Depot: Cardiff Canton
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Cardiff Canton | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2918 | on | 19/08/1907 (New) | CDF | m/e | 02/1935 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2919 | on | 27/08/1907 (New) | CDF | on | 04/02/1932 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2920 | on | 03/09/1907 (New) | CDF | on | 15/06/1947 | HFD | Hereford | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2927 | on | 01/10/1907 (New) | CDF | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2929 | on | 10/10/1907 (New) | CDF | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4089 | on | 08/07/1925 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | on | 15/06/1928 | CDF | on | 17/09/1929 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5002 | on | 28/08/1926 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | on | 18/06/1929 | CDF | on | 29/08/1930 | LA | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4077 | on | 10/02/1924 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | on | 08/10/1929 | CDF | on | 10/07/1932 | CARM | Carmarthen |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4091 | on | 01/08/1925 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | on | 30/06/1930 | CDF | on | 16/09/1931 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5011 | on | 22/07/1927 | NA | Newton Abbot (New) | on | 09/07/1930 | CDF | m/e | 01/1933 | NA | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5010 | on | 26/07/1927 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | on | 26/07/1930 | CDF | on | 15/06/1931 | LA | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4097 | on | 23/12/1930 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 06/01/1931 | CDF | m/e | 07/1933 | SRD | Stafford Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4081 | on | 15/03/1929 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 09/01/1931 | CDF | on | 08/01/1932 | LA | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4099 | on | 03/08/1926 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | on | 02/03/1931 | CDF | on | 18/04/1932 | NA | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4078 | on | 24/02/1924 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | on | 23/04/1931 | CDF | on | 17/12/1932 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4092 | on | 05/09/1926 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 28/04/1931 | CDF | on | 15/01/1934 | LA | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5001 | on | 21/08/1926 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | on | 26/08/1931 | CDF | on | 20/09/1931 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4075 | on | 12/01/1929 | NA | Newton Abbot | on | 20/11/1931 | CDF | on | 17/09/1932 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5008 | on | 23/12/1930 | CARM | Carmarthen | on | 09/03/1932 | CDF | m/e | 06/1933 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4083 | on | 09/05/1925 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | on | 05/06/1932 | CDF | m/e | 07/1933 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5015 | on | 09/07/1932 (New) | CDF | on | 05/07/1934 | EXE | Exeter | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4087 | on | 18/08/1931 | LA | Laira | on | 29/07/1932 | CDF | m/e | 07/1933 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5017 | on | 11/07/1932 | TN | Taunton (New) | on | 09/11/1932 | CDF | m/e | 11/1933 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5012 | on | 04/07/1932 | PDN | Old Oak Common | m/e | 01/1933 | CDF | on | 25/08/1939 | EXE | Exeter |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4084 | on | 13/08/1931 | NA | Newton Abbot | m/e | 03/1933 | CDF | on | 19/04/1934 | CARM | Carmarthen |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4081 | on | 05/11/1932 | LA | Laira | m/e | 04/1933 | CDF | on | 12/05/1934 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4009 | on | 28/01/1932 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 05/1933 | CDF | on | 20/04/1934 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4099 | on | 18/04/1932 | NA | Newton Abbot | m/e | 07/1933 | CDF | on | 16/06/1934 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4093 | on | 24/10/1932 | PDN | Old Oak Common | m/e | 12/1933 | CDF | on | 02/03/1936 | NA | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5002 | on | 23/12/1932 | NA | Newton Abbot | on | 28/01/1934 | CDF | on | 13/06/1939 | LDR | Landore |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5020 | on | 05/08/1932 | LA | Laira (New) | on | 18/02/1934 | CDF | on | 27/03/1935 | LDR | Landore |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4073 | on | 06/11/1924 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 04/03/1934 | CDF | on | 02/10/1934 | LDR | Landore |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5004 | on | 21/07/1930 | NA | Newton Abbot | on | 04/04/1934 | CDF | on | 21/12/1935 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5010 | on | 19/12/1933 | NA | Newton Abbot | on | 24/04/1934 | CDF | on | 14/12/1935 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5003 | on | 28/05/1927 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | on | 09/06/1934 | CDF | on | 13/03/1936 | NA | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4091 | on | 19/06/1934 | LA | Laira | on | 03/10/1934 | CDF | m/e | 07/1938 | LDR | Landore |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4086 | m/e | 11/1934 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 26/02/1935 | CDF | on | 02/06/1936 | WOS | Worcester |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5035 | on | 29/05/1935 (New) | CDF | on | 14/12/1935 | SRD | Stafford Road | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5036 | on | 04/06/1935 (New) | CDF | m/e | 01/1936 | SRD | Stafford Road | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7222 | on | 15/10/1935 | CDF | on | 15/06/1947 | OXY | Oxley | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2416 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | CDF | on | 10/1940 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4278 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | CDF | on | 15/06/1947 | LLY | Llanelli | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 8366 | on | 01/01/1934 | 87 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | CDF | m/e | 03/1939 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5628 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | CDF | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5001 | on | 14/04/1935 | SRD | Stafford Road | on | 13/12/1935 | CDF | on | 15/12/1937 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2484 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | CDF | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | ABDR | Aberdare | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4079 | on | 01/12/1932 | SRD | Stafford Road | on | 14/12/1935 | CDF | m/e | 05/1937 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1235 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | CDF | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5010 | on | 14/12/1935 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 31/12/1935 | CDF | m/e | 08/1938 | LDR | Landore |
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2479 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | CDF | on | 10/1940 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2906 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | CDF | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2983 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | CDF | m/e | 03/1946 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4083 | on | 28/12/1934 | LA | Laira | on | 08/02/1936 | CDF | on | 06/09/1941 | To Store | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4241 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | LTS | Llantrisant | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | CDF | on | 15/06/1947 | TDU | Tondu |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 8378 | on | 01/01/1934 | 153 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | CDF | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6416 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | CDF | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | LTS | Llantrisant | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2433 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | CDF | on | 12/1940 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2876 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | CDF | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5398 | on | 01/01/1934 | 76 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | CDF | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6651 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | TDU | Tondu | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | CDF | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5046 | on | 08/04/1936 (New) | CDF | on | 09/09/1943 | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5023 | on | 02/05/1934 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | on | 22/04/1936 | CDF | on | 18/11/1937 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5030 | on | 01/06/1934 | EXE | Exeter (New) | on | 14/05/1936 | CDF | m/e | 03/1941 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4089 | m/e | 30/04/1936 | LDR | Landore | on | 07/01/1937 | CDF | on | 17/02/1937 | LDR | Landore |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4079 | m/e | 05/1937 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | m/e | 06/1937 | CDF | on | 01/11/1939 | 85 | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4074 | on | 28/03/1937 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 29/08/1937 | CDF | on | 08/04/1940 | LDR | Landore |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4094 | on | 10/10/1934 | LA | Laira | on | 07/11/1937 | CDF | on | 12/01/1942 | To Store | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5054 | on | 13/06/1936 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | on | 01/04/1938 | CDF | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4091 | m/e | 07/1938 | LDR | Landore | m/e | 10/1938 | CDF | on | 19/09/1939 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5010 | m/e | 08/1938 | LDR | Landore | m/e | 10/1938 | CDF | on | 26/04/1940 | SRD | Stafford Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5020 | on | 27/03/1935 | LDR | Landore | on | 26/06/1939 | CDF | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5065 | on | 09/07/1937 | EXE | Exeter (New) | on | 03/08/1939 | CDF | on | 22/12/1944 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5049 | on | 08/05/1936 | WOS | Worcester (New) | on | 13/08/1939 | CDF | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5001 | on | 15/12/1937 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 17/08/1939 | CDF | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | 1889 | on | 05/08/1939 | Withdrawn | on | 11/11/1939 (R) | CDF | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5007 | on | 15/03/1940 | SDN | Swindon | on | 30/03/1940 | CDF | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5080 | on | 25/05/1939 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | m/e | 08/1940 | CDF | on | 09/01/1941 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5093 | on | 25/06/1939 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | m/e | 08/1940 | CDF | m/e | 02/1941 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5079 | on | 19/05/1939 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | on | 13/11/1940 | CDF | m/e | 03/1941 | LDR | Landore |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5010 | on | 26/04/1940 | SRD | Stafford Road | m/e | 12/1940 | CDF | on | 20/01/1943 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5080 | on | 09/01/1941 | SDN | Swindon | on | 20/03/1941 | CDF | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4083 | on | 06/09/1941 | 98S | on | 09/09/1941 | CDF | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5030 | m/e | 03/1941 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | m/e | 08/1942 | CDF | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4094 | on | 12/01/1942 | 98S | on | 07/11/1942 | CDF | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5010 | on | 20/01/1943 | SDN | Swindon | m/e | 04/1943 | CDF | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5046 | on | 09/09/1943 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 24/10/1943 | CDF | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5005 | on | 21/05/1932 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 21/12/1945 | CDF | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3812 | 4w/e | 29/12/1945 | CDF | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2830 | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | CDF | on | 15/06/1947 | OXY | Oxley | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5200 | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | CDF | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4200 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | CDF | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4236 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | CDF | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3716 | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 16 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | CDF | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5183 | 4w/e | 18/05/1946 | CDF | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9648 | on | 25/05/1946 (New) | CDF | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7001 | on | 31/05/1946 (New) | CDF | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 200 | on | 03/11/1945 | Withdrawn | on | 15/06/1947 (R) | CDF | m/e | 07/1948 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 310 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | m/e | 01/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 313 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | m/e | 07/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 317 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 86J | Aberdare | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 209 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | m/e | 08/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 420 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | m/e | 04/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2484 | 4w/e | 22/07/1939 | 66 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | OSW | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2537 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | m/e | 01/1953 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2538 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2570 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | m/e | 01/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2667 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | on | 14/10/1948 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2820 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 81E | Didcot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2821 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2837 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2860 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 81F | Oxford | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2864 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2877 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | m/e | 01/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2889 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2890 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | on | 14/10/1948 | CHR | Chester West | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2891 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | m/e | 10/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2905 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | m/e | 30/04/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2906 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | m/e | 08/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2936 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | m/e | 04/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2940 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | m/e | 01/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2943 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | brd | Weston-super-Mare | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | m/e | 01/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2952 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | m/e | 09/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3708 | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 66 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3716 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3755 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3809 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 84C | Banbury | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3812 | 4w/e | 29/12/1945 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3813 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | BAN | Banbury | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3814 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 81E | Didcot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3817 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 84C | Banbury | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3823 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3824 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4083 | on | 09/09/1941 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | on | 21/02/1950 | To Store | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4094 | on | 07/11/1942 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | on | 09/12/1952 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4200 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4227 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4236 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | TDU | Tondu |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4290 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4622 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 83F | Truro | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4633 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4637 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4652 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 86B | Newport Pill | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4677 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4901 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4913 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 84B | Oxley | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4952 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | HFD | Hereford | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 83F | Truro |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4953 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 82C | Swindon | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4974 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4975 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | rdg | Basingstoke (GWR) | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 85C | Hereford |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5001 | on | 17/08/1939 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | on | 22/01/1958 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5005 | on | 21/12/1945 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | m/e | 12/1956 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5007 | on | 30/03/1940 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | on | 18/02/1957 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5010 | m/e | 04/1943 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | on | 11/06/1948 | LDR | Landore |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5020 | on | 26/06/1939 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | on | 26/01/1957 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5030 | m/e | 08/1942 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | on | 19/08/1958 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5046 | on | 24/10/1943 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | on | 20/03/1958 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5049 | on | 13/08/1939 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | m/e | 12/1956 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5052 | on | 25/03/1936 | CDF | Cardiff Canton (New) | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | on | 15/01/1957 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5054 | on | 01/04/1938 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | on | 10/04/1957 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5080 | on | 20/03/1941 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | on | 16/08/1949 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5200 | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | PILL | Newport Pill |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5205 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 86B | Newport Pill | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5236 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | m/e | 31/03/1948 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5249 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 87F | Llanelli | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7201 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7219 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5307 | on | 01/01/1934 | 194 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | TN | Taunton | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5335 | on | 01/01/1934 | 133 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | LLY | Llanelli | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5378 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | LLY | Llanelli |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5382 | on | 01/01/1934 | 66 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5388 | on | 01/01/1934 | 153 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5628 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | PPRD | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5679 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5685 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5749 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5910 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 82D | Westbury | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5946 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 83B | Taunton | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5958 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5970 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5977 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 85C | Hereford | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6343 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | tn | Barnstaple | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | m/e | 09/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6353 | on | 01/01/1934 | 215 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6394 | on | 01/01/1934 | 54 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 84E | Tyseley | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6622 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | m/e | 31/05/1948 | ABDR | Aberdare | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6691 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6805 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | m/e | 30/06/1948 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6810 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | m/e | 30/06/1948 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6811 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | m/e | 30/06/1948 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6817 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | TN | Taunton | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6827 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | m/e | 30/06/1948 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6928 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6946 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6948 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 85C | Hereford | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6969 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 81E | Didcot | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7001 | on | 31/05/1946 | CDF | Cardiff Canton (New) | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | on | 09/04/1948 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8728 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88C | Barry | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8740 | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 66 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 86F | Tondu | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9629 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 83C | Exeter | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9648 | on | 25/05/1946 | CDF | Cardiff Canton (New) | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9713 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88C | Barry | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9759 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 88E | Abercynon | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9796 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | 1889 | on | 11/11/1939 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | m/e | 12/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | 1891 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | m/e | 12/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5262 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8464 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||||
Steam | B1 | 0-6-2T | 238 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | m/e | 06/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 335 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 357 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 86J | Aberdare | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 381 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||||
Steam | O3 | 0-6-2T | 410 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | m/e | 03/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | O3 | 0-6-2T | 411 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | m/e | 02/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77053 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77380 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5776 | on | 15/06/1947 | PILL | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | CDF | m/e | 05/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3729 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | CDF | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4222 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | m/e | 31/03/1948 | CDF | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5099 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | m/e | 05/1948 | CDF | m/e | 31/05/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4686 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | m/e | 31/05/1948 | CDF | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5099 | m/e | 05/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 31/05/1948 | CDF | on | 20/11/1956 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7006 | on | 15/06/1947 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | m/e | 06/1948 | CDF | m/e | 30/06/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4223 | on | 15/06/1947 | CARM | Carmarthen | m/e | 30/06/1948 | CDF | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4255 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | m/e | 30/06/1948 | CDF | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4266 | on | 15/06/1947 | CARM | Carmarthen | m/e | 30/06/1948 | CDF | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86J | Aberdare |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4285 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | Aberdare | m/e | 30/06/1948 | CDF | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 86B | Newport Pill |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5207 | on | 15/06/1947 | CARM | Carmarthen | m/e | 30/06/1948 | CDF | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5226 | on | 15/06/1947 | LLY | Llanelli | m/e | 30/06/1948 | CDF | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7006 | m/e | 06/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 30/06/1948 | CDF | on | 25/08/1948 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5006 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore | m/e | 07/1948 | CDF | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5006 | m/e | 07/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | CDF | m/e | 06/1954 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8723 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | CDF | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 78632 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | CDF | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 25C | Goole |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5786 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | CDF | m/e | 04/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7016 | m/e | 09/1948 (New) | CDF | on | 08/12/1950 | 82C | Swindon | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7004 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | on | 30/09/1948 | CDF | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7214 | on | 15/06/1947 | DID | Didcot | on | 14/10/1948 | CDF | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | TDU | Tondu |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 78543 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | on | 14/10/1948 | CDF | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | PPRD | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4145 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | CDF | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7004 | on | 30/09/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | CDF | m/e | 01/1949 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4238 | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | CDF | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9723 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | CDF | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7017 | m/e | 11/1948 | PDN | Old Oak Common | m/e | 12/1948 | CDF | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4275 | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | CDF | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7017 | m/e | 12/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | CDF | on | 09/07/1954 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4287 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | CDF | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2407 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | CDF | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 89A | Oswestry |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5089 | on | 31/03/1949 | SDN | Swindon | on | 14/04/1949 | CDF | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7020 | m/e | 06/1949 (New) | CDF | on | 08/11/1956 | 82C | Swindon | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5089 | on | 14/04/1949 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | CDF | m/e | 04/1954 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7022 | m/e | 07/1949 (New) | CDF | on | 23/01/1958 | 83D | Laira | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7023 | m/e | 07/1949 (New) | CDF | on | 02/08/1960 | 85A | Worcester | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3670 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | CDF | m/e | 05/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6939 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXY | Oxley | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | CDF | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4270 | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | CDF | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5080 | on | 16/08/1949 | SDN | Swindon | on | 13/09/1949 | CDF | m/e | 12/1955 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3036 | m/e | 03/1911 | Withdrawn | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 (R) | CDF | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4231 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | CDF | m/e | 12/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5307 | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | TN | Taunton | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | CDF | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4267 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | CDF | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | Unclassified | 0-6-2T | 425 | on | 15/06/1947 | PILL | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | CDF | m/e | 01/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4224 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 86C | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6943 | on | 15/06/1947 | HFD | Hereford | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 86C | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4222 | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 86C | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3729 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 86C | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7232 | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 86C | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7210 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 86C | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7232 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 86C | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7210 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 86C | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5077 | on | 15/06/1947 | TN | Taunton | on | 06/11/1950 | 86C | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2806 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | Aberdare | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 86C | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2892 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 86C | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4963 | on | 15/06/1947 | WES | Westbury | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 86C | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4968 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 86C | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5077 | on | 06/11/1950 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 86C | on | 12/08/1952 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5911 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 86C | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6837 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 86C | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7016 | on | 08/12/1950 | 82C | Swindon | on | 15/12/1950 | 86C | on | 20/09/1956 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2806 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 86C | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2892 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 86C | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4268 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 86C | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4963 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 86C | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4968 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 86C | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 83G | Penzance |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5911 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 86C | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6837 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 86C | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4130 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 86C | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 86B | Newport Pill |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4268 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 86C | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 86D | Llantrisant |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4223 | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 86C | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5925 | on | 15/06/1947 | WES | Westbury | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 86C | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6603 | on | 15/06/1947 | RYR | Radyr | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 86C | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6607 | on | 15/06/1947 | RYR | Radyr | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 86C | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6653 | on | 15/06/1947 | CV.BRY | Barry | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 86C | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90188 | on | 15/06/1947 | NA | Newton Abbot | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 86C | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4223 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 86C | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5925 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 86C | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6603 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 86C | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6607 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 86C | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6653 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 86C | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90188 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 86C | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3842 | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 86C | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7216 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 86C | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6600 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXY | Oxley | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 86C | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Unclassified | 2-6-2T | 1205 | on | 15/06/1947 | PILL | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 86C | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 349 | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 86C | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5911 | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 86C | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3842 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86C | 4w/e | 13/06/1959 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7216 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86C | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86J | Aberdare |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5633 | on | 15/06/1947 | TDU | Tondu | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86C | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 86J | Aberdare |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6600 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86C | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 86D | Llantrisant |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6602 | on | 15/06/1947 | CV.BRY | Barry | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86C | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | Unclassified | 2-6-2T | 1205 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86C | m/e | 01/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 349 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86C | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4267 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 86C | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4267 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 86C | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6333 | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 86C | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90188 | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 86C | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90630 | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 86C | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90701 | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 86C | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6333 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 86C | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90188 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 86C | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90630 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 86C | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90701 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 86C | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90238 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 86C | w/e | 18/07/1959 | 18B | Westhouses |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90701 | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 86C | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 282 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | Aberdare | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 86C | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 86J | Aberdare |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4303 | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 86C | m/e | 11/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6621 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 86F | Tondu | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 86C | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9459 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 86C | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9460 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 86C | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 371 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 86C | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9459 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 86C | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9460 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 86C | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 371 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 86C | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 86J | Aberdare |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4952 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 83F | Truro | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 86C | 4w/e | 29/02/1952 | 83F | Truro |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4968 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 83G | Penzance | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 86C | 4w/e | 29/02/1952 | 83G | Penzance |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8776 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 86C | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4952 | 4w/e | 29/02/1952 | 83F | Truro | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 86C | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4968 | 4w/e | 29/02/1952 | 83G | Penzance | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 86C | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3803 | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | SHL | Southall | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86C | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4318 | on | 15/06/1947 | DID | Didcot | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86C | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6602 | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 88C | Barry | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86C | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8776 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 86C | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2826 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86C | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 84E | Tyseley |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2835 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86C | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2868 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86C | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3803 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86C | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4318 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86C | m/e | 06/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6370 | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86C | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6602 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86C | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77102 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXY | Oxley | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86C | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 85E | Gloucester Barnwood |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6654 | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 86J | Aberdare | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 86C | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6654 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 86C | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5913 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 86C | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5916 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | TYS | Tyseley | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 86C | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90572 | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 84C | Banbury | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 86C | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90192 | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 84C | Banbury | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 86C | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5077 | on | 12/08/1952 | 82C | Swindon | on | 22/09/1952 | 86C | on | 15/06/1954 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5018 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | m/e | 10/1952 | 86C | m/e | 10/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5090 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | m/e | 10/1952 | 86C | m/e | 11/1952 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70026 | on | 07/10/1952 (New) | 86C | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70027 | on | 24/10/1952 (New) | 86C | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70028 | on | 27/10/1952 (New) | 86C | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5012 | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 83D | Laira | m/e | 11/1952 | 86C | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2945 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86C | m/e | 06/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5012 | m/e | 11/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86C | m/e | 12/1952 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5018 | m/e | 10/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86C | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5090 | m/e | 11/1952 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86C | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7208 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86C | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70026 | on | 07/10/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86C | on | 10/09/1961 | 21D | Aston |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70027 | on | 24/10/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86C | on | 10/09/1961 | 21D | Aston |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70028 | on | 27/10/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86C | on | 10/09/1961 | 21D | Aston |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70029 | on | 08/11/1952 (New) | 86C | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70029 | on | 08/11/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 86C | on | 10/09/1961 | 21D | Aston |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 371 | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 86J | Aberdare | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 86C | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4207 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 86C | m/e | 10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4250 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 86C | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 374 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | Aberdare | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 86C | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90524 | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 86C | w/e | 18/07/1959 | 18B | Westhouses |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3846 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 86C | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4226 | on | 15/06/1947 | PILL | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 86C | m/e | 03/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4266 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86J | Aberdare | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 86C | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70025 | on | 13/09/1952 | (New) | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 86C | on | 10/09/1961 | 21D | Aston | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8439 | on | 30/06/1953 (New) | 86C | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4946 | on | 15/06/1947 | PZ | Penzance | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 86C | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6951 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 86C | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4225 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 86C | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6932 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 86C | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75005 | m/e | 09/1951 | 84G | Shrewsbury (New) | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 86C | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 89A | Oswestry |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75006 | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 86C | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 89A | Oswestry |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75007 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 86C | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75009 | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 86C | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75008 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 86C | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5207 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 86C | m/e | 01/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4951 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 86C | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5620 | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 86C | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5218 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 86C | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 86F | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5334 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 86C | m/e | 11/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5602 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 86C | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8402 | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 86C | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 21C | Bromsgrove |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9723 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 86C | m/e | 07/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90148 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 86C | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4934 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 86C | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9493 | m/e | 06/1954 (New) | 86C | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 85D | Bromsgrove | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 9304 | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 86C | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 85C | Hereford |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5074 | on | 22/02/1951 | 98S | on | 02/07/1954 | 86C | m/e | 07/1955 | 87E | Landore | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3652 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 86F | Tondu | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 86C | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 86B | Newport Pill |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4662 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 86F | Tondu | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 86C | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 86D | Llantrisant |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5202 | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 86C | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 86B | Newport Pill |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6352 | on | 15/06/1947 | HFD | Hereford | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 86C | on | 21/11/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 9300 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 86C | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9459 | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 86C | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73025 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 86C | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 6E | Chester West |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73026 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 86C | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 6E | Chester West |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5923 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 86C | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9461 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 86C | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2805 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86B | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86C | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2873 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86C | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2896 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86C | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3801 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86C | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3810 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86C | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3816 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86C | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3836 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86C | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90693 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86C | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9603 | on | 15/06/1947 | FGD | Fishguard Goodwick | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 86C | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90125 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 86C | on | 30/08/1962 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5794 | on | 15/06/1947 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 86C | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4254 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 86C | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 86B | Newport Pill |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7201 | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 86C | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6663 | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 86C | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90201 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 86C | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75004 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 86C | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73014 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 86C | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 6E | Chester West |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90579 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 86C | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5362 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 83C | Exeter | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 86C | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6621 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 86C | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6308 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 85C | Hereford | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 86C | m/e | 08/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90323 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 86C | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90355 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 86C | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4901 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 86C | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7775 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 86C | on | 09/11/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5039 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 87G | Carmarthen | on | 23/11/1955 | 86C | m/e | 12/1955 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5072 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore | m/e | 12/1955 | 86C | on | 24/01/1957 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4964 | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | TYS | Tyseley | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 86C | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6644 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 86C | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2874 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 86C | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 88J | Aberdare |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4973 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | SDN | Swindon | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 86C | m/e | 07/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4996 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 86C | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5969 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 83G | Penzance | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 86C | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9459 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 86C | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 15xx | 0-6-0PT | 1508 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 86C | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9426 | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 86C | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73017 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 84G | Shrewsbury | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 86C | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5074 | m/e | 07/1955 | 87E | Landore | on | 05/07/1956 | 86C | m/e | 12/1956 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3843 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 86C | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73024 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 86C | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 6E | Chester West |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 9306 | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 86C | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9494 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 86C | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2821 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 86C | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90312 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 86C | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70015 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 86C | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70016 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 86C | on | 10/09/1961 | 12C | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70017 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 86C | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70018 | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 86C | on | 10/09/1961 | 12C | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70019 | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 86C | on | 10/09/1961 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70020 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 86C | on | 10/09/1961 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70022 | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 86C | on | 10/09/1961 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70024 | 4w/e | 29/02/1952 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 86C | on | 10/09/1961 | 21D | Aston |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5095 | on | 16/02/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common | on | 18/01/1957 | 86C | on | 12/06/1958 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4073 | on | 27/03/1953 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | on | 23/01/1957 | 86C | on | 10/05/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3845 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 86C | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3854 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 86C | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3860 | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 86C | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88J | Aberdare |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70021 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 86C | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2859 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 86C | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3835 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 86C | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5020 | on | 26/01/1957 | 83D | Laira | on | 20/04/1957 | 86C | on | 30/11/1957 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6362 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 84C | Banbury | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 86C | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8439 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 86C | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4297 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 86J | Aberdare | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 86C | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4999 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 86C | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5989 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | SHL | Southall | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 86C | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6928 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 86C | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6958 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 86C | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2859 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 86C | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2895 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 86C | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75022 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 86C | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5004 | m/e | 06/1956 | 84G | Shrewsbury | on | 20/09/1957 | 86C | on | 20/03/1958 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2813 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 86C | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 86J | Aberdare |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6338 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 86C | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2864 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 86C | m/e | 06/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2867 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 86C | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2893 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 86C | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5727 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 86C | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9450 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 86C | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5727 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86C | m/e | 05/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8429 | m/e | 30/04/1951 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86C | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8441 | m/e | 04/1954 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock (New) | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86C | on | 30/12/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8457 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86C | m/e | 01/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8464 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86C | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9437 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86C | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9443 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86C | m/e | 06/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9477 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86C | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8484 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 86C | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4081 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 87E | Landore | on | 20/03/1958 | 86C | on | 16/05/1958 | 83C | Exeter |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5003 | on | 11/12/1957 | 87G | Carmarthen | on | 20/03/1958 | 86C | on | 17/03/1959 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2816 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 86C | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2847 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 86C | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2889 | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 86C | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3855 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 86C | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5685 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 86C | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4982 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 86C | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 84E | Tyseley |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2826 | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 86C | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5337 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 85C | Hereford | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 86C | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5360 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 86C | m/e | 09/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6326 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 85C | Hereford | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 86C | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5260 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 86C | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5095 | on | 12/06/1958 | 84G | Shrewsbury | on | 24/06/1958 | 86C | on | 08/09/1960 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5078 | on | 15/06/1947 | NA | Newton Abbot | on | 24/07/1958 | 86C | on | 02/12/1958 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5099 | on | 12/06/1958 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | on | 26/08/1958 | 86C | on | 20/02/1962 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5962 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 84K | Chester West | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 86C | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6338 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 86C | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6901 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 84K | Chester West | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 86C | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6942 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 84K | Chester West | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 86C | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6963 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 84K | Chester West | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 86C | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7805 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 86C | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7809 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 86C | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7814 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 86C | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7815 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 86C | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90573 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 86C | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90685 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 86C | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 85E | Gloucester Barnwood |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90691 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 86C | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7227 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 88C | Barry | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 86C | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92003 | on | 31/01/1954 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 86C | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92005 | on | 28/02/1954 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 86C | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8466 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 86C | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92236 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 86C | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92237 | on | 30/09/1958 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 86C | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2834 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 86C | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7227 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 86C | 4w/e | 13/06/1959 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5261 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 86C | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4271 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9453 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 88C | Barry | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4956 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5910 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6935 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 87G | Carmarthen | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6936 | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92231 | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92232 | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92233 | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92234 | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92235 | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7913 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73021 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 84K | Chester West | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73023 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 84K | Chester West | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73024 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 6E | Chester West | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4983 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 87G | Carmarthen | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5225 | on | 15/06/1947 | NEA | Neath (Court Sart) | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5937 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 87G | Carmarthen | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3849 | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4952 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 86C | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3836 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 13/06/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4230 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6859 | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6864 | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 83G | Penzance |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90572 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92166 | w/e | 30/05/1959 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 29/08/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92210 | on | 31/08/1959 (New) | 86C | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2223 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2818 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92209 | m/e | 07/1959 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48707 | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48737 | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48768 | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5021 | m/e | 03/1957 | 83D | Laira | on | 22/09/1959 | 86C | on | 15/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7006 | m/e | 03/1958 | 83D | Laira | on | 22/09/1959 | 86C | on | 05/07/1960 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92004 | on | 31/01/1954 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48460 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 84E | Tyseley |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2821 | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 81E | Didcot | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86C | m/e | 09/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4928 | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4931 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 83G | Penzance | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86C | m/e | 07/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7925 | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 83G | Penzance | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92214 | on | 31/10/1959 (New) | 86C | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 84C | Banbury | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90069 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90149 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6832 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 85D | Kidderminster | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6847 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6963 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4086 | on | 28/09/1959 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | on | 09/12/1959 | 86C | on | 10/05/1961 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5061 | on | 05/09/1958 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | on | 09/12/1959 | 86C | on | 21/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4084 | on | 04/11/1959 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | on | 22/12/1959 | 86C | on | 11/10/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4298 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 86C | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92216 | on | 31/12/1959 (New) | 86C | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92217 | on | 31/12/1959 (New) | 86C | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6822 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 86C | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9775 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 86C | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48450 | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 86C | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92219 | on | 31/01/1960 (New) | 86C | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6833 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 86C | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 83G | Penzance |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92231 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 86C | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90485 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 86C | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 85E | Gloucester Barnwood |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2865 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 86C | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92220 | on | 31/03/1960 (New) | 86C | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7011 | on | 21/10/1959 | 84C | Banbury | on | 04/04/1960 | 86C | on | 23/12/1960 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6858 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 83G | Penzance | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 86C | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5903 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 86C | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5220 | m/e | 30/04/1948 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86C | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8497 | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 86F | Tondu | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86C | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 88B | Radyr |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8722 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 85C | Hereford | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86C | m/e | 04/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9777 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86C | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9794 | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86C | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90485 | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 85E | Gloucester Barnwood | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86C | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5044 | on | 04/07/1960 | 82C | Swindon | on | 05/07/1960 | 86C | on | 13/06/1961 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7209 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 86C | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88B | Radyr |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4080 | on | 22/04/1960 | 84G | Shrewsbury | on | 02/08/1960 | 86C | on | 07/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5081 | on | 10/12/1954 | 85A | Worcester | on | 02/08/1960 | 86C | on | 09/03/1961 | 86C | Hereford |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5092 | on | 20/03/1958 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | on | 02/08/1960 | 86C | on | 07/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6345 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 86C | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6909 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 87H | Neyland | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 86C | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8425 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 84A | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 86C | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5097 | on | 02/06/1959 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | on | 16/09/1960 | 88A | on | 07/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5021 | on | 15/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | on | 03/10/1960 | 88A | on | 21/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4971 | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | TN | Taunton | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 88A | m/e | 08/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5984 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 87G | Carmarthen | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 88A | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6019 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 88A | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6849 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 88A | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6854 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 88A | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6944 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 88A | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7820 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 83E | St Blazey | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 88A | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7927 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 88A | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5072 | on | 20/03/1958 | 84A | Stafford Road | on | 11/10/1960 | 88A | on | 31/10/1960 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5048 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 03/11/1960 | 88A | on | 05/07/1961 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92241 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 88A | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92244 | on | 30/11/1958 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 88A | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92245 | on | 30/11/1958 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 88A | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92246 | on | 31/12/1958 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 88A | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4077 | on | 10/02/1960 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | on | 10/11/1960 | 88A | m/e | 30/11/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6349 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 88A | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3784 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 88A | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9681 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 89A | Oswestry | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 88A | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92227 | on | 31/07/1958 | 84C | Banbury (New) | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 88A | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92233 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 88A | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3804 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 88A | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9727 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 88A | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5081 | on | 09/03/1961 | 86C | Hereford | on | 10/05/1961 | 88A | on | 07/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4977 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 88A | m/e | 05/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8774 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 88A | m/e | 08/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5044 | on | 13/06/1961 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | on | 05/07/1961 | 88A | on | 03/04/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7243 | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 88A | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3748 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 88A | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5685 | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 88C | Barry | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 88A | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 88E | Abercynon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5053 | on | 04/11/1959 | 83D | Laira | on | 11/09/1961 | 88A | on | 13/07/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5073 | on | 13/09/1960 | 83B | Taunton | on | 11/09/1961 | 88A | on | 07/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5091 | on | 13/06/1961 | 87F | Llanelli | on | 11/09/1961 | 88A | on | 07/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7016 | on | 05/07/1961 | 87F | Llanelli | on | 11/09/1961 | 88A | on | 07/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4083 | on | 13/09/1960 | 83C | Exeter | on | 13/09/1961 | 88A | on | 19/12/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5096 | on | 13/09/1960 | 83B | Taunton | on | 20/09/1961 | 88A | on | 07/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5020 | on | 18/06/1960 | 83C | Exeter | on | 07/10/1961 | 88A | on | 14/07/1962 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5909 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 88A | on | 30/07/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5961 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 87G | Carmarthen | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 88A | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6010 | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 88A | m/e | 06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6024 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 88A | m/e | 06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6912 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 88A | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6918 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 88A | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6950 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87G | Carmarthen | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 88A | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6995 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 88A | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4935 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 88A | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6957 | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 82D | Westbury | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 88A | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92001 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 88A | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4918 | 4w/e | 13/06/1959 | 84A | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 88A | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5935 | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 82D | Westbury | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 88A | m/e | 05/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92208 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 88A | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3663 | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 86D | Llantrisant | 4w/e | 30/12/1961 | 88A | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4242 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 30/12/1961 | 88A | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2887 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 88A | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3853 | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 88A | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88J | Aberdare |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5075 | on | 25/07/1961 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | on | 27/01/1962 | 88A | on | 14/07/1962 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7317 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 88A | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6630 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 88A | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92247 | on | 31/12/1958 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 88A | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 84C | Banbury |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7022 | on | 26/02/1962 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7025 | on | 15/03/1962 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7024 | on | 16/03/1962 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7023 | on | 21/02/1962 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 88A | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5224 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 88A | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6681 | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 88A | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8471 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 88A | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7028 | on | 05/04/1962 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7029 | on | 17/04/1962 (New) | 88A | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7030 | on | 19/04/1962 (New) | 88A | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7010 | on | 20/11/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 88A | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5043 | m/e | 02/1956 | 81A | Old Oak Common | on | 21/04/1962 | 88A | on | 07/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7031 | on | 25/04/1962 (New) | 88A | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7032 | on | 05/05/1962 (New) | 88A | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3751 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 81E | Didcot | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 88A | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4936 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 88A | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7034 | on | 23/05/1962 (New) | 88A | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7033 | on | 24/05/1962 (New) | 88A | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7035 | on | 04/06/1962 (New) | 88A | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7036 | on | 05/06/1962 (New) | 88A | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8445 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 86J | Aberdare | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 88A | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7037 | on | 18/06/1962 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7038 | on | 18/06/1962 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 84A | Laira | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7039 | on | 22/06/1962 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 84A | Laira | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3862 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 88A | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4984 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 83C | Exeter | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 88A | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6366 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 88A | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4942 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 88A | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4953 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 88A | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92210 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 88A | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6742 | on | 15/06/1962 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88A | w/e | 04/05/1963 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6743 | on | 22/06/1962 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 06/10/1962 | 88A | w/e | 04/05/1963 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1044 | on | 12/11/1962 (New) | 88A | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7056 | on | 13/11/1962 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1045 | on | 16/11/1962 (New) | 88A | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1012 | on | 17/11/1962 (New) | 88A | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7057 | on | 22/11/1962 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7058 | on | 28/11/1962 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7059 | on | 28/11/1962 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1013 | on | 13/12/1962 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1049 | on | 14/12/1962 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1048 | on | 15/12/1962 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7060 | on | 19/12/1962 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1014 | on | 24/12/1962 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7063 | on | 28/12/1962 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7061 | on | 29/12/1962 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1050 | on | 01/01/1963 (New) | 88A | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1015 | on | 21/01/1963 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1051 | on | 21/01/1963 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7065 | on | 28/01/1963 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7064 | on | 29/01/1963 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7062 | on | 31/01/1963 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7066 | on | 31/01/1963 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1047 | on | 04/02/1963 (New) | 88A | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1052 | on | 04/02/1963 (New) | 88A | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7067 | on | 06/02/1963 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1035 | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 88A | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1043 | on | 26/10/1962 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 88A | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1046 | on | 24/12/1962 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 88A | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1048 | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 88A | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7068 | on | 13/02/1963 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1016 | on | 16/02/1963 (New) | 88A | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1054 | on | 02/03/1963 (New) | 88A | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1055 | on | 02/03/1963 (New) | 88A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1056 | on | 08/03/1963 (New) | 88A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1053 | on | 11/02/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 88A | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1017 | on | 15/03/1963 (New) | 88A | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6829 | on | 20/03/1963 (New) | 88A | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6830 | on | 25/03/1963 (New) | 88A | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6819 | on | 27/03/1963 (New) | 88A | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6820 | on | 29/03/1963 (New) | 88A | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6831 | on | 29/03/1963 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6832 | on | 03/04/1963 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6833 | on | 05/04/1963 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1039 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 88A | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 83D | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1040 | on | 20/09/1962 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 88A | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1041 | on | 10/10/1962 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 88A | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1042 | on | 19/10/1962 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 88A | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1059 | on | 06/04/1963 (New) | 88A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6821 | on | 08/04/1963 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6822 | on | 10/04/1963 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6834 | on | 10/04/1963 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6835 | on | 10/04/1963 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6836 | on | 19/04/1963 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6823 | on | 25/04/1963 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6838 | on | 26/04/1963 (New) | 88A | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | 64B | Haymarket | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6824 | on | 29/04/1963 (New) | 88A | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6839 | on | 03/05/1963 (New) | 88A | 9w/e | 20/08/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1013 | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 88A | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1014 | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 88A | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1037 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 88A | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1038 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 88A | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1057 | on | 06/04/1963 | 83A | Newton Abbot (New) | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 88A | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 83D | Laira |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6825 | on | 08/05/1963 (New) | 88A | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6841 | on | 10/05/1963 (New) | 88A | 09/1963 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6826 | on | 14/05/1963 (New) | 88A | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6842 | on | 17/05/1963 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 20/08/1966 | 66A | Polmadie | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1064 | on | 24/05/1963 (New) | 88A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6827 | on | 28/05/1963 (New) | 88A | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6843 | on | 29/05/1963 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 20/08/1966 | 66A | Polmadie | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1060 | on | 11/04/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 88A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1061 | on | 19/04/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 88A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6844 | on | 05/06/1963 (New) | 88A | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | 64B | Haymarket | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7082 | on | 05/06/1963 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7083 | on | 05/06/1963 (New) | 88A | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6845 | on | 06/06/1963 (New) | 88A | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | 64B | Haymarket | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6828 | on | 07/06/1963 (New) | 88A | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6846 | on | 10/06/1963 (New) | 88A | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | 64B | Haymarket | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6847 | on | 13/06/1963 (New) | 88A | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | 64B | Haymarket | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1066 | on | 14/06/1963 (New) | 88A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6848 | on | 19/06/1963 (New) | 88A | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | 64B | Haymarket | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6849 | on | 21/06/1963 (New) | 88A | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | 64B | Haymarket | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7085 | on | 24/06/1963 (New) | 88A | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6859 | on | 26/06/1963 (New) | 88A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7084 | on | 26/06/1963 (New) | 88A | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1015 | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 88A | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1058 | on | 25/03/1963 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 88A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1062 | on | 06/05/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 88A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1063 | on | 17/05/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 88A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6822 | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 88A | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6850 | on | 01/07/1963 (New) | 88A | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | 64B | Haymarket | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6851 | on | 02/07/1963 (New) | 88A | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | 64B | Haymarket | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6860 | on | 05/07/1963 (New) | 88A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1067 | on | 18/07/1963 (New) | 88A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7086 | on | 20/07/1963 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 84A | Laira | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7087 | on | 20/07/1963 (New) | 88A | 2w/e | 23/01/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7089 | on | 23/07/1963 (New) | 88A | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 84A | Laira | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6857 | on | 25/07/1963 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 20/08/1966 | 66A | Polmadie | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6872 | on | 06/09/1963 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6866 | on | 09/09/1963 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6874 | on | 15/09/1963 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6867 | on | 16/09/1963 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6871 | on | 17/09/1963 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6875 | on | 20/09/1963 (New) | 86A | on | 04/10/1987 | IS | Inverness | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1023 | on | 23/09/1963 (New) | 86A | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7090 | on | 24/09/1963 (New) | 86A | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 84A | Laira | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7091 | on | 24/09/1963 (New) | 86A | 2w/e | 23/01/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1011 | on | 27/10/1962 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 86A | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1018 | on | 02/04/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 86A | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1021 | on | 17/06/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 86A | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1022 | on | 16/07/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 86A | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1039 | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 86A | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1057 | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 86A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1024 | on | 01/10/1963 (New) | 86A | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6879 | on | 02/10/1963 (New) | 86A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 87A | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6877 | on | 03/10/1963 (New) | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6868 | on | 04/10/1963 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6878 | on | 09/10/1963 (New) | 86A | on | 05/06/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6899 | on | 10/10/1963 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6876 | on | 14/10/1963 (New) | 86A | on | 15/05/1988 | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6900 | on | 15/10/1963 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6901 | on | 18/10/1963 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1069 | on | 21/10/1963 (New) | 86A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6881 | on | 21/10/1963 (New) | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6902 | on | 23/10/1963 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1070 | on | 28/10/1963 (New) | 86A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6882 | on | 28/10/1963 (New) | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6903 | on | 29/10/1963 (New) | 86A | 5w/e | 29/04/1967 | 64B | Haymarket | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1025 | on | 01/11/1963 (New) | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7001 | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 86A | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7003 | on | 03/08/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 86A | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7011 | on | 04/12/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 86A | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7015 | on | 22/12/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 86A | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7021 | on | 14/02/1962 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 86A | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6904 | on | 05/11/1963 (New) | 86A | 5w/e | 01/06/1968 | 65A | Eastfield | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D169 | on | 07/06/1962 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | on | 29/11/1963 | 86A | on | 29/04/1984 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1690 | on | 29/11/1963 (New) | 86A | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 2B | Oxley | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1691 | on | 29/11/1963 (New) | 86A | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7080 | on | 14/12/1963 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7094 | on | 14/12/1963 (New) | 86A | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7092 | on | 16/12/1963 (New) | 86A | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7096 | on | 16/12/1963 (New) | 86A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7097 | on | 16/12/1963 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1697 | on | 21/12/1963 (New) | 86A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7095 | on | 24/12/1963 (New) | 86A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6889 | on | 09/01/1964 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6914 | on | 13/01/1964 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6919 | on | 16/01/1964 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 22/02/1964 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6920 | on | 16/01/1964 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1006 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 86A | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1007 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 86A | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1008 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 86A | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1718 | on | 18/02/1964 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1719 | on | 25/02/1964 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1726 | on | 24/03/1964 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1026 | on | 24/12/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6891 | on | 21/01/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1728 | on | 21/04/1964 (New) | 86A | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1736 | on | 22/04/1964 (New) | 86A | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1730 | on | 28/04/1964 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1732 | on | 28/04/1964 (New) | 86A | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1713 | on | 28/01/1964 | 2B | Oxley (New) | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 86A | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6937 | on | 13/05/1964 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | 65A | Eastfield | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1583 | on | 23/05/1964 (New) | 86A | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1586 | on | 25/05/1964 (New) | 86A | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1737 | on | 25/05/1964 (New) | 86A | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1587 | on | 27/05/1964 (New) | 86A | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1738 | on | 28/05/1964 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1588 | on | 29/05/1964 (New) | 86A | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1589 | on | 29/05/1964 (New) | 86A | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1742 | on | 29/05/1964 (New) | 86A | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1590 | on | 30/05/1964 (New) | 86A | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1591 | on | 05/06/1964 (New) | 86A | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1592 | on | 06/06/1964 (New) | 86A | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1593 | on | 09/06/1964 (New) | 86A | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1741 | on | 09/06/1964 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1594 | on | 16/06/1964 (New) | 86A | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1595 | on | 16/06/1964 (New) | 86A | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1731 | on | 16/06/1964 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1744 | on | 19/06/1964 (New) | 86A | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1596 | on | 22/06/1964 (New) | 86A | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1597 | on | 22/06/1964 (New) | 86A | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3365 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 86A | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 91N | To North Eastern Region |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1598 | on | 29/06/1964 (New) | 86A | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1735 | on | 23/05/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 86A | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1739 | on | 04/06/1964 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) (New) | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 86A | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6821 | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 86A | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6889 | on | 09/01/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 86A | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6898 | on | 05/05/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 86A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6914 | on | 13/01/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 86A | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6917 | on | 02/01/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 86A | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6935 | on | 20/04/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 86A | m/e | 31/03/1967 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6936 | on | 29/04/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 86A | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | 65A | Eastfield |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9501 | on | 27/07/1964 (New) | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6939 | on | 21/08/1964 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 27/01/1968 | 55C | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6916 | on | 02/01/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 86A | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6938 | on | 12/06/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 86A | w/e | 24/05/1969 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1613 | on | 25/08/1964 (New) | 86A | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1614 | on | 25/08/1964 (New) | 86A | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6940 | on | 27/08/1964 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 27/01/1968 | 55C | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9507 | on | 28/08/1964 (New) | 86A | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1615 | on | 29/08/1964 (New) | 86A | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9506 | on | 31/08/1964 (New) | 86A | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6941 | on | 03/09/1964 (New) | 86A | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9508 | on | 07/09/1964 (New) | 86A | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9509 | on | 08/09/1964 (New) | 86A | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6942 | on | 10/09/1964 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1757 | on | 17/09/1964 (New) | 86A | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6943 | on | 17/09/1964 (New) | 86A | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9511 | on | 17/09/1964 (New) | 86A | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9510 | on | 18/09/1964 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6944 | on | 24/09/1964 (New) | 86A | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9512 | on | 29/09/1964 (New) | 86A | on | 20/01/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6945 | on | 01/10/1964 (New) | 86A | m/e | 08/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9513 | on | 06/10/1964 (New) | 86A | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9514 | on | 06/10/1964 (New) | 86A | on | 03/05/1969 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6946 | on | 08/10/1964 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1694 | on | 11/12/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 86A | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1695 | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 86A | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1696 | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 86A | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1698 | on | 13/01/1964 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 86A | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9515 | on | 17/10/1964 (New) | 86A | on | 08/01/1968 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9516 | on | 21/10/1964 (New) | 86A | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6947 | on | 22/10/1964 (New) | 86A | 3w/e | 31/08/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6948 | on | 30/10/1964 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9518 | on | 30/10/1964 (New) | 86A | on | 03/05/1969 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9519 | on | 30/10/1964 (New) | 86A | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2128 | on | 07/01/1960 | 83D | Laira (New) | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 86A | 4w/e | 27/12/1964 | 85A | Worcester |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3510 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 83F | Truro | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 86A | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | Hookagate PAD | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3523 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 83D | Laira | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 86A | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 87B | Margam |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9517 | on | 12/11/1964 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9520 | on | 12/11/1964 (New) | 86A | on | 23/01/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6852 | on | 08/07/1963 | 87E | Landore (New) | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6855 | on | 18/07/1963 | 87E | Landore (New) | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6885 | on | 28/12/1963 | 87E | Landore (New) | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 86A | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6892 | on | 20/02/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6906 | on | 08/11/1963 | 87E | Landore (New) | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 86A | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6913 | on | 07/01/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 86A | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6926 | on | 14/02/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 86A | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | 91N | To North Eastern Region |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6930 | on | 06/03/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 86A | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9511 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 87E | Landore | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 86A | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3256 | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | on | 24/07/1983 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3257 | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | on | 24/04/1983 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3258 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | on | 06/12/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3259 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | on | 12/10/1980 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3260 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | on | 20/01/1988 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3261 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | on | 30/12/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3262 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | on | 31/12/1980 | 98Ss | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3263 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | on | 10/07/1983 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3264 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | on | 09/11/1980 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3265 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | on | 25/09/1983 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3266 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | on | 31/12/1980 | 98Ss | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3267 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3363 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3364 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3366 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | w/e | 21/10/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3397 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3398 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | w/e | 21/10/1967 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3399 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | w/e | 28/10/1967 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3400 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | w/e | 25/11/1967 | 16A | Toton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3402 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | w/e | 25/11/1967 | 16A | Toton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3404 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | w/e | 15/06/1968 | 16C | Derby |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3405 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3407 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | w/e | 20/07/1968 | 16C | Derby |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3419 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | on | 31/07/1983 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3420 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | on | 17/01/1984 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3421 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | on | 17/01/1984 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3422 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | on | 10/07/1983 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3423 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | on | 05/07/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3424 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | on | 10/07/1986 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3425 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | w/e | 20/07/1968 | 16C | Derby |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3426 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | w/e | 20/07/1968 | 16C | Derby |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3427 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | w/e | 10/08/1968 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3428 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | w/e | 10/08/1968 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3527 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 81C | Southall |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3594 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | 6w/e | 03/07/1971 | 87A | Landore |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3595 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | m/e | 10/1977 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3603 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | w/e | 29/06/1974 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3607 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 82C | Swindon |
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | D3647 | on | 23/12/1958 | 36C | Frodingham (New) | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | on | 15/03/1970 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | D3648 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 36C | Frodingham | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | w/e | 19/08/1967 | 36A | Doncaster |
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | D3649 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 36A | Doncaster | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | on | 07/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3807 | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3809 | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3823 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 15101 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | m/e | 04/1966 | 2C | Stourbridge Junction |
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 15102 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | m/e | 04/1966 | 2C | Stourbridge Junction |
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 15103 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | w/e | 25/06/1966 | 2C | Stourbridge Junction |
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 15104 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | w/e | 16/07/1966 | 2C | Stourbridge Junction |
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 15105 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 2G | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 15106 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 2G | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1637 | on | 07/12/1964 (New) | 86A | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1638 | on | 08/12/1964 (New) | 86A | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6949 | on | 09/12/1964 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1636 | on | 10/12/1964 (New) | 86A | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6950 | on | 10/12/1964 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1639 | on | 14/12/1964 (New) | 86A | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1640 | on | 16/12/1964 (New) | 86A | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1641 | on | 17/12/1964 (New) | 86A | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1642 | on | 19/12/1964 (New) | 86A | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1643 | on | 19/12/1964 (New) | 86A | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1644 | on | 23/12/1964 (New) | 86A | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1645 | on | 24/12/1964 (New) | 86A | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3819 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 27/12/1964 | 86A | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6951 | on | 30/12/1964 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1646 | on | 31/12/1964 (New) | 86A | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1647 | on | 02/01/1965 (New) | 86A | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1649 | on | 02/01/1965 (New) | 86A | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6953 | on | 05/01/1965 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6954 | on | 05/01/1965 (New) | 86A | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 87A | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6955 | on | 06/01/1965 (New) | 86A | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 87A | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6952 | on | 07/01/1965 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6956 | on | 08/01/1965 (New) | 86A | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 87A | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1650 | on | 09/01/1965 (New) | 86A | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1651 | on | 09/01/1965 (New) | 86A | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6957 | on | 12/01/1965 (New) | 86A | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 87A | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6958 | on | 15/01/1965 (New) | 86A | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 87A | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1652 | on | 16/01/1965 (New) | 86A | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1653 | on | 16/01/1965 (New) | 86A | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1648 | on | 22/01/1965 (New) | 86A | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1654 | on | 23/01/1965 (New) | 86A | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9529 | on | 26/01/1965 (New) | 86A | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1655 | on | 30/01/1965 (New) | 86A | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9530 | on | 02/02/1965 (New) | 86A | on | 05/10/1968 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9531 | on | 02/02/1965 (New) | 86A | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9532 | on | 18/02/1965 (New) | 86A | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9533 | on | 19/02/1965 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3511 | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 82D | Westbury | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | 86A | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6969 | on | 26/02/1965 (New) | 86A | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9534 | on | 02/03/1965 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6970 | on | 04/03/1965 (New) | 86A | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1600 | on | 30/06/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1601 | on | 06/07/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1602 | on | 07/07/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1603 | on | 17/07/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1604 | on | 20/07/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1605 | on | 29/07/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1606 | on | 29/07/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | m/e | 12/1965 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1607 | on | 31/07/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1608 | on | 31/07/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1609 | on | 11/08/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1610 | on | 13/08/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1697 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | Landore | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1754 | on | 19/08/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1755 | on | 14/08/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1756 | on | 04/09/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9535 | on | 08/03/1965 (New) | 86A | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1668 | on | 13/03/1965 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9536 | on | 16/03/1965 (New) | 86A | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9537 | on | 16/03/1965 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1670 | on | 20/03/1965 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6972 | on | 26/03/1965 (New) | 86A | on | 01/04/1999 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9538 | on | 26/03/1965 (New) | 86A | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1671 | on | 27/03/1965 (New) | 86A | on | 18/04/1966 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1672 | on | 27/03/1965 (New) | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1583 | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | Landore | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 86A | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1584 | on | 16/05/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 86A | 2w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1585 | on | 16/05/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 86A | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1751 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1752 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 86A | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1753 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 86A | 8w/e | 16/08/1969 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6913 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 86A | w/e | 26/04/1969 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6922 | on | 24/01/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 86A | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 91N | To North Eastern Region |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6969 | on | 26/02/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 86A | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 87A | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6970 | on | 04/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 86A | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 87A | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1673 | on | 03/04/1965 (New) | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1674 | on | 05/04/1965 (New) | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6973 | on | 05/04/1965 (New) | 86A | on | 27/09/1991 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6974 | on | 06/04/1965 (New) | 86A | w/e | 09/02/1974 | LE | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6975 | on | 09/04/1965 (New) | 86A | on | 01/01/1999 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9539 | on | 09/04/1965 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1675 | on | 10/04/1965 (New) | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1669 | on | 20/03/1965 | 87E | Landore (New) | 2w/e | 11/04/1965 | 86A | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6976 | on | 15/04/1965 (New) | 86A | on | 01/12/2000 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1676 | on | 16/04/1965 (New) | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6977 | on | 22/04/1965 (New) | 86A | ||||||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9540 | on | 22/04/1965 (New) | 86A | 2w/e | 15/01/1967 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6978 | on | 23/04/1965 (New) | 86A | on | 16/05/2003 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1677 | on | 24/04/1965 (New) | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1678 | on | 24/04/1965 (New) | 86A | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9541 | on | 27/04/1965 (New) | 86A | on | 18/01/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1679 | on | 01/05/1965 (New) | 86A | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6979 | on | 03/05/1965 (New) | 86A | on | 01/03/2000 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6980 | on | 06/05/1965 (New) | 86A | on | 15/10/1994 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9542 | on | 06/05/1965 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1681 | on | 08/05/1965 (New) | 86A | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1680 | on | 11/05/1965 (New) | 86A | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6981 | on | 12/05/1965 (New) | 86A | ||||||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6982 | on | 13/05/1965 (New) | 86A | ||||||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6983 | on | 13/05/1965 (New) | 86A | on | 18/04/1966 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6984 | on | 21/05/1965 (New) | 86A | on | 01/10/1993 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6985 | on | 27/05/1965 (New) | 86A | on | 04/10/1987 | IS | Inverness | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9544 | on | 29/05/1965 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6986 | on | 01/06/1965 (New) | 86A | on | 01/02/1999 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6878 | on | 09/10/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | on | 05/06/1965 | 86A | on | 17/09/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6987 | on | 06/06/1965 (New) | 86A | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3432 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87B | Margam | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 86A | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 87B | Margam |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9528 | on | 21/01/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 86A | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6988 | on | 14/06/1965 (New) | 86A | ||||||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6989 | on | 17/06/1965 (New) | 86A | w/e | 09/02/1974 | LE | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6990 | on | 18/06/1965 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 06/12/1975 | LE | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6991 | on | 24/06/1965 (New) | 86A | ||||||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6987 | on | 06/06/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 86A | on | 01/03/2000 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9543 | on | 28/06/1965 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9546 | on | 28/06/1965 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6993 | on | 01/07/1965 (New) | 86A | on | 30/09/2008 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6992 | on | 05/07/1965 (New) | 86A | m/e | 09/1981 | ML | Motherwell | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6994 | on | 08/07/1965 (New) | 86A | m/e | 07/1981 | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6995 | on | 13/07/1965 (New) | 86A | m/e | 10/1977 | LE | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6996 | on | 16/07/1965 (New) | 86A | m/e | 10/1977 | LE | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6997 | on | 21/07/1965 (New) | 86A | m/e | 10/1977 | LE | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9548 | on | 26/07/1965 (New) | 86A | on | 18/01/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6998 | on | 12/08/1965 (New) | 86A | m/e | 02/1977 | LE | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9549 | on | 19/08/1965 (New) | 86A | on | 18/01/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6999 | on | 20/08/1965 (New) | 86A | m/e | 02/1977 | LE | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6600 | on | 26/08/1965 (New) | 86A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 87A | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9550 | on | 27/08/1965 (New) | 86A | on | 18/01/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9551 | on | 02/09/1965 (New) | 86A | on | 12/01/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9552 | on | 06/09/1965 (New) | 86A | on | 12/01/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1903 | on | 09/09/1965 (New) | 86A | m/e | 10/1976 | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1904 | on | 09/09/1965 (New) | 86A | w/e | 13/05/1972 | D05 | Stoke Division | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6602 | on | 09/09/1965 (New) | 86A | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1907 | on | 17/09/1965 (New) | 86A | ||||||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1963 | on | 17/09/1965 (New) | 86A | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6878 | on | 05/06/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | on | 17/09/1965 | 86A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 87A | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1901 | on | 20/09/1965 (New) | 86A | ||||||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1905 | on | 23/09/1965 (New) | 86A | 2w/e | 10/06/1972 | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1964 | on | 24/09/1965 (New) | 86A | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1962 | on | 27/09/1965 (New) | 86A | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1965 | on | 02/10/1965 (New) | 86A | w/e | 18/06/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1966 | on | 02/10/1965 (New) | 86A | w/e | 18/06/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1902 | on | 06/10/1965 (New) | 86A | on | 28/02/2007 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6605 | on | 06/10/1965 (New) | 86A | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1906 | on | 07/10/1965 (New) | 86A | on | 14/01/1987 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1908 | on | 07/10/1965 (New) | 86A | on | 12/08/1969 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1967 | on | 16/10/1965 (New) | 86A | w/e | 18/06/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1909 | on | 19/10/1965 (New) | 86A | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1910 | on | 22/10/1965 (New) | 86A | on | 04/02/1991 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1911 | on | 26/10/1965 (New) | 86A | ||||||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1912 | on | 26/10/1965 (New) | 86A | on | 04/10/1987 | TI | Tinsley | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1913 | on | 28/10/1965 (New) | 86A | on | 31/05/2006 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1914 | on | 01/11/1965 (New) | 86A | ||||||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1918 | on | 16/11/1965 (New) | 86A | w/e | 22/07/1972 | D05 | Stoke Division | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1916 | on | 18/11/1965 (New) | 86A | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1919 | on | 22/11/1965 (New) | 86A | w/e | 19/08/1972 | D05 | Stoke Division | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1920 | on | 30/11/1965 (New) | 86A | on | 01/03/2000 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1915 | on | 03/12/1965 (New) | 86A | w/e | 14/10/1972 | D05 | Stoke Division | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1917 | on | 03/12/1965 (New) | 86A | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1921 | on | 03/12/1965 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 17/10/1966 | 70D | Eastleigh | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1922 | on | 09/12/1965 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 17/10/1966 | 70D | Eastleigh | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1923 | on | 16/12/1965 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 19/09/1966 | 70D | Eastleigh | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1924 | on | 20/12/1965 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 09/01/1967 | 70D | Eastleigh | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1665 | on | 05/03/1965 | 87E | Landore (New) | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 86A | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1666 | on | 05/03/1965 | 87E | Landore (New) | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 86A | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1667 | on | 06/03/1965 | 87E | Landore (New) | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 86A | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1668 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 87E | Landore | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1669 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 87E | Landore | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1670 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 87E | Landore | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3821 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1691 | on | 29/11/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 86A | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1695 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 86A | m/e | 03/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1696 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 86A | m/e | 03/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1697 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 86A | m/e | 03/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1698 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 86A | m/e | 03/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1007 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1008 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1011 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1012 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1013 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1014 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1016 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1017 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1018 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1037 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1038 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1040 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1042 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1609 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1610 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1614 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1615 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7018 | on | 18/01/1962 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | 8w/e | 01/01/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1936 | on | 26/03/1966 (New) | 86A | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1022 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1023 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1662 | on | 20/02/1965 | 87E | Landore (New) | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | 86A | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1663 | on | 20/02/1965 | 87E | Landore (New) | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | 86A | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1664 | on | 27/02/1965 | 87E | Landore (New) | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | 86A | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1937 | on | 07/04/1966 (New) | 86A | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1938 | on | 27/04/1966 (New) | 86A | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1654 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86A | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1655 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86A | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1656 | on | 01/02/1965 | 87E | Landore (New) | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86A | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3527 | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 81C | Southall | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86A | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3759 | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 81C | Southall | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86A | on | 08/12/1980 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3817 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86A | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6885 | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 87E | Landore | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86A | on | 30/06/2005 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6886 | on | 29/11/1963 | 87E | Landore (New) | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86A | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7081 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86A | m/e | 11/09/1971 | To Store | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7082 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7085 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7094 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86A | on | 01/11/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7096 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 84A | Laira | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86A | 3w/e | 30/09/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7097 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 84A | Laira | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7098 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 84A | Laira | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86A | on | 30/12/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7099 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 84A | Laira | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86A | on | 15/10/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7100 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 84A | Laira | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86A | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1636 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 86A | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1637 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 86A | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1648 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 86A | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1649 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 86A | m/e | 30/04/1967 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1650 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 86A | m/e | 30/04/1967 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1652 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 86A | 2w/e | 14/05/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1653 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 86A | 2w/e | 14/05/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1740 | on | 12/06/1964 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 86A | w/e | 14/10/1967 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3049 | on | 20/06/1965 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 86A | w/e | 15/10/1966 | 2E | Saltley |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7093 | on | 14/12/1963 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 86A | w/e | 30/12/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6839 | on | 03/05/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 9w/e | 20/08/1966 | 86A | 4w/e | 20/08/1966 | 66A | Polmadie |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6840 | m/e | 07/1966 | 91X | To Scottish Region | 9w/e | 20/08/1966 | 86A | 4w/e | 20/08/1966 | 66A | Polmadie |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1583 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 86A | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3033 | on | 31/10/1953 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 86A | w/e | 16/09/1967 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6893 | on | 20/02/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 86A | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6894 | on | 16/03/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 86A | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6895 | on | 17/03/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 86A | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6896 | on | 06/04/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 86A | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6897 | on | 15/04/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 86A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7074 | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 86A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7075 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 86A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7077 | on | 13/12/1963 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 86A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7079 | on | 16/12/1963 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 86A | on | 03/10/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7086 | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 86A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7095 | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 86A | on | 16/10/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1585 | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 87A | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1587 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1591 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 87A | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1597 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1600 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1668 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1669 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1751 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | w/e | 30/12/1967 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3187 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | w/e | 16/09/1967 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3353 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 87E | Landore | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 91M | To London Midland Region |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3819 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | 2w/e | 27/12/1969 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6860 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 87E | Landore | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6861 | on | 19/07/1963 | 87E | Landore (New) | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6862 | on | 23/07/1963 | 87E | Landore (New) | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7068 | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7069 | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | on | 03/10/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7070 | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7080 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7089 | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7091 | 2w/e | 23/01/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | on | 10/08/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7092 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | on | 20/06/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3403 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87B | Margam | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86A | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3508 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 2w/e | 15/01/1967 | 86A | w/e | 10/08/1968 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4011 | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86A | 7w/e | 02/01/1971 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6924 | on | 30/01/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86A | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6925 | on | 07/02/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86A | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6927 | on | 19/02/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86A | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | 91N | To North Eastern Region |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7032 | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86A | m/e | 31/01/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7033 | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86A | m/e | 31/01/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7083 | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86A | on | 03/10/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7084 | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9506 | on | 31/08/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86A | on | 10/03/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9507 | on | 28/08/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86A | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9509 | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 87E | Landore | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86A | on | 05/10/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9531 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86A | on | 30/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1592 | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 87E | Landore | m/e | 31/01/1967 | 86A | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1593 | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 87E | Landore | m/e | 31/01/1967 | 86A | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1596 | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 87E | Landore | m/e | 31/01/1967 | 86A | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7054 | on | 16/11/1962 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | m/e | 31/01/1967 | 86A | 4w/e | 22/05/1971 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7055 | on | 02/11/1962 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | m/e | 31/01/1967 | 86A | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4012 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 87B | Margam | m/e | 28/02/1967 | 86A | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1595 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | m/e | 31/03/1967 | 86A | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1601 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | m/e | 31/03/1967 | 86A | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1746 | on | 03/07/1964 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | m/e | 31/03/1967 | 86A | w/e | 14/10/1967 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6908 | on | 20/11/1963 | 87E | Landore (New) | m/e | 31/03/1967 | 86A | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 87A | Landore |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7050 | on | 05/10/1962 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | m/e | 31/03/1967 | 86A | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7051 | on | 06/10/1962 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | m/e | 31/03/1967 | 86A | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7052 | on | 24/10/1962 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | m/e | 31/03/1967 | 86A | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7053 | on | 24/10/1962 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | m/e | 31/03/1967 | 86A | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1602 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | m/e | 30/04/1967 | 86A | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1604 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | m/e | 30/04/1967 | 86A | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9510 | on | 18/09/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 86A | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9534 | on | 02/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 86A | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6921 | on | 17/01/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 86A | w/e | 10/08/1974 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9500 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 86A | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9501 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 86A | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9502 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 86A | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9526 | on | 06/01/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 86A | on | 30/11/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9527 | on | 18/01/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 86A | on | 03/05/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9528 | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 86A | on | 09/11/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9555 | on | 22/10/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 86A | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7046 | on | 15/08/1962 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 86A | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7047 | on | 15/08/1962 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 86A | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7048 | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 86A | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7049 | on | 05/10/1962 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 86A | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9513 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 87E | Landore | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 86A | on | 10/03/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9519 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 87E | Landore | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 86A | on | 05/10/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1584 | m/e | 30/04/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 86A | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 87A | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1586 | 2w/e | 14/05/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 86A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1588 | 2w/e | 14/05/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 86A | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 87A | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1589 | 2w/e | 14/05/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 86A | 2w/e | 25/08/1973 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1731 | on | 16/06/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 86A | w/e | 14/10/1967 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6601 | on | 06/09/1965 | 87E | Landore (New) | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 86A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 87A | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6602 | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 86A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 87A | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6603 | on | 16/09/1965 | 87E | Landore (New) | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 86A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 87A | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6905 | on | 05/11/1963 | 87E | Landore (New) | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 86A | 5w/e | 01/06/1968 | 65A | Eastfield |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6906 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 86A | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 87A | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6907 | on | 15/11/1963 | 87E | Landore (New) | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 86A | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 87A | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6909 | on | 24/12/1963 | 87E | Landore (New) | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 86A | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 87A | Landore |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9517 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 86A | on | 05/10/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1605 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 86A | 8w/e | 16/08/1969 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3357 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 86A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3358 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 86A | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 82C | Swindon |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7078 | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 86A | on | 03/10/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1590 | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 86A | 2w/e | 02/09/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1594 | m/e | 28/02/1967 | 87E | Landore | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 86A | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1598 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 86A | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1599 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 86A | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1754 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 87E | Landore | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 86A | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D02 | Birmingham Division |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7073 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 86A | 5w/e | 10/12/1971 | To Store | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7076 | on | 03/05/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 86A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9500 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 86A | on | 03/05/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9502 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 86A | on | 03/05/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7056 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 86A | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7057 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 86A | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7059 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 86A | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7060 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 86A | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7063 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 86A | on | 03/10/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7064 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 86A | on | 03/10/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7067 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 86A | on | 03/10/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7088 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 84A | Laira | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 86A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1921 | 4w/e | 17/10/1966 | 70D | Eastleigh | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 86A | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1923 | 4w/e | 19/09/1966 | 70D | Eastleigh | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 86A | 3w/e | 29/07/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1924 | 4w/e | 09/01/1967 | 70D | Eastleigh | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 86A | 3w/e | 29/07/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3267 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 86A | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 82C | Swindon |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3523 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 87B | Margam | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 86A | w/e | 09/02/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1923 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 3w/e | 29/07/1968 | 86A | on | 01/10/2003 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1924 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 3w/e | 29/07/1968 | 86A | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1922 | 4w/e | 17/10/1966 | 70D | Eastleigh | 6w/e | 09/09/1968 | 86A | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1603 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 86A | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1606 | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 86A | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1927 | on | 31/01/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 86A | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1934 | on | 18/03/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 86A | on | 04/10/1987 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3527 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 86A | w/e | 07/12/1968 | 31B | March |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3604 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 86A | w/e | 29/06/1974 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3753 | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 81C | Southall | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 86A | 2w/e | 04/10/1975 | MG | Margam |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9528 | on | 09/11/1968 | Withdrawn | w/e | 07/12/1968 (R) | 86A | |||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1925 | 4w/e | 09/01/1967 | 70D | Eastleigh | 5w/e | 09/12/1968 | 86A | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1926 | 4w/e | 09/01/1967 | 70D | Eastleigh | 5w/e | 09/12/1968 | 86A | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1925 | 5w/e | 09/12/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 86A | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1926 | 5w/e | 09/12/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 86A | 2w/e | 14/06/1975 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3822 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 86A | 7w/e | 01/01/1971 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4179 | on | 05/09/1962 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 86A | 7w/e | 29/05/1970 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6604 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 87E | Landore | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 86A | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6910 | on | 26/11/1963 | 87E | Landore (New) | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 86A | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 87A | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6912 | on | 06/01/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 86A | w/e | 19/04/1969 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6924 | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 87E | Landore | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 86A | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 87A | Landore |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3523 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 09/02/1969 | 86A | w/e | 23/02/1969 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1615 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 86A | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1756 | w/e | 04/01/1969 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 86A | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3515 | m/e | 31/03/1967 | 87E | Landore | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | 86A | on | 21/12/1987 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1609 | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 8w/e | 16/08/1969 | 86A | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3000 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 5w/e | 27/09/1969 | 86A | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3268 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 86A | on | 01/12/1980 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4185 | on | 02/11/1962 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 86A | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6604 | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 86A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 87A | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6605 | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 86A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 87A | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6606 | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 86A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 87A | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6607 | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 86A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 87A | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6608 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 86A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 87A | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6941 | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 86A | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 87A | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6943 | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 86A | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 87A | Landore |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7056 | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 86A | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1583 | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | 86A | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1594 | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | 86A | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4173 | on | 19/06/1962 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | 86A | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3817 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 2w/e | 27/12/1969 | 86A | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3819 | 2w/e | 27/12/1969 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 86A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7047 | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 86A | 7w/e | 02/01/1971 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7048 | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 86A | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7051 | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 86A | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7057 | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 86A | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7059 | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 86A | on | 03/10/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7060 | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 86A | on | 03/10/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3756 | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 7w/e | 29/05/1970 | 86A | on | 24/11/1992 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1592 | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 87E | Landore | q/e | 22/08/1970 | 86A | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 87A | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1593 | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 87E | Landore | q/e | 22/08/1970 | 86A | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1594 | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 87E | Landore | q/e | 22/08/1970 | 86A | w/e | 06/10/1973 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1597 | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 87E | Landore | q/e | 22/08/1970 | 86A | w/e | 17/02/1973 | D05 | Stoke Division |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3960 | 5w/e | 27/09/1969 | 87B | Margam | q/e | 22/08/1970 | 86A | m/e | 10/1976 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7049 | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | q/e | 22/08/1970 | 86A | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3743 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | Landore | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 86A | w/e | 22/06/1974 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3744 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | Landore | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 86A | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 87A | Landore |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4176 | on | 22/08/1962 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 86A | w/e | 11/08/1973 | OX | Oxford |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7058 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 86A | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7062 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 86A | on | 03/10/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7065 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 86A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7072 | 2w/e | 10/01/1965 | 81A | Old Oak Common | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 86A | on | 03/10/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7100 | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 86A | 8w/e | 27/02/1971 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6914 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills | w/e | 01/05/1971 | 86A | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6917 | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 01/05/1971 | 86A | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6918 | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills | w/e | 01/05/1971 | 86A | on | 04/09/1988 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6923 | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills | w/e | 01/05/1971 | 86A | on | 31/01/2003 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6927 | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills | w/e | 01/05/1971 | 86A | on | 31/01/2004 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6929 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills | w/e | 01/05/1971 | 86A | on | 04/09/1988 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6930 | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | 55C | Healey Mills | w/e | 01/05/1971 | 86A | on | 31/08/2005 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6939 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | w/e | 01/05/1971 | 86A | on | 01/12/1998 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4010 | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 83D | Laira | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 86A | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4019 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 86A | 9w/e | 11/03/1972 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7055 | m/e | 31/01/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 86A | on | 16/04/1973 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7056 | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 86A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7057 | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 86A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7058 | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 86A | 6w/e | 14/08/1971 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7058 | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 6w/e | 14/08/1971 | 86A | on | 03/10/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1684 | on | 17/06/1968 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 86A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1685 | on | 17/06/1968 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 86A | on | 04/10/1987 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1686 | on | 17/06/1968 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 86A | on | 12/11/1991 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1687 | w/e | 10/07/1971 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 86A | w/e | 08/12/1973 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1688 | on | 17/06/1968 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 86A | on | 13/03/1989 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1720 | on | 17/06/1968 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 86A | w/e | 12/05/1973 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1722 | on | 17/06/1968 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 86A | w/e | 12/05/1973 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1723 | on | 17/06/1968 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 86A | w/e | 12/05/1973 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1728 | w/e | 11/07/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 86A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1729 | w/e | 11/07/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 86A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1730 | w/e | 11/07/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 86A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1732 | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 86A | w/e | 12/05/1973 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1739 | w/e | 06/02/1971 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 86A | w/e | 12/05/1973 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1740 | w/e | 06/12/1969 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 86A | w/e | 12/05/1973 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1741 | w/e | 06/12/1969 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 86A | w/e | 12/05/1973 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1745 | w/e | 20/12/1969 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 86A | w/e | 08/05/1976 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1747 | w/e | 20/12/1969 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 86A | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1750 | w/e | 11/07/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 86A | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1755 | w/e | 11/07/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 86A | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | YK | York (North) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6837 | m/e | 31/03/1971 | 66A | Polmadie | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 86A | w/e | 17/11/1973 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6896 | w/e | 11/04/1970 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 86A | w/e | 24/11/1973 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6913 | w/e | 24/10/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 86A | on | 23/04/2003 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6922 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 86A | on | 31/07/2008 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6925 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 86A | on | 28/02/2004 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6948 | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 86A | on | 01/02/2009 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3746 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87B | Margam | 9w/e | 11/03/1972 | 86A | 2w/e | 21/12/1974 | EJ | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7036 | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | on | 19/04/1972 (R) | 86A | 3w/e | 13/05/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7082 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 2w/e | 19/04/1972 | 86A | on | 19/04/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7052 | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | on | 01/05/1972 (R) | 86A | on | 08/07/1972 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7070 | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | on | 01/05/1972 (R) | 86A | on | 08/09/1972 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7085 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 5w/e | 08/05/1972 | 86A | on | 08/07/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7087 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 5w/e | 08/05/1972 | 86A | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1716 | w/e | 01/05/1971 | 87A | Landore | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 86A | w/e | 15/09/1973 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1717 | w/e | 01/05/1971 | 87A | Landore | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 86A | w/e | 10/11/1973 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1718 | w/e | 01/05/1971 | 87A | Landore | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 86A | w/e | 10/11/1973 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1928 | on | 21/01/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 86A | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3606 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 87E | Landore | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 86A | on | 29/09/1985 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7569 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 86A | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7588 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 86A | w/e | 09/03/1974 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7625 | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 86A | w/e | 09/12/1972 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7656 | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 86A | w/e | 09/12/1972 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7657 | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 86A | w/e | 09/12/1972 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7675 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 84A | Laira | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 86A | w/e | 09/12/1972 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7676 | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 86A | w/e | 09/12/1972 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7677 | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 86A | w/e | 09/12/1972 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D86 | on | 17/06/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 08/07/1972 | 86A | on | 10/05/1987 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7520 | on | 17/06/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 08/07/1972 | 86A | w/e | 11/10/1975 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7521 | on | 17/06/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 08/07/1972 | 86A | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6839 | 5w/e | 01/04/1972 | 65A | Eastfield | 5w/e | 05/08/1972 | 86A | w/e | 17/11/1973 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6903 | 4w/e | 26/02/1972 | 64B | Haymarket | 5w/e | 05/08/1972 | 86A | w/e | 24/11/1973 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1646 | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 86A | w/e | 12/05/1973 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1647 | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 86A | w/e | 07/07/1973 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1930 | on | 12/02/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 86A | w/e | 24/11/1973 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4180 | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 87A | Landore | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 86A | 3w/e | 30/09/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1931 | on | 21/02/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | w/e | 19/08/1972 | 86A | on | 05/01/1981 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1680 | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 2w/e | 02/09/1972 | 86A | w/e | 11/10/1975 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7084 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common | w/e | 09/09/1972 | 86A | on | 11/10/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1935 | on | 18/03/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | 3w/e | 30/09/1972 | 86A | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7052 | on | 08/07/1972 | Withdrawn | on | 16/10/1972 (R) | 86A | on | 30/11/1972 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | 53 | Co-Co | D1200 | m/e | 08/1972 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | w/e | 21/10/1972 | 86A | w/e | 12/05/1973 | EJ | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1583 | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 86A | w/e | 17/03/1973 | D05 | Stoke Division |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1588 | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 87A | Landore | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 86A | 2w/e | 21/12/1974 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1599 | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 86A | 2w/e | 08/02/1975 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6840 | 4w/e | 28/10/1972 | 64B | Haymarket | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 86A | w/e | 17/11/1973 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6841 | 5w/e | 01/04/1972 | 65A | Eastfield | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 86A | w/e | 17/11/1973 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7502 | w/e | 28/10/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 09/12/1972 | 86A | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7503 | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 09/12/1972 | 86A | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7504 | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 09/12/1972 | 86A | w/e | 11/12/1976 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7505 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 84A | Laira | w/e | 09/12/1972 | 86A | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1665 | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 87E | Landore | w/e | 17/02/1973 | 86A | w/e | 29/06/1974 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3760 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | Landore | w/e | 03/03/1973 | 86A | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3434 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87B | Margam | w/e | 17/03/1973 | 86A | w/e | 10/01/1976 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47057 | w/e | 17/03/1973 | 87A | Landore | w/e | 24/03/1973 | 86A | w/e | 06/10/1973 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1644 | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common | w/e | 12/05/1973 | CF | w/e | 07/12/1974 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1652 | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common | w/e | 12/05/1973 | CF | w/e | 02/03/1974 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1653 | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common | w/e | 12/05/1973 | CF | w/e | 07/07/1973 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47073 | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 81A | Old Oak Common | w/e | 12/05/1973 | CF | w/e | 07/07/1973 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1659 | m/e | 10/1970 | 81A | Old Oak Common | w/e | 12/05/1973 | CF | w/e | 12/05/1973 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1667 | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 87E | Landore | w/e | 12/05/1973 | CF | m/e | 11/1981 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1668 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 87E | Landore | w/e | 12/05/1973 | CF | on | 01/11/1990 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1735 | w/e | 06/12/1969 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 12/05/1973 | CF | w/e | 29/06/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7518 | w/e | 08/07/1972 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | w/e | 12/05/1973 | CF | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1739 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | OC | Old Oak Common | w/e | 07/07/1973 | CF | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1740 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | OC | Old Oak Common | w/e | 07/07/1973 | CF | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7508 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 07/07/1973 | CF | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3761 | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 81F | Oxford | w/e | 11/08/1973 | CF | m/e | 10/1977 | EJ | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7517 | w/e | 08/07/1972 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | w/e | 11/08/1973 | CF | w/e | 10/01/1976 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1645 | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 87A | Landore | w/e | 08/09/1973 | CF | w/e | 07/12/1974 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1752 | w/e | 14/04/1973 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 15/09/1973 | CF | m/e | 02/1977 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1712 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 06/10/1973 | CF | on | 07/07/1991 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47548 | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 06/10/1973 | CF | w/e | 10/11/1973 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7506 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 84A | Laira | w/e | 06/10/1973 | CF | w/e | 07/09/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7507 | w/e | 09/12/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 06/10/1973 | CF | w/e | 10/11/1973 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1781 | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 10/11/1973 | CF | on | 28/02/2007 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1896 | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | TI | Tinsley | w/e | 10/11/1973 | CF | on | 15/05/1988 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1897 | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | TI | Tinsley | w/e | 10/11/1973 | CF | m/e | 10/1976 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6943 | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 87A | Landore | w/e | 17/11/1973 | CF | on | 01/04/1999 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6954 | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 87A | Landore | w/e | 17/11/1973 | CF | on | 31/01/1999 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6956 | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 87A | Landore | w/e | 17/11/1973 | CF | on | 01/12/2000 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6957 | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 87A | Landore | w/e | 17/11/1973 | CF | on | 15/05/1988 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47022 | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 87A | Landore | w/e | 24/11/1973 | CF | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6944 | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 87E | Landore | w/e | 24/11/1973 | CF | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6862 | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | MR | March | w/e | 02/02/1974 | CF | on | 30/06/2005 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37220 | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 09/02/1974 | CF | on | 31/08/2005 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37228 | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 09/02/1974 | CF | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1606 | w/e | 31/03/1973 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 02/03/1974 | CF | 2w/e | 08/02/1975 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47074 | w/e | 06/04/1974 | LE | Landore | w/e | 06/04/1974 | CF | 3w/e | 09/08/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47025 | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 87A | Landore | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | w/e | 16/11/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47030 | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 87E | Landore | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47031 | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 87E | Landore | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47032 | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 87E | Landore | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | w/e | 15/03/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47054 | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | w/e | 20/07/1974 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47062 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | LE | Landore | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | w/e | 28/09/1974 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47075 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | LE | Landore | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | 2w/e | 01/06/1974 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47084 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 87E | Landore | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | w/e | 21/09/1974 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25029 | w/e | 07/11/1970 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 91X | To Scottish Region |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25030 | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 91X | To Scottish Region |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25031 | w/e | 07/11/1970 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 91X | To Scottish Region |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25032 | w/e | 07/11/1970 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25059 | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25063 | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25157 | w/e | 10/11/1973 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25159 | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25160 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25161 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25162 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25163 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25164 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25165 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | w/e | 10/01/1976 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25166 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | w/e | 08/05/1976 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25172 | w/e | 12/01/1974 | WN | Willesden | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25238 | w/e | 09/03/1974 | LA | Laira | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47151 | w/e | 06/02/1971 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 01/06/1974 | CF | w/e | 08/05/1976 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47096 | w/e | 08/07/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 29/06/1974 | CF | on | 22/09/1995 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47229 | w/e | 08/07/1972 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 29/06/1974 | CF | 2w/e | 27/11/1976 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47185 | w/e | 13/07/1974 | LE | Landore | w/e | 20/07/1974 | CF | on | 15/05/1988 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37253 | w/e | 09/02/1974 | TE | Thornaby | w/e | 10/08/1974 | CF | on | 01/08/1997 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47020 | w/e | 07/04/1973 | D02 | Birmingham Division | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | CF | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47026 | w/e | 10/03/1973 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 21/09/1974 | CF | 2w/e | 08/02/1975 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47095 | w/e | 23/06/1973 | BS | Bescot | w/e | 28/09/1974 | CF | w/e | 11/10/1975 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47238 | w/e | 14/10/1972 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 12/10/1974 | CF | on | 05/10/2001 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47241 | w/e | 22/07/1972 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 12/10/1974 | CF | on | 30/06/2005 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47242 | w/e | 19/08/1972 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 12/10/1974 | CF | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37138 | 4w/e | 28/09/1968 | 65A | Eastfield | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | CF | on | 19/05/1996 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47020 | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | LE | Landore | w/e | 09/11/1974 | CF | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47128 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 09/11/1974 | CF | m/e | 02/1977 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47142 | w/e | 29/06/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 09/11/1974 | CF | m/e | 02/1977 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37143 | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | LE | Landore | w/e | 09/11/1974 | CF | m/e | 02/1977 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47025 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 16/11/1974 | CF | w/e | 07/12/1974 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47001 | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | GD | Gateshead | 2w/e | 30/11/1974 | CF | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47171 | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | 30A | Stratford | 2w/e | 30/11/1974 | CF | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47119 | w/e | 10/08/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 07/12/1974 | CF | on | 15/05/1992 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47121 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 07/12/1974 | CF | on | 24/09/1996 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47122 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 07/12/1974 | CF | on | 03/09/1987 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47124 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 07/12/1974 | CF | on | 05/06/1989 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47125 | w/e | 09/03/1974 | TI | Tinsley | w/e | 07/12/1974 | CF | m/e | 05/1977 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25158 | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 07/12/1974 | CF | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47258 | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | LE | Landore | 2w/e | 21/12/1974 | CF | on | 30/09/2004 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47056 | w/e | 21/09/1974 | OC | Old Oak Common | 2w/e | 08/02/1975 | CF | w/e | 11/10/1975 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47140 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | 2w/e | 08/02/1975 | CF | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47146 | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | LE | Landore | 2w/e | 08/02/1975 | CF | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25084 | w/e | 13/10/1973 | TI | Tinsley | w/e | 08/03/1975 | CF | 2w/e | 23/08/1975 | HA | Haymarket |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25085 | w/e | 13/10/1973 | TI | Tinsley | w/e | 08/03/1975 | CF | 2w/e | 23/08/1975 | HA | Haymarket |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47166 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | TI | Tinsley | w/e | 15/03/1975 | CF | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46021 | w/e | 03/04/1971 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | CF | m/e | 05/1977 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46022 | w/e | 03/04/1971 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | CF | m/e | 05/1977 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46023 | w/e | 18/05/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | CF | m/e | 05/1977 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46024 | w/e | 01/05/1971 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | CF | m/e | 05/1977 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46025 | w/e | 01/05/1971 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | CF | m/e | 05/1977 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46026 | w/e | 01/05/1971 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | CF | m/e | 05/1977 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46028 | w/e | 01/03/1969 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | CF | w/e | 11/12/1976 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46047 | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | CF | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46048 | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | CF | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46049 | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | CF | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46051 | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | CF | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47069 | w/e | 07/07/1973 | OC | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | CF | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47070 | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | CF | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47072 | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | CF | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47103 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | IM | Immingham | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | CF | on | 14/07/1987 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47105 | 2w/e | 28/04/1973 | 40B | Immingham | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | CF | on | 13/12/1993 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25171 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | 3w/e | 07/06/1975 | CF | w/e | 11/10/1975 | HA | Haymarket |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25172 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | 3w/e | 07/06/1975 | CF | w/e | 11/10/1975 | HA | Haymarket |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25238 | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | LA | Laira | 3w/e | 07/06/1975 | CF | 2w/e | 23/08/1975 | HA | Haymarket |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46020 | w/e | 01/03/1969 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 3w/e | 09/08/1975 | CF | m/e | 02/1977 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25215 | 4w/e | 25/11/1972 | 64B | Haymarket | 3w/e | 30/08/1975 | CF | w/e | 11/10/1975 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25216 | 4w/e | 25/05/1974 | HA | Haymarket | 3w/e | 30/08/1975 | CF | w/e | 11/10/1975 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25217 | 4w/e | 25/05/1974 | HA | Haymarket | 3w/e | 30/08/1975 | CF | w/e | 11/10/1975 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08361 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87B | Margam | 2w/e | 04/10/1975 | CF | on | 09/01/1978 | EJ | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46016 | w/e | 18/05/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 11/10/1975 | CF | w/e | 06/03/1976 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46017 | w/e | 01/03/1969 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 11/10/1975 | CF | w/e | 06/03/1976 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46018 | w/e | 08/03/1969 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 11/10/1975 | CF | m/e | 01/1977 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46019 | w/e | 01/03/1969 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 11/10/1975 | CF | m/e | 02/1977 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46052 | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 11/10/1975 | CF | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47140 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | LE | Landore | w/e | 11/10/1975 | CF | m/e | 02/1977 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25077 | w/e | 06/09/1975 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | CF | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25155 | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | CF | m/e | 05/1977 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25219 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | CF | 3w/e | 20/11/1977 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37178 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 87A | Landore | 4w/e | 06/12/1975 | CF | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47054 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 10/01/1976 | CF | m/e | 05/1977 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47055 | w/e | 22/06/1974 | OC | Old Oak Common | w/e | 10/01/1976 | CF | m/e | 05/1977 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47056 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | OC | Old Oak Common | w/e | 10/01/1976 | CF | 2w/e | 19/06/1976 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47131 | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | LE | Landore | w/e | 10/01/1976 | CF | m/e | 05/1977 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25063 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | LA | Laira | w/e | 10/01/1976 | CF | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46011 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | LA | Laira | w/e | 08/05/1976 | CF | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46012 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | LA | Laira | w/e | 08/05/1976 | CF | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46013 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | LA | Laira | w/e | 08/05/1976 | CF | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46014 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | LA | Laira | w/e | 08/05/1976 | CF | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46015 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | LA | Laira | w/e | 08/05/1976 | CF | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46016 | w/e | 06/03/1976 | LA | Laira | w/e | 08/05/1976 | CF | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46017 | w/e | 06/03/1976 | LA | Laira | w/e | 08/05/1976 | CF | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47074 | w/e | 08/05/1976 | BS | Bescot | w/e | 10/07/1976 | CF | 2w/e | 07/08/1976 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47095 | w/e | 10/07/1976 | BS | Bescot | w/e | 10/07/1976 | CF | m/e | 01/1977 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47249 | 3w/e | 08/05/1976 | BS | Bescot | w/e | 10/07/1976 | CF | 2w/e | 07/08/1976 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47317 | 2w/e | 24/07/1976 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | 2w/e | 07/08/1976 | CF | m/e | 10/1976 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47318 | 4w/e | 21/06/1975 | HA | Haymarket | 2w/e | 07/08/1976 | CF | m/e | 10/1976 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08664 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 2w/e | 07/08/1976 | CF | m/e | 05/1977 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08850 | w/e | 21/02/1976 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | 2w/e | 07/08/1976 | CF | m/e | 11/1978 | RG | Reading (W.R.) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47002 | 2w/e | 30/11/1974 | BS | Bescot | m/e | 10/1976 | CF | m/e | 09/1981 | HA | Haymarket |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47143 | w/e | 07/12/1974 | BS | Bescot | m/e | 10/1976 | CF | m/e | 01/1977 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47144 | w/e | 11/01/1975 | BS | Bescot | m/e | 10/1976 | CF | m/e | 01/1977 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47145 | w/e | 06/12/1969 | D02 | Birmingham Division | m/e | 10/1976 | CF | m/e | 01/1977 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47020 | w/e | 10/07/1976 | LA | Laira | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | 2w/e | 11/12/1976 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47024 | w/e | 10/07/1976 | LA | Laira | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | 2w/e | 11/12/1976 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47056 | 2w/e | 19/06/1976 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | m/e | 05/1977 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47059 | 2w/e | 07/08/1976 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | m/e | 05/1977 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47068 | w/e | 02/03/1974 | OC | Old Oak Common | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | m/e | 05/1977 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47076 | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47077 | w/e | 28/04/1973 | OC | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47078 | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 87E | Landore | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | on | 01/05/1997 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47079 | w/e | 16/12/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | on | 04/10/1987 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47080 | w/e | 29/06/1974 | OC | Old Oak Common | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | on | 15/05/1988 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47081 | w/e | 30/03/1974 | OC | Old Oak Common | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | on | 15/05/1988 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47086 | w/e | 07/07/1973 | OC | Old Oak Common | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | on | 01/07/2003 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47087 | w/e | 06/10/1973 | OC | Old Oak Common | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47088 | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47089 | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | on | 21/06/1987 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47090 | w/e | 06/07/1974 | OC | Old Oak Common | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37131 | w/e | 29/02/1976 | TE | Thornaby | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | m/e | 02/1977 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37238 | w/e | 26/10/1974 | GD | Gateshead | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | on | 30/09/2008 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37251 | w/e | 28/10/1972 | 55C | Healey Mills | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | on | 04/10/1987 | IS | Inverness |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47378 | m/e | 10/1976 | BS | Bescot | 2w/e | 27/11/1976 | CF | on | 15/05/1988 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46028 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 11/12/1976 | CF | m/e | 01/1977 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08822 | q/e | 22/08/1970 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 2w/e | 11/12/1976 | CF | m/e | 03/1978 | EJ | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25055 | 3w/e | 08/05/1976 | CD | Crewe Diesel | w/e | 11/12/1976 | CF | 3w/e | 20/11/1977 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25063 | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | LA | Laira | 2w/e | 11/12/1976 | CF | 3w/e | 20/11/1977 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25220 | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | LA | Laira | 2w/e | 11/12/1976 | CF | 3w/e | 20/11/1977 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46028 | w/e | 11/12/1976 | CF | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 01/1977 | CF | m/e | 05/1977 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37247 | w/e | 25/02/1968 | 30A | Stratford | m/e | 02/1977 | CF | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37268 | w/e | 04/05/1968 | 30A | Stratford | m/e | 02/1977 | CF | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37270 | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 87A | Landore | m/e | 02/1977 | CF | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37271 | w/e | 02/02/1974 | LE | Landore | m/e | 02/1977 | CF | on | 01/04/2005 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47094 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | CD | Crewe Diesel | m/e | 05/1977 | CF | on | 04/10/1987 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47097 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 05/1977 | CF | on | 04/04/1990 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47104 | w/e | 14/09/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 05/1977 | CF | on | 05/05/1988 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47106 | w/e | 05/10/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 05/1977 | CF | on | 29/02/1988 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47111 | w/e | 05/10/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 05/1977 | CF | on | 28/02/1986 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47112 | w/e | 05/10/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 05/1977 | CF | on | 22/11/1991 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08896 | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | 87E | Landore | m/e | 05/1977 | CF | on | 01/02/2004 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47249 | 2w/e | 07/08/1976 | BS | Bescot | on | 01/05/1977 | CF | on | 04/10/1987 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47267 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | on | 01/05/1977 | CF | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47283 | w/e | 21/03/1970 | 41A | Tinsley | m/e | 06/1977 | CF | on | 31/08/2004 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47143 | m/e | 01/1977 | LA | Laira | m/e | 10/1977 | CF | on | 04/10/1987 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47144 | m/e | 01/1977 | LA | Laira | m/e | 10/1977 | CF | on | 04/10/1987 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47145 | m/e | 01/1977 | LA | Laira | m/e | 10/1977 | CF | on | 01/02/2007 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47128 | m/e | 02/1977 | LA | Laira | m/e | 03/1978 | CF | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08779 | on | 02/04/1960 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 6w/e | 13/05/1978 | CF | on | 11/10/1987 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47029 | 2w/e | 08/02/1975 | LA | Laira | m/e | 11/1978 | CF | on | 01/02/2004 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47030 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | LA | Laira | m/e | 11/1978 | CF | on | 15/05/1988 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47033 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | LA | Laira | m/e | 11/1978 | CF | on | 04/10/1987 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08835 | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | RG | Reading (W.R.) | m/e | 11/1978 | CF | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47901 | 3w/e | 04/01/1976 | TI | Tinsley | m/e | 30/11/1979 | CF | on | 04/10/1987 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37234 | m/e | 11/1969 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | m/e | 07/1980 | CF | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08787 | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | 81A | Old Oak Common | on | 08/12/1980 | CF | on | 14/02/1991 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08792 | m/e | 10/1976 | LE | Landore | on | 31/05/1981 | CF | on | 28/02/2007 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08804 | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | SW | Swindon | m/e | 07/1981 | CF | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37289 | w/e | 09/02/1974 | LE | Landore | m/e | 07/1981 | CF | on | 01/08/2005 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37290 | 4w/e | 06/12/1975 | LE | Landore | m/e | 07/1981 | CF | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37294 | on | 08/07/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | m/e | 07/1981 | CF | on | 30/09/2008 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47068 | m/e | 05/1977 | LE | Landore | m/e | 11/1981 | CF | on | 15/05/1988 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47075 | m/e | 05/1977 | LE | Landore | m/e | 11/1981 | CF | on | 01/02/1990 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47082 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 11/1981 | CF | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08796 | w/e | 10/02/1973 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | m/e | 11/1981 | CF | on | 04/05/1990 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47033 | m/e | 11/1978 | CF | Cardiff Canton | on | 04/10/1987 | CF | on | 31/12/2007 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47901 | m/e | 30/11/1979 | CF | Cardiff Canton | on | 04/10/1987 | CF | on | 01/02/1990 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47063 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | on | 04/10/1987 | CF | on | 22/09/1995 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47079 | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | Cardiff Canton | on | 04/10/1987 | CF | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47085 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | SF | Stratford | on | 04/10/1987 | CF | on | 12/06/1988 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47094 | m/e | 05/1977 | CF | Cardiff Canton | on | 04/10/1987 | CF | on | 24/02/1992 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47326 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | on | 04/10/1987 | CF | on | 31/08/2006 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47327 | w/e | 15/02/1969 | D16 | Nottingham Division | on | 04/10/1987 | CF | on | 19/02/1993 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47256 | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | on | 04/10/1987 | CF | on | 28/01/1999 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47295 | on | 01/11/1981 | GD | Gateshead | on | 04/10/1987 | CF | on | 31/01/2003 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08493 | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | FP | Finsbury Park | on | 04/10/1987 | CF | on | 30/06/2008 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | 56001 | on | 04/10/1987 | CF | on | 18/09/1996 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | 56031 | on | 24/05/1977 | TO | Toton (New) | on | 04/10/1987 | CF | ||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | 56033 | on | 29/12/1980 | TI | Tinsley | on | 04/10/1987 | CF | on | 10/2003 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | 56034 | on | 04/10/1987 | CF | on | 06/2005 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | 56036 | on | 04/10/1987 | CF | on | 06/2005 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | 56039 | on | 04/10/1987 | CF | on | 01/2004 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | 56043 | on | 04/10/1987 | CF | on | 09/2008 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | 56045 | on | 29/12/1980 | TI | Tinsley | on | 04/10/1987 | CF | on | 04/2009 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | 56046 | on | 04/10/1987 | CF | on | 07/2002 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | 56048 | on | 04/10/1987 | CF | on | 08/2002 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | 56049 | on | 04/10/1987 | CF | ||||||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | 56051 | on | 04/10/1987 | CF | ||||||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | 56055 | on | 04/10/1987 | CF | on | 03/2003 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | 56056 | on | 04/10/1987 | CF | on | 02/2004 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | 56057 | on | 04/10/1987 | CF | ||||||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37102 | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | MR | March | on | 05/05/1988 | CF | on | 15/05/1988 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47359 | m/e | 06/1977 | TO | Toton | on | 15/05/1988 | CF | on | 28/01/1998 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37024 | m/e | 05/1977 | IM | Immingham | on | 15/05/1988 | CF | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37052 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 31B | March | on | 15/05/1988 | CF | on | 01/03/2000 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37078 | on | 26/07/1981 | TE | Thornaby | on | 15/05/1988 | CF | on | 31/01/2004 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37084 | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | MR | March | on | 15/05/1988 | CF | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37102 | on | 05/05/1988 | CF | Cardiff Canton | on | 15/05/1988 | CF | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37142 | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | on | 15/05/1988 | CF | on | 01/05/1997 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37146 | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | on | 15/05/1988 | CF | on | 28/02/2007 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37147 | 4w/e | 31/10/1970 | 65A | Eastfield | on | 15/05/1988 | CF | on | 01/11/1999 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37158 | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | on | 15/05/1988 | CF | on | 30/04/2008 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37174 | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | on | 15/05/1988 | CF | on | 31/10/2007 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37176 | on | 14/10/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | on | 15/05/1988 | CF | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37177 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 87E | Landore | on | 15/05/1988 | CF | on | 01/04/2002 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37180 | on | 24/10/1963 | 87E | Landore (New) | on | 15/05/1988 | CF | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37207 | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | on | 15/05/1988 | CF | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37215 | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | SF | Stratford | on | 15/05/1988 | CF | on | 16/07/1993 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37232 | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | on | 15/05/1988 | CF | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37889 | on | 01/04/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | on | 15/05/1988 | CF | on | 01/06/1999 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37263 | w/e | 14/10/1967 | 30A | Stratford | on | 15/05/1988 | CF | on | 31/01/2004 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37264 | on | 01/11/1981 | LE | Landore | on | 15/05/1988 | CF | on | 01/12/1999 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 09008 | 4w/e | 30/04/1972 | 73F | Ashford Chart Leacon | on | 29/05/1988 | CF | ||||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 09013 | 4w/e | 29/01/1968 | 73F | Ashford Chart Leacon | on | 29/05/1988 | CF | ||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | 56072 | on | 05/06/1988 | CF | on | 02/2004 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | 56074 | on | 05/06/1988 | CF | on | 04/09/1988 | TD | |||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | 56075 | on | 22/11/1981 | GD | Gateshead | on | 05/06/1988 | CF | on | 04/09/1988 | TO | Toton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47197 | w/e | 18/05/1974 | CD | Crewe Diesel | on | 12/06/1988 | CF | on | 28/02/2007 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47198 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | on | 12/06/1988 | CF | on | 20/04/1989 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08660 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | Landore | on | 12/06/1988 | CF | on | 08/11/1991 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08663 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | Landore | on | 12/06/1988 | CF | on | 04/09/1988 | BZ | St Blazey |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08760 | on | 12/06/1988 | 98S | on | 26/07/1988 | CF | on | 14/02/1992 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37211 | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 40B | Immingham | on | 04/09/1988 | CF | on | 31/08/2003 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37218 | w/e | 01/05/1971 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | on | 04/09/1988 | CF | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08940 | on | 24/07/1988 | 98S | on | 07/09/1988 | CF | on | 31/01/2003 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | 60026 | on | 12/12/1990 (New) | CF | ||||||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | 60010 | on | 21/01/1991 (New) | CF | ||||||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | 60033 | on | 22/02/1991 (New) | CF | ||||||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | 60051 | on | 10/04/1991 (New) | CF | ||||||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | 60054 | on | 03/05/1991 (New) | CF | ||||||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | 60039 | on | 09/05/1991 (New) | CF | ||||||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | 60063 | on | 13/06/1991 (New) | CF | ||||||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | 60062 | on | 17/06/1991 (New) | CF | ||||||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | 60065 | on | 17/09/1991 (New) | CF | ||||||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | 60089 | on | 08/01/1992 (New) | CF | ||||||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | 60079 | on | 17/01/1992 (New) | CF |