Depot: Croes Newydd
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Croes Newydd | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3327 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | CNYD | m/e | 03/1936 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3403 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | CNYD | m/e | 01/1937 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2287 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | CNYD | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6625 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | CNYD | on | 15/06/1947 | LMTN | Leamington | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2232 | 4w/e | 29/12/1945 | CNYD | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | Stafford Road | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6422 | 4w/e | 29/12/1945 | CNYD | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | Stafford Road | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5334 | on | 01/01/1934 | 24 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | CNYD | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7305 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | CNYD | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2030 | 4w/e | 18/05/1946 | CNYD | on | 15/06/1947 | WLN | Wellington | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3203 | 4w/e | 30/11/1946 | CNYD | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 1747 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | TYS | Tyseley | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | m/e | 05/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 1773 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | m/e | 03/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 1780 | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | m/e | 08/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2183 | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | ||||||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2188 | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | ||||||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2184 | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | ||||||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2190 | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | ||||||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2259 | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 89C | Machynlleth | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2287 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | BCN | Brecon |
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 2704 | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | m/e | 03/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 2713 | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | m/e | 09/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 2717 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | WLN | Wellington | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | m/e | 10/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3203 | 4w/e | 30/11/1946 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3206 | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4375 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1401 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | LMTN | Leamington | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | BAN | Banbury |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1411 | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | BAN | Banbury | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1416 | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | m/e | 10/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1457 | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5315 | on | 01/01/1934 | 114 | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 84B | Oxley | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5319 | on | 01/01/1934 | Sw Wks | Swindon Works | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5334 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 84K | Chester West |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5365 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | OXY | Oxley | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | m/e | 03/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 5810 | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | m/e | 01/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 5811 | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | on | 09/07/1956 | To Store | |||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6303 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | WES | Westbury | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6316 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | BAN | Banbury | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6327 | on | 01/01/1934 | 44 | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6694 | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | m/e | 10/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6698 | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7305 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7310 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | BAN | Banbury | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7403 | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7409 | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | m/e | 08/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7414 | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7817 | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9656 | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | m/e | 30/04/1948 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | ||||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | 1706 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | YEO | Yeovil Pen Mill | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | m/e | 06/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1532 | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | ||||||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 70808 | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 87F | Llanelli | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2071 | on | 15/06/1947 | TYS | Tyseley | m/e | 30/04/1948 | CNYD | m/e | 06/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5774 | on | 15/06/1947 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | m/e | 30/04/1948 | CNYD | on | 05/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2871 | on | 15/06/1947 | BAN | Banbury | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | CNYD | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3825 | on | 15/06/1947 | BAN | Banbury | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | CNYD | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6392 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHR | Chester West | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | CNYD | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | CHR | Chester West |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6405 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | CNYD | m/e | 06/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2232 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | CNYD | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2745 | on | 15/06/1947 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | CNYD | m/e | 01/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2065 | on | 15/06/1947 | TYS | Tyseley | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | CNYD | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | TYS | Tyseley |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2152 | on | 15/06/1947 | TYS | Tyseley | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | CNYD | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6404 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | CNYD | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2209 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | TYS | Tyseley | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | CNYD | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2538 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | CNYD | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | OSW | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9614 | on | 15/06/1947 | BCN | Brecon | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | CNYD | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | TYS | Tyseley |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2262 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHR | Chester West | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | CNYD | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6311 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHR | Chester West | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | CNYD | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7313 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHR | Chester West | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | CNYD | m/e | 07/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 2719 | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | WLN | Wellington | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | CNYD | m/e | 11/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2822 | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | SDN | Swindon | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | CNYD | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 84K | Chester West |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2840 | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | SHL | Southall | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | CNYD | m/e | 06/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2297 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | TYS | Tyseley | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | CNYD | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1473 | on | 15/06/1947 | BAN | Banbury | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 84J | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 34E | Neasden |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5742 | on | 15/06/1947 | TYS | Tyseley | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 84J | m/e | 09/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7447 | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 84J | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2296 | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 84J | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 84E | Tyseley |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1624 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 84J | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2878 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 84J | m/e | 06/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4645 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXF | Oxford | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 84J | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 84J | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7432 | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 84J | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7435 | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 84J | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4645 | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 84J | m/e | 11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7432 | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 84J | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7435 | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 84J | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4617 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 84K | Chester West | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 84J | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 84J | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4617 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 84J | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 89A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7825 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 84J | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7826 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 84J | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4683 | on | 15/06/1947 | TYS | Tyseley | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 84J | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 84J | Croes Newydd |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7825 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 84J | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7826 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 84J | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4683 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 84J | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5313 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXY | Oxley | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 84J | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5315 | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 84B | Oxley | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 84J | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 84K | Chester West |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2185 | on | 15/06/1947 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 84J | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4525 | on | 15/06/1947 | PZ | Penzance | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 84J | m/e | 07/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6611 | on | 15/06/1947 | TYS | Tyseley | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 84J | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 84J | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6617 | on | 15/06/1947 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 84J | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 84J | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9793 | on | 15/06/1947 | TYS | Tyseley | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 84J | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 84J | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6611 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 84J | m/e | 11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6617 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 84J | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9793 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 84J | m/e | 08/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1410 | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 84A | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 84J | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 84J | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1410 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 84J | Croes Newydd | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 84J | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2259 | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 89C | Machynlleth | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 84J | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 84J | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2259 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 84J | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1426 | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 84A | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 84J | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 84J | Croes Newydd |
Steam | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3033 | m/e | 07/1911 | Withdrawn | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 (R) | 84J | |||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1426 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 84J | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2259 | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 89C | Machynlleth | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 84J | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6632 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 84J | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 84J | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6632 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 84J | m/e | 09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5912 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHR | Chester West | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 84J | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 84J | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2853 | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | BAN | Banbury | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 84J | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5912 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 84J | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 84E | Tyseley |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7442 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 84J | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2257 | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 84J | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 84J | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2257 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 84J | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 84E | Tyseley |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6625 | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 84J | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6696 | on | 15/06/1947 | BAN | Banbury | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 84J | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5399 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHR | Chester West | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 84J | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2107 | on | 15/06/1947 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 84J | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1646 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 84J | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 60C | Helmsdale |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2209 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 84J | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 9028 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 81F | Oxford | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 84J | on | 24/09/1956 | To Store | |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1635 | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 89A | Oswestry | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 84J | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5328 | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 84J | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6339 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 82D | Westbury | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 84J | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5416 | on | 15/06/1947 | SHL | Southall | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 84J | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2292 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 84J | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2295 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 84J | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6338 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 84J | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6339 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 84J | m/e | 07/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6362 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 84J | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6404 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 84A | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 84J | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 89A | Oswestry |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1660 | on | 28/02/1955 (New) | 84J | m/e | 02/1966 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2202 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 84J | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2209 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 84J | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2256 | on | 15/06/1947 | BAN | Banbury | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 84J | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6633 | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 84D | Leamington | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 84J | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 88F | Treherbert |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5319 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 84K | Chester West | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 84J | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2209 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 84C | Banbury | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 84J | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 87H | Neyland |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2296 | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 84E | Tyseley | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 84J | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 87H | Neyland |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8791 | on | 15/06/1947 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 84J | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 86C | Hereford |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1465 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 81B | Slough | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 84J | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7422 | on | 15/06/1947 | TR | Truro | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 84J | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1659 | on | 28/02/1955 | 87G | Carmarthen (New) | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 84J | m/e | 10/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1465 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 84J | m/e | 09/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2247 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 84J | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 9004 | on | 15/06/1947 | MCH | Machynlleth | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 84J | m/e | 06/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 9014 | on | 15/06/1947 | MCH | Machynlleth | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 84J | m/e | 10/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2211 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 83C | Exeter | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 84J | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2230 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 83B | Taunton | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 84J | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6817 | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 84J | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 9018 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 89C | Machynlleth | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 84J | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 89A | Oswestry |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1458 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 84J | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 89A | Oswestry |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7817 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 84J | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8727 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 84J | m/e | 04/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6429 | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 84J | 4w/e | 13/06/1959 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7428 | on | 15/06/1947 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 84J | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9621 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 84J | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 84H | Wellington |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1635 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 84J | m/e | 10/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2855 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 84J | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3689 | on | 15/06/1947 | TYS | Tyseley | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 84J | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3828 | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 84J | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5378 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 84J | m/e | 09/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6307 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 84J | m/e | 07/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6357 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 84J | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2294 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 89A | Oswestry | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 84J | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3201 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 84J | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6674 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 84J | m/e | 07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6615 | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | CV.BRY | Barry | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 84J | m/e | 05/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3815 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 84J | m/e | 05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7341 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 84J | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1618 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 84J | m/e | 05/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3749 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 84J | m/e | 11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3760 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 84J | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4683 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 84J | m/e | 10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5606 | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 84J | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5651 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 84J | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 88B | Radyr |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6353 | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 84J | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6610 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 84J | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 87H | Neyland |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8734 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 84J | m/e | 03/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9610 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 84J | m/e | 09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40126 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 84J | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7230 | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 84J | m/e | 07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7300 | on | 15/06/1947 | WES | Westbury | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 84J | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 89A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3630 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 84J | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3665 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 84J | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3676 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 84J | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3786 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 84J | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4602 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 84J | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5399 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 84J | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6380 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 84J | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 89A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7762 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 84J | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8709 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 84J | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8729 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 84J | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8730 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 84J | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 88E | Abercynon |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9794 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 84J | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2200 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 81E | Didcot | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 84J | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2222 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 84J | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3207 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 84J | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3786 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 84J | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6306 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 87H | Neyland | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 84J | m/e | 11/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6698 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 84J | w/e | 09/03/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7314 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 84J | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 89A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3210 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 84J | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 82G | Templecombe (S&D) | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2200 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 89C | Machynlleth | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 84J | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3756 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 84J | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3846 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 89B | m/e | 11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6374 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 89B | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 89A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7431 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 89A | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 89B | m/e | 08/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7828 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 89B | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2201 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 84A | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 89B | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 84D | Leamington |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2210 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 89B | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 84D | Leamington |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2236 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 89B | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2856 | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 89B | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7811 | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 89B | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7821 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 89B | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7339 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 89B | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7341 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 89B | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1447 | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 88B | Radyr | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 89B | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 86C | Hereford |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7812 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 89D | Oswestry | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 89B | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 89A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7418 | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 85C | Hereford | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 89B | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 89B | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7442 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 89C | Machynlleth | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 89B | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5679 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 89B | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1632 | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 89A | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 89B | m/e | 04/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2257 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 84D | Leamington | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 89B | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5330 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 89B | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6301 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 89B | on | 22/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6375 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 89B | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 89A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80079 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 30A | Stratford | on | 15/07/1962 | 89B | on | 24/07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80080 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 33B | Tilbury | on | 15/07/1962 | 89B | on | 24/07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1663 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 89B | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 89D | Oswestry |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3209 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 89A | Oswestry | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 89B | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6604 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 89B | m/e | 10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7314 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 89A | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 89B | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 89A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7803 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 89C | Machynlleth | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 89B | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1628 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 89A | Oswestry | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 89B | w/e | 24/10/1964 | On Loan - McAlpi | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3789 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 89A | Oswestry | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 89B | m/e | 10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7442 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 89C | Machynlleth | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 89B | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9608 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 83B | Taunton | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 89B | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 2C | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6625 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 82D | Westbury | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 89B | w/e | 17/07/1965 | 2A | Tyseley |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80096 | on | 15/07/1962 | 89A | Shrewsbury | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 89B | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80098 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 89A | Shrewsbury | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 89B | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7418 | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 89B | Croes Newydd | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 89B | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80104 | on | 15/07/1962 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 89B | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5679 | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | 88C | Barry | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 89B | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46507 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 89A | Oswestry | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 89B | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46508 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 89A | Oswestry | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 89B | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46509 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 89A | Oswestry | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 89B | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80070 | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 89A | Shrewsbury | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 89B | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 89A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80078 | on | 15/07/1962 | 89A | Shrewsbury | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 89B | on | 24/07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80101 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 89C | Machynlleth | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 89B | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80105 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 89C | Machynlleth | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 89B | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75006 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 89C | Machynlleth | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 89B | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75009 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 89C | Machynlleth | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 89B | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75020 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 89C | Machynlleth | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 89B | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75021 | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 89C | Machynlleth | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 89B | w/e | 19/03/1966 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75023 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 89C | Machynlleth | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 89B | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75024 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 89C | Machynlleth | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 89B | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75026 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 89C | Machynlleth | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 89B | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 8K | Bank Hall |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75027 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 89C | Machynlleth | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 89B | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 8K | Bank Hall |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75029 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 89C | Machynlleth | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 89B | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3813 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 84B | Oxley | w/e | 23/03/1963 | 89B | m/e | 07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3831 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 84B | Oxley | w/e | 23/03/1963 | 89B | m/e | 09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3829 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 84E | Tyseley | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 89B | m/e | 03/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3865 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 84E | Tyseley | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 89B | m/e | 03/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1663 | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 89A | Shrewsbury | w/e | 04/05/1963 | 89B | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 89B | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6651 | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 86G | Pontypool Road | on | 15/05/1963 | 89B | m/e | 10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1663 | w/e | 04/05/1963 | 89B | Croes Newydd | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 89B | w/e | 16/05/1964 | 6C | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48659 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 89B | w/e | 20/07/1963 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3862 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | on | 08/09/1963 | 6C | m/e | 02/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5667 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | CV.BRY | Barry | on | 08/09/1963 | 6C | m/e | 07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80096 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 89C | Machynlleth | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 6C | w/e | 01/05/1965 | 70F | Bournemouth |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48762 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 21B | Bescot | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 6C | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48020 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 2B | Bletchley | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 6C | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48269 | w/e | 20/01/1962 | 21B | Bescot | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 6C | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46442 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 6H | Bangor | w/e | 01/02/1964 | 6C | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 2L | Leamington |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41201 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 84H | Wellington | w/e | 01/02/1964 | 6C | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 2M | Wellington |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41202 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 89A | Shrewsbury | w/e | 01/02/1964 | 6C | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84003 | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 21/03/1964 | 6C | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84009 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 21/03/1964 | 6C | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3809 | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 84C | Banbury | w/e | 11/04/1964 | 6C | m/e | 10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3849 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 84C | Banbury | w/e | 11/04/1964 | 6C | m/e | 05/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1663 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 89B | Croes Newydd | w/e | 16/05/1964 | 6C | m/e | 01/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75071 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 82G | Templecombe (S&D) | on | 12/07/1964 | 6C | w/e | 10/06/1967 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3782 | 4w/e | 29/02/1952 | 84G | Shrewsbury | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 6C | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 2C | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41204 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 6H | Bangor | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 6C | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41241 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 6H | Bangor | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 6C | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9630 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 84H | Wellington | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 6C | m/e | 09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9639 | on | 15/06/1947 | WLN | Wellington | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 6C | m/e | 09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5676 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 88B | Radyr | on | 06/09/1964 | 6C | m/e | 11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6626 | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | on | 06/09/1964 | 6C | m/e | 11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6665 | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | on | 06/09/1964 | 6C | w/e | 17/07/1965 | 2A | Tyseley |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1628 | w/e | 24/10/1964 | On Loan - McAlpi | w/e | 21/11/1964 | 6C | m/e | 09/1966 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48134 | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 6C | w/e | 20/02/1965 | 1H | Northampton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48325 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 6C | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48479 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 6C | w/e | 26/12/1964 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48518 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 6C | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48665 | w/e | 08/04/1950 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 6C | w/e | 04/03/1967 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48353 | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 6C | w/e | 30/01/1965 | 2C | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1638 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 89D | Oswestry | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 6C | m/e | 08/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3850 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 6E | Oswestry | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 6C | m/e | 08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3855 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 6E | Oswestry | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 6C | m/e | 08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84000 | w/e | 13/04/1963 | 89D | Oswestry | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 6C | on | 30/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84004 | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 89D | Oswestry | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 6C | on | 30/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5677 | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 88D | Rhymney | on | 25/04/1965 | 6C | m/e | 11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48134 | w/e | 20/02/1965 | 1H | Northampton | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 6C | w/e | 08/01/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73032 | 2w/e | 11/04/1965 | 70D | Eastleigh | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 6C | w/e | 07/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73045 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 5E | Nuneaton | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 6C | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 9H | Patricroft |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73004 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 5E | Nuneaton | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 6C | w/e | 30/04/1966 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73096 | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 5E | Nuneaton | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 6C | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 9H | Patricroft |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46507 | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 6C | w/e | 26/06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73040 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 5E | Nuneaton | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 6C | w/e | 30/04/1966 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46508 | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 6C | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 6F | Machynlleth |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73095 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 84G | Shrewsbury | w/e | 28/08/1965 | 6C | w/e | 30/04/1966 | 9J | Agecroft |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48122 | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 28/08/1965 | 6C | w/e | 18/02/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48147 | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 28/08/1965 | 6C | w/e | 30/07/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48252 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 28/08/1965 | 6C | w/e | 10/06/1967 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5659 | on | 25/04/1965 | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 6C | w/e | 27/11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6683 | m/e | 10/1965 | Withdrawn | w/e | 02/10/1965 (R) | 6C | |||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48440 | w/e | 01/02/1964 | 1H | Northampton | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 6C | w/e | 18/02/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45130 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 6C | w/e | 29/04/1967 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45198 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 6C | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45344 | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 6C | w/e | 20/08/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3709 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 89A | Shrewsbury | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 6C | m/e | 08/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6668 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 84D | Leamington | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 6C | w/e | 04/12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6697 | w/e | 23/10/1965 | 2A | Tyseley | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 6C | m/e | 05/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48411 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 6C | w/e | 26/02/1966 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48697 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 6C | w/e | 26/02/1966 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45045 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 6D | Shrewsbury | w/e | 27/11/1965 | 6C | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 9F | Heaton Mersey |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48255 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 04/12/1965 | 6C | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48554 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 04/12/1965 | 6C | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5605 | on | 25/04/1965 | 2A | Tyseley | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 6C | m/e | 05/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48287 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 6C | w/e | 26/02/1966 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48632 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 6C | w/e | 26/02/1966 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48747 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 21B | Bescot | w/e | 15/01/1966 | 6C | w/e | 03/09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75010 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 05/03/1966 | 6C | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75012 | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 6F | Machynlleth | w/e | 05/03/1966 | 6C | w/e | 19/03/1966 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75047 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 05/03/1966 | 6C | w/e | 16/07/1966 | 6F | Machynlleth |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48287 | w/e | 26/02/1966 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 6C | w/e | 15/04/1967 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75033 | on | 24/04/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 21/05/1966 | 6C | w/e | 21/01/1967 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75046 | w/e | 30/04/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 21/05/1966 | 6C | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75048 | w/e | 30/04/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 21/05/1966 | 6C | w/e | 27/05/1967 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75060 | w/e | 30/04/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 21/05/1966 | 6C | w/e | 22/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92029 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 6C | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 2E | Saltley |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92074 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 6C | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92125 | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 6C | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92135 | on | 30/06/1957 | 21A | Saltley (New) | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 6C | w/e | 29/10/1966 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8767 | m/e | 07/1966 | Withdrawn | w/e | 16/07/1966 (R) | 6C | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9641 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | w/e | 16/07/1966 | 6C | m/e | 10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75021 | w/e | 19/03/1966 | 6D | Shrewsbury | w/e | 16/07/1966 | 6C | w/e | 29/04/1967 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92137 | on | 31/07/1957 | 21A | Saltley (New) | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 6C | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76040 | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 10/09/1966 | 6C | w/e | 08/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76048 | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 10/09/1966 | 6C | w/e | 04/02/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76086 | w/e | 18/06/1966 | 6F | Machynlleth | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 6C | w/e | 24/09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48339 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 6C | w/e | 08/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48385 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 6C | w/e | 03/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44872 | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 2D | Banbury | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 6C | w/e | 20/05/1967 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48253 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 6C | w/e | 04/03/1967 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48632 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 6C | w/e | 18/03/1967 | 8E | Northwich |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48669 | w/e | 07/05/1966 | 2A | Tyseley | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 6C | w/e | 10/06/1967 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48697 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 6C | w/e | 10/06/1967 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44762 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 2A | Tyseley | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 6C | w/e | 26/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44776 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 2A | Tyseley | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 6C | w/e | 27/05/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75002 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 89C | Machynlleth | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 6C | w/e | 03/06/1967 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75047 | w/e | 16/07/1966 | 6F | Machynlleth | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 6C | w/e | 21/01/1967 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75052 | w/e | 16/07/1966 | 6F | Machynlleth | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 6C | w/e | 10/06/1967 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75006 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 6D | Shrewsbury | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 6C | w/e | 10/06/1967 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75009 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 6D | Shrewsbury | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 6C | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75013 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 6D | Shrewsbury | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 6C | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75016 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 6D | Shrewsbury | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 6C | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 16B | Colwick |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75029 | w/e | 03/09/1966 | 6D | Shrewsbury | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 6C | w/e | 10/06/1967 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75033 | w/e | 21/01/1967 | 6D | Shrewsbury | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 6C | w/e | 29/04/1967 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75047 | w/e | 21/01/1967 | 6D | Shrewsbury | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 6C | w/e | 10/06/1967 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75055 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 6D | Shrewsbury | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 6C | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76037 | w/e | 04/02/1967 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 08/04/1967 | 6C | w/e | 10/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76039 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 08/04/1967 | 6C | w/e | 10/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43088 | w/e | 12/03/1966 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 6C | w/e | 03/06/1967 | 5B | Crewe South |