Depot: Duffryn Yard
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Duffryn Yard | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4277 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | DYD | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5631 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | DYD | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore | ||||
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1943 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | DYD | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5697 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | DYD | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 1745 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | DYD | on | 15/06/1947 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 291 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | m/e | 01/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 294 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | m/e | 07/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 296 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | m/e | 09/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2079 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | m/e | 11/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 2715 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | m/e | 07/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2721 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | m/e | 08/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2792 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | m/e | 06/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3718 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | m/e | 05/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3791 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 88F | Treherbert | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4255 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | m/e | 30/06/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4277 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | m/e | 30/06/1948 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4286 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | m/e | 30/06/1948 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4292 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 87F | Llanelli | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4640 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4681 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 87C | Danygraig | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4684 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5216 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5250 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | m/e | 30/06/1948 | PILL | Newport Pill | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5606 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5612 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5629 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 81E | Didcot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5639 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 87F | Llanelli | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5656 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | m/e | 31/05/1948 | LDR | Landore | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5713 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5731 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | LLY | Llanelli | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 87D | Swansea East Dock |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5734 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 86B | Newport Pill | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5773 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6616 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 87G | Carmarthen | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6629 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6632 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6686 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6688 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | m/e | 30/04/1948 | LLY | Llanelli | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6715 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6717 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6718 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6719 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 87C | Danygraig | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6720 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6749 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7733 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 88E | Abercynon | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7744 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 88E | Abercynon | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9617 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9634 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9735 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | m/e | 03/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9736 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | m/e | 07/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9737 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | m/e | 12/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9766 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9785 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9799 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | m/e | 10/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | 1768 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | m/e | 12/1947 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | 1867 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | NEA | Neath (Court Sart) | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | m/e | 11/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5257 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 86B | Newport Pill | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5260 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | m/e | 30/06/1948 | PILL | Newport Pill | ||||
Steam | Unclassified | 0-6-2T | 184 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | m/e | 10/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | A1 | 0-6-2T | 69 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | m/e | 07/1955 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | A1 | 0-6-2T | 70 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | m/e | 07/1955 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6644 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | DYD | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | DG | Danygraig |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6623 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | DYD | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 87H | Neyland |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6650 | on | 15/06/1947 | NEA | Neath (Court Sart) | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | DYD | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4212 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore | m/e | 30/04/1948 | DYD | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5220 | on | 15/06/1947 | LLY | Llanelli | m/e | 30/04/1948 | DYD | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5697 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | m/e | 30/04/1948 | DYD | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2798 | on | 15/06/1947 | DG | Danygraig | m/e | 30/06/1948 | DYD | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | DG | Danygraig |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6644 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | DG | Danygraig | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | DYD | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2798 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | DG | Danygraig | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | DYD | m/e | 11/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4256 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | DYD | m/e | 01/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4265 | on | 15/06/1947 | SED | Swansea East Dock | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | DYD | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5646 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | DYD | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6691 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | DYD | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1602 | on | 18/10/1949 (New) | DYD | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 87H | Neyland | ||||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1622 | on | 27/06/1950 (New) | 87B | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1622 | on | 27/06/1950 | 87B | Duffryn Yard (New) | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 87B | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5761 | on | 15/06/1947 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 87B | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5761 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 87B | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1606 | on | 03/11/1949 | DG | Danygraig (New) | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 87B | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1606 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 87B | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 87H | Neyland |
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1964 | on | 15/06/1947 | WTD | Whitland | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 87B | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1996 | on | 15/06/1947 | WTD | Whitland | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 87B | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 2011 | on | 15/06/1947 | WTD | Whitland | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 87B | m/e | 08/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8464 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 87B | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8464 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 87B | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9431 | on | 30/11/1950 (New) | 87B | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2800 | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 87B | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8465 | on | 30/11/1950 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) (New) | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 87B | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2800 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 87B | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2813 | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 87B | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6776 | on | 27/11/1950 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) (New) | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 87B | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6777 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 87B | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8465 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 87B | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8466 | on | 30/11/1950 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) (New) | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 87B | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2813 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 87B | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6776 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 87B | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6777 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 87B | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8466 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 87B | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9437 | on | 31/01/1951 (New) | 87B | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9437 | on | 31/01/1951 | 87B | Duffryn Yard (New) | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 87B | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9444 | on | 30/04/1951 (New) | 87B | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 86F | Aberbeeg | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9447 | on | 31/05/1951 (New) | 87B | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9447 | on | 31/05/1951 | 87B | Duffryn Yard (New) | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 87B | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6715 | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 87B | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8410 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 87B | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8418 | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 87B | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8423 | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 84A | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 87B | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8454 | on | 31/12/1949 | LMTN | Leamington (New) | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 87B | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6715 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 87B | m/e | 05/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8410 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 87B | m/e | 01/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8418 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 87B | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 87D | Swansea East Dock |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8423 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 87B | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 87D | Swansea East Dock |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8454 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 87B | m/e | 01/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9454 | on | 30/09/1951 (New) | 87B | m/e | 01/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9455 | on | 30/09/1951 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) (New) | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 87B | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9456 | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 87B | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 88B | Radyr | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7244 | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 87B | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5254 | on | 15/06/1947 | NEA | Neath (Court Sart) | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 87B | 4w/e | 29/02/1952 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7244 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 87B | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9461 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 87B | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5254 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 29/02/1952 | 87B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4296 | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 86J | Aberdare | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 87B | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4684 | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 87B | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8490 | on | 31/07/1952 (New) | 87B | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7218 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 87B | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8490 | on | 31/07/1952 | 87B | Duffryn Yard (New) | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 87B | w/e | 06/09/1952 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7218 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 87B | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8490 | w/e | 06/09/1952 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 87B | on | 05/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9483 | on | 31/10/1952 (New) | 87B | m/e | 07/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2872 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 87B | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4101 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | TYS | Tyseley | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 87B | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4207 | on | 15/06/1947 | SED | Swansea East Dock | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 87B | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7240 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 87B | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4250 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 87B | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6909 | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 87B | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9487 | on | 30/11/1952 (New) | 87B | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7238 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXY | Oxley | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 87B | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2894 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 87B | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1643 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 87C | Danygraig | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 87B | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6761 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 87B | m/e | 01/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9457 | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 87C | Danygraig | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 87B | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 88B | Radyr |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5770 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | Aberdare | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 87B | m/e | 12/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5789 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 86F | Tondu | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 87B | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1645 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 87B | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5626 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 81E | Didcot | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 87B | 4w/e | 18/06/1955 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5787 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | Aberdare | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 87B | m/e | 10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4684 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 87B | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 88H | Tondu |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7249 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 87B | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7241 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 87B | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3613 | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | WLN | Wellington | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 87B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8405 | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 87B | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 21C | Bromsgrove |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8407 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 87B | on | 05/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6602 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 87B | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13264 | on | 20/08/1956 (New) | 87B | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13265 | on | 23/08/1956 (New) | 87B | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13266 | on | 24/08/1956 (New) | 87B | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13267 | on | 31/08/1956 (New) | 87B | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6620 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 87B | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4293 | on | 15/06/1947 | NEA | Neath (Court Sart) | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 87B | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3762 | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 84K | Chester West | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 87B | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9742 | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 84H | Wellington | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 87B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5738 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 87B | m/e | 09/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7758 | on | 15/06/1947 | TYS | Tyseley | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 87B | m/e | 06/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7248 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 87B | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 87D | Swansea East Dock |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4273 | on | 15/06/1947 | TDU | Tondu | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 87B | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 86D | Llantrisant |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4695 | on | 15/06/1947 | SHL | Southall | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 87B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5264 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 86J | Aberdare | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 87B | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6778 | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 87B | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5221 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | SED | Swansea East Dock | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 87B | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8416 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 87B | on | 05/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3432 | on | 22/04/1958 (New) | 87B | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3433 | on | 30/04/1958 (New) | 87B | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3434 | on | 08/05/1958 (New) | 87B | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3435 | on | 24/05/1958 (New) | 87B | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3436 | on | 24/05/1958 (New) | 87B | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5604 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 87B | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 87F | Llanelli |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3435 | on | 24/05/1958 | 87B | Duffryn Yard (New) | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 87B | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3436 | on | 24/05/1958 | 87B | Duffryn Yard (New) | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 87B | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6701 | on | 15/06/1947 | CED | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 87B | m/e | 06/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3437 | on | 16/06/1958 (New) | 87B | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3438 | on | 18/06/1958 (New) | 87B | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4278 | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 87B | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 88J | Aberdare |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6725 | on | 15/06/1947 | PILL | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 13/06/1959 | 87B | m/e | 10/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5728 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 87B | m/e | 05/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6766 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 87C | Danygraig | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 87B | m/e | 08/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4299 | on | 15/06/1947 | DG | Danygraig | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 87B | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8724 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 87C | Danygraig | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 87B | m/e | 07/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5670 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 87B | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7235 | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 87B | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4213 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 87G | Carmarthen | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 87B | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88H | Tondu |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5204 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 87B | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5232 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 87B | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5246 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 87B | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7200 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 87B | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6623 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 87H | Neyland | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 87B | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 87H | Neyland |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8772 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 87B | m/e | 08/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4288 | on | 15/06/1947 | NEA | Neath (Court Sart) | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 87B | on | 29/11/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3692 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 87B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4286 | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 87B | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5203 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 87B | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6623 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 87H | Neyland | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 87B | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 87H | Neyland |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9671 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 83B | Taunton | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 87B | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 88J | Aberdare |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3688 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 87B | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8482 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 82D | Westbury | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 87B | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3642 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 87B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4250 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 87B | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6602 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87B | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 87H | Neyland |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6680 | on | 15/06/1947 | NEA | Neath (Court Sart) | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87B | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 87D | Swansea East Dock |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7243 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 87B | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 88A | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9715 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 87B | m/e | 07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4290 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 87B | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9464 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 87B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3626 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 84H | Wellington | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 87B | m/e | 08/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7715 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 83E | St Blazey | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 87B | m/e | 05/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7229 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 87B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7216 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86J | Aberdare | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 87B | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7216 | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 87B | m/e | 10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9788 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 87B | m/e | 04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5257 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 87B | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4651 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 87B | m/e | 09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9669 | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 87B | m/e | 01/1966 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3610 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | Aberdare | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 87B | 4w/e | 22/02/1964 | 87D | Swansea East Dock |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8714 | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 87B | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 87D | Swansea East Dock |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3682 | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 87B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9633 | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 83C | Exeter | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 87B | m/e | 10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4970 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 87B | m/e | 07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4983 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 87B | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 87H | Neyland |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6920 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 87B | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9475 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 83G | Penzance | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 87B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6760 | m/e | 11/1948 | PILL | Newport Pill (New) | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 87B | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 87D | Swansea East Dock |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7790 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 87B | on | 05/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8746 | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 87B | on | 19/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9615 | 4w/e | 30/12/1961 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 87B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7222 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 87B | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 88J | Aberdare |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9656 | m/e | 30/04/1948 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 87B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7243 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 87B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4928 | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 87B | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7312 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 87B | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7318 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 87H | Neyland | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 87B | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7320 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 87H | Neyland | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 87B | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7252 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 88A | Radyr | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 87B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5241 | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 87B | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7204 | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 88J | Aberdare | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 87B | m/e | 02/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6987 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 87B | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 88A | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6914 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 87B | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 88A | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9760 | on | 15/06/1947 | FGD | Fishguard Goodwick | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 87B | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4657 | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 87B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3647 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 87B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3654 | on | 15/06/1947 | NEY | Neyland | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 87B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5202 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 87B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 88A | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5245 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 22/02/1964 | 87B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |