Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 215 Today
» 1354 Yesterday
» 4461 Week
» 1569 Month
» 108515 Year
» 1330080 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: To Eastern Region


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam J3 0-6-0 m/e 10/1939 086 Reinstated        
Steam J24 0-6-0 m/e 10/1939 1822 Reinstated        
Steam J24 0-6-0 m/e 10/1939 1823 Reinstated        
Steam J24 0-6-0 m/e 10/1939 1825 Reinstated        
Steam J24 0-6-0 m/e 10/1939 1829 Reinstated        
Steam J24 0-6-0 m/e 10/1939 1844 Reinstated        
Steam J24 0-6-0 m/e 10/1939 1846 Reinstated        
Steam J24 0-6-0 m/e 10/1939 1946 Reinstated        
Steam J24 0-6-0 m/e 10/1939 1958 Reinstated        
Steam J3 0-6-0 m/e 10/1939 4035 Reinstated        
Steam J10 0-6-0 m/e 10/1939 5076 Reinstated        
Steam J24 0-6-0 m/e 11/1939 1950 Reinstated        
Steam J3 0-6-0 m/e 04/1940 4126 Reinstated        
Steam J24 0-6-0 m/e 11/1942 1846 Condemned      
Steam J24 0-6-0 m/e 07/1943 1958 Condemned      
Steam J24 0-6-0 m/e 10/1945 1950 Condemned      
Steam J3 0-6-0 m/e 02/1946 4126 Condemned      
Steam J10 0-6-0 m/e 08/1947 5174 Condemned      
Steam J3 0-6-0 m/e 09/1947 4161 Condemned      
Steam J24 0-6-0 w/e 08/11/1947 5602 Transfer out to: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam J24 0-6-0 01/01/1948 5601 Snapshot NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J24 0-6-0 01/01/1948 5634 Snapshot BOR Borough Gardens    
Steam J3 0-6-0 01/01/1948 64106 Snapshot NWE New England    
Steam J24 0-6-0 01/01/1948 65603 Snapshot BOR Borough Gardens    
Steam J24 0-6-0 01/01/1948 65606 Snapshot TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam J24 0-6-0 01/01/1948 65609 Snapshot WBY Whitby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 24/12/1949 42681 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 24/12/1949 42684 Transfer in from: PLS Plaistow    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 5w/e 24/12/1949 44222 Transfer in from: 20F Skipton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 5w/e 24/12/1949 44223 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 44228 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 44530 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 44228 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 44530 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 15/12/1956 42681 Transfer out to: 33C Shoeburyness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 15/12/1956 42684 Transfer out to: 33C Shoeburyness    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/04/1960 44222 Transfer out to: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 m/e 11/1963 44223 Condemned      
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 06/11/1965 D5687 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 06/11/1965 D5861 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel D3/5 0-6-0 w/e 04/12/1965 D3152 Transfer in from: 16D Nottingham    
Diesel D3/5 0-6-0 w/e 04/12/1965 D3153 Transfer in from: 16D Nottingham    
Diesel D3/5 0-6-0 w/e 04/12/1965 D3164 Transfer in from: 16D Nottingham    
Diesel D3/5 0-6-0 w/e 04/12/1965 D3165 Transfer in from: 16D Nottingham    
Diesel D3/5 0-6-0 w/e 04/12/1965 D3166 Transfer in from: 16D Nottingham    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 25/12/1965 D5821 Transfer in from: 91M To London Midland Region    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 29/01/1966 D1631 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 29/01/1966 D1632 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co 4w/e 26/02/1966 D1571 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 04/02/1967 D1794 Transfer in from: 91M To London Midland Region    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 04/02/1967 D1794 Transfer in from: D16 Nottingham Division    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 11/03/1967 D1798 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 11/03/1967 D94 Transfer in from: ML Line Power Controller, Derby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 27/05/1967 42066 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 27/05/1967 42236 Transfer in from: 12E Tebay    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 27/05/1967 42252 Transfer in from: 12E Tebay    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 27/05/1967 42616 Transfer in from: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 29/05/1967 42236 Condemned      
Diesel 14 0-6-0 m/e 31/05/1967 D9507 Transfer in from: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 m/e 31/05/1967 D9510 Transfer in from: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 m/e 31/05/1967 D9529 Transfer in from: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 m/e 31/05/1967 D9534 Transfer in from: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 17/06/1967 42066 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 17/06/1967 42252 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 17/06/1967 42616 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 5w/e 29/07/1967 D8020 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 5w/e 29/07/1967 D8022 Transfer in from: 66A Polmadie    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 5w/e 29/07/1967 D8025 Transfer in from: 66A Polmadie    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 5w/e 29/07/1967 D8027 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 09/09/1967 D3946 Transfer in from: 40A Lincoln    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 16/09/1967 D139 Transfer in from: ML Line Power Controller, Derby    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 28/10/1967 D148 Transfer in from: ML Line Power Controller, Derby    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co 4w/e 02/12/1967 D1956 Transfer in from: WL Western Lines (LMR)    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co 4w/e 02/12/1967 D1957 Transfer in from: WL Western Lines (LMR)    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co 4w/e 02/12/1967 D1958 Transfer in from: WL Western Lines (LMR)    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co 4w/e 02/12/1967 D1994 Transfer in from: 34G Finsbury Park    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 27/04/1968 D3918 Transfer in from: 66A Polmadie    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 4w/e 20/07/1968 12114 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 4w/e 20/07/1968 12115 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 4w/e 20/07/1968 12116 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 10 0-6-0 4w/e 20/07/1968 D3137 Transfer in from: 34E New England    
Diesel 10 0-6-0 4w/e 20/07/1968 D3138 Transfer in from: 34E New England    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 20/07/1968 D3401 Transfer in from: 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 20/07/1968 D3405 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 03/08/1968 D1570 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 17/08/1968 D112 Transfer in from: D16 Nottingham Division    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 17/08/1968 D129 Transfer in from: D16 Nottingham Division    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 17/08/1968 D53 Transfer in from: D16 Nottingham Division    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 17/08/1968 D60 Transfer in from: D16 Nottingham Division    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 17/08/1968 D89 Transfer in from: D16 Nottingham Division    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 5w/e 31/08/1968 13338 Transfer in from: 62A Thornton Junction    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 5w/e 31/08/1968 D3132 Transfer in from: 65F Grangemouth    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 5w/e 31/08/1968 D3134 Transfer in from: 65F Grangemouth    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 5w/e 31/08/1968 D3209 Transfer in from: 67C Ayr    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 5w/e 31/08/1968 D3337 Transfer in from: 62A Thornton Junction    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 5w/e 31/08/1968 D3339 Transfer in from: 62A Thornton Junction    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 5w/e 31/08/1968 D3394 Transfer in from: 65E Kipps    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 5w/e 31/08/1968 D3409 Transfer in from: 67A Corkerhill    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 28/09/1968 D3275 Transfer in from: 34E New England    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 5w/e 01/03/1969 13281 Transfer in from: 36C Frodingham    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 5w/e 01/03/1969 D3533 Transfer in from: 40A Lincoln    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 5w/e 01/03/1969 D3537 Transfer in from: 36A Doncaster    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 5w/e 01/03/1969 D3542 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 5w/e 15/03/1969 D3523 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 5w/e 15/03/1969 D3524 Transfer in from: 84A Laira    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 29/03/1969 D3549 Transfer in from: 62A Thornton Junction    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 5w/e 14/06/1969 D6938 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 29/08/1970 D252 Transfer in from: D09 Manchester Division    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 29/08/1970 D256 Transfer in from: D08 Liverpool Division    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 29/08/1970 D257 Transfer in from: D08 Liverpool Division    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 29/08/1970 D394 Transfer in from: D09 Manchester Division    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 29/08/1970 D399 Transfer in from: D08 Liverpool Division    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 30/10/1971 D3911 Transfer in from: 66A Polmadie    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 30/10/1971 D3919 Transfer in from: 66A Polmadie    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 30/10/1971 D3934 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 30/10/1971 D3935 Transfer in from: 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 20/11/1971 D5603 Transfer in from: D10 Preston Division    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 25/03/1972 D5658 Transfer in from: 91M To London Midland Region    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 25/03/1972 D5658 Transfer in from: D16 Nottingham Division    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 27/10/1973 45107 Transfer in from: D16 Nottingham Division    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 4w/e 03/11/1973 20119 Transfer in from: TI Tinsley    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 4w/e 03/11/1973 25083 Transfer in from: TI Tinsley    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 4w/e 03/11/1973 25084 Transfer in from: TI Tinsley    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 4w/e 03/11/1973 25085 Transfer in from: TI Tinsley    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 03/11/1973 37219 Transfer in from: TE Thornaby    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 03/11/1973 D76 Transfer in from: TO Toton    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 17/11/1973 D37 Transfer in from: TO Toton    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 08/12/1973 D1687 Transfer in from: 86A Cardiff Canton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 23/03/1974 08075 Transfer in from: 16C Derby    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 23/03/1974 D3046 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (Midland)    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 25/05/1974 47368 Transfer in from: CD Crewe Diesel    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 25/05/1974 47380 Transfer in from: TO Toton    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 22/06/1974 25108 Transfer in from: D08 Liverpool Division    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 06/07/1974 47306 Transfer in from: CE Crewe Diesel    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 2w/e 24/08/1974 25026 Transfer in from: TI Tinsley    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 28/09/1974 25302 Transfer in from: D08 Liverpool Division    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co 2w/e 12/10/1974 47541 Transfer in from: 86A Cardiff Canton    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co 2w/e 12/10/1974 47542 Transfer in from: CF Cardiff Canton    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 16/11/1974 47025 Transfer in from: CF Cardiff Canton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 2w/e 05/04/1975 08930 Transfer in from: 83A Newton Abbot    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 3w/e 12/07/1975 08081 Transfer in from: OC Old Oak Common    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 3w/e 12/07/1975 08834 Transfer in from: 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 5w/e 26/07/1975 08274 Transfer in from: GD Gateshead    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 5w/e 26/07/1975 08325 Transfer in from: GD Gateshead    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 11/10/1975 31262 Transfer in from: BR Bristol Bath Road    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 11/10/1975 31279 Transfer in from: OC Old Oak Common    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 11/10/1975 31291 Transfer in from: OC Old Oak Common    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 11/10/1975 31418 Transfer in from: CD Cricklewood East    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 11/10/1975 47064 Transfer in from: OC Old Oak Common    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 11/10/1975 47085 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 11/10/1975 47093 Transfer in from: BR Bristol Bath Road    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 m/e 31/10/1975 03084 Transfer in from: NR Norwich Thorpe    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 m/e 31/10/1975 03086 Transfer in from: NR Norwich Thorpe    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 m/e 31/10/1975 03179 Transfer in from: CR Colchester    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 m/e 31/10/1975 03196 Transfer in from: CR Colchester    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 m/e 31/10/1975 03197 Transfer in from: NR Norwich Thorpe    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 3w/e 29/11/1975 08120 Transfer in from: DN Darlington (Bank Top)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 10/01/1976 08089 Transfer in from: BR Bristol Bath Road    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 2w/e 10/01/1976 08102 Transfer in from: DR Doncaster    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo 3w/e 20/03/1976 24137 Transfer in from: 98S      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 2w/e 05/06/1976 08816 Transfer in from: TI Tinsley    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 2w/e 05/06/1976 08824 Transfer in from: SB Shirebrook    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 3w/e 24/07/1976 20017 Transfer in from: TI Tinsley    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 3w/e 24/07/1976 20078 Transfer in from: TI Tinsley    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 3w/e 24/07/1976 20079 Transfer in from: TI Tinsley    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 3w/e 24/07/1976 20098 Transfer in from: TI Tinsley    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 3w/e 04/09/1976 08810 Transfer in from: TI Tinsley    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 3w/e 09/10/1976 31110 Transfer in from: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 3w/e 09/10/1976 31112 Transfer in from: BR Bristol Bath Road    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 3w/e 09/10/1976 46047 Transfer in from: CF Cardiff Canton    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 3w/e 09/10/1976 46048 Transfer in from: CF Cardiff Canton    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 3w/e 09/10/1976 46049 Transfer in from: CF Cardiff Canton    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 3w/e 09/10/1976 46051 Transfer in from: CF Cardiff Canton    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 3w/e 09/10/1976 46052 Transfer in from: CF Cardiff Canton    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 5w/e 31/12/1976 20034 Transfer in from: TI Tinsley    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 5w/e 31/12/1976 20100 Transfer in from: TI Tinsley    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co 5w/e 31/12/1976 47403 Transfer in from: FP Finsbury Park