Depot: Bromsgrove
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 7239 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7234 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7239 | Snapshot | 20B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7301 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7303 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7305 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7308 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7313 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7425 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7565 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | U1 | 2-8-8-2T | on | 07/03/1949 | 69999 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 3321 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 43667 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 43686 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 47313 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 3321 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 3186 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 3186 | Transfer in from: | 21C | Bromsgrove | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 3186 | Transfer out to: | 21C | Bromsgrove | ||
Steam | U1 | 2-8-8-2T | on | 11/11/1950 | 69999 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 47276 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 47301 | Transfer in from: | 21C | Bromsgrove | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 47301 | Transfer out to: | 21C | Bromsgrove | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 47502 | Transfer in from: | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 43686 | Transfer out to: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 47502 | Transfer in from: | 21C | Bromsgrove | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 47502 | Transfer out to: | 21C | Bromsgrove | ||
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 47234 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 56020 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 47635 | Transfer in from: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 47635 | Transfer out to: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 47257 | Transfer in from: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 47257 | Transfer out to: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 03/04/1954 | 43667 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 43462 | Transfer in from: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 51217 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | U1 | 2-8-8-2T | on | 03/07/1955 | 69999 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | U1 | 2-8-8-2T | on | 13/09/1955 | 69999 | Transfer out to: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 51217 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 07/04/1956 | 43462 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 43762 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 92079 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 8402 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 8400 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 8404 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 8405 | Transfer in from: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 8401 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 8403 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 47301 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 47303 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 47305 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 47425 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 8406 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 47565 | Transfer out to: | 6F | Bidston | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 47502 | Transfer out to: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 47464 | Transfer in from: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 47464 | Transfer out to: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 9455 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 8427 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 8427 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 9455 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 43186 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bournville | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 5226 | Transfer in from: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 5226 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | D3988 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | D3988 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 01/1961 | 8406 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 25/03/1961 | 43762 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 43593 | Transfer in from: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 8409 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 9430 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 9493 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 8480 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 8487 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 9429 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 92234 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 8480 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 9429 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 11/1961 | 8404 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 92234 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/12/1961 | 8487 | Transfer in from: | 85D | Bromsgrove | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/12/1961 | 43593 | Transfer out to: | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/12/1961 | 8487 | Transfer out to: | 85D | Bromsgrove | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 8487 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 9401 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 47506 | Transfer in from: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 07/1963 | 9401 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 8418 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 92223 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 47506 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 92230 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 07/02/1964 | 92223 | Transfer out to: | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 47276 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 47308 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 9453 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 08/1964 | 8409 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 08/1964 | 8418 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 92230 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 9453 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1964 | 8400 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1964 | 8401 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1964 | 8405 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1964 | 9493 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 8402 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 8403 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 9430 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 11/11/1967 | 92079 | Condemned |