Depot: Bristol Barrow Road
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1880 | 1274 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1880 | 1275 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1880 | 1276 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1880 | 1277 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1880 | 1278 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1884 | 1649 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1884 | 1650 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1884 | 1651 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1884 | 1652 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1884 | 1653 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 06/1884 | 1654 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 06/1884 | 1655 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 06/1884 | 1656 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1886 | 1730 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1889 | 1824 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1889 | 1825 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1889 | 1826 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1889 | 1827 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1889 | 1828 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1889 | 1829 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1889 | 1830 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1274 | Snapshot | 3 | Saltley | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1275 | Snapshot | 3 | Saltley | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1276 | Snapshot | 3 | Saltley | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1277 | Snapshot | 3 | Saltley | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1278 | Snapshot | 3 | Saltley | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1649 | Snapshot | 21HM | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1650 | Snapshot | 21HM | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1651 | Snapshot | 18 | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1652 | Snapshot | 18 | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1653 | Snapshot | 18 | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1654 | Snapshot | 18 | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1655 | Snapshot | 18 | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1656 | Snapshot | 18 | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1730 | Snapshot | 3 | Saltley | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1824 | Snapshot | 8B | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1825 | Snapshot | 8Th | Thornbury | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1826 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1826 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1827 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1827 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1828 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1828 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1829 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1829 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1830 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1830 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1831 | Snapshot | 1 | Derby | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 1824 | Snapshot | 8B | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 1825 | Snapshot | 8Th | Thornbury | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 1826 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 1826 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 1827 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 1827 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 1828 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 1828 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 1829 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 1829 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 1830 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 1830 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 1831 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 1831 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 1832 | Snapshot | 4M | Malvern (MR) | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 2235 | Snapshot | 5 | Brecon | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 2237 | Snapshot | 3 | Saltley | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 1824 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 1824 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 1825 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 1825 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 1826 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 1826 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 1827 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 1827 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 1828 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 1828 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 1829 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 1829 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 1830 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 1830 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 1831 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 1831 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 1832 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 1832 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 2235 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 2235 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 2237 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 2237 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1331 | Snapshot | 8B | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1332 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1332 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1333 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1333 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1334 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1334 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1335 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1335 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1336 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1336 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1337 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1337 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1338 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1338 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1339 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1339 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1340 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1340 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1388 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1388 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1389 | Snapshot | 8Th | Thornbury | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1390 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1390 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 6 | 0-4-4T | 04/1914 | 1228 | Snapshot | 14 | Bedford | |||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1331 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1331 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1332 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1332 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1333 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1333 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1334 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1334 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1335 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1335 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1336 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1336 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1337 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1337 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1338 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1338 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1339 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1339 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1340 | Snapshot | 18 | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1388 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1388 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1389 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1389 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1390 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1390 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1397 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 6 | 0-4-4T | 12/1921 | 1228 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | |||
Steam | 6 | 0-4-4T | 12/1921 | 1228 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | |||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1331 | Snapshot | 5 | Brecon | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1332 | Snapshot | 2 | Burton | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1333 | Snapshot | 2 | Burton | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1334 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1334 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1335 | Snapshot | 3 | Saltley | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1336 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1336 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1337 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1337 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1338 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1338 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1339 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1339 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1388 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1388 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1389 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1389 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1390 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1390 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1397 | Snapshot | 20 | Buxton (MR) | ||
Steam | 6 | 0-4-4T | 03/1930 | 1228 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | |||
Steam | 6 | 0-4-4T | 03/1930 | 1228 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | |||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1328 | Snapshot | 3 | Saltley | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1334 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1334 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1336 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1336 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1337 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1337 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1338 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1338 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1339 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1339 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1364 | Snapshot | 7 | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1387 | Snapshot | 3 | Saltley | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1388 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1388 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1389 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1389 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1390 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1390 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1391 | Snapshot | 3 | Saltley | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1397 | Snapshot | 20 | Buxton (MR) | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1404 | Snapshot | 20 | Buxton (MR) | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 28/11/1931 | 1328 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 28/11/1931 | 1336 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 26/12/1931 | 1339 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6 | 0-4-4T | 09/1933 | 1228 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | |||
Steam | 6 | 0-4-4T | 09/1933 | 1228 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | |||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1267 | Snapshot | 23 | Hasland | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1309 | Snapshot | M18 | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1334 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1334 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1337 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1337 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1338 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1338 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1364 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1364 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1387 | Snapshot | 6 | Swansea (Upper Bank) | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1388 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1388 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1389 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1389 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1390 | Snapshot | 7 | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1391 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1391 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1397 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1397 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1404 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1404 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 03/11/1934 | 1388 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 01/12/1934 | 1309 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 1391 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 5641 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 5642 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 6 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 1228 | Transfer out to: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1936 | 5283 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1936 | 5288 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1936 | 5289 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 18/06/1938 | 1364 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 04/11/1944 | 1267 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 11/1945 | 1334 | Snapshot | 22C | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 11/1945 | 1337 | Snapshot | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 11/1945 | 1338 | Snapshot | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 11/1945 | 1389 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 11/1945 | 1389 | Snapshot | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 11/1945 | 1397 | Snapshot | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 11/1945 | 1397 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 11/1945 | 1404 | Snapshot | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 4266 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 4829 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1028 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1030 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 11212 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 119 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1706 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 174 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1121 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1874 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3178 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3204 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3419 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3436 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3439 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3444 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3464 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3593 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3712 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3734 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3853 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3928 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3953 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4112 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4135 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4169 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 423 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4266 | Snapshot | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4266 | Snapshot | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 43228 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4411 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4424 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4466 | Snapshot | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4534 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4536 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4537 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4569 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4804 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4812 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4829 | Snapshot | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4843 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4855 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5272 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5283 | Snapshot | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5288 | Snapshot | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5289 | Snapshot | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5561 | Snapshot | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5570 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5572 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5641 | Snapshot | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5642 | Snapshot | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5662 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5663 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5682 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5685 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5690 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5694 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Sentinel | 0-4-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7190 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2781 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 741 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7544 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7550 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7678 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 935 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 4537 | Transfer in from: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 4569 | Transfer in from: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 4537 | Transfer out to: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 4569 | Transfer out to: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 4P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 1012 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 4812 | Transfer out to: | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 3926 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 3427 | Transfer in from: | 22D | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 3462 | Transfer in from: | 22D | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 45660 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 45699 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 3204 | Transfer out to: | 22D | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 19/06/1948 | 3439 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 29 | Transfer in from: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 119 | Transfer out to: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 02/10/1948 | 58074 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 4269 | Transfer in from: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 4269 | Transfer in from: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 4553 | Transfer in from: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 4269 | Transfer out to: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 44466 | Transfer out to: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 4553 | Transfer in from: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 4553 | Transfer out to: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 44962 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 45285 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 1121 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 02/1949 | 41874 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/03/1949 | 3178 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 163 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 44743 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 44744 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 44745 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 44746 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 44747 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 44804 | Transfer out to: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 44843 | Transfer out to: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 44962 | Transfer out to: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 45272 | Transfer out to: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 45285 | Transfer out to: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 44743 | Transfer in from: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 44744 | Transfer in from: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 44745 | Transfer in from: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 44746 | Transfer in from: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 44747 | Transfer in from: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 44743 | Transfer out to: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 44744 | Transfer out to: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 44745 | Transfer out to: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 44746 | Transfer out to: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 44747 | Transfer out to: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 4267 | Transfer in from: | 22C | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 44355 | Transfer in from: | 22C | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 41902 | Transfer in from: | 22C | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 41904 | Transfer in from: | 22C | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 43419 | Transfer out to: | 22E | Highbridge | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 44112 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 40164 | Transfer in from: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 40029 | Transfer out to: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/03/1950 | 43847 | Transfer in from: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/03/1950 | 43969 | Transfer in from: | 19C | Canklow | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 58079 | Transfer in from: | 22D | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 43593 | Transfer out to: | 71H | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 43712 | Transfer out to: | SR | To Southern Region | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 44534 | Transfer out to: | SR | To Southern Region | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 44855 | Transfer out to: | SR | To Southern Region | ||
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | w/e | 01/07/1950 | 41904 | Transfer out to: | 23C | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/07/1950 | 43847 | Transfer out to: | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/07/1950 | 43853 | Transfer out to: | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/07/1950 | 43969 | Transfer out to: | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | w/e | 22/07/1950 | 41902 | Transfer out to: | 23C | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/08/1950 | 43847 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/08/1950 | 43853 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/08/1950 | 43969 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 4P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 12/08/1950 | 41012 | Transfer out to: | 15B | Kettering | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 58079 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 16/09/1950 | 41012 | Transfer in from: | 15B | Kettering | ||
Steam | 4P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 41012 | Transfer in from: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 43593 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 41012 | Transfer out to: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 43847 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 43969 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 40116 | Transfer in from: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 40116 | Transfer in from: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 40116 | Transfer out to: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2781 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 40741 | Transfer in from: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2781 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 40741 | Transfer out to: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 40741 | Transfer in from: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 40741 | Transfer out to: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 4P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 13/01/1951 | 41012 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 40423 | Transfer out to: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 43837 | Transfer in from: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 43972 | Transfer in from: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 43837 | Transfer in from: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 43972 | Transfer in from: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 43837 | Transfer out to: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 43972 | Transfer out to: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 45602 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 45570 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 45602 | Transfer in from: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 45602 | Transfer out to: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 4P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 41030 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2781 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 40741 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 41140 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 40426 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 41140 | Transfer in from: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 41140 | Transfer out to: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 40935 | Transfer out to: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 45679 | Transfer in from: | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | 4P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 41028 | Transfer out to: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 41140 | Transfer out to: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 51217 | Transfer in from: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 4P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 41028 | Transfer in from: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 41140 | Transfer in from: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 43972 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 43046 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 40486 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 41028 | Transfer out to: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 41140 | Transfer out to: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 43837 | Transfer out to: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | Sentinel | 0-4-0T | 6w/e | 13/08/1952 | 47190 | Transfer out to: | 71G | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 45577 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 40486 | Transfer out to: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45577 | Transfer in from: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 43853 | Transfer out to: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45577 | Transfer out to: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45679 | Transfer out to: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 44317 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 51202 | Transfer in from: | 22C | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 43046 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 44135 | Transfer out to: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 44744 | Transfer out to: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 44746 | Transfer out to: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 51217 | Transfer out to: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 44317 | Transfer in from: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 45585 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 51202 | Transfer in from: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 44317 | Transfer out to: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 51202 | Transfer out to: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 44855 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 12/1952 | 43228 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 43436 | Transfer out to: | 71H | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 45651 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 47552 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 45585 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 58077 | Transfer out to: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 44855 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 40409 | Transfer in from: | 18C | Hasland | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 40486 | Transfer in from: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 41198 | Transfer in from: | 15D | Bedford | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 40409 | Transfer out to: | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 43036 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 41198 | Transfer out to: | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 44804 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 41240 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 43932 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 43036 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 44267 | Transfer out to: | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 44804 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 44135 | Transfer in from: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 44296 | Transfer in from: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 40120 | Transfer in from: | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 43444 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 47333 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 40163 | Transfer out to: | 20G | Hellifield | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 46400 | Transfer in from: | 15B | Kettering | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 46494 | Transfer in from: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 40120 | Transfer out to: | 20G | Hellifield | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 44317 | Transfer out to: | 15D | Bedford | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 43462 | Transfer out to: | 21C | Bromsgrove | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 43928 | Transfer out to: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 43932 | Transfer out to: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 43953 | Transfer out to: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 44169 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 40164 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 40174 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 43344 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 43444 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 45273 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 45274 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 44015 | Transfer in from: | 19C | Canklow | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 40182 | Transfer in from: | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 1121 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 41879 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 40182 | Transfer out to: | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 44744 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 44746 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 45273 | Transfer out to: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 45274 | Transfer out to: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 45572 | Transfer out to: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 45572 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 45602 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 41207 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 41208 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 45602 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 41706 | Transfer out to: | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 46400 | Transfer out to: | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 46494 | Transfer out to: | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 45602 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 44266 | Transfer out to: | 15D | Bedford | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 44966 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 45040 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 45280 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 45561 | Transfer out to: | 17F | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 23/02/1957 | 40486 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 44015 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 44966 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 45040 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 45280 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 40332 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 73015 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 73054 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 73068 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 44743 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 44744 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 44745 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 73031 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 44296 | Transfer out to: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 44746 | Transfer out to: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 44747 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | w/e | 24/08/1957 | 51212 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 51217 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 11/1957 | 40426 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 40501 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 73003 | Transfer in from: | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 45663 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 73031 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | w/e | 25/01/1958 | 51202 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 41241 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51221 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 40116 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 43464 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 75004 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 75021 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 75022 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 41241 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 43427 | Transfer out to: | 82G | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 2205 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 45504 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 45506 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 45519 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 5393 | Transfer in from: | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 6350 | Transfer in from: | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 6346 | Transfer in from: | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 6376 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 2205 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 5393 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 8725 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 40537 | Transfer in from: | 21B | Bournville | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 2215 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 44135 | Transfer out to: | 82G | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 28/03/1959 | 47550 | Transfer out to: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 5393 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 2215 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 41304 | Transfer in from: | 71J | Highbridge | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 11/07/1959 | 43926 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 44135 | Transfer in from: | 82G | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 51218 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 30/09/1959 | 40332 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 10/1959 | 5393 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 3752 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 44355 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 44424 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 44536 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 44537 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 6323 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 47552 | Transfer out to: | 82G | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 2229 | Transfer in from: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 3606 | Transfer in from: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 43734 | Transfer out to: | 82G | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 47552 | Transfer in from: | 82G | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | m/e | 31/01/1960 | 51221 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1121 | 0-6-0T | on | 09/03/1960 | 41879 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/03/1960 | D2135 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 40098 | Transfer in from: | 86K | Tredegar | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 41240 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 43344 | Transfer out to: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 41240 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 44422 | Transfer in from: | 22C | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 41240 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 44523 | Transfer in from: | 22C | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 07/1960 | 6323 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 40126 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 40161 | Transfer in from: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 40171 | Transfer in from: | 86K | Abergavenny | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 73019 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 73028 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 40501 | Transfer out to: | 85E | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 41304 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 41304 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 41202 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 41203 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 41240 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 41249 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 41296 | Transfer in from: | 82G | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82006 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82007 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82009 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82030 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82033 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82035 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82037 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82039 | Transfer in from: | 82G | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82040 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82044 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 92210 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 92248 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 40126 | Transfer out to: | 82G | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 82042 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 82043 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 92231 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 40171 | Transfer out to: | 82G | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 73019 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 73028 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 82009 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 92221 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 40161 | Transfer out to: | 82G | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 75021 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 22/11/1960 | 43444 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 41248 | Transfer in from: | 82G | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 44422 | Transfer out to: | 82G | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | D2134 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 92007 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 40098 | Transfer out to: | 82G | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 82033 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 01/01/1961 | 92231 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 92004 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 82006 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 82007 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 43593 | Transfer out to: | 85D | Bromsgrove | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 73054 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | on | 23/04/1961 | 82003 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 73028 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 14/07/1961 | 47333 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 14/07/1961 | 47678 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 3795 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 41203 | Transfer out to: | 83H | Plymouth Friary | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 6350 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 40537 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | m/e | 10/1961 | 51217 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 73094 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 45572 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 45577 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 45651 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 45660 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 45662 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 45699 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 75022 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 82042 | Transfer out to: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 82044 | Transfer out to: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 41203 | Transfer in from: | 83H | Plymouth Friary | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82030 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 3795 | Transfer out to: | 82G | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 73094 | Transfer out to: | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 75004 | Transfer out to: | 82G | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/12/1961 | D2145 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 3795 | Transfer in from: | 82G | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 41208 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 82003 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 82035 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 82037 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 82039 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 82040 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 82043 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | on | 17/03/1962 | 45504 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | on | 17/03/1962 | 45506 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | on | 17/03/1962 | 45519 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 41202 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 41203 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 47544 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 05/1962 | 6376 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 44411 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 47552 | Transfer out to: | 82G | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 44209 | Transfer in from: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 48474 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 73049 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 75002 | Transfer in from: | 82G | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 45694 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 2221 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 73021 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 73024 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 75000 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 73049 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 92210 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 73024 | Transfer in from: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 73024 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 12/08/1962 | 44553 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/1962 | 2229 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 43924 | Transfer in from: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 44264 | Transfer in from: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 5203 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 75000 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 41240 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 48474 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 6346 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 73021 | Transfer out to: | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 73024 | Transfer out to: | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 73068 | Transfer out to: | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 75002 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 22/10/1962 | 8725 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 3218 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 3632 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 3643 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 3675 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 3677 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 3696 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 3702 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 3765 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 4103 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 41208 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 41209 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 41245 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 4131 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 4619 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 46506 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 46517 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 5215 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 6147 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 82007 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 82035 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 82036 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 82037 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 82038 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 82039 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 82040 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 82043 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 8795 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 9623 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 9626 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 13/11/1962 | 3632 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 2277 | Transfer in from: | 82G | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 43924 | To Store | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 2217 | Transfer in from: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 2251 | Transfer in from: | 89D | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 48110 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 48431 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 92000 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 41209 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 46506 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 46517 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 51218 | Transfer out to: | 87D | Swansea East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 18/12/1962 | 3606 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | 48110 | Transfer in from: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | 48110 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 43924 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 5203 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 5215 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 73003 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 92004 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 6148 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 75001 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 81xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 8102 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 05/1963 | 3795 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 4699 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 44209 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1963 | 48110 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 44264 | Transfer in from: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 44296 | Transfer in from: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 44534 | Transfer in from: | SR | To Southern Region | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 44264 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 07/1963 | 3765 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 4684 | Transfer in from: | 88H | Tondu | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 9660 | Transfer in from: | PILL | Newport Pill | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 41207 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 41304 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 08/1963 | 44523 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 08/09/1963 | 92221 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 3659 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 73003 | Transfer in from: | 83E | Yeovil Town | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 92224 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 41245 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Barnstaple Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 75001 | Transfer out to: | 83E | Yeovil Town | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 06/10/1963 | 4681 | Transfer in from: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 06/10/1963 | 7782 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 06/10/1963 | 9620 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 92238 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 6147 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Westbury | ||
Steam | 81xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 8102 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Westbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 82040 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 92224 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 9620 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 73164 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 2251 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 2277 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 73028 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1963 | 4681 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 82035 | Transfer in from: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 9601 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 2217 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 3218 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 41208 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Barnstaple Junction | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 41248 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Barnstaple Junction | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 41249 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Barnstaple Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 82035 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 73001 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 3752 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 4699 | Transfer out to: | 87D | Swansea East Dock | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 48431 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 9660 | Transfer out to: | 87D | Swansea East Dock | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1964 | 44296 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | on | 07/02/1964 | 82043 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/03/1964 | 45690 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 04/1964 | 3702 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 3758 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 82035 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 82039 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 13/04/1964 | 45685 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 4698 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/05/1964 | 2221 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 08/06/1964 | 45682 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 4949 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 4992 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 4993 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 5975 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 6804 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 6816 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 6821 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 6822 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 6829 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 6838 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 6846 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 6860 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 6900 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 6908 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 6982 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 6990 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 6997 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 73012 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 73024 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 73037 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 7907 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 7914 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 7924 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 82001 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 6148 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | on | 29/06/1964 | 82007 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1964 | 5975 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 43887 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 6838 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 20/07/1964 | 44569 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1964 | 6804 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1964 | 6982 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 5955 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 9672 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 09/1964 | 4103 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 09/1964 | 4131 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1964 | 4619 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1964 | 4949 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1964 | 6822 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1964 | 6846 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1964 | 6900 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 10/1964 | 7782 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 2822 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 3798 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 3802 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 3863 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 73030 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 7907 | Transfer in from: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 8714 | Transfer in from: | 87D | Swansea East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 9606 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 43887 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 4698 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 6821 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 6860 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 73024 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 73037 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 73164 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 7907 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 9606 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 11/1964 | 2822 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1964 | 6997 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 11/1964 | 8714 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 2w/e | 01/11/1964 | 3758 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 6918 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 6935 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 6965 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/11/1964 | 73012 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/11/1964 | 44422 | Transfer in from: | 82G | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 28/11/1964 | 44534 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D2134 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D2135 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D2145 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1964 | 9601 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1964 | 3836 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/01/1965 | 4992 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/01/1965 | 4993 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/01/1965 | 6935 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 2w/e | 23/01/1965 | 8403 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 2w/e | 23/01/1965 | 8471 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 2w/e | 23/01/1965 | 9430 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 2w/e | 23/01/1965 | 3643 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 2w/e | 23/01/1965 | 3675 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 2w/e | 23/01/1965 | 3677 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | 44422 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | 73001 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | 92248 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | 75022 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | 8415 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | 9680 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | 73030 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 73030 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 75022 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 92000 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 92007 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 92238 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 9405 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 9711 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 04/1965 | 44135 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 04/1965 | 5955 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 11/04/1965 | 4992 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 11/04/1965 | 5932 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 11/04/1965 | 6973 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 11/04/1965 | 6984 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 8415 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1965 | 6918 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1965 | 8403 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1965 | 8471 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1965 | 9405 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1965 | 9430 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 80059 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 80064 | Transfer in from: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 44264 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 44269 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 16/06/1965 | 43924 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 07/1965 | 4684 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1965 | 6816 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1965 | 6908 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 07/1965 | 8795 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 07/1965 | 9623 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 6829 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 73003 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 73015 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 73030 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 80059 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | on | 21/07/1965 | 82036 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 08/1965 | 3802 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1965 | 6973 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 5971 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 7904 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 25/08/1965 | 80064 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | on | 25/08/1965 | 82037 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | on | 06/09/1965 | 82038 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 3844 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 3659 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 41296 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 9626 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 10/1965 | 3844 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 10/1965 | 3863 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1965 | 5932 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1965 | 6965 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 11/1965 | 3836 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 6141 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 92209 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 92235 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 92243 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 18/11/1965 | 3696 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 18/11/1965 | 92235 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1965 | 5971 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 12/1965 | 6141 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1965 | 7904 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1965 | 7907 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1965 | 7914 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1965 | 7924 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | m/e | 12/1965 | 82001 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | m/e | 12/1965 | 92209 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | m/e | 12/1965 | 92243 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1965 | 9672 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1965 | 9680 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 03/12/1965 | 6984 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 03/12/1965 | 6990 | Condemned |