Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 145 Today
» 853 Yesterday
» 4386 Week
» 17419 Month
» 239820 Year
» 1124201 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Cambridge


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Cambridge Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam K2 2-6-0 1631 02/1913 CLK Colwick (New) 05/1924 CAM 30/09/1927 NWE New England
Steam K2 2-6-0 1644 04/1914 NWE New England (New) 07/1924 CAM 15/10/1927 STR Stratford
Steam K2 2-6-0 1676 1924 MAR March 1925 CAM 15/08/1925 KX Kings Cross
Steam K2 2-6-0 4656 28/08/1925 STR Stratford 04/01/1927 CAM 15/03/1939 MAR March
Steam K2 2-6-0 4674 03/1924 STR Stratford 04/01/1927 CAM 03/11/1928 STR Stratford
Steam K2 2-6-0 4653 10/04/1926 STR Stratford 07/01/1927 CAM 04/06/1928 MAR March
Steam O4 2-8-0 2136       12/05/1927 CAM 04/06/1927 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam K1 2-6-0 4630 30/07/1925 CLK Colwick 11/06/1927 CAM 30/09/1927 NWE New England
Steam K2 2-6-0 4670 16/03/1925 LIV Brunswick 13/06/1927 CAM 27/07/1927 DON Doncaster
Steam K2 2-6-0 4676 23/10/1925 DON Doncaster 15/10/1927 CAM 07/01/1928 STR Stratford
Steam K2 2-6-0 4655 29/10/1925 DON Doncaster 20/10/1927 CAM 12/01/1928 STR Stratford
Steam C1 4-4-2 4408 07/04/1925 NWE New England 07/01/1928 CAM 24/05/1928 NWE New England
Steam C1 4-4-2 4444       09/01/1928 CAM 12/03/1928 KX Kings Cross
Steam K2 2-6-0 4667 08/1918 KX Kings Cross (New) 14/04/1928 CAM 02/05/1929 MAR March
Steam K2 2-6-0 4671 04/11/1925 DON Doncaster 23/05/1928 CAM 04/06/1928 MAR March
Steam K2 2-6-0 4653 04/06/1928 MAR March 23/07/1928 CAM 03/05/1929 MAR March
Steam C1 4-4-2 4404 03/08/1924 KX Kings Cross 20/09/1928 CAM 09/03/1933 NWE New England
Steam C1 4-4-2 4430       22/11/1928 CAM 25/06/1939 GRA Grantham
Steam C1 4-4-2 4402 04/08/1928 DON Doncaster 20/12/1928 CAM 04/01/1939 CLK Colwick
Steam K2 2-6-0 4663 03/11/1927 STR Stratford 18/01/1929 CAM 05/03/1929 NWE New England
Steam C1 4-4-2 3297       16/03/1929 CAM 01/01/1939 KX Kings Cross
Steam C1 4-4-2 4441       07/05/1929 CAM 29/10/1934 KX Kings Cross
Steam O4 2-8-0 6498 01/03/1929 MAR March 25/10/1931 CAM 16/03/1942 MAR March
Steam O4 2-8-0 6506 27/09/1930 MAR March 25/10/1931 CAM 18/10/1941 RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Steam O4 2-8-0 6520 01/03/1929 MAR March 25/10/1931 CAM 05/12/1936 MAR March
Steam O4 2-8-0 6527 27/09/1930 MAR March 25/10/1931 CAM 05/12/1936 MAR March
Steam O4 2-8-0 6204 05/03/1929 MAR March 09/06/1932 CAM 19/09/1941 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 6593 15/03/1932 MAR March 09/06/1932 CAM 14/04/1936 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6284 20/12/1924 DON Doncaster 11/08/1932 CAM 28/08/1932 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6360 24/12/1931 DON Doncaster 12/08/1932 CAM 29/08/1932 DON Doncaster
Steam C1 4-4-2 4439 23/06/1923 GRA Grantham 19/07/1933 CAM 29/09/1939 NWE New England
Steam C1 4-4-2 4440       29/10/1934 CAM 07/11/1934 KX Kings Cross
Steam C1 4-4-2 4441 29/10/1934 KX Kings Cross 07/11/1934 CAM 04/01/1935 KX Kings Cross
Steam C1 4-4-2 4440 07/11/1934 KX Kings Cross 04/01/1935 CAM 05/10/1938 KX Kings Cross
Steam O4 2-8-0 6364 17/04/1930 MAR March 08/05/1935 CAM 02/08/1935 MAR March
Steam K2 2-6-0 4646 08/06/1929 CLK Colwick 06/03/1936 CAM 06/10/1936 CLK Colwick
Steam K2 2-6-0 4640 22/08/1927 CLK Colwick 19/03/1936 CAM 07/11/1936 CLK Colwick
Steam K2 2-6-0 4687 01/03/1930 MAR March 04/10/1936 CAM 01/10/1938 STR Stratford
Steam K2 2-6-0 4671 20/12/1929 MAR March 21/10/1936 CAM 01/10/1938 NOR Norwich Thorpe
Steam C1 4-4-2 4416 03/02/1924 DON Doncaster 26/04/1938 CAM 21/09/1939 NWE New England
Steam J39 0-6-0 1259 05/09/1938 MAR March 12/12/1940 CAM 09/03/1941 MAR March
Steam J39 0-6-0 2708 28/07/1934 MAR March 12/12/1940 CAM 09/03/1941 MAR March
Steam B1 4-6-0 8304 25/06/1944 IPS Ipswich 13/07/1944 CAM 28/09/1945 NOR Norwich Thorpe
Steam B1 4-6-0 8301 01/03/1943 GOR Gorton 11/12/1944 CAM 29/09/1945 NOR Norwich Thorpe
Steam Q1 0-8-0T 5961 22/08/1939 MEX Mexborough 01/10/1945 CAM 21/10/1948 MAR March
Steam B1 4-6-0 8306 24/03/1944 STR Stratford 03/02/1946 CAM 24/07/1946 STR Stratford
Steam B1 4-6-0 1042       04/05/1946 (New) CAM 22/07/1946 NOR Norwich Thorpe
Steam B1 4-6-0 1003 28/09/1945 NOR Norwich Thorpe 24/07/1946 CAM 31/01/1947 STR Stratford
Steam B1 4-6-0 1004 02/11/1945 NOR Norwich Thorpe 24/07/1946 CAM 24/01/1947 PKS Parkeston Quay
Steam O4 2-8-0 3704 08/09/1944 MAR March 22/12/1947 CAM 29/03/1948 MAR March
Steam O4 2-8-0 3705 07/09/1944 MAR March 22/12/1947 CAM 29/03/1948 MAR March
Steam O4 2-8-0 3708 15/08/1933 MAR March 22/12/1947 CAM 27/11/1949 ARD Ardsley
Steam O4 2-8-0 3779 25/11/1936 MAR March 22/12/1947 CAM 11/01/1950 MEX Mexborough
Steam O4 2-8-0 3718 14/03/1932 MAR March 22/12/1947 CAM 29/03/1948 MAR March
Steam O4 2-8-0 3836 20/11/1936 MAR March 22/12/1947 CAM 01/12/1949 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 3839 07/09/1944 MAR March 22/12/1947 CAM 27/11/1949 ARD Ardsley
Steam O4 2-8-0 3880 07/09/1944 MAR March 22/12/1947 CAM 18/12/1949 ARD Ardsley
Steam O4 2-8-0 3897 08/09/1944 MAR March 22/12/1947 CAM 08/02/1948 MAR March
Steam O4 2-8-0 3898 07/09/1944 MAR March 22/12/1947 CAM 13/01/1950 MEX Mexborough
Steam O4 2-8-0 3724 08/09/1944 MAR March 22/12/1947 CAM 29/03/1948 MAR March
Steam O4 2-8-0 3730 07/09/1944 MAR March 22/12/1947 CAM 29/03/1948 MAR March
Steam O4 2-8-0 3904 02/11/1941 MAR March 22/12/1947 CAM 22/05/1949 MEX Mexborough
Steam O4 2-8-0 3913 02/11/1941 MAR March 22/12/1947 CAM 22/05/1949 MEX Mexborough
Steam J67 0-6-0T 8516       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 22/08/1953 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam J67 0-6-0T 8517       01/01/1948 CAM m/e 03/1956 Withdrawn
Steam J69 0-6-0T 8530       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 08/03/1958 41A Sheffield Darnall
Steam J67 0-6-0T 8536       01/01/1948 CAM m/e 02/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J67 0-6-0T 8583       01/01/1948 CAM m/e 04/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J67 0-6-0T 8609       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 18/10/1952 31E Bury St Edmunds
Steam B17 4-6-0 1608       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 17/11/1956 30E Colchester
Steam B17 4-6-0 1610       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 10/05/1958 31B March
Steam B17 4-6-0 1611       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 17/11/1956 30E Colchester
Steam B17 4-6-0 1613       01/01/1948 CAM 5w/e 14/06/1958 30E Colchester
Steam B2 4-6-0 1617       01/01/1948 CAM 11/08/1958 Withdrawn
Steam B17 4-6-0 1619       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 18/10/1952 31B March
Steam B17 4-6-0 1620       01/01/1948 CAM 3w/e 31/05/1950 31A Cambridge
Steam B17 4-6-0 1621       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 23/09/1950 30A Stratford
Steam B17 4-6-0 1622       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 20/06/1953 32D Yarmouth South Town
Steam B17 4-6-0 1623       01/01/1948 CAM m/e 07/1959 Withdrawn
Steam B17 4-6-0 1624       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 18/10/1952 31B March
Steam B17 4-6-0 1627       01/01/1948 CAM 5w/e 24/07/1954 31B March
Steam B17 4-6-0 1628       01/01/1948 CAM 15/09/1952 Withdrawn
Steam B17 4-6-0 1631       01/01/1948 CAM 5w/e 21/06/1952 31A Cambridge
Steam B17 4-6-0 1633       01/01/1948 CAM 3w/e 31/05/1950 31B March
Steam B17 4-6-0 1637       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 20/06/1953 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam B17 4-6-0 1638       01/01/1948 CAM 5w/e 22/09/1951 31B March
Steam B17 4-6-0 1640       01/01/1948 CAM 15/11/1958 Withdrawn
Steam B17 4-6-0 1641       01/01/1948 CAM 28/01/1960 Withdrawn
Steam B17 4-6-0 1642       01/01/1948 CAM 15/09/1958 Withdrawn
Steam B17 4-6-0 1643       01/01/1948 CAM 5w/e 16/02/1952 30A Stratford
Steam B17 4-6-0 1654       01/01/1948 CAM 3w/e 31/05/1950 30A Stratford
Steam B17 4-6-0 1663       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 20/06/1953 30A Stratford
Steam B17 4-6-0 1665       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 21/07/1951 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam B17 4-6-0 1666       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 19/07/1952 30A Stratford
Steam B2 4-6-0 2871       01/01/1948 CAM 22/09/1958 Withdrawn
Steam C12 4-4-2T 7360       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 15/11/1952 31E Bury St Edmunds
Steam C12 4-4-2T 7367       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 15/11/1952 31E Bury St Edmunds
Steam C12 4-4-2T 7375       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 19/04/1952 31B March
Steam C12 4-4-2T 7385       01/01/1948 CAM 5w/e 23/08/1952 31B March
Steam D16 4-4-0 2516       01/01/1948 CAM m/e 08/1957 Withdrawn
Steam D16 4-4-0 2525       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 19/04/1952 31C Kings Lynn
Steam D16 4-4-0 2527       01/01/1948 CAM m/e 07/1952 Withdrawn
Steam D16 4-4-0 2530       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 14/12/1957 31B March
Steam D16 4-4-0 2531       01/01/1948 CAM m/e 03/1955 Withdrawn
Steam D16 4-4-0 2536       01/01/1948 CAM 5w/e 21/06/1952 31A Cambridge
Steam D16 4-4-0 2549       01/01/1948 CAM m/e 12/1955 Withdrawn
Steam D16 4-4-0 2551       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 17/05/1952 31C Kings Lynn
Steam D16 4-4-0 2557       01/01/1948 CAM 5w/e 16/02/1952 31C Kings Lynn
Steam D16 4-4-0 2567       01/01/1948 CAM m/e 12/1956 Withdrawn
Steam D16 4-4-0 2571       01/01/1948 CAM 5w/e 20/04/1957 40A Lincoln
Steam D16 4-4-0 2574       01/01/1948 CAM m/e 12/1955 Withdrawn
Steam D16 4-4-0 2601       01/01/1948 CAM 01/01/1957 Withdrawn
Steam D16 4-4-0 2606       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 20/06/1953 31C Kings Lynn
Steam D16 4-4-0 2607       01/01/1948 CAM m/e 07/1949 BSE Bury St Edmunds
Steam D16 4-4-0 2618       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 08/03/1958 31C Kings Lynn
Steam E4 2-4-0 2780       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 20/10/1951 31A Cambridge
Steam E4 2-4-0 2781       01/01/1948 CAM m/e 30/11/1949 CAM Cambridge
Steam E4 2-4-0 2783       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 19/07/1952 31E Bury St Edmunds
Steam E4 2-4-0 2784       01/01/1948 CAM m/e 05/1955 Withdrawn
Steam E4 2-4-0 2786       01/01/1948 CAM m/e 07/1949 BSE Bury St Edmunds
Steam E4 2-4-0 2788       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 20/10/1951 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam E4 2-4-0 2790       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 25/11/1950 31C Kings Lynn
Steam E4 2-4-0 2791       01/01/1948 CAM 5w/e 24/03/1951 30E Colchester
Steam E4 2-4-0 2794       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 22/03/1952 31E Bury St Edmunds
Steam E4 2-4-0 2796       01/01/1948 CAM 5w/e 22/09/1951 31A Cambridge
Steam E4 2-4-0 2796       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 20/08/1955 31A Cambridge
Steam F3 2-4-2T 7115       01/01/1948 CAM 13/05/1948 Withdrawn
Steam F3 2-4-2T 7117       01/01/1948 CAM 13/05/1948 Withdrawn
Steam J15 0-6-0 5350       01/01/1948 CAM m/e 02/1951 Withdrawn
Steam J15 0-6-0 5356       01/01/1948 CAM m/e 04/1957 Withdrawn
Steam J15 0-6-0 5364       01/01/1948 CAM m/e 06/1949 Withdrawn
Steam J15 0-6-0 5366       01/01/1948 CAM m/e 06/1952 Withdrawn
Steam J15 0-6-0 5369       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 07/1949 STR Stratford
Steam J15 0-6-0 5371       01/01/1948 CAM m/e 12/1949 Withdrawn
Steam J15 0-6-0 5379       01/01/1948 CAM m/e 09/1949 Withdrawn
Steam J15 0-6-0 5380       01/01/1948 CAM 13/01/1948 Withdrawn
Steam J15 0-6-0 5383       01/01/1948 CAM 06/02/1948 Withdrawn
Steam J15 0-6-0 5391       01/01/1948 CAM 5w/e 23/08/1952 31E Bury St Edmunds
Steam J15 0-6-0 5399       01/01/1948 CAM 12/03/1948 Withdrawn
Steam J15 0-6-0 5405       01/01/1948 CAM 5w/e 23/08/1952 31E Bury St Edmunds
Steam J15 0-6-0 5406       01/01/1948 CAM m/e 04/1951 Withdrawn
Steam J15 0-6-0 5410       01/01/1948 CAM 06/02/1948 Withdrawn
Steam J15 0-6-0 5412       01/01/1948 CAM m/e 10/1949 Withdrawn
Steam J15 0-6-0 5413       01/01/1948 CAM 25/11/1950 Withdrawn
Steam J15 0-6-0 5438       01/01/1948 CAM 5w/e 23/08/1952 31E Bury St Edmunds
Steam J15 0-6-0 5451       01/01/1948 CAM m/e 09/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J15 0-6-0 5457       01/01/1948 CAM 11/02/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J15 0-6-0 5461       01/01/1948 CAM 14/04/1960 Withdrawn
Steam J15 0-6-0 5474       01/01/1948 CAM 5w/e 18/06/1955 31B March
Steam J15 0-6-0 5477       01/01/1948 CAM m/e 02/1960 Withdrawn
Steam J17 0-6-0 5501       01/01/1948 CAM 5w/e 16/02/1952 31C Kings Lynn
Steam J17 0-6-0 5502       01/01/1948 CAM m/e 09/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J17 0-6-0 5503       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 19/04/1952 31B March
Steam J17 0-6-0 5506       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 19/02/1955 31D South Lynn
Steam J17 0-6-0 5517       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 20/10/1951 31E Bury St Edmunds
Steam J17 0-6-0 5520       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 18/10/1952 31E Bury St Edmunds
Steam J17 0-6-0 5535       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 19/02/1955 30A Stratford
Steam J17 0-6-0 5537       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 19/03/1955 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam J17 0-6-0 5546       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 19/01/1952 30A Stratford
Steam J20 0-6-0 4676       01/01/1948 CAM m/e 09/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J20 0-6-0 4678       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 17/02/1951 34B Hornsey
Steam J20 0-6-0 4679       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 17/02/1951 34B Hornsey
Steam J20 0-6-0 4680       01/01/1948 CAM w/e 30/07/1960 30F Parkeston Quay
Steam J20 0-6-0 4683       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 19/05/1951 31B March
Steam J20 0-6-0 4684       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 20/01/1951 34B Hornsey
Steam J20 0-6-0 4687       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 19/05/1951 31B March
Steam J65 0-6-0T 8214       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 13/11/1954 32G Melton Constable
Steam J66 0-6-0T 8372       01/01/1948 CAM m/e 02/1951 Withdrawn
Steam J68 0-6-0T 8645       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 22/08/1953 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam J17 0-6-0 5563       01/01/1948 CAM 4w/e 19/01/1952 30A Stratford
Steam J17 0-6-0 5575       01/01/1948 CAM m/e 02/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J17 0-6-0 5585       01/01/1948 CAM 5w/e 21/06/1952 31C Kings Lynn
Steam B1 4-6-0 1285       09/02/1948 (New) CAM 28/10/1956 36A Doncaster
Steam B1 4-6-0 1286       11/02/1948 (New) CAM 16/09/1956 30A Stratford
Steam B1 4-6-0 1287       13/02/1948 (New) CAM 17/06/1962 31B March
Steam B1 4-6-0 1301       17/03/1948 (New) CAM 17/06/1962 30A Stratford
Steam B1 4-6-0 1302       22/03/1948 (New) CAM 07/10/1956 35A New England
Steam B1 4-6-0 61332       30/06/1948 (New) CAM 11/07/1948 NOR Norwich Thorpe
Steam B1 4-6-0 61333       02/07/1948 (New) CAM 11/07/1948 NOR Norwich Thorpe
Steam B1 4-6-0 61333 11/07/1948 NOR Norwich Thorpe 15/08/1948 CAM 29/08/1948 HAY Haymarket
Steam B1 4-6-0 61334 07/07/1948 NOR Norwich Thorpe (New) 15/08/1948 CAM 28/10/1956 41A Sheffield Darnall
Steam B1 4-6-0 61333 29/08/1948 HAY Haymarket 15/11/1948 CAM 13/09/1953 64A St Margarets
Steam B1 4-6-0 1300 15/03/1948 MAR March (New) 21/03/1949 CAM 14/12/1958 30E Colchester
Steam F6 2-4-2T 7238 01/01/1948 BSE Bury St Edmunds m/e 07/1949 CAM m/e 30/11/1949 CAM Cambridge
Steam J15 0-6-0 5475 01/01/1948 STR Stratford m/e 07/1949 CAM m/e 09/1959 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 1036 25/08/1949 STR Stratford 20/11/1949 CAM 02/12/1949 DON Doncaster
Steam B1 4-6-0 61121 20/10/1949 LIN Lincoln 20/11/1949 CAM 28/10/1956 36A Doncaster
Steam B17 4-6-0 61645 01/01/1948 IPS Ipswich m/e 30/11/1949 CAM 4w/e 21/11/1953 30A Stratford
Steam E4 2-4-0 62781 01/01/1948 CAM Cambridge m/e 30/11/1949 CAM m/e 01/1956 Withdrawn
Steam F6 2-4-2T 7238 m/e 07/1949 CAM Cambridge m/e 30/11/1949 CAM 5w/e 23/08/1952 31E Bury St Edmunds
Steam B1 4-6-0 61206 03/07/1947 NWE New England (New) 05/02/1950 31A 26/03/1950 32B Ipswich
Steam B17 4-6-0 61620 01/01/1948 CAM Cambridge 3w/e 31/05/1950 31A 4w/e 18/10/1952 31B March
Steam B17 4-6-0 61636 01/01/1948 MAR March 3w/e 31/05/1950 31A 4w/e 19/07/1958 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam B17 4-6-0 61655 01/01/1948 STR Stratford 4w/e 23/09/1950 31A 4w/e 19/07/1952 30A Stratford
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43002 01/01/1948 5B Crewe South 4w/e 04/11/1950 31A 4w/e 03/10/1953 2B Nuneaton
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58194       4w/e 25/11/1950 31A 4w/e 06/09/1952 15B Kettering
Steam D16 4-4-0 62543 01/01/1948 SL South Lynn 4w/e 25/11/1950 31A 5w/e 23/08/1952 31E Bury St Edmunds
Steam B17 4-6-0 61652 01/01/1948 CLK Colwick 4w/e 23/12/1950 31A 17/09/1959 Withdrawn
Steam B17 4-6-0 61653 01/01/1948 CLK Colwick 4w/e 23/12/1950 31A 4w/e 14/12/1957 31B March
Steam C12 4-4-2T 67389 4w/e 23/09/1950 40A Lincoln 4w/e 23/12/1950 31A 4w/e 19/05/1951 35A New England
Steam D16 4-4-0 62603 01/01/1948 MAR March 4w/e 23/12/1950 31A m/e 09/1951 Withdrawn
Steam J17 0-6-0 65580 01/01/1948 KL Kings Lynn 4w/e 20/01/1951 31A 4w/e 20/10/1951 32B Ipswich
Steam J17 0-6-0 65588 01/01/1948 SL South Lynn 4w/e 20/01/1951 31A 4w/e 22/03/1952 33A Plaistow
Steam B1 4-6-0 61227 30/04/1950 30A Stratford 04/03/1951 31A 06/05/1951 30A Stratford
Steam K1 2-6-0 62036 09/09/1949 MAR March (New) 11/03/1951 31A 08/04/1951 31B March
Steam K1 2-6-0 62039 22/09/1949 MAR March (New) 11/03/1951 31A 01/04/1951 31B March
Steam B17 4-6-0 61657 01/01/1948 CLK Colwick 5w/e 24/03/1951 31A 5w/e 24/03/1956 31B March
Steam B17 4-6-0 61621 4w/e 23/09/1950 30A Stratford 4w/e 21/04/1951 31A 4w/e 19/05/1951 30A Stratford
Steam D16 4-4-0 62558 01/01/1948 SL South Lynn 4w/e 21/04/1951 31A 4w/e 20/10/1951 31C Kings Lynn
Steam D16 4-4-0 62615 01/01/1948 BSE Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 21/04/1951 31A 5w/e 23/08/1952 31E Bury St Edmunds
Steam J17 0-6-0 65505 01/01/1948 SL South Lynn 4w/e 19/05/1951 31A 4w/e 12/04/1958 30A Stratford
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46465       06/1951 (New) 31A w/e 23/06/1962 31B March
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46466       06/1951 (New) 31A w/e 23/06/1962 31B March
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46467       06/1951 (New) 31A w/e 14/10/1961 91X To Scottish Region
Steam D16 4-4-0 62565 01/01/1948 COL Colchester 5w/e 23/06/1951 31A 4w/e 18/08/1951 31C Kings Lynn
Steam D16 4-4-0 62572 4w/e 23/12/1950 30A Stratford 5w/e 23/06/1951 31A 4w/e 21/07/1951 31C Kings Lynn
Steam J15 0-6-0 65390 01/01/1948 NOR Norwich Thorpe 5w/e 23/06/1951 31A 5w/e 21/06/1952 31B March
Steam G5 0-4-4T 67269 01/01/1948 SBK Starbeck 4w/e 18/08/1951 31A m/e 10/1956 Withdrawn
Steam G5 0-4-4T 67279 01/01/1948 HLB Hull Botanic Gardens 4w/e 18/08/1951 31A m/e 11/1956 Withdrawn
Steam G5 0-4-4T 67322 01/01/1948 STR Stratford 4w/e 18/08/1951 31A m/e 11/1956 Withdrawn
Steam E4 2-4-0 2796 01/01/1948 CAM Cambridge 5w/e 22/09/1951 31A m/e 03/1955 Withdrawn
Steam J17 0-6-0 65545 01/01/1948 SL South Lynn 5w/e 22/09/1951 31A 4w/e 22/03/1952 33A Plaistow
Steam J17 0-6-0 65562 4w/e 21/07/1951 31B March 5w/e 22/09/1951 31A 5w/e 21/03/1953 31D South Lynn
Steam E4 2-4-0 62780 01/01/1948 CAM Cambridge 4w/e 20/10/1951 31A 26/09/1955 Withdrawn
Steam J17 0-6-0 65533 01/01/1948 SL South Lynn 4w/e 20/10/1951 31A 5w/e 16/02/1952 33A Plaistow
Steam J20 0-6-0 64683 4w/e 19/05/1951 31B March 4w/e 20/10/1951 31A m/e 11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J20 0-6-0 64688 01/01/1948 MAR March 4w/e 20/10/1951 31A m/e 01/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J20 0-6-0 64689 01/01/1948 MAR March 4w/e 20/10/1951 31A 5w/e 18/06/1955 30A Stratford
Steam F6 2-4-2T 67227 4w/e 25/11/1950 31D South Lynn 5w/e 16/02/1952 31A 4w/e 23/10/1954 31C Kings Lynn
Steam J17 0-6-0 65512 4w/e 19/05/1951 32A Norwich Thorpe 5w/e 16/02/1952 31A 5w/e 23/04/1955 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam J17 0-6-0 65517 4w/e 20/10/1951 31E Bury St Edmunds 5w/e 16/02/1952 31A 4w/e 25/07/1953 31D South Lynn
Steam J17 0-6-0 65565 4w/e 20/10/1951 31E Bury St Edmunds 5w/e 16/02/1952 31A w/e 06/12/1958 31C Kings Lynn
Steam D16 4-4-0 62558 4w/e 20/10/1951 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 22/03/1952 31A 5w/e 21/06/1952 31C Kings Lynn
Steam D16 4-4-0 62616 01/01/1948 NOR Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 22/03/1952 31A m/e 02/1953 Withdrawn
Steam E4 2-4-0 62786 m/e 07/1949 BSE Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 22/03/1952 31A m/e 07/1956 Withdrawn
Steam J20 0-6-0 64694 01/01/1948 MAR March 4w/e 22/03/1952 31A 4w/e 19/04/1952 31B March
Steam E4 2-4-0 62794 4w/e 22/03/1952 31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 17/05/1952 31A m/e 08/1955 Withdrawn
Steam J17 0-6-0 65584 01/01/1948 MAR March 4w/e 17/05/1952 31A 4w/e 15/11/1952 31B March
Steam K1 2-6-0 62019 21/05/1950 31B March 18/05/1952 31A 25/05/1952 31B March
Steam B17 4-6-0 61631 01/01/1948 CAM Cambridge 5w/e 21/06/1952 31A 4w/e 19/07/1952 30A Stratford
Steam D16 4-4-0 62532 2w/e 17/06/1950 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 5w/e 21/06/1952 31A 4w/e 18/10/1952 35C Spital Bridge
Steam D16 4-4-0 62535 01/01/1948 NOR Norwich Thorpe 5w/e 21/06/1952 31A 4w/e 18/10/1952 35C Spital Bridge
Steam D16 4-4-0 62536 01/01/1948 CAM Cambridge 5w/e 21/06/1952 31A 4w/e 15/11/1952 35C Spital Bridge
Steam D16 4-4-0 62551 4w/e 17/05/1952 31C Kings Lynn 5w/e 21/06/1952 31A 5w/e 23/08/1952 31C Kings Lynn
Steam D16 4-4-0 62587 2w/e 17/06/1950 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 5w/e 21/06/1952 31A 4w/e 18/10/1952 35C Spital Bridge
Steam D16 4-4-0 62609 4w/e 17/07/1951 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 5w/e 21/06/1952 31A 4w/e 19/07/1952 31D South Lynn
Steam E4 2-4-0 62790 4w/e 25/11/1950 31C Kings Lynn 5w/e 21/06/1952 31A m/e 01/1956 Withdrawn
Steam D16 4-4-0 62562 4w/e 19/04/1952 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 19/07/1952 31A 5w/e 23/08/1952 31C Kings Lynn
Steam D16 4-4-0 62568 5w/e 21/06/1952 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 19/07/1952 31A 4w/e 18/10/1952 31D South Lynn
Steam D16 4-4-0 62585 01/01/1948 NOR Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 19/07/1952 31A 5w/e 23/08/1952 31E Bury St Edmunds
Steam D16 4-4-0 62599 5w/e 21/06/1952 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 19/07/1952 31A 4w/e 18/10/1952 35C Spital Bridge
Steam J15 0-6-0 65390 5w/e 21/06/1952 31B March 5w/e 23/08/1952 31A 4w/e 18/05/1957 31B March
Steam J15 0-6-0 65442 01/01/1948 BSE Bury St Edmunds 5w/e 23/08/1952 31A m/e 05/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J17 0-6-0 65548 4w/e 21/10/1950 31E Bury St Edmunds 5w/e 23/08/1952 31A 4w/e 12/04/1958 30A Stratford
Steam B17 4-6-0 61643 5w/e 16/02/1952 30A Stratford 4w/e 20/09/1952 31A 4w/e 13/12/1952 31B March
Steam D16 4-4-0 62562 5w/e 23/08/1952 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 20/09/1952 31A 4w/e 20/03/1954 31B March
Steam B17 4-6-0 61656 01/01/1948 MAR March 4w/e 18/10/1952 31A 4w/e 20/06/1953 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam D16 4-4-0 62585 5w/e 23/08/1952 31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 18/10/1952 31A m/e 04/1955 Withdrawn
Steam J17 0-6-0 65518 4w/e 20/10/1951 30A Stratford 4w/e 18/10/1952 31A 4w/e 16/05/1953 31C Kings Lynn
Steam D16 4-4-0 62525 4w/e 19/04/1952 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 15/11/1952 31A 19/09/1955 Withdrawn
Steam D16 4-4-0 62551 5w/e 23/08/1952 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 15/11/1952 31A 4w/e 23/01/1954 35C Spital Bridge
Steam D16 4-4-0 62557 5w/e 16/02/1952 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 15/11/1952 31A m/e 10/1955 Withdrawn
Steam D16 4-4-0 62558 5w/e 21/06/1952 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 15/11/1952 31A 3w/e 12/11/1955 31C Kings Lynn
Steam E4 2-4-0 62791 5w/e 24/03/1951 30E Colchester 4w/e 15/11/1952 31A 4w/e 20/06/1953 31E Bury St Edmunds
Steam F6 2-4-2T 67237 m/e 30/11/1949 BSE Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 15/11/1952 31A 4w/e 20/06/1953 31E Bury St Edmunds
Steam J15 0-6-0 65391 5w/e 23/08/1952 31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 15/11/1952 31A 4w/e 24/10/1953 31E Bury St Edmunds
Steam J15 0-6-0 65405 5w/e 23/08/1952 31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 15/11/1952 31A 4w/e 24/10/1953 31E Bury St Edmunds
Steam J15 0-6-0 65438 5w/e 23/08/1952 31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 15/11/1952 31A 19/07/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J17 0-6-0 65534 01/01/1948 NOR Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 15/11/1952 31A m/e 05/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J17 0-6-0 65568 01/01/1948 MAR March 4w/e 15/11/1952 31A 4w/e 16/05/1953 31C Kings Lynn
Steam F6 2-4-2T 67221 4w/e 23/12/1950 31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 13/12/1952 31A 4w/e 23/10/1954 31C Kings Lynn
Steam J17 0-6-0 65520 4w/e 18/10/1952 31E Bury St Edmunds 5w/e 17/01/1953 31A 4w/e 25/07/1953 31D South Lynn
Steam J17 0-6-0 65561 4w/e 18/10/1952 31E Bury St Edmunds 5w/e 17/01/1953 31A 5w/e 14/06/1958 32B Ipswich
Steam J69 0-6-0T 68609 4w/e 18/10/1952 31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 14/02/1953 31A w/e 07/11/1959 30A Stratford
Steam B17 4-6-0 61630 4w/e 22/03/1952 30A Stratford 5w/e 21/03/1953 31A 4w/e 16/05/1953 30A Stratford
Steam D16 4-4-0 62521 01/01/1948 YAR Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 18/04/1953 31A 5w/e 19/01/1957 31C Kings Lynn
Steam J17 0-6-0 65504 4w/e 22/03/1952 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 16/05/1953 31A 4w/e 12/04/1958 30A Stratford
Steam J17 0-6-0 65547 4w/e 22/03/1952 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 16/05/1953 31A m/e 09/1954 Withdrawn
Steam D16 4-4-0 62570 01/01/1948 NOR Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 20/06/1953 31A 5w/e 20/07/1957 32D Yarmouth South Town
Steam D16 4-4-0 62576 01/01/1948 NOR Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 20/06/1953 31A 4w/e 20/03/1954 31E Bury St Edmunds
Steam E4 2-4-0 62783 4w/e 19/07/1952 31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 20/06/1953 31A m/e 12/1954 Withdrawn
Steam F6 2-4-2T 67238 5w/e 23/08/1952 31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 20/06/1953 31A m/e 11/1955 Withdrawn
Steam J69 0-6-0T 68600 4w/e 19/01/1952 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 25/07/1953 31A w/e 07/02/1959 30A Stratford
Steam C12 4-4-2T 67360 4w/e 15/11/1952 31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 25/07/1953 31A 4w/e 24/10/1953 31C Kings Lynn
Steam C12 4-4-2T 67367 4w/e 15/11/1952 31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 25/07/1953 31A 4w/e 21/11/1953 31C Kings Lynn
Steam J69 0-6-0T 68491 m/e 30/11/1949 STR Stratford 4w/e 22/08/1953 31A 4w/e 21/04/1956 35B Grantham
Steam J67 0-6-0T 68555 4w/e 22/03/1952 32B Ipswich 4w/e 22/08/1953 31A 4w/e 24/10/1953 31E Bury St Edmunds
Steam J69 0-6-0T 68567 4w/e 22/03/1952 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 22/08/1953 31A 4w/e 24/10/1953 31C Kings Lynn
Steam J69 0-6-0T 68625 01/01/1948 YAR Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 22/08/1953 31A 4w/e 23/10/1954 31E Bury St Edmunds
Steam E4 2-4-0 62791 4w/e 20/06/1953 31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 22/08/1953 31A m/e 04/1955 Withdrawn
Steam D16 4-4-0 62532 4w/e 18/10/1952 35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 19/09/1953 31A m/e 11/1956 Withdrawn
Steam D16 4-4-0 62609 4w/e 18/10/1952 35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 19/09/1953 31A 4w/e 19/12/1953 35C Spital Bridge
Steam J17 0-6-0 65585 5w/e 21/06/1952 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 24/10/1953 31A w/e 01/11/1954 Withdrawn
Steam J17 0-6-0 65587 4w/e 18/10/1952 30A Stratford 4w/e 23/01/1954 31A m/e 12/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J67 0-6-0T 68555 4w/e 24/10/1953 31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 20/02/1954 31A 4w/e 23/10/1954 31D South Lynn
Steam J69 0-6-0T 68567 4w/e 24/10/1953 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 20/02/1954 31A 5w/e 22/10/1955 31D South Lynn
Steam J17 0-6-0 65580 4w/e 24/10/1953 31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 20/02/1954 31A m/e 11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam D16 4-4-0 62541 4w/e 22/03/1952 31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 20/03/1954 31A m/e 10/1955 Withdrawn
Steam D16 4-4-0 62545 4w/e 20/06/1953 31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 20/03/1954 31A 4w/e 19/03/1955 31C Kings Lynn
Steam J17 0-6-0 65520 4w/e 25/07/1953 31D South Lynn 4w/e 20/03/1954 31A m/e 02/1961 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61160 16/05/1947 GOR Gorton (New) 20/06/1954 31A 28/10/1956 38A Colwick
Steam B1 4-6-0 61223 11/08/1950 39A Gorton 20/06/1954 31A 24/06/1957 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43089 4w/e 21/04/1951 34E Neasden 4w/e 25/09/1954 31A 5w/e 20/07/1957 32G Melton Constable
Steam B1 4-6-0 61033 19/10/1952 38A Colwick 24/10/1954 31A 28/10/1956 41A Sheffield Darnall
Steam D16 4-4-0 62607 m/e 07/1949 BSE Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 13/11/1954 31A m/e 11/1955 Withdrawn
Steam F6 2-4-2T 67221 4w/e 23/10/1954 31C Kings Lynn 6w/e 25/12/1954 31A 5w/e 17/12/1955 30A Stratford
Steam F6 2-4-2T 67227 4w/e 23/10/1954 31C Kings Lynn 6w/e 25/12/1954 31A 5w/e 17/12/1955 30A Stratford
Steam J20 0-6-0 64693 01/01/1948 MAR March 6w/e 25/12/1954 31A 5w/e 18/06/1955 30A Stratford
Steam J20 0-6-0 64694 4w/e 19/04/1952 31B March 6w/e 25/12/1954 31A 5w/e 18/06/1955 30A Stratford
Steam J69 0-6-0T 68625 4w/e 23/10/1954 31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 19/02/1955 31A 5w/e 21/01/1956 32G Melton Constable
Steam J17 0-6-0 65500 01/01/1948 STR Stratford 4w/e 19/02/1955 31A m/e 03/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J17 0-6-0 65532 4w/e 23/10/1954 31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 19/02/1955 31A 11/02/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J17 0-6-0 65589 4w/e 23/10/1954 31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 19/02/1955 31A m/e 01/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J67 0-6-0T 68555 4w/e 23/10/1954 31D South Lynn 5w/e 23/04/1955 31A 5w/e 24/03/1956 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam J17 0-6-0 65541 4w/e 21/11/1953 31B March 5w/e 23/04/1955 31A w/e 12/11/1960 31B March
Steam J39 0-6-0 64729 16/01/1955 30A Stratford 15/05/1955 31A 28/09/1958 31B March
Steam J39 0-6-0 64751 16/01/1955 30A Stratford 15/05/1955 31A 28/08/1958 31B March
Steam J39 0-6-0 64803 14/10/1951 30A Stratford 15/05/1955 31A 28/09/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J20 0-6-0 64695 4w/e 21/11/1953 31B March 5w/e 18/06/1955 31A m/e 01/1960 Withdrawn
Steam E4 2-4-0 62792 01/01/1948 NOR Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 20/08/1955 31A m/e 06/1956 Withdrawn
Steam E4 2-4-0 62796 01/01/1948 CAM Cambridge 4w/e 20/08/1955 31A m/e 05/1957 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 64890 17/10/1954 30A Stratford 25/09/1955 31A 12/10/1958 31B March
Steam J39 0-6-0 64958 14/10/1951 30A Stratford 25/09/1955 31A 08/06/1958 33A Plaistow
Steam D16 4-4-0 62553 m/e 07/1949 NOR Norwich Thorpe 5w/e 22/10/1955 31A m/e 01/1957 Withdrawn
Steam D16 4-4-0 62608 4w/e 19/01/1952 32A Norwich Thorpe 5w/e 22/10/1955 31A m/e 01/1957 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61177 21/10/1951 40A Lincoln 23/10/1955 31A 28/10/1956 38A Colwick
Steam B1 4-6-0 61371 24/10/1950 40A Lincoln (New) 23/10/1955 31A 17/06/1962 31B March
Steam J69 0-6-0T 68529 5w/e 22/10/1955 31C Kings Lynn 3w/e 12/11/1955 31A 5w/e 24/03/1956 30A Stratford
Steam D16 4-4-0 62610 5w/e 22/09/1951 32G Melton Constable 3w/e 12/11/1955 31A 4w/e 19/10/1957 31C Kings Lynn
Steam C12 4-4-2T 67367 4w/e 21/11/1953 31C Kings Lynn 5w/e 17/12/1955 31A 5w/e 20/04/1957 35C Spital Bridge
Steam D16 4-4-0 62605 01/01/1948 MAR March 5w/e 17/12/1955 31A 4w/e 20/10/1956 31A Cambridge
Steam C12 4-4-2T 67395 5w/e 23/04/1955 31E Bury St Edmunds 5w/e 21/01/1956 31A m/e 03/1957 Withdrawn
Steam C12 4-4-2T 67397 5w/e 23/04/1955 31E Bury St Edmunds 5w/e 21/01/1956 31A 5w/e 20/04/1957 35C Spital Bridge
Steam J69 0-6-0T 68567 5w/e 22/10/1955 31D South Lynn 4w/e 18/02/1956 31A m/e 08/1957 Withdrawn
Steam B17 4-6-0 61633 3w/e 31/05/1950 31B March 5w/e 24/03/1956 31A 4w/e 15/12/1956 31B March
Steam B1 4-6-0 61392 24/03/1956 30A Stratford 25/03/1956 31A 07/10/1956 35A New England
Steam B17 4-6-0 61634 4w/e 22/05/1954 30A Stratford 4w/e 21/04/1956 31A 4w/e 14/12/1957 31B March
Steam D16 4-4-0 62539 01/01/1948 MAR March 4w/e 25/05/1956 31A m/e 10/1957 Withdrawn
Steam J17 0-6-0 65506 4w/e 19/02/1955 31D South Lynn 4w/e 25/05/1956 31A 4w/e 16/03/1957 30A Stratford
Steam D16 4-4-0 62510 01/01/1948 NOR Norwich Thorpe m/e 21/07/1956 31A 5w/e 19/01/1957 31C Kings Lynn
Steam D16 4-4-0 62584 01/01/1948 MAR March m/e 21/07/1956 31A 5w/e 19/01/1957 31C Kings Lynn
Steam E4 2-4-0 62788 4w/e 20/10/1951 32A Norwich Thorpe m/e 21/07/1956 31A m/e 03/1958 Withdrawn
Steam E4 2-4-0 62787 01/01/1948 NOR Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 25/08/1956 31A m/e 11/1956 Withdrawn
Steam E4 2-4-0 62789 01/01/1948 NOR Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 25/08/1956 31A m/e 12/1957 Withdrawn
Steam J69 0-6-0T 68554 4w/e 19/02/1955 30F Parkeston Quay 4w/e 20/10/1956 31A 4w/e 08/03/1958 38A Colwick
Steam B17 4-6-0 61645 4w/e 22/09/1956 30A Stratford 4w/e 20/10/1956 31A 4w/e 15/12/1956 31B March
Steam B17 4-6-0 61646 4w/e 22/09/1956 30A Stratford 4w/e 20/10/1956 31A 4w/e 14/12/1957 31B March
Steam D16 4-4-0 62605 5w/e 17/12/1955 31A Cambridge 4w/e 20/10/1956 31A m/e 06/1957 Withdrawn
Steam N7 0-6-2T 69651 4w/e 19/01/1952 38B Annesley 4w/e 20/10/1956 31A 4w/e 13/09/1958 30A Stratford
Steam N7 0-6-2T 69690 3w/e 16/06/1956 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 20/10/1956 31A 4w/e 16/08/1958 32C Lowestoft
Steam N7 0-6-2T 69692 6w/e 25/12/1954 38B Annesley 4w/e 20/10/1956 31A 4w/e 13/09/1958 30A Stratford
Steam B2 4-6-0 61607 01/01/1948 COL Colchester 4w/e 17/11/1956 31A 14/01/1960 Withdrawn
Steam B2 4-6-0 61614 01/01/1948 COL Colchester 4w/e 17/11/1956 31A 08/06/1959 Withdrawn
Steam B2 4-6-0 61615 01/01/1948 COL Colchester 4w/e 17/11/1956 31A 09/02/1959 Withdrawn
Steam B2 4-6-0 61616 01/01/1948 COL Colchester 4w/e 17/11/1956 31A 07/09/1959 Withdrawn
Steam B2 4-6-0 61632 01/01/1948 COL Colchester 4w/e 17/11/1956 31A 02/02/1959 Withdrawn
Steam B2 4-6-0 61639 01/01/1948 STR Stratford 4w/e 17/11/1956 31A 18/05/1959 Withdrawn
Steam B2 4-6-0 61644 01/01/1948 NOR Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 17/11/1956 31A 25/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam B2 4-6-0 61603 01/01/1948 COL Colchester 4w/e 15/12/1956 31A 08/09/1958 Withdrawn
Steam B12 4-6-0 61575 01/01/1948 STR Stratford 5w/e 19/01/1957 31A 5w/e 20/04/1957 31C Kings Lynn
Steam B12 4-6-0 61576 01/01/1948 STR Stratford 5w/e 19/01/1957 31A 01/01/1959 Withdrawn
Steam B17 4-6-0 61600 4w/e 14/02/1953 30A Stratford 5w/e 19/01/1957 31A 5w/e 20/07/1957 30A Stratford
Steam B17 4-6-0 61601 4w/e 14/02/1953 30A Stratford 5w/e 19/01/1957 31A 5w/e 20/07/1957 30A Stratford
Steam D16 4-4-0 62564 5w/e 21/01/1956 32A Norwich Thorpe 5w/e 19/01/1957 31A 5w/e 20/04/1957 40A Lincoln
Steam D16 4-4-0 62580 01/01/1948 YAR Yarmouth South Town 5w/e 19/01/1957 31A 4w/e 18/05/1957 31C Kings Lynn
Steam D16 4-4-0 62592 3w/e 14/05/1955 32A Norwich Thorpe 5w/e 19/01/1957 31A 5w/e 20/04/1957 31C Kings Lynn
Steam B12 4-6-0 61546 01/01/1948 STR Stratford 4w/e 16/02/1957 31A 11/05/1959 Withdrawn
Steam B12 4-6-0 61549 01/01/1948 STR Stratford 4w/e 16/02/1957 31A 01/01/1959 Withdrawn
Steam N7 0-6-2T 69616 01/01/1948 STR Stratford 4w/e 16/02/1957 31A m/e 01/1959 Withdrawn
Steam N7 0-6-2T 69617 4w/e 19/12/1953 30A Stratford 4w/e 16/02/1957 31A 4w/e 08/03/1958 31C Kings Lynn
Steam N7 0-6-2T 69619 5w/e 24/03/1956 30A Stratford 4w/e 16/02/1957 31A 5w/e 14/06/1958 31C Kings Lynn
Steam N7 0-6-2T 69620 5w/e 24/04/1954 30A Stratford 4w/e 16/02/1957 31A 5w/e 14/06/1958 31C Kings Lynn
Steam B12 4-6-0 61554 5w/e 24/03/1956 35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 16/03/1957 31A 15/09/1958 Withdrawn
Steam B12 4-6-0 61558 5w/e 19/01/1957 35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 16/03/1957 31A 5w/e 20/04/1957 31C Kings Lynn
Steam B12 4-6-0 61567 4w/e 22/09/1956 35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 16/03/1957 31A 11/11/1958 Withdrawn
Steam B12 4-6-0 61573 01/01/1948 STR Stratford 4w/e 16/03/1957 31A 01/01/1959 Withdrawn
Steam B12 4-6-0 61553 m/e 30/11/1949 GRA Grantham 5w/e 20/04/1957 31A 25/08/1958 Withdrawn
Steam B12 4-6-0 61555 5w/e 19/01/1957 35B Grantham 5w/e 20/04/1957 31A 07/10/1957 Withdrawn
Steam B12 4-6-0 61580 4w/e 14/02/1953 35B Grantham 5w/e 20/04/1957 31A 02/03/1959 Withdrawn
Steam D16 4-4-0 62521 5w/e 19/01/1957 31C Kings Lynn 5w/e 20/04/1957 31A 5w/e 20/07/1957 31C Kings Lynn
Steam D16 4-4-0 62534 4w/e 21/04/1951 31C Kings Lynn 5w/e 20/04/1957 31A 5w/e 24/08/1957 31C Kings Lynn
Steam D16 4-4-0 62545 4w/e 19/03/1955 31C Kings Lynn 5w/e 20/04/1957 31A 4w/e 19/10/1957 31C Kings Lynn
Steam E4 2-4-0 62785 6w/e 25/12/1954 34D Hitchin (GNR) 4w/e 18/05/1957 31A m/e 12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43087 4w/e 13/12/1952 35A New England 5w/e 20/07/1957 31A w/e 04/07/1959 31C Kings Lynn
Steam E4 2-4-0 62797 5w/e 24/07/1954 32C Lowestoft 5w/e 20/07/1957 31A m/e 03/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J17 0-6-0 65562 4w/e 19/06/1954 31C Kings Lynn 5w/e 20/07/1957 31A m/e 08/1958 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61096 23/12/1951 39B Sheffield Darnall 29/09/1957 31A 14/09/1958 30A Stratford
Steam B1 4-6-0 61314 03/10/1948 SHF Sheffield Darnall 29/09/1957 31A 11/10/1959 36A Doncaster
Steam B1 4-6-0 61066 07/10/1956 38A Colwick 06/10/1957 31A 14/09/1958 30A Stratford
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43089 5w/e 20/07/1957 32G Melton Constable 4w/e 19/10/1957 31A 4w/e 14/12/1957 31C Kings Lynn
Steam B12 4-6-0 61516 5w/e 20/04/1957 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 19/10/1957 31A 14/07/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J17 0-6-0 65501 4w/e 18/05/1957 31B March 4w/e 19/10/1957 31A m/e 01/1958 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61203 17/06/1947 KX Kings Cross (New) 20/10/1957 31A 11/09/1960 31B March
Steam B1 4-6-0 61283 05/05/1957 34A Kings Cross 20/10/1957 31A 20/11/1960 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 04 0-6-0 11123 28/07/1955 30A Stratford (New) 4w/e 09/11/1957 31A 4w/e 12/04/1958 30A Stratford
Steam B12 4-6-0 61558 5w/e 20/04/1957 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 14/12/1957 31A 13/04/1959 Withdrawn
Steam B12 4-6-0 61575 5w/e 20/04/1957 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 14/12/1957 31A 06/04/1959 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2004       09/01/1958 (New) 31A 10/05/1976 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2005       09/01/1958 (New) 31A 05/11/1976 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2006       09/01/1958 (New) 31A 08/10/1972 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2007       09/01/1958 (New) 31A 10/05/1976 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2008       09/01/1958 (New) 31A 30/12/1978 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2009       12/02/1958 (New) 31A w/e 25/11/1972 30E Colchester
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2010       12/02/1958 (New) 31A w/e 06/02/1960 31C Kings Lynn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3611       12/03/1958 (New) 31A 14/06/1990 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2013       18/03/1958 (New) 31A 4w/e 10/05/1958 31C Kings Lynn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2014       18/03/1958 (New) 31A 4w/e 10/05/1958 31C Kings Lynn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2015       18/03/1958 (New) 31A 4w/e 10/05/1958 31C Kings Lynn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2016       18/03/1958 (New) 31A 4w/e 10/05/1958 31D South Lynn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2017       01/04/1958 (New) 31A 4w/e 10/05/1958 31D South Lynn
Steam B17 4-6-0 61667 4w/e 19/10/1957 30A Stratford 4w/e 10/05/1958 31A 23/06/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 64985 14/04/1957 35C Spital Bridge 08/06/1958 31A 31/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam D16 4-4-0 62522 5w/e 21/01/1956 31C Kings Lynn 5w/e 14/06/1958 31A m/e 08/1958 Withdrawn
Steam D16 4-4-0 62588 4w/e 08/03/1958 31C Kings Lynn 5w/e 14/06/1958 31A m/e 10/1958 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61182 17/02/1957 30A Stratford 10/08/1958 31A 20/11/1960 31B March
Steam K3 2-6-0 61834 4w/e 08/03/1958 30F Parkeston Quay 4w/e 16/08/1958 31A w/e 14/10/1961 31B March
Steam D16 4-4-0 62513 5w/e 20/07/1957 31B March 4w/e 13/09/1958 31A m/e 11/1958 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61066 14/09/1958 30A Stratford 21/09/1958 31A 20/11/1960 31B March
Steam B1 4-6-0 61096 14/09/1958 30A Stratford 21/09/1958 31A 14/12/1958 31F Spital Bridge
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2028       02/10/1958 (New) 31A w/e 07/11/1964 34E New England
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2029       16/10/1958 (New) 31A w/e 20/06/1959 34D Hitchin (GNR)
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2031       13/11/1958 (New) 31A w/e 06/12/1958 31B March
Steam D16 4-4-0 62534 m/e 11/1958 Withdrawn 5w/e 15/11/1958 (R) 31A      
Steam D16 4-4-0 62582 01/01/1948 KL Kings Lynn 5w/e 15/11/1958 31A m/e 01/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J15 0-6-0 65450 01/01/1948 STR Stratford 5w/e 15/11/1958 31A m/e 10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam B17 4-6-0 61608 5w/e 14/06/1958 30E Colchester w/e 20/12/1958 31A 14/03/1960 Withdrawn
Steam K3 2-6-0 61817 01/01/1948 MAR March w/e 20/12/1958 31A w/e 02/12/1961 31B March
Steam B1 4-6-0 61104 01/02/1948 STR Stratford 08/02/1959 31A 03/05/1959 41A Sheffield Darnall
Steam B17 4-6-0 61613 4w/e 11/10/1958 30A Stratford w/e 14/02/1959 31A 18/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam B17 4-6-0 61651 4w/e 19/12/1953 30E Colchester w/e 14/02/1959 31A 14/08/1959 Withdrawn
Steam B17 4-6-0 61655 4w/e 19/07/1952 30A Stratford w/e 14/02/1959 31A 09/04/1959 Withdrawn
Steam B17 4-6-0 61661 4w/e 11/10/1958 30A Stratford w/e 14/02/1959 31A 23/07/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J17 0-6-0 65528 01/01/1948 STR Stratford w/e 14/02/1959 31A 14/11/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J17 0-6-0 65540 01/01/1948 STR Stratford w/e 14/02/1959 31A m/e 04/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J17 0-6-0 65556 4w/e 12/04/1958 30A Stratford w/e 14/02/1959 31A m/e 03/1961 Withdrawn
Steam K3 2-6-0 61880 w/e 20/12/1958 30F Parkeston Quay w/e 14/02/1959 31A w/e 02/12/1961 31B March
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67701 4w/e 19/05/1951 30A Stratford w/e 14/02/1959 31A w/e 05/09/1959 32C Lowestoft
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67712       w/e 14/02/1959 31A m/e 10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67718 4w/e 19/03/1955 30A Stratford w/e 14/02/1959 31A w/e 03/12/1960 34E New England
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67720 4w/e 19/03/1955 30A Stratford w/e 14/02/1959 31A w/e 17/06/1961 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67721       w/e 14/02/1959 31A w/e 03/12/1960 34E New England
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67722       w/e 14/02/1959 31A m/e 10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67733       w/e 14/02/1959 31A w/e 27/06/1959 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67734       w/e 14/02/1959 31A w/e 17/06/1961 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67723 m/e 30/11/1949 NEA Neasden w/e 28/02/1959 31A w/e 17/06/1961 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2016 4w/e 10/05/1958 31D South Lynn w/e 07/03/1959 31A w/e 12/11/1960 31B March
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2017 4w/e 10/05/1958 31D South Lynn w/e 07/03/1959 31A w/e 10/09/1966 31B March
Steam J69 0-6-0T 68566 01/01/1948 SL South Lynn w/e 07/03/1959 31A w/e 20/06/1959 31C Kings Lynn
Steam K3 2-6-0 61849 w/e 20/12/1958 30F Parkeston Quay w/e 07/03/1959 31A 17/04/1961 Withdrawn
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67713       w/e 11/04/1959 31A m/e 10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61171 16/06/1957 30A Stratford 12/04/1959 31A 20/11/1960 31B March
Steam B1 4-6-0 61236 26/09/1947 STR Stratford (New) 12/04/1959 31A 20/11/1960 31B March
Steam B1 4-6-0 61280 08/02/1959 30F Parkeston Quay 12/04/1959 31A 20/11/1960 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam B1 4-6-0 61360 06/01/1957 30E Colchester 12/04/1959 31A 01/11/1959 36A Doncaster
Steam B12 4-6-0 61577 4w/e 16/08/1958 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 18/04/1959 31A 28/09/1959 Withdrawn
Steam B12 4-6-0 61530 w/e 31/01/1959 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 13/06/1959 31A 09/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam B12 4-6-0 61533 w/e 31/01/1959 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 13/06/1959 31A 03/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam B17 4-6-0 61618 4w/e 23/01/1954 32B Ipswich w/e 31/10/1959 31A 23/01/1960 Withdrawn
Steam B17 4-6-0 61625 4w/e 20/06/1953 32B Ipswich w/e 31/10/1959 31A 03/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam B17 4-6-0 61647 01/01/1948 LIN Lincoln w/e 31/10/1959 31A 18/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J20 0-6-0 64684 4w/e 24/10/1953 31B March w/e 21/11/1959 31A m/e 06/1960 Withdrawn
Steam J20 0-6-0 64698 01/01/1948 MAR March w/e 21/11/1959 31A m/e 03/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J17 0-6-0 65578 4w/e 25/11/1950 32B Ipswich w/e 05/12/1959 31A w/e 22/07/1961 31B March
Steam B17 4-6-0 61610 4w/e 10/05/1958 31B March w/e 12/12/1959 31A 11/01/1960 Withdrawn
Steam B17 4-6-0 61626 w/e 11/04/1959 31B March w/e 12/12/1959 31A 11/01/1960 Withdrawn
Steam K3 2-6-0 61801 4w/e 16/02/1957 31B March w/e 12/12/1959 31A w/e 02/12/1961 31B March
Steam B1 4-6-0 61252 01/11/1959 31B March 10/01/1960 31A 20/11/1960 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam B1 4-6-0 61253 01/11/1959 31B March 10/01/1960 31A 20/11/1960 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam B1 4-6-0 61254 01/11/1959 31B March 10/01/1960 31A 20/11/1960 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam B1 4-6-0 61300 13/12/1959 31B March 10/01/1960 31A 17/06/1962 31B March
Steam B1 4-6-0 61363 13/12/1959 31B March 10/01/1960 31A 17/06/1962 30A Stratford
Steam J15 0-6-0 65478 w/e 07/03/1959 32B Ipswich w/e 19/03/1960 31A m/e 10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61046 29/05/1946 NOR Norwich Thorpe (New) 12/06/1960 31A 20/11/1960 31B March
Steam B1 4-6-0 61048 06/06/1946 NOR Norwich Thorpe (New) 12/06/1960 31A 20/11/1960 31B March
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76030 11/1953 30A Stratford (New) w/e 18/06/1960 31A w/e 17/09/1960 31B March
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76032 12/1953 30A Stratford (New) w/e 18/06/1960 31A w/e 17/09/1960 31B March
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76033 12/1953 30A Stratford (New) w/e 18/06/1960 31A w/e 17/09/1960 31B March
Steam J17 0-6-0 65513 w/e 02/04/1960 31C Kings Lynn w/e 17/09/1960 31A m/e 03/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J17 0-6-0 65560 w/e 02/04/1960 31C Kings Lynn w/e 17/09/1960 31A w/e 22/07/1961 31B March
Steam J17 0-6-0 65582 4w/e 20/10/1951 31C Kings Lynn w/e 17/09/1960 31A w/e 22/07/1961 31B March
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D3493 30/04/1958 31B March (New) w/e 12/11/1960 31A w/e 04/02/1961 31B March
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46468 w/e 07/01/1961 30A Stratford w/e 14/01/1961 31A w/e 25/03/1961 63C Oban
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46469 w/e 07/01/1961 30A Stratford w/e 14/01/1961 31A w/e 23/06/1962 31B March
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12134 4w/e 11/10/1958 31B March w/e 04/02/1961 31A w/e 29/10/1966 30A Stratford
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90522 w/e 03/12/1960 30A Stratford w/e 25/03/1961 31A w/e 22/04/1961 33B Tilbury
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90501 w/e 03/12/1960 30A Stratford w/e 25/03/1961 31A w/e 22/04/1961 33B Tilbury
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46494 m/e 16/06/1956 19B Sheffield Millhouses w/e 01/04/1961 31A w/e 23/06/1962 31B March
Steam B1 4-6-0 61005 01/11/1959 31B March 11/06/1961 31A 17/06/1962 30A Stratford
Steam B1 4-6-0 61046 20/11/1960 31B March 11/06/1961 31A 24/04/1962 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61048 20/11/1960 31B March 11/06/1961 31A 17/06/1962 30A Stratford
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43086 w/e 07/01/1961 31B March w/e 22/07/1961 31A w/e 23/06/1962 31B March
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43105 w/e 17/06/1961 31B March w/e 22/07/1961 31A w/e 23/06/1962 31B March
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43149 w/e 14/01/1961 31B March w/e 22/07/1961 31A w/e 23/06/1962 31B March
Steam J15 0-6-0 65469 4w/e 21/09/1957 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 16/09/1961 31A w/e 23/06/1962 31B March
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46400 m/e 16/06/1956 19B Sheffield Millhouses w/e 07/10/1961 31A w/e 23/06/1962 31B March
Steam J17 0-6-0 65582 w/e 22/07/1961 31B March w/e 02/12/1961 31A w/e 23/06/1962 31B March
Steam J17 0-6-0 65581 w/e 07/03/1959 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 10/02/1962 31A 25/04/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J17 0-6-0 65576 01/01/1948 MAR March w/e 28/04/1962 31A w/e 23/06/1962 31B March
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2200 w/e 07/01/1961 30F Parkeston Quay w/e 15/09/1962 31A w/e 22/09/1962 31B March
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3608 28/02/1958 30A Stratford (New) w/e 15/09/1962 31A 30/06/2008 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2016 w/e 12/11/1960 31B March w/e 23/02/1963 31A 30/12/1978 Withdrawn
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12136 w/e 29/11/1958 31B March w/e 05/10/1963 31A w/e 04/06/1966 31B March
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3661 w/e 28/12/1968 31B March w/e 25/10/1969 31A w/e 15/08/1976 DN Darlington
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3883 w/e 29/01/1972 31B March w/e 14/10/1972 31A 30/11/1988 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08077 w/e 11/01/1976 DR Doncaster 2w/e 25/01/1976 CA 2w/e 08/08/1976 To Store
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08089 w/e 11/01/1976 SF Stratford 2w/e 25/01/1976 CA 21/09/1980 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08090 w/e 11/01/1976 DR Doncaster 2w/e 25/01/1976 CA 27/11/1977 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08108 w/e 10/01/1976 SF Stratford 2w/e 25/01/1976 CA 08/07/1984 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08180 w/e 20/05/1972 30A Stratford 2w/e 22/02/1976 CA 2w/e 08/08/1976 To Store