Depot: Aberbeeg
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Aberbeeg | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6689 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | ABEEG | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4226 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | ABEEG | on | 15/06/1947 | PILL | Newport Pill | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8748 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 146 | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5732 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | ABEEG | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8776 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4251 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 16 | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3729 | 4w/e | 29/12/1945 | ABEEG | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8777 | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | ABEEG | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3674 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | ABEEG | on | 15/06/1947 | TDU | Tondu | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4522 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | ABEEG | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4682 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | ABEEG | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5756 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | ABEEG | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5789 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | ABEEG | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8724 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | ABEEG | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5236 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | ABEEG | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6410 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 18/05/1946 | ABDR | Aberdare | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8794 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | ABEEG | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4225 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 18/05/1946 | ABEEG | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3670 | 4w/e | 07/09/1946 | ABEEG | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7740 | 4w/e | 07/09/1946 | ABEEG | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3616 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | TDU | Tondu | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3670 | 4w/e | 07/09/1946 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3680 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 86J | Aberdare | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3683 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3729 | 4w/e | 29/12/1945 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3776 | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 16 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 86D | Llantrisant | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3779 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4217 | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 146 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | TDU | Tondu | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4222 | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 16 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | m/e | 31/03/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4231 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4243 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4267 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4287 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4522 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4541 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 87H | Neyland | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4682 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86B | Newport Pill |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4685 | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 16 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | m/e | 05/1962 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4686 | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 16 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | m/e | 31/05/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5532 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5733 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 86B | Newport Pill | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5756 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5786 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5788 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | m/e | 31/05/1948 | LTS | Llantrisant | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5789 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 86F | Tondu |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6621 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 86F | Tondu | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7703 | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 16 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86B | Newport Pill | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7740 | 4w/e | 07/09/1946 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | PPRD | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7789 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | PILL | Newport Pill | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7798 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | m/e | 05/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8723 | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 16 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8724 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 86J | Aberdare |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8739 | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 66 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 86D | Llantrisant | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8776 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8777 | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8794 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9723 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5259 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4214 | on | 15/06/1947 | TDU | Tondu | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 86B | Newport Pill |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4270 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4637 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | ABEEG | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 86D | Llantrisant |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5236 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 31/03/1948 | ABEEG | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 86F | Tondu |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5520 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | Aberdare | m/e | 30/04/1948 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 87H | Neyland |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4662 | on | 15/06/1947 | PILL | Newport Pill | m/e | 31/05/1948 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 86F | Tondu |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3711 | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3729 | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4686 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5238 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7775 | on | 15/06/1947 | TDU | Tondu | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3716 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 86J | Aberdare |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4238 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86B | Newport Pill |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4222 | m/e | 31/03/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4260 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 86F | Tondu |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3708 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4290 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4223 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | ABEEG | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5207 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2159 | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 86J | Aberdare |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8402 | on | 30/09/1949 | PILL | Newport Pill (New) | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | ABEEG | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5777 | on | 15/06/1947 | LTS | Llantrisant | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 86H | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 86B | Newport Pill |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4217 | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | TDU | Tondu | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 86H | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 86F | Tondu |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6685 | on | 15/06/1947 | TDU | Tondu | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 86H | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86J | Aberdare |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7721 | on | 15/06/1947 | LTS | Llantrisant | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 86H | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 86B | Newport Pill |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4267 | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 86H | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9796 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 86H | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6642 | on | 15/06/1947 | TDU | Tondu | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 86H | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6642 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 86H | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4271 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 86H | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4271 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 86H | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3691 | on | 15/06/1947 | LTS | Llantrisant | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 86H | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3691 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 86H | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4287 | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 86H | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4287 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 86H | m/e | 01/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4222 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 86H | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4227 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 86H | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4222 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 86H | Aberbeeg | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 86H | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 86F | Tondu |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4227 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 86H | Aberbeeg | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 86H | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4533 | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 86H | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4533 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 86H | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5750 | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | PILL | Newport Pill | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 86H | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5202 | on | 15/06/1947 | TDU | Tondu | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 86H | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6663 | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 86H | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4593 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 86H | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4593 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 86H | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9459 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 86H | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9460 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 86H | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9459 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 86H | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6692 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | Aberdare | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86H | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9460 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 86H | m/e | 02/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5602 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86H | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6692 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86H | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 86J | Aberdare |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5532 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 86H | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5532 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 86H | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4215 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 86F | Tondu | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 86H | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8786 | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 86H | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6638 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86F | Tondu | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 86H | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 85C | Hereford |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8493 | on | 30/09/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 86H | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6672 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 86H | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8494 | on | 30/09/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 86H | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6620 | on | 15/06/1947 | CV.BRY | Barry | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 86H | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4643 | on | 15/06/1947 | TDU | Tondu | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 86H | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 86B | Newport Pill |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5785 | on | 15/06/1947 | WES | Westbury | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 86H | m/e | 12/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8436 | on | 31/05/1953 (New) | 86H | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5645 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 86H | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8436 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 86H | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5573 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | WOS | Worcester | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 86H | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3747 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | Aberdare | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 86H | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5241 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | LTS | Llantrisant | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 86H | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9427 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 86H | m/e | 06/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9450 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 86H | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6621 | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 86H | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8439 | on | 30/06/1953 | 86C | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 86H | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4269 | on | 15/06/1947 | PILL | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 86H | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 86F | Tondu |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7774 | on | 15/06/1947 | PILL | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 86H | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 86K | Tredegar |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4522 | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 86H | m/e | 02/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4250 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 86H | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8494 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 86H | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5544 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | NA | Newton Abbot | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 86H | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 83F | Truro |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4277 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 86H | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5685 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 86H | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6663 | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 86H | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5729 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 86H | m/e | 10/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5794 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 86H | m/e | 12/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3674 | on | 15/06/1947 | TDU | Tondu | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 86H | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 86B | Newport Pill |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5206 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 86H | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5574 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 86F | Tondu | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 86H | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4200 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 86H | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4259 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 86H | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 86B | Newport Pill |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3647 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 86J | Aberdare | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 86H | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8705 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 86H | m/e | 04/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5564 | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 82C | Swindon | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 86H | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9458 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 86H | m/e | 01/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5539 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 86H | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 83E | St Blazey |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4138 | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 86H | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4237 | on | 15/06/1947 | PILL | Newport Pill | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 86H | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 88J | Aberdare |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4276 | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 86F | Tondu | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 86H | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86B | Newport Pill |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5516 | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 86H | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6621 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 86H | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 88B | Radyr |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8796 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | PILL | Newport Pill | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 86H | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4258 | on | 15/06/1947 | PILL | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 86H | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86B | Newport Pill |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5657 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 86H | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5790 | on | 15/06/1947 | TYS | Tyseley | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 86H | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3700 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 86B | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 86H | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 86K | Tredegar |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5759 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 86H | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9459 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 86H | m/e | 09/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4285 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 86B | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86H | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 88G | Llantrisant |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4291 | on | 15/06/1947 | PILL | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86H | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8484 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86H | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8489 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86H | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8429 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 86H | m/e | 01/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6644 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 86H | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6653 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 86H | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8786 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 86H | m/e | 07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5568 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 86H | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6629 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 86H | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4627 | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 86H | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8437 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 88C | Barry | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86H | m/e | 11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5257 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 86B | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 86H | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7755 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86H | m/e | 05/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8444 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 86J | Aberdare | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 86H | m/e | 07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5731 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 87C | Danygraig | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 86H | m/e | 05/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5706 | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 86F | Tondu | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 86H | m/e | 09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3676 | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86H | m/e | 05/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9682 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 86H | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 88B | Radyr | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3712 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 86H | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 87H | Neyland |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5264 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 86H | on | 17/06/1963 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6408 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 86F | m/e | 02/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6419 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 86F | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 83E | Yeovil Town |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7787 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 86F | m/e | 06/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3664 | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 84A | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 86F | m/e | 05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4652 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 86B | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 86F | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 88H | Tondu |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4246 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 86F | on | 13/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4247 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 86F | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 88H | Tondu |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8440 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 86B | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 86F | m/e | 07/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8499 | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 86B | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 86F | m/e | 06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4650 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 86F | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 88B | Radyr |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9444 | on | 30/04/1951 | 87B | Duffryn Yard (New) | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 86F | m/e | 03/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5218 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 86F | m/e | 09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9494 | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 86F | m/e | 11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3686 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 86F | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4693 | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 86F | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5202 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 86B | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 86F | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5231 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | PILL | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 86F | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 88A | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5252 | on | 15/06/1947 | TDU | Tondu | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 86F | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 88J | Aberdare |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9482 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 86F | m/e | 11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4604 | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | TN | Taunton | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 86F | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5260 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 87F | Llanelli | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 86F | m/e | 03/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7245 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 86F | 4w/e | 22/02/1964 | 88B | Radyr |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7212 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 86F | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 88J | Aberdare |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5214 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 86F | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8493 | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 86F | m/e | 11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3766 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 86F | m/e | 08/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9446 | on | 31/05/1951 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) (New) | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 86F | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 87D | Swansea East Dock |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9425 | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 88C | Barry | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 86F | m/e | 11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5214 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 86F | m/e | 09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4277 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 86F | m/e | 06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4663 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 86F | m/e | 06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7217 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 87F | Llanelli | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 86F | m/e | 07/1964 | Withdrawn |