-0ST on 01/01/1948 8029 Snapshot        
Steam J94 0-6-0ST on 01/01/1948 8035 Snapshot        
Steam J94 0-6-0ST on 01/01/1948 8036 Snapshot        
Steam J94 0-6-0ST on 01/01/1948 8037 Snapshot        
Steam J94 0-6-0ST on 01/01/1948 8038 Snapshot        
Steam J94 0-6-0ST on 01/01/1948 8058 Snapshot        
Steam J94 0-6-0ST on 01/01/1948 8059 Snapshot        
Steam J71 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 8284 Snapshot        
Steam N10 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9095 Snapshot        
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 15/02/1948 4865 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 24/02/1948 4949 Transfer in from: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 28/02/1948 4863 Transfer in from: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 28/02/1948 4711 Transfer out to: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 28/02/1948 4813 Transfer out to: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 09/05/1948 4926 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 09/05/1948 4927 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 09/05/1948 4941 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 30/05/1948 9853 Transfer out to: SUN Sunderland    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 30/05/1948 9865 Transfer out to: WBY Whitby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 29/08/1948 4812 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 29/08/1948 4858 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 29/08/1948 4940 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 29/08/1948 4982 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 29/08/1948 64925 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam D32 4-4-0 on 02/09/1948 62448 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 07/11/1948 4709 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 07/11/1948 4817 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 07/11/1948 4863 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 07/11/1948 4865 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 07/11/1948 4920 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 07/11/1948 4923 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 07/11/1948 4934 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 07/11/1948 64915 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 07/11/1948 64947 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 07/11/1948 69857 Transfer out to: SUN Sunderland    
Steam D32 4-4-0 on 13/11/1948 62449 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 14/11/1948 64869 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J21 0-6-0 m/e 05/1949 65029 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 23/05/1949 64982 Transfer out to: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 05/06/1949 64843 Transfer out to: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 17/07/1949 64854 Transfer out to: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 02/08/1949 62021 1st Allocation        
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 04/08/1949 62022 1st Allocation        
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 05/08/1949 62023 1st Allocation        
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 08/08/1949 62024 1st Allocation        
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 10/08/1949 62025 1st Allocation        
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 11/08/1949 62026 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 14/08/1949 64844 Transfer out to: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 14/08/1949 64925 Transfer out to: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 15/08/1949 62027 1st Allocation        
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 17/08/1949 62028 1st Allocation        
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 19/08/1949 62029 1st Allocation        
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 22/08/1949 62030 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 04/09/1949 3437 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 04/09/1949 63448 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 04/09/1949 64705 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 04/09/1949 64812 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 04/09/1949 64858 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 18/09/1949 4704 Transfer out to: GHD Gateshead    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 18/09/1949 64701 Transfer out to: GHD Gateshead    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 18/09/1949 64707 Transfer out to: GHD Gateshead    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 18/09/1949 64853 Transfer out to: GHD Gateshead    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 18/09/1949 64871 Transfer out to: GHD Gateshead    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 02/10/1949 64705 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 02/10/1949 64812 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 02/10/1949 64858 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 23/10/1949 4856 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 23/10/1949 4917 Transfer out to: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam J21 0-6-0 m/e 11/1949 65112 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 22/01/1950 4846 Transfer out to: BOR Borough Gardens    
Steam J21 0-6-0 m/e 04/1950 65101 Condemned      
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 28/05/1950 69851 Transfer out to: 51F West Auckland    
Steam V1 2-6-2T 4w/e 30/06/1950 67653 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 30/06/1950 67325 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 30/06/1950 67329 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 09/07/1950 64869 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 20/08/1950 64949 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 19/11/1950 64940 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 17/12/1950 63444 Transfer out to: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam J21 0-6-0 4w/e 23/12/1950 65062 Transfer out to: 51F West Auckland    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 4w/e 20/01/1951 68702 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 4w/e 20/01/1951 68019 Transfer out to: 54D Consett    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 04/03/1951 64852 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 21/03/1951 65111 Condemned      
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 24/03/1951 5667 Transfer in from: CUD Cudworth    
Steam J36 0-6-0 5w/e 24/03/1951 65295 Transfer out to: 65C Parkhead    
Steam J72 0-6-0T m/e 04/1951 69023 1st Allocation        
Steam J72 0-6-0T m/e 04/1951 69024 1st Allocation        
Steam J72 0-6-0T m/e 04/1951 69025 1st Allocation        
Steam J21 0-6-0 4w/e 21/04/1951 65039 Transfer in from: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam J21 0-6-0 4w/e 21/04/1951 65042 Transfer in from: SEL Selby    
Steam J21 0-6-0 4w/e 21/04/1951 65105 Transfer in from: SEL Selby    
Steam J72 0-6-0T m/e 05/1951 69026 1st Allocation        
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 02/05/1951 67255 Condemned      
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 19/05/1951 67325 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam J36 0-6-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 5331 Transfer out to: 64F Bathgate    
Steam J36 0-6-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 5343 Transfer out to: 65E Kipps    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 4w/e 19/05/1951 68029 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 5w/e 23/06/1951 68059 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam J71 0-6-0T 5w/e 23/06/1951 68267 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam J71 0-6-0T 5w/e 23/06/1951 68273 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 5w/e 23/06/1951 68021 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 5w/e 23/06/1951 68058 Transfer out to: 54A Sunderland    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 5w/e 23/06/1951 68059 Transfer out to: 52C Blaydon    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 5w/e 23/06/1951 68702 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 25/06/1951 67245 Condemned      
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 21/07/1951 67316 Transfer in from: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 21/08/1951 67313 Condemned      
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 12/09/1951 65105 Condemned      
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 13/11/1951 65025 Condemned      
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 05/12/1951 65080 Condemned      
Steam J21 0-6-0 4w/e 19/01/1952 65042 Transfer in from: 52C Blaydon    
Steam J21 0-6-0 4w/e 19/01/1952 65119 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J21 0-6-0 4w/e 19/01/1952 65042 Transfer out to: 52C Blaydon    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 06/07/1952 62002 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 06/07/1952 62010 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 06/07/1952 64703 Transfer out to: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 19/07/1952 67248 Transfer in from: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam N10 0-6-2T 4w/e 19/07/1952 69095 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 23/08/1952 67252 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam J21 0-6-0 4w/e 20/09/1952 65119 Transfer in from: 52C Blaydon    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 4w/e 20/09/1952 68731 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam J21 0-6-0 4w/e 20/09/1952 65035 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam J21 0-6-0 4w/e 20/09/1952 65119 Transfer out to: 52C Blaydon    
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 20/09/1952 65667 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam G5 0-4-4T w/e 10/11/1952 67252 Condemned      
Steam J72 0-6-0T 4w/e 15/11/1952 69026 Transfer in from: 52C Blaydon    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 4w/e 15/11/1952 69026 Transfer out to: 52C Blaydon    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 30/11/1952 64713 Transfer in from: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 13/12/1952 67304 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam J21 0-6-0 4w/e 13/12/1952 65039 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 04/01/1953 64864 Transfer in from: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 04/01/1953 64870 Transfer in from: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 04/01/1953 64897 Transfer in from: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 04/01/1953 64700 Transfer out to: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 04/01/1953 64713 Transfer out to: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 04/01/1953 64812 Transfer out to: 52c Alston    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 5w/e 21/03/1953 76024 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam D20 4-4-0 5w/e 21/03/1953 62371 Transfer out to: 52D Tweedmouth    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 18/04/1953 76024 Transfer out to: 52E Percy Main    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 07/06/1953 64812 Transfer in from: 52c Alston    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 14/06/1953 63408 Transfer in from: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 20/06/1953 43126 Transfer in from: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 20/06/1953 43128 Transfer in from: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 20/06/1953 67315 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam D20 4-4-0 4w/e 20/06/1953 62349 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam D20 4-4-0 4w/e 20/06/1953 62360 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 20/06/1953 67315 Transfer out to: 52C Blaydon    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 27/09/1953 63363 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam J71 0-6-0T 4w/e 24/10/1953 68284 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 31/01/1954 62006 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 28/03/1954 64897 Transfer out to: 52d Alnmouth    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 24/04/1954 67320 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 24/04/1954 67329 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 24/04/1954 67259 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 24/04/1954 67315 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam D20 4-4-0 4w/e 22/05/1954 62349 Transfer in from: 52D Tweedmouth    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 22/05/1954 67270 Transfer in from: 52D Tweedmouth    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 22/05/1954 67268 Transfer out to: 52D Tweedmouth    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 13/06/1954 64864 Transfer out to: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 07/07/1954 65042 Condemned      
Steam J21 0-6-0 4w/e 23/10/1954 65088 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J21 0-6-0 4w/e 23/10/1954 65103 Transfer in from: KBY Kirkby Stephen    
Steam V1 2-6-2T 4w/e 23/10/1954 67639 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 23/10/1954 67265 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 23/10/1954 67323 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 23/10/1954 67339 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam J21 0-6-0 w/e 13/12/1954 65100 Condemned      
Steam J21 0-6-0 w/e 13/12/1954 65119 Condemned      
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 18/12/1954 67259 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam V3 2-6-2T 5w/e 18/12/1954 67687 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 18/12/1954 67277 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 18/12/1954 67320 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam V3 2-6-2T 5w/e 22/01/1955 67682 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 22/02/1955 67304 Condemned      
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 19/03/1955 67265 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 19/03/1955 67320 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 14/05/1955 67341 Transfer in from: SBH Blyth (South)    
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 on 29/05/1955 77011 Transfer in from: 51F West Auckland    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 5w/e 18/06/1955 76049 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 5w/e 18/06/1955 43128 Transfer out to: 51H Kirkby Stephen    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 26/06/1955 64870 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 5w/e 23/07/1955 76046 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 5w/e 23/07/1955 43126 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam D20 4-4-0 5w/e 23/07/1955 62349 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 23/07/1955 67316 Transfer out to: 54A Sunderland    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 22/10/1955 67246 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 22/10/1955 67326 Transfer in from: SBH Blyth (South)    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 5w/e 22/10/1955 76045 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 5w/e 22/10/1955 76047 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 5w/e 22/10/1955 76048 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 22/10/1955 67320 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 22/10/1955 67341 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam J21 0-6-0 3w/e 12/11/1955 65070 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington    
Steam J71 0-6-0T 3w/e 12/11/1955 68267 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 21/11/1955 65088 Condemned      
Steam J21 0-6-0 5w/e 17/12/1955 65033 Transfer in from: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam V3 2-6-2T 5w/e 17/12/1955 67634 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam V3 2-6-2T 5w/e 17/12/1955 67683 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 17/12/1955 67259 Transfer out to: 54A Sunderland    
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 on 17/12/1955 77011 Transfer out to: 52c Alston    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 5w/e 21/01/1956 76045 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 5w/e 21/01/1956 76049 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam J21 0-6-0 5w/e 24/03/1956 65117 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 21/04/1956 67270 Transfer out to: 54A Sunderland    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 21/04/1956 67325 Transfer out to: 50F Malton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 13/05/1956 61414 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 13/05/1956 61469 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 10/06/1956 61414 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 3w/e 16/06/1956 43056 Transfer in from: 51F West Auckland    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 3w/e 16/06/1956 43057 Transfer in from: 51F West Auckland    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 3w/e 16/06/1956 43071 Transfer in from: 51F West Auckland    
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 w/e 16/06/1956 77014 Transfer in from: 50G Whitby    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 3w/e 16/06/1956 76046 Transfer out to: 51F West Auckland    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 3w/e 16/06/1956 76047 Transfer out to: 51H Kirkby Stephen    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 3w/e 16/06/1956 76048 Transfer out to: 51H Kirkby Stephen    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 17/06/1956 63461 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 17/06/1956 63462 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 17/06/1956 63464 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 17/06/1956 63468 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 17/06/1956 63470 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 17/06/1956 63471 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 17/06/1956 63472 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 01/07/1956 63353 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 01/07/1956 63391 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 01/07/1956 63398 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 01/07/1956 63399 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 01/07/1956 63403 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 01/07/1956 63428 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 08/07/1956 61469 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST m/e 21/07/1956 68037 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington    
Steam J21 0-6-0 4w/e 20/10/1956 65039 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 20/10/1956 43056 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 11/11/1956 64815 Transfer in from: Twd Alnmouth    
Steam V1 2-6-2T 4w/e 17/11/1956 67673 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 17/11/1956 43057 Transfer out to: 52D Tweedmouth    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 17/11/1956 43071 Transfer out to: 52D Tweedmouth    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 15/12/1956 67248 Transfer out to: 54A Sunderland    
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 19/01/1957 65687 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam J21 0-6-0 5w/e 19/01/1957 65039 Transfer out to: 54B Tyne Dock    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 19/01/1957 67246 Transfer out to: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 19/01/1957 67265 Transfer out to: 54A Sunderland    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 19/01/1957 67329 Transfer out to: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 10/02/1957 61019 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 10/02/1957 61100 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 10/02/1957 61238 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 16/02/1957 65675 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 4w/e 16/02/1957 68731 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam V1 2-6-2T 5w/e 20/04/1957 67639 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam V1 2-6-2T 5w/e 20/04/1957 67673 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam V3 2-6-2T 5w/e 20/04/1957 67687 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam V3 2-6-2T 4w/e 18/05/1957 67683 Transfer out to: 52D Tweedmouth    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 15/06/1957 67326 Transfer out to: 53D Bridlington    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 16/06/1957 63412 Transfer out to: 51G Haverton Hill    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 16/06/1957 63461 Transfer out to: 54B Tyne Dock    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 16/06/1957 63468 Transfer out to: 54B Tyne Dock    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 16/06/1957 64705 Transfer out to: 52d Alnmouth    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 30/06/1957 63399 Transfer in from: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 30/06/1957 64849 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 5w/e 20/07/1957 69001 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam V1 2-6-2T 5w/e 20/07/1957 67658 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 5w/e 20/07/1957 68059 Transfer out to: 54B Tyne Dock    
Steam J71 0-6-0T 5w/e 20/07/1957 68273 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 15/09/1957 63432 Transfer out to: 51B Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 10/11/1957 64849 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam J21 0-6-0 4w/e 14/12/1957 65070 Transfer out to: 52D Tweedmouth    
Steam J21 0-6-0 4w/e 14/12/1957 65117 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 14/12/1957 65687 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 08/06/1958 63470 Transfer out to: 54B Tyne Dock    
Steam J21 0-6-0 4w/e 13/09/1958 65033 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 14/09/1958 63378 Transfer in from: 54B Tyne Dock    
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 05/12/1958 65103 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 13/12/1958 D3673 Transfer in from: 52E Percy Main    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 13/12/1958 D3674 Transfer in from: 52E Percy Main    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 13/12/1958 D3678 Transfer in from: 52E Percy Main    
Steam J25 0-6-0 w/e 20/12/1958 65675 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST w/e 20/12/1958 68024 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 on 24/12/1958 D2049 1st Allocation        
Steam J21 0-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 65033 Transfer in from: 52F Blyth (North)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 on 17/01/1959 D2050 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 25/01/1959 63453 Transfer in from: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 25/01/1959 63464 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam V3 2-6-2T w/e 31/01/1959 67682 Transfer out to: 53B Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 28/02/1959 68732 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 28/02/1959 69001 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 08/03/1959 63352 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 08/03/1959 63362 Transfer in from: 54B Tyne Dock    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 08/03/1959 63462 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 08/03/1959 63471 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 08/03/1959 63472 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST w/e 02/05/1959 68014 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST w/e 02/05/1959 68014 Transfer out to: 52C Blaydon    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST w/e 02/05/1959 68038 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 14/06/1959 63366 Transfer in from: BOR Borough Gardens    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 14/06/1959 63377 Transfer in from: BOR Borough Gardens    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 14/06/1959 63384 Transfer in from: BOR Borough Gardens    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 14/06/1959 63386 Transfer in from: BOR Borough Gardens    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 14/06/1959 63400 Transfer in from: BOR Borough Gardens    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 14/06/1959 63402 Transfer in from: BOR Borough Gardens    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 14/06/1959 63431 Transfer in from: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 14/06/1959 63434 Transfer in from: BOR Borough Gardens    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 14/06/1959 63444 Transfer in from: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 14/06/1959 63456 Transfer in from: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 14/06/1959 63458 Transfer in from: BOR Borough Gardens    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 14/06/1959 61238 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 14/06/1959 64812 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 14/06/1959 64814 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 19/09/1959 D2048 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 19/09/1959 D2050 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 19/09/1959 D3673 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 27/09/1959 63456 Transfer out to: 52K Consett    
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 on 27/09/1959 77014 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 31/10/1959 68732 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 01/11/1959 62050 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 01/11/1959 62060 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 01/11/1959 61019 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 01/11/1959 61100 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 08/11/1959 63368 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 08/11/1959 63399 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Steam J25 0-6-0 w/e 07/05/1960 65663 Transfer in from: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam J21 0-6-0 w/e 07/05/1960 65033 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 12/06/1960 61025 Transfer in from: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 12/06/1960 61199 Transfer in from: 52D Tweedmouth    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 12/06/1960 61241 Transfer in from: 52D Tweedmouth    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 12/06/1960 61322 Transfer in from: 52D Tweedmouth    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 11/09/1960 61019 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 11/09/1960 63387 Transfer in from: 52K Consett    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 11/09/1960 63437 Transfer in from: 52K Consett    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 D2093 Transfer in from: 52E Percy Main    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST w/e 01/10/1960 68036 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 09/10/1960 64815 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 09/10/1960 64849 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 26/11/1960 D2105 Transfer in from: 52E Percy Main    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 26/11/1960 D2106 Transfer in from: 52E Percy Main    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 26/11/1960 D2165 Transfer in from: 52E Percy Main    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 10/12/1960 D2105 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST w/e 07/01/1961 68015 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 15/01/1961 61035 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 15/01/1961 61216 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 15/01/1961 64816 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 15/01/1961 64842 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 15/01/1961 64858 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam J25 0-6-0 w/e 21/01/1961 65663 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 19/03/1961 63429 Transfer in from: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 19/03/1961 63384 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 08/04/1961 D2055 Transfer in from: 52E Percy Main    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 08/04/1961 D2321 Transfer in from: 52E Percy Main    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 on 27/07/1961 D2335 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 20/08/1961 63368 Transfer out to: 52K Consett    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 20/08/1961 63377 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST w/e 09/09/1961 68010 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST w/e 09/09/1961 68014 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST w/e 09/09/1961 68035 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 07/10/1961 69024 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 07/10/1961 69025 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 07/10/1961 69026 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 21/01/1962 62010 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 21/01/1962 62025 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam V3 2-6-2T on 16/04/1962 67634 Condemned      
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 06/05/1962 62002 Transfer out to: 52K Consett    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 06/05/1962 62006 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 06/05/1962 62021 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 06/05/1962 62022 Transfer out to: 52K Consett    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 06/05/1962 62023 Transfer out to: 52K Consett    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 06/05/1962 62024 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 06/05/1962 62026 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 06/05/1962 62027 Transfer out to: 52K Consett    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 06/05/1962 62028 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 06/05/1962 62029 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 06/05/1962 62030 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 06/05/1962 62050 Transfer out to: 52K Consett    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 06/05/1962 62060 Transfer out to: 52K Consett    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 17/06/1962 61038 Transfer in from: 52G Sunderland    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 17/06/1962 61237 Transfer in from: 52G Sunderland    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 09/09/1962 61038 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 09/09/1962 61216 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 09/09/1962 61241 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 09/09/1962 61322 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 09/09/1962 63376 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 23/09/1962 63352 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 23/09/1962 63356 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 23/09/1962 63378 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 23/09/1962 63381 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 23/09/1962 63386 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 23/09/1962 63413 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 04/11/1962 61038 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 04/11/1962 61019 Transfer out to: 52d Alnmouth    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 04/11/1962 61025 Transfer out to: 52d Alnmouth    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 02/12/1962 63363 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 02/12/1962 63366 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 10/02/1963 61035 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 17/02/1963 63400 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 17/02/1963 63458 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 24/02/1963 61038 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 24/02/1963 63385 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 24/02/1963 63387 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 24/02/1963 63390 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 24/02/1963 63402 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 24/02/1963 63408 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 24/02/1963 63429 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 24/02/1963 63431 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 24/02/1963 63434 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 24/02/1963 63441 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 24/02/1963 63444 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 24/02/1963 63453 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 12/05/1963 63394 Transfer out to: 52E Percy Main    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 08/06/1963 D2048 Transfer out to: 52E Percy Main    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 08/06/1963 D2049 Transfer out to: 52E Percy Main    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 08/06/1963 D2055 Transfer out to: 52E Percy Main    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 08/06/1963 D2093 Transfer out to: 52E Percy Main    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 08/06/1963 D2106 Transfer out to: 52E Percy Main    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 08/06/1963 D2165 Transfer out to: 52E Percy Main    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 08/06/1963 D2321 Transfer out to: 52E Percy Main    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 08/06/1963 D2335 Transfer out to: 52E Percy Main    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 08/06/1963 D3674 Transfer out to: 52E Percy Main    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 08/06/1963 D3678 Transfer out to: 52E Percy Main    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 16/06/1963 61199 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 16/06/1963 61237 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 16/06/1963 63362 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 16/06/1963 63437 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam V1 2-6-2T w/e 22/06/1963 67636 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam V1 2-6-2T on 23/09/1963 67653 Condemned      
Steam J72 0-6-0T m/e 10/1964 59 Condemned