Depot: Coalville
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Coalville | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 2018 | m/e | 05/1892 (New) | 10C | m/e | 01/1899 | 10C | Coalville | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 2018 | m/e | 05/1892 | 10C | Coalville (New) | m/e | 01/1899 | 10C | m/e | 12/1902 | 10C | Coalville |
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 2021 | m/e | 05/1892 | 10 | Leicester Midland (New) | m/e | 01/1899 | 10C | m/e | 12/1902 | 10C | Coalville |
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 2018 | m/e | 01/1899 | 10C | Coalville | m/e | 12/1902 | 10C | m/e | 05/1908 | 10 | Leicester Midland |
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 2021 | m/e | 01/1899 | 10C | Coalville | m/e | 12/1902 | 10C | m/e | 05/1908 | 10 | Leicester Midland |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3835 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | on | 01/01/1948 | 17C | w/e | 01/10/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3865 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17C | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 21A | Saltley | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3872 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17C | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 19C | Canklow | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3921 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17C | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 17F | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8008 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17C | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 15A | Wellingborough | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8106 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17C | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8107 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17C | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 15A | Wellingborough | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8265 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17C | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 15A | Wellingborough | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8543 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17C | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 15A | Wellingborough | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3779 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17C | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3429 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17C | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 17A | Derby | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3682 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17C | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4085 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17C | w/e | 12/10/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4103 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17C | w/e | 12/12/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4109 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17C | w/e | 02/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4146 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17C | w/e | 20/05/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4227 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | on | 01/01/1948 | 17C | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4252 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17C | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4260 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17C | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 17C | Coalville | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4279 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 18B | Westhouses | on | 01/01/1948 | 17C | w/e | 11/01/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4539 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17C | w/e | 07/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7449 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17C | w/e | 28/03/1959 | 14B | Kentish Town | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8475 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 17C | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 15A | Wellingborough |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3892 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17B | Burton | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 17C | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 17B | Burton |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3972 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17B | Burton | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 17C | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 17B | Burton |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43894 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 17C | on | 03/09/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44180 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16A | Nottingham | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 17C | w/e | 14/04/1962 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44156 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17B | Burton | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 17C | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 15A | Wellingborough |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44554 | w/e | 18/06/1949 | 16B | Spital Bridge | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 17C | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 9F | Heaton Mersey |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44572 | w/e | 18/06/1949 | 16B | Spital Bridge | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 17C | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 14B | Kentish Town |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 40934 | w/e | 22/07/1950 | 16B | Spital Bridge | on | 25/10/1950 | 17C | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44260 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17C | Coalville | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 17C | w/e | 01/02/1964 | 15C | Kettering |
Steam | 1357 | 0-6-0 | 58246 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 17C | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 17A | Derby | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43658 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 17D | Rowsley | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 17C | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44113 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 17B | Burton | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 17C | w/e | 19/12/1964 | 16G | Westhouses |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58209 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 17A | Derby | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 17C | m/e | 09/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43869 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 21A | Saltley | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 17C | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44166 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 17D | Rowsley | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 17C | w/e | 27/01/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43292 | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 18A | Toton | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 17C | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43923 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 18A | Toton | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 17C | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43933 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 18A | Toton | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 17C | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44190 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 18A | Toton | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 17C | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43885 | w/e | 07/05/1949 | 18B | Westhouses | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 17C | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43919 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 14B | Kentish Town | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 17C | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 15C | Leicester Midland |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43975 | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 14B | Kentish Town | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 17C | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44418 | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 15B | Kettering | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 17C | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44278 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 17C | Rowsley | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 15D | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 15A | Wellingborough |
Steam | 1357 | 0-6-0 | 58246 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 15D | on | 13/06/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48053 | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 16A | Nottingham | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 15D | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 15A | Leicester Midland |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48382 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 18B | Westhouses | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 15D | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 15A | Wellingborough |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43854 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 9F | Heaton Mersey | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 15D | on | 06/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43876 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 14A | Cricklewood East | w/e | 21/02/1959 | 15D | w/e | 08/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48619 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 15C | Leicester Midland | w/e | 21/02/1959 | 15D | w/e | 30/10/1965 | 16G | Westhouses |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44150 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 18B | Westhouses | w/e | 28/03/1959 | 15D | w/e | 26/01/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48644 | on | 01/01/1948 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 15D | w/e | 30/10/1965 | 16G | Westhouses |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43861 | on | 01/01/1948 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 15D | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 18A | Toton |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43979 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 15D | w/e | 14/04/1962 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 58137 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 17D | Rowsley | w/e | 30/07/1960 | 15D | on | 06/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43986 | on | 01/01/1948 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 15D | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 18C | Hasland |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58305 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 17B | Burton | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 15D | w/e | 17/06/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48382 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 15D | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 15C | Kettering |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48687 | on | 01/01/1948 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 15D | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 15A | Leicester Midland |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58214 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 18A | Toton | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 15D | w/e | 10/02/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48315 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 15D | w/e | 04/12/1965 | 15A | Leicester Midland |
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 58166 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 18A | Toton | w/e | 07/10/1961 | 15D | w/e | 24/03/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44333 | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 09/12/1961 | 15D | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 58138 | w/e | 18/11/1961 | 18A | Toton | w/e | 13/01/1962 | 15D | w/e | 22/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44581 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 14A | Cricklewood East | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 15D | w/e | 12/09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 58143 | w/e | 18/11/1961 | 18A | Toton | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 15D | on | 30/11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 58148 | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 15D | on | 31/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 0F | 0-4-0ST | 47006 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 25/08/1962 | 15D | w/e | 01/09/1962 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43995 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 15D | on | 15/06/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44156 | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 15D | w/e | 01/02/1964 | 15C | Kettering |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43991 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 17B | Burton | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 15D | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 18A | Toton |
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 58182 | w/e | 29/07/1961 | 12E | Barrow in Furness | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 15D | on | 28/01/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48699 | on | 01/01/1948 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 15D | w/e | 30/10/1965 | 16G | Westhouses |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44259 | w/e | 16/02/1963 | 16A | Nottingham | w/e | 06/07/1963 | 15D | m/e | 08/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44184 | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 16A | Nottingham | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 15E | w/e | 26/10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44171 | w/e | 03/08/1963 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 15E | w/e | 09/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78013 | w/e | 23/03/1963 | 16A | Nottingham | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 15E | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 15A | Leicester Midland |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78028 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 16A | Nottingham | w/e | 04/01/1964 | 15E | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 15A | Leicester Midland |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44244 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 15C | Kettering | w/e | 01/02/1964 | 15E | w/e | 10/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44403 | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 15C | Kettering | w/e | 01/02/1964 | 15E | w/e | 13/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44492 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 9F | Heaton Mersey | w/e | 08/02/1964 | 15E | m/e | 05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44289 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 9F | Heaton Mersey | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 15E | w/e | 20/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44554 | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 9F | Heaton Mersey | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 15E | m/e | 03/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48672 | on | 01/01/1948 | 18A | Toton | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 15E | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 16F | Burton |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44134 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17D | Rowsley | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 15E | w/e | 28/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44421 | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 17C | Rowsley | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 15E | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44501 | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 16J | Rowsley | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 15E | w/e | 12/12/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44080 | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 16C | Derby | w/e | 30/05/1964 | 15E | w/e | 11/07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44433 | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 16C | Derby | w/e | 30/05/1964 | 15E | w/e | 05/12/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44334 | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 16C | Derby | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 15E | w/e | 19/12/1964 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44210 | w/e | 16/02/1963 | 18A | Toton | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 15E | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 2F | Bescot |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44043 | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 18A | Toton | w/e | 01/08/1964 | 15E | w/e | 19/12/1964 | 16G | Westhouses |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44051 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 16A | Toton | w/e | 01/08/1964 | 15E | w/e | 12/12/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43988 | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 15C | Kettering | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 15E | on | 10/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48380 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 15B | Kettering | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 15E | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 15A | Leicester Midland |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48467 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 15B | Kettering | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 15E | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 15A | Leicester Midland |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44260 | w/e | 01/02/1964 | 15C | Kettering | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 15E | w/e | 10/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44414 | w/e | 05/08/1961 | 15C | Leicester Midland | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 15E | w/e | 19/12/1964 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44575 | w/e | 08/08/1964 | 15A | Leicester Midland | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 15E | w/e | 14/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44203 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 15C | Kettering | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 15E | w/e | 19/12/1964 | 16G | Westhouses |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48137 | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 26C | Bolton | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 15E | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 15A | Leicester Midland |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48388 | w/e | 18/01/1964 | 15B | Wellingborough | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 15E | w/e | 30/10/1965 | 16G | Westhouses |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48607 | w/e | 18/01/1964 | 15B | Wellingborough | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 15E | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 15A | Leicester Midland |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5249 | on | 07/02/1964 | 16A | Toton (New) | w/e | 21/11/1964 | 15E | on | 16/01/1965 | D15 | Leicester Division |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12060 | w/e | 03/02/1962 | 18A | Toton | w/e | 21/11/1964 | 15E | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 16C | Derby |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48105 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 21/11/1964 | 15E | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48219 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 21/11/1964 | 15E | w/e | 30/10/1965 | 16G | Westhouses |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48552 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 21/11/1964 | 15E | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 15A | Leicester Midland |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48063 | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 15E | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44888 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 16F | Burton | w/e | 19/12/1964 | 15E | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45260 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 16F | Burton | w/e | 19/12/1964 | 15E | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45442 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 16F | Burton | w/e | 19/12/1964 | 15E | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48107 | w/e | 28/10/1961 | 15B | Kettering | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 15E | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 15A | Leicester Midland |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48617 | on | 01/01/1948 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 15E | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 15A | Leicester Midland |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48696 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16A | Nottingham | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 15E | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 15A | Leicester Midland |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3862 | on | 28/11/1959 | 17A | Derby (New) | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 15E | w/e | 20/02/1965 | 15A | Leicester Midland |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48132 | w/e | 18/01/1964 | 15B | Wellingborough | w/e | 15/05/1965 | 15E | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 15A | Leicester Midland |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48376 | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 15A | Leicester Midland | w/e | 31/07/1965 | 15E | w/e | 30/10/1965 | 16G | Westhouses |