Depot: Aintree
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Aintree | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12184 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 23B | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 19C | Canklow | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12390 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 23B | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | Aintree | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12607 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 23B | on | 01/01/1948 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | ||||
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 27635 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 23B | w/e | 10/04/1948 | 4D | Abergavenny | ||||
Steam | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 12934 | w/e | 22/02/1936 | 23B | ||||||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8385 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 15A | Wellingborough | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8461 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 24A | Accrington | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8469 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8707 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | 52337 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | on | 20/03/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | 52401 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | on | 24/01/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | 12527 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | w/e | 01/04/1950 | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11343 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11462 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | on | 27/10/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11460 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | m/e | 10/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11530 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | w/e | 26/11/1955 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11413 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 26B | Agecroft | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51475 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | m/e | 11/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4220 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 25C | Goole | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4462 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 25D | Mirfield | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4481 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4541 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12094 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12112 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | w/e | 08/09/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12179 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12196 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12218 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 99C | Crewe Works | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12582 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 23C | Southport | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12328 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 12E | Moor Row | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | w/e | 24/06/1950 | 27E | Walton on the Hill |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12557 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | w/e | 29/09/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12333 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | w/e | 24/06/1950 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12362 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | w/e | 15/11/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12379 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 27D | Carstairs | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12390 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 23B | Aintree | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12405 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 27A | Bank Hall | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12456 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | w/e | 01/04/1950 | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||||
Steam | 1351 | 0-6-0T | 11544 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 27A | Bank Hall | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9521 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | m/e | 04/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9535 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | on | 11/11/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9564 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | w/e | 24/09/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9566 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | on | 15/08/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9567 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | on | 19/01/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9571 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9581 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | w/e | 11/06/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9586 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9587 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | on | 16/06/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9592 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9595 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | on | 08/12/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9597 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | m/e | 05/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9613 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 52971 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 9 | 0-8-0 | 12782 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | w/e | 10/04/1948 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||||
Steam | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 12856 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||||
Steam | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 12857 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||||
Steam | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 12870 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||||
Steam | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 52877 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | on | 02/10/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 12910 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||||
Steam | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 52935 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | on | 26/06/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 52956 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | 2w/e | 14/01/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 12962 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | w/e | 01/07/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 10648 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 26C | Bolton | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 10655 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 26D | Bury | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 10660 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 26E | Bacup |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8705 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 10/04/1948 | 23B | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 25A | Wakefield |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2733 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 23B | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2821 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25G | Farnley Junction | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 23B | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9515 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 23B | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9541 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 23B | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9550 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 23B | m/e | 08/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9671 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 23B | on | 08/03/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9543 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 07/08/1948 | 23B | on | 08/08/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9605 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 07/08/1948 | 23B | on | 13/02/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9609 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 07/08/1948 | 23B | on | 12/10/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9623 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 07/08/1948 | 23B | on | 13/01/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52312 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 23B | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 898 | 0-6-0 | 52549 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 25F | Low Moor | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 23B | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49549 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 23B | m/e | 04/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9610 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 23B | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 52886 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 23B | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 12906 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 23B | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 52913 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 23B | m/e | 02/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 12916 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 23B | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 12945 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 23B | w/e | 15/04/1950 | 27D | Carstairs |
Steam | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 52952 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 23B | m/e | 04/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8523 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 19/03/1949 | 23B | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8524 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 19/03/1949 | 23B | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8525 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 19/03/1949 | 23B | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52093 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 23B | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 99C | Crewe Works |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49649 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24C | Lostock Hall | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 23B | on | 29/11/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12412 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 23B | w/e | 23/03/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49523 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 23B | on | 20/02/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49534 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 23B | on | 02/11/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49576 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 23B | m/e | 10/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52157 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26C | Bolton | w/e | 30/07/1949 | 23B | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 24C | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49539 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | Goole | w/e | 30/07/1949 | 23B | on | 15/10/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9585 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 30/07/1949 | 23B | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4042 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 25C | Goole | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 23B | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 25D | Mirfield |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49505 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 23B | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12179 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 23B | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49541 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 23B | on | 17/07/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9506 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 23B | on | 01/11/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49524 | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 23B | on | 12/12/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49561 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 23B | on | 15/06/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49563 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 23B | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9571 | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 23B | on | 02/06/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49641 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 23B | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 23B | Aintree |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49643 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 23B | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 23B | Aintree |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49645 | m/e | 12/1949 | Withdrawn | w/e | 17/12/1949 (R) | 23B | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49641 | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 23B | Aintree | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 23B | on | 18/11/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49643 | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 23B | Aintree | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 23B | on | 31/12/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49665 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | Bury | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 23B | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 23B | Aintree |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52461 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | Agecroft | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 23B | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 23B | Aintree |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49665 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 23B | Aintree | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 23B | on | 14/08/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52461 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 23B | Aintree | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 23B | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49631 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 27B | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49635 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 27B | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49631 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 27B | Aintree | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 27B | on | 28/04/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49635 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 27B | Aintree | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 27B | on | 27/10/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49503 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24C | Lostock Hall | w/e | 12/08/1950 | 27B | on | 21/08/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49582 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | w/e | 12/08/1950 | 27B | on | 16/05/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49586 | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 25G | Farnley Junction | w/e | 12/08/1950 | 27B | on | 01/08/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49600 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | w/e | 12/08/1950 | 27B | on | 15/08/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49624 | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | w/e | 12/08/1950 | 27B | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49603 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 27B | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49617 | w/e | 14/05/1949 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 27B | on | 16/06/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49545 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 25D | Mirfield | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 27B | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49554 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 25D | Mirfield | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 27B | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49510 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 26C | Bolton | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 27B | on | 08/09/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49545 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 27B | Aintree | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 27B | on | 06/07/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49554 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 27B | Aintree | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 27B | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49640 | w/e | 14/05/1949 | 26C | Bolton | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 27B | on | 16/05/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49672 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 26C | Bolton | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 27B | on | 09/03/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42726 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | Low Moor | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 27B | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42727 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | Low Moor | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 27B | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42728 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | Low Moor | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 27B | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50646 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 24F | Fleetwood | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 27B | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50646 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 27B | Aintree | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 27B | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49589 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 26C | Bolton | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 27B | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50652 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26E | Bacup | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 27B | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 26E | Bacup |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49589 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 27B | Aintree | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 27B | on | 09/06/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1351 | 0-6-0T | 11537 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23A | Bank Hall | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 27B | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52171 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24C | Lostock Hall | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 27B | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52171 | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 27B | Aintree | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 27B | w/e | 20/05/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1351 | 0-6-0T | 11537 | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 27B | Aintree | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 27B | on | 21/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50652 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 26E | Bacup | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 27B | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 79226 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 27B | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52615 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | Bury | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 27B | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90570 | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 27B | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 27B | Aintree | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90604 | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 27B | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 27B | Aintree | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90142 | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | HIT | Hither Green | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 27B | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50829 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 26D | Bury | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 27B | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90127 | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | HIT | Hither Green | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 27B | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90570 | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 27B | Aintree | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 27B | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90142 | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 27B | Aintree | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 27B | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90234 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 27B | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 27B | Aintree | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90604 | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 27B | Aintree | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 27B | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90408 | on | 03/07/1947 | WD | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 27B | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 27B | Aintree | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90390 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 27B | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 79226 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 27B | Aintree | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 27B | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52615 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 27B | Aintree | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 27B | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50651 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 26D | Bury | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 27B | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50829 | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 27B | Aintree | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 27B | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 26E | Bacup |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90164 | w/e | 23/06/1951 | 27B | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 27B | Aintree | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90247 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 73C | Hither Green | w/e | 23/06/1951 | 27B | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90127 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 27B | Aintree | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 27B | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 25A | Wakefield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90570 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 27B | Aintree | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 27B | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90142 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 27B | Aintree | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 27B | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 25A | Wakefield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90164 | w/e | 23/06/1951 | 27B | Aintree | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 27B | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90234 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 27B | Aintree | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 27B | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 25A | Wakefield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90247 | w/e | 23/06/1951 | 27B | Aintree | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 27B | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90604 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 27B | Aintree | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 27B | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 25A | Wakefield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90408 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 27B | Aintree | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 27B | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90164 | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 27B | Aintree | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 27B | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 25A | Wakefield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90247 | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 27B | Aintree | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 27B | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 25A | Wakefield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90671 | w/e | 28/07/1951 | 27B | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 27B | Aintree | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90671 | w/e | 28/07/1951 | 27B | Aintree | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 27B | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49511 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 27B | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49592 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 27B | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49659 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 27B | on | 02/03/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49664 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 27B | on | 16/02/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41283 | m/e | 11/1950 | 25A | Wakefield (New) | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 27B | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42732 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | Low Moor | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 27B | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90121 | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 27B | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 27B | Aintree | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90282 | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 27B | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 27B | Aintree | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90121 | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 27B | Aintree | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 27B | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90282 | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 27B | Aintree | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 27B | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42732 | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 27B | Aintree | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 27B | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41283 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 27B | Aintree | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 27B | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 27A | Bank Hall |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41284 | m/e | 11/1950 | 25A | Wakefield (New) | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 27B | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52378 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | w/e | 22/09/1951 | 27B | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52378 | w/e | 22/09/1951 | 27B | Aintree | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 27B | m/e | 11/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41284 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 27B | Aintree | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 27B | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 27A | Bank Hall |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52379 | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 27D | Carstairs | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 27B | w/e | 06/04/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52588 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 28A | Blackpool Central | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 27B | w/e | 06/09/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52360 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 27B | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52416 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 27B | m/e | 07/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52464 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 27B | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 99C | Crewe Works |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90267 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 25G | Farnley Junction | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 27B | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90278 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 25G | Farnley Junction | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 27B | w/e | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90216 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 26B | Agecroft | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 27B | m/e | 07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51307 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23A | Bank Hall | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 27B | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 27A | Bank Hall |
Steam | 1351 | 0-6-0T | 51535 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23A | Bank Hall | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 27B | w/e | 01/09/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52136 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 26C | Bolton | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 27B | w/e | 31/08/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52278 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 23C | Southport | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 27B | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52278 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 27B | Aintree | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 27B | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52299 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 24D | Lower Darwen | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 27B | on | 04/09/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52095 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 20C | Royston | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 27B | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52135 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16A | Nottingham | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 27B | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52258 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | Royston | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 27B | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52311 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 24D | Lower Darwen | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 27B | w/e | 03/03/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52095 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 27B | Aintree | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 27B | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52135 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 27B | Aintree | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 27B | w/e | 07/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52258 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 27B | Aintree | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 27B | on | 07/08/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42733 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 27B | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 62A | Thornton Junction |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49620 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 27B | on | 28/01/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49650 | on | 26/05/1951 | Withdrawn | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 (R) | 27B | |||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41102 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 27C | Southport | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 27B | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 25G | Farnley Junction |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41186 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 27B | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 25F | Low Moor |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41187 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 27B | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 25F | Low Moor |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41188 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 27B | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 25G | Farnley Junction |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49554 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 27B | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49637 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 27B | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49638 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 27B | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50648 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 24B | Rose Grove | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 27B | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90375 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 25D | Mirfield | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 27B | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 24D | Lower Darwen |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42733 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 27B | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90101 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 25A | Wakefield | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 27B | w/e | 16/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90127 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 25A | Wakefield | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 27B | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 25G | Farnley Junction |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90141 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 25A | Wakefield | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 27B | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90142 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 25A | Wakefield | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 27B | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 26G | Belle Vue |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90164 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 25A | Wakefield | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 27B | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90107 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 25D | Mirfield | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 27B | w/e | 16/11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49511 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 27B | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90643 | w/e | 18/06/1949 | 25A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 27B | w/e | 08/02/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49637 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 27B | Aintree | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 27B | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49638 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 27B | Aintree | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 27B | on | 23/06/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46412 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 26B | Agecroft | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 27B | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46439 | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 25A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 27B | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90204 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 26G | Belle Vue | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 27B | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 10H | Lower Darwen |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90416 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 26C | Bolton | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 27B | m/e | 04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90343 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 26C | Bolton | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 27B | w/e | 21/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90535 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 27B | w/e | 13/07/1963 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90675 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 27B | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90724 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 25A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 27B | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90381 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 27B | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 36C | Frodingham | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90527 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 25G | Farnley Junction | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 27B | w/e | 11/05/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90234 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 25A | Wakefield | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 27B | 4w/e | 13/04/1957 | 66A | Polmadie |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46405 | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 25C | Goole | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 27B | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90283 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 27B | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90712 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 26C | Bolton | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 27B | m/e | 07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51397 | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 27B | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78043 | on | 25/12/1954 | 27A | Bank Hall (New) | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 27B | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 27A | Bank Hall |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47305 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 27B | w/e | 04/04/1964 | 12C | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47425 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 27B | w/e | 19/05/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 47258 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4C | Swansea (Upper Bank) | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 27B | w/e | 16/11/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42711 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 27B | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42721 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | Agecroft | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 27B | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42727 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 27B | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42878 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 27B | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41283 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 27A | Bank Hall | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 27B | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 27A | Bank Hall |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52160 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 24D | Lower Darwen | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 27B | w/e | 06/07/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52260 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24D | Lower Darwen | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 27B | w/e | 01/04/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 47259 | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 27A | Bank Hall | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 27B | w/e | 24/03/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49668 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 27B | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42845 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 26B | Agecroft | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 27B | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90552 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 27B | m/e | 04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90316 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 27B | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 24D | Lower Darwen |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90327 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 27B | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42864 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 27B | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90245 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 27B | m/e | 04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90599 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 27B | w/e | 25/07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90576 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 27B | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90297 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 26C | Bolton | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 27B | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 24D | Lower Darwen |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47655 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 27B | w/e | 13/11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42715 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 27B | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90219 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 26D | Bury | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 27B | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78040 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 27B | w/e | 11/04/1964 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47512 | w/e | 28/01/1961 | L.M.R. | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 27B | w/e | 08/05/1965 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47480 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 27A | Bank Hall | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 27B | w/e | 21/03/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44692 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 27C | Southport | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 27B | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44729 | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 27B | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44887 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23C | Southport | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 27B | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45061 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 27C | Southport | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 27B | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45210 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 27A | Bank Hall | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 27B | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45228 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 27C | Southport | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 27B | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78043 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 27A | Bank Hall | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 27B | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78044 | m/e | 12/1954 | 27A | Bank Hall (New) | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 27B | w/e | 28/12/1963 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78060 | on | 13/10/1956 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) (New) | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 27B | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42730 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 26D | Bury | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 27B | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 8P | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42953 | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 16/01/1963 | 27B | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90125 | on | 30/08/1962 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 27B | w/e | 13/07/1963 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90141 | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 27B | w/e | 22/02/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78022 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 12E | Barrow in Furness | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 27B | w/e | 28/12/1963 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45330 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 27B | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78023 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 12E | Barrow in Furness | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 27B | w/e | 23/05/1964 | 16D | Nottingham |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44676 | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 27B | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44958 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 27B | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45112 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 27B | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45118 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 27B | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45120 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 27B | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42715 | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 27B | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90702 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 8L | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42956 | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 8L | w/e | 07/1964 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42952 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 9J | Agecroft | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 8L | w/e | 07/1964 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42960 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 9J | Agecroft | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 8L | w/e | 07/1964 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42961 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 9K | Bolton | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 8L | w/e | 07/1964 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45451 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 8L | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75015 | m/e | 12/1951 | 27C | Southport (New) | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 8L | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75043 | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 8R | Walton on the Hill | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 8L | w/e | 17/06/1967 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75060 | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 8R | Walton on the Hill | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 8L | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75061 | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 8R | Walton on the Hill | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 8L | w/e | 04/02/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75064 | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 8R | Walton on the Hill | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 8L | w/e | 20/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90242 | w/e | 16/11/1963 | 10C | Fleetwood | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 8L | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 40B | Immingham |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90413 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 24F | Fleetwood | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 8L | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47327 | w/e | 13/01/1962 | 27A | Bank Hall | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 8L | w/e | 24/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47681 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 8L | w/e | 01/05/1965 | 9J | Agecroft |
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 47228 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 8L | w/e | 08/02/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42054 | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 8L | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45323 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 8L | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45104 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 8L | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45154 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 8L | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90316 | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 18/01/1964 | 8L | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45068 | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 8L | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45229 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 8L | w/e | 04/09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90584 | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 9K | Bolton | w/e | 29/02/1964 | 8L | w/e | 05/09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78055 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 24G | Skipton | w/e | 21/03/1964 | 8L | w/e | 23/05/1964 | 16D | Nottingham |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78044 | w/e | 28/12/1963 | 10D | Lostock Hall | w/e | 11/04/1964 | 8L | w/e | 23/05/1964 | 16D | Nottingham |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90563 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 1G | Woodford Halse | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 8L | w/e | 07/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90474 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 38E | Woodford Halse | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 8L | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46404 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 16A | Nottingham | w/e | 23/05/1964 | 8L | w/e | 08/05/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46500 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 23/05/1964 | 8L | w/e | 07/01/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46502 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 23/05/1964 | 8L | w/e | 25/02/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90706 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 30/05/1964 | 8L | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90346 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 8L | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90123 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 04/07/1964 | 8L | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 10H | Lower Darwen |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90271 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 04/07/1964 | 8L | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90289 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 04/07/1964 | 8L | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47289 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 04/07/1964 | 8L | w/e | 19/11/1966 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47566 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 04/07/1964 | 8L | m/e | 10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90561 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 8L | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90399 | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 8L | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90520 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 8L | w/e | 29/08/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90327 | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 9K | Bolton | w/e | 22/08/1964 | 8L | w/e | 16/01/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90419 | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 9K | Bolton | w/e | 22/08/1964 | 8L | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90687 | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 22/08/1964 | 8L | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90516 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 8L | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 36C | Frodingham |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90718 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 8L | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90520 | w/e | 29/08/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 8L | w/e | 06/02/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90248 | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 9K | Bolton | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 8L | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 36C | Frodingham |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90267 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 26C | Bolton | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 8L | w/e | 13/03/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90641 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 26C | Bolton | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 8L | w/e | 07/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90486 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 9K | Bolton | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 8L | w/e | 03/04/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90689 | w/e | 28/12/1963 | 9K | Bolton | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 8L | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90306 | w/e | 07/10/1961 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 8L | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90222 | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 10F | Rose Grove | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 8L | w/e | 07/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90080 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 9G | Gorton | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 8L | w/e | 26/12/1964 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90284 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 9G | Gorton | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 8L | w/e | 06/03/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90274 | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 9G | Gorton | w/e | 26/12/1964 | 8L | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 36C | Frodingham |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90632 | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 30/01/1965 | 8L | w/e | 08/05/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90724 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 30/01/1965 | 8L | w/e | 05/06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90533 | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 9G | Gorton | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 8L | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48050 | w/e | 11/04/1964 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 8L | w/e | 19/03/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48108 | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 8L | w/e | 14/05/1966 | 9L | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48139 | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 8L | w/e | 19/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48268 | w/e | 18/02/1961 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 8L | w/e | 17/06/1967 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48421 | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 8L | w/e | 29/04/1967 | 8E | Northwich |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48451 | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 8L | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48500 | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 8L | w/e | 18/12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48558 | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 8L | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48676 | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 8L | w/e | 17/06/1967 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48715 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 8L | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48017 | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 8L | w/e | 17/06/1967 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48290 | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 8L | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48340 | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 8L | w/e | 17/06/1967 | 8E | Northwich |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48422 | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 8L | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48605 | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 8L | w/e | 06/08/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48648 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 8L | w/e | 20/08/1966 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48704 | w/e | 27/03/1965 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 8L | w/e | 11/09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47453 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 8L | w/e | 23/04/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46439 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 9K | Bolton | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 8L | w/e | 18/03/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46523 | w/e | 17/08/1963 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 8L | w/e | 06/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47367 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 8L | m/e | 12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48301 | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 15A | Leicester Midland | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 8L | w/e | 11/03/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48363 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 8L | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 8E | Northwich |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45147 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 5C | Stafford | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 8L | w/e | 20/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44910 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 8L | w/e | 17/06/1967 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47279 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 12D | Workington | w/e | 04/12/1965 | 8L | w/e | 19/11/1966 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46419 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 22/01/1966 | 8L | m/e | 09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48206 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 12/03/1966 | 8L | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48650 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 5E | Nuneaton | w/e | 12/03/1966 | 8L | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 8E | Northwich |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44659 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 40E | Colwick | w/e | 30/04/1966 | 8L | w/e | 17/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47444 | w/e | 21/01/1961 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 07/05/1966 | 8L | w/e | 26/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48412 | w/e | 27/02/1965 | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | w/e | 23/07/1966 | 8L | w/e | 20/08/1966 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75026 | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 8K | Bank Hall | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 8L | w/e | 19/11/1966 | 10G | Skipton |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75027 | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 8K | Bank Hall | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 8L | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 10G | Skipton |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41244 | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 8K | Bank Hall | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 8L | w/e | 19/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41304 | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 8K | Bank Hall | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 8L | w/e | 19/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44809 | w/e | 18/06/1966 | 8K | Bank Hall | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 8L | w/e | 17/06/1967 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44816 | w/e | 30/04/1966 | 8K | Bank Hall | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 8L | w/e | 17/06/1967 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45055 | w/e | 18/06/1966 | 8K | Bank Hall | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 8L | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48600 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 16B | Colwick | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 8L | w/e | 26/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44858 | w/e | 27/08/1966 | 16B | Colwick | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 8L | w/e | 17/06/1967 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48315 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 40E | Colwick | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 8L | w/e | 17/06/1967 | 9F | Heaton Mersey |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48212 | w/e | 18/12/1965 | 40E | Colwick | w/e | 04/02/1967 | 8L | w/e | 29/04/1967 | 8E | Northwich |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48279 | w/e | 17/12/1966 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 18/02/1967 | 8L | w/e | 17/06/1967 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75020 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 6D | Shrewsbury | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 8L | w/e | 17/06/1967 | 10A | Carnforth |