Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 140 Today
» 1040 Yesterday
» 1180 Week
» 11350 Month
» 289146 Year
» 1173527 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Crewe South


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Crewe South Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 13277       23/01/1934 (New) 5B by 31/12/1934 26A Newton Heath
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 13276       24/01/1934 (New) 5B by 31/12/1934 26A Newton Heath
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 13275       25/01/1934 (New) 5B by 12/1934 7C  
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 13278       25/01/1934 (New) 5B w/e 19/05/1934 25B  
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 13279       02/02/1934 (New) 5B w/e 19/05/1934 25B  
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 13280 07/02/1934 26A Newton Heath (New) w/e 12/05/1934 5B w/e 19/01/1935 8A  
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 13281 12/02/1934 26A Newton Heath (New) w/e 12/05/1934 5B w/e 06/06/1936 3D Aston
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 13282 08/02/1934 26A Newton Heath (New) w/e 12/05/1934 5B w/e 19/01/1935 1A  
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 13283 09/03/1934 26A Newton Heath (New) w/e 12/05/1934 5B w/e 06/06/1936 3D Aston
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 13284 07/03/1934 26A Newton Heath (New) w/e 12/05/1934 5B w/e 19/01/1935 1A  
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 13258 11/01/1934 14B (New) w/e 13/10/1934 5B w/e 15/12/1934 12B  
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 13259 04/01/1934 14B (New) w/e 13/10/1934 5B w/e 15/07/1935 8A Edge Hill
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 13260 23/12/1933 14B (New) w/e 13/10/1934 5B w/e 24/11/1934 9A  
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 13261 10/01/1934 14B (New) w/e 13/10/1934 5B w/e 24/11/1934 9A  
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 13262 03/01/1934 20A (New) w/e 13/10/1934 5B w/e 09/03/1935 10B Preston
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 13269 w/e 20/10/1934 8B   w/e 20/04/1935 5B w/e 30/11/1935 3D Aston
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 13279 w/e 03/11/1934 24B Rose Grove w/e 25/05/1935 5B w/e 09/11/1935 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 13271 w/e 1935 10C   w/e 01/06/1935 5B w/e 03/10/1936 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2970 w/e 20/10/1934 8A   w/e 15/06/1935 5B w/e 09/05/1936 BHD Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 13268 w/e 20/04/1935 8A Edge Hill w/e 13/07/1935 5B w/e 14/12/1935 3D Aston
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2960 w/e 03/08/1935 1A Willesden w/e 26/10/1935 5B w/e 06/02/1936 8A Edge Hill
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2984 w/e 03/08/1935 1A Willesden w/e 26/10/1935 5B w/e 06/06/1936 3D Aston
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2960 w/e 06/02/1936 8A Edge Hill w/e 07/03/1936 5B w/e 17/10/1936 8C Speke Junction
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2964 w/e 08/05/1936 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 27/03/1937 5B w/e 05/06/1937 BHD Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2961 w/e 29/10/1938 4A Shrewsbury w/e 26/11/1938 5B w/e 08/07/1939 5D Stoke
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2963 w/e 08/10/1938 4A Shrewsbury w/e 26/11/1938 5B w/e 17/07/1943 3A Bescot
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2983 w/e 08/10/1938 4A Shrewsbury w/e 26/11/1938 5B w/e 04/10/1941 9A Longsight
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2966 w/e 25/09/1937 2D Nuneaton w/e 04/02/1939 5B w/e 08/07/1939 5D Stoke
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8116       04/1939 (New) 5B 01/01/1948 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2961 w/e 08/07/1939 5D Stoke w/e 30/09/1939 5B w/e 17/09/1949 BHD Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2966 w/e 08/07/1939 5D Stoke w/e 30/09/1939 5B w/e 17/07/1943 3A Bescot
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2947 w/e 12/02/1938 8A Edge Hill w/e 10/02/1940 5B w/e 29/03/1941 2D Nuneaton
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2955 w/e 29/04/1939 8A Edge Hill w/e 10/02/1940 5B w/e 17/11/1945 8C Speke Junction
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2952 w/e 26/10/1940 7B Bangor w/e 11/01/1941 5B w/e 24/11/1962 5D Stoke
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2980 w/e 20/07/1940 7B Bangor w/e 11/01/1941 5B w/e 18/05/1957 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2958 w/e 20/06/1936 8A Edge Hill w/e 05/07/1941 5B w/e 28/08/1943 8A Edge Hill
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2982 w/e 04/12/1937 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 05/07/1941 5B w/e 04/12/1948 8C Speke Junction
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2945 w/e 23/11/1940 12D Workington w/e 24/01/1942 5B w/e 07/11/1942 8A Edge Hill
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2946 w/e 23/11/1940 12D Workington w/e 24/01/1942 5B w/e 17/11/1945 8C Speke Junction
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2949 w/e 23/11/1940 12D Workington w/e 24/01/1942 5B w/e 20/12/1947 2B Bletchley
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2950 w/e 23/11/1940 12D Workington w/e 21/02/1942 5B w/e 12/09/1953 6B Mold Junction
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2953 w/e 29/04/1939 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 21/02/1942 5B w/e 24/07/1943 6B Mold Junction
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2962 w/e 09/05/1936 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 21/02/1942 5B w/e 18/11/1944 7B Bangor
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2968 w/e 22/11/1941 2D Nuneaton w/e 21/02/1942 5B w/e 03/05/1958 5A Crewe North
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2972 w/e 21/11/1936 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 21/02/1942 5B w/e 28/08/1943 8A Edge Hill
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2974 w/e 10/05/1941 2D Nuneaton w/e 21/02/1942 5B w/e 17/11/1945 8C Speke Junction
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2947 w/e 29/03/1941 2D Nuneaton w/e 15/08/1942 5B w/e 21/08/1943 6B Mold Junction
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2983 w/e 04/10/1941 9A Longsight w/e 29/08/1942 5B w/e 07/1964 2K Bushbury
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2956 w/e 13/11/1937 BHD Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 19/09/1942 5B w/e 26/11/1960 21D Aston
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2960 w/e 12/06/1942 2D Nuneaton w/e 19/09/1942 5B w/e 17/07/1948 3D Aston
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2962 w/e 18/11/1944 7B Bangor w/e 16/12/1944 5B w/e 11/12/1948 8C Speke Junction
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2947 w/e 21/08/1943 6B Mold Junction w/e 15/06/1946 5B w/e 28/05/1949 7B Bangor
Steam G1 0-8-0 8962       4w/e 22/06/1946 5B m/e 12/1948 Withdrawn
Steam G1 0-8-0 9032       4w/e 22/06/1946 5B 01/01/1948 8A Edge Hill
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9070       4w/e 22/06/1946 5B 01/01/1948 2A Rugby
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9275       4w/e 22/06/1946 5B 01/01/1948 5B Crewe South
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2955 w/e 22/06/1946 8A Edge Hill w/e 26/04/1947 5B w/e 08/01/1955 5A Crewe North
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2957 w/e 13/10/1934 8A   w/e 26/04/1947 5B w/e 13/12/1947 2B Bletchley
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2958 w/e 11/05/1946 8A Edge Hill w/e 26/04/1947 5B w/e 06/12/1947 2D Nuneaton
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2977 w/e 25/09/1937 2D Nuneaton w/e 05/07/1947 5B w/e 27/11/1948 8C Speke Junction
Diesel D3/6 0-6-0 7074 04/1936 5A Crewe North (New) 01/01/1948 5B 29/04/1961 Withdrawn
Diesel D3/6 0-6-0 7076       01/01/1948 5B w/e 03/02/1962 Withdrawn
Diesel D3/6 0-6-0 7079       01/01/1948 5B 16/06/1956 Withdrawn
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 7091       01/01/1948 5B 21/10/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 7092       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 21/03/1953 5B Crewe South
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 7094       01/01/1948 5B w/e 07/10/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 7095       01/01/1948 5B 8w/e 14/06/1952 8A Edge Hill
Diesel 11 0-6-0 7120       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 06/11/1954 1A Willesden
Diesel 11 0-6-0 7121       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 06/11/1954 1A Willesden
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12035       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 06/11/1954 1A Willesden
Diesel 11 0-6-0 7122       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 06/11/1954 1A Willesden
Diesel 11 0-6-0 7123       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 06/11/1954 1A Willesden
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12037       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 06/11/1954 1A Willesden
Diesel 11 0-6-0 7124       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 06/11/1954 1A Willesden
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2785       01/01/1948 5B w/e 04/07/1959 26A Newton Heath
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2856       01/01/1948 5B w/e 29/11/1958 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2920       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 04/10/1958 3D Aston
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2939       01/01/1948 5B w/e 15/08/1959 2B Nuneaton
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2944       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 08/10/1955 5B Crewe South
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7266       01/01/1948 5B 3w/e 14/01/1950 5E Alsager
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7280       01/01/1948 5B 3w/e 14/01/1950 5B Crewe South
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7330       01/01/1948 5B w/e 16/07/1960 5D Stoke
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7344       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 23/02/1952 5D Stoke
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7384       01/01/1948 5B 8w/e 14/06/1952 5B Crewe South
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7414       01/01/1948 5B w/e 05/05/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7416       01/01/1948 5B m/e 07/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7431       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 25/01/1958 8A Edge Hill
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7444       01/01/1948 5B w/e 21/01/1961 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7445       01/01/1948 5B w/e 16/07/1960 5B Crewe South
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7451       01/01/1948 5B 3w/e 24/01/1953 10B Preston
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7523       01/01/1948 5B w/e 12/11/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7524       01/01/1948 5B m/e 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7526       01/01/1948 5B w/e 01/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7590       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 17/07/1951 5C Stafford
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7602       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 01/12/1956 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7608       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 18/05/1957 6B Mold Junction
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7616       01/01/1948 5B 8w/e 29/11/1952 5B Crewe South
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7633       01/01/1948 5B 5w/e 24/12/1949 5B Crewe South
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7665       01/01/1948 5B w/e 24/02/1962 Wolverton Works
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7680       01/01/1948 5B m/e 07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7681       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 30/11/1957 27E Walton on the Hill
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4300       01/01/1948 5B 5w/e 24/12/1949 5B Crewe South
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4342       01/01/1948 5B w/e 23/06/1962 5D Stoke
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4344       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 02/12/1950 5B Crewe South
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4359       01/01/1948 5B 2w/e 17/06/1950 5E Alsager
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4387       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 07/10/1950 11B Barrow in Furness
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4453       01/01/1948 5B m/e 03/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4461       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 14/08/1954 12D Workington
Steam 2P 4-4-0 402       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 23/03/1957 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 2P 4-4-0 405       01/01/1948 5B 8w/e 14/06/1952 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam 2P 4-4-0 448       01/01/1948 5B m/e 11/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8191       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 06/10/1956 15B Kettering
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8273       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 03/12/1955 15A Wellingborough
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8310       01/01/1948 5B 3w/e 11/12/1948 2D Nuneaton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8318       01/01/1948 5B 3w/e 14/01/1950 26A Newton Heath
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8320       01/01/1948 5B 5w/e 24/12/1949 2A Rugby
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8340       01/01/1948 5B 3w/e 14/01/1950 1A Willesden
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8345       01/01/1948 5B w/e 20/06/1959 2A Rugby
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8428       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 19/04/1958 6B Mold Junction
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8457       01/01/1948 5B w/e 06/03/1965 8C Speke Junction
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8465       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 14/06/1958 9A Longsight
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8466       01/01/1948 5B 3w/e 11/12/1948 8D Widnes
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8467       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 23/02/1952 20D Normanton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8477       01/01/1948 5B 5w/e 24/12/1949 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8478       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 08/09/1962 84F Stourbridge Junction
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8553       01/01/1948 5B w/e 25/10/1958 26A Newton Heath
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8555       01/01/1948 5B 3w/e 14/01/1950 NTH Northwich
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8559       01/01/1948 5B 5w/e 24/12/1949 2A Rugby
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8708       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 16/06/1951 12B Carlisle Canal
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8716       01/01/1948 5B w/e 25/10/1958 26A Newton Heath
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8723       01/01/1948 5B w/e 20/07/1963 2A Rugby
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8729       01/01/1948 5B 5w/e 24/12/1949 2A Rugby
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8731       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 26/01/1952 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8734       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 06/10/1956 9D Buxton (LNWR)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8740       01/01/1948 5B w/e 22/09/1962 8E Northwich
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8741       01/01/1948 5B 3w/e 11/12/1948 21A Saltley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8742       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 09/10/1954 9G Northwich
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8744       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 17/07/1951 9A Longsight
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8745       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 22/03/1958 9A Longsight
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8746       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 12/07/1958 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8747       01/01/1948 5B 5w/e 24/12/1949 8C Speke Junction
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8748       01/01/1948 5B 3w/e 11/12/1948 21A Saltley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8749       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 09/10/1954 6B Mold Junction
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8750       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 23/02/1952 20A Holbeck (MR)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8753       01/01/1948 5B 3w/e 14/01/1950 8D Widnes
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8757       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 27/01/1951 2A Rugby
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8758       01/01/1948 5B 3w/e 14/01/1950 1A Willesden
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8764       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 10/08/1957 5B Crewe South
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8770       01/01/1948 5B 3w/e 14/01/1950 6B Mold Junction
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8771       01/01/1948 5B w/e 25/07/1959 6B Mold Junction
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8772       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 31/10/1953 15A Wellingborough
Steam 21 0-4-0ST 11221       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 28/01/1956 6H Bangor
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9267       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 20/04/1957 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam G1 0-8-0 9370       01/01/1948 5B 3w/e 14/01/1950 3D Aston
Steam G1 0-8-0 8906       01/01/1948 5B m/e 03/1949 Withdrawn
Steam G1 0-8-0 9272       01/01/1948 5B m/e 02/1948 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9373       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 14/06/1958 3A Bescot
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9369       01/01/1948 5B m/e 04/1950 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9357       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 25/01/1958 10B Preston
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9116       01/01/1948 5B 5w/e 24/12/1949 8D Widnes
Steam G2 0-8-0 9396       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 09/09/1950 2B Nuneaton
Steam G2 0-8-0 9415       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 18/04/1953 2D Coventry
Steam G2 0-8-0 9450       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 28/12/1957 5C Stafford
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9184       01/01/1948 5B m/e 01/1949 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9209       01/01/1948 5B 3w/e 14/01/1950 10C Patricroft
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9210       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 29/12/1951 9D Buxton (LNWR)
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9230       01/01/1948 5B m/e 11/1957 Withdrawn
Steam G1 0-8-0 9232       01/01/1948 5B 2w/e 17/06/1950 Withdrawn
Steam G1 0-8-0 9241       01/01/1948 5B 3w/e 11/12/1948 5B Crewe South
Steam G1 0-8-0 9263       01/01/1948 5B m/e 03/1949 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9275 4w/e 22/06/1946 5B Crewe South 01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 06/10/1956 3A Bescot
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9296       01/01/1948 5B 3w/e 11/12/1948 2D Nuneaton
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 3000       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 27/01/1951 1D Devons Road (Bow)
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 3001       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 27/01/1951 1D Devons Road (Bow)
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 3002       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 04/11/1950 31A Cambridge
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4827       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 02/12/1950 5B Crewe South
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4844       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 29/12/1951 3D Aston
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5028       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 04/11/1950 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5038       01/01/1948 5B 8w/e 16/07/1955 3D Aston
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5041       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 02/12/1950 5B Crewe South
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5044       01/01/1948 5B w/e 20/06/1959 5D Stoke
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5048       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 12/07/1952 6J Holyhead
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5060       01/01/1948 5B w/e 20/06/1959 5D Stoke
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5064       01/01/1948 5B w/e 07/05/1960 21B Bescot
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5067       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 10/08/1957 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5069       01/01/1948 5B 2w/e 17/06/1950 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5072       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 04/11/1950 11A Carnforth
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5073       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 23/02/1957 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5074       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 02/12/1950 5B Crewe South
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5089       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 12/07/1958 6J Holyhead
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5093       01/01/1948 5B 8w/e 19/06/1954 6J Holyhead
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5097       01/01/1948 5B 3w/e 11/12/1948 1A Willesden
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5108       01/01/1948 5B w/e 20/06/1959 9A Longsight
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5128       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 04/11/1950 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5131       01/01/1948 5B w/e 10/06/1961 6J Holyhead
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5134       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 12/07/1952 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5143       01/01/1948 5B w/e 10/10/1964 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5145       01/01/1948 5B w/e 20/06/1964 6H Bangor
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5146       01/01/1948 5B 8w/e 11/07/1953 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5148       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 18/04/1953 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5181       01/01/1948 5B 3w/e 11/12/1948 8A Edge Hill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5183       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 06/10/1951 64C Dalry Road
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5189       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 20/04/1957 5D Stoke
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5195       01/01/1948 5B 8w/e 29/11/1952 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5197       01/01/1948 5B w/e 10/03/1962 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5198       01/01/1948 5B 3w/e 11/12/1948 5B Crewe South
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5235       01/01/1948 5B 2w/e 17/06/1950 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5236       01/01/1948 5B 3w/e 11/12/1948 8A Edge Hill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5239       01/01/1948 5B 8w/e 11/07/1953 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5240       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 18/04/1953 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5242       01/01/1948 5B 3w/e 11/12/1948 8A Edge Hill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5248       01/01/1948 5B 3w/e 11/12/1948 8A Edge Hill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5254       01/01/1948 5B 8w/e 11/07/1953 6J Holyhead
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5255       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 22/03/1952 7A Llandudno Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5270       01/01/1948 5B w/e 18/06/1960 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5271       01/01/1948 5B 8w/e 11/07/1953 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5300       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 18/04/1953 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5305       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 02/12/1950 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5317       01/01/1948 5B 4w/e 26/02/1955 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2972 w/e 20/07/1946 8C Speke Junction w/e 24/04/1948 5B w/e 24/11/1962 5D Stoke
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2974 w/e 17/11/1945 8C Speke Junction w/e 24/04/1948 5B w/e 19/06/1948 2D Nuneaton
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42815 01/01/1948 8C Speke Junction 3w/e 11/12/1948 5B 5w/e 21/06/1952 35C Spital Bridge
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42926 01/01/1948 8C Speke Junction 3w/e 11/12/1948 5B w/e 20/06/1959 2B Nuneaton
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2934 01/01/1948 8C Speke Junction 3w/e 11/12/1948 5B 8w/e 05/10/1957 9A Longsight
Steam Cauliflowers 0-6-0 28531       3w/e 11/12/1948 5B m/e 01/1950 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9205 01/01/1948 2C Northampton 3w/e 11/12/1948 5B 5w/e 24/12/1949 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Steam G1 0-8-0 49241 01/01/1948 5B Crewe South 3w/e 11/12/1948 5B 4w/e 27/01/1951 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44834 01/01/1948 5A Crewe North 3w/e 11/12/1948 5B 4w/e 07/09/1957 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45185 01/01/1948 10B Preston 3w/e 11/12/1948 5B m/e 16/06/1956 5D Stoke
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5198 01/01/1948 5B Crewe South 3w/e 11/12/1948 5B w/e 10/06/1961 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5294 01/01/1948 9A Longsight 3w/e 11/12/1948 5B 8w/e 11/07/1953 9A Longsight
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5301 01/01/1948 7A Llandudno Junction 3w/e 11/12/1948 5B 4w/e 18/04/1953 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45303 01/01/1948 7A Llandudno Junction 3w/e 11/12/1948 5B 4w/e 10/08/1957 11A Carnforth
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5369 01/01/1948 5A Crewe North 3w/e 11/12/1948 5B 4w/e 12/07/1952 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5374 01/01/1948 5A Crewe North 3w/e 11/12/1948 5B 3w/e 14/01/1950 2A Rugby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5493 01/01/1948 5A Crewe North 3w/e 11/12/1948 5B 5w/e 16/07/1949 3B Bushbury
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12055       4w/e 16/07/1949 (New) 5B 4w/e 04/12/1954 1A Willesden
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48736 01/01/1948 4A Shrewsbury 5w/e 16/07/1949 5B 4w/e 23/02/1952 8C Speke Junction
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42954 w/e 28/06/1947 7A Llandudno Junction w/e 01/10/1949 5B w/e 12/11/1949 3D Aston
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42984 w/e 25/06/1949 7A Llandudno Junction w/e 01/10/1949 5B 28/09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48012       2w/e 03/12/1949 5B 3w/e 14/01/1950 2E Warwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48018       2w/e 03/12/1949 5B 3w/e 14/01/1950 2E Warwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48252       2w/e 03/12/1949 5B 4w/e 01/12/1956 1A Willesden
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48259       2w/e 03/12/1949 5B 4w/e 21/03/1953 3A Bescot
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48289       2w/e 03/12/1949 5B w/e 15/08/1959 2B Nuneaton
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47633 01/01/1948 5B Crewe South 5w/e 24/12/1949 5B 8w/e 14/06/1952 5E Alsager
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44300 01/01/1948 5B Crewe South 5w/e 24/12/1949 5B 4w/e 02/12/1950 5E Alsager
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48020       3w/e 24/12/1949 5B 3w/e 14/01/1950 2D Nuneaton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48077       3w/e 24/12/1949 5B 3w/e 14/01/1950 2D Nuneaton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48094       3w/e 24/12/1949 5B 4w/e 31/10/1953 8C Speke Junction
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48246       3w/e 24/12/1949 5B w/e 08/07/1961 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48251       3w/e 24/12/1949 5B w/e 18/04/1959 2B Nuneaton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48255       3w/e 24/12/1949 5B w/e 05/11/1960 8E Northwich
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49315 01/01/1948 9D Buxton (LNWR) 5w/e 24/12/1949 5B 4w/e 09/10/1954 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48254       w/e 31/12/1949 5B 4w/e 04/11/1950 9G Northwich
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48261       w/e 31/12/1949 5B 4w/e 22/03/1952 11E Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48286       w/e 31/12/1949 5B 4w/e 22/03/1952 11E Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48291       w/e 31/12/1949 5B w/e 15/08/1959 2B Nuneaton
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7280 01/01/1948 5B Crewe South 3w/e 14/01/1950 5B w/e 05/08/1961 5D Stoke
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48257 5w/e 24/12/1949 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 3w/e 14/01/1950 5B 4w/e 18/05/1957 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43189 01/01/1948 11A Carnforth 3w/e 14/01/1950 5B 4w/e 16/06/1957 9A Longsight
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43207 01/01/1948 8B Warrington Dallam 3w/e 14/01/1950 5B 4w/e 25/02/1956 9G Northwich
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44386 01/01/1948 10D Plodder Lane 2w/e 17/06/1950 5B 4w/e 02/12/1950 5E Alsager
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44807 01/01/1948 5A Crewe North 4w/e 07/10/1950 5B 8w/e 11/07/1953 5A Crewe North
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12078       31/10/1950 (New) 5B 4w/e 04/12/1954 1A Willesden
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44125 01/01/1948 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 04/11/1950 5B w/e 09/07/1960 9D Buxton (LNWR)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44708 4w/e 07/10/1950 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 04/11/1950 5B 4w/e 16/05/1953 5A Crewe North
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44079 01/01/1948 10D Plodder Lane 4w/e 02/12/1950 5B w/e 23/06/1962 5D Stoke
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44341 01/01/1948 10D Plodder Lane 4w/e 02/12/1950 5B 4w/e 06/10/1951 9G Northwich
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44344 01/01/1948 5B Crewe South 4w/e 02/12/1950 5B w/e 15/08/1959 5D Stoke
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44827 01/01/1948 5B Crewe South 4w/e 02/12/1950 5B 4w/e 16/05/1953 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44911 01/01/1948 7A Llandudno Junction 4w/e 02/12/1950 5B 4w/e 18/04/1953 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45028 4w/e 04/11/1950 5A Crewe North 4w/e 02/12/1950 5B 8w/e 29/11/1952 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45041 01/01/1948 5B Crewe South 4w/e 02/12/1950 5B 4w/e 23/02/1957 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45074 01/01/1948 5B Crewe South 4w/e 02/12/1950 5B w/e 15/12/1962 5D Stoke
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48258 4w/e 09/09/1950 9G Northwich 4w/e 31/12/1950 5B 4w/e 06/10/1956 2B Nuneaton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48751 4w/e 07/10/1950 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 31/12/1950 5B 4w/e 27/01/1951 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48754 01/01/1948 25G Farnley Junction 4w/e 31/12/1950 5B 4w/e 27/01/1951 4A Bletchley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48756 4w/e 02/12/1950 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 31/12/1950 5B 4w/e 27/01/1951 4A Bletchley
Steam 21 0-4-0ST 51218 4w/e 04/11/1950 3E Monument Lane 4w/e 31/12/1950 5B 4w/e 08/08/1953 10B Preston
Steam Cauliflowers 0-6-0 58426 3w/e 14/01/1950 9B Stockport Edgeley 4w/e 31/12/1950 5B 4w/e 24/02/1951 7A Llandudno Junction
Steam Cauliflowers 0-6-0 58429 3w/e 11/12/1948 3B Bushbury 4w/e 31/12/1950 5B 4w/e 04/10/1952 3D Aston
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45128 4w/e 04/11/1950 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe 4w/e 31/12/1950 5B 4w/e 19/04/1952 5A Crewe North
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48296 4w/e 24/03/1951 9G Northwich 4w/e 19/05/1951 5B 4w/e 03/12/1955 6D Chester Northgate
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47598 01/01/1948 5C Stafford 4w/e 17/07/1951 5B 8w/e 29/11/1952 5E Alsager
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49271 01/01/1948 2C Northampton 4w/e 17/07/1951 5B 4w/e 06/10/1951 8A Edge Hill
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42851 01/01/1948 3A Bescot 4w/e 08/09/1951 5B 4w/e 29/12/1951 2B Nuneaton
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42894 5w/e 16/07/1949 3A Bescot 4w/e 08/09/1951 5B w/e 29/11/1958 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12049 4w/e 08/09/1951 1A Willesden 4w/e 06/10/1951 5B 4w/e 06/11/1954 1A Willesden
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42854 4w/e 27/01/1951 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 06/10/1951 5B 4w/e 29/12/1951 2B Nuneaton
Steam Sentinel 0-4-0T 47183 01/01/1948 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 06/10/1951 5B 8w/e 11/07/1953 84G Shrewsbury
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45111 01/01/1948 7C Holyhead 4w/e 06/10/1951 5B 4w/e 26/01/1952 8A Edge Hill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45350 4w/e 24/02/1951 7C Holyhead 4w/e 06/10/1951 5B 4w/e 18/04/1953 5A Crewe North
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42978 w/e 21/07/1951 3D Aston w/e 03/11/1951 5B w/e 05/07/1952 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Sentinel 0-4-0T 47184 4w/e 24/02/1951 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 29/12/1951 5B m/e 12/1955 Withdrawn
Steam G2 0-8-0 49454 01/01/1948 1A Willesden 4w/e 29/12/1951 5B m/e 06/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45327 01/01/1948 12B Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 29/12/1951 5B 4w/e 26/01/1952 8C Speke Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45403 3w/e 11/12/1948 10C Patricroft 4w/e 29/12/1951 5B 4w/e 31/10/1953 6A Chester (MR)
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42965 w/e 12/01/1952 8C Speke Junction w/e 26/01/1952 5B w/e 14/02/1953 6B Mold Junction
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42962 w/e 11/12/1948 8C Speke Junction w/e 09/02/1952 5B w/e 30/06/1962 2B Nuneaton
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47338 01/01/1948 5D Stoke 4w/e 23/02/1952 5B 4w/e 05/11/1955 2D Coventry
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43187 01/01/1948 20H Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 23/02/1952 5B 4w/e 27/02/1954 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43330 01/01/1948 20H Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 23/02/1952 5B 4w/e 22/03/1958 99C Crewe Works
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45327 4w/e 26/01/1952 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 23/02/1952 5B 8w/e 11/07/1953 9A Longsight
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42964 w/e 09/02/1952 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 22/03/1952 5B w/e 19/09/1953 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47384 01/01/1948 5B Crewe South 8w/e 14/06/1952 5B m/e 10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44840 01/01/1948 21A Saltley 8w/e 14/06/1952 5B 4w/e 18/04/1953 5A Crewe North
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48529 01/01/1948 24C Lostock Hall 4w/e 09/08/1952 5B w/e 20/06/1959 2E Northampton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48736 4w/e 23/02/1952 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 09/08/1952 5B 8w/e 29/11/1952 9G Northwich
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48743 3w/e 11/12/1948 21A Saltley 4w/e 09/08/1952 5B w/e 24/07/1965 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42953 w/e 28/06/1947 BHD Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 20/09/1952 5B w/e 17/04/1954 5A Crewe North
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42851 4w/e 29/12/1951 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 04/10/1952 5B m/e 16/06/1956 11E Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42815 5w/e 21/06/1952 35C Spital Bridge 8w/e 29/11/1952 5B w/e 18/04/1959 5A Crewe North
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42933 01/01/1948 8C Speke Junction 8w/e 29/11/1952 5B w/e 15/08/1959 2B Nuneaton
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42941 01/01/1948 2D Nuneaton 8w/e 29/11/1952 5B 3w/e 24/01/1953 8C Speke Junction
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47616 01/01/1948 5B Crewe South 8w/e 29/11/1952 5B 4w/e 06/10/1956 8D Widnes
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48736 8w/e 29/11/1952 9G Northwich 3w/e 24/01/1953 5B w/e 20/06/1959 2E Northampton
Steam Cauliflowers 0-6-0 58429 4w/e 04/10/1952 3D Aston 3w/e 24/01/1953 5B m/e 02/1953 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45446 01/01/1948 3D Aston 4w/e 21/02/1953 5B 4w/e 18/04/1953 5A Crewe North
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12012 5w/e 03/01/1953 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 21/03/1953 5B 4w/e 16/05/1953 8C Speke Junction
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12015 01/01/1948 5B Crewe South 4w/e 21/03/1953 5B 4w/e 16/05/1953 8C Speke Junction
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58221       4w/e 21/03/1953 5B 8w/e 11/07/1953 2B Nuneaton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48287 4w/e 21/02/1953 1A Willesden 4w/e 21/03/1953 5B w/e 15/08/1959 2B Nuneaton
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45028 8w/e 29/11/1952 5A Crewe North 4w/e 18/04/1953 5B 8w/e 16/07/1955 6B Mold Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45048 8w/e 29/11/1952 5A Crewe North 4w/e 18/04/1953 5B 4w/e 21/04/1956 2A Rugby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45128 4w/e 12/07/1952 5A Crewe North 4w/e 18/04/1953 5B w/e 24/07/1965 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45134 8w/e 29/11/1952 5A Crewe North 4w/e 18/04/1953 5B w/e 18/06/1960 21E Monument Lane
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45195 3w/e 24/01/1953 5A Crewe North 4w/e 18/04/1953 5B 4w/e 17/07/1954 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45307 4w/e 04/10/1952 5A Crewe North 4w/e 18/04/1953 5B 8w/e 11/07/1953 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45369 4w/e 12/07/1952 5A Crewe North 4w/e 18/04/1953 5B 4w/e 11/08/1956 5A Crewe North
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12007 01/01/1948 18A Toton 4w/e 16/05/1953 5B 8w/e 11/07/1953 8C Speke Junction
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12027 4w/e 31/12/1950 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 16/05/1953 5B 8w/e 11/07/1953 8C Speke Junction
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58196       8w/e 11/07/1953 5B m/e 07/1958 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49318 01/01/1948 2D Nuneaton 8w/e 11/07/1953 5B 4w/e 02/01/1954 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44971 5w/e 03/01/1953 8A Edge Hill 8w/e 11/07/1953 5B 4w/e 02/01/1954 2A Rugby
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43562 3w/e 14/01/1950 9D Buxton (LNWR) 4w/e 08/08/1953 5B w/e 10/01/1959 9G Gorton
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45135 4w/e 29/12/1951 4A Bletchley 4w/e 08/08/1953 5B 4w/e 28/11/1953 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45353 4w/e 07/10/1950 4A Bletchley 4w/e 08/08/1953 5B 4w/e 11/08/1956 8A Edge Hill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45004 8w/e 11/07/1953 10C Patricroft 4w/e 05/09/1953 5B 4w/e 28/11/1953 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42948 w/e 25/06/1949 3D Aston w/e 26/09/1953 5B w/e 31/10/1953 3D Aston
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42979 w/e 13/06/1953 3D Aston w/e 26/09/1953 5B w/e 31/10/1953 3D Aston
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12012 4w/e 16/05/1953 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 03/10/1953 5B w/e 05/11/1960 21E Monument Lane
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42777 01/01/1948 2D Nuneaton 4w/e 03/10/1953 5B w/e 15/08/1959 2A Rugby
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42813 01/01/1948 9A Longsight 4w/e 03/10/1953 5B w/e 14/03/1959 21A Saltley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45314 01/01/1948 2B Bletchley 4w/e 03/10/1953 5B 4w/e 28/11/1953 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12052 4w/e 03/10/1953 2A Rugby 4w/e 31/10/1953 5B 4w/e 04/12/1954 1A Willesden
Steam 21 0-4-0ST 51218 4w/e 08/08/1953 10B Preston 4w/e 31/10/1953 5B w/e 13/12/1958 27A Bank Hall
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42950 w/e 12/09/1953 6B Mold Junction w/e 21/11/1953 5B w/e 16/01/1960 2A Rugby
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12013 01/01/1948 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 02/01/1954 5B 8w/e 19/06/1954 1A Willesden
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45391 01/01/1948 2A Rugby 4w/e 02/01/1954 5B w/e 12/08/1967 10D Lostock Hall
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45034 01/01/1948 2A Rugby 4w/e 27/02/1954 5B 8w/e 16/07/1955 3D Aston
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13050       22/05/1954 (New) 5B 4w/e 04/12/1954 1A Willesden
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13051       19/06/1954 (New) 5B m/e 14/08/1954 1E Bletchley
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13052       19/06/1954 (New) 5B m/e 14/08/1954 1E Bletchley
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13053       19/06/1954 (New) 5B m/e 14/08/1954 2A Rugby
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42776 01/01/1948 9A Longsight 8w/e 19/06/1954 5B w/e 18/04/1959 5A Crewe North
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42932 8w/e 29/11/1952 9A Longsight 8w/e 19/06/1954 5B 8w/e 16/07/1955 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48248 4w/e 27/01/1951 2A Rugby 8w/e 19/06/1954 5B w/e 05/11/1960 8E Northwich
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48626 01/01/1948 1A Willesden 8w/e 19/06/1954 5B 4w/e 03/12/1955 6D Chester Northgate
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13054       17/07/1954 (New) 5B m/e 14/08/1954 2A Rugby
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13055       17/07/1954 (New) 5B m/e 14/08/1954 2A Rugby
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58271 4w/e 23/02/1952 16A Nottingham 4w/e 14/08/1954 5B 4w/e 18/05/1957 99C Crewe Works
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47516 4w/e 03/10/1953 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 11/09/1954 5B w/e 10/02/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45302 01/01/1948 10C Patricroft 4w/e 09/10/1954 5B 4w/e 03/11/1956 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45385 8w/e 19/06/1954 6J Holyhead 4w/e 09/10/1954 5B 4w/e 06/11/1954 6J Holyhead
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12005 01/01/1948 1A Willesden 4w/e 06/11/1954 5B w/e 30/05/1959 6A Chester (MR)
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12020 4w/e 24/04/1954 1A Willesden 4w/e 06/11/1954 5B w/e 30/09/1961 6B Mold Junction
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12021 01/01/1948 1A Willesden 4w/e 06/11/1954 5B w/e 29/04/1967 8C Speke Junction
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12022 01/01/1948 1A Willesden 4w/e 06/11/1954 5B w/e 25/07/1959 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12023 01/01/1948 1A Willesden 4w/e 06/11/1954 5B w/e 25/07/1959 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12030 01/01/1948 1A Willesden 4w/e 06/11/1954 5B w/e 05/11/1960 21B Bescot
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12031 01/01/1948 1A Willesden 4w/e 06/11/1954 5B w/e 10/06/1961 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12032 01/01/1948 1A Willesden 4w/e 06/11/1954 5B w/e 10/06/1961 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42940 8w/e 11/07/1953 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 06/11/1954 5B 4w/e 04/10/1958 3D Aston
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45093 8w/e 19/06/1954 6J Holyhead 4w/e 06/11/1954 5B 4w/e 14/06/1958 5D Stoke
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45111 4w/e 26/01/1952 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 06/11/1954 5B 4w/e 30/11/1957 5A Crewe North
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12004 01/01/1948 1A Willesden 4w/e 04/12/1954 5B w/e 05/11/1960 21E Monument Lane
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12009 01/01/1948 1A Willesden 4w/e 04/12/1954 5B w/e 11/09/1965 1H Northampton
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12010 01/01/1948 1A Willesden 4w/e 04/12/1954 5B w/e 18/07/1964 8C Speke Junction
Steam G2 0-8-0 49448 6w/e 30/06/1951 86K Abergavenny 4w/e 04/12/1954 5B 4w/e 23/02/1957 2A Rugby
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12019 01/01/1948 1A Willesden 4w/e 01/01/1955 5B w/e 25/07/1959 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42953 w/e 17/04/1954 5A Crewe North w/e 08/01/1955 5B w/e 03/08/1957 5B Crewe South
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12013 8w/e 19/06/1954 1A Willesden 4w/e 29/01/1955 5B w/e 05/11/1960 21B Bescot
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12029 01/01/1948 1A Willesden 4w/e 29/01/1955 5B 4w/e 01/12/1956 8C Speke Junction
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12026 4w/e 31/12/1950 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 23/04/1955 5B 4w/e 13/08/1955 8C Speke Junction
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48292 4w/e 23/04/1955 9G Northwich 4w/e 21/05/1955 5B w/e 10/06/1961 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Sentinel 0-4-0T 47181 4w/e 02/01/1954 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 21/05/1955 5B 4w/e 10/09/1955 84G Shrewsbury
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13172       07/09/1955 (New) 5B 4w/e 04/10/1958 24K Preston
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13173       20/09/1955 (New) 5B 4w/e 25/02/1956 1A Willesden
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13174       23/09/1955 (New) 5B 4w/e 25/02/1956 1A Willesden
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13175       29/09/1955 (New) 5B w/e 10/12/1966 6J Holyhead
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13176       30/09/1955 (New) 5B w/e 23/07/1960 9A Longsight
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42944 01/01/1948 5B Crewe South 4w/e 08/10/1955 5B 4w/e 04/10/1958 3D Aston
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44186 4w/e 21/02/1953 2E Northampton 4w/e 05/11/1955 5B w/e 15/08/1959 5D Stoke
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44385 4w/e 22/03/1952 5D Stoke 4w/e 05/11/1955 5B m/e 08/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44592 01/01/1948 3E Monument Lane 4w/e 05/11/1955 5B m/e 10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48630 4w/e 08/10/1955 9G Northwich 4w/e 03/12/1955 5B w/e 31/07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45188 01/01/1948 10C Patricroft 4w/e 31/12/1955 5B 4w/e 10/08/1957 9A Longsight
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45426 01/01/1948 10C Patricroft 4w/e 31/12/1955 5B 4w/e 16/06/1957 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45180 4w/e 29/01/1955 12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 28/01/1956 5B 4w/e 14/06/1958 6J Holyhead
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44827 4w/e 28/01/1956 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 25/02/1956 5B 8w/e 05/10/1957 12A Carlisle Upperby
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13245       14/05/1956 (New) 5B w/e 22/11/1958 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45048 4w/e 21/04/1956 2A Rugby m/e 16/06/1956 5B w/e 20/06/1964 5A Crewe North
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43207 4w/e 25/02/1956 9G Northwich 4w/e 11/08/1956 5B w/e 10/01/1959 9G Gorton
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42932 8w/e 16/07/1955 9F Heaton Mersey 4w/e 06/10/1956 5B 4w/e 14/06/1958 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48626 4w/e 03/12/1955 6D Chester Northgate 4w/e 06/10/1956 5B w/e 23/06/1962 1E Bletchley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45301 m/e 16/06/1956 5D Stoke 4w/e 06/10/1956 5B w/e 11/04/1959 3E Monument Lane
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45305 m/e 16/06/1956 6J Holyhead 4w/e 06/10/1956 5B 4w/e 30/11/1957 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45311 8w/e 19/06/1954 6J Holyhead 4w/e 06/10/1956 5B 4w/e 14/06/1958 5D Stoke
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48505 4w/e 22/03/1952 11E Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 03/11/1956 5B 4w/e 19/04/1958 9D Buxton (LNWR)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48734 4w/e 06/10/1956 9D Buxton (LNWR) 4w/e 03/11/1956 5B w/e 07/01/1961 21B Bescot
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49025 4w/e 06/10/1951 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 03/11/1956 5B 4w/e 26/01/1957 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44868 4w/e 09/09/1950 7C Holyhead 4w/e 03/11/1956 5B w/e 20/06/1959 6J Holyhead
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45000 4w/e 24/03/1956 5A Crewe North 4w/e 03/11/1956 5B 4w/e 23/02/1957 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45003 4w/e 21/04/1956 5A Crewe North 4w/e 03/11/1956 5B 4w/e 26/01/1957 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45353 4w/e 11/08/1956 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 03/11/1956 5B 4w/e 23/02/1957 1A Willesden
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45390 4w/e 24/03/1956 5A Crewe North 4w/e 03/11/1956 5B 4w/e 26/01/1957 5A Crewe North
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13089 4w/e 24/03/1956 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 01/12/1956 5B 4w/e 04/10/1958 24K Preston
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48411 01/01/1948 19G Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 01/12/1956 5B w/e 20/06/1959 2A Rugby
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42948 w/e 05/12/1953 1A Willesden w/e 08/12/1956 5B w/e 24/11/1962 5D Stoke
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42966 w/e 05/12/1953 1A Willesden w/e 08/12/1956 5B w/e 03/05/1958 5A Crewe North
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42747 01/01/1948 1A Willesden 4w/e 29/12/1956 5B 4w/e 26/01/1957 1A Willesden
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48252 4w/e 01/12/1956 1A Willesden 4w/e 29/12/1956 5B w/e 20/06/1959 2A Rugby
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42937 4w/e 27/02/1954 1A Willesden 4w/e 26/01/1957 5B w/e 18/04/1959 5A Crewe North
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42959 w/e 12/02/1949 6B Mold Junction w/e 09/02/1957 5B w/e 24/11/1962 5D Stoke
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42964 w/e 09/06/1956 6B Mold Junction w/e 09/02/1957 5B w/e 26/11/1960 21D Aston
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48263 4w/e 03/11/1956 5C Stafford 4w/e 23/02/1957 5B w/e 15/08/1959 2B Nuneaton
Steam G2 0-8-0 49448 4w/e 23/02/1957 2A Rugby 4w/e 20/04/1957 5B 4w/e 30/11/1957 10D Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44807 8w/e 11/07/1953 5A Crewe North 4w/e 16/06/1957 5B 4w/e 10/08/1957 5D Stoke
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42953 w/e 08/01/1955 5B Crewe South w/e 03/08/1957 5B w/e 17/08/1957 5B Crewe South
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42980 w/e 18/05/1957 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 03/08/1957 5B w/e 24/11/1962 5D Stoke
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47608 4w/e 18/05/1957 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 10/08/1957 5B w/e 03/02/1962 99C Crewe Works
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48111 4w/e 02/01/1954 16A Nottingham 4w/e 10/08/1957 5B w/e 15/08/1959 2B Nuneaton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48257 4w/e 18/05/1957 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 10/08/1957 5B w/e 07/01/1961 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48764 01/01/1948 5B Crewe South 4w/e 10/08/1957 5B 4w/e 28/12/1957 8D Widnes
Steam 1142 0-6-0 58135 4w/e 03/12/1955 3A Bescot 4w/e 10/08/1957 5B w/e 09/05/1959 3E Monument Lane
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42953 w/e 03/08/1957 5B Crewe South w/e 17/08/1957 5B w/e 16/01/1960 2A Rugby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45067 4w/e 10/08/1957 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 07/09/1957 5B w/e 20/06/1964 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44681 4w/e 03/10/1953 6J Holyhead 8w/e 05/10/1957 5B w/e 11/07/1959 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44824 01/01/1948 20A Holbeck (MR) 8w/e 05/10/1957 5B w/e 21/03/1959 56F Low Moor
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45002 4w/e 07/09/1957 12A Carlisle Upperby 8w/e 05/10/1957 5B w/e 20/06/1959 6J Holyhead
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42787 4w/e 10/08/1957 1A Willesden 4w/e 30/11/1957 5B 4w/e 09/08/1958 26A Newton Heath
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42885 4w/e 07/09/1957 1A Willesden 4w/e 30/11/1957 5B w/e 14/02/1959 1A Willesden
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58271 4w/e 18/05/1957 99C Crewe Works 4w/e 30/11/1957 5B w/e 09/05/1959 3E Monument Lane
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45003 4w/e 26/01/1957 5A Crewe North 4w/e 30/11/1957 5B w/e 20/06/1959 5D Stoke
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45188 4w/e 07/09/1957 5A Crewe North 4w/e 30/11/1957 5B w/e 18/06/1960 21E Monument Lane
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3019 21/03/1953 1A Willesden (New) 4w/e 28/12/1957 5B 4w/e 06/09/1958 8C Speke Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45000 4w/e 23/02/1957 12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 28/12/1957 5B w/e 20/06/1959 6J Holyhead
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48764 4w/e 28/12/1957 8D Widnes 4w/e 25/01/1958 5B 4w/e 09/08/1958 1A Willesden
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12011 01/01/1948 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 22/02/1958 5B 12/03/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 27 0-6-0 52201 4w/e 30/11/1957 10D Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 22/02/1958 5B 4w/e 19/04/1958 99C Crewe Works
Steam G2 0-8-0 49417 4w/e 18/04/1953 2A Rugby 4w/e 22/02/1958 5B 4w/e 19/04/1958 8D Widnes
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49180 4w/e 06/10/1951 1A Willesden 4w/e 22/02/1958 5B m/e 03/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42931 4w/e 18/05/1957 9A Longsight 4w/e 22/03/1958 5B 4w/e 17/05/1958 1A Willesden
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42935 4w/e 07/09/1957 9A Longsight 4w/e 22/03/1958 5B w/e 15/08/1959 2B Nuneaton
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43187 4w/e 25/01/1958 3D Aston 4w/e 22/03/1958 5B w/e 10/01/1959 9G Gorton
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43389 4w/e 08/08/1953 3D Aston 4w/e 22/03/1958 5B w/e 10/01/1959 9G Gorton
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44871 4w/e 31/10/1953 5D Stoke 4w/e 22/03/1958 5B w/e 18/06/1960 5D Stoke
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45149 4w/e 12/07/1952 5D Stoke 4w/e 22/03/1958 5B w/e 10/06/1961 6A Chester (MR)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48516 01/01/1948 25A Wakefield 4w/e 19/04/1958 5B w/e 14/09/1963 5D Stoke
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48709 4w/e 30/11/1957 9D Buxton (LNWR) 4w/e 19/04/1958 5B 4w/e 17/05/1958 9G Gorton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48693 4w/e 20/04/1957 9G Northwich 4w/e 17/05/1958 5B w/e 07/01/1961 81E Didcot
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45299 4w/e 22/03/1958 12B Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 17/05/1958 5B w/e 26/01/1963 1E Bletchley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45300 4w/e 18/04/1953 5A Crewe North 4w/e 17/05/1958 5B w/e 22/06/1963 6J Holyhead
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47467 01/01/1948 1B Camden 4w/e 14/06/1958 5B m/e 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48174 4w/e 24/04/1954 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 14/06/1958 5B w/e 21/01/1961 5C Stafford
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48548 4w/e 28/12/1957 2A Rugby 4w/e 14/06/1958 5B w/e 14/09/1963 5D Stoke
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48633 4w/e 17/05/1958 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 14/06/1958 5B w/e 05/03/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48655 4w/e 22/03/1958 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 14/06/1958 5B w/e 10/06/1961 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48659 4w/e 30/11/1957 2E Northampton 4w/e 14/06/1958 5B w/e 29/06/1963 89B Croes Newydd
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48692 4w/e 20/04/1957 2E Northampton 4w/e 14/06/1958 5B w/e 10/06/1961 8C Speke Junction
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43410 01/01/1948 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 14/06/1958 5B 4w/e 04/10/1958 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49048 4w/e 26/03/1955 5C Stafford 4w/e 14/06/1958 5B m/e 11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 48922 4w/e 26/03/1955 5C Stafford 4w/e 14/06/1958 5B m/e 05/1959 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49158 01/01/1948 2C Northampton 4w/e 14/06/1958 5B m/e 10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49229 3w/e 14/01/1950 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 14/06/1958 5B w/e 07/11/1959 3B Bushbury
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44713 4w/e 21/04/1956 1A Willesden 4w/e 14/06/1958 5B w/e 10/11/1962 2E Northampton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48297 4w/e 14/06/1958 3D Aston 4w/e 12/07/1958 5B w/e 31/01/1959 8E Northwich
Steam G2 0-8-0 49417 4w/e 19/04/1958 8D Widnes 4w/e 12/07/1958 5B m/e 11/1959 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8004 09/08/1957 1D Devons Road (Bow) (New) 4w/e 09/08/1958 5B w/e 21/05/1960 1A Willesden
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43394 01/01/1948 4A Shrewsbury 4w/e 09/08/1958 5B w/e 10/01/1959 9G Gorton
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43464 01/01/1948 22A Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 09/08/1958 5B 4w/e 04/10/1958 99C Crewe Works
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3577       28/08/1958 (New) 5B w/e 01/11/1958 18A Toton
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5000       05/09/1958 (New) 5B 05/09/1958 5B Crewe South
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5000 05/09/1958 5B Crewe South (New) 05/09/1958 5B w/e 27/01/1959 5B Crewe South
Diesel 04 0-6-0 11114 4w/e 20/10/1956 34E Neasden 4w/e 06/09/1958 5B w/e 04/04/1959 6A Chester (MR)
Diesel 04 0-6-0 11155 4w/e 20/10/1956 34E Neasden 4w/e 06/09/1958 5B w/e 21/03/1964 5C Stafford
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8001 08/07/1957 1D Devons Road (Bow) (New) 4w/e 06/09/1958 5B w/e 29/10/1960 1A Willesden
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8003 23/08/1957 1D Devons Road (Bow) (New) 4w/e 06/09/1958 5B w/e 29/10/1960 1A Willesden
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12003 01/01/1948 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 06/09/1958 5B w/e 25/07/1959 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 27 0-6-0 52207 4w/e 31/10/1953 99C Crewe Works 4w/e 06/09/1958 5B w/e 05/09/1959 26D Bury
Steam 27 0-6-0 52212 m/e 09/1958 Withdrawn 4w/e 06/09/1958 (R) 5B      
Steam 27 0-6-0 52345 4w/e 31/10/1953 99C Crewe Works 4w/e 06/09/1958 5B w/e 22/09/1962 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8000 4w/e 12/07/1958 18A Toton 4w/e 04/10/1958 5B w/e 29/10/1960 1B Camden
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8002 4w/e 12/07/1958 2A Rugby 4w/e 04/10/1958 5B w/e 17/09/1960 1A Willesden
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42787 4w/e 09/08/1958 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 04/10/1958 5B w/e 15/08/1959 2A Rugby
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47664 01/01/1948 12B Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 04/10/1958 5B w/e 29/09/1962 5D Stoke
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43760 01/01/1948 11A Carnforth 4w/e 04/10/1958 5B w/e 24/01/1959 3A Bescot
Diesel 04 0-6-0 11124 4w/e 16/02/1957 40B Immingham w/e 11/10/1958 5B w/e 18/10/1958 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Diesel 04 0-6-0 11126 w/e 25/05/1956 40B Immingham w/e 11/10/1958 5B w/e 22/11/1958 6B Mold Junction
Diesel 04 0-6-0 11127 04/09/1955 30A Stratford (New) w/e 11/10/1958 5B w/e 21/03/1964 5C Stafford
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5001       29/10/1958 (New) 5B 01/11/1958 5B Crewe South
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13089 4w/e 04/10/1958 24K Preston w/e 01/11/1958 5B w/e 10/06/1961 2B Nuneaton
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5001 29/10/1958 5B Crewe South (New) 01/11/1958 5B w/e 04/02/1959 5B Crewe South
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43330 4w/e 22/03/1958 99C Crewe Works w/e 01/11/1958 5B w/e 10/01/1959 9G Gorton
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47391 01/01/1948 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 15/11/1958 5B w/e 27/12/1958 99C Crewe Works
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47618 01/01/1948 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 15/11/1958 5B w/e 24/09/1960 99C Crewe Works
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12025 4w/e 31/12/1950 8C Speke Junction w/e 22/11/1958 5B w/e 29/04/1967 8C Speke Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45142 4w/e 06/10/1956 6B Mold Junction w/e 22/11/1958 5B w/e 10/06/1961 6J Holyhead
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45403 4w/e 14/06/1958 6B Mold Junction w/e 22/11/1958 5B w/e 06/04/1963 6A Chester (MR)
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43464 4w/e 04/10/1958 99C Crewe Works w/e 27/12/1958 5B w/e 31/03/1962 Withdrawn
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5000 05/09/1958 5B Crewe South w/e 27/01/1959 5B w/e 16/06/1962 1A Willesden
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5001 01/11/1958 5B Crewe South w/e 04/02/1959 5B m/e 01/06/1962 1A Willesden
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3583 03/11/1958 21A Saltley (New) w/e 28/02/1959 5B w/e 25/11/1967 5A Crewe Diesel
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3584 07/11/1958 21A Saltley (New) w/e 28/02/1959 5B w/e 23/07/1960 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42949 w/e 08/07/1950 8E Brunswick w/e 14/03/1959 5B w/e 24/11/1962 5D Stoke
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5011       28/03/1959 (New) 5B w/e 28/03/1959 17A Derby
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5012       11/04/1959 (New) 5B w/e 11/04/1959 17A Derby
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42782 4w/e 23/02/1957 3A Bescot w/e 11/04/1959 5B w/e 15/08/1959 2A Rugby
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42853 4w/e 04/10/1958 3A Bescot w/e 11/04/1959 5B w/e 15/08/1959 2B Nuneaton
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5013       18/04/1959 (New) 5B w/e 18/04/1959 17A Derby
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47391 w/e 27/12/1958 99C Crewe Works w/e 18/04/1959 5B w/e 25/04/1964 5B Crewe South
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42946 w/e 20/09/1958 5A Crewe North w/e 18/04/1959 5B w/e 10/09/1960 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42955 w/e 08/01/1955 5A Crewe North w/e 18/04/1959 5B w/e 31/12/1960 2A Rugby
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42961 w/e 24/04/1954 5A Crewe North w/e 18/04/1959 5B w/e 24/11/1962 5D Stoke
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5008 w/e 25/04/1959 5B Crewe South w/e 25/04/1959 5B w/e 09/05/1959 18A Toton
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5008 w/e 21/03/1959 17A Derby w/e 25/04/1959 5B w/e 25/04/1959 5B Crewe South
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5014       09/05/1959 (New) 5B w/e 09/05/1959 17A Derby
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3763 18/04/1959 24K Preston (New) w/e 30/05/1959 5B w/e 25/11/1967 5A Crewe Diesel
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5015       30/05/1959 (New) 5B w/e 30/05/1959 5B Crewe South
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5015 30/05/1959 5B Crewe South (New) w/e 30/05/1959 5B w/e 13/06/1959 5B Crewe South
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5016       30/05/1959 (New) 5B w/e 30/05/1959 17A Derby
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5017       06/06/1959 (New) 5B w/e 06/06/1959 17A Derby
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5015 w/e 30/05/1959 5B Crewe South w/e 13/06/1959 5B w/e 29/08/1959 1B Camden
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5016 w/e 30/05/1959 17A Derby w/e 13/06/1959 5B w/e 26/09/1959 1A Willesden
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48297 w/e 31/01/1959 8E Northwich w/e 20/06/1959 5B w/e 07/01/1961 81E Didcot
Steam G1 0-8-0 49131 w/e 03/01/1959 22L   w/e 20/06/1959 5B w/e 17/09/1960 1E Bletchley
Steam G2 0-8-0 49439 w/e 18/04/1959 24L Carnforth w/e 20/06/1959 5B w/e 17/09/1960 1E Bletchley
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5018       27/06/1959 (New) 5B w/e 27/06/1959 17A Derby
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5019       11/07/1959 (New) 5B w/e 11/07/1959 17A Derby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45390 4w/e 26/01/1957 5A Crewe North w/e 18/07/1959 5B w/e 18/06/1960 5D Stoke
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13245 w/e 22/11/1958 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 25/07/1959 5B w/e 25/11/1967 5A Crewe Diesel
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13291 4w/e 10/08/1957 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 25/07/1959 5B w/e 25/11/1967 5A Crewe Diesel
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13292 4w/e 10/08/1957 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 25/07/1959 5B w/e 25/11/1967 5A Crewe Diesel
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3367 4w/e 22/03/1958 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 25/07/1959 5B w/e 18/07/1964 8C Speke Junction
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42785 w/e 04/07/1959 26A Newton Heath w/e 12/09/1959 5B w/e 12/12/1959 1A Willesden
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44868 w/e 20/06/1959 6J Holyhead w/e 19/09/1959 5B w/e 10/06/1961 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45000 w/e 20/06/1959 6J Holyhead w/e 19/09/1959 5B w/e 10/06/1961 24L Carnforth
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45002 w/e 20/06/1959 6J Holyhead w/e 19/09/1959 5B w/e 10/06/1961 24L Carnforth
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5018 w/e 27/06/1959 17A Derby w/e 26/09/1959 5B w/e 17/10/1959 1B Camden
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5019 w/e 11/07/1959 17A Derby w/e 26/09/1959 5B w/e 17/10/1959 1B Camden
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45291 4w/e 06/10/1956 11A Carnforth w/e 03/10/1959 5B w/e 10/06/1961 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45370 w/e 12/09/1959 24L Carnforth w/e 03/10/1959 5B w/e 18/06/1960 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45494 w/e 20/06/1959 24L Carnforth w/e 03/10/1959 5B m/e 09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45001 4w/e 23/02/1952 6B Mold Junction w/e 07/11/1959 5B w/e 20/06/1964 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45130 4w/e 07/09/1957 6B Mold Junction w/e 07/11/1959 5B w/e 10/06/1961 1A Willesden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42416 4w/e 14/06/1958 9A Longsight w/e 09/01/1960 5B w/e 18/06/1960 6H Bangor
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5004 w/e 11/03/1959 17A Derby w/e 16/01/1960 5B w/e 16/06/1962 5B Crewe South
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12005 w/e 30/05/1959 6A Chester (MR) w/e 16/01/1960 5B w/e 29/04/1967 8C Speke Junction
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42777 w/e 15/08/1959 2A Rugby w/e 16/01/1960 5B w/e 13/06/1960 5D Stoke
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42787 w/e 15/08/1959 2A Rugby w/e 16/01/1960 5B w/e 18/06/1960 24J Lancaster Green Ayre
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5006 w/e 11/03/1959 17A Derby w/e 05/03/1960 5B w/e 17/03/1962 5B Crewe South
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45092 4w/e 04/10/1958 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 02/04/1960 5B w/e 25/06/1960 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45097 4w/e 05/11/1955 11A Carnforth w/e 02/04/1960 5B w/e 25/06/1960 24L Carnforth
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45292 4w/e 09/10/1954 2E Northampton w/e 02/04/1960 5B w/e 25/06/1960 2E Northampton
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45414 01/01/1948 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 02/04/1960 5B w/e 25/06/1960 12B Carlisle Upperby
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5003 w/e 11/03/1959 17A Derby w/e 30/04/1960 5B w/e 17/03/1962 1A Willesden
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47395 01/01/1948 1A Willesden w/e 07/05/1960 5B w/e 28/01/1961 5F Uttoxeter
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47400 01/01/1948 9A Longsight w/e 07/05/1960 5B w/e 25/04/1964 99C Crewe Works
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47601 w/e 07/11/1959 8D Widnes w/e 07/05/1960 5B w/e 17/03/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47338 w/e 15/11/1958 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 14/05/1960 5B m/e 10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47677 w/e 22/11/1958 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 28/05/1960 5B m/e 11/1965 Withdrawn
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5005 w/e 11/03/1959 17A Derby w/e 04/06/1960 5B w/e 20/08/1960 5B Crewe South
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48502 4w/e 14/06/1958 8D Widnes w/e 11/06/1960 5B w/e 24/07/1965 9H Patricroft
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48729 w/e 15/08/1959 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 18/06/1960 5B w/e 23/06/1962 1E Bletchley
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47445 01/01/1948 5B Crewe South w/e 16/07/1960 5B m/e 04/1966 Withdrawn
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5005 w/e 04/06/1960 5B Crewe South w/e 20/08/1960 5B w/e 02/06/1962 5A Crewe North
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13176 w/e 23/07/1960 9A Longsight w/e 10/09/1960 5B w/e 24/09/1960 6A Chester (MR)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3584 w/e 23/07/1960 9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 10/09/1960 5B w/e 25/11/1967 5A Crewe Diesel
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47341 01/01/1948 9A Longsight w/e 10/09/1960 5B w/e 29/10/1960 9A Longsight
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44687 31/05/1951 9A Longsight (New) w/e 10/09/1960 5B w/e 08/10/1960 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47431 w/e 07/11/1959 9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 17/09/1960 5B w/e 10/12/1960 8C Speke Junction
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48085 5w/e 24/12/1949 2A Rugby w/e 17/09/1960 5B w/e 23/06/1962 1A Willesden
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48252 w/e 20/06/1959 2A Rugby w/e 17/09/1960 5B w/e 23/06/1962 1A Willesden
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48423 4w/e 04/10/1958 2A Rugby w/e 17/09/1960 5B w/e 07/01/1961 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45148 4w/e 12/07/1958 5A Crewe North w/e 17/09/1960 5B w/e 10/06/1961 6J Holyhead
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45270 w/e 18/06/1960 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 17/09/1960 5B w/e 31/12/1960 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45370 w/e 18/06/1960 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 17/09/1960 5B w/e 15/10/1960 8C Speke Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45248 w/e 23/04/1960 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 08/10/1960 5B m/e 02/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42944 w/e 12/09/1959 1A Willesden w/e 22/10/1960 5B w/e 19/11/1960 2B Nuneaton
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42975 w/e 17/09/1960 9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 22/10/1960 5B w/e 31/12/1960 2A Rugby
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42979 w/e 17/09/1960 9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 22/10/1960 5B w/e 26/11/1960 21D Aston
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47482 4w/e 28/12/1957 1A Willesden w/e 29/10/1960 5B m/e 10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47310 w/e 19/12/1959 8C Speke Junction w/e 05/11/1960 5B w/e 28/01/1961 5D Stoke
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47349 w/e 24/01/1959 3A Bescot w/e 05/11/1960 5B w/e 28/01/1961 5D Stoke
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47354 w/e 24/01/1959 3A Bescot w/e 05/11/1960 5B m/e 10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47397 01/01/1948 3B Bushbury w/e 05/11/1960 5B m/e 09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47529 01/01/1948 1B Camden w/e 05/11/1960 5B m/e 10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48248 w/e 05/11/1960 8E Northwich w/e 12/11/1960 5B w/e 14/09/1963 5D Stoke
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48255 w/e 05/11/1960 8E Northwich w/e 12/11/1960 5B w/e 04/12/1965 6C Croes Newydd
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47398 01/01/1948 3B Bushbury w/e 19/11/1960 5B w/e 28/01/1961 5F Uttoxeter
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44377 01/01/1948 5D Stoke w/e 19/11/1960 5B w/e 08/08/1964 12D Workington
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47341 w/e 26/11/1960 24L Carnforth w/e 24/12/1960 5B w/e 28/01/1961 5D Stoke
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42772 w/e 19/11/1960 2B Nuneaton w/e 31/12/1960 5B w/e 17/06/1961 6B Mold Junction
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42815 w/e 18/04/1959 5A Crewe North w/e 31/12/1960 5B w/e 23/06/1962 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42940 w/e 12/09/1959 5A Crewe North w/e 31/12/1960 5B w/e 18/08/1962 9D Buxton (LNWR)
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45553 w/e 26/11/1960 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 31/12/1960 5B w/e 23/06/1962 5A Crewe North
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45613 w/e 12/09/1959 8A Edge Hill w/e 31/12/1960 5B w/e 10/06/1961 5A Crewe North
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45623 w/e 30/04/1960 9A Longsight w/e 31/12/1960 5B w/e 17/03/1962 26A Newton Heath
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45644 4w/e 06/09/1952 9A Longsight w/e 31/12/1960 5B 23/11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45709 w/e 13/06/1960 3D Aston w/e 31/12/1960 5B w/e 23/06/1962 5A Crewe North
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45555 w/e 07/11/1959 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 07/01/1961 5B 17/08/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45617 4w/e 04/10/1958 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 07/01/1961 5B w/e 23/06/1962 5A Crewe North
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45634 w/e 03/12/1960 1A Willesden w/e 07/01/1961 5B 11/05/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45666 w/e 10/12/1960 1A Willesden w/e 07/01/1961 5B w/e 04/08/1962 5A Crewe North
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12019 w/e 25/07/1959 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 21/01/1961 5B w/e 14/01/1967 1F Rugby
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12022 w/e 25/07/1959 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 21/01/1961 5B 12/11/1966 Withdrawn
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12071 4w/e 04/10/1958 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 21/01/1961 5B w/e 09/09/1961 21E Monument Lane
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12099 4w/e 04/10/1958 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 21/01/1961 5B w/e 10/06/1961 2B Nuneaton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3798 w/e 23/01/1960 5D Stoke w/e 28/01/1961 5B w/e 25/11/1967 5A Crewe Diesel
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3799 w/e 23/01/1960 5D Stoke w/e 28/01/1961 5B w/e 25/11/1967 5A Crewe Diesel
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3802 26/12/1959 5D Stoke (New) w/e 28/01/1961 5B w/e 12/06/1965 5D Stoke
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42889 w/e 14/01/1961 9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 11/02/1961 5B w/e 11/04/1961 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42977 w/e 21/01/1961 2B Nuneaton w/e 04/03/1961 5B w/e 18/08/1962 21C Bushbury
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48292 w/e 10/06/1961 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 01/07/1961 5B w/e 24/07/1965 8C Speke Junction
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44452 8w/e 29/11/1952 17B Burton w/e 22/07/1961 5B w/e 10/11/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47330 w/e 16/07/1960 5D Stoke w/e 05/08/1961 5B w/e 25/04/1964 99C Crewe Works
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45002 w/e 15/07/1961 24K Preston w/e 09/09/1961 5B m/e 07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45024 w/e 10/12/1960 24K Preston w/e 09/09/1961 5B w/e 09/12/1961 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45297 w/e 25/03/1961 24K Preston w/e 09/09/1961 5B m/e 09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45315 w/e 18/06/1960 24K Preston w/e 09/09/1961 5B m/e 09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48505 w/e 07/01/1961 8C Speke Junction w/e 16/09/1961 5B w/e 12/08/1967 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42963 w/e 19/09/1959 5A Crewe North w/e 16/09/1961 5B w/e 24/11/1962 5D Stoke
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45000 w/e 10/06/1961 24L Carnforth w/e 16/09/1961 5B w/e 22/06/1963 6J Holyhead
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45069 4w/e 03/10/1953 8A Edge Hill w/e 16/09/1961 5B w/e 09/12/1961 8A Edge Hill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45281 w/e 12/09/1959 8A Edge Hill w/e 16/09/1961 5B w/e 09/12/1961 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8035 w/e 26/09/1959 1A Willesden w/e 14/10/1961 5B w/e 10/02/1962 1A Willesden
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47530 4w/e 16/06/1957 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 28/10/1961 5B m/e 10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47648 w/e 22/07/1961 12E Barrow in Furness w/e 25/11/1961 5B w/e 24/02/1962 Wolverton Works
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 D2519       30/11/1961 (New) 5B w/e 08/10/1966 5A Crewe Diesel
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47505 4w/e 28/12/1957 11B Barrow in Furness w/e 02/12/1961 5B w/e 06/07/1963 99C Crewe Works
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45004 4w/e 04/10/1958 5A Crewe North w/e 06/01/1962 5B w/e 22/06/1963 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45033 8w/e 05/10/1957 5A Crewe North w/e 06/01/1962 5B w/e 02/03/1963 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45045 w/e 31/12/1960 5A Crewe North w/e 06/01/1962 5B w/e 08/12/1962 6J Holyhead
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45142 w/e 23/09/1961 5A Crewe North w/e 06/01/1962 5B w/e 09/02/1963 5A Crewe North
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8038 w/e 26/11/1960 1A Willesden w/e 10/02/1962 5B w/e 02/06/1962 1A Willesden
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42778 w/e 01/07/1961 5D Stoke w/e 10/02/1962 5B w/e 23/06/1962 24J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42937 w/e 26/11/1960 5D Stoke w/e 10/02/1962 5B w/e 18/08/1962 5D Stoke
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47479 w/e 03/10/1959 Wolverton Works w/e 24/02/1962 5B w/e 17/03/1962 Wolverton Works
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5006 w/e 05/03/1960 5B Crewe South w/e 17/03/1962 5B w/e 12/05/1962 5A Crewe North
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47648 w/e 24/02/1962 Wolverton Works w/e 17/03/1962 5B m/e 04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47615 w/e 10/02/1962 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 24/03/1962 5B w/e 14/12/1963 99C Crewe Works
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47608 w/e 03/02/1962 99C Crewe Works w/e 31/03/1962 5B w/e 01/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78031 w/e 20/06/1959 6K Rhyl w/e 07/04/1962 5B m/e 10/1966 Withdrawn
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5011 w/e 11/04/1959 73C Hither Green w/e 05/05/1962 5B w/e 05/05/1962 1A Willesden
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5017 w/e 04/07/1959 73C Hither Green w/e 05/05/1962 5B w/e 05/05/1962 1A Willesden
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5009 w/e 28/03/1959 73C Hither Green w/e 12/05/1962 5B w/e 12/05/1962 5A Crewe North
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5012 w/e 18/04/1959 73C Hither Green w/e 12/05/1962 5B w/e 12/05/1962 5A Crewe North
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5002 w/e 11/03/1959 17A Derby w/e 19/05/1962 5B w/e 19/05/1962 1A Willesden
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5004 w/e 16/01/1960 5B Crewe South w/e 16/06/1962 5B w/e 29/09/1962 1A Willesden
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47399 w/e 19/11/1960 5E Alsager w/e 23/06/1962 5B m/e 08/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44386 4w/e 02/12/1950 5E Alsager w/e 23/06/1962 5B w/e 10/11/1962 12F Workington
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44405 4w/e 09/08/1958 5E Alsager w/e 23/06/1962 5B w/e 02/03/1963 99C Crewe Works
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44450 01/01/1948 5E Alsager w/e 23/06/1962 5B w/e 16/03/1963 6B Mold Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44714 w/e 20/06/1959 5A Crewe North w/e 23/06/1962 5B w/e 15/09/1962 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45021 4w/e 30/11/1957 5A Crewe North w/e 23/06/1962 5B w/e 15/09/1962 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45046 w/e 09/01/1960 5A Crewe North w/e 23/06/1962 5B w/e 15/09/1962 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45189 8w/e 05/10/1957 5A Crewe North w/e 23/06/1962 5B w/e 15/09/1962 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45257 4w/e 04/10/1958 5A Crewe North w/e 23/06/1962 5B w/e 15/09/1962 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45426 w/e 26/11/1960 5A Crewe North w/e 23/06/1962 5B w/e 07/11/1964 1H Northampton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44353 w/e 10/01/1959 2E Northampton w/e 30/06/1962 5B w/e 07/03/1964 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44445 w/e 28/10/1961 24L Carnforth w/e 07/07/1962 5B w/e 10/11/1962 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48555 w/e 13/01/1962 21B Bescot w/e 14/07/1962 5B w/e 14/09/1963 5D Stoke
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45586 w/e 23/06/1962 5A Crewe North w/e 04/08/1962 5B 23/01/1965 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4143       23/08/1962 (New) 5B w/e 25/11/1967 5A Crewe Diesel
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48757 w/e 19/11/1960 2E Northampton w/e 15/09/1962 5B w/e 26/01/1963 89A Shrewsbury
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48736 w/e 07/07/1962 2A Rugby w/e 29/09/1962 5B m/e 08/1966 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2385 w/e 16/09/1961 8C Speke Junction w/e 10/11/1962 5B w/e 21/03/1964 5C Stafford
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48305 4w/e 20/04/1957 2E Northampton w/e 10/11/1962 5B w/e 24/07/1965 8E Northwich
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43073 w/e 06/08/1960 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 10/11/1962 5B w/e 21/09/1963 5D Stoke
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78055 w/e 17/09/1960 8E Northwich w/e 17/11/1962 5B w/e 25/05/1963 24G Skipton
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47494 w/e 10/02/1962 21D Aston w/e 08/12/1962 5B w/e 17/08/1963 99C Crewe Works
Steam G2 0-8-0 49448 w/e 17/09/1960 8A Edge Hill w/e 22/12/1962 5B m/e 06/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48757 w/e 26/01/1963 89A Shrewsbury w/e 16/03/1963 5B w/e 23/01/1965 1G Woodford Halse
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78036 w/e 15/09/1962 24G Skipton w/e 25/05/1963 5B w/e 12/11/1966 6D Shrewsbury
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42954 w/e 16/09/1961 2B Nuneaton w/e 22/06/1963 5B w/e 02/1964 5E Nuneaton
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42958 w/e 16/06/1962 2B Nuneaton w/e 22/06/1963 5B w/e 09/11/1963 1F Rugby
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42969 w/e 16/06/1962 2B Nuneaton w/e 22/06/1963 5B w/e 09/11/1963 1F Rugby
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42971 w/e 16/06/1962 2B Nuneaton w/e 22/06/1963 5B w/e 09/11/1963 5E Nuneaton
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42981 w/e 16/06/1962 2B Nuneaton w/e 22/06/1963 5B w/e 09/11/1963 1F Rugby
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43001 4w/e 30/11/1957 2B Nuneaton w/e 22/06/1963 5B w/e 12/03/1966 5D Stoke
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42947 w/e 23/06/1962 2B Nuneaton w/e 29/06/1963 5B w/e 11/1963 1F Rugby
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48659 w/e 29/06/1963 89B Croes Newydd w/e 20/07/1963 5B w/e 19/09/1964 2F Bescot
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45021 w/e 15/09/1962 5A Crewe North w/e 14/09/1963 5B m/e 09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45033 w/e 02/03/1963 5A Crewe North w/e 14/09/1963 5B m/e 12/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45046 w/e 15/09/1962 5A Crewe North w/e 14/09/1963 5B w/e 21/08/1965 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45093 4w/e 04/10/1958 5A Crewe North w/e 14/09/1963 5B m/e 10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45142 w/e 09/02/1963 5A Crewe North w/e 14/09/1963 5B m/e 04/1965 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3956 w/e 31/08/1963 89A Shrewsbury w/e 02/11/1963 5B w/e 21/03/1964 1F Rugby
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47622 w/e 09/02/1963 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 16/11/1963 5B w/e 14/12/1963 5C Stafford
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47494 w/e 17/08/1963 99C Crewe Works w/e 14/12/1963 5B m/e 10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44218 w/e 07/04/1962 21A Saltley w/e 28/12/1963 5B w/e 22/08/1964 5D Stoke
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44500 01/01/1948 5D Stoke w/e 28/12/1963 5B w/e 26/12/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44583 8w/e 19/06/1954 21A Saltley w/e 28/12/1963 5B w/e 25/04/1964 99C Crewe Works
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49361 w/e 22/12/1962 21B Bescot w/e 28/12/1963 5B w/e 22/02/1964 2F Bescot
Steam G2 0-8-0 49407 w/e 20/07/1963 21B Bescot w/e 28/12/1963 5B w/e 21/03/1964 2F Bescot
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48131 w/e 20/07/1963 6B Mold Junction w/e 25/01/1964 5B w/e 20/06/1964 5D Stoke
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48368 w/e 12/10/1963 6B Mold Junction w/e 25/01/1964 5B w/e 28/03/1964 16G Westhouses
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48551 w/e 12/10/1963 6B Mold Junction w/e 25/01/1964 5B w/e 25/03/1967 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48729 w/e 12/10/1963 6B Mold Junction w/e 25/01/1964 5B w/e 19/09/1964 2F Bescot
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48762 w/e 05/10/1963 6B Mold Junction w/e 25/01/1964 5B w/e 14/11/1964 2C Stourbridge Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45321 w/e 19/08/1961 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 15/02/1964 5B w/e 24/07/1965 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel D3/1 0-4-0 D2909 11/09/1958 2A Rugby (New) w/e 22/02/1964 5B 11/02/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel D3/1 0-4-0 D2911 w/e 20/02/1960 2A Rugby w/e 22/02/1964 5B 11/02/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48251 w/e 18/04/1959 2B Nuneaton w/e 07/03/1964 5B w/e 24/07/1965 8C Speke Junction
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48291 w/e 15/08/1959 2B Nuneaton w/e 07/03/1964 5B w/e 12/12/1964 5D Stoke
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48398 4w/e 25/02/1956 2B Nuneaton w/e 07/03/1964 5B w/e 24/07/1965 8C Speke Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44684       w/e 07/03/1964 5B w/e 20/06/1964 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44714 w/e 15/02/1964 5D Stoke w/e 07/03/1964 5B w/e 20/06/1964 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44759 4w/e 24/03/1951 5A Crewe North w/e 07/03/1964 5B w/e 20/06/1964 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45446 w/e 14/09/1963 5D Stoke w/e 07/03/1964 5B m/e 02/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48353 w/e 02/07/1960 18B Westhouses w/e 14/03/1964 5B w/e 12/12/1964 6C Croes Newydd
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45434 w/e 14/09/1963 1E Bletchley w/e 14/03/1964 5B m/e 08/1966 Withdrawn
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2208 w/e 14/07/1962 30A Stratford w/e 28/03/1964 5B w/e 25/07/1964 2B Oxley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48647 w/e 09/02/1963 16A Nottingham w/e 28/03/1964 5B w/e 07/11/1964 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48727 w/e 29/02/1964 16E Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 28/03/1964 5B w/e 07/11/1964 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78010 w/e 09/11/1963 55C Farnley Junction w/e 25/04/1964 5B m/e 09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47266 w/e 14/12/1963 6J Holyhead w/e 25/04/1964 5B w/e 31/10/1964 6J Holyhead
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47391 w/e 18/04/1959 5B Crewe South w/e 25/04/1964 5B w/e 23/07/1966 6A Chester (MR)
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47325 w/e 01/10/1960 17A Derby w/e 06/06/1964 5B m/e 09/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76023 w/e 12/10/1963 5F Uttoxeter w/e 20/06/1964 5B w/e 16/01/1965 5D Stoke
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78007 w/e 22/06/1963 5A Crewe North w/e 27/06/1964 5B w/e 06/03/1965 9G Gorton
Diesel D3/1 0-4-0 D2910 12/09/1958 2A Rugby (New) w/e 04/07/1964 5B 11/02/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44571 w/e 20/02/1960 21A Saltley w/e 25/07/1964 5B w/e 22/08/1964 8D Widnes
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44583 w/e 25/04/1964 99C Crewe Works w/e 25/07/1964 5B m/e 08/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47273 5w/e 24/12/1949 15A Wellingborough w/e 22/08/1964 5B w/e 14/11/1964 5D Stoke
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2208 w/e 25/07/1964 2B Oxley w/e 05/09/1964 5B w/e 17/12/1966 5A Crewe Diesel
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44684 w/e 20/06/1964 5A Crewe North w/e 19/09/1964 5B m/e 09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44714 w/e 20/06/1964 5A Crewe North w/e 19/09/1964 5B w/e 20/03/1965 5D Stoke
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44759 w/e 20/06/1964 5A Crewe North w/e 19/09/1964 5B w/e 15/04/1967 12D Workington
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45001 w/e 20/06/1964 5A Crewe North w/e 19/09/1964 5B w/e 28/11/1964 1F Rugby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45065 w/e 17/08/1963 2A Rugby w/e 19/09/1964 5B w/e 28/11/1964 1F Rugby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45113 w/e 17/09/1960 2A Rugby w/e 19/09/1964 5B w/e 28/11/1964 1F Rugby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45392 w/e 14/09/1963 1F Rugby w/e 19/09/1964 5B w/e 28/11/1964 1F Rugby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45448 w/e 23/02/1963 2A Rugby w/e 19/09/1964 5B w/e 28/11/1964 1F Rugby
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43088 w/e 09/03/1963 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 10/10/1964 5B w/e 12/03/1966 5D Stoke
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43151 w/e 09/03/1963 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 10/10/1964 5B 18/12/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44218 w/e 22/08/1964 5D Stoke w/e 24/10/1964 5B w/e 02/01/1965 16G Westhouses
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44571 w/e 22/08/1964 8D Widnes w/e 24/10/1964 5B m/e 12/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78030 4w/e 21/04/1956 5A Crewe North w/e 31/10/1964 5B m/e 10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42969 w/e 09/11/1963 1F Rugby w/e 11/1964 5B 14/11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47565 w/e 22/11/1958 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 26/12/1964 5B m/e 04/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48012 w/e 21/02/1959 2A Rugby w/e 09/01/1965 5B w/e 30/01/1965 5D Stoke
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48035 4w/e 16/06/1957 2A Rugby w/e 09/01/1965 5B w/e 01/05/1965 1G Woodford Halse
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48036 4w/e 31/12/1950 1A Willesden w/e 09/01/1965 5B w/e 20/02/1965 1A Willesden
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48171 01/01/1948 1A Willesden w/e 09/01/1965 5B w/e 30/01/1965 5D Stoke
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48252 w/e 23/06/1962 1A Willesden w/e 09/01/1965 5B w/e 28/08/1965 6C Croes Newydd
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48347 w/e 19/09/1964 1H Northampton w/e 09/01/1965 5B w/e 20/02/1965 1A Willesden
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48416 01/01/1948 24A Accrington w/e 09/01/1965 5B w/e 26/06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48658 w/e 07/07/1962 2E Northampton w/e 09/01/1965 5B w/e 20/02/1965 1A Willesden
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44761 01/01/1948 5A Crewe North w/e 10/04/1965 5B w/e 24/06/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45056 w/e 27/02/1965 1F Rugby w/e 10/04/1965 5B w/e 18/03/1967 8C Speke Junction
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48036 w/e 20/02/1965 1A Willesden w/e 08/05/1965 5B w/e 18/03/1967 8E Northwich
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48347 w/e 20/02/1965 1A Willesden w/e 08/05/1965 5B w/e 01/04/1967 8E Northwich
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48658 w/e 20/02/1965 1A Willesden w/e 08/05/1965 5B w/e 17/07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44715       w/e 08/05/1965 5B w/e 15/04/1967 12D Workington
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44716 27/11/1948 5A Crewe North (New) w/e 08/05/1965 5B m/e 07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44836 01/01/1948 5A Crewe North w/e 08/05/1965 5B w/e 21/08/1965 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45091 w/e 02/03/1963 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 08/05/1965 5B w/e 24/07/1965 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70000 w/e 25/05/1963 5A Crewe North w/e 29/05/1965 5B w/e 05/03/1966 9D Newton Heath
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70010 w/e 09/01/1965 5A Crewe North w/e 29/05/1965 5B w/e 26/06/1965 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70012 w/e 09/01/1965 5A Crewe North w/e 29/05/1965 5B w/e 26/02/1966 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70014 w/e 09/01/1965 5A Crewe North w/e 29/05/1965 5B w/e 26/02/1966 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70017 w/e 14/09/1963 5A Crewe North w/e 29/05/1965 5B w/e 24/07/1965 9D Newton Heath
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70018 w/e 15/09/1962 5A Crewe North w/e 29/05/1965 5B w/e 05/03/1966 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70019 w/e 14/09/1963 5A Crewe North w/e 29/05/1965 5B w/e 24/07/1965 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70020 w/e 09/01/1965 5A Crewe North w/e 29/05/1965 5B w/e 24/07/1965 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70021 w/e 09/01/1965 5A Crewe North w/e 29/05/1965 5B w/e 24/07/1965 9D Newton Heath
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70023 w/e 06/02/1965 5A Crewe North w/e 29/05/1965 5B w/e 26/02/1966 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70024 w/e 06/02/1965 5A Crewe North w/e 29/05/1965 5B w/e 26/02/1966 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70025 w/e 25/05/1963 5A Crewe North w/e 29/05/1965 5B w/e 26/02/1966 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70027 w/e 06/02/1965 5A Crewe North w/e 29/05/1965 5B w/e 26/02/1966 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70028 w/e 14/09/1963 5A Crewe North w/e 29/05/1965 5B w/e 26/02/1966 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70030 w/e 06/07/1963 5A Crewe North w/e 29/05/1965 5B w/e 24/07/1965 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70031 w/e 09/01/1965 5A Crewe North w/e 29/05/1965 5B w/e 24/07/1965 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70033 w/e 14/09/1963 5A Crewe North w/e 29/05/1965 5B w/e 26/06/1965 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70034 w/e 20/06/1964 5A Crewe North w/e 29/05/1965 5B w/e 24/07/1965 9D Newton Heath
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70042 w/e 25/05/1963 5A Crewe North w/e 29/05/1965 5B w/e 26/06/1965 6J Holyhead
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70043 w/e 20/06/1964 5A Crewe North w/e 29/05/1965 5B 07/08/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70044 w/e 18/08/1962 5A Crewe North w/e 29/05/1965 5B w/e 24/07/1965 9D Newton Heath
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70046 w/e 06/02/1965 5A Crewe North w/e 29/05/1965 5B w/e 26/06/1965 6J Holyhead
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70051 w/e 05/01/1963 5A Crewe North w/e 29/05/1965 5B w/e 02/10/1965 2D Banbury
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70052 4w/e 21/04/1962 67A Corkerhill w/e 29/05/1965 5B w/e 02/10/1965 2D Banbury
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70054 w/e 18/08/1962 5A Crewe North w/e 29/05/1965 5B w/e 02/10/1965 2D Banbury
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41212 w/e 29/06/1963 5A Crewe North w/e 29/05/1965 5B w/e 19/06/1965 5D Stoke
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41229 4w/e 09/10/1954 5A Crewe North w/e 29/05/1965 5B w/e 19/06/1965 5D Stoke
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44678 w/e 07/11/1959 5A Crewe North w/e 29/05/1965 5B w/e 21/08/1965 8C Speke Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44679       w/e 29/05/1965 5B w/e 21/08/1965 8C Speke Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44680       w/e 29/05/1965 5B m/e 09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44681 w/e 11/07/1959 5A Crewe North w/e 29/05/1965 5B m/e 09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44683       w/e 29/05/1965 5B w/e 24/06/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44685 4w/e 26/01/1952 5A Crewe North w/e 29/05/1965 5B m/e 04/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44765 01/01/1948 5A Crewe North w/e 29/05/1965 5B m/e 09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45243 w/e 11/10/1958 5A Crewe North w/e 29/05/1965 5B m/e 09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44829 w/e 05/10/1963 2E Saltley w/e 19/06/1965 5B w/e 29/04/1967 12D Workington
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44833 w/e 20/06/1964 1A Willesden w/e 19/06/1965 5B w/e 19/08/1967 29F  
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44844 w/e 28/11/1964 1A Willesden w/e 19/06/1965 5B w/e 29/04/1967 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44873 w/e 03/04/1965 2E Saltley w/e 19/06/1965 5B w/e 24/07/1965 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44910 w/e 03/04/1965 2E Saltley w/e 19/06/1965 5B w/e 21/08/1965 8L Aintree
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45180 w/e 03/04/1965 2E Saltley w/e 19/06/1965 5B m/e 09/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45393 w/e 14/03/1964 1A Willesden w/e 19/06/1965 5B m/e 09/1966 Withdrawn
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2221 w/e 21/03/1964 5C Stafford w/e 31/07/1965 5B w/e 25/11/1967 5A Crewe Diesel
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2236 w/e 21/03/1964 5C Stafford w/e 31/07/1965 5B w/e 08/10/1966 Wolverton Works
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2385 w/e 21/03/1964 5C Stafford w/e 31/07/1965 5B w/e 08/10/1966 Wolverton Works
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48544 w/e 08/05/1965 1A Willesden w/e 07/08/1965 5B w/e 24/06/1967 10F Rose Grove
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48559 w/e 29/05/1965 1A Willesden w/e 07/08/1965 5B w/e 12/08/1967 9K Bolton
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78034 w/e 03/04/1965 1A Willesden w/e 02/10/1965 5B m/e 01/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47590 w/e 11/07/1964 1H Northampton w/e 02/10/1965 5B w/e 08/10/1966 5D Stoke
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48554 w/e 08/05/1965 1A Willesden w/e 02/10/1965 5B w/e 04/12/1965 6C Croes Newydd
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3801 19/12/1959 5D Stoke (New) w/e 04/12/1965 5B w/e 25/11/1967 5A Crewe Diesel
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47521 w/e 10/07/1965 5D Stoke w/e 04/12/1965 5B w/e 13/08/1966 5D Stoke
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47649 w/e 05/12/1964 5D Stoke w/e 04/12/1965 5B w/e 12/03/1966 99C Crewe Works
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48255 w/e 04/12/1965 6C Croes Newydd w/e 11/12/1965 5B w/e 03/12/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48554 w/e 04/12/1965 6C Croes Newydd w/e 11/12/1965 5B m/e 08/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78019 w/e 02/10/1965 5E Nuneaton w/e 15/01/1966 5B m/e 11/1966 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3083 09/10/1954 16A Nottingham (New) w/e 05/03/1966 5B w/e 25/11/1967 5A Crewe Diesel
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3084 09/10/1954 16A Nottingham (New) w/e 05/03/1966 5B w/e 25/11/1967 5A Crewe Diesel
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3984 05/08/1960 84E Tyseley (New) w/e 05/03/1966 5B w/e 25/11/1967 5A Crewe Diesel
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48449 w/e 02/10/1965 2F Bescot w/e 12/03/1966 5B w/e 20/05/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 09 0-6-0 D4109 29/11/1961 5D Stoke (New) w/e 23/04/1966 5B w/e 25/11/1967 5A Crewe Diesel
Diesel 09 0-6-0 D4110 08/12/1961 5D Stoke (New) w/e 23/04/1966 5B w/e 25/11/1967 5A Crewe Diesel
Diesel 09 0-6-0 D4111 w/e 19/06/1965 5D Stoke w/e 23/04/1966 5B w/e 25/11/1967 5A Crewe Diesel
Diesel DES1 0-6-0 15000 w/e 05/02/1966 5D Stoke w/e 23/04/1966 5B 05/08/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel DES1 0-6-0 15001 w/e 05/02/1966 5D Stoke w/e 23/04/1966 5B 03/11/1966 To Store
Diesel DES1 0-6-0 15002 w/e 05/02/1966 5A Crewe Diesel w/e 23/04/1966 5B 05/08/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel DES1 0-6-0 15002 w/e 05/02/1966 5D Stoke w/e 23/04/1966 5B 05/08/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel DES1 0-6-0 15003 w/e 05/02/1966 5D Stoke w/e 23/04/1966 5B 06/05/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70012 w/e 26/02/1966 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 23/04/1966 5B w/e 20/08/1966 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70014 w/e 26/02/1966 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 23/04/1966 5B w/e 06/08/1966 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70023 w/e 26/02/1966 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 23/04/1966 5B w/e 17/09/1966 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70024 w/e 26/02/1966 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 23/04/1966 5B w/e 20/08/1966 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70025 w/e 26/02/1966 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 23/04/1966 5B w/e 17/09/1966 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70027 w/e 26/02/1966 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 23/04/1966 5B w/e 17/09/1966 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70028 w/e 26/02/1966 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 23/04/1966 5B w/e 17/09/1966 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46495 w/e 25/05/1963 2B Nuneaton w/e 04/06/1966 5B m/e 10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46512 w/e 02/10/1965 5E Nuneaton w/e 04/06/1966 5B m/e 12/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48186 w/e 12/09/1964 16E Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 17/09/1966 5B m/e 10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48194 w/e 18/06/1966 16E Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 17/09/1966 5B w/e 19/08/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48225 01/01/1948 16C Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 17/09/1966 5B m/e 10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78059 w/e 04/06/1966 5D Stoke w/e 08/10/1966 5B m/e 11/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46428 w/e 19/06/1965 2A Tyseley w/e 08/10/1966 5B m/e 12/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45349 w/e 02/10/1965 2A Tyseley w/e 12/11/1966 5B m/e 11/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48436 4w/e 30/12/1961 89A Shrewsbury w/e 11/02/1967 5B w/e 18/11/1967 9K Bolton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48018 w/e 09/01/1965 5D Stoke w/e 11/03/1967 5B w/e 15/04/1967 6A Chester (MR)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48220 w/e 27/02/1965 2E Saltley w/e 11/03/1967 5B w/e 02/09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48336 w/e 26/03/1966 2E Saltley w/e 11/03/1967 5B w/e 18/11/1967 9L Buxton (LNWR)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48351 01/01/1948 21A Saltley w/e 11/03/1967 5B w/e 18/11/1967 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48450 w/e 16/07/1966 2B Oxley w/e 11/03/1967 5B w/e 19/08/1967 8A Edge Hill
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48460 w/e 16/07/1966 2B Oxley w/e 11/03/1967 5B w/e 16/09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48474 w/e 19/06/1965 2B Oxley w/e 11/03/1967 5B w/e 16/09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48531 w/e 16/07/1966 2B Oxley w/e 11/03/1967 5B w/e 16/09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48548 w/e 14/09/1963 5D Stoke w/e 11/03/1967 5B w/e 15/04/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48725 w/e 03/01/1966 2E Saltley w/e 11/03/1967 5B w/e 02/09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48767 w/e 15/01/1966 5D Stoke w/e 11/03/1967 5B w/e 16/09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44800 w/e 23/04/1966 6D Shrewsbury w/e 11/03/1967 5B w/e 19/08/1967 10D Lostock Hall
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44812 w/e 03/04/1965 2B Oxley w/e 11/03/1967 5B m/e 09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44814 w/e 02/10/1965 6D Shrewsbury w/e 11/03/1967 5B m/e 09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44821 w/e 02/10/1965 6D Shrewsbury w/e 11/03/1967 5B m/e 06/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44843 w/e 19/06/1965 2B Oxley w/e 11/03/1967 5B m/e 09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44865 w/e 12/11/1966 2B Oxley w/e 11/03/1967 5B m/e 09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45006 w/e 03/04/1965 2B Oxley w/e 11/03/1967 5B m/e 09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45145 w/e 02/10/1965 6D Shrewsbury w/e 11/03/1967 5B m/e 11/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45186 w/e 03/04/1965 2B Oxley w/e 11/03/1967 5B m/e 09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45264 w/e 16/04/1966 2B Oxley w/e 11/03/1967 5B m/e 09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45285 w/e 02/11/1963 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 11/03/1967 5B w/e 24/06/1967 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45310 w/e 10/09/1966 6D Shrewsbury w/e 11/03/1967 5B w/e 24/06/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45040 w/e 03/04/1965 2B Oxley w/e 25/03/1967 5B m/e 07/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44766 w/e 08/10/1966 6A Chester (MR) w/e 29/04/1967 5B m/e 08/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44944 w/e 11/03/1967 6A Chester (MR) w/e 29/04/1967 5B m/e 09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45089 w/e 10/09/1966 6A Chester (MR) w/e 29/04/1967 5B m/e 08/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43021 w/e 03/04/1965 5D Stoke w/e 03/06/1967 5B 16/09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43088 w/e 22/04/1967 6C Croes Newydd w/e 03/06/1967 5B w/e 19/08/1967 10D Lostock Hall
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48018 w/e 15/04/1967 6A Chester (MR) w/e 10/06/1967 5B w/e 21/10/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48252 w/e 28/08/1965 6C Croes Newydd w/e 10/06/1967 5B w/e 19/08/1967 29F  
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48287 w/e 15/04/1967 6A Chester (MR) w/e 10/06/1967 5B w/e 01/07/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44917 w/e 23/04/1966 6A Chester (MR) w/e 10/06/1967 5B m/e 11/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45042 w/e 08/10/1966 6A Chester (MR) w/e 10/06/1967 5B m/e 09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45298 w/e 08/10/1966 6A Chester (MR) w/e 10/06/1967 5B m/e 09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45353 w/e 07/03/1964 6A Chester (MR) w/e 10/06/1967 5B w/e 19/08/1967 10D Lostock Hall
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48364 w/e 17/09/1966 5D Stoke w/e 12/08/1967 5B w/e 16/09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48402 w/e 11/03/1967 5D Stoke w/e 12/08/1967 5B w/e 18/11/1967 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48522 w/e 03/12/1966 5D Stoke w/e 12/08/1967 5B w/e 19/08/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48729 w/e 11/03/1967 5D Stoke w/e 12/08/1967 5B w/e 18/11/1967 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43001 w/e 12/03/1966 5D Stoke w/e 12/08/1967 5B 16/09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43003 w/e 21/09/1963 5D Stoke w/e 12/08/1967 5B 16/09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43007 w/e 02/10/1965 5D Stoke w/e 12/08/1967 5B 16/09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43112 w/e 21/09/1963 5D Stoke w/e 12/08/1967 5B 16/09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44805 w/e 15/04/1967 5D Stoke w/e 12/08/1967 5B m/e 09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45052 w/e 15/04/1967 5D Stoke w/e 12/08/1967 5B m/e 09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45241 w/e 19/01/1963 5D Stoke w/e 12/08/1967 5B m/e 09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45270 w/e 19/09/1964 5D Stoke w/e 12/08/1967 5B m/e 09/1967 Withdrawn