Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 380 Today
» 1270 Yesterday
» 6743 Week
» 9325 Month
» 273958 Year
» 1495523 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Bradford Hammerton Street


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam J51 0-6-0T m/e 02/1914 159 1st Allocation        
Steam J51 0-6-0T m/e 02/1914 162 1st Allocation        
Steam J51 0-6-0T m/e 03/1914 164 1st Allocation        
Steam A5 4-6-2T 25/03/1924 5129 Transfer in from: ANN Annesley    
Steam A5 4-6-2T 21/04/1924 5129 Transfer out to: NEA Neasden    
Steam J39 0-6-0 15/08/1928 2699 1st Allocation        
Steam Q4 0-8-0 16/03/1929 5135 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam B6 4-6-0 15/06/1929 5416 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam B6 4-6-0 01/02/1930 5053 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam B6 4-6-0 13/05/1930 5052 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam B6 4-6-0 10/09/1930 5052 Transfer out to: ARD Ardsley    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 04/10/1930 6178 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam B6 4-6-0 29/12/1930 5052 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam J39 0-6-0 30/01/1931 1289 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 02/03/1931 6174 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam B6 4-6-0 14/04/1931 5052 Transfer out to: ARD Ardsley    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 04/06/1931 6174 Transfer out to: ARD Ardsley    
Steam J39 0-6-0 10/08/1931 1289 Transfer out to: ARD Ardsley    
Steam J39 0-6-0 31/05/1933 2698 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam J39 0-6-0 31/07/1933 2698 Transfer out to: ARD Ardsley    
Steam J39 0-6-0 07/08/1933 1265 Transfer in from: STR Stratford    
Steam J39 0-6-0 08/08/1933 1484 Transfer in from: STR Stratford    
Steam J39 0-6-0 21/08/1933 1484 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam J39 0-6-0 01/09/1933 1265 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam J39 0-6-0 18/04/1934 2974 Transfer in from: SHF Sheffield Neepsend    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 23/04/1934 5135 Transfer out to: ARD Ardsley    
Steam J39 0-6-0 05/05/1934 2973 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam B6 4-6-0 01/06/1934 5416 Transfer out to: SHF Sheffield Neepsend    
Steam B6 4-6-0 26/06/1934 5053 Transfer out to: SHF Sheffield Neepsend    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 21/11/1934 6177 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam J39 0-6-0 15/01/1936 2700 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam K2 2-6-0 22/01/1936 4670 Transfer in from: MAR March    
Steam K2 2-6-0 09/02/1936 4661 Transfer in from: NOR Norwich Thorpe    
Steam J39 0-6-0 09/02/1936 2699 Transfer out to: ARD Ardsley    
Steam K2 2-6-0 12/02/1936 4666 Transfer in from: CLK Colwick    
Steam J39 0-6-0 17/02/1936 2700 Transfer out to: ARD Ardsley    
Steam K2 2-6-0 02/12/1936 4661 Transfer out to: COP Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam K2 2-6-0 05/05/1937 4678 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam A5 4-6-2T 06/05/1937 5452 Transfer in from: HIT Hither Green    
Steam A5 4-6-2T 07/05/1937 5007 Transfer in from: HIT Hither Green    
Steam A5 4-6-2T 20/05/1937 5411 Transfer in from: NEA Neasden    
Steam A5 4-6-2T 10/07/1937 5373 Transfer in from: NEA Neasden    
Steam A5 4-6-2T 16/10/1937 5452 Transfer out to: NEA Neasden    
Steam K2 2-6-0 27/10/1937 4678 Transfer out to: ARD Ardsley    
Steam A5 4-6-2T 28/10/1937 5373 Transfer out to: NEA Neasden    
Steam A5 4-6-2T 12/11/1937 5411 Transfer out to: NEA Neasden    
Steam A5 4-6-2T 27/11/1937 5007 Transfer out to: NEA Neasden    
Steam J39 0-6-0 22/02/1938 2981 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam K2 2-6-0 09/05/1938 4678 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam A5 4-6-2T 19/05/1938 5007 Transfer in from: NEA Neasden    
Steam A5 4-6-2T 19/05/1938 5373 Transfer in from: NEA Neasden    
Steam A5 4-6-2T 29/07/1938 5007 Transfer out to: COP Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam A5 4-6-2T 29/07/1938 5373 Transfer out to: COP Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 15/08/1939 6178 Condemned      
Steam Q4 0-8-0 27/08/1939 5147 Transfer in from: FRO Frodingham    
Steam K2 2-6-0 25/01/1940 4666 Transfer out to: ARD Ardsley    
Steam K2 2-6-0 25/01/1940 4670 Transfer out to: ARD Ardsley    
Steam K2 2-6-0 25/01/1940 4678 Transfer out to: ARD Ardsley    
Steam J39 0-6-0 24/07/1940 2981 Transfer out to: ARD Ardsley    
Steam J39 0-6-0 02/02/1941 2973 Transfer out to: ARD Ardsley    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 02/02/1941 6177 Transfer out to: ARD Ardsley    
Steam J39 0-6-0 26/03/1941 2706 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam J39 0-6-0 26/03/1941 2707 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam B4 4-6-0 11/07/1941 6101 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam J39 0-6-0 11/07/1941 2707 Transfer out to: ARD Ardsley    
Steam J39 0-6-0 02/12/1941 1980 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 02/12/1941 5147 Transfer out to: ARD Ardsley    
Steam A5 4-6-2T 13/12/1941 5006 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam A5 4-6-2T 15/03/1942 5006 Transfer out to: ARD Ardsley    
Steam B4 4-6-0 10/12/1942 6101 Transfer out to: COP Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam B4 4-6-0 30/06/1943 6101 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam B4 4-6-0 07/07/1943 6101 Transfer out to: ARD Ardsley    
Steam J39 0-6-0 17/09/1944 1980 Transfer out to: ARD Ardsley    
Steam K2 2-6-0 30/07/1945 4633 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam K2 2-6-0 30/07/1945 4679 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam J39 0-6-0 30/07/1945 2706 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam J39 0-6-0 30/07/1945 2974 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam K2 2-6-0 19/08/1945 4642 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam B4 4-6-0 02/12/1945 6099 Transfer in from: COP Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam B4 4-6-0 02/12/1945 6101 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam B4 4-6-0 02/12/1945 6102 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam K2 2-6-0 02/12/1945 4642 Transfer out to: ARD Ardsley    
Steam K2 2-6-0 02/12/1945 4679 Transfer out to: ARD Ardsley    
Steam K2 2-6-0 30/12/1945 4633 Transfer out to: ARD Ardsley    
Steam B4 4-6-0 19/05/1946 1494 Transfer out to: ARD Ardsley    
Steam B4 4-6-0 19/05/1946 1496 Transfer out to: ARD Ardsley    
Steam B4 4-6-0 19/05/1946 1497 Transfer out to: ARD Ardsley    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 30/06/1946 3217 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam K2 2-6-0 30/06/1946 4633 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam J39 0-6-0 18/08/1946 2696 Transfer in from: CLK Colwick    
Steam K2 2-6-0 18/08/1946 4633 Transfer out to: CLK Colwick    
Steam B5 4-6-0 17/06/1947 1688 Transfer in from: MEX Mexborough    
Steam B1 4-6-0 29/08/1947 1033 1st Allocation        
Steam B5 4-6-0 07/09/1947 1688 Transfer out to: MEX Mexborough    
Steam B1 4-6-0 21/09/1947 1229 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam B1 4-6-0 21/09/1947 1230 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam B1 4-6-0 21/09/1947 1033 Transfer out to: COP Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 16/11/1947 4749 Transfer out to: ARD Ardsley    
Steam J6 0-6-0 01/01/1948 4170 Snapshot        
Steam J6 0-6-0 01/01/1948 4203 Snapshot        
Steam J6 0-6-0 01/01/1948 4205 Snapshot        
Steam J6 0-6-0 01/01/1948 4226 Snapshot        
Steam J6 0-6-0 01/01/1948 4268 Snapshot        
Steam J6 0-6-0 01/01/1948 4271 Snapshot        
Steam J6 0-6-0 01/01/1948 4274 Snapshot        
Steam J50 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8892 Snapshot BFD Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam J51 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8892 Snapshot BFD Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8895 Snapshot BFD Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam J51 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8895 Snapshot BFD Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8897 Snapshot BFD Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam J51 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8897 Snapshot BFD Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8898 Snapshot ARD Ardsley    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8902 Snapshot ARD Ardsley    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8906 Snapshot ARD Ardsley    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8908 Snapshot ARD Ardsley    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8912 Snapshot ARD Ardsley    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8922 Snapshot ARD Ardsley    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8923 Snapshot ARD Ardsley    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8932 Snapshot        
Steam J50 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8933 Snapshot        
Steam J50 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8934 Snapshot        
Steam J50 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8940 Snapshot        
Steam J50 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8941 Snapshot        
Steam J50 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8942 Snapshot        
Steam J50 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8943 Snapshot        
Steam J50 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8944 Snapshot        
Steam J50 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8959 Snapshot        
Steam J50 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8961 Snapshot        
Steam J50 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8969 Snapshot        
Steam N5 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 9253 Snapshot        
Steam N5 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 9256 Snapshot        
Steam N5 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 9261 Snapshot        
Steam N5 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 9280 Snapshot        
Steam N1 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 9437 Snapshot        
Steam N1 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 9443 Snapshot        
Steam N1 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 9447 Snapshot        
Steam N1 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 9448 Snapshot        
Steam N1 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 9449 Snapshot        
Steam N1 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 9454 Snapshot        
Steam N1 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 9459 Snapshot        
Steam N1 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 9464 Snapshot        
Steam N1 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 9474 Snapshot        
Steam N1 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 9478 Snapshot        
Steam N1 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 9479 Snapshot        
Steam N1 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 9482 Snapshot        
Steam N1 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 9483 Snapshot        
Steam N1 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 9485 Snapshot        
Steam B1 4-6-0 01/03/1948 1294 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 10/04/1949 1268 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam B1 4-6-0 10/04/1949 61267 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam L1 2-6-4T m/e 07/1949 67762 Transfer in from:        
Steam C14 4-4-2T 3w/e 31/05/1950 67447 Transfer in from: IPS Ipswich    
Steam C14 4-4-2T 3w/e 31/05/1950 67450 Transfer in from: IPS Ipswich    
Steam N5 0-6-2T 3w/e 31/05/1950 69253 Transfer out to: 40A Lincoln    
Steam N5 0-6-2T 3w/e 31/05/1950 69256 Transfer out to: 40F Boston    
Steam N5 0-6-2T 3w/e 31/05/1950 69261 Transfer out to: 40F Boston    
Steam N5 0-6-2T 3w/e 31/05/1950 69280 Transfer out to: 40F Boston    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 3w/e 31/05/1950 8944 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam B1 4-6-0 04/06/1950 1296 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 04/06/1950 63217 Transfer out to: 37A Ardsley    
Steam N1 0-6-2T 5w/e 24/03/1951 69483 Transfer out to: 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 13/05/1951 61031 Transfer in from: 37A Ardsley    
Steam N1 0-6-2T 4w/e 21/07/1951 69432 Transfer in from: HSY Hornsey    
Steam N1 0-6-2T 4w/e 21/07/1951 69434 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam N1 0-6-2T 4w/e 21/07/1951 69439 Transfer in from: HSY Hornsey    
Steam C14 4-4-2T 4w/e 21/07/1951 67447 Transfer out to: 39A Gorton    
Steam C14 4-4-2T 4w/e 21/07/1951 67450 Transfer out to: 39A Gorton    
Steam B1 4-6-0 18/11/1951 61145 Transfer in from: 37A Ardsley    
Steam J39 0-6-0 16/03/1952 64903 Transfer in from: 37A Ardsley    
Steam J39 0-6-0 16/03/1952 64907 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam J6 0-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 64271 Transfer out to: 37A Ardsley    
Steam J6 0-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 64274 Transfer out to: 37A Ardsley    
Steam B1 4-6-0 20/07/1952 61384 Transfer in from: 37A Ardsley    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 18/10/1952 68961 Transfer out to: 34B Hornsey    
Steam B1 4-6-0 19/10/1952 61384 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Steam N1 0-6-2T w/e 27/10/1952 69479 Condemned      
Steam N1 0-6-2T 4w/e 13/12/1952 69442 Transfer in from: HSY Hornsey    
Steam N1 0-6-2T w/e 12/01/1953 69448 Condemned      
Steam N1 0-6-2T 5w/e 21/03/1953 69433 Transfer in from: HSY Hornsey    
Steam N1 0-6-2T 5w/e 21/03/1953 69475 Transfer in from: HSY Hornsey    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 5w/e 21/03/1953 68902 Transfer out to: 37A Ardsley    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 5w/e 21/03/1953 68906 Transfer out to: 34B Hornsey    
Steam N5 0-6-2T 4w/e 16/05/1953 69337 Transfer in from: 37A Ardsley    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 16/05/1953 68941 Transfer out to: 37A Ardsley    
Steam N5 0-6-2T 4w/e 20/06/1953 69337 Transfer out to: 36B Mexborough    
Steam N1 0-6-2T 06/09/1953 69442 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 13/09/1953 61294 Transfer out to: 65A Eastfield    
Steam O4 2-8-0 06/12/1953 63920 Transfer in from: 37A Ardsley    
Steam B1 4-6-0 06/12/1953 61145 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam N1 0-6-2T 19/07/1954 69437 Condemned      
Steam N1 0-6-2T 4w/e 21/08/1954 69436 Transfer in from: COP Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam N1 0-6-2T 4w/e 21/08/1954 69471 Transfer in from: COP Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam N1 0-6-2T 4w/e 21/08/1954 69475 Transfer out to: 34C Hatfield    
Steam N1 0-6-2T 30/08/1954 69482 Condemned      
Steam N1 0-6-2T w/e 01/11/1954 69485 Condemned      
Steam N1 0-6-2T w/e 08/11/1954 69432 Condemned      
Steam N1 0-6-2T w/e 27/12/1954 69433 Condemned      
Steam N1 0-6-2T w/e 07/02/1955 69454 Condemned      
Steam N1 0-6-2T 4w/e 19/03/1955 69455 Transfer in from: HAT Hatfield    
Steam N1 0-6-2T 4w/e 19/03/1955 69475 Transfer in from: 34C Hatfield    
Steam N1 0-6-2T 28/03/1955 69459 Condemned      
Steam N1 0-6-2T 11/04/1955 69475 Condemned      
Steam N1 0-6-2T 19/04/1955 69449 Condemned      
Steam N1 0-6-2T 5w/e 23/04/1955 69441 Transfer in from: 38A Colwick    
Steam N1 0-6-2T 5w/e 23/04/1955 69451 Transfer in from: 38A Colwick    
Steam N1 0-6-2T 5w/e 23/04/1955 69467 Transfer in from: 38A Colwick    
Steam N1 0-6-2T w/e 16/05/1955 69455 Condemned      
Steam N1 0-6-2T w/e 30/05/1955 69441 Condemned      
Steam N1 0-6-2T 11/07/1955 69436 Condemned      
Steam N7 0-6-2T 5w/e 23/07/1955 69696 Transfer in from: 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam N1 0-6-2T 08/08/1955 69464 Condemned      
Steam N1 0-6-2T 12/10/1955 69451 Condemned      
Steam N1 0-6-2T 11/11/1955 69439 Condemned      
Steam N1 0-6-2T 16/01/1956 69471 Condemned      
Steam N1 0-6-2T 4w/e 21/04/1956 69457 Transfer in from: 37A Ardsley    
Steam N7 0-6-2T 4w/e 21/04/1956 69696 Transfer out to: 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 27/05/1956 64801 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam J6 0-6-0 3w/e 16/06/1956 64205 Transfer out to: 37A Ardsley    
Steam J6 0-6-0 3w/e 16/06/1956 64268 Transfer out to: 37A Ardsley    
Steam N1 0-6-2T 02/07/1956 69467 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 23/09/1956 61320 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam N1 0-6-2T 26/10/1956 69447 Condemned      
Steam N1 0-6-2T 12/12/1956 69478 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 16/02/1957 41251 Transfer in from:        
Steam N1 0-6-2T 4w/e 16/02/1957 69434 Transfer out to: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 16/03/1957 41251 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam N1 0-6-2T 4w/e 16/03/1957 69457 Transfer out to: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 23/05/1957 D3455 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 27/05/1957 D3454 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 31/05/1957 D3456 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 16/06/1957 64796 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam J39 0-6-0 16/06/1957 64872 Transfer in from: 37A Ardsley    
Steam B1 4-6-0 16/06/1957 61267 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam B1 4-6-0 16/06/1957 61268 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam B1 4-6-0 16/06/1957 61296 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 D3457 Transfer in from: 55B Stourton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 20/07/1957 42072 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 20/07/1957 42073 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 20/07/1957 42093 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 20/07/1957 42094 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 D3454 Transfer out to: 55B Stourton    
Steam B1 4-6-0 15/09/1957 61131 Transfer in from: 37A Ardsley    
Steam B1 4-6-0 15/09/1957 61382 Transfer in from: 37A Ardsley    
Steam B1 4-6-0 15/09/1957 61383 Transfer in from: 37A Ardsley    
Steam J39 0-6-0 15/09/1957 64791 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam J39 0-6-0 15/09/1957 64886 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam J39 0-6-0 15/09/1957 64947 Transfer in from: 50F Malton    
Steam B1 4-6-0 15/09/1957 61320 Transfer out to: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 21/09/1957 42072 Transfer out to: 55G Huddersfield Hillhouse    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 21/09/1957 42073 Transfer out to: 56E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 21/09/1957 42093 Transfer out to: 55F Manningham    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 21/09/1957 42094 Transfer out to: 56E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 21/09/1957 68895 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 21/09/1957 68898 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 19/10/1957 68895 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 19/10/1957 68959 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Steam N1 0-6-2T 4w/e 19/10/1957 69474 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 10/12/1957 D2260 1st Allocation        
Diesel 04 0-6-0 12/12/1957 D2261 1st Allocation        
Steam N1 0-6-2T 4w/e 14/12/1957 69443 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 28/12/1957 D2264 1st Allocation        
Diesel 04 0-6-0 28/12/1957 D2265 1st Allocation        
Steam O4 2-8-0 05/01/1958 63920 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 4w/e 08/01/1958 D8010 Transfer in from: 1D Devons Road (Bow)    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 4w/e 08/01/1958 D8011 Transfer in from: 1D Devons Road (Bow)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 08/01/1958 90698 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Steam B1 4-6-0 12/01/1958 61031 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam B1 4-6-0 12/01/1958 61131 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam B1 4-6-0 12/01/1958 61382 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam B1 4-6-0 12/01/1958 61383 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam J39 0-6-0 12/01/1958 64791 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam J39 0-6-0 12/01/1958 64796 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam J39 0-6-0 12/01/1958 64801 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam J39 0-6-0 12/01/1958 64872 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam J39 0-6-0 12/01/1958 64886 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam J39 0-6-0 12/01/1958 64903 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam J39 0-6-0 12/01/1958 64907 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam J39 0-6-0 12/01/1958 64947 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 4w/e 08/02/1958 D8010 Transfer in from: 56G Bradford Hammerton Street    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 4w/e 08/02/1958 D8011 Transfer in from: 56G Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam J6 0-6-0 4w/e 08/02/1958 64170 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam J6 0-6-0 4w/e 08/02/1958 64203 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam J6 0-6-0 4w/e 08/02/1958 64226 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/02/1958 68892 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/02/1958 68895 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/02/1958 68897 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/02/1958 68908 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/02/1958 68912 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/02/1958 68922 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/02/1958 68923 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/02/1958 68932 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/02/1958 68933 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/02/1958 68934 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/02/1958 68940 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/02/1958 68942 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/02/1958 68943 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/02/1958 68969 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 4w/e 08/02/1958 D8010 Transfer out to: 56G Bradford Hammerton Street    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 4w/e 08/02/1958 D8011 Transfer out to: 56G Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 08/02/1958 90698 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/02/1958 D8010 Transfer out to: 1D Devons Road (Bow)    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/02/1958 D8011 Transfer out to: 1D Devons Road (Bow)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 19/07/1958 D3455 Transfer out to: 52E Percy Main    
Steam L1 2-6-4T w/e 01/11/1958 67762 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 D3456 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 18/07/1959 D3457 Transfer out to: 55F Manningham    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 13/10/1959 D2071 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 31/10/1959 D2072 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 05/11/1959 D2073 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 11/11/1959 D2074 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 24/11/1959 D2075 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 05/02/1960 D2081 1st Allocation        
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 23/04/1960 D2267 Transfer in from: 55D Royston    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 05/05/1960 D2089 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 05/05/1960 D2090 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 26/05/1960 D2091 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 18/06/1960 D2075 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 18/06/1960 D2267 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 25/06/1960 D2095 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 25/06/1960 D2096 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 25/06/1960 D2097 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 02/07/1960 D2150 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 02/07/1960 D2152 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 09/07/1960 D2094 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 09/07/1960 D2098 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 01/10/1960 D2104 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 15/10/1960 D2104 Transfer out to: 52E Percy Main    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 24/06/1961 D2309 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 15/09/1962 D2173 Transfer in from: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B1 4-6-0 19/11/1962 61230 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 12/01/1963 D2150 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 01/06/1963 D3230 Transfer in from: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 01/06/1963 D3235 Transfer in from: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 01/06/1963 D2098 Transfer out to: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 08/06/1963 D3231 Transfer in from: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 08/06/1963 D2081 Transfer out to: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 D2248 Transfer in from: 52E Percy Main    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 D3376 Transfer in from: 55D Royston    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 D3873 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 03/08/1963 D3456 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 19/10/1963 D3235 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 27/06/1964 D3381 Transfer in from: 55D Royston    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 27/06/1964 D2095 Transfer out to: 55G Huddersfield Hillhouse    
Steam B1 4-6-0 29/06/1964 61229 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 18/07/1964 D3457 Transfer in from: 55F Manningham    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 18/07/1964 D2071 Transfer out to: 55F Manningham    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 12/09/1964 D2074 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 12/09/1964 D2248 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 19/06/1965 D3071 Transfer in from: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 05 0-6-0 4w/e 06/11/1965 D2593 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Diesel 05 0-6-0 4w/e 06/11/1965 D2595 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Diesel 05 0-6-0 4w/e 06/11/1965 D2596 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Diesel 05 0-6-0 4w/e 06/11/1965 D2597 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Diesel 05 0-6-0 4w/e 06/11/1965 D2603 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Diesel 05 0-6-0 4w/e 06/11/1965 D2604 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Diesel 05 0-6-0 4w/e 06/11/1965 D2605 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Diesel 05 0-6-0 4w/e 06/11/1965 D2606 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Diesel 05 0-6-0 4w/e 06/11/1965 D2607 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Diesel 05 0-6-0 4w/e 06/11/1965 D2608 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Diesel 05 0-6-0 4w/e 06/11/1965 D2617 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Diesel 05 0-6-0 w/e 11/12/1965 D2603 Transfer out to: 6J Holyhead    
Diesel 05 0-6-0 w/e 11/12/1965 D2604 Transfer out to: 6J Holyhead    
Diesel 05 0-6-0 w/e 11/12/1965 D2605 Transfer out to: 6J Holyhead    
Diesel 05 0-6-0 w/e 11/12/1965 D2606 Transfer out to: 6J Holyhead    
Diesel 05 0-6-0 w/e 11/12/1965 D2607 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 10/09/1966 D2273 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 08/10/1966 D3071 Transfer out to: 56B Healey Mills    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 08/10/1966 D3230 Transfer out to: 56B Healey Mills    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 08/10/1966 D3231 Transfer out to: 56B Healey Mills    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 08/10/1966 D3456 Transfer out to: 56B Healey Mills    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 08/10/1966 D3457 Transfer out to: 56B Healey Mills    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 08/10/1966 D3873 Transfer out to: 56B Healey Mills    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 28/01/1967 D2095 Transfer in from: 55G Huddersfield Hillhouse    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 28/01/1967 D2262 Transfer in from: 55E Normanton    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 25/02/1967 D2045 Transfer in from: 52E Percy Main    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 25/02/1967 D2061 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 25/02/1967 D2148 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 25/02/1967 D2164 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 25/02/1967 D2166 Transfer in from: 52E Percy Main    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 25/02/1967 D2313 Transfer in from: 52E Percy Main    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 22/04/1967 D2097 Transfer out to: 56B Healey Mills    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 22/04/1967 D2148 Transfer out to: 56B Healey Mills    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 22/04/1967 D2152 Transfer out to: 56B Healey Mills    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 22/04/1967 D2164 Transfer out to: 56B Healey Mills    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 22/04/1967 D2166 Transfer out to: 56B Healey Mills    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 22/04/1967 D2173 Transfer out to: 56B Healey Mills    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 22/04/1967 D2309 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 22/04/1967 D2313 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Diesel 05 0-6-0 4w/e 22/04/1967 D2593 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 05 0-6-0 4w/e 22/04/1967 D2595 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 05 0-6-0 4w/e 22/04/1967 D2596 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 05 0-6-0 4w/e 22/04/1967 D2597 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 05 0-6-0 4w/e 22/04/1967 D2608 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 05 0-6-0 4w/e 22/04/1967 D2617 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 20/05/1967 D2044 Transfer in from: 55F Manningham    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 20/05/1967 D2102 Transfer in from: 55F Manningham    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 20/05/1967 D2161 Transfer in from: 55F Manningham    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 20/05/1967 D2260 Transfer out to: 55B Stourton    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 20/05/1967 D2261 Transfer out to: 55B Stourton    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 20/05/1967 D2264 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 15/07/1967 D2073 Transfer out to: 56B Healey Mills    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 09/09/1967 D2262 Transfer out to: 50D Goole    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1967 D2248 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1967 D2340 Transfer in from: 51C West Hartlepool    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1967 D2204 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 16/10/1967 D2273 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 04/11/1967 D2045 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 24/02/1968 D2044 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 24/02/1968 D2061 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 25/05/1968 D2158 Transfer in from: 50D Goole    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 25/05/1968 D2260 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 25/05/1968 D2261 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 22/06/1968 D2063 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 20/07/1968 D2271 Transfer in from: 55D Royston    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 20/07/1968 D2272 Transfer in from: 55D Royston    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 20/07/1968 D2072 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 20/07/1968 D2094 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 20/07/1968 D2102 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 20/07/1968 D2161 Transfer out to: 55G Knottingley    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 28/09/1968 D2371 Transfer in from: 32C Lowestoft    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 13/10/1968 D2340 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 14/12/1968 D2095 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 14/12/1968 D2248 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 12/04/1969 D2111 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 12/04/1969 D2063 Transfer out to: 55B York (North)    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 01/11/1969 D2244 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 01/11/1969 D2248 Transfer in from: 55H Neville Hill    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 31/12/1969 D2204 Condemned      
Diesel 04 0-6-0 31/12/1969 D2271 Condemned      
Diesel 04 0-6-0 15/03/1970 D2261 Condemned      
Diesel 04 0-6-0 15/03/1970 D2265 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 04/04/1970 D2051 Transfer in from: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 04/04/1970 D2158 Transfer out to: 30E Colchester    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 29/06/1970 D2244 Condemned      
Diesel 04 0-6-0 29/06/1970 D2248 Condemned      
Diesel 04 0-6-0 24/10/1970 D2260 Condemned      
Diesel 04 0-6-0 24/10/1970 D2272 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 16/01/1971 D3547 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 13/03/1971 D3294 Transfer in from: 55D Royston    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 13/03/1971 D2051 Transfer out to: 30E Colchester    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 11/11/1972 D2162 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 11/11/1972 D2090 Transfer out to: 55B York (North)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 11/11/1972 D2111 Transfer out to: 55B York (North)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 2w/e 24/03/1973 03371 Transfer out to: 55C Healey Mills    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 21/03/1974 03091 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 27/09/1975 08548 Transfer in from: DR Doncaster    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 2w/e 25/07/1976 03371 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 2w/e 25/07/1976 03096 Transfer out to: TE Thornaby    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 21/12/1977 08306 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 19/12/1982 08311 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 19/12/1982 08548 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 16/10/1983 08432 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 06/11/1987 03089 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 26/11/1987 03371 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 27/07/1988 08224 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 23/05/1989 03162 Condemned