Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 750 Today
» 1040 Yesterday
» 1790 Week
» 11960 Month
» 289756 Year
» 1174137 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Colwick


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Colwick Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam Q1 0-8-0 401       02/1901 (New) CLK 20/06/1929 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-8-0 402       03/1902 (New) CLK 13/09/1927 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-8-0 409       06/1902 (New) CLK 05/08/1931 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-8-0 408       07/1902 (New) CLK 02/09/1927 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-8-0 410       07/1902 (New) CLK 10/08/1932 ARD Ardsley
Steam Q1 0-8-0 411       07/1902 (New) CLK 08/12/1930 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-8-0 412       08/1902 (New) CLK 23/07/1928 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-8-0 414       09/1902 (New) CLK 31/12/1929 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-8-0 415       10/1902 (New) CLK 18/05/1929 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-8-0 416       12/1902 (New) CLK 17/12/1935 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-8-0 417       01/1903 (New) CLK 17/12/1935 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-8-0 418       01/1903 (New) CLK 30/11/1929 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-8-0 421       01/1903 (New) CLK 19/05/1934 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-8-0 425       09/1903 (New) CLK 27/06/1928 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-8-0 433       03/1904 (New) CLK 08/02/1930 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-8-0 436       03/1904 (New) CLK 08/02/1930 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-8-0 437       04/1904 (New) CLK 01/03/1928 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-8-0 439       08/1904 (New) CLK 22/09/1925 ARD Ardsley
Steam Q1 0-8-0 443       12/1906 (New) CLK 02/01/1929 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-8-0 448       07/1909 (New) CLK 12/02/1932 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-8-0 449       08/1909 (New) CLK 27/08/1930 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-8-0 450       08/1909 (New) CLK 15/06/1933 Withdrawn
Steam K1 2-6-0 1630       08/1912 (New) CLK 05/1924 MAR March
Steam K1 2-6-0 1631       02/1913 (New) CLK 05/1924 CAM Cambridge
Steam K1 2-6-0 1633       02/1913 (New) CLK 05/1924 STR Stratford
Steam K1 2-6-0 1635       03/1913 (New) CLK 29/07/1925 NWE New England
Steam K1 2-6-0 1638       04/1913 (New) CLK 01/11/1933 DON Doncaster
Steam K1 2-6-0 1639       04/1913 (New) CLK 09/1923 STR Stratford
Steam O3 2-8-0 464       05/1919 (New) CLK 17/03/1925 NWE New England
Steam O3 2-8-0 469       06/1919 (New) CLK 13/03/1925 NWE New England
Steam O3 2-8-0 470       06/1919 (New) CLK 17/03/1925 NWE New England
Steam O3 2-8-0 471       06/1919 (New) CLK 16/03/1925 NWE New England
Steam K2 2-6-0 1646 05/1914 NWE New England (New) 1923 CLK 20/06/1925 KX Kings Cross
Steam K2 2-6-0 1690 07/1921 DON Doncaster (New) 1923 CLK 05/08/1925 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 383 27/03/1924 ANN Annesley 31/03/1924 CLK 10/09/1941 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 380 23/11/1917 ANN Annesley 05/04/1924 CLK 14/10/1927 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 381 11/03/1924 ANN Annesley 05/04/1924 CLK 06/09/1927 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 382 13/03/1924 ANN Annesley 05/04/1924 CLK 10/09/1941 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 385 29/03/1924 ANN Annesley 05/04/1924 CLK 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 387 07/09/1917 ANN Annesley 05/04/1924 CLK 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6321 29/03/1924 GOR Gorton 05/04/1924 CLK 27/11/1925 NWE New England
Steam O4 2-8-0 6314 27/03/1924 GOR Gorton 05/04/1924 CLK 27/11/1925 NWE New England
Steam O4 2-8-0 6313 27/03/1924 GOR Gorton 05/04/1924 CLK 27/11/1925 NWE New England
Steam O4 2-8-0 6322 10/04/1924 GOR Gorton 13/12/1924 CLK 19/09/1941 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 6324 26/03/1924 SHF Sheffield Neepsend 21/01/1925 CLK 16/09/1940 GRA Grantham
Steam O4 2-8-0 6361 16/05/1924 SHF Sheffield Neepsend 24/01/1925 CLK 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6363 31/01/1925 ARD Ardsley 14/03/1925 CLK 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6279 02/03/1925 NWE New England 16/03/1925 CLK 13/09/1941 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 6270 24/02/1925 NWE New England 16/03/1925 CLK 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6308 20/02/1925 NWE New England 16/03/1925 CLK 12/02/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6266 23/02/1925 NWE New England 18/03/1925 CLK 03/07/1925 MAR March
Steam K2 2-6-0 4652 1924 MAR March 13/06/1925 CLK 01/07/1925 STR Stratford
Steam K1 2-6-0 4634 05/1924 STR Stratford 22/06/1925 CLK 23/08/1927 NWE New England
Steam B13 4-6-0 746 07/07/1924 DON Doncaster 01/07/1925 CLK 28/11/1931 Withdrawn
Steam K1 2-6-0 4633 05/1924 STR Stratford 01/07/1925 CLK 14/01/1931 MEX Mexborough
Steam K1 2-6-0 4637 25/03/1923 DON Doncaster 22/07/1925 CLK 11/05/1929 DON Doncaster
Steam K1 2-6-0 4630 05/1924 MAR March 30/07/1925 CLK 11/06/1927 CAM Cambridge
Steam K1 2-6-0 4636 12/07/1923 STR Stratford 07/08/1925 CLK 29/07/1930 MEX Mexborough
Steam K1 2-6-0 1639 09/1923 STR Stratford 15/08/1925 CLK 04/08/1930 NWE New England
Steam O4 2-8-0 6510 30/07/1925 GOR Gorton 15/08/1925 CLK 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6539 01/08/1925 GOR Gorton 18/08/1925 CLK 16/09/1927 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam O4 2-8-0 6540 01/08/1925 GOR Gorton 18/08/1925 CLK 23/11/1940 CLK Colwick
Steam B7 4-6-0 5037 22/11/1924 WFD Woodford Halse 28/10/1925 CLK 07/04/1926 GOR Gorton
Steam O3 2-8-0 3459 01/1914 NWE New England (New) 27/11/1925 CLK 19/08/1935 NWE New England
Steam O3 2-8-0 3469 13/03/1925 NWE New England 27/11/1925 CLK 09/08/1934 NWE New England
Steam O3 2-8-0 3475 10/1919 NWE New England (New) 27/11/1925 CLK 09/08/1934 NWE New England
Steam O3 2-8-0 3468 06/1919 NWE New England (New) 28/11/1925 CLK 12/07/1929 NWE New England
Steam B7 4-6-0 5034 08/06/1925 LEI Leicester (G.C.) 30/11/1925 CLK 27/03/1926 GOR Gorton
Steam K2 2-6-0 4650 1923 ARD Ardsley 06/12/1925 CLK 25/04/1926 KX Kings Cross
Steam O4 2-8-0 6497 12/11/1925 GOR Gorton 08/01/1926 CLK 13/09/1941 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 6525 10/11/1925 GOR Gorton 09/01/1926 CLK 23/06/1930 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam O4 2-8-0 6528 04/12/1925 GOR Gorton 09/01/1926 CLK 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6338 12/06/1924 GOR Gorton 03/02/1926 CLK 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6296 08/07/1924 GOR Gorton 03/02/1926 CLK 16/09/1927 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam O4 2-8-0 6521 07/11/1925 WFD Woodford Halse 04/02/1926 CLK 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam B7 4-6-0 5458 16/01/1926 GOR Gorton 09/02/1926 CLK 01/04/1926 GOR Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 6530 16/02/1926 GOR Gorton 02/03/1926 CLK 13/09/1941 Withdrawn
Steam B7 4-6-0 5036 10/06/1925 ANN Annesley 04/03/1926 CLK 01/04/1926 GOR Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 6522 25/02/1926 GOR Gorton 05/03/1926 CLK 25/02/1935 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam O4 2-8-0 6519 18/02/1926 GOR Gorton 06/03/1926 CLK 24/04/1926 DON Doncaster
Steam B8 4-6-0 5441 09/06/1925 GOR Gorton 27/03/1926 CLK 09/08/1943 ANN Annesley
Steam B8 4-6-0 5443 24/01/1925 ANN Annesley 27/03/1926 CLK 09/08/1943 ANN Annesley
Steam B8 4-6-0 5439 29/09/1922 GOR Gorton 29/03/1926 CLK 10/08/1943 ANN Annesley
Steam B8 4-6-0 5446 08/06/1925 GOR Gorton 29/03/1926 CLK 06/06/1926 ANN Annesley
Steam B8 4-6-0 5279 08/06/1925 GOR Gorton 31/03/1926 CLK 08/11/1926 ANN Annesley
Steam K1 2-6-0 4632 05/1924 STR Stratford 17/04/1926 CLK 13/08/1930 DON Doncaster
Steam B13 4-6-0 757 23/02/1926 ARD Ardsley 07/06/1926 CLK 22/09/1926 YK York (North)
Steam B8 4-6-0 5004 29/05/1926 GOR Gorton 09/06/1926 CLK 08/11/1926 ANN Annesley
Steam B8 4-6-0 5280 21/05/1926 GOR Gorton 10/06/1926 CLK 31/03/1927 ANN Annesley
Steam B8 4-6-0 5442 22/05/1926 GOR Gorton 09/07/1926 CLK 15/10/1928 ANN Annesley
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5213 09/1909 SHF Sheffield Neepsend (New) 21/01/1927 CLK 05/04/1927 STV Staveley (G.C.)
Steam Q4 0-8-0 6140 20/06/1912 LNG Langwith Junction 26/01/1927 CLK 11/09/1929 KEA Keadby
Steam O4 2-8-0 6211 09/10/1915 STV Staveley (G.C.) 02/1927 CLK 03/09/1942 WHL West Hartlepool
Steam O4 2-8-0 6366 05/02/1924 GOR Gorton 21/02/1927 CLK 05/04/1927 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam O4 2-8-0 6312 03/03/1927 LNG Langwith Junction 04/03/1927 CLK 14/03/1927 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam B8 4-6-0 5444 16/06/1926 GOR Gorton 16/06/1927 CLK 12/10/1927 ANN Annesley
Steam K2 2-6-0 4640 05/1924 NWE New England 22/08/1927 CLK 19/03/1936 CAM Cambridge
Steam O4 2-8-0 6598       30/09/1927 CLK 31/10/1927 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam B8 4-6-0 5440 21/05/1926 GOR Gorton 12/10/1927 CLK 04/01/1933 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 5394 06/01/1924 KEA Keadby 26/10/1927 CLK 03/11/1927 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6249 17/11/1922 IMM Immingham 01/11/1927 CLK 21/11/1927 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam O4 2-8-0 6586       31/12/1927 CLK 22/11/1940 CLK Colwick
Steam B8 4-6-0 5279 08/11/1926 ANN Annesley 06/03/1928 CLK 09/10/1933 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6601   08/1921 ROD   15/03/1928 CLK 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam B8 4-6-0 5444 12/10/1927 ANN Annesley 02/04/1928 CLK 15/06/1943 ANN Annesley
Steam B8 4-6-0 5280 31/03/1927 ANN Annesley 02/04/1928 CLK 08/06/1928 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam O4 2-8-0 6573   06/1920 ROD   24/04/1928 CLK 28/11/1940 CLK Colwick
Steam O4 2-8-0 2079       16/08/1928 CLK 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam B8 4-6-0 5445 13/07/1928 MAR March 14/11/1928 CLK 15/08/1943 ANN Annesley
Steam K2 2-6-0 4643 04/1914 NWE New England (New) 01/1929 CLK 27/04/1947 IMM Immingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 6344 22/05/1924 GOR Gorton 05/02/1929 CLK 23/06/1930 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam Q1 0-8-0 3432 01/1904 NWE New England (New) 16/02/1929 CLK 27/10/1931 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-8-0 3426 09/1903 NWE New England (New) 09/03/1929 CLK 09/09/1931 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 1914       30/04/1929 CLK 14/09/1941 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 1609       03/05/1929 CLK 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam K2 2-6-0 4646 20/06/1925 KX Kings Cross 08/06/1929 CLK 06/03/1936 CAM Cambridge
Steam J39 0-6-0 2780 04/11/1929 YK York (North) (New) 08/11/1929 CLK 15/11/1929 ANN Annesley
Steam J39 0-6-0 2781 07/11/1929 YK York (North) (New) 15/11/1929 CLK 19/11/1929 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6339 03/05/1924 IMM Immingham 05/06/1930 CLK 25/06/1930 ANN Annesley
Steam K2 2-6-0 4654 12/02/1927 NWE New England 31/07/1930 CLK 25/09/1930 NWE New England
Steam K2 2-6-0 4641 12/1923 NWE New England 04/08/1930 CLK 02/07/1946 BOS Boston
Steam K2 2-6-0 4651 03/11/1925 DON Doncaster 12/08/1930 CLK 28/07/1936 BOS Boston
Steam K2 2-6-0 4659 21/07/1927 DON Doncaster 25/08/1930 CLK 27/07/1932 DON Doncaster
Steam J39 0-6-0 2704 21/09/1929 DON Doncaster 20/09/1930 CLK 03/10/1930 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6336 24/03/1924 DON Doncaster 19/12/1930 CLK 24/11/1940 CLK Colwick
Steam Q4 0-8-0 6052 16/02/1924 MEX Mexborough 01/01/1931 CLK 09/01/1931 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam O4 2-8-0 6192 01/09/1912 MEX Mexborough 02/01/1931 CLK 11/03/1939 BRN Barnsley
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5067 14/12/1903 MEX Mexborough 02/01/1931 CLK 09/01/1931 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6356 02/04/1924 DON Doncaster 23/04/1931 CLK 15/05/1931 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6634 19/01/1931 NWE New England 14/05/1931 CLK 18/05/1931 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam J39 0-6-0 2976       15/03/1932 (New) CLK 17/03/1942 GRA Grantham
Steam O4 2-8-0 6587 07/11/1927 NWE New England 09/08/1932 CLK 14/09/1941 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 6565 19/12/1927 NWE New England 29/08/1932 CLK 09/09/1941 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 6541 02/09/1925 NWE New England 19/10/1932 CLK 19/09/1941 Withdrawn
Steam K2 2-6-0 4659 22/09/1932 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 21/05/1933 CLK 06/10/1933 KX Kings Cross
Steam J39 0-6-0 1295 08/10/1927 STR Stratford 30/05/1933 CLK 10/04/1934 TFD Trafford Park (LNER)
Steam J39 0-6-0 1296 01/02/1930 STR Stratford 31/05/1933 CLK 28/03/1934 TFD Trafford Park (LNER)
Steam O4 2-8-0 5407 21/07/1924 DON Doncaster 27/10/1933 CLK 20/02/1934 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam K2 2-6-0 4659 06/10/1933 KX Kings Cross 02/11/1933 CLK 18/06/1936 BOS Boston
Steam J39 0-6-0 2694 21/06/1933 GOR Gorton 04/11/1933 CLK 02/12/1933 ANN Annesley
Steam J39 0-6-0 2779 31/10/1929 ANN Annesley 04/11/1933 CLK 02/12/1933 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6505 13/08/1925 DON Doncaster 08/11/1933 CLK 04/01/1937 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam O4 2-8-0 6311 19/01/1926 NWE New England 11/11/1933 CLK 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6619 30/06/1927 NWE New England 14/11/1933 CLK 01/12/1940 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam O4 2-8-0 5001 1930 DON Doncaster 24/11/1933 CLK 30/12/1938 IMM Immingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 6202 07/05/1929 GOR Gorton 16/12/1933 CLK 15/02/1934 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6354 12/06/1924 GOR Gorton 16/12/1933 CLK 10/02/1934 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6262 28/06/1933 GOR Gorton 16/12/1933 CLK 1934 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 5400 17/11/1933 MAR March 29/12/1933 CLK 21/02/1934 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam O4 2-8-0 5398 17/11/1933 MAR March 03/01/1934 CLK 21/02/1934 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam O4 2-8-0 6251 02/03/1929 MAR March 11/01/1934 CLK 04/10/1941 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 6532 02/03/1929 MAR March 12/01/1934 CLK 22/02/1935 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6207 02/03/1929 MAR March 05/02/1934 CLK 04/01/1937 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam O4 2-8-0 6368 10/05/1924 ANN Annesley 15/02/1934 CLK 13/09/1941 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 6218 29/09/1912 ANN Annesley 16/02/1934 CLK 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam Q4 0-8-0 6138 03/1907 LNG Langwith Junction (New) 20/02/1934 CLK 05/12/1934 Withdrawn
Steam Q4 0-8-0 6132 09/04/1920 LNG Langwith Junction 21/02/1934 CLK 07/10/1935 ARD Ardsley
Steam Q4 0-8-0 6137 03/1907 LNG Langwith Junction (New) 23/02/1934 CLK 02/11/1935 ARD Ardsley
Steam O3 2-8-0 3475 09/08/1934 NWE New England 08/10/1934 CLK 08/11/1934 NWE New England
Steam O3 2-8-0 3469 09/08/1934 NWE New England 09/10/1934 CLK 08/11/1934 NWE New England
Steam K2 2-6-0 4660 06/1918 NWE New England (New) 01/01/1935 CLK 05/07/1935 BOS Boston
Steam K2 2-6-0 4661 1923 DON Doncaster 01/01/1935 CLK 04/07/1935 MAR March
Steam O4 2-8-0 6246 27/10/1927 LNG Langwith Junction 25/02/1935 CLK 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6225 11/1912 ANN Annesley (New) 21/03/1935 CLK 14/03/1937 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam O4 2-8-0 6264 20/05/1933 NWE New England 15/07/1935 CLK 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam K2 2-6-0 4666 03/07/1935 BOS Boston 09/09/1935 CLK 12/02/1936 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam J39 0-6-0 2951 06/08/1935 DON Doncaster (New) 10/09/1935 CLK 04/10/1935 MAR March
Steam K2 2-6-0 4660 05/07/1935 BOS Boston 10/09/1935 CLK 08/01/1950 BOS Boston
Steam O4 2-8-0 6606 31/05/1935 GRA Grantham 10/09/1935 CLK 20/01/1944 WHL West Hartlepool
Steam J39 0-6-0 1281 14/12/1929 LIN Lincoln 25/09/1935 CLK 08/02/1937 GOR Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 5405 05/11/1929 NWE New England 14/10/1935 CLK 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6377 15/01/1926 NWE New England 24/10/1935 CLK 16/09/1940 GRA Grantham
Steam O4 2-8-0 5008 18/10/1933 NWE New England 15/11/1935 CLK 03/09/1942 WHL West Hartlepool
Steam O4 2-8-0 6509 29/11/1935 NWE New England 18/12/1935 CLK 20/04/1940 GRA Grantham
Steam O4 2-8-0 6635 21/08/1929 NWE New England 18/12/1935 CLK 28/12/1935 GRA Grantham
Steam O4 2-8-0 5399 24/08/1933 MAR March 30/01/1936 CLK 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6295 14/10/1930 MAR March 30/01/1936 CLK 22/11/1940 CLK Colwick
Steam J39 0-6-0 2785 14/03/1934 ARD Ardsley 12/02/1936 CLK 18/08/1946 ARD Ardsley
Steam J39 0-6-0 2696 02/09/1930 MAR March 29/02/1936 CLK 17/03/1942 GRA Grantham
Steam J39 0-6-0 1495 03/09/1930 MAR March 05/03/1936 CLK 11/04/1936 GOR Gorton
Steam J39 0-6-0 2971 22/01/1932 MAR March (New) 28/04/1936 CLK 05/05/1938 LEI Leicester (G.C.)
Steam K2 2-6-0 4651 28/07/1936 BOS Boston 01/09/1936 CLK 29/02/1940 DON Doncaster
Steam K2 2-6-0 4680 10/1931 KX Kings Cross 07/09/1936 CLK 08/01/1950 BOS Boston
Steam K2 2-6-0 4646 06/03/1936 CAM Cambridge 06/10/1936 CLK 29/02/1940 DON Doncaster
Steam J39 0-6-0 1828 23/09/1936 GOR Gorton (New) 23/10/1936 CLK 23/08/1946 DON Doncaster
Steam J39 0-6-0 1856 30/09/1936 GOR Gorton (New) 24/10/1936 CLK 23/08/1946 DON Doncaster
Steam K2 2-6-0 4683 13/10/1934 STR Stratford 26/10/1936 CLK 09/11/1958 40F Boston
Steam K2 2-6-0 4640 19/03/1936 CAM Cambridge 07/11/1936 CLK 03/06/1937 MAR March
Steam J39 0-6-0 1857 02/10/1936 GOR Gorton (New) 12/11/1936 CLK 31/03/1946 ARD Ardsley
Steam J39 0-6-0 1854 25/09/1936 GOR Gorton (New) 14/11/1936 CLK 31/03/1946 ARD Ardsley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6249 21/11/1927 LNG Langwith Junction 04/01/1937 CLK 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6257 22/10/1926 LNG Langwith Junction 04/01/1937 CLK 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam B7 4-6-0 5470 05/06/1924 GOR Gorton 04/03/1937 CLK 05/01/1938 ANN Annesley
Steam B7 4-6-0 5034 27/03/1926 GOR Gorton 16/03/1937 CLK 13/12/1937 SHF Sheffield Neepsend
Steam J39 0-6-0 2970 20/05/1937 DON Doncaster 04/06/1937 CLK 22/08/1940 GRA Grantham
Steam J39 0-6-0 1898       25/04/1938 (New) CLK 14/09/1946 DON Doncaster
Steam J39 0-6-0 1903       29/04/1938 (New) CLK 31/03/1946 ARD Ardsley
Steam C1 4-4-2 3282 15/06/1924 NWE New England 05/07/1938 CLK 20/10/1946 KX Kings Cross
Steam C1 4-4-2 3278 16/02/1929 KX Kings Cross 13/07/1938 CLK 29/12/1943 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6354 10/02/1934 ANN Annesley 20/11/1938 CLK 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6353 15/05/1924 ANN Annesley 20/11/1938 CLK 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam J39 0-6-0 1273 26/07/1930 LIN Lincoln 19/12/1938 CLK 06/11/1943 DAR Darlington
Steam C1 4-4-2 4402 20/12/1928 CAM Cambridge 04/01/1939 CLK 29/12/1943 DON Doncaster
Steam A5 4-6-2T 5449 25/06/1939 WFD Woodford Halse 31/07/1939 CLK 09/09/1941 NEA Neasden
Steam J39 0-6-0 2987 17/05/1938 BOS Boston 03/08/1939 CLK 14/07/1940 GRA Grantham
Steam A5 4-6-2T 5165 04/10/1938 WFD Woodford Halse 17/08/1939 CLK 08/11/1940 NEA Neasden
Steam B18 4-6-0 5195 28/04/1926 WFD Woodford Halse 03/03/1940 CLK 05/04/1943 LEI Leicester (G.C.)
Steam B18 4-6-0 5196 23/04/1928 WFD Woodford Halse 03/03/1940 CLK 26/05/1940 LEI Leicester (G.C.)
Steam A5 4-6-2T 5373 20/09/1939 KX Kings Cross 25/05/1940 CLK 07/11/1940 NEA Neasden
Steam A5 4-6-2T 5007 26/02/1939 KX Kings Cross 25/05/1940 CLK 27/06/1940 NEA Neasden
Steam J39 0-6-0 2970 22/08/1940 GRA Grantham 06/09/1940 CLK 01/04/1951 37A Ardsley
Steam J39 0-6-0 2971 05/05/1938 LEI Leicester (G.C.) 14/09/1940 CLK 28/09/1959 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 6214 23/09/1912 ANN Annesley 13/10/1940 CLK 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6575 06/10/1937 ANN Annesley 13/10/1940 CLK 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6626 19/11/1928 WFD Woodford Halse 13/10/1940 CLK 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam J39 0-6-0 2987 14/07/1940 GRA Grantham 23/10/1940 CLK 23/08/1946 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6586 31/12/1927 CLK Colwick 22/11/1940 CLK 24/07/1942 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam O4 2-8-0 6295 30/01/1936 CLK Colwick 22/11/1940 CLK 30/01/1943 GOR Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 6540 18/08/1925 CLK Colwick 23/11/1940 CLK 30/07/1942 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam O4 2-8-0 6336 19/12/1930 CLK Colwick 24/11/1940 CLK 01/02/1943 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam O4 2-8-0 6573 24/04/1928 CLK Colwick 28/11/1940 CLK 23/07/1942 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam J39 0-6-0 3098 21/08/1941 DON Doncaster (New) 09/09/1941 CLK 30/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Q4 0-8-0 6140 25/03/1931 IMM Immingham 04/10/1941 CLK 05/10/1941 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam C1 4-4-2 4408 24/05/1928 NWE New England 06/10/1941 CLK 26/07/1945 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 3091 13/05/1941 GRA Grantham (New) 08/10/1941 CLK 20/05/1951 37A Ardsley
Steam J39 0-6-0 3093 26/07/1941 BOS Boston 08/10/1941 CLK 10/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 3094 26/07/1941 BOS Boston 08/10/1941 CLK 23/08/1946 DON Doncaster
Steam J39 0-6-0 3095 30/07/1941 BOS Boston 08/10/1941 CLK 18/08/1946 ARD Ardsley
Steam J39 0-6-0 3089 11/05/1941 GRA Grantham 09/10/1941 CLK 13/10/1941 ANN Annesley
Steam J39 0-6-0 3090 11/05/1941 GRA Grantham 09/10/1941 CLK 13/10/1941 ANN Annesley
Steam C1 4-4-2 3275       11/10/1941 CLK 31/07/1943 KX Kings Cross
Steam H2 4-4-4T 6418 11/1920 NEA Neasden (New) 04/12/1941 CLK 21/05/1946 Withdrawn
Steam H2 4-4-4T 6422 06/1921 NEA Neasden (New) 04/12/1941 CLK 12/12/1941 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam H2 4-4-4T 6416 10/1920 NEA Neasden (New) 05/12/1941 CLK 20/11/1947 Withdrawn
Steam H2 4-4-4T 6419 03/1921 NEA Neasden (New) 05/12/1941 CLK 23/09/1943 Withdrawn
Steam H2 4-4-4T 6415 10/1920 NEA Neasden (New) 06/12/1941 CLK 04/03/1946 Withdrawn
Steam H2 4-4-4T 6421 06/1921 NEA Neasden (New) 06/12/1941 CLK 12/12/1941 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam H2 4-4-4T 6417 11/1920 NEA Neasden (New) 07/12/1941 CLK 17/10/1947 Withdrawn
Steam C1 4-4-2 4414 30/11/1938 NWE New England 21/03/1942 CLK 28/10/1944 Withdrawn
Steam C1 4-4-2 4446 30/11/1938 NWE New England 21/03/1942 CLK 20/10/1946 KX Kings Cross
Steam J39 0-6-0 2696 17/03/1942 GRA Grantham 13/05/1942 CLK 18/08/1946 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam J39 0-6-0 2976 17/03/1942 GRA Grantham 14/05/1942 CLK 20/05/1951 37A Ardsley
Steam H2 4-4-4T 6422 12/12/1941 LNG Langwith Junction 18/07/1942 CLK 04/05/1946 Withdrawn
Steam H2 4-4-4T 6420 12/12/1941 LNG Langwith Junction 14/08/1942 CLK 03/01/1946 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 5391 18/07/1942 WFD Woodford Halse 03/09/1942 CLK 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6586 24/07/1942 WFD Woodford Halse 04/09/1942 CLK 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6336 01/02/1943 WFD Woodford Halse 21/03/1943 CLK 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6275 28/01/1943 WFD Woodford Halse 21/03/1943 CLK 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam J39 0-6-0 1268 14/10/1927 STR Stratford 05/06/1943 CLK 14/01/1946 NOR Norwich Thorpe
Steam B18 4-6-0 5195 05/04/1943 LEI Leicester (G.C.) 04/07/1943 CLK 16/01/1944 LEI Leicester (G.C.)
Steam J39 0-6-0 3089 13/10/1941 ANN Annesley 08/08/1943 CLK 18/08/1946 ARD Ardsley
Steam J39 0-6-0 1287 14/03/1935 ANN Annesley 09/08/1943 CLK 18/08/1946 NWE New England
Steam J39 0-6-0 1289 15/11/1934 ANN Annesley 09/08/1943 CLK 03/10/1943 GOR Gorton
Steam J39 0-6-0 2780 19/08/1930 ANN Annesley 09/08/1943 CLK 26/10/1943 DAR Darlington
Steam J39 0-6-0 2781 19/11/1929 ANN Annesley 09/08/1943 CLK 03/10/1943 GOR Gorton
Steam J39 0-6-0 2975 02/03/1941 ANN Annesley 09/08/1943 CLK 18/08/1946 ARD Ardsley
Steam J39 0-6-0 2710 23/08/1929 LEI Leicester (G.C.) 14/08/1943 CLK 20/05/1951 37A Ardsley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6546 27/06/1927 DON Doncaster 05/09/1943 CLK 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6229 17/04/1941 DON Doncaster 06/09/1943 CLK 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6604 21/11/1942 DON Doncaster 06/09/1943 CLK 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6533 21/11/1942 DON Doncaster 06/09/1943 CLK 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6531 11/07/1925 DON Doncaster 07/09/1943 CLK 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6535 21/11/1942 DON Doncaster 07/09/1943 CLK 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6254 26/02/1925 DON Doncaster 07/09/1943 CLK 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6253 04/12/1931 DON Doncaster 07/09/1943 CLK 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6594 20/03/1943 WHL West Hartlepool 20/01/1944 CLK 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster
Steam O2 2-8-0 3461 11/05/1943 DON Doncaster 23/01/1944 CLK 24/12/1944 NWE New England
Steam O2 2-8-0 3477 14/05/1943 DON Doncaster 23/01/1944 CLK 24/12/1944 NWE New England
Steam O2 2-8-0 3478 12/05/1943 DON Doncaster 23/01/1944 CLK 24/12/1944 NWE New England
Steam O2 2-8-0 3479 13/05/1943 DON Doncaster 23/01/1944 CLK 21/09/1944 NWE New England
Steam O2 2-8-0 3480 15/05/1943 DON Doncaster 23/01/1944 CLK 21/12/1944 NWE New England
Steam O2 2-8-0 3483 06/09/1943 DON Doncaster 23/01/1944 CLK 17/01/1945 NWE New England
Steam O2 2-8-0 3484 06/09/1943 DON Doncaster 23/01/1944 CLK 17/01/1945 NWE New England
Steam O2 2-8-0 3485 05/09/1943 DON Doncaster 23/01/1944 CLK 17/01/1945 NWE New England
Steam O2 2-8-0 3486 05/09/1943 DON Doncaster 23/01/1944 CLK 29/03/1944 NWE New England
Steam O2 2-8-0 3487 09/09/1943 DON Doncaster 23/01/1944 CLK 17/01/1945 NWE New England
Steam O2 2-8-0 3488 07/09/1943 DON Doncaster 23/01/1944 CLK 17/01/1945 NWE New England
Steam O2 2-8-0 3489 06/09/1943 DON Doncaster 23/01/1944 CLK 21/09/1944 NWE New England
Steam O2 2-8-0 3490 06/09/1943 DON Doncaster 23/01/1944 CLK 24/09/1944 NWE New England
Steam O2 2-8-0 3492 11/12/1943 DON Doncaster 23/01/1944 CLK 21/09/1944 NWE New England
Steam O2 2-8-0 3493 10/12/1943 DON Doncaster 23/01/1944 CLK 24/09/1944 NWE New England
Steam O2 2-8-0 3494 10/12/1943 DON Doncaster 23/01/1944 CLK 17/01/1945 NWE New England
Steam O2 2-8-0 3495 10/12/1943 DON Doncaster 23/01/1944 CLK 17/01/1945 NWE New England
Steam O2 2-8-0 3497 10/02/1943 DON Doncaster 23/01/1944 CLK 24/09/1944 NWE New England
Steam O2 2-8-0 3498 12/12/1943 DON Doncaster 23/01/1944 CLK 24/09/1944 NWE New England
Steam O2 2-8-0 3833 22/05/1942 DON Doncaster (New) 23/01/1944 CLK 17/01/1945 NWE New England
Steam O2 2-8-0 3834 10/06/1942 DON Doncaster (New) 23/01/1944 CLK 09/12/1945 DON Doncaster
Steam O2 2-8-0 3835 26/06/1942 DON Doncaster (New) 23/01/1944 CLK 05/10/1947 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam O2 2-8-0 3836 31/07/1942 DON Doncaster (New) 23/01/1944 CLK 28/10/1946 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam O2 2-8-0 3837 21/08/1942 DON Doncaster (New) 23/01/1944 CLK 20/10/1946 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam O2 2-8-0 3838 02/09/1942 DON Doncaster (New) 23/01/1944 CLK 05/10/1947 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam O2 2-8-0 3839 12/09/1942 DON Doncaster (New) 23/01/1944 CLK 20/10/1946 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam O2 2-8-0 3840 21/09/1942 DON Doncaster (New) 23/01/1944 CLK 20/10/1946 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam O2 2-8-0 3841 05/10/1942 DON Doncaster (New) 23/01/1944 CLK 20/10/1946 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam O2 2-8-0 3842 10/10/1942 DON Doncaster (New) 23/01/1944 CLK 20/10/1946 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam O2 2-8-0 3843 23/10/1942 DON Doncaster (New) 23/01/1944 CLK 20/10/1946 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam O2 2-8-0 3844 03/11/1942 DON Doncaster (New) 23/01/1944 CLK 20/10/1946 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam O2 2-8-0 3848 28/11/1942 DON Doncaster (New) 23/01/1944 CLK 20/10/1946 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam O2 2-8-0 3850 11/12/1942 DON Doncaster (New) 23/01/1944 CLK 20/10/1946 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam O2 2-8-0 3851 17/12/1942 DON Doncaster (New) 23/01/1944 CLK 20/10/1946 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam O2 2-8-0 3852 21/12/1942 DON Doncaster (New) 23/01/1944 CLK 05/10/1947 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam O2 2-8-0 3853 26/12/1942 DON Doncaster (New) 23/01/1944 CLK 20/10/1946 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam O2 2-8-0 3854 31/12/1942 DON Doncaster (New) 23/01/1944 CLK 29/03/1944 NWE New England
Steam O2 2-8-0 3855 02/01/1943 DON Doncaster (New) 23/01/1944 CLK 09/12/1945 DON Doncaster
Steam O2 2-8-0 3856 07/01/1943 DON Doncaster (New) 23/01/1944 CLK 29/03/1944 NWE New England
Steam O2 2-8-0 3857 21/01/1943 DON Doncaster (New) 23/01/1944 CLK 29/03/1944 NWE New England
Steam O2 2-8-0 3849 04/12/1942 DON Doncaster (New) 25/01/1944 CLK 05/10/1947 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam O2 2-8-0 3481 13/06/1943 DON Doncaster 19/02/1944 CLK 17/01/1945 NWE New England
Steam O2 2-8-0 3482 13/06/1943 DON Doncaster 19/02/1944 CLK 17/01/1945 NWE New England
Steam C1 4-4-2 3291 15/10/1941 DON Doncaster 05/07/1944 CLK 21/04/1945 Withdrawn
Steam C1 4-4-2 3289       10/07/1944 CLK 15/10/1944 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam C1 4-4-2 4453 06/11/1933 DON Doncaster 14/07/1944 CLK 27/07/1946 Withdrawn
Steam C1 4-4-2 3298 11/04/1943 SHF Sheffield Darnall 17/07/1944 CLK 04/04/1945 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 6571 01/09/1934 FRO Frodingham 11/09/1944 CLK 09/11/1947 STV Staveley (G.C.)
Steam O4 2-8-0 6255 18/03/1939 FRO Frodingham 11/09/1944 CLK 30/03/1947 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6192 13/08/1943 FRO Frodingham 12/09/1944 CLK 30/09/1944 STV Staveley (G.C.)
Steam O4 2-8-0 6568 11/06/1932 FRO Frodingham 12/09/1944 CLK 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6252 02/02/1923 MEX Mexborough 18/09/1944 CLK 11/04/1948 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6526 07/05/1930 MEX Mexborough 18/09/1944 CLK 16/06/1946 GOR Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 5010 17/10/1919 MEX Mexborough 18/09/1944 CLK 30/09/1944 STV Staveley (G.C.)
Steam O4 2-8-0 5069 24/12/1926 MEX Mexborough 19/09/1944 CLK 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 5093 29/01/1924 MEX Mexborough 19/09/1944 CLK 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6224 20/09/1919 MEX Mexborough 19/09/1944 CLK 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6227 01/04/1932 MEX Mexborough 19/09/1944 CLK 07/08/1949 SHF Sheffield Darnall
Steam O4 2-8-0 6344 23/06/1930 LNG Langwith Junction 19/09/1944 CLK 26/10/1947 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6591 14/05/1943 LNG Langwith Junction 19/09/1944 CLK 18/12/1949 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6512 14/05/1943 LNG Langwith Junction 20/09/1944 CLK 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6245 10/03/1943 GOR Gorton 24/11/1944 CLK 20/10/1946 GOR Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 6226 12/02/1939 FRO Frodingham 22/12/1944 CLK 18/04/1948 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6231 10/03/1943 GOR Gorton 24/12/1944 CLK 21/10/1945 GOR Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 6242 01/07/1939 GOR Gorton 24/12/1944 CLK 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6263 05/09/1939 FRO Frodingham 24/12/1944 CLK 03/06/1945 GOR Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 6561 13/09/1939 FRO Frodingham 24/12/1944 CLK 23/05/1948 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6375 05/04/1924 GOR Gorton 17/01/1945 CLK 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6310 05/04/1924 GOR Gorton 17/01/1945 CLK 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6306 02/12/1940 GOR Gorton 17/01/1945 CLK 23/05/1948 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6210 17/10/1919 MEX Mexborough 28/01/1945 CLK 30/03/1947 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6222 20/09/1919 MEX Mexborough 28/01/1945 CLK 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 5388 11/05/1917 MEX Mexborough 28/01/1945 CLK 30/03/1947 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6285 20/06/1943 MEX Mexborough 28/01/1945 CLK 26/10/1947 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6559 01/05/1929 MEX Mexborough 28/01/1945 CLK 30/05/1948 ANN Annesley
Steam J39 0-6-0 2780 26/10/1943 DAR Darlington 16/02/1945 CLK 18/08/1946 ARD Ardsley
Steam J39 0-6-0 1273 06/11/1943 DAR Darlington 05/04/1945 CLK 18/08/1946 NWE New England
Steam K2 2-6-0 4630 17/06/1943 BOS Boston 16/04/1945 CLK 27/04/1947 IMM Immingham
Steam K2 2-6-0 4649 06/10/1941 BOS Boston 16/04/1945 CLK 27/04/1947 IMM Immingham
Steam K2 2-6-0 4659 08/10/1941 BOS Boston 16/04/1945 CLK 26/06/1955 41A Sheffield Darnall
Steam K2 2-6-0 4665 08/10/1941 BOS Boston 16/04/1945 CLK 02/07/1946 BOS Boston
Steam K2 2-6-0 4681 15/06/1940 BOS Boston 16/04/1945 CLK 16/03/1958 40F Boston
Steam O4 2-8-0 6556 07/02/1943 GOR Gorton 22/04/1945 CLK 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6302 07/06/1924 GOR Gorton 22/04/1945 CLK 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6331 05/06/1924 GOR Gorton 03/06/1945 CLK 24/11/1946 DON Doncaster
Steam O2 2-8-0 3461 24/12/1944 NWE New England 25/06/1945 CLK 02/12/1945 DON Doncaster
Steam O2 2-8-0 3477 24/12/1944 NWE New England 25/06/1945 CLK 09/12/1945 DON Doncaster
Steam O2 2-8-0 3478 24/12/1944 NWE New England 25/06/1945 CLK 09/12/1945 DON Doncaster
Steam O2 2-8-0 3479 21/09/1944 NWE New England 25/06/1945 CLK 09/12/1945 DON Doncaster
Steam O2 2-8-0 3480 21/12/1944 NWE New England 25/06/1945 CLK 05/12/1945 DON Doncaster
Steam O2 2-8-0 3481 17/01/1945 NWE New England 25/06/1945 CLK 05/12/1945 DON Doncaster
Steam O2 2-8-0 3482 17/01/1945 NWE New England 25/06/1945 CLK 05/12/1945 DON Doncaster
Steam O2 2-8-0 3483 17/01/1945 NWE New England 25/06/1945 CLK 09/12/1945 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6269 17/01/1924 GOR Gorton 21/10/1945 CLK 18/04/1948 ANN Annesley
Steam B18 4-6-0 1471 26/05/1940 LEI Leicester (G.C.) 05/05/1946 CLK 20/10/1946 NEA Neasden
Steam O4 2-8-0 6291 12/05/1946 GOR Gorton 16/06/1946 CLK 23/05/1948 ANN Annesley
Steam K2 2-6-0 4633 30/06/1946 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 18/08/1946 CLK 04/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam K2 2-6-0 1727 30/07/1945 ARD Ardsley 18/08/1946 CLK 27/04/1947 IMM Immingham
Steam K2 2-6-0 1732 02/12/1945 ARD Ardsley 18/08/1946 CLK 04/01/1948 ANN Annesley
Steam K2 2-6-0 1741 30/07/1945 ARD Ardsley 18/08/1946 CLK 28/01/1951 65A Eastfield
Steam K2 2-6-0 4666 23/02/1940 NWE New England 18/08/1946 CLK 08/01/1950 BOS Boston
Steam K2 2-6-0 4668 16/06/1946 NWE New England 18/08/1946 CLK 01/04/1951 65A Eastfield
Steam K2 2-6-0 4678 30/07/1945 ARD Ardsley 18/08/1946 CLK 26/01/1959 Withdrawn
Steam K2 2-6-0 4679 02/12/1945 ARD Ardsley 18/08/1946 CLK 20/05/1951 65A Eastfield
Steam O1 2-8-0 6213 12/05/1946 GOR Gorton 18/08/1946 CLK 20/10/1946 GOR Gorton
Steam O1 2-8-0 6220 17/06/1945 GOR Gorton 18/08/1946 CLK 20/10/1946 GOR Gorton
Steam O1 2-8-0 6243 07/01/1945 GOR Gorton 18/08/1946 CLK 20/10/1946 GOR Gorton
Steam O1 2-8-0 6356 12/05/1946 GOR Gorton 18/08/1946 CLK 20/10/1946 GOR Gorton
Steam O1 2-8-0 6324 06/01/1946 GOR Gorton 18/08/1946 CLK 20/10/1946 GOR Gorton
Steam O1 2-8-0 6545 03/06/1945 GOR Gorton 18/08/1946 CLK 20/10/1946 GOR Gorton
Steam O1 2-8-0 6371 06/01/1946 GOR Gorton 18/08/1946 CLK 20/10/1946 GOR Gorton
Steam O1 2-8-0 6359 08/07/1945 GOR Gorton 18/08/1946 CLK 20/10/1946 GOR Gorton
Steam O1 2-8-0 6341 29/05/1924 GOR Gorton 18/08/1946 CLK 20/10/1946 GOR Gorton
Steam O1 2-8-0 3768 16/12/1945 GOR Gorton 18/08/1946 CLK 20/10/1946 GOR Gorton
Steam O1 2-8-0 3780 29/04/1945 GOR Gorton 18/08/1946 CLK 20/10/1946 GOR Gorton
Steam O1 2-8-0 3796 12/05/1946 GOR Gorton 18/08/1946 CLK 20/10/1946 GOR Gorton
Steam O1 2-8-0 3808 25/02/1945 GOR Gorton 18/08/1946 CLK 20/10/1946 GOR Gorton
Steam O1 2-8-0 6263 03/06/1945 GOR Gorton 18/08/1946 CLK 20/10/1946 GOR Gorton
Steam O1 2-8-0 6526 16/06/1946 GOR Gorton 18/08/1946 CLK 20/10/1946 GOR Gorton
Steam O1 2-8-0 3863 09/09/1945 GOR Gorton 18/08/1946 CLK 20/10/1946 GOR Gorton
Steam O1 2-8-0 3869 10/12/1944 GOR Gorton 18/08/1946 CLK 20/10/1946 GOR Gorton
Steam O1 2-8-0 3872 26/05/1946 GOR Gorton 18/08/1946 CLK 20/10/1946 GOR Gorton
Steam O1 2-8-0 3879 03/12/1944 GOR Gorton 18/08/1946 CLK 20/10/1946 GOR Gorton
Steam O1 2-8-0 3725 15/04/1945 GOR Gorton 18/08/1946 CLK 20/10/1946 GOR Gorton
Steam K2 2-6-0 1722 28/02/1940 DON Doncaster 21/08/1946 CLK 27/04/1947 IMM Immingham
Steam K2 2-6-0 1735 04/04/1942 DON Doncaster 21/08/1946 CLK 27/04/1947 IMM Immingham
Steam K2 2-6-0 1724 25/07/1943 DON Doncaster 23/08/1946 CLK 27/04/1947 IMM Immingham
Steam K2 2-6-0 4636 27/02/1940 DON Doncaster 23/08/1946 CLK 07/05/1957 Withdrawn
Steam K2 2-6-0 1728 28/02/1940 DON Doncaster 23/08/1946 CLK 27/04/1947 IMM Immingham
Steam K2 2-6-0 4661 08/04/1942 DON Doncaster 23/08/1946 CLK 17/06/1956 40A Lincoln
Steam K2 2-6-0 1763 25/07/1943 DON Doncaster 23/08/1946 CLK 09/11/1958 40F Boston
Steam O4 2-8-0 3546 13/01/1946 LNG Langwith Junction 27/10/1946 CLK 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6206 19/02/1934 LNG Langwith Junction 27/10/1946 CLK 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6218 12/03/1944 LNG Langwith Junction 27/10/1946 CLK 06/06/1948 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6249 12/03/1944 LNG Langwith Junction 27/10/1946 CLK 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 3609 28/04/1931 LNG Langwith Junction 27/10/1946 CLK 09/11/1947 STV Staveley (G.C.)
Steam O4 2-8-0 3749 03/08/1943 LNG Langwith Junction 27/10/1946 CLK 09/11/1947 STV Staveley (G.C.)
Steam O4 2-8-0 3750 09/01/1944 LNG Langwith Junction 27/10/1946 CLK 28/03/1948 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6376 17/06/1945 LNG Langwith Junction 27/10/1946 CLK 30/03/1947 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6358 07/04/1946 LNG Langwith Junction 27/10/1946 CLK 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 3695 07/04/1946 LNG Langwith Junction 27/10/1946 CLK 04/07/1948 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 3699 25/02/1945 LNG Langwith Junction 27/10/1946 CLK 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 3794 03/04/1943 LNG Langwith Junction 27/10/1946 CLK 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 3798 12/03/1944 LNG Langwith Junction 27/10/1946 CLK 06/06/1948 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 3801 31/10/1927 LNG Langwith Junction 27/10/1946 CLK 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 3713 03/08/1943 LNG Langwith Junction 27/10/1946 CLK 11/04/1948 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 3858 01/12/1940 LNG Langwith Junction 27/10/1946 CLK 06/02/1949 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 3876 23/09/1945 LNG Langwith Junction 27/10/1946 CLK 30/03/1947 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 3893 15/04/1945 LNG Langwith Junction 27/10/1946 CLK 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 3895 16/09/1927 LNG Langwith Junction 27/10/1946 CLK 28/03/1948 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 3729 25/11/1940 LNG Langwith Junction 27/10/1946 CLK 11/05/1952 40B Immingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 3721 24/11/1946 DON Doncaster 01/12/1946 CLK 23/05/1948 ANN Annesley
Steam J11 0-6-0 4317       05/01/1947 CLK 4w/e 20/08/1955 38B Annesley
Steam J39 0-6-0 4716 30/10/1943 ANN Annesley 30/03/1947 CLK 09/11/1958 40F Boston
Steam J39 0-6-0 4719 30/10/1943 ANN Annesley 30/03/1947 CLK 05/10/1952 35C Spital Bridge
Steam J39 0-6-0 4720 30/10/1943 ANN Annesley 30/03/1947 CLK 20/05/1951 37A Ardsley
Steam J39 0-6-0 4739 30/10/1943 ANN Annesley 30/03/1947 CLK 03/11/1957 38B Annesley
Steam J39 0-6-0 4747 02/12/1933 ANN Annesley 30/03/1947 CLK 03/11/1957 38B Annesley
Steam J39 0-6-0 4750 30/10/1943 ANN Annesley 30/03/1947 CLK 27/09/1953 40D Tuxford
Steam J39 0-6-0 4757 04/04/1932 ANN Annesley 30/03/1947 CLK 20/05/1951 37A Ardsley
Steam J39 0-6-0 4762 21/08/1930 ANN Annesley 30/03/1947 CLK 29/06/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 4805 02/12/1933 ANN Annesley 30/03/1947 CLK 11/12/1949 GOR Gorton
Steam J39 0-6-0 4955 30/10/1943 ANN Annesley 30/03/1947 CLK 03/11/1957 38B Annesley
Steam J39 0-6-0 4980 13/10/1941 ANN Annesley 30/03/1947 CLK 30/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 4732 27/10/1946 BRN Barnsley 27/04/1947 CLK 15/12/1949 14A Cricklewood East
Steam J39 0-6-0 4735 20/10/1946 BRN Barnsley 27/04/1947 CLK 27/09/1953 40D Tuxford
Steam J39 0-6-0 4827 22/12/1946 IMM Immingham 27/04/1947 CLK 01/03/1959 36A Doncaster
Steam J39 0-6-0 4828 22/12/1946 IMM Immingham 27/04/1947 CLK 27/09/1953 40D Tuxford
Steam J39 0-6-0 4974 20/10/1946 BRN Barnsley 27/04/1947 CLK 31/08/1960 Withdrawn
Steam B18 4-6-0 1479 20/10/1946 NEA Neasden 26/06/1947 CLK 21/09/1947 ANN Annesley
Steam B18 4-6-0 1480 20/10/1946 NEA Neasden 26/06/1947 CLK 21/09/1947 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 3635 18/03/1915 ANN Annesley 29/06/1947 CLK 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 3605 14/10/1927 ANN Annesley 29/06/1947 CLK 09/05/1948 SHF Sheffield Darnall
Steam O4 2-8-0 3613 30/03/1947 ANN Annesley 29/06/1947 CLK 09/11/1947 STV Staveley (G.C.)
Steam O4 2-8-0 3614 07/09/1918 ANN Annesley 29/06/1947 CLK 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 3681 06/01/1946 ANN Annesley 29/06/1947 CLK 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 3636 30/03/1947 ANN Annesley 29/06/1947 CLK 11/05/1952 40E Langwith Junction
Steam D2 4-4-0 2150       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 05/1949 Withdrawn
Steam D2 4-4-0 2151       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 04/1949 Withdrawn
Steam D3 4-4-0 2116       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 10/1948 Withdrawn
Steam D3 4-4-0 2123       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 12/1949 Withdrawn
Steam D3 4-4-0 2125       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 08/1949 Withdrawn
Steam D3 4-4-0 2126       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 08/1948 Withdrawn
Steam D3 4-4-0 2135       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 02/1950 Withdrawn
Steam D3 4-4-0 2140       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 06/05/1950 38A Colwick
Steam J69 0-6-0T 8527       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 30/11/1949 STR Stratford
Steam B17 4-6-0 1650       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 07/1949 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam B17 4-6-0 1651       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 07/1949 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam B17 4-6-0 1652       01/01/1948 CLK 4w/e 23/12/1950 31A Cambridge
Steam B17 4-6-0 1653       01/01/1948 CLK 4w/e 23/12/1950 31A Cambridge
Steam B17 4-6-0 1657       01/01/1948 CLK 5w/e 24/03/1951 31A Cambridge
Steam B17 4-6-0 1662       01/01/1948 CLK 4w/e 19/12/1953 30E Colchester
Steam B17 4-6-0 1664       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 07/1949 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam B17 4-6-0 1667       01/01/1948 CLK 4w/e 20/10/1951 38A Colwick
Steam B17 4-6-0 1669       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 07/1949 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam D2 4-4-0 2153       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 04/1949 Withdrawn
Steam D2 4-4-0 2169       01/01/1948 CLK 02/07/1948 Withdrawn
Steam D2 4-4-0 2177       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 10/1949 Withdrawn
Steam D2 4-4-0 2187       01/01/1948 CLK 01/10/1948 Withdrawn
Steam D2 4-4-0 2188       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 10/1949 Withdrawn
Steam D2 4-4-0 2193       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 06/1949 Withdrawn
Steam D2 4-4-0 2194       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 06/1949 Withdrawn
Steam D2 4-4-0 2198       01/01/1948 CLK 27/08/1948 Withdrawn
Steam D2 4-4-0 2199       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 07/1949 Withdrawn
Steam J1 0-6-0 5003       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 01/1953 Withdrawn
Steam J1 0-6-0 5008       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 03/1952 Withdrawn
Steam J1 0-6-0 5010       01/01/1948 CLK 19/01/1953 Withdrawn
Steam J1 0-6-0 5013       01/01/1948 CLK w/e 22/11/1954 Withdrawn
Steam J1 0-6-0 5014       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 08/1953 Withdrawn
Steam J5 0-6-0 5480       01/01/1948 CLK w/e 25/10/1954 Withdrawn
Steam J5 0-6-0 5481       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 10/1953 Withdrawn
Steam J5 0-6-0 5482       01/01/1948 CLK 5w/e 21/06/1952 34D Hitchin (GNR)
Steam J5 0-6-0 5483       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 12/1955 Withdrawn
Steam J5 0-6-0 5484       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 03/1953 Withdrawn
Steam J5 0-6-0 5485       01/01/1948 CLK 4w/e 20/10/1951 38C Leicester (G.C.)
Steam J5 0-6-0 5486       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 12/1954 Withdrawn
Steam J5 0-6-0 5487       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 06/1953 Withdrawn
Steam J5 0-6-0 5488       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 10/1953 Withdrawn
Steam J5 0-6-0 5489       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 12/1953 Withdrawn
Steam J5 0-6-0 5490       01/01/1948 CLK w/e 11/10/1954 Withdrawn
Steam J5 0-6-0 5491       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 10/1953 Withdrawn
Steam J5 0-6-0 5492       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 09/1953 Withdrawn
Steam J5 0-6-0 5493       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 08/1954 Withdrawn
Steam J5 0-6-0 5494       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 01/1955 Withdrawn
Steam J5 0-6-0 5495       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 08/1954 Withdrawn
Steam J5 0-6-0 5496       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 02/1954 Withdrawn
Steam J5 0-6-0 5497       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 11/1953 Withdrawn
Steam J5 0-6-0 5498       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 12/1955 Withdrawn
Steam J5 0-6-0 5499       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 04/1953 Withdrawn
Steam J6 0-6-0 4194       01/01/1948 CLK 25/11/1955 Withdrawn
Steam J6 0-6-0 4197       01/01/1948 CLK 4w/e 15/11/1952 34D Hitchin (GNR)
Steam J6 0-6-0 4199       01/01/1948 CLK 21/04/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J6 0-6-0 4200       01/01/1948 CLK 10/02/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J6 0-6-0 4202       01/01/1948 CLK 25/09/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J6 0-6-0 4212       01/01/1948 CLK 14/12/1955 Withdrawn
Steam J6 0-6-0 4213       01/01/1948 CLK 18/02/1960 Withdrawn
Steam J6 0-6-0 4215       01/01/1948 CLK 24/03/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J6 0-6-0 4222       01/01/1948 CLK 4w/e 24/10/1953 34B Hornsey
Steam J6 0-6-0 4223       01/01/1948 CLK 4w/e 24/10/1953 34B Hornsey
Steam J6 0-6-0 4224       01/01/1948 CLK 4w/e 15/11/1952 35A New England
Steam J6 0-6-0 4230       01/01/1948 CLK 3w/e 31/05/1950 38C Leicester (G.C.)
Steam J6 0-6-0 4231       01/01/1948 CLK 3w/e 31/05/1950 38C Leicester (G.C.)
Steam J6 0-6-0 4233       01/01/1948 CLK 4w/e 24/10/1953 34B Hornsey
Steam J6 0-6-0 4253       01/01/1948 CLK 4w/e 24/10/1953 34B Hornsey
Steam J6 0-6-0 4269       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8981       01/01/1948 CLK 4w/e 20/09/1952 38A Colwick
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8982       01/01/1948 CLK 4w/e 15/11/1952 34B Hornsey
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8807       01/01/1948 CLK 23/09/1955 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8810       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 11/1955 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8812       01/01/1948 CLK 16/09/1955 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8814       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 11/1955 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8839       01/01/1948 CLK 4w/e 20/09/1952 38C Leicester (G.C.)
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8858       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 12/1955 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8859       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 08/1954 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8863       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 05/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8867       01/01/1948 CLK 4w/e 22/03/1952 34C Hatfield
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8875       01/01/1948 CLK 4w/e 13/12/1952 37A Ardsley
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8882       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 01/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8887       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 08/1957 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8762       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 08/1951 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8767       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 12/1950 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8768       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 10/1957 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8779       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 04/1953 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8792       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 06/1952 Withdrawn
Steam K3 2-6-0 1801       01/01/1948 CLK 5w/e 24/07/1954 40A Lincoln
Steam K3 2-6-0 1802       01/01/1948 CLK 3w/e 16/06/1956 40A Lincoln
Steam K3 2-6-0 1808       01/01/1948 CLK 3w/e 31/05/1950 39A Gorton
Steam K3 2-6-0 1816       01/01/1948 CLK 3w/e 31/05/1950 31B March
Steam K3 2-6-0 1821       01/01/1948 CLK 16/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam K3 2-6-0 1824       01/01/1948 CLK 4w/e 24/10/1953 31B March
Steam K3 2-6-0 1826       01/01/1948 CLK 4w/e 24/10/1953 31B March
Steam K3 2-6-0 1865       01/01/1948 CLK 3w/e 31/05/1950 39A Gorton
Steam K3 2-6-0 1894       01/01/1948 CLK w/e 22/10/1960 40E Colwick
Steam K3 2-6-0 1905       01/01/1948 CLK w/e 20/01/1962 40E Colwick
Steam N2 0-6-2T 9501       01/01/1948 CLK 4w/e 19/05/1951 34C Hatfield
Steam N2 0-6-2T 9550       01/01/1948 CLK 4w/e 19/05/1951 34C Hatfield
Steam N2 0-6-2T 9552       01/01/1948 CLK 4w/e 19/05/1951 34C Hatfield
Steam N2 0-6-2T 9555       01/01/1948 CLK 4w/e 19/05/1951 34C Hatfield
Steam N2 0-6-2T 9560       01/01/1948 CLK 4w/e 19/05/1951 34C Hatfield
Steam N5 0-6-2T 9263       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 07/1949 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam N5 0-6-2T 9286       01/01/1948 CLK m/e 30/11/1949 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam N5 0-6-2T 9312       01/01/1948 CLK 5w/e 23/06/1951 39B Sheffield Darnall
Steam N5 0-6-2T 9324       01/01/1948 CLK 5w/e 23/06/1951 39B Sheffield Darnall
Steam O4 2-8-0 3851 06/01/1946 ANN Annesley 08/01/1948 CLK 26/12/1948 ANN Annesley
Steam B1 4-6-0 1282       28/01/1948 (New) CLK 21/11/1948 LEI Leicester (G.C.)
Steam O4 2-8-0 3631 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley 01/02/1948 CLK 04/12/1949 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 3829 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley 01/02/1948 CLK 19/09/1948 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 3899 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley 01/02/1948 CLK 06/06/1948 ANN Annesley
Steam B1 4-6-0 1283       02/02/1948 (New) CLK 06/11/1949 LEI Leicester (G.C.)
Steam O4 2-8-0 3700 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley 08/02/1948 CLK 23/01/1949 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 3638 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley 08/02/1948 CLK 14/11/1948 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 3662 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley 08/02/1948 CLK 06/06/1948 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 3801 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley 08/02/1948 CLK 14/11/1948 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 3720 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley 08/02/1948 CLK 13/06/1948 STV Staveley (G.C.)
Steam B1 4-6-0 1209 01/07/1947 NWE New England (New) 12/02/1948 CLK 21/03/1948 ANN Annesley
Steam K2 2-6-0 1732 04/01/1948 ANN Annesley 22/02/1948 CLK 10/04/1957 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 3762 30/03/1947 ANN Annesley 28/03/1948 CLK 19/09/1948 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 3694 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley 28/03/1948 CLK 30/01/1949 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 3685 26/10/1947 ANN Annesley 09/05/1948 CLK 27/02/1949 SHF Sheffield Darnall
Steam O4 2-8-0 3756 30/03/1947 ANN Annesley 04/07/1948 CLK 29/01/1956 36B Mexborough
Steam O4 2-8-0 3721 23/05/1948 ANN Annesley 19/09/1948 CLK 04/12/1949 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 3894 07/01/1945 ANN Annesley 19/09/1948 CLK 28/11/1948 ANN Annesley
Steam B1 4-6-0 61111 01/06/1947 LEI Leicester (G.C.) 21/11/1948 CLK 07/09/1952 38E Woodford Halse
Steam B1 4-6-0 61092 30/10/1946 SHF Sheffield Darnall (New) 22/11/1948 CLK 12/03/1950 38C Leicester (G.C.)
Steam O4 2-8-0 3573 18/04/1948 ANN Annesley 26/12/1948 CLK 17/09/1950 38B Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 63575 03/11/1912 ANN Annesley 23/01/1949 CLK 05/02/1950 38B Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 3713 11/04/1948 ANN Annesley 30/01/1949 CLK 05/02/1950 38B Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 63580 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley 06/02/1949 CLK 18/12/1949 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 63783 03/02/1946 SHF Sheffield Darnall 06/03/1949 CLK 07/08/1949 SHF Sheffield Darnall
Steam O4 2-8-0 63674 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley 15/05/1949 CLK 18/12/1949 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 63781 18/04/1948 ANN Annesley 15/05/1949 CLK 17/09/1950 38B Annesley
Steam B1 4-6-0 61078 02/03/1947 WFD Woodford Halse 19/06/1949 CLK 27/01/1952 38C Leicester (G.C.)
Steam B1 4-6-0 61088 03/04/1949 WFD Woodford Halse 19/06/1949 CLK 12/03/1950 38C Leicester (G.C.)
Steam B1 4-6-0 61131 04/06/1947 WFD Woodford Halse 19/06/1949 CLK 14/09/1952 30A Stratford
Steam D15 4-4-0 2502 01/01/1948 KL Kings Lynn m/e 07/1949 CLK m/e 02/1952 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68894 01/01/1948 WFD Woodford Halse m/e 07/1949 CLK 4w/e 18/10/1952 34B Hornsey
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8920 01/01/1948 WFD Woodford Halse m/e 07/1949 CLK 4w/e 18/10/1952 34B Hornsey
Steam O4 2-8-0 63762 19/09/1948 ANN Annesley 10/07/1949 CLK 21/10/1951 38D Staveley (G.C.)
Steam O4 2-8-0 63735 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley 11/09/1949 CLK 09/03/1952 31B March
Steam O4 2-8-0 63801 14/11/1948 ANN Annesley 11/09/1949 CLK 02/09/1951 38B Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 63876 30/03/1947 ANN Annesley 20/11/1949 CLK 21/05/1950 39A Gorton
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69809 30/01/1949 BOS Boston 11/12/1949 CLK 07/10/1956 38B Annesley
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69810 30/01/1949 BOS Boston 11/12/1949 CLK 04/02/1951 51A Darlington
Steam A5 4-6-2T 9817 23/01/1949 BOS Boston 11/12/1949 CLK 13/06/1954 39A Gorton
Steam B1 4-6-0 61283 06/11/1949 LEI Leicester (G.C.) 18/12/1949 CLK 05/02/1950 38C Leicester (G.C.)
Steam O4 2-8-0 63638 14/11/1948 ANN Annesley 18/12/1949 CLK 02/04/1950 39A Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 63829 19/09/1948 ANN Annesley 18/12/1949 CLK 08/01/1950 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 63894 28/11/1948 ANN Annesley 18/12/1949 CLK 02/09/1951 38B Annesley
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69801 15/04/1911 NEA Neasden (New) 30/12/1949 CLK 18/02/1951 51A Darlington
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69814 18/11/1929 NEA Neasden 30/12/1949 CLK 29/04/1951 34E Neasden
Steam B1 4-6-0 61123 04/06/1947 LEI Leicester (G.C.) 01/01/1950 CLK 30/09/1951 37A Ardsley
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69825 19/07/1927 NEA Neasden 05/01/1950 CLK 14/10/1956 38B Annesley
Steam B1 4-6-0 61122 04/06/1947 LEI Leicester (G.C.) 08/01/1950 CLK 30/09/1951 37A Ardsley
Steam O4 2-8-0 63599 11/04/1948 ANN Annesley 08/01/1950 CLK 23/04/1950 39A Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 63787 18/12/1949 ANN Annesley 08/01/1950 CLK 08/10/1950 38B Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 63851 26/12/1948 ANN Annesley 08/01/1950 CLK 08/10/1950 38B Annesley
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69823 17/03/1923 NEA Neasden (New) 13/01/1950 CLK 13/06/1954 39A Gorton
Steam B1 4-6-0 61110 01/06/1947 LEI Leicester (G.C.) 22/01/1950 CLK 30/09/1951 38E Woodford Halse
Steam O4 2-8-0 63582 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley 22/01/1950 CLK 21/05/1950 39A Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 63761 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley 22/01/1950 CLK 08/10/1950 38B Annesley
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69805 07/07/1924 NEA Neasden 29/01/1950 CLK 30/07/1950 34E Neasden
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69807 01/07/1911 NEA Neasden (New) 29/01/1950 CLK 14/07/1958 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61141 14/11/1948 LEI Leicester (G.C.) 05/02/1950 38A 12/03/1950 38C Leicester (G.C.)
Steam O4 2-8-0 63804 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley 05/02/1950 38A 14/11/1954 38D Staveley (G.C.)
Steam O4 2-8-0 63899 06/06/1948 ANN Annesley 05/02/1950 38A 21/05/1950 39A Gorton
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69806 24/06/1911 NEA Neasden (New) 12/02/1950 38A 13/06/1954 39A Gorton
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69822 27/06/1940 NEA Neasden 05/03/1950 38A 30/07/1950 34E Neasden
Steam B1 4-6-0 61283 05/02/1950 38C Leicester (G.C.) 12/03/1950 38A 07/11/1954 38E Woodford Halse
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69826 12/05/1923 NEA Neasden (New) 19/03/1950 38A 04/02/1951 51A Darlington
Steam J39 0-6-0 64729 18/08/1946 NWE New England 19/03/1950 38A 01/04/1951 37A Ardsley
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69821 15/02/1943 NEA Neasden 26/03/1950 38A 04/02/1951 40E Langwith Junction
Steam J39 0-6-0 64965 09/02/1947 NWE New England 26/03/1950 38A 12/10/1952 35C Spital Bridge
Steam O4 2-8-0 63829 08/01/1950 ANN Annesley 23/04/1950 38A 08/10/1950 38B Annesley
Steam B1 4-6-0 61367       28/04/1950 (New) 38A 27/05/1951 38E Woodford Halse
Steam B1 4-6-0 61368       05/05/1950 38A 20/05/1951 38E Woodford Halse
Steam D3 4-4-0 62140 01/01/1948 CLK Colwick m/e 06/05/1950 38A m/e 06/1950 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 4805 01/01/1950 GOR Gorton 14/05/1950 38A 27/09/1953 40D Tuxford
Steam J39 0-6-0 64807 03/10/1943 GOR Gorton 14/05/1950 38A 27/09/1953 40D Tuxford
Steam B1 4-6-0 61369       16/05/1950 (New) 38A 12/10/1952 38C Leicester (G.C.)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90330       3w/e 31/05/1950 38A 4w/e 25/11/1950 38D Staveley (G.C.)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 77258       3w/e 31/05/1950 38A w/e 07/05/1960 34E New England
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90251       3w/e 31/05/1950 38A 3w/e 17/05/1952 82B St Philips Marsh
Steam J2 0-6-0 65023 01/01/1948 LEI Leicester (G.C.) 3w/e 31/05/1950 38A m/e 11/1953 Withdrawn
Steam K3 2-6-0 61833 3w/e 31/05/1950 31B March 4w/e 23/09/1950 38A 20/09/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 64798 16/04/1950 38E Woodford Halse 08/10/1950 38A 03/11/1957 38B Annesley
Steam J39 0-6-0 64838 16/04/1950 38E Woodford Halse 08/10/1950 38A 27/09/1953 40D Tuxford
Steam O4 2-8-0 63723 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley 08/10/1950 38A 29/01/1956 36B Mexborough
Steam O4 2-8-0 63618 02/10/1943 ANN Annesley 08/10/1950 38A 30/09/1951 38B Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 63699 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley 08/10/1950 38A 30/09/1951 38B Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 63893 12/10/1947 ANN Annesley 08/10/1950 38A 11/05/1952 40E Langwith Junction
Steam K3 2-6-0 61822 01/01/1948 LIN Lincoln 4w/e 21/10/1950 38A 4w/e 24/10/1953 31B March
Steam K3 2-6-0 61982 01/01/1948 LIN Lincoln 4w/e 21/10/1950 38A 4w/e 18/10/1952 30A Stratford
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90051       4w/e 25/11/1950 38A 4w/e 19/06/1954 40E Langwith Junction
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90122 3w/e 24/12/1949 24B Rose Grove 4w/e 25/11/1950 38A 4w/e 08/09/1951 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90126       4w/e 25/11/1950 38A 4w/e 08/09/1951 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90140       4w/e 25/11/1950 38A 4w/e 08/09/1951 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90147       4w/e 25/11/1950 38A 8w/e 14/06/1952 6B Mold Junction
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90157 5w/e 16/07/1949 25A Wakefield 4w/e 25/11/1950 38A 5w/e 24/03/1951 38D Staveley (G.C.)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90163 5w/e 16/07/1949 25A Wakefield 4w/e 25/11/1950 38A 4w/e 08/09/1951 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90178       4w/e 25/11/1950 38A 8w/e 14/06/1952 6B Mold Junction
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 77209       4w/e 25/11/1950 38A w/e 07/05/1960 34E New England
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90187       4w/e 25/11/1950 38A 4w/e 20/10/1951 38E Woodford Halse
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90197       4w/e 25/11/1950 38A 4w/e 08/09/1951 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90204       4w/e 25/11/1950 38A 4w/e 08/09/1951 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90212 4w/e 30/06/1949 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 25/11/1950 38A 8w/e 14/06/1952 6B Mold Junction
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90242 5w/e 16/07/1949 25A Wakefield 4w/e 25/11/1950 38A 8w/e 14/06/1952 6B Mold Junction
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90638       4w/e 25/11/1950 38A 5w/e 24/03/1951 38E Woodford Halse
Steam K3 2-6-0 61864 4w/e 21/10/1950 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 23/12/1950 38A 4w/e 24/10/1953 31B March
Steam K2 2-6-0 61729 19/11/1950 35B Grantham 21/01/1951 38A 25/06/1957 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 64723 16/11/1941 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) 11/03/1951 38A 05/08/1951 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam J39 0-6-0 64823 30/11/1939 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) 11/03/1951 38A 09/11/1958 40F Boston
Steam K2 2-6-0 61747 17/12/1950 32A Norwich Thorpe 11/03/1951 38A 26/06/1955 41A Sheffield Darnall
Steam O4 2-8-0 63684 18/01/1948 FRO Frodingham 18/03/1951 38A 29/01/1956 36B Mexborough
Steam O4 2-8-0 63602 17/02/1934 FRO Frodingham 18/03/1951 38A 22/01/1956 38B Annesley
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90358 4w/e 25/11/1950 38D Staveley (G.C.) 5w/e 24/03/1951 38A 4w/e 14/02/1953 36B Mexborough
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90036 4w/e 20/01/1951 38D Staveley (G.C.) 5w/e 24/03/1951 38A 4w/e 13/09/1958 40B Immingham
Steam K2 2-6-0 61738 03/12/1947 SL South Lynn 08/04/1951 38A 03/07/1959 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61376       12/04/1951 (New) 38A 30/09/1951 38E Woodford Halse
Steam B1 4-6-0 61377       01/05/1951 (New) 38A 09/12/1951 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90202 4w/e 21/04/1951 38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 19/05/1951 38A w/e 20/02/1960 41D Canklow
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90606       4w/e 19/05/1951 38A 8w/e 14/06/1952 6B Mold Junction
Steam N7 0-6-2T 69613 01/01/1948 STR Stratford 4w/e 19/05/1951 38A 4w/e 19/12/1953 30A Stratford
Steam N7 0-6-2T 69615 01/01/1948 STR Stratford 4w/e 19/05/1951 38A 5w/e 24/04/1954 30A Stratford
Steam N7 0-6-2T 69620 01/01/1948 STR Stratford 4w/e 19/05/1951 38A 5w/e 24/04/1954 30A Stratford
Steam N7 0-6-2T 69638 01/01/1948 STR Stratford 4w/e 19/05/1951 38A 4w/e 21/08/1954 34A Kings Cross
Steam N7 0-6-2T 69651 01/01/1948 STR Stratford 4w/e 19/05/1951 38A 4w/e 19/01/1952 38B Annesley
Steam B1 4-6-0 61378       25/05/1951 (New) 38A 19/10/1952 30A Stratford
Steam O4 2-8-0 63877 08/04/1951 39B Sheffield Darnall 09/06/1951 38A 22/01/1956 38D Staveley (G.C.)
Steam B1 4-6-0 61379       14/06/1951 (New) 38A 08/07/1951 40B Immingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 63839 08/04/1951 39B Sheffield Darnall 19/06/1951 38A 03/04/1959 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90634       5w/e 23/06/1951 38A 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69801 18/02/1951 51A Darlington 01/07/1951 38A 07/10/1956 39A Gorton
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69818 28/01/1951 51A Darlington 01/07/1951 38A 21/10/1956 38B Annesley
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69810 04/02/1951 51A Darlington 08/07/1951 38A 23/10/1958 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90330 4w/e 25/11/1950 38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 21/07/1951 38A 4w/e 14/02/1953 36B Mexborough
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90411 4w/e 20/01/1951 38B Annesley 4w/e 21/07/1951 38A 4w/e 20/10/1951 38E Woodford Halse
Steam B1 4-6-0 61380       22/08/1951 (New) 38A 25/01/1953 38C Leicester (G.C.)
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69826 04/02/1951 51A Darlington 26/08/1951 38A 25/05/1952 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam O4 2-8-0 63772 12/08/1951 20C Royston 02/09/1951 38A 27/04/1952 38D Staveley (G.C.)
Steam O4 2-8-0 63751 12/08/1951 20C Royston 02/09/1951 38A 18/10/1953 38B Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 63754 12/08/1951 20C Royston 02/09/1951 38A 07/02/1964 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63845 12/08/1951 20C Royston 02/09/1951 38A 22/01/1956 38B Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 63849 12/08/1951 20C Royston 02/09/1951 38A 22/02/1952 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63857 12/08/1951 20C Royston 02/09/1951 38A 22/09/1952 37A Ardsley
Steam B1 4-6-0 61381       07/09/1951 (New) 38A 25/11/1951 38E Woodford Halse
Steam O4 2-8-0 63673 02/09/1951 53A Hull Dairycoates 23/09/1951 38A 29/01/1956 36B Mexborough
Steam O4 2-8-0 63812 20/09/1951 53A Hull Dairycoates 23/09/1951 38A 29/01/1956 36B Mexborough
Steam O4 2-8-0 63816 02/09/1951 53A Hull Dairycoates 23/09/1951 38A 15/01/1966 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63835 02/09/1951 53A Hull Dairycoates 23/09/1951 38A 21/03/1954 39A Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 63628 02/09/1951 53A Hull Dairycoates 23/09/1951 38A 29/01/1956 36B Mexborough
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90002 4w/e 20/01/1951 38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 20/10/1951 38A w/e 01/01/1966 36A Doncaster
Steam B17 4-6-0 61651 m/e 07/1949 WFD Woodford Halse 4w/e 20/10/1951 38A 4w/e 19/12/1953 30E Colchester
Steam B17 4-6-0 61667 01/01/1948 CLK Colwick 4w/e 20/10/1951 38A 4w/e 24/10/1953 31B March
Steam J2 0-6-0 65015 01/01/1948 LEI Leicester (G.C.) 4w/e 20/10/1951 38A m/e 12/1953 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63699 30/09/1951 38B Annesley 04/11/1951 38A 08/06/1959 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63801 02/09/1951 38B Annesley 04/11/1951 38A 20/07/1952 38D Staveley (G.C.)
Steam B1 4-6-0 61110 30/09/1951 38E Woodford Halse 25/11/1951 38A 09/12/1951 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam B1 4-6-0 61367 27/05/1951 38E Woodford Halse 30/12/1951 38A 27/01/1952 38C Leicester (G.C.)
Steam B1 4-6-0 61376 30/09/1951 38E Woodford Halse 30/12/1951 38A 10/12/1956 38C Leicester (G.C.)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90052 5w/e 22/09/1951 40B Immingham 4w/e 19/01/1952 38A w/e 09/05/1959 41G Barnsley
Steam O4 2-8-0 63618 30/09/1951 38B Annesley 24/02/1952 38A 29/01/1956 36A Doncaster
Steam K3 2-6-0 61977 01/01/1948 ANN Annesley 4w/e 22/03/1952 38A 4w/e 18/10/1952 30A Stratford
Steam O4 2-8-0 63735 09/03/1952 31B March 30/03/1952 38A 27/12/1953 38D Staveley (G.C.)
Steam B1 4-6-0 61269 24/12/1947 LIN Lincoln (New) 06/04/1952 38A 20/04/1952 40A Lincoln
Steam B1 4-6-0 61280 23/01/1948 LIN Lincoln (New) 06/04/1952 38A 20/04/1952 40A Lincoln
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90411 4w/e 20/10/1951 38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 19/04/1952 38A 4w/e 23/01/1954 31B March
Steam B1 4-6-0 61367 27/01/1952 38C Leicester (G.C.) 27/04/1952 38A 05/05/1957 34A Kings Cross
Steam J39 0-6-0 64891 23/08/1946 DON Doncaster 27/04/1952 38A 12/04/1953 35C Spital Bridge
Steam J39 0-6-0 64976 22/09/1946 DON Doncaster 27/04/1952 38A 27/09/1953 40D Tuxford
Steam J39 0-6-0 64981 20/05/1951 37A Ardsley 27/04/1952 38A 12/04/1953 35C Spital Bridge
Steam O4 2-8-0 63912 26/11/1950 39A Gorton 04/05/1952 38A 18/07/1954 39B Sheffield Darnall
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90423 4w/e 22/03/1952 7A Llandudno Junction 4w/e 17/05/1952 38A 4w/e 24/04/1954 2E Northampton
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90567 4w/e 23/02/1952 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 17/05/1952 38A 4w/e 19/06/1954 40E Langwith Junction
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90432 4w/e 23/02/1952 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 17/05/1952 38A m/e 10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90154       4w/e 17/05/1952 38A w/e 12/12/1959 34E New England
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90157 5w/e 24/03/1951 38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 17/05/1952 38A 8w/e 14/06/1952 6B Mold Junction
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90007 4w/e 23/02/1952 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 17/05/1952 38A 4w/e 13/12/1952 38E Woodford Halse
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90235 4w/e 23/02/1952 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 17/05/1952 38A w/e 22/10/1960 36A Doncaster
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90043 4w/e 20/10/1951 38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 17/05/1952 38A 4w/e 19/06/1954 40E Langwith Junction
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90618       4w/e 17/05/1952 38A 5w/e 17/01/1953 38A Colwick
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90449 4w/e 23/02/1952 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 17/05/1952 38A 4w/e 19/06/1954 40E Langwith Junction
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90674 4w/e 23/02/1952 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 17/05/1952 38A 4w/e 13/11/1954 36A Doncaster
Steam J1 0-6-0 65004 01/01/1948 NWE New England 4w/e 17/05/1952 38A m/e 11/1952 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90346 5w/e 22/09/1951 40B Immingham 5w/e 21/06/1952 38A 4w/e 17/11/1956 38E Woodford Halse
Steam B1 4-6-0 61056 16/12/1951 32B Ipswich 29/06/1952 38A 06/10/1957 32B Ipswich
Steam B1 4-6-0 61192 10/12/1950 30A Stratford 29/06/1952 38A 19/05/1953 91S To Southern Region
Steam B1 4-6-0 61390 12/12/1951 35A New England (New) 29/06/1952 38A 24/10/1954 40B Immingham
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68873 01/01/1948 KX Kings Cross 4w/e 19/07/1952 38A 30/09/1955 Withdrawn
Steam N7 0-6-2T 69621 5w/e 22/09/1951 30A Stratford 4w/e 19/07/1952 38A 4w/e 14/02/1953 38E Woodford Halse
Steam N7 0-6-2T 69654 01/01/1948 STR Stratford 4w/e 19/07/1952 38A 5w/e 24/04/1954 34C Hatfield
Steam O4 2-8-0 63894 02/09/1951 38B Annesley 31/08/1952 38A 29/01/1956 36B Mexborough
Steam B1 4-6-0 61111 07/09/1952 38E Woodford Halse 14/09/1952 38A 07/12/1952 38C Leicester (G.C.)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90532 4w/e 17/05/1952 38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 20/09/1952 38A 4w/e 24/04/1954 2E Northampton
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90369 4w/e 19/07/1952 38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 20/09/1952 38A 4w/e 24/04/1954 2E Northampton
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68981 01/01/1948 CLK Colwick 4w/e 20/09/1952 38A 4w/e 15/11/1952 34B Hornsey
Steam O4 2-8-0 63801 20/07/1952 38D Staveley (G.C.) 22/09/1952 38A 05/10/1952 38D Staveley (G.C.)
Steam O4 2-8-0 63674 18/12/1949 ANN Annesley 28/09/1952 38A 01/02/1953 38D Staveley (G.C.)
Steam O4 2-8-0 63639 30/05/1948 ANN Annesley 28/09/1952 38A 22/01/1956 38B Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 63798 06/06/1948 ANN Annesley 28/09/1952 38A 29/01/1956 36B Mexborough
Steam O4 2-8-0 63851 08/10/1950 38B Annesley 28/09/1952 38A 29/01/1956 36B Mexborough
Steam K2 2-6-0 61737 26/03/1950 30A Stratford 05/10/1952 38A 26/06/1955 41A Sheffield Darnall
Steam K2 2-6-0 61752 17/10/1947 STR Stratford 05/10/1952 38A 11/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam K2 2-6-0 61753 22/10/1947 STR Stratford 05/10/1952 38A 28/09/1959 Withdrawn
Steam K2 2-6-0 61754 17/10/1947 STR Stratford 05/10/1952 38A 30/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam K2 2-6-0 61759 25/09/1947 STR Stratford 05/10/1952 38A 26/06/1955 41A Sheffield Darnall
Steam K2 2-6-0 61777 25/09/1947 STR Stratford 05/10/1952 38A 18/08/1957 35A New England
Steam K2 2-6-0 61780 25/09/1947 STR Stratford 05/10/1952 38A 21/10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61106 15/05/1949 LEI Leicester (G.C.) 12/10/1952 38A 15/02/1953 38C Leicester (G.C.)
Steam J39 0-6-0 64723 05/08/1951 9F Heaton Mersey 12/10/1952 38A 13/10/1952 35C Spital Bridge
Steam J11 0-6-0 64420       4w/e 18/10/1952 38A 4w/e 18/05/1957 38B Annesley
Steam J11 0-6-0 64453       4w/e 18/10/1952 38A 5w/e 17/01/1953 34E Neasden
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68758 01/01/1948 HSY Hornsey 4w/e 18/10/1952 38A m/e 11/1955 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68773 01/01/1948 HSY Hornsey 4w/e 18/10/1952 38A m/e 04/1953 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68781 01/01/1948 HSY Hornsey 4w/e 18/10/1952 38A m/e 12/1954 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68787 01/01/1948 HSY Hornsey 4w/e 18/10/1952 38A m/e 10/1955 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68788 01/01/1948 HSY Hornsey 4w/e 18/10/1952 38A m/e 12/1954 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61033 22/09/1952 30A Stratford 19/10/1952 38A 24/10/1954 31A Cambridge
Steam J1 0-6-0 65002 01/01/1948 NWE New England 4w/e 15/11/1952 38A 21/08/1954 Withdrawn
Steam J5 0-6-0 65482 5w/e 21/06/1952 34D Hitchin (GNR) 4w/e 15/11/1952 38A m/e 11/1953 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68777 01/01/1948 HSY Hornsey 4w/e 15/11/1952 38A w/e 29/11/1954 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68791 01/01/1948 HSY Hornsey 4w/e 15/11/1952 38A w/e 08/11/1954 Withdrawn
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69822 30/07/1950 34E Neasden 07/12/1952 38A 17/02/1957 39A Gorton
Steam B1 4-6-0 61188 02/11/1947 LEI Leicester (G.C.) 07/12/1952 38A 19/05/1953 91S To Southern Region
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68851 4w/e 15/11/1952 38B Annesley 4w/e 13/12/1952 38A m/e 05/1957 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90007 4w/e 13/12/1952 38E Woodford Halse 5w/e 17/01/1953 38A 5w/e 21/01/1956 38D Staveley (G.C.)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90618 4w/e 17/05/1952 38A Colwick 5w/e 17/01/1953 38A w/e 07/05/1960 34E New England
Steam B1 4-6-0 61111 07/12/1952 38C Leicester (G.C.) 28/01/1953 38A 09/01/1955 38E Woodford Halse
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90050 4w/e 18/10/1952 31B March 4w/e 14/02/1953 38A w/e 20/02/1960 34E New England
Steam B1 4-6-0 61186 02/11/1947 LEI Leicester (G.C.) 15/02/1953 38A 01/09/1957 38E Woodford Halse
Steam J11 0-6-0 64375       4w/e 18/04/1953 38A 4w/e 25/09/1954 38C Leicester (G.C.)
Steam J11 0-6-0 64438       4w/e 18/04/1953 38A 4w/e 25/09/1954 38C Leicester (G.C.)
Steam O4 2-8-0 63674 01/02/1953 38D Staveley (G.C.) 26/04/1953 38A 17/07/1955 38D Staveley (G.C.)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90263 4w/e 13/12/1952 38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 16/05/1953 38A w/e 13/12/1958 40B Immingham
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90648 5w/e 24/03/1951 38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 16/05/1953 38A 4w/e 13/09/1958 40B Immingham
Steam N5 0-6-2T 69271 5w/e 24/03/1951 37A Ardsley 4w/e 16/05/1953 38A 5w/e 17/12/1955 41A Sheffield Darnall
Steam B1 4-6-0 61188 19/05/1953 91S To Southern Region 27/05/1953 38A 01/06/1958 15E Leicester (G.C.)
Steam B1 4-6-0 61192 19/05/1953 91S To Southern Region 27/05/1953 38A 27/06/1954 38E Woodford Halse
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68798 4w/e 13/12/1952 36C Frodingham 4w/e 20/06/1953 38A w/e 08/11/1954 Withdrawn
Steam N7 0-6-2T 69621 4w/e 14/02/1953 38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 20/06/1953 38A 5w/e 24/04/1954 30A Stratford
Steam O4 2-8-0 63766 25/06/1945 SHF Sheffield Darnall 21/06/1953 38A 21/11/1954 39A Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 63899 21/05/1950 39A Gorton 21/06/1953 38A 29/11/1953 38D Staveley (G.C.)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90162 5w/e 24/03/1951 35A New England 4w/e 25/07/1953 38A 4w/e 22/01/1955 40E Langwith Junction
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90025 5w/e 22/09/1951 40B Immingham 4w/e 25/07/1953 38A w/e 22/10/1960 36C Frodingham
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90288       4w/e 25/07/1953 38A w/e 16/04/1960 40B Immingham
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90476       4w/e 25/07/1953 38A w/e 22/10/1960 36A Doncaster
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90545 4w/e 23/02/1952 64A St Margarets 4w/e 19/09/1953 38A 4w/e 19/06/1954 40E Langwith Junction
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90038       4w/e 19/09/1953 38A m/e 08/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90496       4w/e 19/09/1953 38A w/e 22/10/1960 36A Doncaster
Steam B1 4-6-0 61201 30/04/1950 32B Ipswich 20/09/1953 38A 19/12/1954 38C Leicester (G.C.)
Steam B1 4-6-0 61271 26/12/1947 NOR Norwich Thorpe (New) 20/09/1953 38A 16/06/1957 38E Woodford Halse
Steam B1 4-6-0 61272 29/12/1947 NOR Norwich Thorpe (New) 20/09/1953 38A 19/12/1954 38C Leicester (G.C.)
Steam O4 2-8-0 63658 02/12/1951 40B Immingham 20/09/1953 38A 18/07/1954 39B Sheffield Darnall
Steam O4 2-8-0 63745 07/06/1953 40B Immingham 20/09/1953 38A 29/01/1956 36B Mexborough
Steam O4 2-8-0 63647 25/06/1950 40B Immingham 20/09/1953 38A 21/06/1959 36C Frodingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 63649 20/05/1951 40B Immingham 20/09/1953 38A 21/11/1954 39A Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 63657 25/06/1950 40B Immingham 20/09/1953 38A 23/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63807 07/06/1953 40B Immingham 20/09/1953 38A 21/03/1954 39A Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 63832 20/05/1951 40B Immingham 20/09/1953 38A 29/01/1956 36B Mexborough
Steam O4 2-8-0 63881 16/09/1951 40B Immingham 20/09/1953 38A 21/03/1954 39B Sheffield Darnall
Steam O4 2-8-0 63729 11/05/1952 40B Immingham 20/09/1953 38A 31/03/1959 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63908 02/12/1951 40B Immingham 20/09/1953 38A 29/01/1956 36B Mexborough
Steam B1 4-6-0 61269 20/04/1952 40A Lincoln 27/09/1953 38A 11/11/1956 38C Leicester (G.C.)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90075 4w/e 21/10/1950 31B March 4w/e 24/10/1953 38A w/e 20/02/1960 34E New England
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90296 5w/e 23/06/1951 31B March 4w/e 24/10/1953 38A w/e 22/10/1960 36A Doncaster
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90433       4w/e 24/10/1953 38A 4w/e 18/02/1956 38E Woodford Halse
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90384       4w/e 24/10/1953 38A 4w/e 19/07/1958 41F Mexborough
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90392       4w/e 24/10/1953 38A 4w/e 24/04/1954 2E Northampton
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90473       4w/e 24/10/1953 38A 16/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J6 0-6-0 64183 01/01/1948 DON Doncaster 4w/e 21/11/1953 38A 4w/e 09/11/1957 38C Leicester (G.C.)
Steam J6 0-6-0 64218 01/01/1948 DON Doncaster 4w/e 21/11/1953 38A 5w/e 14/06/1958 40E Langwith Junction
Steam N5 0-6-2T 69286 m/e 30/11/1949 WFD Woodford Halse 4w/e 21/11/1953 38A 5w/e 17/12/1955 41A Sheffield Darnall
Steam N5 0-6-2T 69360 m/e 07/1949 WFD Woodford Halse 4w/e 21/11/1953 38A 5w/e 17/12/1955 39A Gorton
Steam J11 0-6-0 64369       4w/e 19/12/1953 38A 27/10/1955 Withdrawn
Steam N5 0-6-2T 69263 m/e 07/1949 WFD Woodford Halse 4w/e 19/12/1953 38A 4w/e 13/11/1954 38D Staveley (G.C.)
Steam N5 0-6-2T 69310 01/01/1948 WFD Woodford Halse 4w/e 19/12/1953 38A m/e 11/1955 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63751 18/10/1953 38B Annesley 27/12/1953 38A 29/01/1956 36B Mexborough
Steam J11 0-6-0 64390       4w/e 23/01/1954 38A w/e 02/05/1955 Withdrawn
Steam K3 2-6-0 61824 4w/e 24/10/1953 31B March 4w/e 23/01/1954 38A 4w/e 08/01/1958 38E Woodford Halse
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69451 4w/e 25/07/1953 34B Hornsey 4w/e 23/01/1954 38A 5w/e 23/04/1955 37C Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69481 01/01/1948 KX Kings Cross 4w/e 23/01/1954 38A 3w/e 12/11/1955 37A Ardsley
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69457 01/01/1948 HSY Hornsey 4w/e 20/02/1954 38A 3w/e 12/11/1955 37A Ardsley
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69469 01/01/1948 KX Kings Cross 4w/e 20/02/1954 38A 5w/e 24/04/1954 38D Staveley (G.C.)
Steam B1 4-6-0 61106 15/02/1953 38C Leicester (G.C.) 28/02/1954 38A 08/12/1957 38C Leicester (G.C.)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90208       5w/e 24/04/1954 38A 4w/e 18/02/1956 38E Woodford Halse
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90411 4w/e 23/01/1954 31B March 5w/e 24/04/1954 38A 4w/e 19/06/1954 40E Langwith Junction
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90519       5w/e 24/04/1954 38A w/e 09/05/1959 41G Barnsley
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69441 01/01/1948 HSY Hornsey 5w/e 24/04/1954 38A 5w/e 23/04/1955 37C Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69453 01/01/1948 HSY Hornsey 5w/e 24/04/1954 38A 5w/e 23/04/1955 37A Ardsley
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69467 01/01/1948 KX Kings Cross 5w/e 24/04/1954 38A 5w/e 23/04/1955 37C Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69476 01/01/1948 KX Kings Cross 5w/e 24/04/1954 38A m/e 03/1955 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63599 23/04/1950 39A Gorton 13/06/1954 38A 18/07/1954 39B Sheffield Darnall
Steam O4 2-8-0 63614 26/11/1950 39A Gorton 13/06/1954 38A 28/04/1959 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63638 02/04/1950 39A Gorton 13/06/1954 38A 12/03/1959 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63829 26/11/1950 39A Gorton 13/06/1954 38A 12/10/1958 41J Langwith Junction
Steam O4 2-8-0 63841 26/11/1950 39A Gorton 13/06/1954 38A 29/01/1956 36B Mexborough
Steam O4 2-8-0 63859 26/11/1950 39A Gorton 13/06/1954 38A 18/10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63873 26/11/1950 39A Gorton 13/06/1954 38A 15/01/1966 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63876 21/05/1950 39A Gorton 13/06/1954 38A 29/01/1956 36B Mexborough
Steam O4 2-8-0 63891 21/05/1950 39A Gorton 13/06/1954 38A 29/01/1956 36B Mexborough
Steam K3 2-6-0 61809 01/01/1948 NWE New England 4w/e 19/06/1954 38A 4w/e 08/01/1958 38E Woodford Halse
Steam K3 2-6-0 61856 3w/e 31/05/1950 39A Gorton 4w/e 19/06/1954 38A 4w/e 19/02/1955 38B Annesley
Steam K3 2-6-0 61870 m/e 07/1949 GOR Gorton 4w/e 19/06/1954 38A 12/07/1962 Withdrawn
Steam K3 2-6-0 61896 01/01/1948 NWE New England 4w/e 19/06/1954 38A 14/05/1962 Withdrawn
Steam K3 2-6-0 61914 01/01/1948 MAR March 4w/e 19/06/1954 38A w/e 06/08/1960 40B Immingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 63613 09/11/1947 STV Staveley (G.C.) 27/06/1954 38A 29/01/1956 36A Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 63706 18/11/1951 38D Staveley (G.C.) 27/06/1954 38A 17/07/1955 38D Staveley (G.C.)
Steam O4 2-8-0 63835 21/03/1954 39A Gorton 04/07/1954 38A 29/01/1956 36B Mexborough
Steam O4 2-8-0 63781 26/11/1950 39A Gorton 18/07/1954 38A 29/01/1956 36B Mexborough
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90269       5w/e 24/07/1954 38A w/e 21/02/1959 34E New England
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90276       5w/e 24/07/1954 38A 5w/e 21/01/1956 38D Staveley (G.C.)
Steam J11 0-6-0 64397 4w/e 20/03/1954 35A New England 4w/e 21/08/1954 38A w/e 19/03/1960 40A Lincoln
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68880 01/01/1948 NWE New England 4w/e 21/08/1954 38A m/e 08/1956 Withdrawn
Steam J5 0-6-0 65485 4w/e 20/10/1951 38C Leicester (G.C.) 4w/e 25/09/1954 38A m/e 12/1954 Withdrawn
Steam J11 0-6-0 64288 4w/e 18/10/1952 35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 25/09/1954 38A 5w/e 17/12/1955 39A Gorton
Steam J11 0-6-0 64453 4w/e 18/04/1953 36A Doncaster 4w/e 25/09/1954 38A 4w/e 22/09/1956 38C Leicester (G.C.)
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68821 01/01/1948 NWE New England 4w/e 13/11/1954 38A m/e 03/1956 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68876 01/01/1948 NWE New England 4w/e 13/11/1954 38A m/e 03/1956 Withdrawn
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69469 5w/e 24/04/1954 38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 13/11/1954 38A 3w/e 12/11/1955 37A Ardsley
Steam B1 4-6-0 61092 12/03/1950 38C Leicester (G.C.) 19/12/1954 38A 19/02/1966 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61163 04/07/1954 38C Leicester (G.C.) 19/12/1954 38A 16/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J11 0-6-0 64338 4w/e 18/10/1952 35C Spital Bridge 6w/e 25/12/1954 38A 5w/e 22/10/1955 38C Leicester (G.C.)
Steam J39 0-6-0 64735 27/09/1953 40D Tuxford 16/01/1955 38A 03/08/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 64763 27/09/1953 40D Tuxford 16/01/1955 38A 29/06/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 64976 27/09/1953 40D Tuxford 16/01/1955 38A 25/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68826 4w/e 20/09/1952 35A New England 4w/e 22/01/1955 38A m/e 03/1957 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68852 01/01/1948 NWE New England 4w/e 22/01/1955 38A m/e 12/1955 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68765 01/01/1948 NWE New England 4w/e 22/01/1955 38A m/e 12/1955 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61111 09/01/1955 38E Woodford Halse 06/02/1955 38A 07/10/1956 34A Kings Cross
Steam K3 2-6-0 61974 01/01/1948 ANN Annesley 4w/e 19/02/1955 38A w/e 24/12/1960 40B Immingham
Steam B1 4-6-0 61272 19/12/1954 38C Leicester (G.C.) 20/02/1955 38A 17/02/1957 38B Annesley
Steam B1 4-6-0 61283 07/11/1954 38E Woodford Halse 20/02/1955 38A 15/11/1956 38C Leicester (G.C.)
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67769       5w/e 23/04/1955 38A 4w/e 18/02/1956 34E Neasden
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67796 4w/e 20/09/1952 34E Neasden 5w/e 23/04/1955 38A 5w/e 23/04/1955 34A Kings Cross
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67799 5w/e 17/01/1953 34A Kings Cross 5w/e 23/04/1955 38A 29/03/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 64715 23/09/1945 LIN Lincoln 10/07/1955 38A 06/05/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 64741 26/09/1954 40A Lincoln 10/07/1955 38A 09/11/1958 40F Boston
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90115       5w/e 23/07/1955 38A w/e 22/10/1960 36C Frodingham
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90418       5w/e 23/07/1955 38A 5w/e 21/01/1956 38D Staveley (G.C.)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90394       5w/e 23/07/1955 38A w/e 16/04/1960 40B Immingham
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90460 5w/e 22/09/1951 40B Immingham 5w/e 23/07/1955 38A 4w/e 13/09/1958 40B Immingham
Steam J11 0-6-0 64438 4w/e 25/09/1954 38C Leicester (G.C.) 5w/e 22/10/1955 38A 4w/e 17/11/1956 38E Woodford Halse
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68819 4w/e 19/02/1955 35A New England 5w/e 22/10/1955 38A m/e 06/1956 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68759 4w/e 22/01/1955 35A New England 5w/e 22/10/1955 38A m/e 07/1956 Withdrawn
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69800 26/03/1950 40B Immingham 23/10/1955 38A 15/06/1957 38C Leicester (G.C.)
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69804 15/05/1955 40E Langwith Junction 23/10/1955 38A 07/04/1958 Withdrawn
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69821 10/07/1955 40E Langwith Junction 23/10/1955 38A 17/02/1957 40B Immingham
Steam J11 0-6-0 64317 4w/e 20/08/1955 38B Annesley 3w/e 12/11/1955 38A 5w/e 17/12/1955 39A Gorton
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68975 4w/e 25/07/1953 38B Annesley 3w/e 12/11/1955 38A m/e 07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68860 01/01/1948 DON Doncaster 3w/e 12/11/1955 38A m/e 12/1957 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68785 4w/e 18/10/1952 36A Doncaster 3w/e 12/11/1955 38A m/e 01/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J69 0-6-0T 68550 4w/e 22/03/1952 30A Stratford 5w/e 17/12/1955 38A w/e 27/02/1960 40F Boston
Steam J69 0-6-0T 68552 4w/e 22/03/1952 30A Stratford 5w/e 17/12/1955 38A 5w/e 24/03/1956 30E Colchester
Steam J69 0-6-0T 68629 4w/e 21/10/1950 30A Stratford 5w/e 17/12/1955 38A m/e 11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90659       5w/e 17/12/1955 38A 5w/e 21/01/1956 35A New England
Steam J6 0-6-0 64221 4w/e 20/09/1952 34B Hornsey 5w/e 17/12/1955 38A 01/01/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J6 0-6-0 64239 01/01/1948 HSY Hornsey 5w/e 17/12/1955 38A m/e 10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J6 0-6-0 64248 01/01/1948 BOS Boston 5w/e 17/12/1955 38A 04/03/1959 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63587 18/03/1951 38D Staveley (G.C.) 01/01/1956 38A 23/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63674 17/07/1955 38D Staveley (G.C.) 01/01/1956 38A 15/01/1966 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63675 30/03/1952 38D Staveley (G.C.) 01/01/1956 38A 15/01/1966 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63694 05/02/1950 38D Staveley (G.C.) 01/01/1956 38A 30/10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J6 0-6-0 64267 01/01/1948 ARD Ardsley 5w/e 21/01/1956 38A 28/07/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68871 01/01/1948 ARD Ardsley 5w/e 21/01/1956 38A m/e 02/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68875 4w/e 13/12/1952 37A Ardsley 5w/e 21/01/1956 38A 5w/e 24/03/1956 34B Hornsey
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90053 4w/e 19/06/1954 36B Mexborough 4w/e 18/02/1956 38A w/e 16/04/1960 40B Immingham
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90064 4w/e 24/10/1953 36A Doncaster 4w/e 18/02/1956 38A w/e 09/05/1959 41G Barnsley
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90066 4w/e 19/06/1954 36B Mexborough 4w/e 18/02/1956 38A 4w/e 16/02/1957 38E Woodford Halse
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90104 4w/e 14/02/1953 36B Mexborough 4w/e 18/02/1956 38A m/e 02/1966 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90118 5w/e 24/03/1951 36B Mexborough 4w/e 18/02/1956 38A m/e 11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90119 5w/e 24/03/1951 36B Mexborough 4w/e 18/02/1956 38A 5w/e 24/03/1956 31B March
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90120       4w/e 18/02/1956 38A w/e 22/10/1960 36C Frodingham
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90130       4w/e 18/02/1956 38A w/e 07/05/1960 34E New England
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90005 4w/e 19/06/1954 36B Mexborough 4w/e 18/02/1956 38A w/e 28/09/1963 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90528 m/e 30/11/1949 NWE New England 4w/e 18/02/1956 38A 5w/e 24/03/1956 35A New England
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90144       4w/e 18/02/1956 38A 5w/e 24/03/1956 31B March
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90146       4w/e 18/02/1956 38A w/e 07/05/1960 34E New England
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90150       4w/e 18/02/1956 38A 5w/e 24/03/1956 31B March
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90153       4w/e 18/02/1956 38A 4w/e 19/07/1958 41F Mexborough
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90161 4w/e 31/03/1952 86K Abergavenny 4w/e 18/02/1956 38A w/e 16/04/1960 40B Immingham
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90166       4w/e 18/02/1956 38A w/e 16/04/1960 40B Immingham
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90189       4w/e 18/02/1956 38A w/e 20/02/1960 36C Frodingham
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90244 m/e 30/11/1949 NWE New England 4w/e 18/02/1956 38A 5w/e 24/03/1956 35A New England
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90015 4w/e 14/02/1953 36B Mexborough 4w/e 18/02/1956 38A w/e 21/02/1959 34E New England
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90024 5w/e 18/06/1955 36B Mexborough 4w/e 18/02/1956 38A w/e 20/02/1960 34E New England
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90037 4w/e 24/10/1953 36A Doncaster 4w/e 18/02/1956 38A w/e 01/01/1966 40B Immingham
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90085 4w/e 14/02/1953 36B Mexborough 4w/e 18/02/1956 38A 4w/e 17/11/1956 38D Staveley (G.C.)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90674 4w/e 13/11/1954 36A Doncaster 4w/e 18/02/1956 38A 5w/e 24/03/1956 36A Doncaster
Steam J6 0-6-0 64195 01/01/1948 DON Doncaster 4w/e 18/02/1956 38A 29/01/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68893 4w/e 19/03/1955 30A Stratford 4w/e 18/02/1956 38A m/e 10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68927 4w/e 13/12/1952 38B Annesley 4w/e 18/02/1956 38A m/e 04/1961 Withdrawn
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67771 5w/e 22/09/1951 34E Neasden 4w/e 18/02/1956 38A 5w/e 19/01/1957 38E Woodford Halse
Steam B1 4-6-0 61201 19/12/1954 38C Leicester (G.C.) 20/02/1956 38A 26/10/1958 15E Leicester (G.C.)
Steam J69 0-6-0T 68601 5w/e 23/04/1955 30E Colchester 5w/e 24/03/1956 38A m/e 10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J6 0-6-0 64256 01/01/1948 HSY Hornsey 5w/e 24/03/1956 38A 4w/e 09/11/1957 38C Leicester (G.C.)
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67760 m/e 07/1949 NEA Neasden 5w/e 24/03/1956 38A m/e 08/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68877 01/01/1948 GRA Grantham 4w/e 21/04/1956 38A m/e 11/1956 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63639 22/01/1956 38B Annesley 17/06/1956 38A 19/12/1965 Withdrawn
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69828 11/12/1955 40D Tuxford 09/07/1956 38A 07/10/1956 39A Gorton
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68950 4w/e 18/02/1956 40B Immingham m/e 21/07/1956 38A w/e 20/02/1960 34B Hornsey
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69812 11/03/1956 40F Boston 29/07/1956 38A 07/07/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68829 01/01/1948 HSY Hornsey 4w/e 25/08/1956 38A m/e 02/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J11 0-6-0 64338 5w/e 22/10/1955 38C Leicester (G.C.) 4w/e 22/09/1956 38A 20/10/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68967 4w/e 18/02/1956 40B Immingham 4w/e 22/09/1956 38A m/e 06/1959 Withdrawn
Steam K3 2-6-0 61873 01/01/1948 MAR March 4w/e 22/09/1956 38A 08/05/1962 Withdrawn
Steam K3 2-6-0 61888 01/01/1948 MAR March 4w/e 22/09/1956 38A 25/09/1961 Withdrawn
Steam K3 2-6-0 61947 4w/e 21/07/1951 31B March 4w/e 22/09/1956 38A 01/08/1962 Withdrawn
Steam K3 2-6-0 61975 01/01/1948 ANN Annesley 4w/e 22/09/1956 38A 4w/e 15/12/1956 38B Annesley
Steam K3 2-6-0 61982 4w/e 18/10/1952 30A Stratford 4w/e 22/09/1956 38A 16/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61066 19/06/1949 ANN Annesley 07/10/1956 38A 06/10/1957 31A Cambridge
Steam B1 4-6-0 61209 21/03/1948 ANN Annesley 14/10/1956 38A 16/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67788 5w/e 21/03/1953 34E Neasden 4w/e 20/10/1956 38A 30/05/1962 Withdrawn
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67798 5w/e 21/03/1953 34E Neasden 4w/e 20/10/1956 38A 4w/e 15/06/1957 39A Gorton
Steam B1 4-6-0 61063 19/06/1949 ANN Annesley 21/10/1956 38A 11/11/1956 38C Leicester (G.C.)
Steam B1 4-6-0 61160 20/06/1954 31A Cambridge 28/10/1956 38A 06/10/1957 32B Ipswich
Steam B1 4-6-0 61177 23/10/1955 31A Cambridge 28/10/1956 38A 22/09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61141 12/03/1950 38C Leicester (G.C.) 11/11/1956 38A 25/07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61185 02/11/1947 LEI Leicester (G.C.) 11/11/1956 38A 06/12/1959 40B Immingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 63602 22/01/1956 38B Annesley 11/11/1956 38A 21/06/1959 36C Frodingham
Steam J11 0-6-0 64345       4w/e 17/11/1956 38A 17/12/1958 Withdrawn
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67751 6w/e 25/12/1954 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 17/11/1956 38A 4w/e 15/06/1957 39A Gorton
Steam B1 4-6-0 61088 12/03/1950 38C Leicester (G.C.) 18/11/1956 38A 22/09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61283 15/11/1956 38C Leicester (G.C.) 09/12/1956 38A 05/05/1957 34A Kings Cross
Steam J11 0-6-0 64388       5w/e 19/01/1957 38A 4w/e 08/02/1958 40E Langwith Junction
Steam J11 0-6-0 64438 4w/e 17/11/1956 38E Woodford Halse 5w/e 19/01/1957 38A 11/01/1960 Withdrawn
Steam K3 2-6-0 61804 m/e 21/07/1956 40A Lincoln 4w/e 16/03/1957 38A 5w/e 20/07/1957 38E Woodford Halse
Steam K3 2-6-0 61838 01/01/1948 IMM Immingham 4w/e 16/03/1957 38A 5w/e 20/07/1957 38E Woodford Halse
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67786 4w/e 25/08/1956 34D Hitchin (GNR) 4w/e 16/03/1957 38A 4w/e 21/09/1957 38C Leicester (G.C.)
Steam J11 0-6-0 64361 4w/e 20/08/1955 38D Staveley (G.C.) 5w/e 20/04/1957 38A 25/03/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J11 0-6-0 64354       4w/e 18/05/1957 38A 4w/e 08/02/1958 40D Tuxford
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69805 13/06/1954 39A Gorton 19/05/1957 38A 23/09/1959 Withdrawn
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69828 07/10/1956 39A Gorton 19/05/1957 38A 26/11/1958 Withdrawn
Steam K2 2-6-0 61739 10/07/1955 41A Sheffield Darnall 02/06/1957 38A 27/02/1959 Withdrawn
Steam K2 2-6-0 61749 26/06/1955 41A Sheffield Darnall 02/06/1957 38A 27/01/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J11 0-6-0 64364 4w/e 20/08/1955 38B Annesley 4w/e 21/09/1957 38A 4w/e 19/10/1957 38C Leicester (G.C.)
Steam O1 2-8-0 63594 16/01/1949 ANN Annesley 03/11/1957 38A 24/02/1963 31B March
Steam O1 2-8-0 63589 30/04/1949 ANN Annesley 03/11/1957 38A 09/06/1963 41H Staveley (G.C.)
Steam O1 2-8-0 63592 26/11/1950 38B Annesley 03/11/1957 38A 09/06/1963 41H Staveley (G.C.)
Steam O1 2-8-0 63768 26/11/1950 38B Annesley 03/11/1957 38A 09/06/1963 41H Staveley (G.C.)
Steam O1 2-8-0 63863 16/07/1950 38B Annesley 03/11/1957 38A 09/06/1963 41H Staveley (G.C.)
Steam J11 0-6-0 64352 4w/e 18/05/1957 38B Annesley 4w/e 09/11/1957 38A 4w/e 08/02/1958 40D Tuxford
Steam B1 4-6-0 61299 12/03/1948 LEI Leicester (G.C.) (New) 17/11/1957 38A 25/07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam K3 2-6-0 61808 3w/e 31/05/1950 39A Gorton 4w/e 14/12/1957 38A w/e 27/06/1959 31B March
Steam K3 2-6-0 61837 01/01/1948 IMM Immingham 4w/e 08/01/1958 38A 27/04/1962 Withdrawn
Steam K3 2-6-0 61852 3w/e 14/05/1955 40B Immingham 4w/e 08/01/1958 38A 18/07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J11 0-6-0 64344       4w/e 08/02/1958 38A 02/06/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J11 0-6-0 64392       4w/e 08/02/1958 38A 02/12/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68974 4w/e 25/07/1953 36A Doncaster 4w/e 08/02/1958 38A m/e 08/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J69 0-6-0T 68554 4w/e 20/10/1956 31A Cambridge 4w/e 08/03/1958 38A w/e 17/10/1959 40A Lincoln
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 68033 01/01/1948 IMM Immingham 4w/e 08/03/1958 38A 5w/e 15/11/1958 40B Immingham
Steam B1 4-6-0 61281 19/02/1956 40B Immingham 01/06/1958 38A 19/02/1966 Withdrawn
Steam J69 0-6-0T 68618 4w/e 08/03/1958 40F Boston 4w/e 19/07/1958 40E m/e 08/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J6 0-6-0 64218 5w/e 14/06/1958 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 19/07/1958 40E 18/09/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J69 0-6-0T 68522 5w/e 14/06/1958 30A Stratford 4w/e 16/08/1958 40E w/e 14/11/1959 40F Boston
Steam B1 4-6-0 61188 01/06/1958 15E Leicester (G.C.) 07/09/1958 40E 14/11/1965 Withdrawn
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D3624       19/09/1958 (New) 40E w/e 19/10/1963 40B Immingham
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D3625       02/10/1958 (New) 40E 27/07/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D3626       06/10/1958 (New) 40E 27/07/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D3627       07/10/1958 (New) 40E 27/07/1968 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63585 02/07/1950 40E Langwith Junction 12/10/1958 40E 30/12/1962 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D3628       16/10/1958 (New) 40E 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D3629       20/10/1958 (New) 40E w/e 26/09/1959 34E New England
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D3630       21/10/1958 (New) 40E w/e 26/09/1959 34E New England
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67753 m/e 30/11/1949 KX Kings Cross 5w/e 15/11/1958 40E w/e 06/12/1958 40E Colwick
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67758 5w/e 21/01/1956 34E Neasden 5w/e 15/11/1958 40E w/e 06/12/1958 40E Colwick
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67769 4w/e 18/02/1956 34E Neasden 5w/e 15/11/1958 40E w/e 06/12/1958 40E Colwick
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67753 5w/e 15/11/1958 40E Colwick w/e 06/12/1958 40E 06/02/1962 Withdrawn
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67758 5w/e 15/11/1958 40E Colwick w/e 06/12/1958 40E m/e 09/1961 Withdrawn
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67769 5w/e 15/11/1958 40E Colwick w/e 06/12/1958 40E m/e 09/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 64977 02/09/1951 40A Lincoln 07/12/1958 40E 04/02/1960 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63770 16/09/1951 40B Immingham 07/12/1958 40E 19/12/1965 Withdrawn
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 68028 01/01/1948 IMM Immingham w/e 13/12/1958 40E m/e 09/1960 Withdrawn
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 68072 01/01/1948 IMM Immingham w/e 13/12/1958 40E m/e 09/1960 Withdrawn
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 68076 01/01/1948 IMM Immingham w/e 13/12/1958 40E m/e 09/1960 Withdrawn
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69809 07/10/1956 38B Annesley 14/12/1958 40E 04/05/1959 Withdrawn
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69825 14/10/1956 38B Annesley 14/12/1958 40E 30/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 64802 30/11/1958 40A Lincoln 04/01/1959 40E 25/07/1960 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 64882 30/11/1958 40A Lincoln 04/01/1959 40E 01/03/1959 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Steam J39 0-6-0 64729 07/12/1958 40A Lincoln 08/01/1959 40E 25/01/1959 40F Boston
Steam J11 0-6-0 64348 5w/e 19/01/1957 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 10/01/1959 40E 11/03/1960 Withdrawn
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69800 15/06/1958 15E Leicester (G.C.) 11/01/1959 40E 24/08/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J69 0-6-0T 68545 4w/e 16/08/1958 40A Lincoln w/e 31/01/1959 40E m/e 02/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 64712 09/11/1958 40F Boston 01/03/1959 40E 04/02/1960 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 64887 09/11/1958 40F Boston 01/03/1959 40E 20/01/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43154 w/e 07/03/1959 40F