Depot: Trafford Park (LNER)
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | by | 1921 | 694 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | by | 1921 | 695 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | by | 1921 | 696 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | by | 1921 | 697 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | by | 1921 | 698 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | by | 1921 | 699 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | by | 1925 | 5696 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | by | 1925 | 5697 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | by | 1925 | 694 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | by | 1925 | 695 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | by | 1925 | 698 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | by | 1925 | 699 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/06/1926 | 6106 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/11/1927 | 6105 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/11/1927 | 6111 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 02/1928 | 5694 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 02/1928 | 5695 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 02/1928 | 5696 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 02/1928 | 5697 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 02/1928 | 5698 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 02/1928 | 5699 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/08/1928 | 6108 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/08/1928 | 6106 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/08/1928 | 6108 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/08/1928 | 6106 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1929 | 6110 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/04/1929 | 6109 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/04/1929 | 6110 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/08/1929 | 6110 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/08/1929 | 6111 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/10/1929 | 6111 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/10/1929 | 6109 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/03/1930 | 6107 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/03/1930 | 6105 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/06/1930 | 6105 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/06/1930 | 6106 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 07/1930 | 5696 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/09/1930 | 6106 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/09/1930 | 6107 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/11/1930 | 6108 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 07/1931 | 5695 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 10/1931 | 5698 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/01/1932 | 6107 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/01/1932 | 6110 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/04/1932 | 6110 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/04/1932 | 6111 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/05/1932 | 6112 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/05/1932 | 6105 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/07/1932 | 6109 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/07/1932 | 6108 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/08/1932 | 6108 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/08/1932 | 6106 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 10/1932 | 5694 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 10/1932 | 5697 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 18/10/1932 | 5344 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 18/10/1932 | 5368 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/10/1932 | 6106 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/10/1932 | 6108 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/11/1932 | 6108 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/11/1932 | 6110 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 03/1933 | 5699 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/03/1933 | 6105 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/03/1933 | 6112 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/07/1933 | 6113 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/07/1933 | 6107 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/09/1933 | 1265 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/10/1933 | 6106 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/10/1933 | 1233 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/10/1933 | 1265 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 27/12/1933 | 5344 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 27/12/1933 | 5368 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/03/1934 | 6110 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/03/1934 | 6109 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/03/1934 | 1296 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/04/1934 | 1295 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/07/1934 | 6105 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/07/1934 | 6114 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/02/1935 | 6111 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/02/1935 | 6108 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/06/1935 | 6106 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/06/1935 | 6114 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/07/1935 | 6108 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/07/1935 | 6113 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/08/1935 | 2692 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/08/1935 | 1233 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | C13 | 4-4-2T | m/e | 12/1935 | 5114 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/12/1935 | 2693 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/12/1935 | 1295 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1936 | 5846 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/03/1936 | 6113 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/04/1936 | 6110 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/05/1936 | 1275 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/05/1936 | 1296 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/06/1936 | 6107 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/06/1936 | 6111 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/09/1936 | 1255 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/09/1936 | 6108 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/09/1936 | 2962 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/09/1936 | 2963 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/01/1937 | 6106 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/03/1937 | 1497 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/03/1937 | 2692 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/03/1937 | 6108 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/03/1937 | 6113 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/03/1937 | 6105 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/06/1937 | 2691 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/06/1937 | 1275 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/07/1937 | 2692 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/07/1937 | 1255 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/10/1937 | 6106 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/10/1937 | 6107 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/01/1938 | 1498 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/01/1938 | 1497 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/02/1938 | 1496 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/02/1938 | 2963 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/02/1938 | 1255 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/02/1938 | 2693 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/06/1938 | 1233 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/06/1938 | 1498 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/08/1938 | 6111 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/08/1938 | 6105 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/09/1938 | 1275 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/09/1938 | 2691 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/09/1938 | 1274 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/09/1938 | 1255 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/09/1938 | 6105 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/09/1938 | 6111 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/10/1938 | 1498 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/10/1938 | 2692 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/02/1939 | 1295 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/02/1939 | 1274 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/02/1939 | 2963 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/02/1939 | 2962 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/08/1939 | 1281 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/08/1939 | 1498 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/09/1939 | 6110 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/09/1939 | 6106 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/10/1939 | 1497 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/10/1939 | 1233 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/11/1939 | 2962 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/11/1939 | 1275 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/01/1940 | 2691 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/01/1940 | 1496 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/04/1940 | 6113 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/04/1940 | 6114 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/05/1940 | 6112 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/07/1940 | 6300 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/08/1940 | 6300 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/08/1940 | 1290 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/08/1940 | 1295 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/04/1941 | 6106 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/04/1941 | 6107 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/04/1941 | 2997 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/04/1941 | 1281 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/06/1941 | 6109 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/09/1941 | 6106 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/09/1941 | 6107 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/09/1941 | 6110 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/10/1941 | 6105 | Transfer out to: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/11/1941 | 1263 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/11/1941 | 1497 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/03/1942 | 6110 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/11/1942 | 6112 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/11/1942 | 6114 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/12/1942 | 1265 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/08/1944 | 6112 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/04/1945 | 6105 | Transfer in from: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/05/1945 | 6105 | Transfer out to: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/09/1945 | 1265 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/09/1945 | 1290 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/10/1946 | 1679 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/10/1946 | 1680 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/10/1946 | 1686 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/01/1947 | 1680 | Transfer out to: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/04/1947 | 4744 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/04/1947 | 4824 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/06/1947 | 1472 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/08/1947 | 1679 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/08/1947 | 1686 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/08/1947 | 1477 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/10/1947 | 1474 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/12/1947 | 1473 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2300 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2301 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2305 | Snapshot | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2307 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2312 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2313 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2317 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2325 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2329 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2330 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2651 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2656 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 67358 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 67370 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 67378 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7369 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C13 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7437 | Snapshot | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8540 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8585 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9252 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9255 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9304 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9336 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9343 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9361 | Snapshot | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9364 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9370 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 67358 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 67370 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 67378 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 17/04/1948 | 67366 | Transfer in from: | CHR | Chester Northgate | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/08/1948 | 61476 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 5137 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 65169 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 9326 | Transfer in from: | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 5155 | Transfer in from: | WIG | Lower Ince | ||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 02/1949 | 62329 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 40433 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 40479 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 40561 | Transfer in from: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 41166 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 464 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 527 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 539 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 628 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 18/07/1949 | 62317 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 15/08/1949 | 62330 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 628 | Transfer out to: | 7D | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 40561 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 41166 | Transfer out to: | 19G | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 12/10/1949 | 62313 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/10/1949 | 64733 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/10/1949 | 64727 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 11/1949 | 40479 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 11/1949 | 62300 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 06/02/1950 | 62325 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 04/1950 | 62301 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 04/1950 | 62312 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/05/1950 | 64954 | Transfer in from: | LIV | Brunswick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/05/1950 | 64733 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 12/06/1950 | 62307 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 40433 | Transfer out to: | 7D | Rhyl | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 69304 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 24/07/1950 | 62305 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 40527 | Transfer out to: | 4B | Northampton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/01/1951 | 64727 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 62651 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/03/1951 | 64723 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/03/1951 | 64823 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/04/1951 | 64901 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/04/1951 | 64954 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 69252 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 40464 | Transfer out to: | 4B | Northampton | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/04/1952 | 65137 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/06/1952 | 65155 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 67366 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 67369 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 68540 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 65166 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 62656 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 07/08/1954 | 40539 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 11/12/1954 | 69336 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 69255 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 13/08/1955 | 69364 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 69343 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 68585 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 14/12/1957 | 69326 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 69361 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 69370 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/02/1960 | 65169 | Condemned |