Depot: Carlisle Canal
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Carlisle Canal | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2254 | m/e | 12/1919 (New) | CAR | on | 29/03/1939 | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2257 | m/e | 02/1920 (New) | CAR | on | 30/03/1939 | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2259 | m/e | 02/1920 (New) | CAR | on | 23/03/1939 | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2268 | m/e | 03/1920 (New) | CAR | m/e | 12/1924 | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2271 | m/e | 04/1920 (New) | CAR | on | 01/07/1924 | BLA | Blaydon | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2281 | m/e | 06/1920 (New) | CAR | on | 01/07/1924 | BLA | Blaydon | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 763 | y/e | 1924 | CAR | w/e | 10/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2745 | on | 24/10/1928 | HAY | Haymarket | on | 26/10/1928 | CAR | on | 30/05/1948 | GHD | Gateshead |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 4480 | on | 16/07/1927 | DON | Doncaster | on | 18/12/1928 | CAR | on | 05/04/1929 | KX | Kings Cross |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2749 | on | 26/01/1929 | DON | Doncaster (New) | on | 06/02/1929 | CAR | on | 10/04/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2748 | on | 13/02/1929 | KX | Kings Cross | on | 05/04/1929 | CAR | on | 29/12/1947 | HAY | Haymarket |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2739 | on | 03/07/1929 (New) | CAR | m/e | 01/1935 | STM | St Margarets | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2740 | on | 09/07/1929 (New) | CAR | on | 11/11/1931 | EFD | Eastfield | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2740 | on | 11/11/1931 | EFD | Eastfield | on | 01/02/1933 | CAR | on | 01/05/1947 | IPS | Ipswich |
Steam | D31 | 4-4-0 | 9213 | m/e | 11/1935 | CAR | m/e | 03/1939 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1875 | on | 05/05/1937 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 28/05/1937 | CAR | on | 08/11/1958 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1880 | on | 19/05/1937 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 19/06/1937 | CAR | on | 27/05/1941 | EFD | Eastfield |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1894 | on | 28/05/1937 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 21/06/1937 | CAR | on | 03/07/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1808 | on | 31/03/1938 (New) | CAR | on | 22/03/1948 | STM | St Margarets | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1835 | on | 08/04/1938 (New) | CAR | on | 01/01/1941 | SEL | Selby | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1862 | on | 12/04/1938 (New) | CAR | on | 11/04/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1863 | on | 13/04/1938 (New) | CAR | m/e | 06/1941 | EFD | Eastfield | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1896 | on | 21/04/1938 (New) | CAR | on | 20/10/1940 | CON | Consett | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1942 | on | 03/06/1938 (New) | CAR | on | 12/09/1938 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1259 | on | 19/03/1936 | MAR | March | on | 08/06/1938 | CAR | on | 05/09/1938 | MAR | March |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4853 | on | 07/10/1939 (New) | CAR | m/e | 11/1939 | STM | St Margarets | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6370 | on | 20/08/1924 | 29B | Stirling | on | 27/10/1939 | CAR | on | 02/11/1939 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2735 | on | 29/02/1940 | SEL | Selby | on | 01/10/1940 | CAR | on | 07/03/1947 | STR | Stratford |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2736 | on | 08/07/1939 | CON | Consett | on | 19/10/1940 | CAR | on | 22/04/1947 | STR | Stratford |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 2565 | on | 28/03/1937 | EFD | Eastfield | on | 19/11/1940 | CAR | on | 12/02/1941 | HAY | Haymarket |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 2564 | on | 15/02/1937 | EFD | Eastfield | on | 20/11/1940 | CAR | on | 01/12/1941 | HAY | Haymarket |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 2567 | on | 02/02/1940 | EFD | Eastfield | on | 20/11/1940 | CAR | on | 27/08/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2747 | on | 16/03/1939 | HAY | Haymarket | on | 23/01/1941 | CAR | w/e | 28/04/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2977 | on | 13/04/1943 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | on | 12/12/1943 | CAR | on | 24/03/1947 | IPS | Ipswich |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2731 | on | 17/04/1943 | STM | St Margarets | on | 05/03/1945 | CAR | on | 15/07/1946 | THJ | Thornton Junction |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2732 | on | 17/04/1943 | STM | St Margarets | on | 20/08/1945 | CAR | on | 28/03/1947 | IPS | Ipswich |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2733 | on | 17/04/1943 | STM | St Margarets | on | 20/08/1945 | CAR | on | 18/06/1947 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2737 | on | 26/06/1929 | STM | St Margarets (New) | on | 20/08/1945 | CAR | on | 28/09/1947 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 3085 | on | 17/03/1941 | STM | St Margarets (New) | on | 20/08/1945 | CAR | on | 16/10/1947 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2979 | on | 12/12/1943 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | on | 15/06/1946 | CAR | on | 24/09/1947 | STR | Stratford |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2980 | on | 12/12/1943 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | on | 15/06/1946 | CAR | on | 15/04/1947 | IPS | Ipswich |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2734 | on | 07/11/1933 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | on | 15/07/1946 | CAR | on | 20/03/1947 | PKS | Parkeston Quay |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4888 | on | 03/07/1943 | PKS | Parkeston Quay | on | 17/03/1947 | CAR | w/e | 27/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4875 | on | 13/09/1935 | STR | Stratford | on | 20/03/1947 | CAR | on | 08/11/1958 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4912 | on | 06/10/1946 | LOW | Lowestoft | on | 24/03/1947 | CAR | on | 05/12/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4895 | on | 29/07/1946 | IPS | Ipswich | on | 28/03/1947 | CAR | w/e | 27/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4964 | on | 01/02/1940 | IPS | Ipswich | on | 08/04/1947 | CAR | on | 24/04/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4880 | on | 29/10/1941 | IPS | Ipswich | on | 13/04/1947 | CAR | on | 20/12/1960 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4899 | on | 21/01/1937 | STR | Stratford | on | 15/04/1947 | CAR | w/e | 27/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4986 | on | 10/02/1947 | STM | St Margarets | on | 21/04/1947 | CAR | on | 22/03/1948 | STM | St Margarets |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4892 | on | 07/11/1946 | IPS | Ipswich | on | 10/06/1947 | CAR | on | 12/05/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1219 | on | 09/08/1947 (New) | CAR | on | 20/05/1953 | SR | To Southern Region | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1217 | on | 11/08/1947 (New) | CAR | on | 21/03/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1222 | on | 11/08/1947 (New) | CAR | on | 18/01/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1221 | on | 16/08/1947 (New) | CAR | on | 10/10/1947 | HAY | Haymarket | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4877 | on | 13/06/1943 | STR | Stratford | on | 18/09/1947 | CAR | w/e | 27/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4963 | on | 25/05/1943 | STR | Stratford | on | 20/09/1947 | CAR | on | 22/03/1948 | STM | St Margarets |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4884 | on | 25/09/1944 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | on | 23/09/1947 | CAR | w/e | 24/03/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | 7458 | on | 01/01/1948 | CAR | on | 16/03/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | 7474 | on | 01/01/1948 | CAR | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 65A | Eastfield | ||||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | 7481 | on | 01/01/1948 | CAR | w/e | 03/02/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D31 | 4-4-0 | 2059 | on | 01/01/1948 | CAR | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 51G | Haverton Hill | ||||
Steam | D31 | 4-4-0 | 2060 | on | 01/01/1948 | CAR | on | 28/02/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2730 | on | 01/01/1948 | CAR | on | 17/09/1950 | 50D | Starbeck | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62731 | on | 01/01/1948 | CAR | on | 17/09/1950 | 50D | Starbeck | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62732 | on | 01/01/1948 | CAR | on | 17/09/1950 | 50D | Starbeck | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62734 | on | 01/01/1948 | CAR | on | 17/09/1950 | 50D | Starbeck | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62735 | on | 01/01/1948 | CAR | on | 17/09/1950 | 50D | Starbeck | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4478 | S | 01/1936 | TWD | Tweedmouth | on | 01/01/1948 | CAR | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 62A | Thornton Junction |
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4499 | on | 01/01/1948 | CAR | w/e | 27/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4511 | on | 01/01/1948 | CAR | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 66A | Polmadie | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4526 | on | 01/01/1948 | CAR | w/e | 22/03/1958 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 5216 | m/e | 09/1939 | ? | on | 01/01/1948 | CAR | 8w/e | 22/12/1956 | 66A | Polmadie | |
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 5293 | on | 01/01/1948 | CAR | w/e | 10/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 5304 | on | 01/01/1948 | CAR | 8w/e | 22/12/1956 | 66A | Polmadie | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 5312 | S | 01/1936 | Twd | Reedsmouth | on | 01/01/1948 | CAR | w/e | 10/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 8499 | on | 01/01/1948 | CAR | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1851 | m/e | 11/1935 | DON | Doncaster | on | 01/01/1948 | CAR | w/e | 04/07/1959 | 31B | March |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1854 | on | 01/01/1948 | CAR | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1858 | on | 01/01/1948 | CAR | on | 26/04/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1882 | on | 01/01/1948 | CAR | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 2F | Woodford Halse | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1898 | on | 01/01/1948 | CAR | on | 07/02/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1936 | on | 01/01/1948 | CAR | w/e | 25/11/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1937 | on | 01/01/1948 | CAR | w/e | 04/07/1959 | 31B | March | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 9139 | on | 01/01/1948 | CAR | w/e | 26/04/1958 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 9155 | on | 01/01/1948 | CAR | w/e | 08/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 9185 | on | 01/01/1948 | CAR | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 65A | Eastfield | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 9174 | on | 01/01/1948 | CAR | on | 15/11/1958 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 9197 | on | 01/01/1948 | CAR | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 65A | Eastfield | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 9215 | on | 01/01/1948 | CAR | w/e | 28/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 9218 | on | 01/01/1948 | CAR | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 65A | Eastfield | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 3063 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | CAR | on | 13/08/1950 | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77089 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | CAR | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 24A | Accrington | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 3126 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | CAR | on | 13/08/1950 | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60079 | on | 28/05/1945 | GHD | Gateshead | on | 30/05/1948 | CAR | on | 11/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63180 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | CAR | on | 13/08/1950 | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45096 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 01/10/1949 | CAR | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 10B | Preston |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45454 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 01/10/1949 | CAR | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45014 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 08/10/1949 | CAR | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48074 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 16B | Spital Bridge | on | 13/08/1950 | 12B | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 12B | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48074 | on | 13/08/1950 | 12B | Carlisle Canal | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 12B | w/e | 16/09/1950 | 12B | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48323 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 16B | Spital Bridge | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 12B | w/e | 16/09/1950 | 12B | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48544 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 16B | Spital Bridge | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 12B | w/e | 16/09/1950 | 12B | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48074 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 12B | Carlisle Canal | w/e | 16/09/1950 | 12B | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48323 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 12B | Carlisle Canal | w/e | 16/09/1950 | 12B | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 8D | Widnes |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48544 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 12B | Carlisle Canal | w/e | 16/09/1950 | 12B | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 4A | Bletchley |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12084 | w/e | 09/12/1950 (New) | 12B | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12085 | on | 31/12/1950 (New) | 12B | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12086 | on | 31/12/1950 (New) | 12B | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12087 | on | 31/12/1950 (New) | 12B | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64727 | on | 18/10/1949 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | on | 07/01/1951 | 12B | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 12B | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64733 | on | 22/05/1950 | 9F | Heaton Mersey | on | 07/01/1951 | 12B | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 12B | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64727 | on | 07/01/1951 | 12B | Carlisle Canal | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 12B | on | 08/11/1958 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64733 | on | 07/01/1951 | 12B | Carlisle Canal | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 12B | on | 19/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48708 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 12B | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 12B | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48756 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 4A | Bletchley | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 12B | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 12B | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48758 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 12B | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 12B | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48708 | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 12B | Carlisle Canal | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 12B | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48756 | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 12B | Carlisle Canal | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 12B | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48758 | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 12B | Carlisle Canal | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 12B | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44892 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 10B | Preston | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 12B | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 11A | Carnforth |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45141 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 12B | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 11B | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61916 | on | 01/01/1948 | STM | St Margarets | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 12B | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 12B | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62732 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 50A | York (North) | on | 15/07/1951 | 12B | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 12B | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62734 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 50A | York (North) | on | 15/07/1951 | 12B | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 12B | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62732 | on | 15/07/1951 | 12B | Carlisle Canal | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 12B | w/e | 21/07/1951 | 12B | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62734 | on | 15/07/1951 | 12B | Carlisle Canal | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 12B | w/e | 21/07/1951 | 12B | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62732 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 12B | Carlisle Canal | w/e | 21/07/1951 | 12B | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 12B | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62734 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 12B | Carlisle Canal | w/e | 21/07/1951 | 12B | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 12B | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43139 | on | 27/07/1951 (New) | 12B | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61916 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 12B | Carlisle Canal | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 12B | w/e | 31/12/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12084 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 12B | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12085 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 12B | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12086 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 12B | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62732 | w/e | 21/07/1951 | 12B | Carlisle Canal | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 12B | on | 03/11/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62734 | w/e | 21/07/1951 | 12B | Carlisle Canal | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 12B | on | 04/03/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 64461 | on | 01/01/1948 | STG | Stirling | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 68E | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 65C | Parkhead |
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 64471 | on | 01/01/1948 | STG | Stirling | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 68E | 4w/e | 30/10/1954 | 66A | Polmadie |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61395 | on | 01/02/1952 (New) | 68E | on | 17/06/1962 | 9G | Gorton | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44790 | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 27A | Polmadie | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 68E | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44792 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 66A | Polmadie | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 68E | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61219 | on | 20/05/1953 | SR | To Southern Region | on | 21/06/1953 | 68E | on | 09/12/1957 | 64B | Haymarket |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61239 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | YK | York (North) | on | 20/09/1953 | 68E | on | 17/06/1962 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61290 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | SKN | Stockton | on | 20/09/1953 | 68E | on | 21/03/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60097 | on | 02/07/1950 | 64B | Haymarket | on | 06/01/1954 | 68E | on | 21/02/1954 | 64B | Haymarket |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60037 | on | 15/03/1939 | HAY | Haymarket | on | 07/02/1954 | 68E | on | 08/03/1954 | 64B | Haymarket |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61064 | w/e | 03/09/1949 | EFD | Eastfield | on | 18/05/1955 | 68E | on | 15/07/1962 | 65A | Eastfield |
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 69564 | on | 01/01/1948 | PKD | Parkhead | 8w/e | 31/08/1957 | 68E | w/e | 24/06/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47662 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 5B | Crewe South | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 12C | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 11B | Workington |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46433 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 6K | Rhyl | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 12C | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 11B | Workington |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44157 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 2B | Nuneaton | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 12C | w/e | 31/07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44292 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 2B | Nuneaton | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 12C | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 11B | Workington |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62747 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 12C | on | 04/03/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 65237 | 4w/e | 06/07/1957 | 65A | Eastfield | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 12C | w/e | 10/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13171 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 12C | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61851 | w/e | 04/07/1959 | 31B | March | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 12C | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 2F | Woodford Halse |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61937 | w/e | 04/07/1959 | 31B | March | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 12C | on | 12/03/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60035 | on | 04/04/1937 | HAY | Haymarket | on | 23/04/1961 | 12C | on | 28/08/1961 | 64B | Haymarket |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60057 | on | 24/04/1943 | HAY | Haymarket | on | 23/04/1961 | 12C | on | 15/05/1961 | 64B | Haymarket |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42317 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 12C | w/e | 04/11/1961 | 12H | Tebay |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42440 | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 13/05/1961 | 12C | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42449 | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 13/05/1961 | 12C | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 24L | Carnforth |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42210 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 12C | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42081 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 12C | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61242 | on | 28/01/1957 | 61A | Kittybrewster | on | 17/06/1961 | 12C | on | 17/09/1961 | 64A | St Margarets |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61324 | on | 01/06/1948 | KIT | Kittybrewster (New) | on | 17/06/1961 | 12C | on | 23/08/1961 | 64C | Dalry Road |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42067 | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 22/07/1961 | 12C | w/e | 23/02/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42095 | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 1C | Watford | w/e | 22/07/1961 | 12C | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 12H | Tebay |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70016 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | on | 10/09/1961 | 12C | w/e | 19/05/1962 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70018 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | on | 10/09/1961 | 12C | w/e | 19/05/1962 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43045 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 12D | Kirkby Stephen | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 12C | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42720 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 17/02/1962 | 12C | w/e | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42752 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 17/02/1962 | 12C | w/e | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5100 | on | 25/06/1960 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 12C | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5133 | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 26/05/1962 | 12C | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42835 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 02/06/1962 | 12C | w/e | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42836 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 02/06/1962 | 12C | w/e | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42098 | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 12G | Oxenholme | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 12C | w/e | 23/02/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61064 | on | 15/07/1962 | 65A | Eastfield | on | 12/08/1962 | 12C | on | 15/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45100 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 12C | m/e | 10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47520 | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 24L | Carnforth | w/e | 08/09/1962 | 12C | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47383 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 12C | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47388 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 12C | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43000 | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 12C | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43028 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 12C | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42447 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 12C | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 12E | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42634 | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 12C | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 12E | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45195 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 12C | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45218 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 27C | Southport | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 12C | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45103 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 12C | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70020 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 12C | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45105 | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 27C | Southport | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 12C | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42238 | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 24L | Carnforth | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 12C | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 24L | Carnforth |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42187 | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 12C | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 24C | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42278 | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 12H | Tebay | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 12C | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 12E | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70004 | w/e | 28/04/1962 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 12C | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |