Depot: Grimsby
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/09/1912 | 1206 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/09/1912 | 1207 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/09/1912 | 1208 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/01/1917 | 1207 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/11/1919 | 1208 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 1920 | 1206 | Transfer out to: | KEA | Keadby |