Depot: Allerton
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Allerton | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D215 | on | 18/04/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | w/e | 14/10/1967 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D216 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | w/e | 14/10/1967 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D217 | on | 18/04/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | w/e | 14/10/1967 | 8J | w/e | 21/10/1967 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D218 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | w/e | 14/10/1967 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D219 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | w/e | 14/10/1967 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D220 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | w/e | 14/10/1967 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D221 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | w/e | 14/10/1967 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D222 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | w/e | 14/10/1967 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D223 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | w/e | 14/10/1967 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D224 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | w/e | 14/10/1967 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D225 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | w/e | 21/10/1967 | 8J | w/e | 13/01/1968 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D339 | on | 18/04/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | w/e | 13/01/1968 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D206 | w/e | 05/07/1967 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | w/e | 06/04/1968 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D207 | w/e | 19/08/1967 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | w/e | 06/04/1968 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D208 | w/e | 05/07/1967 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | w/e | 06/04/1968 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D209 | w/e | 05/07/1967 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | w/e | 06/04/1968 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D287 | on | 18/04/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | w/e | 06/04/1968 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7569 | w/e | 16/03/1968 | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby | w/e | 27/04/1968 | 8J | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7574 | w/e | 16/09/1967 | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby | w/e | 27/04/1968 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7575 | on | 16/01/1965 | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby | w/e | 27/04/1968 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7577 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby | w/e | 27/04/1968 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7580 | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D14 | London (Midland) | w/e | 27/04/1968 | 8J | 5w/e | 01/06/1968 | 65A | Eastfield |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7582 | w/e | 16/09/1967 | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby | w/e | 27/04/1968 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7585 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby | w/e | 27/04/1968 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7587 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby | w/e | 27/04/1968 | 8J | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D245 | w/e | 07/10/1967 | 10A | Carnforth | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D246 | w/e | 14/10/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D288 | on | 18/04/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D291 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | w/e | 15/06/1968 | 9A | Longsight |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D292 | on | 18/04/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | w/e | 15/06/1968 | 9A | Longsight |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2117 | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2198 | w/e | 25/11/1967 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | w/e | 02/11/1968 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2209 | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 27/07/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2221 | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 13/07/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2253 | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 28/04/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2274 | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 17/05/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2300 | w/e | 16/12/1967 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 17/05/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2396 | w/e | 09/12/1967 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 11/05/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | D2850 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | w/e | 09/05/1970 | To Store | |
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | D2851 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | w/e | 06/11/1971 | To Store | |
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | D2852 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 01/10/1973 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | D2853 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 01/06/1975 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | D2854 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | w/e | 21/02/1970 | To Store | |
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | D2855 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | w/e | 09/05/1970 | To Store | |
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | D2856 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 01/06/1975 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | D2857 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | w/e | 02/08/1969 | To Store | |
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | D2860 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | w/e | 25/04/1970 | To Store | |
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | D2867 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | w/e | 06/06/1970 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3019 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 01/06/1973 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3033 | w/e | 16/09/1967 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | w/e | 15/12/1973 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3109 | w/e | 07/10/1967 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | w/e | 22/07/1972 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3187 | w/e | 16/09/1967 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | 5w/e | 30/09/1971 | 73F | Ashford Chart Leacon |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3197 | w/e | 11/11/1967 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | 3w/e | 06/10/1973 | NH | Newton Heath |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3349 | 4w/e | 16/03/1963 | 66C | Hamilton (West) | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 12/04/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3352 | w/e | 16/09/1967 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 02/11/1980 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3353 | w/e | 16/09/1967 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | w/e | 11/10/1975 | LO | Longsight |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3360 | w/e | 16/09/1967 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 25/04/1982 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3370 | w/e | 27/04/1963 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | m/e | 02/1977 | BC | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3398 | w/e | 21/10/1967 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 31/12/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3399 | w/e | 28/10/1967 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | w/e | 15/12/1973 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3546 | w/e | 09/09/1967 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 04/07/1985 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3578 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 16/03/1989 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3579 | w/e | 18/10/1958 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 01/09/1985 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3793 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | w/e | 15/01/1972 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3794 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | w/e | 12/01/1974 | BY | Bletchley |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3836 | w/e | 29/01/1966 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 23/05/1989 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3837 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 09/08/1981 | 98Su | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3855 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 01/03/1991 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3856 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3857 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 30/08/1981 | 98Su | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3858 | w/e | 04/09/1965 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | w/e | 10/01/1970 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3870 | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | w/e | 19/10/1968 | 5A | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3950 | w/e | 07/10/1967 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4146 | on | 19/09/1962 | 8C | Speke Junction (New) | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 29/10/1992 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4147 | w/e | 10/06/1967 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 22/11/1991 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4148 | on | 25/09/1962 | 8C | Speke Junction (New) | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4152 | on | 02/11/1962 | 8C | Speke Junction (New) | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | w/e | 27/06/1970 | 12C | Barrow in Furness |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4153 | on | 13/11/1962 | 8C | Speke Junction (New) | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 10/06/1993 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4154 | on | 13/12/1962 | 8A | Edge Hill (New) | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4155 | on | 14/12/1962 | 8A | Edge Hill (New) | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | w/e | 23/03/1974 | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5248 | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5249 | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5250 | w/e | 03/02/1968 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5251 | w/e | 09/12/1967 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5252 | w/e | 23/12/1967 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5253 | w/e | 23/12/1967 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5254 | w/e | 23/12/1967 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5258 | w/e | 05/07/1967 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5259 | w/e | 14/10/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5260 | w/e | 14/10/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5261 | w/e | 14/10/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5262 | w/e | 14/10/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5283 | w/e | 05/07/1967 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7546 | w/e | 02/12/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7547 | w/e | 02/12/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7548 | w/e | 02/12/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7551 | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7552 | w/e | 07/10/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12034 | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 19/10/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12035 | w/e | 07/10/1967 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 19/10/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12061 | w/e | 07/10/1967 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 09/10/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12063 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | w/e | 23/01/1971 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12094 | w/e | 07/10/1967 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | on | 09/10/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2392 | w/e | 03/06/1967 | 10A | Carnforth | w/e | 18/05/1968 | 8J | w/e | 17/01/1970 | 12C | Barrow in Furness |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12057 | w/e | 05/03/1960 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 18/05/1968 | 8J | on | 25/01/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7616 | on | 19/06/1966 | 65A | Eastfield (New) | w/e | 15/06/1968 | 8J | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D4113 | on | 04/01/1962 | 9A | Longsight (New) | w/e | 21/09/1968 | 8J | w/e | 13/07/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4115 | on | 18/01/1962 | 24C | Lostock Hall (New) | w/e | 21/09/1968 | 8J | on | 07/05/1993 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D4112 | w/e | 07/12/1968 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | on | 29/12/1968 | 8J | w/e | 20/07/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3008 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 10D | Lostock Hall | w/e | 25/01/1969 | 8J | w/e | 03/08/1974 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3361 | w/e | 28/10/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 10/05/1969 | 8J | on | 04/01/1983 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12065 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 10/05/1969 | 8J | w/e | 10/04/1971 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2385 | w/e | 27/07/1968 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | w/e | 17/05/1969 | 8J | w/e | 06/12/1969 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3192 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 2F | Bescot | w/e | 12/07/1969 | 8J | w/e | 01/11/1969 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3778 | w/e | 30/04/1966 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 12/07/1969 | 8J | w/e | 29/11/1969 | 9A | Longsight |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3343 | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | w/e | 06/12/1969 | 8J | 2w/e | 05/08/1972 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | D2857 | w/e | 02/08/1969 | 98S | w/e | 27/12/1969 | 8J | w/e | 03/01/1970 | To Store | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3192 | w/e | 01/11/1969 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 10/01/1970 | 8J | w/e | 28/12/1974 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3366 | w/e | 21/10/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 10/01/1970 | 8J | on | 30/10/1988 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3102 | w/e | 06/12/1969 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 24/01/1970 | 8J | w/e | 07/03/1970 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | D2857 | w/e | 03/01/1970 | 98S | w/e | 21/02/1970 | 8J | on | 18/04/1971 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3104 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | w/e | 21/02/1970 | 8J | w/e | 07/03/1970 | 8J | Allerton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3605 | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 98S | w/e | 21/02/1970 | 8J | w/e | 07/03/1970 | 8J | Allerton | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3104 | w/e | 21/02/1970 | 8J | Allerton | w/e | 07/03/1970 | 8J | w/e | 14/03/1970 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3605 | w/e | 21/02/1970 | 8J | Allerton | w/e | 07/03/1970 | 8J | w/e | 28/03/1970 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3425 | w/e | 27/07/1968 | 16B | Colwick | w/e | 18/04/1970 | 8J | w/e | 09/05/1970 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | D2850 | w/e | 09/05/1970 | 98S | w/e | 06/06/1970 | 8J | on | 20/06/1970 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | D2855 | w/e | 09/05/1970 | 98S | w/e | 06/06/1970 | 8J | on | 04/10/1970 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | D2860 | w/e | 25/04/1970 | 98S | w/e | 06/06/1970 | 8J | on | 13/12/1970 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4135 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 14B | Cricklewood West | w/e | 18/07/1970 | 8J | w/e | 25/03/1972 | 1A | Willesden |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4139 | w/e | 31/10/1970 | 10D | Lostock Hall | w/e | 14/11/1970 | 8J | w/e | 12/12/1970 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12088 | w/e | 29/11/1969 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 14/11/1970 | 8J | on | 11/05/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12051 | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 09/01/1971 | 8J | on | 09/10/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3007 | w/e | 15/02/1969 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 8J | w/e | 27/04/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3009 | w/e | 04/03/1967 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 26/06/1971 | 8J | w/e | 04/12/1976 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3795 | w/e | 24/04/1971 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 11/03/1972 | 8J | on | 31/08/2005 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3909 | 5w/e | 01/04/1972 | 65A | Eastfield | w/e | 15/04/1972 | 8J | 4w/e | 29/04/1972 | 91M | To London Midland Region |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3694 | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 9A | Longsight | 2w/e | 05/08/1972 | 8J | on | 23/04/1993 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4117 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 2w/e | 05/08/1972 | 8J | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08838 | w/e | 15/07/1972 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 13/10/1973 | AN | on | 09/05/1990 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08679 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 22/06/1974 | AN | on | 19/06/1976 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08939 | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 20/07/1974 | AN | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08931 | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 84B | St Blazey | w/e | 27/07/1974 | AN | on | 30/06/2005 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08857 | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | AN | on | 21/10/1991 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08922 | w/e | 27/06/1970 | 12C | Barrow in Furness | w/e | 11/10/1975 | AN | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08703 | w/e | 09/11/1974 | TO | Toton | w/e | 19/06/1976 | AN | m/e | 31/10/1979 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08213 | w/e | 08/12/1973 | NH | Newton Heath | m/e | 10/1976 | AN | on | 02/11/1980 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08534 | w/e | 24/02/1973 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | m/e | 10/1976 | AN | on | 04/09/1988 | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08300 | m/e | 04/1977 | CH | Chester West | m/e | 09/1977 | AN | on | 17/07/1983 | Withdrawn |