Depot: Crewe Works
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 11412 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 11446 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 16032 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7592 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 317 | 0-4-2ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 7862 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 317 | 0-4-2ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 7865 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 11444 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 52093 | Transfer in from: | 23B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 52464 | Transfer in from: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 52441 | Transfer in from: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 52517 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0T | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 58857 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 52212 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 52218 | Transfer in from: | 23B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 58857 | Transfer out to: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 52207 | Transfer in from: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 52345 | Transfer in from: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 52459 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 317 | 0-4-2ST | on | 07/11/1953 | 47865 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 52312 | Transfer in from: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 317 | 0-4-2ST | on | 03/11/1956 | 47862 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 56027 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 58271 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 58271 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 52429 | Transfer in from: | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 52429 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 43330 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 52201 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 05/1958 | 52517 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 52225 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 44363 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 44373 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 44374 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 52201 | Transfer out to: | 26F | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 52207 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 52212 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 52345 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 43464 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/11/1958 | 43330 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 40679 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 27/12/1958 | 47391 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 27/12/1958 | 40679 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/12/1958 | 43464 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 47391 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 52225 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 47618 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 56027 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 56032 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 43957 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1961 | 52464 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/05/1961 | 47648 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 47648 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 26/08/1961 | 47597 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | m/e | 09/1961 | 51444 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1961 | 44127 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 25/11/1961 | 47611 | Transfer in from: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/11/1961 | 44127 | Transfer out to: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/12/1961 | 52459 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 30/12/1961 | 47661 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 03/02/1962 | 47608 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 47658 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 51446 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 47608 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/04/1962 | 52218 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 47380 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 84021 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 84022 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 84023 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 84024 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 01/09/1962 | 51412 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/09/1962 | 52093 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/09/1962 | 52312 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/09/1962 | 52441 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/03/1963 | 44405 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/03/1963 | 44374 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 47611 | Transfer out to: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 06/07/1963 | 47505 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/08/1963 | 47494 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 47646 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/1963 | 44363 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | m/e | 10/1963 | 47618 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 44593 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 47615 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 47494 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 44583 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 47330 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 47400 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 02/05/1964 | 43957 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 47380 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 44583 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | on | 05/09/1964 | 84021 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | on | 05/09/1964 | 84022 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | on | 05/09/1964 | 84023 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | on | 05/09/1964 | 84024 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 44137 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/12/1964 | 44525 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/12/1964 | 44373 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/12/1964 | 44593 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 13/02/1965 | D2741 | Transfer in from: | 67E | Dumfries | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 27/02/1965 | D2708 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 27/02/1965 | D2711 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 27/02/1965 | D2719 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 27/02/1965 | D2722 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 27/02/1965 | D2743 | Transfer in from: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/02/1965 | 44137 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 06/03/1965 | D2742 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 44377 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 47330 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 47400 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 47505 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 47646 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | m/e | 11/1965 | 47597 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 05/03/1966 | 47592 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 12/03/1966 | 47649 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 30/04/1966 | D2900 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 30/04/1966 | D2901 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 30/04/1966 | D2902 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/06/1966 | 44405 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | D2201 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | D2202 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | D2203 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/09/1966 | D2200 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/09/1966 | D2207 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1966 | 12039 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1966 | 12047 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1966 | 12062 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1966 | D3068 | Transfer in from: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 44377 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 44525 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 47615 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 47649 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 47658 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 47661 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 11/02/1967 | D2708 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 11/02/1967 | D2711 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 11/02/1967 | D2719 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 11/02/1967 | D2722 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 11/02/1967 | D2741 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 11/02/1967 | D2742 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 11/02/1967 | D2743 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | on | 11/02/1967 | D2900 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | on | 11/02/1967 | D2901 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | on | 11/02/1967 | D2902 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/12/1967 | D2176 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/12/1967 | D2203 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/12/1967 | D2207 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/12/1967 | D2189 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/12/1967 | 12039 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 12040 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/02/1968 | D2218 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/02/1968 | D2202 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/02/1968 | D2208 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/02/1968 | D2218 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/04/1968 | D2386 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/04/1968 | D2387 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/04/1968 | D2200 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/04/1968 | D2201 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/05/1968 | D2176 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/05/1968 | 12040 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/05/1968 | 12047 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/05/1968 | 12062 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/05/1968 | D2189 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/05/1968 | D2208 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/05/1968 | D2386 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/05/1968 | D2387 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/05/1968 | D3068 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel |