Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 131 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 4262 Week
» 14432 Month
» 292228 Year
» 1176609 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Corkerhill


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Corkerhill Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2910       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 12/06/1954 67C Ayr
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2911       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 26/01/1952 67D Ardrossan
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2912       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 07/08/1954 67C Ayr
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2913       01/01/1948 30A 5w/e 30/05/1964 67C Ayr
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2914       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 29/12/1951 67C Ayr
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2915       01/01/1948 30A 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2916       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 26/11/1955 67C Ayr
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2917       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 29/10/1955 67C Ayr
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 5560       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 06/09/1952 16A Nottingham
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 5575       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 06/09/1952 14B Kentish Town
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 5576       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 06/09/1952 19B Sheffield Millhouses
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 5643       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 06/09/1952 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 5644       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 06/09/1952 9A Longsight
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 5645       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 04/10/1952 10C Patricroft
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 5646       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 06/09/1952 25G Farnley Junction
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 5693       01/01/1948 30A 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 594       01/01/1948 30A m/e 11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 595       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 20/12/1958 67C Ayr
Steam 2P 4-4-0 596       01/01/1948 30A m/e 09/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 598       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 29/11/1952 66A Polmadie
Steam 2P 4-4-0 599       01/01/1948 30A m/e 05/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 603       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 19/12/1959 61C Keith
Steam 2P 4-4-0 604       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 02/09/1955 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill
Steam 2P 4-4-0 620       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 21/04/1951 67B Hurlford
Steam 2P 4-4-0 621       01/01/1948 30A m/e 10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 622       01/01/1948 30A 8w/e 27/10/1956 61C Keith
Steam 2P 4-4-0 627       01/01/1948 30A m/e 01/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 636       01/01/1948 30A m/e 11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 637       01/01/1948 30A m/e 09/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 641       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 19/12/1959 68C Stranraer
Steam 2P 4-4-0 642       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 19/12/1959 68C Stranraer
Steam 2P 4-4-0 649       01/01/1948 30A m/e 11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 650       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 26/08/1961 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill
Steam 2P 4-4-0 651       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 01/11/1952 66B Motherwell
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7329       01/01/1948 30A m/e 05/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 905       01/01/1948 30A m/e 11/1953 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 906       01/01/1948 30A m/e 01/1955 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 909       01/01/1948 30A m/e 07/1956 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 913       01/01/1948 30A 3w/e 11/12/1948 32B Aviemore
Steam Compound 4-4-0 914       01/01/1948 30A m/e 09/1954 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 919       01/01/1948 30A m/e 01/1954 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 920       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 12/05/1956 68C Stranraer
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1110       01/01/1948 30A m/e 08/1954 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1127       01/01/1948 30A m/e 08/1955 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1148       01/01/1948 30A m/e 03/1953 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1149       01/01/1948 30A m/e 08/1955 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1182       01/01/1948 30A m/e 12/1952 Withdrawn
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 17241       01/01/1948 30A m/e 05/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 17249       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 26/08/1961 67D Ardrossan
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 17255       01/01/1948 30A m/e 03/1952 Withdrawn
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 17266       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 18/02/1956 67D Ardrossan
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 17300       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 18/11/1961 67B Hurlford
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 17309       01/01/1948 30A 8w/e 22/12/1956 67D Ardrossan
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 17359       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 26/01/1952 67B Hurlford
Steam 2P 0-4-4T 15135       01/01/1948 30A m/e 07/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 0-4-4T 15140       01/01/1948 30A m/e 09/1952 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 0-4-4T 15143       01/01/1948 30A m/e 05/1953 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 15182       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 20/01/1951 66C Hamilton (West)
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 15193       01/01/1948 30A m/e 04/1955 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 15206       01/01/1948 30A m/e 09/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 15211       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 19/01/1957 67B Hurlford
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 15219       01/01/1948 30A m/e 05/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 15225       01/01/1948 30A 08/01/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 15235       01/01/1948 30A m/e 05/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 0-4-4T 15266       01/01/1948 30A m/e 09/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 0-4-4T 15269       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 17/01/1959 60E Forres
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56249       01/01/1948 30A m/e 10/1956 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56350       01/01/1948 30A m/e 07/1957 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56361       01/01/1948 30A m/e 11/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56369       01/01/1948 30A m/e 11/1957 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 17560       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 06/07/1957 64C Dalry Road
Steam 3F 0-6-0 57561       01/01/1948 30A m/e 07/1949 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 57562       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 21/12/1957 67B Hurlford
Steam 3F 0-6-0 57566       01/01/1948 30A 8w/e 31/08/1957 67D Ardrossan
Steam 3F 0-6-0 57575       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 28/09/1957 60A Inverness
Steam 3F 0-6-0 57580       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 06/07/1957 67C Ayr
Steam 3F 0-6-0 57589       01/01/1948 30A m/e 10/1956 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 57594       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 17/02/1951 67A Corkerhill
Steam 3F 0-6-0 57596       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 23/11/1957 67C Ayr
Steam 3F 0-6-0 57624       01/01/1948 30A m/e 05/1949 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 57693       01/01/1948 30A m/e 06/1949 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 57694       01/01/1948 30A m/e 02/1950 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 57695       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 20/01/1951 67B Hurlford
Steam 3F 0-6-0 57698       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 20/01/1951 67B Hurlford
Steam 3F 0-6-0 57699       01/01/1948 30A m/e 02/1949 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 57702       01/01/1948 30A m/e 10/1949 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2275       01/01/1948 30A m/e 06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2276       01/01/1948 30A 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2277       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 22/01/1955 63A Perth South
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5047       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 17/05/1952 67C Ayr
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5049       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 17/05/1952 67C Ayr
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5168       01/01/1948 30A 8w/e 21/03/1953 63A Perth South
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5194       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 21/11/1959 67C Ayr
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5251       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 24/10/1959 67D Ardrossan
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5489       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 24/09/1960 67B Hurlford
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5490       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 24/10/1959 67D Ardrossan
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5491       01/01/1948 30A 4w/e 09/08/1952 68A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42744 01/01/1948 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 16/07/1949 67A 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42745 01/01/1948 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 16/07/1949 67A 4w/e 07/08/1954 67C Ayr
Steam 2P 4-4-0 592 01/01/1948 28C Carstairs 4w/e 04/11/1950 67A 4w/e 20/01/1951 67B Hurlford
Steam Compound 4-4-0 40908 01/01/1948 30D Ayr 4w/e 20/01/1951 67A m/e 07/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 57594 01/01/1948 30A Corkerhill 4w/e 17/02/1951 67A 4w/e 26/10/1957 60A Inverness
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45010 01/01/1948 29A Perth South 5w/e 24/03/1951 67A 4w/e 21/04/1951 67B Hurlford
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43996 4w/e 25/11/1950 67B Hurlford 4w/e 21/04/1951 67A 4w/e 21/10/1961 67D Ardrossan
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44001 4w/e 25/11/1950 67B Hurlford 4w/e 21/04/1951 67A 26/03/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45362 4w/e 17/06/1950 64C Dalry Road 4w/e 21/04/1951 67A 4w/e 02/11/1963 65F Grangemouth
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42380 01/01/1948 20E Manningham 8w/e 09/09/1951 67A 5w/e 14/06/1958 56E Sowerby Bridge
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42212 01/01/1948 30C Ardrossan 8w/e 09/09/1951 67A 4w/e 06/10/1951 67D Ardrossan
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45119 01/01/1948 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 8w/e 09/09/1951 67A 4w/e 06/10/1951 65F Grangemouth
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42419 01/01/1948 27B Greenock Ladyburn 4w/e 06/10/1951 67A 8w/e 19/04/1952 66D Greenock Ladyburn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42420 01/01/1948 27B Greenock Ladyburn 4w/e 06/10/1951 67A 8w/e 19/04/1952 66D Greenock Ladyburn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80024       07/12/1951 (New) 67A 24/08/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80025       13/12/1951 (New) 67A 24/08/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42914 4w/e 29/12/1951 67C Ayr 4w/e 26/01/1952 67A 4w/e 06/08/1955 67C Ayr
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45160 01/01/1948 32A Inverness 4w/e 26/01/1952 67A 4w/e 21/11/1959 67C Ayr
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80030 05/02/1952 67C Ayr (New) 8w/e 19/04/1952 67A 4w/e 25/10/1958 67D Ardrossan
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42190 4w/e 18/08/1951 33A Plaistow 8w/e 19/04/1952 67A m/e 08/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42191 5w/e 22/09/1951 33A Plaistow 8w/e 19/04/1952 67A 4w/e 17/05/1952 67A Corkerhill
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42742 4w/e 26/01/1952 67C Ayr 4w/e 17/05/1952 67A 4w/e 14/06/1952 67D Ardrossan
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42806 01/01/1948 30D Ayr 4w/e 17/05/1952 67A 8w/e 16/04/1955 67D Ardrossan
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42191 8w/e 19/04/1952 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 17/05/1952 67A 4w/e 09/04/1960 67D Ardrossan
Steam 3F 0-6-0 57579 01/01/1948 30C Ardrossan 4w/e 14/06/1952 67A 4w/e 28/09/1957 67D Ardrossan
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40605 01/01/1948 28C Carstairs 4w/e 12/07/1952 67A 4w/e 01/11/1952 67B Hurlford
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40572 01/01/1948 30B Hurlford 4w/e 09/08/1952 67A 4w/e 01/11/1952 67B Hurlford
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 57359 4w/e 26/01/1952 67B Hurlford 4w/e 09/08/1952 67A 4w/e 26/08/1961 67B Hurlford
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45621 01/01/1948 19B Sheffield Millhouses 4w/e 04/10/1952 67A 4w/e 24/10/1959 63A Perth South
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45665 01/01/1948 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 04/10/1952 67A 4w/e 21/11/1959 66A Polmadie
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45687 01/01/1948 5A Crewe North 4w/e 04/10/1952 67A 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45711 01/01/1948 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 04/10/1952 67A 4w/e 23/11/1957 66A Polmadie
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45720 01/01/1948 10C Patricroft 4w/e 04/10/1952 67A 4w/e 24/10/1959 63A Perth South
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44791 4w/e 21/04/1951 67B Hurlford 4w/e 04/10/1952 67A 4w/e 26/06/1965 66E Carstairs
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80000 26/09/1952 67C Ayr (New) 4w/e 01/11/1952 67A 4w/e 21/10/1961 67B Hurlford
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80008       15/12/1952 (New) 67A 13/07/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80009       30/12/1952 (New) 67A 24/09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41133 01/01/1948 30D Ayr 4w/e 16/05/1953 67A m/e 09/1954 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40566 4w/e 27/12/1952 66C Hamilton (West) 4w/e 13/06/1953 67A 4w/e 26/12/1953 67B Hurlford
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40598 4w/e 29/11/1952 66A Polmadie 4w/e 13/06/1953 67A m/e 11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40607 4w/e 29/11/1952 66A Polmadie 4w/e 13/06/1953 67A 4w/e 26/12/1953 67D Ardrossan
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40651 4w/e 01/11/1952 66B Motherwell 4w/e 13/06/1953 67A 4w/e 30/10/1954 68A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41142 01/01/1948 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 13/06/1953 67A m/e 07/1956 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40620 4w/e 01/11/1952 66A Polmadie 4w/e 11/07/1953 67A m/e 10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40666 4w/e 29/11/1952 66A Polmadie 4w/e 11/07/1953 67A 4w/e 26/12/1953 67B Hurlford
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41134       4w/e 11/07/1953 67A m/e 09/1954 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41139 01/01/1948 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 11/07/1953 67A m/e 09/1954 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45030 4w/e 24/01/1953 66A Polmadie 8w/e 05/09/1953 67A 4w/e 03/10/1953 66A Polmadie
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40602 01/01/1948 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 07/08/1954 67A 4w/e 30/10/1954 68A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Compound 4-4-0 40913 4w/e 16/05/1953 63A Perth South 4w/e 07/08/1954 67A m/e 08/1955 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41126 01/01/1948 31A St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 07/08/1954 67A 4w/e 04/09/1954 65B St Rollox (Balornock)
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41141 01/01/1948 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 07/08/1954 67A m/e 09/1954 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41146 01/01/1948 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 07/08/1954 67A m/e 10/1954 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41176       4w/e 07/08/1954 67A m/e 01/1955 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45030 4w/e 03/10/1953 66A Polmadie 4w/e 07/08/1954 67A 4w/e 29/10/1955 64C Dalry Road
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45036 4w/e 17/05/1952 66A Polmadie 4w/e 07/08/1954 67A 4w/e 29/10/1955 64C Dalry Road
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45175 01/01/1948 29A Perth South 4w/e 07/08/1954 67A 4w/e 18/02/1956 64D Carstairs
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45677 4w/e 04/10/1952 66A Polmadie 4w/e 04/09/1954 67A 4w/e 29/08/1959 63A Perth South
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45707 4w/e 04/10/1952 66A Polmadie 4w/e 04/09/1954 67A 4w/e 23/11/1957 66A Polmadie
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45173 4w/e 26/12/1953 66A Polmadie 4w/e 04/09/1954 67A 4w/e 17/03/1956 64D Carstairs
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 55187 4w/e 06/09/1952 68D Beattock 4w/e 25/12/1954 67A m/e 02/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42697 01/01/1948 27B Greenock Ladyburn 4w/e 22/01/1955 67A 4w/e 12/05/1956 67D Ardrossan
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73079       31/05/1955 (New) 67A 5w/e 29/04/1967 66A Polmadie
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45011 4w/e 12/06/1954 65A Eastfield 8w/e 09/07/1955 67A 4w/e 29/10/1955 64D Carstairs
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73100       26/08/1955 (New) 67A m/e 01/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73101       01/09/1955 (New) 67A m/e 08/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73102       14/09/1955 (New) 67A m/e 12/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73103       21/09/1955 (New) 67A m/e 10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73104       27/09/1955 (New) 67A m/e 10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80127       07/11/1955 (New) 67A 30/07/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80128       23/11/1955 (New) 67A 4w/e 21/10/1961 67B Hurlford
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73121       01/1956 (New) 67A m/e 01/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73122       01/1956 (New) 67A m/e 09/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73123       02/1956 (New) 67A m/e 05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73124       02/1956 (New) 67A m/e 12/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40647 01/01/1948 30D Ayr 8w/e 27/10/1956 67A 4w/e 26/10/1957 67C Ayr
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44189 4w/e 26/11/1955 68B Dumfries 8w/e 27/10/1956 67A 4w/e 18/11/1961 67C Ayr
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56364 01/01/1948 30C Ardrossan 8w/e 27/10/1956 67A m/e 12/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56267 01/01/1948 31D Grangemouth 8w/e 22/12/1956 67A m/e 07/1958 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76090       06/1957 (New) 67A 4w/e 14/01/1961 65C Parkhead
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76091       06/1957 (New) 67A 4w/e 14/01/1961 65C Parkhead
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76092       06/1957 (New) 67A 5w/e 30/05/1964 67B Hurlford
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76093       07/1957 (New) 67A 4w/e 14/01/1961 65C Parkhead
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76094       08/1957 (New) 67A 4w/e 14/01/1961 65C Parkhead
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76095       08/1957 (New) 67A 4w/e 11/03/1961 65C Parkhead
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76096       09/1957 (New) 67A 4w/e 16/06/1962 67C Ayr
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76097       09/1957 (New) 67A 4w/e 16/06/1962 67C Ayr
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76098       10/1957 (New) 67A 5w/e 30/05/1964 67D Ardrossan
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76099       11/1957 (New) 67A 4w/e 16/06/1962 67C Ayr
Steam Dock 0-6-0T 56156 01/01/1948 27B Greenock Ladyburn 4w/e 12/04/1958 67A m/e 10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45707 4w/e 23/11/1957 66A Polmadie 4w/e 10/05/1958 67A 4w/e 21/11/1959 66A Polmadie
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45711 4w/e 23/11/1957 66A Polmadie 4w/e 10/05/1958 67A 4w/e 21/11/1959 66A Polmadie
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 55227 01/01/1948 20E Manningham 4w/e 05/07/1958 67A 4w/e 25/10/1958 60A Inverness
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45007 4w/e 08/06/1957 64C Dalry Road 4w/e 02/08/1958 67A 4w/e 24/09/1960 67B Hurlford
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45161 4w/e 06/10/1951 64C Dalry Road 4w/e 02/08/1958 67A 4w/e 21/11/1959 64D Carstairs
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44319 01/01/1948 30B Hurlford 4w/e 25/10/1958 67A 4w/e 13/02/1960 67C Ayr
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56279 01/01/1948 30C Ardrossan 4w/e 25/10/1958 67A m/e 11/1960 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80030 4w/e 25/10/1958 67D Ardrossan 4w/e 14/02/1959 67A 08/06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42238 4w/e 22/01/1955 66D Greenock Ladyburn 4w/e 14/02/1959 67A w/e 06/02/1960 6A Chester (MR)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42240 4w/e 22/01/1955 66D Greenock Ladyburn 4w/e 14/02/1959 67A w/e 06/02/1960 6A Chester (MR)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42247 4w/e 19/01/1957 66D Greenock Ladyburn 4w/e 14/02/1959 67A w/e 06/02/1960 6A Chester (MR)
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42800 4w/e 05/07/1958 63A Perth South 4w/e 04/07/1959 67A 4w/e 26/09/1959 67D Ardrossan
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42801 4w/e 22/11/1958 63A Perth South 4w/e 04/07/1959 67A 4w/e 21/11/1959 67C Ayr
Steam Caledonian Pug 0-4-0ST 56031 01/01/1948 28A Motherwell 4w/e 04/07/1959 67A 4w/e 16/01/1960 66B Motherwell
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 55203 01/01/1948 30B Hurlford 4w/e 04/07/1959 67A 21/12/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 0-4-4T 55264 4w/e 18/04/1953 67B Hurlford 4w/e 04/07/1959 67A 4w/e 11/02/1961 67D Ardrossan
Steam 113 4-4-0 54472 8w/e 21/03/1953 60E Forres 4w/e 04/07/1959 67A 4w/e 01/08/1959 65B St Rollox (Balornock)
Steam 113 4-4-0 54473 01/01/1948 32C Forres 4w/e 04/07/1959 67A 4w/e 01/08/1959 65B St Rollox (Balornock)
Steam 3F 0-6-0 57620 01/01/1948 32C Forres 4w/e 04/07/1959 67A w/e 11/06/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45053 8w/e 21/03/1953 63A Perth South 4w/e 04/07/1959 67A 4w/e 22/10/1960 67D Ardrossan
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45452 01/01/1948 29A Perth South 4w/e 04/07/1959 67A 4w/e 21/11/1959 64D Carstairs
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80005 13/11/1952 61A Kittybrewster (New) 4w/e 01/08/1959 67A 5w/e 31/10/1964 67C Ayr
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40011 4w/e 12/04/1958 61C Keith 4w/e 01/08/1959 67A w/e 29/08/1959 24L Carnforth
Steam Caledonian Pug 0-4-0ST 56029 4w/e 29/10/1955 65D Dawsholm 4w/e 01/08/1959 67A 4w/e 24/10/1959 65D Dawsholm
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42270 01/01/1948 28B Dalry Road 4w/e 01/08/1959 67A w/e 06/02/1960 6A Chester (MR)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42271 4w/e 17/01/1959 63A Perth South 4w/e 01/08/1959 67A 4w/e 21/11/1959 64D Carstairs
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42211 01/01/1948 30C Ardrossan 4w/e 26/09/1959 67A w/e 06/02/1960 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44159 4w/e 08/06/1957 67D Ardrossan 4w/e 19/12/1959 67A 4w/e 18/11/1961 67B Hurlford
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44330 4w/e 29/10/1955 67C Ayr 4w/e 19/12/1959 67A w/e 01/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44323 8w/e 16/04/1955 67C Ayr 4w/e 13/02/1960 67A w/e 01/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J83 0-6-0T 68458 01/01/1948 THJ Thornton Junction 4w/e 13/02/1960 67A 4w/e 11/02/1961 67C Ayr
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80047 4w/e 06/10/1956 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 12/03/1960 67A 24/08/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40602 w/e 28/11/1959 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 12/03/1960 67A 4w/e 02/07/1960 67B Hurlford
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40613 w/e 28/11/1959 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 12/03/1960 67A m/e 10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40615 w/e 28/11/1959 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 12/03/1960 67A m/e 10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40629 w/e 28/11/1959 12B Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 12/03/1960 67A m/e 04/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40651 w/e 28/11/1959 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 12/03/1960 67A 4w/e 02/07/1960 67B Hurlford
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40695 8w/e 05/10/1957 11B Barrow in Furness 4w/e 12/03/1960 67A 4w/e 02/07/1960 67B Hurlford
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80044 4w/e 25/02/1956 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 09/04/1960 67A 14/11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80052 4w/e 06/10/1956 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 09/04/1960 67A 07/07/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80045 4w/e 06/10/1956 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 07/05/1960 67A 4w/e 27/03/1965 66F Beattock
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80046 4w/e 30/11/1957 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 07/05/1960 67A 01/05/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80049 4w/e 06/10/1956 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 07/05/1960 67A 08/06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80050 4w/e 06/10/1956 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 07/05/1960 67A 21/11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80051 4w/e 06/10/1956 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 07/05/1960 67A 17/08/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80053 4w/e 06/10/1956 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 07/05/1960 67A 07/07/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45621 4w/e 24/10/1959 63A Perth South 4w/e 07/05/1960 67A 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45665 4w/e 21/11/1959 66A Polmadie 4w/e 07/05/1960 67A 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45707 4w/e 21/11/1959 66A Polmadie 4w/e 07/05/1960 67A 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45711 4w/e 21/11/1959 66A Polmadie 4w/e 07/05/1960 67A 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45720 4w/e 19/12/1959 66A Polmadie 4w/e 07/05/1960 67A 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45164 4w/e 19/02/1955 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 07/05/1960 67A 4w/e 08/09/1962 67C Ayr
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45384 4w/e 06/10/1951 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 07/05/1960 67A 4w/e 22/10/1960 67D Ardrossan
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45486 4w/e 30/10/1954 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 07/05/1960 67A 4w/e 27/08/1960 68C Stranraer
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45673 8w/e 21/03/1953 63A Perth South 4w/e 04/06/1960 67A 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45677 4w/e 29/08/1959 63A Perth South 4w/e 04/06/1960 67A 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45692 4w/e 04/09/1954 63A Perth South 4w/e 04/06/1960 67A 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45727 8w/e 21/03/1953 63A Perth South 4w/e 04/06/1960 67A 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 55231 4w/e 30/10/1954 67C Ayr 4w/e 04/06/1960 67A m/e 06/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44723 4w/e 29/11/1952 60A Inverness 4w/e 04/06/1960 67A 4w/e 28/03/1964 67D Ardrossan
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44798 01/01/1948 32A Inverness 4w/e 04/06/1960 67A m/e 09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45124 01/01/1948 32A Inverness 4w/e 04/06/1960 67A 4w/e 11/02/1961 67B Hurlford
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45460 4w/e 26/10/1957 60A Inverness 4w/e 04/06/1960 67A 4w/e 08/09/1962 67C Ayr
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2439       21/06/1960 (New) 67A 4w/e 26/08/1967 65A Eastfield
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45365 01/01/1948 29A Perth South 4w/e 02/07/1960 67A 4w/e 28/03/1964 67D Ardrossan
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45467 01/01/1948 29A Perth South 4w/e 02/07/1960 67A 4w/e 11/02/1961 67B Hurlford
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2440       11/07/1960 (New) 67A 4w/e 26/08/1967 65A Eastfield
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2441       17/08/1960 (New) 67A 4w/e 16/02/1963 66C Hamilton (West)
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2442       05/09/1960 (New) 67A 4w/e 26/08/1961 66D Greenock Ladyburn
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2443       28/09/1960 (New) 67A 5w/e 30/05/1964 66C Hamilton (West)
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2444       31/10/1960 (New) 67A 4w/e 24/03/1962 66A Polmadie
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45486 4w/e 27/08/1960 68C Stranraer 4w/e 19/11/1960 67A 4w/e 19/11/1960 67C Ayr
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3922       12/01/1961 (New) 67A 4w/e 27/04/1968 64H Leith Central
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3923       20/01/1961 (New) 67A 4w/e 29/05/1971 66A Polmadie
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3924       27/01/1961 (New) 67A 5w/e 31/05/1969 67C Ayr
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3925       01/02/1961 (New) 67A w/e 30/10/1971 9A Longsight
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3926       08/02/1961 (New) 67A 4w/e 26/08/1961 67D Ardrossan
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 D24 15/04/1961 17A Derby (New) w/e 29/04/1961 67A w/e 05/08/1961 17A Derby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45192 4w/e 30/07/1960 63A Perth South 4w/e 06/05/1961 67A 4w/e 29/07/1961 67B Hurlford
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80111 4w/e 11/05/1957 61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 01/07/1961 67A 4w/e 01/07/1961 67B Hurlford
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80112 4w/e 11/05/1957 61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 01/07/1961 67A 4w/e 01/07/1961 67B Hurlford
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40603 m/e 07/1961 Withdrawn 4w/e 01/07/1961 (R) 67A      
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 55221 8w/e 05/09/1953 61C Keith 4w/e 01/07/1961 67A m/e 10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44699       4w/e 01/07/1961 67A 5w/e 30/05/1964 67E Dumfries
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45171 01/01/1948 29A Perth South 4w/e 01/07/1961 67A 4w/e 26/06/1965 66E Carstairs
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45361 4w/e 27/08/1960 63A Perth South 4w/e 01/07/1961 67A 4w/e 30/11/1963 65J Stirling
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45366 01/01/1948 29A Perth South 4w/e 01/07/1961 67A m/e 04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80020 4w/e 01/07/1961 67D Ardrossan 4w/e 29/07/1961 67A 26/06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80021 4w/e 01/07/1961 67D Ardrossan 4w/e 29/07/1961 67A 13/07/1964 Withdrawn
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2442 4w/e 26/08/1961 66D Greenock Ladyburn 4w/e 21/10/1961 67A 5w/e 01/06/1968 62A Thornton Junction
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76091 4w/e 14/01/1961 65C Parkhead 4w/e 21/10/1961 67A 5w/e 30/05/1964 67B Hurlford
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76093 4w/e 14/01/1961 65C Parkhead 4w/e 21/10/1961 67A m/e 02/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76094 4w/e 14/01/1961 65C Parkhead 4w/e 21/10/1961 67A 4w/e 27/06/1964 67B Hurlford
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42203 4w/e 25/11/1950 66B Motherwell 4w/e 21/10/1961 67A 4w/e 18/11/1961 67D Ardrossan
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44801 01/01/1948 5A Crewe North 4w/e 21/10/1961 67A 4w/e 16/02/1963 67B Hurlford
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45488 01/01/1948 28A Motherwell 4w/e 21/10/1961 67A 4w/e 02/11/1963 65F Grangemouth
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45497 01/01/1948 28A Motherwell 4w/e 21/10/1961 67A 6w/e 30/12/1961 67D Ardrossan
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76095 4w/e 11/03/1961 65C Parkhead 6w/e 30/12/1961 67A w/e 16/01/1965 2J Aston
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 D147 16/12/1961 17A Derby (New) w/e 13/01/1962 67A w/e 09/06/1962 17A Derby
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80000 4w/e 21/10/1961 67B Hurlford 4w/e 27/01/1962 67A 4w/e 27/06/1964 67A Corkerhill
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80128 4w/e 21/10/1961 67B Hurlford 4w/e 27/01/1962 67A 04/04/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70050 04/08/1954 66A Polmadie (New) 4w/e 21/04/1962 67A w/e 08/12/1962 6J Holyhead
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70051 11/08/1954 66A Polmadie (New) 4w/e 21/04/1962 67A w/e 08/12/1962 6J Holyhead
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70052 21/08/1954 66A Polmadie (New) 4w/e 21/04/1962 67A w/e 29/05/1965 5B Crewe South
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44784 01/01/1948 12B Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 21/04/1962 67A 4w/e 21/04/1962 67C Ayr
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44785 01/01/1948 12B Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 21/04/1962 67A 4w/e 21/04/1962 67C Ayr
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45117 4w/e 26/10/1957 60A Inverness 4w/e 21/04/1962 67A 4w/e 21/04/1962 67B Hurlford
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45123 01/01/1948 32A Inverness 4w/e 21/04/1962 67A 4w/e 21/04/1962 67B Hurlford
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45470 4w/e 18/11/1961 60A Inverness 4w/e 21/04/1962 67A 4w/e 21/04/1962 67D Ardrossan
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45479 4w/e 18/11/1961 60A Inverness 4w/e 21/04/1962 67A 4w/e 21/04/1962 67D Ardrossan
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76114 4w/e 21/10/1961 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 19/05/1962 67A 9w/e 26/11/1966 66F Beattock
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44784 4w/e 21/04/1962 67C Ayr 4w/e 14/07/1962 67A 5w/e 30/05/1964 67E Dumfries
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44785 4w/e 21/04/1962 67C Ayr 4w/e 14/07/1962 67A m/e 06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76001 4w/e 02/07/1960 63B Fort William 4w/e 08/09/1962 67A 5w/e 30/05/1964 67D Ardrossan
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44322 4w/e 16/06/1962 66B Motherwell 4w/e 08/09/1962 67A 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45467 4w/e 11/02/1961 67B Hurlford 4w/e 24/11/1962 67A 5w/e 30/05/1964 67E Dumfries
Steam B1 4-6-0 61134 18/04/1960 65A Eastfield 31/12/1962 67A 11/03/1963 67C Ayr
Steam B1 4-6-0 61197 29/05/1947 EFD Eastfield (New) 31/12/1962 67A 11/03/1963 67C Ayr
Steam B1 4-6-0 61243 14/10/1947 EFD Eastfield (New) 31/12/1962 67A 11/03/1963 67C Ayr
Steam B1 4-6-0 61261 26/01/1959 65A Eastfield 31/12/1962 67A 11/03/1963 67C Ayr
Steam B1 4-6-0 61355 24/01/1959 65A Eastfield 31/12/1962 67A 11/03/1963 67C Ayr
Steam B1 4-6-0 61396 20/02/1952 65A Eastfield (New) 31/12/1962 67A 11/03/1963 67C Ayr
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73005 06/1951 63A Perth South (New) 4w/e 19/01/1963 67A m/e 06/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73006 06/1951 63A Perth South (New) 4w/e 19/01/1963 67A w/e 18/07/1964 9H Patricroft
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73009 07/1951 63A Perth South (New) 4w/e 19/01/1963 67A m/e 07/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73077 13/05/1955 65A Eastfield (New) 4w/e 19/01/1963 67A m/e 01/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73120 01/1956 63A Perth South (New) 4w/e 19/01/1963 67A m/e 12/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76099 4w/e 16/06/1962 67C Ayr 4w/e 19/01/1963 67A 5w/e 30/05/1964 67D Ardrossan
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44707 4w/e 29/10/1955 65A Eastfield 4w/e 19/01/1963 67A 4w/e 13/04/1963 67E Dumfries
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44957 4w/e 25/12/1954 65A Eastfield 4w/e 19/01/1963 67A 4w/e 13/04/1963 67E Dumfries
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44967 4w/e 13/04/1957 65A Eastfield 4w/e 19/01/1963 67A 4w/e 13/04/1963 67E Dumfries
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44996 4w/e 25/12/1954 65A Eastfield 4w/e 19/01/1963 67A 4w/e 13/04/1963 67E Dumfries
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2438 30/05/1960 67C Ayr (New) 4w/e 11/05/1963 67A 5w/e 01/06/1968 62A Thornton Junction
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3201 5w/e 07/09/1963 66C Hamilton (West) 5w/e 30/05/1964 67A 8w/e 26/03/1966 67C Ayr
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3277 4w/e 24/11/1962 65A Eastfield 4w/e 27/06/1964 67A 8w/e 26/03/1966 67C Ayr
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73057 4w/e 07/08/1954 66A Polmadie 4w/e 27/06/1964 67A m/e 03/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80000 4w/e 27/01/1962 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 27/06/1964 67A 31/12/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73106 4w/e 26/10/1957 63A Perth South 4w/e 25/07/1964 67A m/e 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80077 4w/e 02/11/1963 67D Ardrossan 4w/e 25/07/1964 67A 12/10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80112 4w/e 01/07/1961 67B Hurlford 4w/e 25/07/1964 67A 24/08/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80063 4w/e 12/03/1960 63B Stirling 4w/e 22/08/1964 67A 24/08/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80004 5w/e 26/09/1964 65D Dawsholm 5w/e 31/10/1964 67A 01/05/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78026 5w/e 29/02/1964 67F Stranraer 4w/e 28/11/1964 67A m/e 08/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76046 5w/e 31/10/1964 65F Grangemouth 5w/e 30/10/1965 67A m/e 05/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45488 4w/e 02/11/1963 65F Grangemouth 5w/e 30/10/1965 67A m/e 11/1966 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3215 4w/e 02/11/1963 65F Grangemouth 4w/e 04/12/1965 67A 5w/e 30/12/1967 62C Dunfermline Upper
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13216 4w/e 02/11/1963 65F Grangemouth 4w/e 25/12/1965 67A 5w/e 30/12/1967 62C Dunfermline Upper
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45214 4w/e 01/10/1955 63B Stirling 5w/e 30/04/1966 67A m/e 12/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45357 4w/e 06/08/1955 63B Stirling 5w/e 30/04/1966 67A m/e 12/1966 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3198 5w/e 30/05/1964 66A Polmadie 8w/e 25/06/1966 67A w/e 22/10/1966 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73105 5w/e 30/10/1965 65J Stirling 8w/e 25/06/1966 67A m/e 09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44699 5w/e 30/05/1964 67E Dumfries 8w/e 25/06/1966 67A m/e 05/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44723 5w/e 30/05/1964 67E Dumfries 8w/e 25/06/1966 67A m/e 10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44995 4w/e 21/01/1956 68B Dumfries 8w/e 25/06/1966 67A m/e 11/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45084 8w/e 19/04/1952 63B Stirling 8w/e 25/06/1966 67A 8w/e 25/06/1966 66E Carstairs
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45124 4w/e 11/02/1961 67B Hurlford 5w/e 31/12/1966 67A 4w/e 28/01/1967 66B Motherwell
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3409 5w/e 29/01/1966 65A Eastfield 4w/e 25/03/1967 67A w/e 31/08/1968 34E New England
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3409 5w/e 29/01/1966 65A Eastfield 4w/e 25/03/1967 67A 5w/e 31/08/1968 91E To Eastern Region
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3898 9w/e 26/11/1966 65A Eastfield 4w/e 27/01/1968 67A 4w/e 26/12/1970 67C Ayr
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3396 08/11/1957 65A Eastfield (New) 4w/e 27/04/1968 67A 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A Eastfield
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3297 5w/e 01/06/1968 66A Polmadie 5w/e 31/08/1968 67A 4w/e 26/12/1970 66A Polmadie
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3733 4w/e 24/02/1968 62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 29/11/1969 67A 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A Eastfield
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3906 3w/e 29/06/1968 66A Polmadie 4w/e 26/12/1970 67A 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A Eastfield
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3728 2w/e 21/08/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 67A 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A Eastfield