Depot: Hull Botanic Gardens
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | B14 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/10/1924 | 2112 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | B14 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/10/1924 | 2114 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | B14 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/11/1924 | 2111 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | B14 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/11/1924 | 2113 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | B14 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/11/1924 | 2115 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | B14 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/02/1925 | 2111 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | B14 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/02/1925 | 2112 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | B14 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/02/1925 | 2113 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | B14 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/02/1925 | 2114 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | B14 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/02/1925 | 2115 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/06/1931 | 848 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/06/1931 | 849 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/06/1932 | 848 | Transfer out to: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/06/1932 | 849 | Transfer out to: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | on | 17/05/1935 | 694 | Transfer in from: | SCA | Scarborough | ||
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | on | 30/05/1935 | 694 | Transfer out to: | SCA | Scarborough | ||
Steam | D17 | 4-4-0 | H | 12/1935 | 1871 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | H | 12/1935 | 1931 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | H | 12/1935 | 283 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | H | 12/1935 | 753 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 02/12/1935 | 1520 | Transfer in from: | SCA | Scarborough | ||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | S | 01/1936 | 4075 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | S | 01/1936 | 4349 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | S | 01/1936 | 4350 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | S | 01/1936 | 4514 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | S | 01/1936 | 4541 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | S | 01/1936 | 4542 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | S | 01/1936 | 4543 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | S | 01/1936 | 4544 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | S | 01/1936 | 4545 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | S | 01/1936 | 4546 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | S | 01/1936 | 4547 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | S | 01/1936 | 4549 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | S | 01/1936 | 4550 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 14/07/1936 | 2160 | Transfer in from: | Twd | Duns | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 08/09/1936 | 2159 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 23/09/1936 | 1517 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 04/07/1938 | 2160 | Transfer out to: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 12/10/1938 | 2160 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/10/1938 | 753 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | m/e | 12/1938 | 4550 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 27/05/1939 | 1517 | Transfer out to: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 28/03/1940 | 2151 | Transfer in from: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 04/01/1941 | 1521 | Transfer in from: | AUK | West Auckland | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 23/05/1942 | 2153 | Transfer in from: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 13/10/1942 | 2148 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | D17 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 02/1944 | 1871 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 12/01/1946 | 2147 | Transfer in from: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 12/01/1946 | 2151 | Transfer out to: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 29/04/1946 | 9868 | Transfer in from: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 29/04/1946 | 2153 | Transfer out to: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/08/1946 | 1071 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/09/1946 | 1074 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/09/1946 | 1080 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/10/1946 | 1084 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 11/1946 | 2141 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/11/1946 | 1010 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 04/1947 | 2142 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | on | 13/04/1947 | 9795 | Transfer in from: | SBK | Starbeck | ||
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | on | 13/04/1947 | 9796 | Transfer in from: | SBK | Starbeck | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 13/04/1947 | 9868 | Transfer out to: | SALT | Saltburn | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | m/e | 06/1947 | 7396 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | on | 05/07/1947 | 9798 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/07/1947 | 1215 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2119 | Snapshot | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2355 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2369 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2700 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2701 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2703 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2707 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2710 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2720 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2722 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2723 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2724 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2727 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2737 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2741 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2743 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2744 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2746 | Snapshot | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2754 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2757 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2767 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 62361 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 62367 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 62382 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 65626 | Snapshot | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 67399 | Snapshot | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 67399 | Snapshot | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7242 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7256 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7266 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7279 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7280 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7282 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7301 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7305 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7311 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7321 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7340 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7371 | Snapshot | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7371 | Snapshot | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7391 | Snapshot | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7391 | Snapshot | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7392 | Snapshot | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7392 | Snapshot | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7393 | Snapshot | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7393 | Snapshot | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7394 | Snapshot | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7394 | Snapshot | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7395 | Snapshot | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7395 | Snapshot | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7397 | Snapshot | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7397 | Snapshot | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | Y1 | 0-4-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8151 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8296 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 7266 | Transfer in from: | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 7266 | Transfer out to: | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | on | 17/01/1948 | 62367 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/02/1948 | 1094 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 1094 | Transfer out to: | HIT | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 7279 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/05/1948 | 61304 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/05/1948 | 61305 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/05/1948 | 61306 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/05/1948 | 1080 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/05/1948 | 61071 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/05/1948 | 61074 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/05/1948 | 61084 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 61304 | Transfer in from: | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 61305 | Transfer in from: | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 61306 | Transfer in from: | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 2355 | Transfer out to: | BRI | Bridlington | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 61304 | Transfer out to: | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 61305 | Transfer out to: | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 61306 | Transfer out to: | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 30/05/1948 | 9877 | Transfer in from: | AUK | West Auckland | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 30/05/1948 | 9879 | Transfer in from: | AUK | West Auckland | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 9877 | Transfer in from: | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 9879 | Transfer in from: | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 7242 | Transfer out to: | AUK | West Auckland | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 7266 | Transfer out to: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 9877 | Transfer out to: | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 9879 | Transfer out to: | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 27/06/1948 | 69854 | Transfer out to: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 11/07/1948 | 69866 | Transfer out to: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 15/08/1948 | 9890 | Transfer out to: | WBY | Whitby | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 12/09/1948 | 69873 | Transfer out to: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 2727 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 2744 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 2372 | Transfer in from: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 62379 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 62387 | Transfer in from: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 2369 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 22/01/1949 | 67755 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 67759 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 67763 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 05/03/1949 | 67764 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 19/03/1949 | 67765 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 62353 | Transfer in from: | BRI | Bridlington | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 62359 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 62365 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 2372 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 62379 | Transfer out to: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 62387 | Transfer out to: | BRI | Bridlington | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 17/07/1949 | 69879 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 17/07/1949 | 9867 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 62701 | Transfer out to: | BRI | Bridlington | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 62707 | Transfer out to: | BRI | Bridlington | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 68296 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 67254 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 67305 | Transfer out to: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | m/e | 11/1949 | 67399 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 12/1949 | 62383 | Transfer in from: | BRI | Bridlington | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 12/1949 | 62396 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 12/1949 | 62353 | Transfer out to: | BRI | Bridlington | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 12/1949 | 62359 | Transfer out to: | NLN | Northallerton | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 12/1949 | 62365 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 62383 | Transfer in from: | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 62396 | Transfer in from: | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 62383 | Transfer out to: | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 62396 | Transfer out to: | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 14/01/1950 | 62345 | Transfer in from: | NLN | Northallerton | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 30/01/1950 | 67354 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 67766 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 04/06/1950 | 69854 | Transfer in from: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 04/06/1950 | 69859 | Transfer in from: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 04/06/1950 | 69866 | Transfer in from: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 04/06/1950 | 69873 | Transfer in from: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 04/06/1950 | 69878 | Transfer in from: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 04/06/1950 | 69880 | Transfer in from: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 04/06/1950 | 69894 | Transfer in from: | SCA | Scarborough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 04/06/1950 | 69877 | Transfer out to: | 50E | Scarborough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 11/06/1950 | 69876 | Transfer in from: | SALT | Saltburn | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 69854 | Transfer in from: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 69859 | Transfer in from: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 69866 | Transfer in from: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 69873 | Transfer in from: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 69876 | Transfer in from: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 69878 | Transfer in from: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 69880 | Transfer in from: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 69894 | Transfer in from: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 67755 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 67759 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 67763 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 67764 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 67765 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 67766 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 69854 | Transfer out to: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 69859 | Transfer out to: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 69866 | Transfer out to: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 69873 | Transfer out to: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 69876 | Transfer out to: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 69878 | Transfer out to: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 69880 | Transfer out to: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 69894 | Transfer out to: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | on | 17/07/1950 | 69795 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 67284 | Transfer in from: | SBK | Starbeck | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 67284 | Transfer in from: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 67284 | Transfer out to: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 19/11/1950 | 69854 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 19/11/1950 | 69859 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 19/11/1950 | 69866 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 19/11/1950 | 69873 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 19/11/1950 | 69876 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 19/11/1950 | 69878 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 19/11/1950 | 69880 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 67755 | Transfer in from: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 67759 | Transfer in from: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 67763 | Transfer in from: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 67764 | Transfer in from: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 67765 | Transfer in from: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 67766 | Transfer in from: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 62703 | Transfer out to: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 67755 | Transfer in from: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 67759 | Transfer in from: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 67763 | Transfer in from: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 67764 | Transfer in from: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 67765 | Transfer in from: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 67766 | Transfer in from: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 67755 | Transfer out to: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 67759 | Transfer out to: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 67763 | Transfer out to: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 67764 | Transfer out to: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 67765 | Transfer out to: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 67766 | Transfer out to: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 67284 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1951 | 62717 | Transfer in from: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1951 | 62743 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 62717 | Transfer in from: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 62345 | Transfer out to: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 62717 | Transfer out to: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 02/1951 | 62361 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 02/1951 | 62382 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | on | 06/02/1951 | 69798 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | on | 11/02/1951 | 69791 | Transfer in from: | SBK | Starbeck | ||
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | on | 11/02/1951 | 69793 | Transfer in from: | SBK | Starbeck | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 67253 | Transfer in from: | SBK | Starbeck | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 67337 | Transfer in from: | 50D | Starbeck | ||
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | on | 09/04/1951 | 69793 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 67253 | Transfer in from: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 67337 | Transfer in from: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 67253 | Transfer out to: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 67337 | Transfer out to: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 62383 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 62396 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | on | 16/08/1951 | 69791 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 19/08/1951 | 69802 | Transfer in from: | 51K | Saltburn | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 19/08/1951 | 69811 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 19/08/1951 | 69855 | Transfer out to: | 51K | Saltburn | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 19/08/1951 | 69894 | Transfer out to: | 51K | Saltburn | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 69802 | Transfer in from: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 69811 | Transfer in from: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 69802 | Transfer out to: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 69811 | Transfer out to: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 06/07/1952 | 69836 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 06/07/1952 | 69837 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 69836 | Transfer in from: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 69837 | Transfer in from: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 69836 | Transfer out to: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 69837 | Transfer out to: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 67273 | Transfer in from: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 67254 | Transfer out to: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | on | 30/03/1953 | 69796 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 20/04/1953 | 67393 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 67254 | Transfer in from: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 67321 | Transfer out to: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 22/06/1953 | 67354 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 67352 | Transfer in from: | LTH | Louth | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 67353 | Transfer in from: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 67321 | Transfer in from: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Steam | J73 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 68363 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/02/1954 | 61068 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 13/06/1954 | 69835 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 67754 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 40056 | Transfer in from: | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1954 | 40012 | Transfer in from: | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 40057 | Transfer in from: | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 40059 | Transfer in from: | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 40060 | Transfer in from: | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 40061 | Transfer in from: | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 62710 | Transfer out to: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Steam | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 68151 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 5w/e | 18/12/1954 | 40045 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 18/12/1954 | 67261 | Transfer in from: | SBH | Blyth (South) | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 18/12/1954 | 67340 | Transfer out to: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 09/01/1955 | 69867 | Transfer in from: | 50E | Scarborough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 09/01/1955 | 69881 | Transfer in from: | SCA | Scarborough | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 09/01/1955 | 69802 | Transfer out to: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 22/01/1955 | 40917 | Transfer in from: | 21B | Bournville | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 22/01/1955 | 62701 | Transfer in from: | BRI | Bridlington | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 22/01/1955 | 62707 | Transfer in from: | BRI | Bridlington | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 22/01/1955 | 62710 | Transfer in from: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 22/01/1955 | 62750 | Transfer in from: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 22/01/1955 | 62766 | Transfer in from: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 22/01/1955 | 67755 | Transfer out to: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 22/01/1955 | 67764 | Transfer out to: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 08/03/1955 | 67301 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 04/04/1955 | 67371 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 12/04/1955 | 67353 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 67352 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 67391 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 67392 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 67394 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 67395 | Transfer out to: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 67397 | Transfer out to: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 29/05/1955 | 69802 | Transfer in from: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 29/05/1955 | 69867 | Transfer out to: | 50E | Scarborough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 29/05/1955 | 69881 | Transfer out to: | 50E | Scarborough | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 67755 | Transfer in from: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 67764 | Transfer in from: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 62701 | Transfer out to: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 62707 | Transfer out to: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 62750 | Transfer out to: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 62766 | Transfer out to: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 77000 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 77001 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 77010 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 25/09/1955 | 69860 | Transfer in from: | WBY | Whitby | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 25/09/1955 | 69879 | Transfer in from: | 50E | Scarborough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 25/09/1955 | 69886 | Transfer in from: | 50E | Scarborough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 25/09/1955 | 69888 | Transfer in from: | WBY | Whitby | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 40060 | Transfer out to: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 67254 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 67273 | Transfer out to: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 67321 | Transfer out to: | 54A | Sunderland | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 08/04/1956 | 40012 | Transfer out to: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 40060 | Transfer in from: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 10/06/1956 | 69858 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 10/06/1956 | 69882 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 62381 | Transfer in from: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 62396 | Transfer in from: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 62707 | Transfer in from: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 62766 | Transfer in from: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 67638 | Transfer in from: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 67663 | Transfer in from: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 67677 | Transfer in from: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 67684 | Transfer in from: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 67685 | Transfer in from: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 67686 | Transfer in from: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 67691 | Transfer in from: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 40045 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 40059 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 67754 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 67755 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 67759 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 67763 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 67764 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 67765 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 67766 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 62700 | Transfer out to: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 62707 | Transfer out to: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 67280 | Transfer out to: | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 67311 | Transfer out to: | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 40056 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 40057 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 40060 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 40061 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 08/12/1956 | 40917 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 67256 | Transfer out to: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/01/1957 | 61289 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 67337 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 67280 | Transfer in from: | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 67311 | Transfer in from: | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 67280 | Transfer out to: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 67311 | Transfer out to: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 05/1957 | 67282 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 67253 | Transfer out to: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 16/06/1957 | 69835 | Transfer out to: | 51E | Stockton | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 16/06/1957 | 69836 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 16/06/1957 | 69858 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 16/06/1957 | 69860 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 14/07/1957 | 69882 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 67263 | Transfer in from: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 67274 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 67341 | Transfer in from: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 68251 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 67261 | Transfer out to: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 67663 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 67677 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 67684 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 67685 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 67691 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 15/09/1957 | 69832 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 15/09/1957 | 69836 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 67663 | Transfer in from: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 67677 | Transfer in from: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 67684 | Transfer in from: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 62700 | Transfer in from: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 62701 | Transfer in from: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 62703 | Transfer in from: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 62707 | Transfer in from: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 62750 | Transfer in from: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 62381 | Transfer out to: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 62396 | Transfer out to: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 68251 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 09/11/1957 | 67341 | Transfer out to: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 10/12/1957 | 62757 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/12/1957 | 61080 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 17/12/1957 | 62724 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 2w/e | 28/12/1957 | 77000 | Transfer out to: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1958 | 62737 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 16/02/1958 | 69886 | Transfer out to: | 50F | Malton | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 62760 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 24/06/1958 | 62703 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 25/08/1958 | 69836 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 30/09/1958 | 62766 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 01/10/1958 | 69888 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 06/10/1958 | 69811 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 06/10/1958 | 69832 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 08/10/1958 | 62700 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 67640 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/10/1958 | 77010 | Transfer out to: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 20/10/1958 | 62767 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 28/10/1958 | 67263 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 30/10/1958 | 62741 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 03/11/1958 | 62754 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 04/11/1958 | 62750 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 20/11/1958 | 69879 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 03/12/1958 | 69837 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 16/12/1958 | 67274 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 24/12/1958 | 69802 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 67635 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 67682 | Transfer in from: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 61010 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 61068 | Transfer out to: | 50E | Scarborough | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 61080 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 61215 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 61289 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 61304 | Transfer out to: | 50E | Scarborough | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 61305 | Transfer out to: | 50E | Scarborough | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 61306 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 77001 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 62701 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 62707 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 62710 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 62717 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 62720 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 62722 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 62723 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 62760 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 67635 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 67638 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 67640 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 67663 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 67677 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 67682 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 67684 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 67686 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J73 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 68363 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/03/1962 | D2100 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/03/1962 | D2170 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/03/1962 | D2174 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1966 | D2100 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/04/1967 | D2155 | Transfer in from: | DG | Danygraig | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | D2155 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | D2170 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | D2174 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1970 | 12121 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1970 | D2100 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1970 | D2168 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1970 | D2171 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1970 | D2172 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1970 | D2174 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1970 | D3070 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1970 | D3074 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1970 | D3075 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1970 | D3077 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1970 | D3079 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1970 | D3080 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1970 | D3081 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1970 | D3232 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1970 | D3233 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1970 | D3234 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1970 | D3236 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1970 | D3313 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1970 | D3318 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1970 | D3323 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1970 | D3675 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1970 | D3676 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1970 | D3944 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1970 | D3945 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/10/1970 | D3074 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/12/1970 | 12121 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/02/1971 | D2112 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/02/1971 | D2174 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/03/1971 | D2158 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/05/1971 | D2168 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/11/1971 | D2100 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/12/1971 | D3080 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/12/1971 | D3313 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D3081 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/06/1972 | D3734 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/06/1972 | D3075 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/12/1972 | D2073 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/12/1972 | D2172 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/02/1973 | D2151 | Transfer in from: | 50D | Goole | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/02/1973 | D2152 | Transfer in from: | 50D | Goole | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/02/1973 | D2157 | Transfer in from: | 50D | Goole | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/02/1973 | D2169 | Transfer in from: | 50D | Goole | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/02/1973 | D2173 | Transfer in from: | 50D | Goole | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/07/1973 | D3070 | Transfer out to: | HM | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/11/1973 | D2173 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/07/1974 | 03151 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/07/1974 | 03152 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 27/07/1974 | 03137 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 09/11/1974 | 08317 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee West | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 09/11/1974 | 03157 | Transfer out to: | LN | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/11/1974 | 08093 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/11/1974 | 03171 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 28/12/1974 | 08004 | Transfer in from: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | 03157 | Transfer in from: | LN | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/06/1975 | 08099 | Transfer in from: | FH | Frodingham | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/11/1975 | 03169 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/12/1975 | 08004 | Transfer out to: | DN | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/12/1975 | 08063 | Transfer out to: | DN | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/12/1975 | 08064 | Transfer out to: | DR | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/12/1975 | 03157 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 04/01/1976 | 03063 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/05/1976 | 08093 | Transfer out to: | FH | Frodingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/07/1976 | 08435 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/07/1976 | 03158 | Transfer out to: | CR | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/07/1976 | 03137 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1977 | 08514 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 02/1977 | 08514 | Reinstated | 98S | |||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/1977 | 08514 | Transfer out to: | DR | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 02/1978 | 08164 | Transfer out to: | DN | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/03/1978 | 08513 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1978 | 08514 | Transfer in from: | DR | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/07/1980 | 08165 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/11/1980 | 08435 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/07/1981 | 08386 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/11/1981 | 08177 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/11/1981 | 08386 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/07/1982 | 08166 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/09/1982 | 08099 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/10/1982 | 08317 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/09/1984 | 08248 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/02/1987 | 08253 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/07/1987 | 03112 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/11/1987 | 03063 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/03/1988 | 08168 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/10/1988 | 08177 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/05/1989 | 03073 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/11/1991 | 08777 | Condemned |