Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 708 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1655 Week
» 20437 Month
» 268730 Year
» 1153111 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Coventry


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Coventry Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam G1 0-8-0 8892       4w/e 22/06/1946 2F 01/01/1948 2F Coventry
Steam G1 0-8-0 8892 4w/e 22/06/1946 2F Coventry 01/01/1948 2F m/e 01/1949 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9340       01/01/1948 2F 3w/e 14/01/1950 10C Patricroft
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9368       01/01/1948 2F 4w/e 29/12/1951 8A Edge Hill
Steam G1 0-8-0 9135       01/01/1948 2F m/e 08/1948 Withdrawn
Steam G2 0-8-0 9423       01/01/1948 2F 4w/e 19/05/1951 8A Edge Hill
Steam G2 0-8-0 9440       01/01/1948 2F 8w/e 20/04/1957 85C Hereford
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9167       01/01/1948 2F 3w/e 11/12/1948 3B Bushbury
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9278       01/01/1948 2F 8w/e 29/11/1952 3D Aston
Steam G2 0-8-0 9445 01/01/1948 4A Shrewsbury 3w/e 11/12/1948 2F m/e 11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49094 01/01/1948 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 5w/e 16/07/1949 2F 4w/e 05/09/1953 9G Northwich
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49104 01/01/1948 2C Northampton 5w/e 16/07/1949 2F 3w/e 14/01/1950 10B Preston
Steam G2 0-8-0 9441 01/01/1948 2A Rugby 3w/e 14/01/1950 2F w/e 15/11/1958 2B Nuneaton
Steam G2 0-8-0 49442 01/01/1948 10B Preston 3w/e 14/01/1950 2F w/e 15/11/1958 2A Rugby
Steam G2 0-8-0 9417 01/01/1948 10B Preston 4w/e 08/09/1951 2D 4w/e 18/04/1953 2A Rugby
Steam G2 0-8-0 49415 01/01/1948 5B Crewe South 4w/e 18/04/1953 2D w/e 15/11/1958 2B Nuneaton
Steam G2 0-8-0 49425 01/01/1948 3A Bescot 4w/e 18/04/1953 2D w/e 15/11/1958 2B Nuneaton
Steam G2 0-8-0 49411 01/01/1948 8B Warrington Dallam 8w/e 19/06/1954 2D 4w/e 25/01/1958 3B Bushbury
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47359 01/01/1948 1B Camden 8w/e 16/07/1955 2D 4w/e 13/08/1955 5C Stafford
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12045 4w/e 04/12/1954 18A Toton 4w/e 13/08/1955 2D 4w/e 25/02/1956 2A Rugby
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47338 4w/e 23/02/1952 5B Crewe South 4w/e 05/11/1955 2D w/e 15/11/1958 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46420 4w/e 04/10/1952 8D Widnes 4w/e 19/05/1956 2D w/e 15/11/1958 2A Rugby
Steam G2 0-8-0 49431 4w/e 05/11/1955 2F Market Harborough 4w/e 25/01/1958 2D w/e 15/11/1958 2B Nuneaton