Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 17 Today
» 772 Yesterday
» 3439 Week
» 15217 Month
» 304609 Year
» 815711 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Carlisle Kingmoor


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Carlisle Kingmoor Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 13254 06/12/1933 10C (New) w/e 01/06/1935 12A w/e 13/07/1935 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2948 w/e 26/10/1935 8A Edge Hill w/e 28/12/1935 12A w/e 22/01/1938 8C Speke Junction
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2953 w/e 13/07/1935 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 01/06/1936 12A w/e 22/01/1938 8C Speke Junction
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8069       4w/e 22/06/1946 12A 01/01/1948 15B Kettering
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8078       4w/e 22/06/1946 12A 01/01/1948 20C Royston
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8079       4w/e 22/06/1946 12A 01/01/1948 20C Royston
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8080       4w/e 22/06/1946 12A 01/01/1948 20C Royston
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8085       4w/e 22/06/1946 12A 01/01/1948 20C Royston
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8088       4w/e 22/06/1946 12A 01/01/1948 16D Mansfield
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8093       4w/e 22/06/1946 12A 01/01/1948 21A Saltley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8158       4w/e 22/06/1946 12A 01/01/1948 16A Nottingham
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8159       4w/e 22/06/1946 12A 01/01/1948 20D Normanton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8164       4w/e 22/06/1946 12A 01/01/1948 20D Normanton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8165       4w/e 22/06/1946 12A 01/01/1948 4A Shrewsbury
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8336       4w/e 22/06/1946 12A 01/01/1948 21A Saltley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8337       4w/e 22/06/1946 12A 01/01/1948 21A Saltley
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 16340       4w/e 22/06/1946 12A 01/01/1948 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 7111       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 02/12/1950 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 7112       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 02/12/1950 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 7113       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 02/12/1950 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 7114       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 02/12/1950 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 7115       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 02/12/1950 91M To London Midland Region
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2742       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 26/01/1952 67C Ayr
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2743       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 26/01/1952 67B Hurlford
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2744       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 16/07/1949 67A Corkerhill
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2745       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 16/07/1949 67A Corkerhill
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2746       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 11/04/1959 66C Hamilton (West)
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2748       01/01/1948 12A w/e 11/07/1959 17C Rowsley
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2749       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 26/01/1952 68C Stranraer
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2751       01/01/1948 12A w/e 21/07/1962 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2752       01/01/1948 12A w/e 17/02/1962 12C Carlisle Canal
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2780       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 12/06/1954 65F Grangemouth
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2802       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 12/06/1954 65F Grangemouth
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2803       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 12/06/1954 65F Grangemouth
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2830       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 29/10/1955 68A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2831       01/01/1948 12A w/e 29/12/1962 9G Gorton
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2832       01/01/1948 12A w/e 20/04/1963 24F Fleetwood
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2833       01/01/1948 12A w/e 06/01/1962 24J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2834       01/01/1948 12A w/e 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42835       01/01/1948 12A w/e 02/06/1962 12C Carlisle Canal
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2836       01/01/1948 12A w/e 02/06/1962 12C Carlisle Canal
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2837       01/01/1948 12A w/e 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2875       01/01/1948 12A w/e 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2876       01/01/1948 12A w/e 17/06/1961 24J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2877       01/01/1948 12A w/e 09/01/1960 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2878       01/01/1948 12A 8w/e 21/03/1953 62A Thornton Junction
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2880       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 21/10/1961 67B Hurlford
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2881       01/01/1948 12A w/e 17/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2882       01/01/1948 12A w/e 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2883       01/01/1948 12A w/e 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2884       01/01/1948 12A w/e 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2905       01/01/1948 12A w/e 13/04/1963 26B Agecroft
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2906       01/01/1948 12A w/e 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2907       01/01/1948 12A w/e 22/06/1963 24D Lower Darwen
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 5564       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 06/09/1952 17A Derby
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 5577       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 06/09/1952 22A Bristol Barrow Road
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 5579       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 06/09/1952 14B Kentish Town
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 5580       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 06/09/1952 24E Blackpool Central
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 5581       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 04/10/1952 25G Farnley Junction
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 5582       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 06/09/1952 10B Preston
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 5713       01/01/1948 12A w/e 21/07/1962 27A Bank Hall
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 5714       01/01/1948 12A w/e 16/09/1961 24L Carnforth
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 5715       01/01/1948 12A w/e 21/07/1962 27A Bank Hall
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 5716       01/01/1948 12A w/e 28/10/1961 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 5727       01/01/1948 12A 8w/e 21/03/1953 63A Perth South
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 5728       01/01/1948 12A w/e 26/08/1961 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 5729       01/01/1948 12A w/e 21/07/1962 26B Agecroft
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 5730       01/01/1948 12A w/e 16/09/1961 24L Carnforth
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 5731       01/01/1948 12A w/e 02/09/1961 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 5732       01/01/1948 12A w/e 10/03/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam 2P 4-4-0 602       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 07/08/1954 67A Corkerhill
Steam 2P 4-4-0 613       01/01/1948 12A w/e 18/07/1959 68C Stranraer
Steam 2P 4-4-0 615       01/01/1948 12A w/e 18/07/1959 68C Stranraer
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3868       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 19/05/1951 68B Dumfries
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3902       01/01/1948 12A w/e 02/06/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3922       01/01/1948 12A 15/07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3973       01/01/1948 12A w/e 24/01/1959 3E Monument Lane
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3996       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 25/11/1950 67B Hurlford
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4001       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 25/11/1950 67B Hurlford
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4008       01/01/1948 12A m/e 09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4009       01/01/1948 12A m/e 06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4016       01/01/1948 12A w/e 29/11/1958 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4181       01/01/1948 12A w/e 02/11/1963 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4183       01/01/1948 12A m/e 10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4189       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 26/11/1955 68B Dumfries
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4199       01/01/1948 12A 8w/e 22/12/1956 65B St Rollox (Balornock)
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4315       01/01/1948 12A w/e 18/04/1959 2A Rugby
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4324       01/01/1948 12A w/e 11/11/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4326       01/01/1948 12A w/e 29/11/1958 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1129       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 03/10/1953 68C Stranraer
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1139       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 11/07/1953 67A Corkerhill
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1140       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 06/10/1951 22A Bristol Barrow Road
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1141       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 07/08/1954 67A Corkerhill
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1142       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 13/06/1953 67A Corkerhill
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1143       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 06/10/1951 17A Derby
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1146       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 07/08/1954 67A Corkerhill
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56231       01/01/1948 12A m/e 02/1956 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56235       01/01/1948 12A m/e 11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56248       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 13/06/1953 66A Polmadie
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56266       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 13/06/1953 66A Polmadie
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56310       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 16/03/1957 68B Dumfries
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56316       01/01/1948 12A m/e 10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56317       01/01/1948 12A m/e 05/1956 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56327       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 13/06/1953 65D Dawsholm
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56332       01/01/1948 12A m/e 10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56333       01/01/1948 12A m/e 10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56340 4w/e 22/06/1946 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 01/01/1948 12A m/e 10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56354       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 13/06/1953 66B Motherwell
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56355       01/01/1948 12A m/e 11/1956 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56373       01/01/1948 12A m/e 10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56374       01/01/1948 12A m/e 10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-2T 56905       01/01/1948 12A 17/04/1948 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 57592       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 19/01/1963 66E Carstairs
Steam 3F 0-6-0 57605       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 21/11/1959 60C Helmsdale
Steam 3F 0-6-0 57626       01/01/1948 12A w/e 05/03/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4795       01/01/1948 12A m/e 07/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4877       01/01/1948 12A w/e 26/05/1962 24J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4878       01/01/1948 12A w/e 06/01/1968 10D Lostock Hall
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4879       01/01/1948 12A 5w/e 30/04/1966 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4882       01/01/1948 12A w/e 17/06/1961 12E Barrow in Furness
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4883       01/01/1948 12A m/e 07/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4884       01/01/1948 12A w/e 22/06/1963 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4886       01/01/1948 12A m/e 10/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4898       01/01/1948 12A m/e 10/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4899       01/01/1948 12A w/e 06/01/1968 10F Rose Grove
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4900       01/01/1948 12A m/e 06/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4901       01/01/1948 12A m/e 08/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4902       01/01/1948 12A m/e 10/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4903       01/01/1948 12A w/e 18/06/1966 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4993       01/01/1948 12A m/e 12/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4994       01/01/1948 12A 8w/e 19/04/1952 64C Dalry Road
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5005       01/01/1948 12A 5w/e 03/01/1953 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5006       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 12/07/1952 6J Holyhead
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5009 4w/e 22/06/1946 29A Perth South 01/01/1948 12A 22/11/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5013       01/01/1948 12A 8w/e 09/09/1951 68A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5014       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 27/01/1951 9A Longsight
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5015       01/01/1948 12A 2w/e 17/06/1950 3E Monument Lane
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5017       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 24/02/1951 2A Rugby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5022       01/01/1948 12A m/e 09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5023       01/01/1948 12A 5w/e 24/03/1951 66A Polmadie
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5081       01/01/1948 12A w/e 10/03/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5082       01/01/1948 12A w/e 04/08/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5083       01/01/1948 12A w/e 04/08/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5084       01/01/1948 12A 8w/e 19/04/1952 63B Stirling
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5096       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 16/06/1951 10B Preston
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5100       01/01/1948 12A w/e 18/08/1962 12C Carlisle Canal
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5118       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 29/12/1951 68A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5119       01/01/1948 12A 8w/e 09/09/1951 67A Corkerhill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5126       01/01/1948 12A m/e 05/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5127       01/01/1948 12A 8w/e 09/09/1951 64C Dalry Road
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5151       01/01/1948 12A 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5152       01/01/1948 12A 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5169       01/01/1948 12A 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5241       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 09/09/1950 7A Llandudno Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5266       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 17/05/1952 67B Hurlford
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5363       01/01/1948 12A m/e 10/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5364       01/01/1948 12A w/e 11/04/1961 12F Workington
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5429       01/01/1948 12A 5w/e 16/07/1949 3B Bushbury
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5432       01/01/1948 12A 5w/e 30/04/1966 67C Ayr
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5443       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 08/06/1963 65F Grangemouth
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5454       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 16/06/1951 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5455       01/01/1948 12A m/e 08/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5482       01/01/1948 12A 4w/e 08/04/1961 65F Grangemouth
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 77313       4w/e 16/07/1949 12A m/e 09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 77424       4w/e 16/07/1949 12A 5w/e 16/02/1952 31B March
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 3143       4w/e 16/07/1949 12A 4w/e 03/10/1953 64A St Margarets
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 3184       4w/e 16/07/1949 12A 4w/e 23/09/1950 66B Motherwell
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 63192       4w/e 16/07/1949 12A 4w/e 24/12/1955 62A Thornton Junction
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90585       4w/e 25/11/1950 68A 4w/e 31/08/1951 91W To Western Region / GWR
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90505 4w/e 23/09/1950 66B Motherwell 4w/e 25/11/1950 68A 4w/e 26/01/1952 67C Ayr
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12079       30/11/1950 (New) 68A w/e 15/04/1967 12D Workington
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12080       30/11/1950 (New) 68A 24/04/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12081       30/11/1950 (New) 68A 4w/e 24/03/1951 12A Carlisle Upperby
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12082       30/11/1950 (New) 68A 4w/e 24/03/1951 12A Carlisle Upperby
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12083       30/11/1950 (New) 68A 4w/e 24/03/1951 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam 3F 0-6-0 57563 01/01/1948 12G Dumfries 4w/e 19/05/1951 68A 8w/e 19/04/1952 66A Polmadie
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44703       4w/e 19/05/1951 68A 4w/e 06/08/1955 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45013 01/01/1948 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 8w/e 09/09/1951 68A 8w/e 19/04/1952 65F Grangemouth
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45011 01/01/1948 29A Perth South 4w/e 29/12/1951 68A 8w/e 19/04/1952 65F Grangemouth
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45118 01/01/1948 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 29/12/1951 68A w/e 18/05/1963 27B Aintree
Steam Clan 4-6-2 72004       02/1952 (New) 68A 4w/e 21/11/1959 64A St Margarets
Steam Clan 4-6-2 72005       02/1952 (New) 68A 4w/e 26/10/1957 64B Haymarket
Steam Clan 4-6-2 72006       02/1952 (New) 68A 4w/e 26/10/1957 64B Haymarket
Steam Clan 4-6-2 72007       02/1952 (New) 68A w/e 04/12/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Clan 4-6-2 72008       02/1952 (New) 68A 16/04/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Clan 4-6-2 72009       03/1952 (New) 68A 4w/e 13/09/1958 30A Stratford
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48708 4w/e 16/06/1951 12B Carlisle Canal 4w/e 17/05/1952 68A w/e 27/06/1964 9D Newton Heath
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48756 4w/e 16/06/1951 12B Carlisle Canal 4w/e 17/05/1952 68A w/e 11/07/1964 9D Newton Heath
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90108 4w/e 19/04/1952 36A Doncaster 4w/e 17/05/1952 68A 4w/e 14/06/1952 68A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44921 8w/e 09/09/1951 65A Eastfield 4w/e 17/05/1952 68A 4w/e 12/06/1954 63D Fort William
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45007 8w/e 09/09/1951 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 17/05/1952 68A 4w/e 08/06/1957 64C Dalry Road
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45043 8w/e 09/09/1951 63A Perth South 4w/e 17/05/1952 68A 8w/e 05/09/1953 64A St Margarets
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45112 01/01/1948 7A Llandudno Junction 4w/e 17/05/1952 68A w/e 14/02/1959 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45163 01/01/1948 29A Perth South 4w/e 17/05/1952 68A m/e 05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45334 8w/e 19/04/1952 63A Perth South 4w/e 17/05/1952 68A w/e 25/05/1963 16D Annesley
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90108 4w/e 17/05/1952 68A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 14/06/1952 68A 4w/e 15/11/1952 36A Doncaster
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45524 4w/e 06/10/1951 12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 12/07/1952 68A 4w/e 09/08/1952 5A Crewe North
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45724 4w/e 07/10/1950 5A Crewe North 4w/e 09/08/1952 68A 4w/e 06/09/1952 68A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48758 4w/e 16/06/1951 12B Carlisle Canal 4w/e 09/08/1952 68A w/e 27/06/1964 9D Newton Heath
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44958 01/01/1948 29A Perth South 4w/e 09/08/1952 68A w/e 18/05/1963 27B Aintree
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45330 4w/e 06/10/1951 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 09/08/1952 68A w/e 11/05/1963 27B Aintree
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45466 01/01/1948 29A Perth South 4w/e 09/08/1952 68A w/e 14/03/1964 8C Speke Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45491 01/01/1948 30A Corkerhill 4w/e 09/08/1952 68A m/e 07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45724 4w/e 09/08/1952 68A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 06/09/1952 68A 4w/e 09/08/1958 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42177 4w/e 23/12/1950 64D Carstairs 4w/e 06/09/1952 68A w/e 19/10/1963 56B Ardsley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45013 8w/e 19/04/1952 65F Grangemouth 4w/e 06/09/1952 68A w/e 06/01/1968 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45640 01/01/1948 16A Nottingham 4w/e 04/10/1952 68A 07/03/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45673 4w/e 17/07/1951 10B Preston 4w/e 04/10/1952 68A 8w/e 21/03/1953 63A Perth South
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45679 4w/e 23/02/1952 22A Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 04/10/1952 68A w/e 20/06/1959 5A Crewe North
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45697 01/01/1948 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 04/10/1952 68A w/e 18/08/1962 24E Blackpool Central
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45704 01/01/1948 25G Farnley Junction 4w/e 04/10/1952 68A w/e 20/06/1959 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45012 4w/e 17/06/1950 60A Inverness 4w/e 04/10/1952 68A w/e 10/03/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam WD/10 2-10-0 90763 4w/e 06/09/1952 65F Grangemouth 4w/e 01/11/1952 68A w/e 15/08/1959 6F Bidston
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45018 01/01/1948 28A Motherwell 4w/e 01/11/1952 68A 8w/e 05/09/1953 64A St Margarets
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45122 01/01/1948 32A Inverness 4w/e 01/11/1952 68A m/e 04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45138 01/01/1948 32A Inverness 4w/e 01/11/1952 68A m/e 09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43514 01/01/1948 20D Normanton 4w/e 29/11/1952 68A w/e 15/10/1960 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45120 01/01/1948 28A Motherwell 4w/e 27/12/1952 68A w/e 18/05/1963 27B Aintree
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45481 4w/e 06/09/1952 68C Stranraer 4w/e 27/12/1952 68A m/e 09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45657 4w/e 04/10/1952 63A Perth South 8w/e 21/03/1953 68A w/e 21/07/1962 27A Bank Hall
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45718 4w/e 04/10/1952 63A Perth South 8w/e 21/03/1953 68A w/e 21/07/1962 26B Agecroft
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43241 01/01/1948 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe 4w/e 16/05/1953 68A 20/06/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43301 4w/e 16/06/1951 20E Manningham 4w/e 16/05/1953 68A 25/10/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43351 01/01/1948 20E Manningham 4w/e 16/05/1953 68A 10/12/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43622 01/01/1948 18C Hasland 4w/e 16/05/1953 68A 19/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43636 01/01/1948 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe 4w/e 16/05/1953 68A 12/11/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43678 01/01/1948 20B Stourton 4w/e 16/05/1953 68A 05/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73032       07/1953 (New) 68A 4w/e 03/10/1953 82B St Philips Marsh
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73034       08/1953 (New) 68A 4w/e 03/10/1953 84G Shrewsbury
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73036       08/1953 (New) 68A 4w/e 03/10/1953 84G Shrewsbury
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44848 01/01/1948 20A Holbeck (MR) 8w/e 05/09/1953 68A 4w/e 03/10/1953 19B Sheffield Millhouses
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44790 4w/e 17/05/1952 68E Carlisle Canal 4w/e 03/10/1953 68A m/e 03/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44792 4w/e 17/05/1952 68E Carlisle Canal 4w/e 03/10/1953 68A m/e 09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45018 8w/e 05/09/1953 64A St Margarets 4w/e 03/10/1953 68A w/e 28/07/1962 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45281 01/01/1948 4A Shrewsbury 4w/e 03/10/1953 68A 4w/e 21/02/1959 84G Shrewsbury
Steam WD/10 2-10-0 90774 4w/e 20/02/1954 66C Hamilton (West) 4w/e 15/05/1954 68A 8w/e 16/04/1955 65F Grangemouth
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90049 4w/e 25/11/1950 64A St Margarets 4w/e 12/06/1954 68A 4w/e 27/11/1954 65A Eastfield
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90170       4w/e 12/06/1954 68A w/e 03/09/1960 21B Bescot
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90464 4w/e 03/10/1953 64A St Margarets 4w/e 12/06/1954 68A w/e 17/09/1960 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45691 01/01/1948 27A Polmadie 4w/e 02/10/1954 68A w/e 28/10/1961 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45696 4w/e 04/10/1952 66A Polmadie 4w/e 02/10/1954 68A w/e 20/06/1959 5A Crewe North
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40602 4w/e 07/08/1954 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 30/10/1954 68A 4w/e 29/08/1959 67B Hurlford
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40651 4w/e 13/06/1953 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 30/10/1954 68A 4w/e 29/08/1959 67B Hurlford
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42804 01/01/1948 28B Dalry Road 4w/e 29/10/1955 68A w/e 09/01/1960 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42830 01/01/1948 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 29/10/1955 68A w/e 10/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92023 21/03/1955 99R (New) 4w/e 26/11/1955 68A 4w/e 31/12/1955 15A Wellingborough
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92050 20/08/1955 18A Toton (New) 4w/e 26/11/1955 68A 4w/e 31/12/1955 18A Toton
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40185 4w/e 06/09/1952 68B Dumfries 4w/e 26/11/1955 68A 4w/e 22/02/1958 6H Bangor
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12087 3w/e 24/01/1953 12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 18/02/1956 68A w/e 05/11/1960 21C Bushbury
Steam 3F 0-6-0 57568 01/01/1948 29C Dundee West 4w/e 18/02/1956 68A 4w/e 12/05/1956 68D Beattock
Steam 300 0-6-0 57653 01/01/1948 29C Dundee West 4w/e 18/02/1956 68A m/e 01/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47332 01/01/1948 27A Polmadie 4w/e 17/03/1956 68A w/e 05/05/1962 Withdrawn
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12082 4w/e 24/03/1951 12A Carlisle Upperby w/e 12/05/1956 68A 4w/e 19/05/1956 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47540 01/01/1948 27A Polmadie m/e 09/06/1956 68A m/e 04/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47537 01/01/1948 27A Polmadie 8w/e 22/12/1956 68A m/e 09/1960 Withdrawn
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42749 4w/e 26/01/1952 68C Stranraer 4w/e 21/12/1957 68A 4w/e 27/09/1958 68C Stranraer
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42440 8w/e 05/10/1957 9G Northwich 4w/e 22/03/1958 12A w/e 20/06/1959 11A Barrow in Furness
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42449 8w/e 05/10/1957 9G Northwich 4w/e 22/03/1958 12A w/e 05/03/1960 11C Oxenholme
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42542 4w/e 28/12/1957 9G Northwich 4w/e 22/03/1958 12A w/e 05/03/1960 9A Longsight
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47475 01/01/1948 1A Willesden 4w/e 22/03/1958 12A w/e 17/01/1959 5C Stafford
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47492 4w/e 16/05/1953 1A Willesden 4w/e 22/03/1958 12A m/e 08/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Clan 4-6-2 72005 4w/e 26/10/1957 64B Haymarket 4w/e 19/04/1958 12A 4w/e 10/05/1958 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Clan 4-6-2 72006 4w/e 26/10/1957 64B Haymarket 4w/e 19/04/1958 12A 4w/e 10/05/1958 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47354 01/01/1948 1B Camden 4w/e 19/04/1958 12A w/e 24/01/1959 3A Bescot
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47527 01/01/1948 1B Camden 4w/e 19/04/1958 12A m/e 03/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47667 01/01/1948 1B Camden 4w/e 19/04/1958 12A w/e 02/06/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Clan 4-6-2 72005 4w/e 19/04/1958 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 10/05/1958 12A 01/05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Clan 4-6-2 72006 4w/e 19/04/1958 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 10/05/1958 12A 21/05/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47288 4w/e 11/09/1954 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 14/06/1958 12A w/e 29/11/1958 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47356 01/01/1948 1B Camden 4w/e 14/06/1958 12A w/e 24/01/1959 9A Longsight
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47358 01/01/1948 1B Camden 4w/e 14/06/1958 12A w/e 08/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47342 01/01/1948 1A Willesden 4w/e 12/07/1958 12A w/e 24/01/1959 24L Carnforth
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47349 01/01/1948 13B Devons Road (Bow) 4w/e 12/07/1958 12A w/e 24/01/1959 3A Bescot
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47497 01/01/1948 13B Devons Road (Bow) 4w/e 06/09/1958 12A w/e 22/11/1958 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47515 01/01/1948 13B Devons Road (Bow) 4w/e 06/09/1958 12A m/e 07/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45724 4w/e 09/08/1958 12B Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 04/10/1958 12A w/e 10/03/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Clan 4-6-2 72009 4w/e 13/09/1958 30A Stratford w/e 25/10/1958 12A 28/08/1965 Withdrawn
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12083 4w/e 24/03/1951 12A Carlisle Upperby w/e 29/11/1958 12A 09/10/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3565       05/12/1958 (New) 12A w/e 20/01/1968 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3566       05/12/1958 (New) 12A w/e 14/01/1967 10A Carnforth
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3567       12/12/1958 (New) 12A 10/06/1985 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43240 4w/e 10/08/1957 11A Carnforth w/e 20/06/1959 12A w/e 15/10/1960 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45112 w/e 14/02/1959 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 20/06/1959 12A w/e 18/05/1963 27B Aintree
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45329 4w/e 13/08/1955 12A Carlisle Upperby w/e 20/06/1959 12A w/e 18/06/1960 24J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48729 4w/e 11/08/1956 1A Willesden w/e 15/08/1959 12A w/e 18/06/1960 5B Crewe South
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40602 4w/e 29/08/1959 67B Hurlford w/e 28/11/1959 12A 4w/e 12/03/1960 67A Corkerhill
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40613 w/e 18/07/1959 68C Stranraer w/e 28/11/1959 12A 4w/e 12/03/1960 67A Corkerhill
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40615 w/e 18/07/1959 68C Stranraer w/e 28/11/1959 12A 4w/e 12/03/1960 67A Corkerhill
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40651 4w/e 29/08/1959 67B Hurlford w/e 28/11/1959 12A 4w/e 12/03/1960 67A Corkerhill
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47599 01/01/1948 5D Stoke w/e 27/02/1960 12A w/e 20/05/1961 24J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42304 w/e 11/07/1959 9A Longsight w/e 05/03/1960 12A w/e 08/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42313 01/01/1948 11D Oxenholme w/e 05/03/1960 12A w/e 13/07/1963 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam WD/10 2-10-0 90763 w/e 15/08/1959 6F Bidston w/e 02/07/1960 12A w/e 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43018 w/e 30/04/1960 12D Kirkby Stephen w/e 09/07/1960 12A w/e 23/06/1962 1C Watford
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43023 w/e 30/04/1960 12D Kirkby Stephen w/e 09/07/1960 12A w/e 30/04/1966 10A Carnforth
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43027 w/e 23/04/1960 12D Kirkby Stephen w/e 09/07/1960 12A w/e 24/10/1964 10A Carnforth
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43103 w/e 23/04/1960 12D Kirkby Stephen w/e 09/07/1960 12A w/e 24/10/1964 10A Carnforth
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45593 4w/e 06/10/1951 12A Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/09/1960 12A w/e 04/03/1961 1A Willesden
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45672 4w/e 04/10/1958 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/09/1960 12A w/e 04/03/1961 1A Willesden
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47471 w/e 18/06/1960 24L Carnforth w/e 17/09/1960 12A m/e 12/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44208 w/e 10/09/1960 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 15/10/1960 12A w/e 09/12/1961 5E Alsager
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44451 w/e 10/09/1960 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 15/10/1960 12A w/e 23/10/1965 12D Workington
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42320 w/e 19/09/1959 11A Barrow in Furness w/e 22/10/1960 12A w/e 17/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42217 w/e 18/06/1960 24L Carnforth w/e 22/10/1960 12A m/e 10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42233 4w/e 06/09/1958 11A Barrow in Furness w/e 22/10/1960 12A w/e 04/02/1961 65C Parkhead
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47281 w/e 27/02/1960 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 05/11/1960 12A w/e 16/03/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Princess Royal 4-6-2 46210 06/07/1958 91X To Scottish Region 04/03/1961 12A 07/10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Princess Royal 4-6-2 46201 05/07/1958 66A Polmadie 11/03/1961 12A 27/01/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Coronation (Semi) 4-6-2 46221 w/e 11/02/1961 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 11/04/1961 12A w/e 07/04/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Coronation (Semi) 4-6-2 46226 4w/e 03/11/1956 12A Carlisle Upperby w/e 11/04/1961 12A m/e 10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Coronation (Semi) 4-6-2 46237 4w/e 14/06/1958 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 11/04/1961 12A w/e 07/04/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Coronation (Semi) 4-6-2 46244 4w/e 14/06/1958 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 11/04/1961 12A m/e 10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Coronation (Semi) 4-6-2 46252 w/e 11/06/1960 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 11/04/1961 12A w/e 22/09/1962 1B Camden
Steam Coronation (Semi) 4-6-2 46255 4w/e 25/02/1956 12A Carlisle Upperby w/e 11/04/1961 12A m/e 10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Coronation (Semi) 4-6-2 46257 4w/e 04/10/1958 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 11/04/1961 12A m/e 10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42301 w/e 22/10/1960 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 29/04/1961 12A 19/10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Coronation (Semi) 4-6-2 46247 01/01/1948 1B Camden w/e 17/06/1961 12A m/e 06/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46166 w/e 10/09/1960 5A Crewe North w/e 24/06/1961 12A w/e 01/07/1961 5A Crewe North
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46129 4w/e 30/11/1957 6J Holyhead w/e 01/07/1961 12A w/e 30/09/1961 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44594 01/01/1948 11B Barrow in Furness w/e 02/09/1961 12A 08/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70019 4w/e 29/12/1956 86C Cardiff Canton w/e 16/09/1961 12A w/e 16/06/1962 9A Longsight
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70020 4w/e 29/12/1956 86C Cardiff Canton w/e 16/09/1961 12A w/e 16/06/1962 9A Longsight
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70022 4w/e 29/12/1956 86C Cardiff Canton w/e 16/09/1961 12A w/e 16/06/1962 9A Longsight
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70023 4w/e 30/09/1951 81A Old Oak Common w/e 16/09/1961 12A w/e 16/06/1962 9A Longsight
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70046 w/e 09/09/1961 1A Willesden w/e 16/09/1961 12A w/e 14/10/1961 1A Willesden
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70047 w/e 17/06/1961 1A Willesden w/e 23/09/1961 12A w/e 14/10/1961 1A Willesden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42233 4w/e 11/02/1961 65C Parkhead w/e 11/11/1961 12A w/e 26/05/1962 2E Northampton
Diesel 09 0-6-0 D4106       13/11/1961 (New) 12A w/e 20/04/1963 2A Rugby
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44305 w/e 18/06/1960 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 25/11/1961 12A m/e 04/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47615 01/01/1948 6B Mold Junction w/e 10/02/1962 12A w/e 24/03/1962 5B Crewe South
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47669 w/e 17/09/1960 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 10/02/1962 12A w/e 05/05/1962 6K Rhyl
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45716 w/e 28/10/1961 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 10/03/1962 12A w/e 21/07/1962 26B Agecroft
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45728 w/e 26/08/1961 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 10/03/1962 12A w/e 21/07/1962 26B Agecroft
Steam Princess Royal 4-6-2 46200 27/01/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby 07/04/1962 12A w/e 17/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Princess Royal 4-6-2 46203 27/01/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby 07/04/1962 12A w/e 20/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44060 w/e 10/03/1962 24L Carnforth w/e 16/06/1962 12A m/e 03/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44016 w/e 21/04/1962 24L Carnforth w/e 23/06/1962 12A w/e 21/07/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45588 4w/e 30/11/1957 12A Carlisle Upperby w/e 07/07/1962 12A 01/05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45678 w/e 10/06/1961 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 07/07/1962 12A w/e 25/08/1962 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45680 w/e 10/06/1961 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 07/07/1962 12A w/e 12/01/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45681 w/e 10/06/1961 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 07/07/1962 12A w/e 21/07/1962 24E Blackpool Central
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45688 w/e 07/11/1959 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 07/07/1962 12A w/e 15/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45691 w/e 28/10/1961 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 07/07/1962 12A w/e 21/07/1962 24E Blackpool Central
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45703 w/e 09/07/1960 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 07/07/1962 12A w/e 18/08/1962 24E Blackpool Central
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45731 w/e 02/09/1961 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 07/07/1962 12A w/e 21/07/1962 24E Blackpool Central
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45732 w/e 10/03/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 07/07/1962 12A w/e 21/07/1962 24E Blackpool Central
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45734 w/e 01/10/1960 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 07/07/1962 12A 28/12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45738 w/e 07/11/1959 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 07/07/1962 12A 28/12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45741 w/e 07/11/1959 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 07/07/1962 12A 01/02/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45742 w/e 07/11/1959 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 07/07/1962 12A 01/05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44557 5w/e 19/07/1957 71H Templecombe (S&D) w/e 18/08/1962 12A w/e 15/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43981 4w/e 25/01/1958 6K Rhyl w/e 06/10/1962 12A 07/08/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42369 w/e 23/06/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 13/10/1962 12A w/e 14/03/1964 8M Southport
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44676 w/e 07/01/1961 12E Barrow in Furness w/e 10/11/1962 12A w/e 18/05/1963 27B Aintree
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44677 4w/e 19/05/1951 65B St Rollox (Balornock) w/e 10/11/1962 12A m/e 10/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44802 4w/e 17/05/1958 6J Holyhead w/e 10/11/1962 12A w/e 11/07/1964 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45097 w/e 25/06/1960 24L Carnforth w/e 10/11/1962 12A m/e 06/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45148 w/e 03/03/1962 8A Edge Hill w/e 10/11/1962 12A m/e 12/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45254 w/e 06/01/1962 8A Edge Hill w/e 10/11/1962 12A w/e 06/01/1968 9D Newton Heath
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45421 w/e 23/06/1962 12E Barrow in Furness w/e 10/11/1962 12A w/e 18/07/1964 10C Fleetwood
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47211 w/e 28/07/1962 9G Gorton w/e 19/01/1963 12A w/e 29/06/1963 24C Lostock Hall
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47481 w/e 28/03/1959 24J Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 02/02/1963 12A w/e 30/03/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44386 w/e 10/11/1962 12F Workington w/e 02/02/1963 12A w/e 16/11/1963 10A Carnforth
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3172 w/e 16/09/1961 24C Lostock Hall w/e 23/02/1963 12A 07/05/1972 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44464 4w/e 08/08/1953 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 02/03/1963 12A w/e 16/11/1963 10A Carnforth
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45364 w/e 11/04/1961 12F Workington w/e 09/03/1963 12A m/e 08/1966 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3169 02/09/1955 2A Rugby (New) w/e 06/04/1963 12A 04/07/1982 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47647 w/e 10/11/1962 12F Workington w/e 06/04/1963 12A w/e 22/06/1963 24B Rose Grove
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45210 w/e 17/03/1962 27B Aintree w/e 11/05/1963 12A w/e 01/08/1964 10B Blackpool Central
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44692 w/e 17/03/1962 27B Aintree w/e 18/05/1963 12A w/e 11/07/1964 10D Lostock Hall
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44729 w/e 17/03/1962 27B Aintree w/e 18/05/1963 12A w/e 11/07/1964 10C Fleetwood
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44887 w/e 17/03/1962 27B Aintree w/e 18/05/1963 12A m/e 12/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45061 w/e 17/03/1962 27B Aintree w/e 18/05/1963 12A m/e 11/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45228 w/e 17/03/1962 27B Aintree w/e 18/05/1963 12A m/e 03/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45217 w/e 25/06/1960 16D Annesley w/e 25/05/1963 12A 26/11/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48136 w/e 13/06/1960 SD   w/e 01/06/1963 12A w/e 18/07/1964 9D Newton Heath
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3087 4w/e 01/12/1956 12A Carlisle Upperby w/e 22/06/1963 12A w/e 04/11/1972 9A Longsight
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3170 02/09/1955 12A Carlisle Upperby (New) w/e 22/06/1963 12A 17/07/1983 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3171 w/e 07/11/1959 12C Carlisle Canal w/e 22/06/1963 12A 24/01/1982 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3173 4w/e 25/02/1956 1A Willesden w/e 22/06/1963 12A 19/12/1982 Withdrawn
Diesel 09 0-6-0 D4107 16/11/1961 12B Carlisle Upperby (New) w/e 22/06/1963 12A w/e 30/09/1968 73C Hither Green
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12084 4w/e 08/09/1951 12B Carlisle Canal w/e 22/06/1963 12A w/e 07/12/1968 5A Crewe Diesel
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12085 4w/e 08/09/1951 12B Carlisle Canal w/e 22/06/1963 12A 22/05/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12086 4w/e 08/09/1951 12B Carlisle Canal w/e 22/06/1963 12A w/e 22/01/1966 12C Barrow in Furness
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70004 w/e 25/05/1963 12C Carlisle Canal w/e 22/06/1963 12A w/e 27/07/1963 1A Willesden
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46157 w/e 30/06/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 22/06/1963 12A 04/01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46160 w/e 30/06/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 22/06/1963 12A 01/05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45604 w/e 05/05/1962 24L Carnforth w/e 22/06/1963 12A w/e 14/09/1963 10A Carnforth
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45613 w/e 05/05/1962 24L Carnforth w/e 22/06/1963 12A 12/09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45629 w/e 05/05/1962 24L Carnforth w/e 22/06/1963 12A 01/05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45696 w/e 16/09/1961 24L Carnforth w/e 22/06/1963 12A 18/07/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44282 w/e 15/09/1962 24H Hellifield w/e 22/06/1963 12A m/e 07/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43000 w/e 10/11/1962 12C Carlisle Canal w/e 22/06/1963 12A w/e 27/08/1966 52F Blyth (North)
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43011 w/e 09/07/1960 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 22/06/1963 12A w/e 24/10/1964 10A Carnforth
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43028 w/e 10/11/1962 12C Carlisle Canal w/e 22/06/1963 12A w/e 25/01/1964 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43045 w/e 11/11/1961 12C Carlisle Canal w/e 22/06/1963 12A w/e 31/10/1964 10A Carnforth
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43139 27/07/1951 12B Carlisle Canal (New) w/e 22/06/1963 12A m/e 09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42210 w/e 10/06/1961 12C Carlisle Canal w/e 22/06/1963 12A w/e 27/06/1964 12E Tebay
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44689 w/e 18/05/1963 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 22/06/1963 12A w/e 25/07/1964 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44884 01/01/1948 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 22/06/1963 12A w/e 06/01/1968 9D Newton Heath
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44939 w/e 27/06/1959 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 22/06/1963 12A w/e 27/06/1964 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45012 w/e 10/03/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 22/06/1963 12A w/e 23/04/1966 12C Barrow in Furness
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45028 w/e 10/11/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 22/06/1963 12A m/e 03/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45081 w/e 10/03/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 22/06/1963 12A w/e 27/06/1964 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45082 w/e 04/08/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 22/06/1963 12A m/e 07/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45103 w/e 19/01/1963 12C Carlisle Canal w/e 22/06/1963 12A w/e 13/07/1963 26A Newton Heath
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45105 w/e 26/01/1963 12C Carlisle Canal w/e 22/06/1963 12A m/e 10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45106 8w/e 05/10/1957 12A Carlisle Upperby w/e 22/06/1963 12A w/e 11/07/1964 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45185 4w/e 23/02/1957 12A Carlisle Upperby w/e 22/06/1963 12A w/e 02/10/1965 6D Shrewsbury
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45195 w/e 12/01/1963 12C Carlisle Canal w/e 22/06/1963 12A w/e 13/07/1963 26A Newton Heath
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45218 w/e 12/01/1963 12C Carlisle Canal w/e 22/06/1963 12A w/e 14/03/1964 8P Wigan Central (L&Y)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45236 w/e 07/11/1959 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 22/06/1963 12A m/e 12/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45259 4w/e 10/09/1955 12A Carlisle Upperby w/e 22/06/1963 12A m/e 12/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45286 4w/e 06/10/1956 12A Carlisle Upperby w/e 22/06/1963 12A w/e 01/08/1964 10B Blackpool Central
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45293 01/01/1948 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 22/06/1963 12A m/e 08/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45295 w/e 23/06/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 22/06/1963 12A m/e 12/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45317 w/e 21/02/1959 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 22/06/1963 12A m/e 11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45323 01/01/1948 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 22/06/1963 12A w/e 14/12/1963 8L Aintree
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45351 w/e 09/07/1960 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 22/06/1963 12A w/e 14/12/1963 9K Bolton
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45451 w/e 07/11/1959 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 22/06/1963 12A w/e 07/12/1963 8L Aintree
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48318 w/e 29/11/1958 8A Edge Hill w/e 29/06/1963 12A w/e 27/06/1964 9D Newton Heath
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48372 w/e 25/10/1958 26A Newton Heath w/e 29/06/1963 12A w/e 27/06/1964 9D Newton Heath
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46110 w/e 29/06/1963 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 06/07/1963 12A 22/02/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48426 4w/e 28/11/1953 9G Northwich w/e 06/07/1963 12A w/e 18/07/1964 9D Newton Heath
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46150 w/e 22/06/1963 1A Willesden w/e 14/09/1963 12A 23/11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45736 w/e 22/06/1963 1A Willesden w/e 14/09/1963 12A w/e 18/07/1964 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45527 w/e 22/06/1963 1A Willesden w/e 14/09/1963 12A w/e 18/07/1964 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46132 w/e 30/06/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 28/09/1963 12A 01/02/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46162 w/e 30/06/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 28/09/1963 12A 30/05/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46166 w/e 26/05/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 28/09/1963 12A 19/09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45118 w/e 22/06/1963 26A Newton Heath w/e 05/10/1963 12A m/e 10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45195 w/e 13/07/1963 26A Newton Heath w/e 05/10/1963 12A m/e 07/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42353 w/e 16/06/1962 6H Bangor w/e 09/11/1963 12A 13/06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42953 w/e 16/01/1963 27B Aintree w/e 09/11/1963 12A w/e 07/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45018 w/e 18/05/1963 26C Bolton w/e 23/11/1963 12A m/e 12/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45112 w/e 18/05/1963 27B Aintree w/e 23/11/1963 12A m/e 10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45120 w/e 18/05/1963 27B Aintree w/e 23/11/1963 12A m/e 06/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48773 20/06/1963 Withdrawn 4w/e 30/11/1963 (R) 12A w/e 25/01/1964 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48774 20/06/1963 Withdrawn 4w/e 30/11/1963 (R) 12A w/e 30/05/1964 8C Speke Junction
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48775 20/06/1963 Withdrawn 4w/e 30/11/1963 (R) 12A w/e 27/06/1964 9D Newton Heath
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70002 w/e 01/07/1961 31B March w/e 07/12/1963 12A 14/01/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70003 w/e 15/07/1961 31B March w/e 07/12/1963 12A 25/03/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70006 w/e 09/12/1961 31B March w/e 07/12/1963 12A 20/05/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70007 w/e 18/11/1961 31B March w/e 07/12/1963 12A 19/06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70008 w/e 16/09/1961 31B March w/e 07/12/1963 12A 14/01/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70009 w/e 16/09/1961 31B March w/e 07/12/1963 12A 21/01/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70011 w/e 16/09/1961 31B March w/e 07/12/1963 12A w/e 06/02/1965 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70013 w/e 16/09/1961 31B March w/e 07/12/1963 12A w/e 06/02/1965 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70035 w/e 22/06/1963 31B March w/e 07/12/1963 12A 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7581 27/12/1963 16A Toton (New) w/e 18/01/1964 12A w/e 01/08/1964 16A Toton
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70037 w/e 07/12/1963 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 25/01/1964 12A 05/11/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70038 w/e 07/12/1963 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 25/01/1964 12A 12/08/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70041 w/e 07/12/1963 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 25/01/1964 12A 15/04/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45635 01/01/1948 26A Newton Heath w/e 08/02/1964 12A 12/09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48397 w/e 06/04/1963 9F Heaton Mersey w/e 22/02/1964 12A w/e 27/06/1964 9D Newton Heath
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70036 w/e 07/12/1963 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 29/02/1964 12A 15/10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70039 w/e 07/12/1963 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 29/02/1964 12A 23/09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70040 w/e 07/12/1963 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 29/02/1964 12A 15/04/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43028 w/e 25/01/1964 9F Heaton Mersey w/e 07/03/1964 12A w/e 13/05/1967 12D Workington
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43036 w/e 22/09/1962 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 07/03/1964 12A w/e 24/10/1964 10A Carnforth
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44041 w/e 11/01/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 04/04/1964 12A m/e 06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47230 w/e 19/10/1963 8A Edge Hill w/e 18/04/1964 12A m/e 11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43004 w/e 22/06/1963 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 02/05/1964 12A w/e 30/04/1966 10A Carnforth
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47236 w/e 06/02/1960 17A Derby w/e 09/05/1964 12A m/e 08/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92023 w/e 03/08/1963 15B Kettering w/e 23/05/1964 12A w/e 10/07/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92024 w/e 18/01/1964 15C Kettering w/e 23/05/1964 12A w/e 24/07/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92130 4w/e 16/06/1957 18A Toton w/e 23/05/1964 12A m/e 05/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43950 w/e 12/05/1962 9G Gorton w/e 23/05/1964 12A w/e 05/12/1964 12D Workington
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43953 w/e 12/05/1962 9G Gorton w/e 23/05/1964 12A w/e 05/12/1964 12D Workington
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92009 w/e 02/05/1964 15C Kettering w/e 13/06/1964 12A 4w/e 08/08/1965 86E Severn Tunnel Junction
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92010 w/e 28/03/1964 9D Newton Heath w/e 27/06/1964 12A m/e 04/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92012 w/e 02/05/1964 15C Kettering w/e 27/06/1964 12A m/e 10/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92015 w/e 22/12/1962 26A Newton Heath w/e 27/06/1964 12A m/e 04/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92017 w/e 22/12/1962 26A Newton Heath w/e 27/06/1964 12A m/e 12/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92019 w/e 18/01/1964 15C Kettering w/e 27/06/1964 12A m/e 06/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92021 w/e 18/01/1964 15C Kettering w/e 27/06/1964 12A w/e 24/07/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92208 w/e 12/10/1963 9D Newton Heath w/e 27/06/1964 12A m/e 10/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92233 w/e 12/10/1963 9D Newton Heath w/e 27/06/1964 12A w/e 06/01/1968 8C Speke Junction
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92249 w/e 12/10/1963 9D Newton Heath w/e 27/06/1964 12A w/e 06/01/1968 8C Speke Junction
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43040 w/e 22/09/1962 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 27/06/1964 12A w/e 27/08/1966 52F Blyth (North)
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47641 w/e 18/04/1964 10A Carnforth w/e 25/07/1964 12A m/e 12/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45574 01/01/1948 24E Blackpool Central w/e 19/09/1964 12A 4w/e 19/06/1965 55A Holbeck (MR)
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45584 w/e 02/05/1964 10B Blackpool Central w/e 19/09/1964 12A 03/10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45736 w/e 18/07/1964 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 19/09/1964 12A 26/09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45527 w/e 18/07/1964 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 19/09/1964 12A 05/12/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45531 w/e 25/07/1964 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 19/09/1964 12A 30/10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70001 w/e 14/12/1963 2J Aston w/e 10/10/1964 12A 03/09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70005 w/e 14/12/1963 2J Aston w/e 10/10/1964 12A 29/07/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70016 w/e 25/05/1963 21D Aston w/e 10/10/1964 12A 19/08/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70022 w/e 23/02/1963 21D Aston w/e 10/10/1964 12A w/e 07/11/1964 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70029 w/e 16/09/1961 21D Aston w/e 10/10/1964 12A w/e 07/11/1964 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70032 w/e 14/01/1961 1A Willesden w/e 10/10/1964 12A w/e 07/11/1964 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70048 w/e 06/04/1963 21D Aston w/e 10/10/1964 12A w/e 07/11/1964 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70049 w/e 21/03/1964 1A Willesden w/e 10/10/1964 12A w/e 07/11/1964 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46140 w/e 22/06/1963 9A Longsight w/e 10/10/1964 12A 30/10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46155 w/e 14/09/1963 5A Crewe North w/e 10/10/1964 12A 12/12/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44674 w/e 22/02/1964 10D Lostock Hall w/e 10/10/1964 12A m/e 12/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44692 w/e 11/07/1964 10D Lostock Hall w/e 10/10/1964 12A m/e 05/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46115 w/e 25/07/1964 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 07/11/1964 12A 01/01/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45512 01/01/1948 5A Crewe North w/e 07/11/1964 12A 27/03/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44689 w/e 25/07/1964 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 07/11/1964 12A m/e 03/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44802 w/e 11/07/1964 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 07/11/1964 12A w/e 06/01/1968 9K Bolton
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44911 w/e 27/06/1964 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 07/11/1964 12A m/e 10/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45106 w/e 11/07/1964 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 07/11/1964 12A m/e 01/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43049 w/e 22/09/1962 9F Heaton Mersey w/e 14/11/1964 12A 05/08/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44767 w/e 17/03/1962 27C Southport w/e 14/11/1964 12A m/e 12/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45135 w/e 17/08/1963 27C Southport w/e 14/11/1964 12A m/e 10/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45337 w/e 24/08/1963 27C Southport w/e 14/11/1964 12A m/e 02/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47616 w/e 01/08/1964 9H Patricroft w/e 12/12/1964 12A m/e 01/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46152 w/e 10/03/1962 6J Holyhead w/e 02/01/1965 12A 17/04/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45530 01/01/1965 Withdrawn w/e 02/01/1965 (R) 12A      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92076 w/e 10/10/1964 9D Newton Heath w/e 09/01/1965 12A m/e 02/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47667 w/e 02/06/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 16/01/1965 12A w/e 17/09/1966 10G Skipton
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45442 w/e 19/12/1964 15E Coalville w/e 13/02/1965 12A m/e 08/1966 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5414 16/01/1965 D15 Leicester Division w/e 27/02/1965 12A w/e 26/06/1965 D15 Leicester Division
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47326 01/01/1948 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 03/04/1965 12A m/e 12/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92110 w/e 26/09/1964 9D Newton Heath w/e 22/05/1965 12A m/e 12/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92114 w/e 26/09/1964 9D Newton Heath w/e 22/05/1965 12A m/e 07/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92161 4w/e 12/07/1958 26A Newton Heath w/e 22/05/1965 12A m/e 12/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43120 w/e 14/12/1963 9F Heaton Mersey w/e 19/06/1965 12A 26/08/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43121 w/e 14/12/1963 9F Heaton Mersey w/e 19/06/1965 12A 18/11/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70010 w/e 29/05/1965 5B Crewe South w/e 26/06/1965 12A 23/09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70033 w/e 29/05/1965 5B Crewe South w/e 26/06/1965 12A 15/07/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44989 w/e 25/05/1963 17B Burton w/e 24/07/1965 12A m/e 02/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45253 w/e 12/09/1964 16F Burton w/e 24/07/1965 12A w/e 06/01/1968 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44809 w/e 24/07/1965 10A Carnforth w/e 07/08/1965 12A w/e 11/09/1965 8M Southport
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45210 w/e 21/11/1964 10F Rose Grove w/e 07/08/1965 12A m/e 04/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44862 w/e 20/06/1964 1A Willesden w/e 21/08/1965 12A m/e 07/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44982 w/e 18/06/1960 24F Fleetwood w/e 18/09/1965 12A m/e 05/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45218 w/e 19/06/1965 10C Fleetwood w/e 18/09/1965 12A m/e 04/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45274 w/e 09/11/1963 10C Fleetwood w/e 18/09/1965 12A m/e 05/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44675 w/e 13/03/1965 10C Fleetwood w/e 25/09/1965 12A m/e 09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45212 w/e 26/06/1965 10A Carnforth w/e 25/09/1965 12A w/e 06/01/1968 10D Lostock Hall
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45437 w/e 21/08/1965 10A Carnforth w/e 25/09/1965 12A m/e 10/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92051 w/e 10/10/1964 9D Newton Heath w/e 04/12/1965 12A m/e 10/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92071 w/e 24/07/1965 9D Newton Heath w/e 04/12/1965 12A m/e 11/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70042 w/e 26/06/1965 6J Holyhead w/e 11/12/1965 12A 13/05/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70045 w/e 02/10/1965 2D Banbury w/e 08/01/1966 12A 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70046 w/e 02/10/1965 2D Banbury w/e 08/01/1966 12A 08/07/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70047 w/e 02/10/1965 2D Banbury w/e 08/01/1966 12A 29/07/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70050 w/e 02/10/1965 2D Banbury w/e 08/01/1966 12A 06/08/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70051 w/e 02/10/1965 2D Banbury w/e 08/01/1966 12A 16/12/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70052 w/e 02/10/1965 2D Banbury w/e 08/01/1966 12A 01/04/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70053 w/e 02/10/1965 2D Banbury w/e 08/01/1966 12A 15/04/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70054 w/e 02/10/1965 2D Banbury w/e 08/01/1966 12A 26/11/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92043 w/e 03/01/1966 16F Burton w/e 15/01/1966 12A m/e 07/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92093 w/e 03/07/1965 16E Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 15/01/1966 12A m/e 09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92096 w/e 25/12/1965 16C Derby w/e 15/01/1966 12A m/e 02/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12086 w/e 22/01/1966 12C Barrow in Furness w/e 29/01/1966 12A w/e 02/07/1966 12C Barrow in Furness
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92075 w/e 03/07/1965 16E Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 02/04/1966 12A m/e 09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70017 w/e 24/07/1965 9D Newton Heath w/e 21/05/1966 12A 01/10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70034 w/e 24/07/1965 9D Newton Heath w/e 21/05/1966 12A 06/05/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70014 w/e 23/04/1966 5B Crewe South w/e 06/08/1966 12A 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92018 w/e 26/09/1964 9D Newton Heath w/e 06/08/1966 12A m/e 04/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92056 w/e 24/10/1964 9D Newton Heath w/e 06/08/1966 12A m/e 11/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92080 w/e 27/06/1964 9D Newton Heath w/e 13/08/1966 12A m/e 05/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70012 w/e 23/04/1966 5B Crewe South w/e 20/08/1966 12A 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43106 w/e 21/09/1963 9F Heaton Mersey w/e 27/08/1966 12A w/e 23/09/1967 10D Lostock Hall
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70023 w/e 23/04/1966 5B Crewe South w/e 17/09/1966 12A 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70025 w/e 23/04/1966 5B Crewe South w/e 17/09/1966 12A 23/12/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70027 w/e 23/04/1966 5B Crewe South w/e 17/09/1966 12A 01/07/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70028 w/e 23/04/1966 5B Crewe South w/e 17/09/1966 12A 16/09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92129 w/e 18/07/1964 2D Banbury w/e 17/09/1966 12A m/e 07/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92004 w/e 30/03/1963 84C Banbury w/e 15/10/1966 12A w/e 06/01/1968 10A Carnforth
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92067 w/e 19/06/1965 2D Banbury w/e 15/10/1966 12A m/e 11/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92213 4w/e 28/11/1959 84C Banbury w/e 15/10/1966 12A m/e 11/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44817 w/e 23/11/1963 9J Agecroft w/e 22/10/1966 12A m/e 08/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44928 w/e 13/01/1962 26B Agecroft w/e 22/10/1966 12A m/e 06/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3200 13/12/1955 66A Polmadie (New) w/e 05/11/1966 12A w/e 04/03/1967 10A Carnforth
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3202 4w/e 16/03/1963 66C Hamilton (West) w/e 05/11/1966 12A w/e 19/11/1966 12D Workington
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3412 5w/e 30/05/1964 66A Polmadie w/e 05/11/1966 12A w/e 26/11/1966 12C Barrow in Furness
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44825 w/e 25/12/1965 40E Colwick w/e 12/11/1966 12A m/e 10/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44936 w/e 19/02/1966 16B Colwick w/e 12/11/1966 12A m/e 08/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92074 w/e 28/05/1966 6C Croes Newydd w/e 10/12/1966 12A m/e 04/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92125 w/e 28/05/1966 6C Croes Newydd w/e 10/12/1966 12A m/e 12/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92137 w/e 06/08/1966 6C Croes Newydd w/e 10/12/1966 12A m/e 09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92223 w/e 12/11/1966 2E Saltley w/e 10/12/1966 12A w/e 06/01/1968 10A Carnforth
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44775 w/e 11/12/1965 6D Shrewsbury w/e 10/12/1966 12A m/e 10/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70011 w/e 06/02/1965 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/12/1966 12A 23/12/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70013 w/e 06/02/1965 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/12/1966 12A w/e 06/01/1968 10A Carnforth
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70018 w/e 05/03/1966 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/12/1966 12A 24/12/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70020 w/e 24/07/1965 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/12/1966 12A 21/01/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70022 w/e 07/11/1964 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/12/1966 12A 23/12/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70024 w/e 20/08/1966 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/12/1966 12A 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70029 w/e 07/11/1964 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/12/1966 12A 21/10/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70031 w/e 24/07/1965 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/12/1966 12A 11/11/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70032 w/e 07/11/1964 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/12/1966 12A m/e 09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70048 w/e 07/11/1964 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/12/1966 12A 06/05/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70049 w/e 07/11/1964 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/12/1966 12A 09/12/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41217 m/e 12/1966 Withdrawn w/e 17/12/1966 (R) 12A      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41222 m/e 12/1966 Withdrawn w/e 17/12/1966 (R) 12A      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41264 m/e 12/1966 Withdrawn w/e 17/12/1966 (R) 12A      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46455 w/e 30/01/1960 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/12/1966 12A m/e 05/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46457 w/e 15/10/1966 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/12/1966 12A m/e 05/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46470 w/e 15/10/1966 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/12/1966 12A m/e 05/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44882 w/e 17/06/1961 12E Barrow in Furness w/e 17/12/1966 12A m/e 07/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44937 w/e 28/07/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/12/1966 12A m/e 05/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45141 4w/e 17/07/1951 11B Barrow in Furness w/e 17/12/1966 12A w/e 28/01/1967 10D Lostock Hall
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45340 w/e 18/09/1965 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/12/1966 12A m/e 04/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45371 4w/e 30/01/1954 12A Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/12/1966 12A w/e 14/01/1967 12D Workington
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45383 01/01/1948 6B Mold Junction w/e 17/12/1966 12A m/e 02/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4156 w/e 03/08/1963 24L Carnforth w/e 14/01/1967 12A w/e 03/08/1974 BW Barrow in Furness
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 D2513 05/10/1961 12E Barrow in Furness (New) w/e 21/01/1967 12A w/e 22/04/1967 12C Barrow in Furness
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 D2514 16/10/1961 12E Barrow in Furness (New) w/e 21/01/1967 12A w/e 22/04/1967 12D Workington
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 D2517 10/11/1961 12E Barrow in Furness (New) w/e 21/01/1967 12A 25/02/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3283 w/e 05/11/1966 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 04/03/1967 12A w/e 03/01/1970 12C Barrow in Furness
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3736 w/e 15/10/1966 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 04/03/1967 12A 2w/e 07/10/1972 9A Longsight
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3740 w/e 15/10/1966 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 04/03/1967 12A w/e 13/01/1973 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3741 w/e 15/10/1966 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 04/03/1967 12A w/e 22/03/1975 EJ Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4157 w/e 03/08/1963 24L Carnforth w/e 04/03/1967 12A w/e 16/11/1968 6A Chester (MR)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44770 w/e 10/12/1966 5D Stoke w/e 11/03/1967 12A m/e 10/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45279 w/e 17/09/1966 6D Shrewsbury w/e 11/03/1967 12A w/e 06/01/1968 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45447 w/e 17/09/1966 6D Shrewsbury w/e 11/03/1967 12A w/e 06/01/1968 10F Rose Grove
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45493 w/e 17/09/1966 6D Shrewsbury w/e 11/03/1967 12A m/e 01/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3580 w/e 25/10/1958 11B Workington w/e 15/04/1967 12A w/e 09/09/1967 10D Lostock Hall
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2253 w/e 04/02/1967 16C Derby w/e 29/04/1967 12A w/e 06/01/1968 8C Speke Junction
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2209 w/e 04/03/1967 16C Derby w/e 20/05/1967 12A w/e 06/01/1968 8C Speke Junction
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2390 w/e 06/08/1966 9A Longsight w/e 03/06/1967 12A w/e 06/01/1968 10A Carnforth
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70004 w/e 29/05/1965 9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 17/06/1967 12A 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70015 w/e 29/05/1965 9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 17/06/1967 12A 05/08/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70021 w/e 21/05/1966 9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 17/06/1967 12A 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92052 w/e 10/10/1964 9D Newton Heath w/e 17/06/1967 12A m/e 08/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44858 w/e 12/11/1966 8L Aintree w/e 17/06/1967 12A m/e 12/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44910 w/e 21/08/1965 8L Aintree w/e 17/06/1967 12A w/e 06/01/1968 9D Newton Heath
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45038 w/e 29/01/1966 5D Stoke w/e 24/06/1967 12A w/e 06/01/1968 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45285 w/e 11/03/1967 5B Crewe South w/e 24/06/1967 12A m/e 12/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92058 w/e 17/06/1967 8C Speke Junction w/e 12/08/1967 12A m/e 11/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92119 w/e 17/06/1967 8C Speke Junction w/e 12/08/1967 12A m/e 09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92139 w/e 10/12/1966 8C Speke Junction w/e 12/08/1967 12A m/e 09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92218 w/e 11/03/1967 8C Speke Junction w/e 12/08/1967 12A w/e 06/01/1968 8C Speke Junction
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8501 w/e 05/10/1963 66A Polmadie w/e 19/08/1967 12A 4w/e 26/08/1967 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8502 06/10/1962 66A Polmadie (New) w/e 19/08/1967 12A 4w/e 26/08/1967 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8503 10/10/1962 66A Polmadie (New) w/e 19/08/1967 12A 4w/e 26/08/1967 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8500 w/e 19/08/1967 66A Polmadie 4w/e 09/1967 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8504 17/10/1962 66A Polmadie (New) w/e 09/09/1967 12A 5w/e 30/09/1967 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8505 17/10/1962 66A Polmadie (New) w/e 09/09/1967 12A 5w/e 30/09/1967 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8506 24/10/1962 66A Polmadie (New) w/e 09/09/1967 12A 5w/e 10/1967 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44759 w/e 15/04/1967 12D Workington w/e 23/09/1967 12A m/e 11/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8506 w/e 09/09/1967 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 5w/e 10/1967 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D247 w/e 16/09/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 07/10/1967 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D249 w/e 16/09/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 07/10/1967 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7550 w/e 23/10/1965 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 07/10/1967 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7551 w/e 09/10/1965 D15 Leicester Division w/e 07/10/1967 12A w/e 06/01/1968 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7553 24/06/1965 D16 Nottingham Division (New) w/e 07/10/1967 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92132 m/e 10/1967 Withdrawn w/e 07/10/1967 (R) 12A      
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8507 30/10/1962 66A Polmadie (New) w/e 14/10/1967 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8508 30/10/1962 66A Polmadie (New) w/e 14/10/1967 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8509 13/11/1962 66A Polmadie (New) w/e 14/10/1967 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8512 07/12/1962 66A Polmadie (New) w/e 14/10/1967 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8514 09/07/1963 66A Polmadie (New) w/e 14/10/1967 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8513 07/12/1962 66A Polmadie (New) w/e 21/10/1967 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43028 w/e 13/05/1967 12D Workington w/e 21/10/1967 12A 02/12/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8515 03/08/1963 66A Polmadie (New) w/e 28/10/1967 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8516 19/04/1963 66A Polmadie (New) w/e 04/11/1967 12A 4w/e 25/11/1967 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D241 w/e 14/10/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 11/11/1967 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D242 w/e 14/10/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 11/11/1967 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D248 w/e 14/10/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 11/11/1967 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7549 w/e 07/10/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 11/11/1967 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7554 w/e 09/09/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 11/11/1967 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7555 w/e 09/09/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 11/11/1967 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7556 w/e 09/09/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 11/11/1967 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8518 19/04/1963 66A Polmadie (New) w/e 11/11/1967 12A m/e 12/1967 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8519 18/07/1963 66A Polmadie (New) w/e 11/11/1967 12A m/e 12/1967 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5152 01/05/1961 51L Thornaby (New) w/e 25/11/1967 12A w/e 06/01/1968 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5153 10/05/1961 51L Thornaby (New) w/e 25/11/1967 12A w/e 06/01/1968 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5154 4w/e 07/10/1967 51L Thornaby w/e 25/11/1967 12A w/e 06/01/1968 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5155 4w/e 07/10/1967 51L Thornaby w/e 25/11/1967 12A w/e 06/01/1968 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8510 13/11/1962 66A Polmadie (New) w/e 25/11/1967 12A m/e 12/1967 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8511 22/11/1962 66A Polmadie (New) w/e 25/11/1967 12A m/e 12/1967 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8517 29/06/1963 66A Polmadie (New) 4w/e 25/11/1967 12A w/e 12/1967 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8510 w/e 25/11/1967 12A Carlisle Kingmoor m/e 12/1967 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8511 w/e 25/11/1967 12A Carlisle Kingmoor m/e 12/1967 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8517 4w/e 25/11/1967 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 12/1967 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8518 w/e 11/11/1967 12A Carlisle Kingmoor m/e 12/1967 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8519 w/e 11/11/1967 12A Carlisle Kingmoor m/e 12/1967 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5151 4w/e 07/10/1967 52A Gateshead w/e 02/12/1967 12A w/e 06/01/1968 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5156 w/e 19/09/1964 51L Thornaby w/e 02/12/1967 12A w/e 06/01/1968 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5248 4w/e 18/06/1966 55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 02/12/1967 12A w/e 06/01/1968 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5249 4w/e 18/06/1966 55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 09/12/1967 12A 4w/e 30/12/1967 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5250 4w/e 18/06/1966 55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 09/12/1967 12A 4w/e 30/12/1967 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5251 4w/e 18/06/1966 55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 09/12/1967 12A 4w/e 30/12/1967 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8520 17/05/1963 66A Polmadie (New) w/e 16/12/1967 12A 5w/e 30/12/1967 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5252 4w/e 18/06/1966 55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 23/12/1967 12A 4w/e 30/12/1967 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5253 4w/e 18/06/1966 55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 23/12/1967 12A 4w/e 30/12/1967 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5254 4w/e 16/07/1966 55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 23/12/1967 12A 4w/e 30/12/1967 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5255 4w/e 16/07/1966 55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 23/12/1967 12A 4w/e 30/12/1967 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5256 4w/e 08/10/1966 55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 23/12/1967 12A 4w/e 30/12/1967 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D243 w/e 16/09/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 06/01/1968 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D244 w/e 16/09/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 06/01/1968 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D267 w/e 25/11/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 06/01/1968 12A w/e 09/03/1968 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D268 w/e 25/11/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 06/01/1968 12A w/e 09/03/1968 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D269 w/e 25/11/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 06/01/1968 12A w/e 09/03/1968 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D289 w/e 09/12/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 06/01/1968 12A w/e 09/03/1968 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D390 4w/e 28/01/1967 56B Healey Mills w/e 06/01/1968 12A w/e 03/08/1968 D08 Liverpool Division
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D391 4w/e 28/01/1967 56B Healey Mills w/e 06/01/1968 12A w/e 03/08/1968 D08 Liverpool Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5204 w/e 02/12/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 06/01/1968 12A w/e 11/05/1968 D05 Stoke Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5205 w/e 02/12/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 06/01/1968 12A w/e 11/05/1968 D05 Stoke Division
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12079 w/e 15/04/1967 12D Workington w/e 06/01/1968 12A 11/09/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12086 w/e 21/01/1967 12D Workington w/e 06/01/1968 12A 31/07/1969 Withdrawn
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8521 23/07/1963 66A Polmadie (New) w/e 13/01/1968 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8522 03/07/1963 66A Polmadie (New) w/e 13/01/1968 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8523 09/07/1963 66A Polmadie (New) w/e 13/01/1968 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8524 16/07/1963 66A Polmadie (New) w/e 13/01/1968 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8525 14/08/1963 66A Polmadie (New) w/e 13/01/1968 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3565 05/12/1958 12A Carlisle Kingmoor (New) w/e 20/01/1968 12A 02/05/1986 Withdrawn
Diesel 28 Co-Bo D5701 w/e 16/10/1965 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/02/1968 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 28 Co-Bo D5702 w/e 16/10/1965 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/02/1968 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 28 Co-Bo D5705 w/e 17/12/1966 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/02/1968 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 28 Co-Bo D5706 w/e 17/12/1966 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/02/1968 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 28 Co-Bo D5707 w/e 17/12/1966 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/02/1968 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 28 Co-Bo D5708 w/e 17/12/1966 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/02/1968 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 28 Co-Bo D5711 w/e 17/12/1966 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/02/1968 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 28 Co-Bo D5712 w/e 17/12/1966 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/02/1968 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 28 Co-Bo D5714 w/e 16/10/1965 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/02/1968 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 28 Co-Bo D5715 w/e 16/10/1965 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/02/1968 12A 04/05/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 28 Co-Bo D5716 w/e 16/10/1965 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/02/1968 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 28 Co-Bo D5717 w/e 17/12/1966 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/02/1968 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 28 Co-Bo D5718 w/e 17/12/1966 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/02/1968 12A 04/05/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 28 Co-Bo D5719 w/e 17/12/1966 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/02/1968 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7671 w/e 22/07/1967 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/02/1968 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7672 w/e 15/07/1967 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/02/1968 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7673 w/e 22/07/1967 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/02/1968 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7674 w/e 22/07/1967 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/02/1968 12A w/e 11/05/1968 9A Longsight
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7675 w/e 15/07/1967 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/02/1968 12A w/e 11/05/1968 9A Longsight
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7676 w/e 15/07/1967 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/02/1968 12A w/e 11/05/1968 9A Longsight
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7677 w/e 22/07/1967 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/02/1968 12A w/e 11/05/1968 9A Longsight
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5208 w/e 03/02/1968 9A Longsight w/e 09/03/1968 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5209 w/e 03/02/1968 9A Longsight w/e 09/03/1968 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5210 w/e 24/02/1968 9A Longsight w/e 09/03/1968 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8526 20/08/1963 66A Polmadie (New) w/e 30/03/1968 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8527 29/08/1963 66A Polmadie (New) w/e 30/03/1968 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8528 23/07/1963 66A Polmadie (New) w/e 30/03/1968 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8529 17/05/1963 66A Polmadie (New) w/e 30/03/1968 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8530 26/04/1963 66A Polmadie (New) w/e 30/03/1968 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8531 08/05/1963 66A Polmadie (New) w/e 30/03/1968 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8532 29/07/1963 66A Polmadie (New) w/e 30/03/1968 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5285 w/e 05/07/1967 D05 Stoke Division w/e 11/05/1968 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5286 w/e 05/07/1967 D05 Stoke Division w/e 11/05/1968 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8533 03/08/1963 66A Polmadie (New) w/e 11/05/1968 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8534 12/06/1963 66A Polmadie (New) w/e 11/05/1968 12A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3534 4w/e 13/04/1963 67C Ayr w/e 08/06/1968 12A 24/07/1988 CL  
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3566 w/e 10/08/1968 12C Barrow in Furness w/e 12/10/1968 12A      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4142 w/e 10/08/1968 12C Barrow in Furness w/e 29/03/1969 12A 24/07/1988 CL  
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3568 w/e 18/07/1964 16C Derby w/e 19/07/1969 12A w/e 03/08/1974 HO Holbeck (MR)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4138 05/07/1962 14A Cricklewood East (New) w/e 27/09/1969 12A w/e 01/11/1969 2E Saltley
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4141 w/e 10/08/1968 12C Barrow in Furness w/e 03/01/1970 12A 24/07/1988 CL  
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3580 w/e 09/09/1967 10D Lostock Hall w/e 15/08/1970 12A 09/08/1985 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3581 w/e 16/09/1961 24C Lostock Hall w/e 10/10/1970 12A 2w/e 10/07/1976 BS Bescot
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3511 w/e 17/05/1969 2E Saltley w/e 24/04/1971 12A 13/03/1986 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3768 w/e 05/09/1959 9A Longsight w/e 08/05/1971 12A 31/05/2004 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3530 w/e 05/11/1966 10D Lostock Hall w/e 18/09/1971 12A 30/09/1996 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3531 w/e 05/11/1966 10D Lostock Hall w/e 18/09/1971 12A w/e 15/12/1973 CD Crewe Diesel
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3784 w/e 06/07/1968 9A Longsight w/e 09/10/1971 12A w/e 08/01/1972 12C Barrow in Furness
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3202 5w/e 01/04/1972 67C Ayr w/e 06/05/1972 12A w/e 13/01/1973 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3283 w/e 03/01/1970 12C Barrow in Furness w/e 06/05/1972 12A 2w/e 05/08/1972 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25190 w/e 06/01/1973 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 12/05/1973 KM w/e 07/09/1974 SP Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25191 w/e 09/10/1971 D08 Liverpool Division w/e 12/05/1973 KM 01/03/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25204 2w/e 08/04/1972 D08 Liverpool Division w/e 12/05/1973 KM 2w/e 10/01/1976 CW Cricklewood East
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25248 w/e 11/11/1972 D09 Manchester Division w/e 12/05/1973 KM 2w/e 10/01/1976 CD Crewe Diesel
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25320 w/e 22/04/1967 D02 Birmingham Division w/e 12/05/1973 KM 11/12/1983 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25321 w/e 08/07/1972 D02 Birmingham Division w/e 12/05/1973 KM 29/09/1986 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25322 w/e 08/07/1972 D02 Birmingham Division w/e 12/05/1973 KM w/e 28/02/1976 CD Crewe Diesel
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3740 w/e 13/01/1973 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 09/06/1973 KM w/e 18/05/1974 DY Derby
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3202 w/e 13/01/1973 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 30/06/1973 KM w/e 06/07/1974 SY Saltley
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D300 w/e 12/05/1973 LO Longsight w/e 11/08/1973 KM w/e 11/05/1974 YK York (North)
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D301 w/e 12/05/1973 LO Longsight w/e 11/08/1973 KM w/e 11/05/1974 HA Haymarket
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D303 w/e 12/05/1973 LO Longsight w/e 11/08/1973 KM w/e 11/05/1974 HA Haymarket
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D304 w/e 12/10/1968 D09 Manchester Division w/e 11/08/1973 KM w/e 12/01/1974 LO Longsight
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D335 w/e 05/02/1972 D08 Liverpool Division w/e 11/08/1973 KM w/e 10/05/1975 LO Longsight
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D336 w/e 05/02/1972 D08 Liverpool Division w/e 11/08/1973 KM w/e 10/05/1975 LO Longsight
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D337 w/e 05/02/1972 D08 Liverpool Division w/e 11/08/1973 KM w/e 10/08/1974 SP Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D338 w/e 09/11/1968 D08 Liverpool Division w/e 11/08/1973 KM w/e 06/07/1974 SP Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D339 17/06/1968 D08 Liverpool Division w/e 11/08/1973 KM w/e 06/07/1974 SP Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D340 w/e 29/08/1970 D08 Liverpool Division w/e 11/08/1973 KM w/e 06/07/1974 SP Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D297 w/e 11/08/1973 LO Longsight 3w/e 06/10/1973 KM 24/06/1983 Withdrawn
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D298 2w/e 10/06/1972 D09 Manchester Division 3w/e 06/10/1973 KM w/e 10/05/1975 LO Longsight
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D299 w/e 11/11/1972 D08 Liverpool Division 3w/e 06/10/1973 KM w/e 10/05/1975 LO Longsight
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08759 w/e 12/05/1973 NH Newton Heath w/e 03/11/1973 KM      
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25086 w/e 25/08/1973 ED Eastfield w/e 10/11/1973 KM 4w/e 01/12/1973 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D295 w/e 11/08/1973 LO Longsight w/e 12/01/1974 KM 14/09/1981 Withdrawn
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40131 w/e 13/10/1973 LO Longsight w/e 12/01/1974 KM w/e 12/04/1975 SP Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25147 w/e 08/12/1973 LO Longsight w/e 12/01/1974 KM w/e 09/03/1974 LO Longsight
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40005 w/e 07/11/1970 D09 Manchester Division w/e 09/02/1974 KM w/e 11/05/1974 HM Healey Mills
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40104 w/e 12/01/1974 LO Longsight w/e 09/02/1974 KM w/e 11/05/1974 SP Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25146 w/e 11/03/1972 D09 Manchester Division w/e 09/03/1974 KM 07/08/1983 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08132 w/e 10/08/1968 12C Barrow in Furness w/e 03/08/1974 KM 2w/e 30/11/1974 CD Crewe Diesel
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08910 w/e 10/08/1968 12C Barrow in Furness w/e 03/08/1974 KM 24/07/1988 CL  
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25196 w/e 09/03/1974 LO Longsight w/e 07/09/1974 KM w/e 09/08/1975 TO Toton
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25249 w/e 07/07/1973 SP Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 07/09/1974 KM w/e 11/01/1975 SP Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25184 w/e 07/07/1973 WN Willesden w/e 09/11/1974 KM w/e 08/02/1975 BS Bescot
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25190 w/e 07/09/1974 SP Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 09/11/1974 KM w/e 08/02/1975 TO Toton
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40137 w/e 12/10/1974 LO Longsight w/e 11/01/1975 KD 04/01/1981 Withdrawn
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40138 w/e 12/10/1974 LO Longsight w/e 11/01/1975 KD 03/09/1982 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08844 9w/e 12/08/1972 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) w/e 11/01/1975 KD 24/07/1988 CL  
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40139 w/e 06/07/1974 SP Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 08/02/1975 KD 14/02/1982 Withdrawn
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40140 w/e 06/07/1974 SP Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 08/02/1975 KD w/e 10/05/1975 LO Longsight
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25050 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division 2w/e 22/03/1975 KD 24/04/1983 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25192 w/e 11/08/1973 SP Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 12/04/1975 KD 3w/e 08/05/1976 SP Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25193 w/e 11/08/1973 SP Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 12/04/1975 KD w/e 10/05/1975 WN Willesden
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40011 3w/e 06/10/1973 LO Longsight w/e 11/10/1975 KD 3w/e 08/05/1976 LO Longsight
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40017 w/e 10/05/1975 LO Longsight w/e 11/10/1975 KD 3w/e 08/05/1976 LO Longsight
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40042 w/e 10/05/1975 LO Longsight w/e 11/10/1975 KD 3w/e 08/05/1976 LO Longsight
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40043 w/e 06/07/1974 LO Longsight w/e 11/10/1975 KD 31/01/1976 Withdrawn
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40098 w/e 10/05/1975 LO Longsight w/e 11/10/1975 KD 12/04/1981 Withdrawn
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40140 w/e 10/05/1975 LO Longsight w/e 11/10/1975 KD 3w/e 08/05/1976 SP Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25112 17/06/1968 D08 Liverpool Division w/e 11/10/1975 KD 3w/e 08/05/1976 SP Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25113 17/06/1968 D08 Liverpool Division w/e 11/10/1975 KD 26/06/1983 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25114 17/06/1968 D08 Liverpool Division w/e 11/10/1975 KD 3w/e 08/05/1976 SP Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25115 17/06/1968 D08 Liverpool Division w/e 11/10/1975 KD 3w/e 08/05/1976 SP Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25119 w/e 11/03/1972 D09 Manchester Division w/e 11/10/1975 KD 14/06/1985 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25144 w/e 11/03/1972 D09 Manchester Division w/e 11/10/1975 KD 17/04/1983 Withdrawn
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40093 w/e 05/06/1971 D08 Liverpool Division 4w/e 08/11/1975 KD 3w/e 08/05/1976 SP Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40134 w/e 08/01/1972 D08 Liverpool Division 4w/e 08/11/1975 KD 31/05/1981 Withdrawn
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40141 17/06/1968 D08 Liverpool Division 4w/e 08/11/1975 KD 3w/e 08/05/1976 SP Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25142 w/e 10/02/1973 D02 Birmingham Division 2w/e 10/01/1976 KD 18/10/1981 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25116 w/e 07/11/1970 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 28/02/1976 KD 3w/e 08/05/1976 CW Cricklewood East
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40036 w/e 01/02/1976 SP Springs Branch (Wigan) 3w/e 08/05/1976 KD 31/01/1982 Withdrawn
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40046 w/e 01/02/1976 SP Springs Branch (Wigan) 3w/e 08/05/1976 KD 20/02/1983 Withdrawn
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40179 w/e 09/05/1970 D08 Liverpool Division 3w/e 08/05/1976 KD 01/02/1981 Withdrawn
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40136 w/e 10/05/1975 LO Longsight 2w/e 10/07/1976 KD 09/05/1982 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08485 w/e 18/04/1988 98Su   w/e 12/05/1988 KD