Depot: Annesley
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Annesley | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 165 | on | 18/03/1911 (New) | ANN | on | 05/01/1924 | ARD | Ardsley | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 170 | on | 10/06/1911 (New) | ANN | on | 05/01/1924 | ARD | Ardsley | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 448 | on | 12/08/1911 (New) | ANN | on | 05/01/1924 | ARD | Ardsley | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1212 | on | 14/09/1912 | ANN | on | 10/09/1941 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1213 | on | 16/09/1912 | ANN | on | 30/09/1944 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1214 | on | 23/09/1912 | ANN | on | 13/10/1940 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1215 | on | 23/09/1912 | ANN | on | 04/06/1929 | IMM | Immingham | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1216 | on | 25/09/1912 | ANN | on | 20/09/1919 | MEX | Mexborough | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1217 | on | 29/09/1912 | ANN | on | 19/09/1941 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1218 | on | 29/09/1912 | ANN | on | 16/02/1934 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1223 | m/e | 10/1912 (New) | ANN | on | 06/06/1929 | IMM | Immingham | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1224 | m/e | 10/1912 (New) | ANN | on | 20/09/1919 | MEX | Mexborough | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 449 | on | 19/10/1912 (New) | ANN | on | 22/04/1924 | NEA | Neasden | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1220 | m/e | 11/1912 | ANN | on | 24/11/1940 | ANN | Annesley | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1221 | m/e | 11/1912 | ANN | on | 19/02/1948 | GOR | Gorton | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1225 | m/e | 11/1912 (New) | ANN | on | 21/03/1935 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1226 | m/e | 11/1912 (New) | ANN | on | 12/02/1939 | FRO | Frodingham | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1227 | m/e | 11/1912 (New) | ANN | on | 09/03/1929 | MAR | March | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 450 | on | 02/11/1912 (New) | ANN | on | 05/01/1924 | ARD | Ardsley | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1228 | on | 03/11/1912 | ANN | m/e | 31/03/1948 | SDN | Swindon | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1219 | on | 13/11/1912 | ANN | on | 20/10/1950 | 39A | Gorton | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 128 | on | 21/12/1912 (New) | ANN | on | 07/07/1924 | NEA | Neasden | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 129 | on | 28/12/1912 (New) | ANN | on | 25/03/1924 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1238 | on | 17/03/1915 | ANN | on | 19/09/1941 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 351 | on | 18/03/1915 | ANN | on | 29/06/1947 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 375 | on | 24/07/1915 | ANN | on | 11/10/1941 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 387 | on | 07/09/1917 | ANN | on | 05/04/1924 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 380 | on | 23/11/1917 | ANN | on | 05/04/1924 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 389 | on | 07/09/1918 | ANN | on | 29/06/1947 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 271 | on | 02/11/1918 | ANN | on | 02/02/1923 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 273 | m/e | 12/1914 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 08/11/1919 | ANN | on | 10/03/1923 | IMM | Immingham |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 274 | m/e | 02/1915 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 08/11/1919 | ANN | on | 10/03/1923 | IMM | Immingham |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 337 | m/e | 05/1915 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 08/11/1919 | ANN | on | 10/03/1923 | IMM | Immingham |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 345 | m/e | 01/1917 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 07/01/1920 | ANN | on | 23/02/1929 | MEX | Mexborough |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 343 | m/e | 06/1916 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 12/03/1920 | ANN | on | 09/02/1929 | MEX | Mexborough |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 370 | y/e | 1917 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 09/04/1920 | ANN | on | 02/11/1927 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 408 | on | 28/07/1921 | ANN | on | 07/01/1945 | GOR | Gorton | ||||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | 4 | on | 03/02/1922 | ANN | on | 01/08/1925 | MAR | March | ||||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | 446 | on | 03/02/1922 | ANN | on | 03/11/1923 | MAR | March | ||||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | 279 | on | 03/02/1922 | ANN | on | 19/07/1924 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | 440 | on | 17/02/1922 | ANN | on | 19/07/1924 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | 441 | on | 06/10/1922 | ANN | on | 03/11/1923 | MAR | March | ||||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 366 | m/e | 02/1917 | LNG | Langwith Junction (New) | on | 02/02/1923 | ANN | on | 23/02/1929 | MEX | Mexborough |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 340 | m/e | 12/1915 | LNG | Langwith Junction (New) | on | 10/03/1923 | ANN | on | 18/02/1929 | MEX | Mexborough |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6239 | m/e | 12/1912 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 16/02/1924 | ANN | on | 28/09/1939 | FRO | Frodingham |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 1179 | m/e | 11/1910 | LNG | Langwith Junction (New) | on | 10/03/1924 | ANN | on | 15/04/1936 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 381 | on | 08/08/1916 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | on | 11/03/1924 | ANN | on | 05/04/1924 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 382 | on | 02/03/1916 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | on | 13/03/1924 | ANN | on | 05/04/1924 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 383 | on | 13/11/1920 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | on | 27/03/1924 | ANN | on | 31/03/1924 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 385 | on | 14/03/1914 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | on | 29/03/1924 | ANN | on | 05/04/1924 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1282 | on | 01/02/1924 | GOR | Gorton | on | 31/03/1924 | ANN | on | 24/03/1932 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6267 | on | 21/02/1924 | GOR | Gorton | on | 01/04/1924 | ANN | on | 06/10/1931 | MAR | March |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6323 | on | 05/03/1924 | GOR | Gorton | on | 04/04/1924 | ANN | on | 28/09/1939 | FRO | Frodingham |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6264 | on | 16/02/1924 | GOR | Gorton | on | 04/04/1924 | ANN | on | 30/01/1925 | NWE | New England |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6320 | on | 22/02/1924 | GOR | Gorton | on | 21/04/1924 | ANN | on | 05/09/1943 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6262 | on | 05/02/1924 | GOR | Gorton | on | 21/04/1924 | ANN | on | 15/05/1930 | HLS | Hull Springhead |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6307 | on | 21/02/1924 | GOR | Gorton | on | 21/04/1924 | ANN | on | 05/09/1943 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6368 | on | 10/04/1924 | GOR | Gorton | on | 10/05/1924 | ANN | on | 15/02/1934 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6353 | on | 01/05/1924 | GOR | Gorton | on | 15/05/1924 | ANN | on | 20/11/1938 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6309 | on | 28/12/1923 | GOR | Gorton | on | 15/05/1924 | ANN | on | 25/11/1940 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | 441 | on | 03/11/1923 | MAR | March | on | 25/06/1924 | ANN | on | 09/06/1925 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 37 | on | 26/01/1923 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 19/07/1924 | ANN | on | 22/11/1924 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5463 | on | 12/01/1923 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 19/07/1924 | ANN | on | 15/11/1924 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 32 | on | 29/09/1922 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | on | 19/07/1924 | ANN | on | 15/11/1924 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 33 | on | 05/08/1922 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | on | 19/07/1924 | ANN | on | 08/06/1925 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | 279 | on | 19/07/1924 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | on | 06/10/1924 | ANN | on | 08/06/1925 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | 440 | on | 19/07/1924 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | on | 14/11/1924 | ANN | on | 25/07/1925 | MAR | March |
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | 5443 | on | 13/10/1924 | GOR | Gorton | on | 24/01/1925 | ANN | on | 27/03/1926 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4664 | m/e | 07/1918 | NWE | New England (New) | on | 28/05/1925 | ANN | on | 01/01/1927 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4665 | m/e | 07/1918 | NWE | New England (New) | on | 28/05/1925 | ANN | on | 07/01/1927 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5036 | on | 24/05/1924 | GOR | Gorton | on | 10/06/1925 | ANN | on | 04/03/1926 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5035 | on | 01/09/1922 | GOR | Gorton | on | 10/06/1925 | ANN | on | 17/04/1926 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6266 | on | 10/07/1925 | DON | Doncaster | on | 18/08/1925 | ANN | on | 23/05/1938 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 752 | on | 07/01/1925 | TWD | Tweedmouth | on | 07/02/1926 | ANN | on | 20/09/1926 | TWD | Tweedmouth |
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | 5446 | on | 29/03/1926 | CLK | Colwick | on | 06/06/1926 | ANN | on | 05/05/1947 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | 5004 | on | 09/06/1926 | CLK | Colwick | on | 08/11/1926 | ANN | on | 16/01/1928 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | 5279 | on | 31/03/1926 | CLK | Colwick | on | 08/11/1926 | ANN | on | 06/03/1928 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | 5280 | on | 10/06/1926 | CLK | Colwick | on | 31/03/1927 | ANN | on | 02/04/1928 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 5381 | on | 05/04/1924 | CLK | Colwick | on | 06/09/1927 | ANN | on | 11/08/1944 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | 5444 | on | 16/06/1927 | CLK | Colwick | on | 12/10/1927 | ANN | on | 02/04/1928 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 5380 | on | 05/04/1924 | CLK | Colwick | on | 14/10/1927 | ANN | on | 29/06/1947 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 5394 | on | 26/10/1927 | CLK | Colwick | on | 03/11/1927 | ANN | on | 01/04/1945 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5370 | on | 02/11/1927 | GOR | Gorton | on | 14/04/1928 | ANN | on | 23/02/1929 | MEX | Mexborough |
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | 5442 | on | 09/07/1926 | CLK | Colwick | on | 15/10/1928 | ANN | on | 27/04/1947 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2709 | on | 28/09/1928 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 31/10/1928 | ANN | on | 24/06/1929 | LIN | Lincoln |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2710 | on | 28/09/1928 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 10/11/1928 | ANN | on | 24/06/1929 | LIN | Lincoln |
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | 5280 | on | 13/07/1928 | MAR | March | on | 17/11/1928 | ANN | on | 25/03/1947 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6274 | on | 13/08/1926 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 18/02/1929 | ANN | on | 08/10/1950 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6349 | on | 10/08/1926 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 21/02/1929 | ANN | on | 29/06/1947 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6560 | on | 10/04/1928 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 23/02/1929 | ANN | on | 13/09/1941 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6620 | on | 25/11/1927 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 23/02/1929 | ANN | on | 16/06/1949 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 5963 | on | 24/01/1929 | MAR | March | on | 09/03/1929 | ANN | on | 22/05/1931 | ARD | Ardsley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6299 | on | 24/03/1924 | DON | Doncaster | on | 14/03/1929 | ANN | on | 11/08/1944 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2710 | on | 14/08/1929 | ARD | Ardsley | on | 19/08/1929 | ANN | on | 23/08/1929 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2709 | on | 07/08/1929 | ARD | Ardsley | on | 20/08/1929 | ANN | on | 20/06/1930 | LIN | Lincoln |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2779 | on | 25/10/1929 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 31/10/1929 | ANN | on | 04/11/1933 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2780 | on | 08/11/1929 | CLK | Colwick | on | 15/11/1929 | ANN | on | 20/06/1930 | LIN | Lincoln |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2781 | on | 15/11/1929 | CLK | Colwick | on | 19/11/1929 | ANN | on | 09/08/1943 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6339 | on | 05/06/1930 | CLK | Colwick | on | 25/06/1930 | ANN | on | 14/09/1941 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2780 | on | 04/08/1930 | ARD | Ardsley | on | 19/08/1930 | ANN | on | 09/08/1943 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2709 | on | 05/08/1930 | ARD | Ardsley | on | 21/08/1930 | ANN | on | 30/03/1947 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2704 | on | 20/09/1930 | CLK | Colwick | on | 03/10/1930 | ANN | on | 13/03/1932 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 5064 | m/e | 1928 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 05/01/1931 | ANN | m/e | 12/1935 | ARD | Ardsley |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 5067 | on | 02/01/1931 | CLK | Colwick | on | 09/01/1931 | ANN | on | 14/04/1936 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6356 | on | 23/04/1931 | CLK | Colwick | on | 15/05/1931 | ANN | on | 23/05/1938 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5471 | on | 13/07/1924 | GOR | Gorton | on | 10/02/1932 | ANN | on | 01/01/1935 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2975 | on | 10/03/1932 (New) | ANN | on | 04/04/1932 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2704 | on | 13/03/1932 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | on | 04/04/1932 | ANN | on | 30/03/1947 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | 5440 | on | 12/10/1927 | CLK | Colwick | on | 04/01/1933 | ANN | on | 27/04/1947 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6495 | on | 08/01/1926 | NWE | New England | on | 25/01/1933 | ANN | on | 07/05/1944 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6496 | on | 25/09/1925 | NWE | New England | on | 26/01/1933 | ANN | on | 07/05/1944 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5472 | on | 26/12/1924 | GOR | Gorton | on | 21/07/1933 | ANN | on | 30/10/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | 5279 | on | 06/03/1928 | CLK | Colwick | on | 09/10/1933 | ANN | on | 27/04/1947 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2694 | on | 04/11/1933 | CLK | Colwick | on | 02/12/1933 | ANN | on | 30/03/1947 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2779 | on | 04/11/1933 | CLK | Colwick | on | 02/12/1933 | ANN | on | 30/03/1947 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5032 | on | 29/06/1929 | GOR | Gorton | on | 03/02/1934 | ANN | on | 30/10/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6354 | on | 16/12/1933 | CLK | Colwick | on | 10/02/1934 | ANN | on | 20/11/1938 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6202 | on | 16/12/1933 | CLK | Colwick | on | 15/02/1934 | ANN | on | 19/09/1941 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1289 | on | 10/08/1931 | ARD | Ardsley | on | 15/11/1934 | ANN | on | 09/08/1943 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6532 | on | 12/01/1934 | CLK | Colwick | on | 22/02/1935 | ANN | on | 02/07/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1287 | on | 22/07/1927 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | on | 14/03/1935 | ANN | on | 09/08/1943 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5469 | on | 26/09/1934 | GOR | Gorton | on | 31/10/1935 | ANN | on | 30/10/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 5287 | m/e | 11/1935 | ANN | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 36B | Mexborough | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6321 | on | 19/10/1935 | MAR | March | m/e | 12/1935 | ANN | on | 21/12/1935 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6321 | m/e | 12/1935 | ANN | Annesley | on | 21/12/1935 | ANN | on | 25/11/1940 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6599 | on | 19/01/1934 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | on | 22/02/1937 | ANN | on | 19/09/1941 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6575 | on | 19/04/1927 | GOR | Gorton | on | 06/10/1937 | ANN | on | 13/10/1940 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6273 | on | 20/05/1929 | GOR | Gorton | on | 06/10/1937 | ANN | on | 11/10/1941 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5470 | on | 04/03/1937 | CLK | Colwick | on | 05/01/1938 | ANN | on | 06/11/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6242 | on | 12/06/1932 | FRO | Frodingham | on | 22/01/1939 | ANN | on | 30/05/1939 | ARD | Ardsley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6220 | m/e | 11/1912 | ANN | Annesley | on | 24/11/1940 | ANN | on | 03/02/1943 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6321 | on | 21/12/1935 | ANN | Annesley | on | 25/11/1940 | ANN | on | 31/01/1943 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2975 | on | 04/04/1932 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | on | 02/03/1941 | ANN | on | 09/08/1943 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 3089 | on | 09/10/1941 | CLK | Colwick | on | 13/10/1941 | ANN | on | 08/08/1943 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 3090 | on | 09/10/1941 | CLK | Colwick | on | 13/10/1941 | ANN | on | 30/03/1947 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5037 | on | 20/09/1940 | GOR | Gorton | on | 03/05/1943 | ANN | on | 30/10/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5462 | on | 11/04/1943 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | on | 03/05/1943 | ANN | on | 24/10/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5471 | on | 11/04/1943 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | on | 03/05/1943 | ANN | on | 13/11/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5031 | on | 20/09/1940 | LIV | Brunswick | on | 03/05/1943 | ANN | on | 30/10/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5033 | on | 11/04/1943 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | on | 03/05/1943 | ANN | on | 30/10/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5480 | on | 11/04/1943 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | on | 03/05/1943 | ANN | on | 24/10/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5481 | on | 11/04/1943 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | on | 03/05/1943 | ANN | on | 30/10/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5483 | on | 11/02/1941 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 03/05/1943 | ANN | on | 24/10/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5479 | on | 07/11/1942 | GOR | Gorton | on | 07/05/1943 | ANN | on | 07/10/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5476 | on | 29/06/1938 | GOR | Gorton | on | 19/05/1943 | ANN | on | 30/10/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5458 | on | 02/11/1942 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 24/05/1943 | ANN | on | 21/06/1943 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5467 | on | 03/05/1943 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 24/05/1943 | ANN | on | 21/06/1943 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5034 | on | 03/05/1943 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 24/05/1943 | ANN | on | 21/06/1943 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5035 | on | 03/05/1943 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 24/05/1943 | ANN | on | 21/06/1943 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5477 | on | 03/05/1943 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 24/05/1943 | ANN | on | 21/06/1943 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5478 | on | 03/05/1943 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 24/05/1943 | ANN | on | 21/06/1943 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | 5444 | on | 02/04/1928 | CLK | Colwick | on | 15/06/1943 | ANN | on | 27/04/1947 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5458 | on | 21/06/1943 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 05/07/1943 | ANN | on | 30/10/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5467 | on | 21/06/1943 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 05/07/1943 | ANN | on | 30/10/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5034 | on | 21/06/1943 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 05/07/1943 | ANN | on | 24/10/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5035 | on | 21/06/1943 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 05/07/1943 | ANN | on | 30/10/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5477 | on | 21/06/1943 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 05/07/1943 | ANN | on | 24/10/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5478 | on | 21/06/1943 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 05/07/1943 | ANN | on | 30/10/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | 5441 | on | 27/03/1926 | CLK | Colwick | on | 09/08/1943 | ANN | on | 06/05/1947 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | 5443 | on | 27/03/1926 | CLK | Colwick | on | 09/08/1943 | ANN | on | 27/04/1947 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | 5439 | on | 29/03/1926 | CLK | Colwick | on | 10/08/1943 | ANN | on | 27/04/1947 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | 5445 | on | 14/11/1928 | CLK | Colwick | on | 15/08/1943 | ANN | on | 27/04/1947 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5460 | on | 08/10/1935 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 05/09/1943 | ANN | on | 30/10/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5464 | on | 12/01/1923 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 05/09/1943 | ANN | on | 30/10/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6288 | on | 29/07/1943 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | on | 01/10/1943 | ANN | on | 03/12/1944 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 5393 | on | 10/02/1943 | THJ | Thornton Junction | on | 02/10/1943 | ANN | on | 08/10/1950 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1495 | on | 11/04/1936 | GOR | Gorton | on | 30/10/1943 | ANN | on | 30/03/1947 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1497 | on | 16/11/1941 | GOR | Gorton | on | 30/10/1943 | ANN | on | 30/03/1947 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1498 | on | 29/08/1939 | GOR | Gorton | on | 30/10/1943 | ANN | on | 30/03/1947 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1289 | on | 03/10/1943 | GOR | Gorton | on | 30/10/1943 | ANN | on | 30/03/1947 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2697 | on | 25/03/1941 | GOR | Gorton | on | 30/10/1943 | ANN | on | 30/03/1947 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1927 | on | 09/06/1943 | GOR | Gorton | on | 30/10/1943 | ANN | on | 30/03/1947 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6209 | on | 06/08/1942 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 07/05/1944 | ANN | on | 29/06/1947 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6258 | on | 23/07/1942 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 07/05/1944 | ANN | on | 26/11/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6292 | on | 04/12/1940 | GOR | Gorton | on | 03/12/1944 | ANN | on | 29/06/1947 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6300 | on | 01/12/1940 | GOR | Gorton | on | 07/01/1945 | ANN | on | 19/09/1948 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6562 | on | 10/03/1943 | GOR | Gorton | on | 01/04/1945 | ANN | on | 29/06/1947 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6347 | on | 07/09/1944 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 06/01/1946 | ANN | on | 29/06/1947 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6299 | on | 11/08/1944 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 06/01/1946 | ANN | on | 08/01/1948 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3762 | on | 28/01/1945 | CLK | Colwick | on | 30/03/1947 | ANN | on | 28/03/1948 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3613 | on | 28/01/1945 | CLK | Colwick | on | 30/03/1947 | ANN | on | 29/06/1947 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3756 | on | 11/09/1944 | CLK | Colwick | on | 30/03/1947 | ANN | on | 04/07/1948 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3636 | on | 27/10/1946 | CLK | Colwick | on | 30/03/1947 | ANN | on | 29/06/1947 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3876 | on | 27/10/1946 | CLK | Colwick | on | 30/03/1947 | ANN | on | 20/11/1949 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 3069 | on | 29/06/1947 | ANN | on | 15/11/1947 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | B18 | 4-6-0 | 1479 | on | 26/06/1947 | CLK | Colwick | on | 21/09/1947 | ANN | on | 31/12/1947 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B18 | 4-6-0 | 1480 | on | 26/06/1947 | CLK | Colwick | on | 21/09/1947 | ANN | on | 31/12/1947 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3580 | on | 19/09/1944 | CLK | Colwick | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | on | 06/02/1949 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3582 | on | 19/09/1944 | CLK | Colwick | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | on | 22/01/1950 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3635 | on | 29/06/1947 | CLK | Colwick | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | on | 26/11/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3700 | on | 30/09/1944 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | on | 08/02/1948 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3722 | on | 27/10/1946 | CLK | Colwick | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | on | 26/11/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3723 | on | 18/08/1946 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | on | 08/10/1950 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3743 | on | 27/10/1946 | CLK | Colwick | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | on | 20/10/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3761 | on | 29/06/1947 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | on | 22/01/1950 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3809 | on | 28/01/1945 | CLK | Colwick | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | on | 20/02/1948 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3571 | on | 19/09/1944 | CLK | Colwick | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | on | 03/03/1957 | 31B | March |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3589 | on | 24/12/1944 | CLK | Colwick | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | on | 20/02/1948 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3596 | on | 27/10/1946 | CLK | Colwick | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | on | 17/02/1957 | 31B | March |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3614 | on | 29/06/1947 | CLK | Colwick | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | on | 26/11/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3735 | on | 29/06/1947 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | on | 11/09/1949 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3742 | on | 12/09/1944 | CLK | Colwick | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | on | 20/10/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3674 | on | 18/08/1946 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | on | 15/05/1949 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3681 | on | 29/06/1947 | CLK | Colwick | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | on | 26/11/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3631 | on | 22/04/1945 | CLK | Colwick | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | on | 01/02/1948 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3633 | on | 07/05/1944 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | on | 02/04/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3638 | on | 17/01/1945 | CLK | Colwick | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | on | 08/02/1948 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3662 | on | 27/10/1946 | CLK | Colwick | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | on | 08/02/1948 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3694 | on | 29/06/1947 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | on | 28/03/1948 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3699 | on | 27/10/1946 | CLK | Colwick | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | on | 08/10/1950 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3706 | on | 18/08/1946 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | on | 20/02/1948 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3759 | on | 24/03/1932 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | on | 23/02/1949 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3794 | on | 27/10/1946 | CLK | Colwick | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | on | 16/07/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3801 | on | 27/10/1946 | CLK | Colwick | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | on | 08/02/1948 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3804 | on | 20/09/1944 | CLK | Colwick | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | on | 05/02/1950 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3716 | on | 17/01/1945 | CLK | Colwick | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | on | 26/11/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3829 | on | 18/08/1946 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | on | 01/02/1948 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3841 | on | 22/04/1945 | CLK | Colwick | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | on | 26/11/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3720 | on | 12/03/1944 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | on | 08/02/1948 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3853 | on | 29/06/1947 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | on | 26/11/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3873 | on | 03/04/1944 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | on | 26/11/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3893 | on | 27/10/1946 | CLK | Colwick | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | on | 08/10/1950 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3899 | on | 07/05/1944 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | on | 01/02/1948 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3912 | on | 30/09/1944 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | on | 26/11/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3739 | on | 28/01/1945 | CLK | Colwick | on | 26/10/1947 | ANN | on | 20/10/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3685 | on | 19/09/1944 | CLK | Colwick | on | 26/10/1947 | ANN | on | 09/05/1948 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | F2 | 2-4-2T | 7105 | m/e | 01/1936 | LIV | Brunswick | on | 01/01/1948 | ANN | on | 27/08/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | F2 | 2-4-2T | 7107 | on | 01/01/1948 | ANN | m/e | 02/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 8927 | m/e | 12/1922 | ARD | Ardsley (New) | on | 01/01/1948 | ANN | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 34B | Hornsey |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 8929 | m/e | 12/1922 | ARD | Ardsley (New) | on | 01/01/1948 | ANN | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 34B | Hornsey |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 8935 | on | 01/01/1948 | ANN | w/e | 28/01/1950 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 8972 | on | 01/01/1948 | ANN | w/e | 06/03/1948 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 8975 | on | 01/01/1948 | ANN | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 34B | Hornsey | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 8976 | on | 01/01/1948 | ANN | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 34B | Hornsey | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1895 | on | 01/01/1948 | ANN | w/e | 27/03/1948 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1974 | on | 01/01/1948 | ANN | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 38A | Colwick | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1975 | on | 01/01/1948 | ANN | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 38A | Colwick | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1976 | on | 01/01/1948 | ANN | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1977 | on | 01/01/1948 | ANN | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 38A | Colwick | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1979 | on | 01/01/1948 | ANN | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 35A | New England | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1980 | on | 01/01/1948 | ANN | w/e | 16/05/1959 | 56B | Ardsley | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 1732 | on | 18/08/1946 | CLK | Colwick | on | 04/01/1948 | ANN | w/e | 10/01/1948 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 1732 | on | 04/01/1948 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 10/01/1948 | ANN | on | 22/02/1948 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 3068 | on | 20/10/1946 | CLK | Colwick | on | 01/02/1948 | ANN | on | 23/05/1948 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63021 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | ANN | w/e | 17/04/1948 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63036 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | ANN | w/e | 29/05/1948 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63069 | on | 15/11/1947 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 14/02/1948 | ANN | w/e | 29/05/1948 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 3073 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | ANN | w/e | 26/06/1948 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63027 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | ANN | w/e | 17/04/1948 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63025 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | ANN | w/e | 29/05/1948 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63157 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | ANN | w/e | 29/05/1948 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63184 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | ANN | w/e | 29/05/1948 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 3687 | on | 20/10/1946 | GOR | Gorton | on | 19/02/1948 | ANN | w/e | 21/02/1948 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 3970 | on | 20/10/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 20/02/1948 | ANN | w/e | 21/02/1948 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 3987 | on | 27/10/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 20/02/1948 | ANN | w/e | 21/02/1948 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 3752 | on | 20/10/1946 | GOR | Gorton | on | 20/02/1948 | ANN | w/e | 21/02/1948 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 3970 | on | 20/02/1948 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 21/02/1948 | ANN | on | 07/03/1948 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 3987 | on | 20/02/1948 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 21/02/1948 | ANN | on | 07/03/1948 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 3752 | on | 20/02/1948 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 21/02/1948 | ANN | on | 07/03/1948 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 3687 | on | 19/02/1948 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 21/02/1948 | ANN | on | 07/03/1948 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 1650 | on | 01/01/1948 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 28/02/1948 | ANN | w/e | 30/10/1948 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 1669 | on | 01/01/1948 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 28/02/1948 | ANN | w/e | 25/06/1949 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3805 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | GOR | Gorton | on | 07/03/1948 | ANN | w/e | 13/03/1948 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3809 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | GOR | Gorton | on | 07/03/1948 | ANN | w/e | 13/03/1948 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3706 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 07/03/1948 | ANN | w/e | 13/03/1948 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3805 | on | 07/03/1948 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 13/03/1948 | ANN | on | 05/12/1948 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3809 | on | 07/03/1948 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 13/03/1948 | ANN | on | 31/01/1949 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3589 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | LNG | Langwith Junction | w/e | 13/03/1948 | ANN | on | 30/04/1949 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3706 | on | 07/03/1948 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 13/03/1948 | ANN | on | 26/11/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1209 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | CLK | Colwick | on | 21/03/1948 | ANN | w/e | 27/03/1948 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1209 | on | 21/03/1948 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 27/03/1948 | ANN | on | 14/10/1956 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3750 | on | 27/10/1946 | CLK | Colwick | on | 28/03/1948 | ANN | w/e | 03/04/1948 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3895 | on | 27/10/1946 | CLK | Colwick | on | 28/03/1948 | ANN | w/e | 03/04/1948 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3750 | on | 28/03/1948 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 03/04/1948 | ANN | on | 16/01/1949 | MEX | Mexborough |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3895 | on | 28/03/1948 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 03/04/1948 | ANN | on | 16/07/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3599 | on | 18/09/1944 | CLK | Colwick | on | 11/04/1948 | ANN | w/e | 17/04/1948 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3713 | on | 27/10/1946 | CLK | Colwick | on | 11/04/1948 | ANN | w/e | 17/04/1948 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3599 | on | 11/04/1948 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 17/04/1948 | ANN | on | 08/01/1950 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3713 | on | 11/04/1948 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 17/04/1948 | ANN | on | 30/01/1949 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3573 | on | 22/12/1944 | CLK | Colwick | on | 18/04/1948 | ANN | w/e | 24/04/1948 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3781 | on | 21/10/1945 | CLK | Colwick | on | 18/04/1948 | ANN | w/e | 24/04/1948 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3573 | on | 18/04/1948 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 24/04/1948 | ANN | on | 26/12/1948 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3781 | on | 18/04/1948 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 24/04/1948 | ANN | on | 15/05/1949 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63686 | on | 14/03/1946 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | on | 09/05/1948 | ANN | w/e | 15/05/1948 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63686 | on | 09/05/1948 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 15/05/1948 | ANN | on | 02/07/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3827 | on | 17/01/1945 | CLK | Colwick | on | 23/05/1948 | ANN | w/e | 29/05/1948 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3721 | on | 01/12/1946 | CLK | Colwick | on | 23/05/1948 | ANN | w/e | 29/05/1948 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3641 | on | 24/12/1944 | CLK | Colwick | on | 23/05/1948 | ANN | w/e | 29/05/1948 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3848 | on | 16/06/1946 | CLK | Colwick | on | 23/05/1948 | ANN | w/e | 29/05/1948 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3639 | on | 28/01/1945 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 29/05/1948 | ANN | on | 30/05/1948 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3827 | on | 23/05/1948 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 29/05/1948 | ANN | on | 17/09/1950 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3721 | on | 23/05/1948 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 29/05/1948 | ANN | on | 19/09/1948 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3641 | on | 23/05/1948 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 29/05/1948 | ANN | on | 16/07/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3848 | on | 23/05/1948 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 29/05/1948 | ANN | on | 23/04/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3639 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | ANN | Annesley | on | 30/05/1948 | ANN | on | 28/09/1952 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3797 | on | 27/10/1946 | CLK | Colwick | on | 06/06/1948 | ANN | w/e | 12/06/1948 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63662 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | CLK | Colwick | on | 06/06/1948 | ANN | w/e | 12/06/1948 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3798 | on | 27/10/1946 | CLK | Colwick | on | 06/06/1948 | ANN | w/e | 12/06/1948 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3899 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | CLK | Colwick | on | 06/06/1948 | ANN | w/e | 12/06/1948 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3797 | on | 06/06/1948 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 12/06/1948 | ANN | on | 16/01/1949 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63662 | on | 06/06/1948 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 12/06/1948 | ANN | on | 26/11/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3798 | on | 06/06/1948 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 12/06/1948 | ANN | on | 28/09/1952 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3899 | on | 06/06/1948 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 12/06/1948 | ANN | on | 05/02/1950 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | F2 | 2-4-2T | 7106 | on | 01/01/1948 | KX | Kings Cross | w/e | 19/06/1948 | ANN | on | 31/12/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4361 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | ANN | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9286 | on | 01/01/1948 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 19/06/1948 | ANN | m/e | 30/11/1949 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63695 | on | 27/10/1946 | CLK | Colwick | on | 04/07/1948 | ANN | w/e | 10/07/1948 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63695 | on | 04/07/1948 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 10/07/1948 | ANN | on | 02/07/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1943 | on | 01/01/1948 | WFD | Woodford Halse | w/e | 18/09/1948 | ANN | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 31B | March |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63762 | w/e | 03/04/1948 | CLK | Colwick | on | 19/09/1948 | ANN | w/e | 25/09/1948 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63829 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | CLK | Colwick | on | 19/09/1948 | ANN | w/e | 25/09/1948 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63762 | on | 19/09/1948 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 25/09/1948 | ANN | on | 10/07/1949 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63829 | on | 19/09/1948 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 25/09/1948 | ANN | on | 18/12/1949 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77085 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 30/10/1948 | ANN | w/e | 29/01/1949 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77181 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | ANN | w/e | 04/12/1948 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77372 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 30/10/1948 | ANN | w/e | 29/01/1949 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 78643 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 30/10/1948 | ANN | w/e | 21/05/1949 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 1664 | on | 01/01/1948 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 30/10/1948 | ANN | w/e | 25/06/1949 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63638 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | CLK | Colwick | on | 14/11/1948 | ANN | w/e | 20/11/1948 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63801 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | CLK | Colwick | on | 14/11/1948 | ANN | w/e | 20/11/1948 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63638 | on | 14/11/1948 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 20/11/1948 | ANN | on | 18/12/1949 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63801 | on | 14/11/1948 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 20/11/1948 | ANN | on | 11/09/1949 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63894 | w/e | 25/09/1948 | CLK | Colwick | on | 28/11/1948 | ANN | w/e | 04/12/1948 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63894 | on | 28/11/1948 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 04/12/1948 | ANN | on | 18/12/1949 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63746 | on | 09/11/1947 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | on | 05/12/1948 | ANN | w/e | 11/12/1948 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63746 | on | 05/12/1948 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 11/12/1948 | ANN | on | 03/03/1957 | 31B | March |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63851 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | CLK | Colwick | on | 26/12/1948 | ANN | w/e | 01/01/1949 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63851 | on | 26/12/1948 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 01/01/1949 | ANN | on | 08/01/1950 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 3594 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 16/01/1949 | ANN | w/e | 22/01/1949 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63579 | on | 11/04/1943 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | on | 16/01/1949 | ANN | w/e | 22/01/1949 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 3594 | on | 16/01/1949 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 22/01/1949 | ANN | on | 03/11/1957 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63579 | on | 16/01/1949 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 22/01/1949 | ANN | on | 24/02/1957 | 31B | March |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63700 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | CLK | Colwick | on | 23/01/1949 | ANN | w/e | 29/01/1949 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 3610 | on | 20/08/1944 | THJ | Thornton Junction | on | 23/01/1949 | ANN | w/e | 29/01/1949 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 3806 | on | 30/08/1944 | THJ | Thornton Junction | on | 23/01/1949 | ANN | w/e | 29/01/1949 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63700 | on | 23/01/1949 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 29/01/1949 | ANN | on | 26/11/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 3610 | on | 23/01/1949 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 29/01/1949 | ANN | w/e | 24/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 3806 | on | 23/01/1949 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 29/01/1949 | ANN | w/e | 24/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63694 | w/e | 03/04/1948 | CLK | Colwick | on | 30/01/1949 | ANN | w/e | 05/02/1949 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63867 | on | 28/09/1944 | MAR | March | on | 31/01/1949 | ANN | w/e | 05/02/1949 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63694 | on | 30/01/1949 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 05/02/1949 | ANN | on | 05/02/1950 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63867 | on | 31/01/1949 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 05/02/1949 | ANN | w/e | 17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63858 | on | 27/10/1946 | CLK | Colwick | on | 06/02/1949 | ANN | w/e | 12/02/1949 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63043 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | ANN | w/e | 14/05/1949 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63116 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | ANN | w/e | 21/05/1949 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63127 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | ANN | w/e | 14/05/1949 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | F2 | 2-4-2T | 67104 | on | 01/01/1948 | ARD | Ardsley | w/e | 12/02/1949 | ANN | m/e | 05/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63858 | on | 06/02/1949 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 12/02/1949 | ANN | on | 26/11/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 3792 | on | 04/10/1944 | MAR | March | on | 13/02/1949 | ANN | w/e | 27/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 67363 | on | 01/01/1948 | NWE | New England | w/e | 26/02/1949 | ANN | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 30A | Stratford |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63589 | w/e | 13/03/1948 | ANN | Annesley | on | 30/04/1949 | ANN | on | 03/11/1957 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61063 | on | 27/04/1947 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 19/06/1949 | ANN | w/e | 25/06/1949 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1066 | on | 27/04/1947 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 19/06/1949 | ANN | on | 07/10/1956 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63838 | on | 29/08/1943 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | on | 19/06/1949 | ANN | w/e | 25/06/1949 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61063 | on | 19/06/1949 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 25/06/1949 | ANN | on | 21/10/1956 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63838 | on | 19/06/1949 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 25/06/1949 | ANN | w/e | 27/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 67387 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | Boston | w/e | 19/11/1949 | ANN | m/e | 30/11/1949 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 67387 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | ANN | Annesley | m/e | 30/11/1949 | ANN | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 32F | Yarmouth Beach |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63631 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | CLK | Colwick | on | 04/12/1949 | ANN | w/e | 10/12/1949 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63721 | w/e | 25/09/1948 | CLK | Colwick | on | 04/12/1949 | ANN | w/e | 10/12/1949 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63631 | on | 04/12/1949 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 10/12/1949 | ANN | on | 16/07/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63721 | on | 04/12/1949 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 10/12/1949 | ANN | on | 22/10/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63580 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | CLK | Colwick | on | 18/12/1949 | ANN | w/e | 24/12/1949 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63674 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | CLK | Colwick | on | 18/12/1949 | ANN | w/e | 24/12/1949 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63787 | on | 19/09/1944 | CLK | Colwick | on | 18/12/1949 | ANN | w/e | 24/12/1949 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63580 | on | 18/12/1949 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 24/12/1949 | ANN | on | 26/11/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63674 | on | 18/12/1949 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 24/12/1949 | ANN | on | 28/09/1952 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63787 | on | 18/12/1949 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 24/12/1949 | ANN | on | 08/01/1950 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | 65494 | on | 01/01/1948 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 31/12/1949 | ANN | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63829 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | CLK | Colwick | on | 08/01/1950 | ANN | w/e | 14/01/1950 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63829 | on | 08/01/1950 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 14/01/1950 | ANN | on | 23/04/1950 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63805 | w/e | 11/12/1948 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | on | 05/02/1950 | 38B | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63575 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | CLK | Colwick | on | 05/02/1950 | 38B | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63713 | w/e | 05/02/1949 | CLK | Colwick | on | 05/02/1950 | 38B | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63805 | on | 05/02/1950 | 38B | Annesley | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 38B | on | 02/07/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63575 | on | 05/02/1950 | 38B | Annesley | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 38B | on | 16/07/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63713 | on | 05/02/1950 | 38B | Annesley | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 38B | on | 02/07/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63795 | on | 13/03/1944 | GOR | Gorton | on | 02/04/1950 | 38B | on | 17/02/1957 | 31B | March |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63687 | w/e | 13/03/1948 | GOR | Gorton | on | 23/04/1950 | 38B | on | 10/02/1957 | 31B | March |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63879 | on | 20/10/1946 | GOR | Gorton | on | 23/04/1950 | 38B | on | 10/02/1957 | 31B | March |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 60533 | on | 30/04/1950 | 35A | New England | on | 02/07/1950 | 38B | on | 09/07/1950 | 35A | New England |
Steam | J4 | 0-6-0 | 3646 | m/e | 03/1928 | Withdrawn | w/e | 02/07/1950 (R) | 38B | |||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63752 | w/e | 13/03/1948 | GOR | Gorton | on | 02/07/1950 | 38B | w/e | 17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63646 | on | 20/10/1946 | GOR | Gorton | on | 02/07/1950 | 38B | on | 24/02/1957 | 31B | March |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63868 | on | 20/10/1946 | GOR | Gorton | on | 02/07/1950 | 38B | on | 17/02/1957 | 31B | March |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63869 | on | 20/10/1946 | GOR | Gorton | on | 02/07/1950 | 38B | w/e | 17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63901 | on | 04/11/1945 | GOR | Gorton | on | 02/07/1950 | 38B | w/e | 17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63803 | on | 20/10/1946 | GOR | Gorton | on | 16/07/1950 | 38B | on | 17/02/1957 | 31B | March |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63578 | on | 21/10/1945 | GOR | Gorton | on | 16/07/1950 | 38B | w/e | 17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63689 | on | 20/10/1946 | GOR | Gorton | on | 16/07/1950 | 38B | w/e | 17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63808 | on | 20/10/1946 | GOR | Gorton | on | 16/07/1950 | 38B | w/e | 17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63863 | on | 20/10/1946 | GOR | Gorton | on | 16/07/1950 | 38B | on | 03/11/1957 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63573 | w/e | 01/01/1949 | CLK | Colwick | on | 17/09/1950 | 38B | on | 26/11/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63781 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | CLK | Colwick | on | 17/09/1950 | 38B | on | 26/11/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63859 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | on | 17/09/1950 | 38B | on | 26/11/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63761 | w/e | 28/01/1950 | CLK | Colwick | on | 08/10/1950 | 38B | on | 26/11/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63702 | on | 14/04/1946 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | on | 08/10/1950 | 38B | on | 26/11/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63787 | w/e | 14/01/1950 | CLX | on | 08/10/1950 | 38B | on | 26/11/1950 | 39A | Gorton | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63829 | on | 23/04/1950 | 38A | Colwick | on | 08/10/1950 | 38B | on | 26/11/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63851 | w/e | 14/01/1950 | CLX | on | 08/10/1950 | 38B | on | 28/09/1952 | 38A | Colwick | |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63777 | on | 03/11/1946 | GOR | Gorton | on | 20/10/1950 | 38B | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63780 | on | 20/10/1946 | GOR | Gorton | on | 20/10/1950 | 38B | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63796 | on | 20/10/1946 | GOR | Gorton | on | 22/10/1950 | 38B | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63886 | on | 04/08/1946 | GOR | Gorton | on | 22/10/1950 | 38B | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63786 | on | 06/12/1944 | GOR | Gorton | on | 27/10/1950 | 38B | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63777 | on | 20/10/1950 | 38B | Annesley | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 38B | w/e | 27/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63780 | on | 20/10/1950 | 38B | Annesley | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 38B | on | 10/02/1957 | 31B | March |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63786 | on | 27/10/1950 | 38B | Annesley | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 38B | on | 03/03/1957 | 31B | March |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63796 | on | 22/10/1950 | 38B | Annesley | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 38B | on | 17/02/1957 | 31B | March |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63886 | on | 22/10/1950 | 38B | Annesley | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 38B | w/e | 27/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63678 | on | 07/01/1945 | GOR | Gorton | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63711 | on | 15/10/1944 | GOR | Gorton | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63773 | w/e | 11/09/1948 | GOR | Gorton | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63789 | w/e | 28/08/1948 | GOR | Gorton | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63590 | on | 20/10/1946 | GOR | Gorton | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63591 | on | 25/06/1945 | GOR | Gorton | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63592 | on | 20/10/1946 | GOR | Gorton | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63619 | on | 01/04/1945 | GOR | Gorton | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63670 | on | 20/10/1946 | GOR | Gorton | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63630 | on | 20/10/1946 | GOR | Gorton | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63650 | on | 20/10/1946 | GOR | Gorton | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63652 | on | 20/10/1946 | GOR | Gorton | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63663 | on | 20/10/1946 | GOR | Gorton | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63768 | on | 20/10/1946 | GOR | Gorton | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63784 | on | 20/08/1944 | GOR | Gorton | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63817 | on | 20/10/1946 | GOR | Gorton | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63854 | on | 20/10/1946 | GOR | Gorton | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63865 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | GOR | Gorton | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63872 | w/e | 11/09/1948 | GOR | Gorton | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63887 | on | 20/10/1946 | GOR | Gorton | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63890 | on | 20/10/1946 | GOR | Gorton | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63725 | on | 20/10/1946 | GOR | Gorton | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63678 | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | on | 24/02/1957 | 31B | March |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63711 | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | w/e | 17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63773 | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | on | 24/02/1957 | 31B | March |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63789 | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | w/e | 17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63590 | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | on | 03/03/1957 | 31B | March |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63591 | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | w/e | 17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63592 | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | on | 03/11/1957 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63619 | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | on | 03/03/1957 | 31B | March |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63670 | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | on | 10/02/1957 | 31B | March |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63630 | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | on | 03/03/1957 | 31B | March |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63650 | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | on | 17/02/1957 | 31B | March |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63652 | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | on | 10/02/1957 | 31B | March |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63663 | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | on | 24/02/1957 | 31B | March |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63768 | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | on | 03/11/1957 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63784 | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | on | 26/05/1957 | 31B | March |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63817 | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | w/e | 17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63854 | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | w/e | 17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63865 | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | w/e | 17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63872 | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | on | 26/05/1957 | 31B | March |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63887 | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | on | 14/04/1957 | 31B | March |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63890 | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | on | 14/04/1957 | 31B | March |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63725 | on | 26/11/1950 | 38B | Annesley | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38B | on | 15/07/1956 | 15A | Wellingborough |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90025 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | CLK | Colwick | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 38B | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90411 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | CLK | Colwick | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 38B | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90492 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 38B | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 38B | Annesley | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90025 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 38B | Annesley | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 38B | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 40B | Immingham |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90411 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 38B | Annesley | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 38B | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90492 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 38B | Annesley | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 38B | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 40B | Immingham |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90052 | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 53C | Hull Springhead | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 38B | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 40B | Immingham |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90001 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 38B | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 40B | Immingham |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63740 | on | 21/05/1950 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | on | 02/09/1951 | 38B | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63676 | on | 21/05/1950 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | on | 02/09/1951 | 38B | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63801 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | CLK | Colwick | on | 02/09/1951 | 38B | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63894 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | CLK | Colwick | on | 02/09/1951 | 38B | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63740 | on | 02/09/1951 | 38B | Annesley | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 38B | w/e | 17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63676 | on | 02/09/1951 | 38B | Annesley | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 38B | w/e | 24/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63801 | on | 02/09/1951 | 38B | Annesley | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 38B | on | 04/11/1951 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63894 | on | 02/09/1951 | 38B | Annesley | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 38B | on | 31/08/1952 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63618 | on | 08/10/1950 | 38A | Colwick | on | 30/09/1951 | 38B | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63699 | on | 08/10/1950 | 38A | Colwick | on | 30/09/1951 | 38B | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63618 | on | 30/09/1951 | 38B | Annesley | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 38B | on | 24/02/1952 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63699 | on | 30/09/1951 | 38B | Annesley | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 38B | on | 04/11/1951 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64406 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 38A | Colwick | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 38B | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 36B | Mexborough |
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 69691 | on | 01/01/1948 | HAT | Hatfield | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 38B | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 37A | Ardsley |
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 69695 | on | 01/01/1948 | HAT | Hatfield | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 38B | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 37A | Ardsley |
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 69651 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 38A | Colwick | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 38B | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 69651 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 38B | Annesley | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 38B | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 31A | Cambridge |
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 68825 | on | 01/01/1948 | HSY | Hornsey | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 38B | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 68834 | on | 01/01/1948 | HSY | Hornsey | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 38B | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 68851 | on | 01/01/1948 | HSY | Hornsey | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 38B | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 68883 | on | 01/01/1948 | HSY | Hornsey | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 38B | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 68825 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 38B | Annesley | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 38B | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 34B | Hornsey |
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 68834 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 38B | Annesley | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 38B | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 34B | Hornsey |
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 68851 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 38B | Annesley | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 38B | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 68883 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 38B | Annesley | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 38B | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 34B | Hornsey |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68927 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 34B | Hornsey | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 38B | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68975 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 34B | Hornsey | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 38B | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68976 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 34B | Hornsey | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 38B | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68896 | on | 01/01/1948 | ARD | Ardsley | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 38B | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68927 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 38B | Annesley | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 38B | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68975 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 38B | Annesley | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 38B | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 34B | Hornsey |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68976 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 38B | Annesley | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 38B | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 34E | New England |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68896 | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 38B | Annesley | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 38B | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 34E | New England |
Steam | C13 | 4-4-2T | 67408 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 38B | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68975 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 34B | Hornsey | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 38B | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 69257 | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 34E | Neasden | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 38B | 4w/e | 19/09/1953 | 34E | Neasden |
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 67363 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 30A | Stratford | 4w/e | 19/09/1953 | 38B | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 33B | Tilbury |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63751 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 38A | Colwick | on | 18/10/1953 | 38B | on | 27/12/1953 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 69692 | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 34A | Kings Cross | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 38B | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 30A | Stratford |
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 69689 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 34A | Kings Cross | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 38B | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 32D | Yarmouth South Town |
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 69692 | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 30A | Stratford | 6w/e | 25/12/1954 | 38B | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 31A | Cambridge |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61856 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 38A | Colwick | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 38B | w/e | 16/05/1959 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64317 | w/e | 17/04/1948 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 38B | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64324 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 38B | 4w/e | 09/11/1957 | 39A | Gorton | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64364 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 38B | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 38A | Colwick | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64386 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 38B | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 40B | Immingham | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63602 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 38A | Colwick | on | 22/01/1956 | 38B | on | 11/11/1956 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63639 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 38A | Colwick | on | 22/01/1956 | 38B | on | 17/06/1956 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63845 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 38A | Colwick | on | 22/01/1956 | 38B | on | 11/11/1956 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48678 | on | 01/01/1948 | 15A | Wellingborough | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 38B | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 15A | Wellingborough |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69809 | w/e | 17/12/1949 | CLK | Colwick | on | 07/10/1956 | 38B | on | 14/12/1958 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69825 | on | 05/01/1950 | CLK | Colwick | on | 14/10/1956 | 38B | on | 14/12/1958 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69818 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 38A | Colwick | on | 21/10/1956 | 38B | on | 16/12/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61975 | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 38A | Colwick | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 38B | w/e | 16/05/1959 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63725 | on | 15/07/1956 | 15A | Wellingborough | on | 16/12/1956 | 38B | on | 24/02/1957 | 31B | March |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92010 | on | 31/05/1954 | 31B | March (New) | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 38B | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 15A | Wellingborough |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92013 | on | 31/05/1954 | 31B | March (New) | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 38B | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 2F | Woodford Halse |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92014 | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 31B | March | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 38B | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92043 | on | 18/01/1955 | 31B | March (New) | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 38B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 16F | Burton |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61272 | on | 20/02/1955 | 38A | Colwick | on | 17/02/1957 | 38B | on | 26/01/1958 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92067 | on | 31/12/1955 | 36A | Doncaster (New) | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 38B | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 2D | Banbury |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92068 | on | 31/12/1955 | 36A | Doncaster (New) | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 38B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 16C | Derby |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92069 | on | 31/12/1955 | 36A | Doncaster (New) | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 38B | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92070 | on | 31/01/1956 | 36A | Doncaster (New) | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 38B | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92071 | on | 31/01/1956 | 36A | Doncaster (New) | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 38B | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92072 | on | 29/02/1956 | 36A | Doncaster (New) | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 38B | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92073 | on | 29/02/1956 | 36A | Doncaster (New) | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 38B | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 2D | Banbury |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92074 | on | 31/03/1956 | 36A | Doncaster (New) | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 38B | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 2D | Banbury |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92075 | on | 31/03/1956 | 36A | Doncaster (New) | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 38B | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 18A | Toton |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92076 | on | 31/03/1956 | 36A | Doncaster (New) | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 38B | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 16J | Rowsley |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92087 | on | 31/08/1956 | 36A | Doncaster (New) | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 38B | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 2D | Banbury |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92088 | on | 31/10/1956 | 36A | Doncaster (New) | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 38B | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 18A | Toton |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92089 | on | 30/09/1956 | 36A | Doncaster (New) | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 38B | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 15C | Leicester Midland |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92090 | on | 30/11/1956 | 36A | Doncaster (New) | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 38B | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92091 | on | 30/11/1956 | 36A | Doncaster (New) | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 38B | w/e | 31/07/1965 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92092 | on | 31/12/1956 | 36A | Doncaster (New) | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 38B | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92093 | on | 31/01/1957 | 36A | Doncaster (New) | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 38B | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92095 | on | 31/03/1957 (New) | 38B | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63579 | on | 24/02/1957 | 31B | March | on | 14/04/1957 | 38B | w/e | 24/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63796 | on | 17/02/1957 | 31B | March | on | 14/04/1957 | 38B | w/e | 27/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92094 | on | 28/02/1957 | 36A | Doncaster (New) | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 38B | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 18A | Toton |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92096 | on | 30/04/1957 (New) | 38B | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 16C | Derby | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64352 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 38B | 4w/e | 09/11/1957 | 38A | Colwick | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64359 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 38B | w/e | 25/04/1959 | 9G | Gorton | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64420 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 38A | Colwick | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 38B | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64439 | w/e | 08/05/1948 | IMM | Immingham | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 38B | w/e | 25/04/1959 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92011 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 35A | New England | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 38B | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92012 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 35A | New England | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 38B | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92030 | on | 07/11/1954 | 35A | New England (New) | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 38B | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 2D | Banbury |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92031 | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 35A | New England | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 38B | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 16G | Westhouses |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92032 | on | 17/11/1954 | 35A | New England (New) | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 38B | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92033 | on | 19/11/1954 | 35A | New England (New) | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 38B | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 2D | Banbury |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64375 | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 38B | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64739 | on | 30/03/1947 | CLK | Colwick | on | 03/11/1957 | 38B | w/e | 03/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64747 | on | 30/03/1947 | CLK | Colwick | on | 03/11/1957 | 38B | on | 28/08/1959 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64798 | on | 08/10/1950 | 38A | Colwick | on | 03/11/1957 | 38B | w/e | 15/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64955 | on | 30/03/1947 | CLK | Colwick | on | 03/11/1957 | 38B | on | 25/11/1960 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92154 | on | 31/10/1957 | 15A | Wellingborough (New) | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 16D | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 15A | Wellingborough |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69800 | on | 26/01/1958 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | on | 08/06/1958 | 16D | on | 15/06/1958 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48220 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19D | Heaton Mersey | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 16D | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48315 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19D | Heaton Mersey | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 16D | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92009 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 25/10/1958 | 16D | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92120 | on | 28/02/1957 | 18B | Westhouses (New) | w/e | 25/10/1958 | 16D | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 18B | Westhouses |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92081 | on | 31/05/1956 | 18A | Toton (New) | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 16D | w/e | 02/05/1959 | 18A | Toton |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47429 | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 35A | New England | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 16D | w/e | 04/04/1959 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47458 | 5w/e | 24/08/1957 | 35A | New England | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 16D | w/e | 04/04/1959 | 17B | Burton |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47638 | on | 01/01/1948 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 16D | w/e | 04/04/1959 | 17B | Burton |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42769 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 16A | Nottingham | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 16D | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 17B | Burton |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42784 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 16A | Nottingham | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 16D | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 17B | Burton |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42847 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 16D | w/e | 04/06/1960 | 17B | Burton |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42872 | w/e | 30/07/1949 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 16D | w/e | 30/07/1960 | 17B | Burton |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42897 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 16D | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 17B | Burton |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42339 | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 16A | Nottingham | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 16D | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42361 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16A | Nottingham | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 16D | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42636 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 14D | Neasden | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 16D | w/e | 17/01/1959 | 16A | Nottingham |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42333 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16A | Nottingham | w/e | 17/01/1959 | 16D | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92094 | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 18A | Toton | w/e | 02/05/1959 | 16D | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92013 | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 2F | Woodford Halse | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 16D | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 2D | Banbury |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3859 | on | 07/11/1959 (New) | 16D | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 16A | Nottingham | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3860 | on | 14/11/1959 (New) | 16D | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 16A | Nottingham | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41320 | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 19/12/1959 | 16D | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44932 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 16D | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 14A | Cricklewood East |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45116 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 16D | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 14A | Cricklewood East |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45223 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 16D | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 2F | Woodford Halse |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45234 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 16D | w/e | 02/02/1963 | 14A | Cricklewood East |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45450 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 16D | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41280 | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 14E | Bedford | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 16D | w/e | 14/04/1962 | 15A | Wellingborough |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3861 | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 2F | Woodford Halse | w/e | 16/04/1960 | 16D | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 16A | Nottingham |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45215 | w/e | 21/02/1959 | 14D | Neasden | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 16D | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45217 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 8E | Brunswick | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 16D | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45444 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 27F | Brunswick | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 16D | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 14A | Cricklewood East |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92083 | on | 31/05/1956 | 15A | Wellingborough (New) | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 16D | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 15A | Wellingborough |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92120 | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 15C | Leicester Midland | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 16D | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 15C | Leicester Midland |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92014 | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 14A | Cricklewood East | w/e | 07/10/1961 | 16D | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92052 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 18A | Toton | w/e | 07/10/1961 | 16D | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 17C | Rowsley |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92117 | on | 31/12/1956 | 18B | Westhouses (New) | w/e | 07/10/1961 | 16D | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 17C | Rowsley |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92129 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 14A | Cricklewood East | w/e | 07/10/1961 | 16D | w/e | 09/12/1961 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92057 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 14A | Cricklewood East | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 16D | w/e | 13/04/1963 | 18A | Toton |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41227 | w/e | 06/08/1960 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 16D | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 15A | Wellingborough |
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | D4089 | on | 08/03/1962 (New) | 16D | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84007 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 16D | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 15B | Wellingborough |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84027 | w/e | 27/01/1962 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 16D | on | 02/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84006 | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 14D | Neasden | w/e | 14/04/1962 | 16D | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 15B | Wellingborough |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3696 | on | 28/04/1959 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 16D | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 16A | Nottingham |
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 30925 | 7w/e | 23/08/1961 | 70D | Basingstoke | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 16D | on | 30/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44665 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 17F | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 16D | w/e | 23/10/1965 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70014 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 14D | Neasden | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 16D | w/e | 06/10/1962 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70015 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 14D | Neasden | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 16D | w/e | 06/10/1962 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70048 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 14D | Neasden | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 16D | w/e | 06/10/1962 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70049 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 14D | Neasden | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 16D | w/e | 06/10/1962 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44717 | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 14B | Kentish Town | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 16D | w/e | 31/07/1965 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45267 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 14B | Kentish Town | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 16D | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 14A | Cricklewood East |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48002 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 16A | Nottingham | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 16D | w/e | 16/02/1963 | 2F | Woodford Halse |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48005 | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 15B | Kettering | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 16D | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 17C | Rowsley |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48011 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 16D | w/e | 03/08/1963 | 2F | Woodford Halse |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48024 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 16A | Nottingham | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 16D | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 16D | Nottingham |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48057 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 16D | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48064 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16A | Nottingham | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 16D | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 16C | Derby |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48079 | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 15B | Kettering | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 16D | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 16A | Toton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48099 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 16A | Nottingham | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 16D | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 10C | Fleetwood |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48117 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 14A | Cricklewood East | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 16D | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 16F | Burton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48141 | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 14A | Cricklewood East | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 16D | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 16A | Toton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48142 | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 14A | Cricklewood East | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 16D | w/e | 28/08/1965 | 16A | Toton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48168 | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 15B | Kettering | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 16D | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48220 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 16D | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48293 | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 15B | Kettering | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 16D | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48304 | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 14A | Cricklewood East | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 16D | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48324 | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 14A | Cricklewood East | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 16D | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 16G | Westhouses |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48333 | w/e | 03/02/1962 | 9F | Heaton Mersey | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 16D | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 8E | Northwich |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48378 | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 14A | Cricklewood East | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 16D | w/e | 07/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48615 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 18B | Westhouses | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 16D | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 8E | Northwich |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48700 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 16D | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 16F | Burton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48770 | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 14A | Cricklewood East | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 16D | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 26F | Patricroft |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46112 | w/e | 19/12/1959 | 16A | Nottingham | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 16D | on | 09/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46143 | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 16D | on | 21/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46153 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 16D | w/e | 22/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46158 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 16D | on | 19/10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48007 | w/e | 09/12/1961 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 16D | w/e | 16/02/1963 | 2F | Woodford Halse |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45626 | w/e | 18/11/1961 | 17B | Burton | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 16D | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 17B | Burton |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46126 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 16D | on | 05/10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46122 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 16D | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46101 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 16D | m/e | 09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46169 | w/e | 21/04/1962 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 16D | on | 25/05/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48167 | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 18A | Toton | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 16D | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46111 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 16D | on | 28/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46163 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 16D | on | 29/08/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44932 | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 14A | Cricklewood East | w/e | 02/02/1963 | 16D | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92082 | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 16D | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92083 | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 16D | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 15A | Wellingborough |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44846 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 2F | Woodford Halse | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 16D | w/e | 31/07/1965 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45234 | w/e | 02/02/1963 | 14A | Cricklewood East | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 16D | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48678 | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 14A | Cricklewood East | w/e | 13/04/1963 | 16D | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 16G | Westhouses |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48037 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 26F | Patricroft | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 16D | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 16A | Toton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48166 | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 8E | Northwich | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 16D | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48727 | w/e | 16/03/1963 | 8E | Northwich | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 16D | w/e | 27/07/1963 | 2F | Woodford Halse |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45334 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 16D | m/e | 07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92088 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 18A | Toton | w/e | 17/08/1963 | 16D | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 16A | Toton |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46114 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 16B | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46125 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 16B | on | 03/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46167 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 16B | on | 11/04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92075 | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 18A | Toton | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 16B | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45735 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 16B | on | 03/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45529 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 16B | on | 22/02/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46156 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 16B | on | 10/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92109 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 15C | Leicester Midland | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 16B | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 15A | Leicester Midland |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92154 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 16B | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46165 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 22/02/1964 | 16B | w/e | 21/11/1964 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92132 | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 15C | Kettering | w/e | 29/02/1964 | 16B | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 2D | Banbury |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42618 | on | 13/11/1961 | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | on | 12/03/1964 | 16B | on | 22/03/1964 | 55H | Neville Hill |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92025 | w/e | 18/01/1964 | 15C | Kettering | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 16B | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92027 | w/e | 18/01/1964 | 15C | Kettering | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 16B | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44847 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 16B | w/e | 23/10/1965 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44848 | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 16B | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44984 | w/e | 01/02/1964 | 15D | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 16B | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 16A | Toton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45342 | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 16B | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45416 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 16B | w/e | 10/07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45301 | w/e | 16/05/1964 | 16D | Nottingham | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 16B | w/e | 10/07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45346 | w/e | 16/05/1964 | 16D | Nottingham | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 16B | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45335 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 15A | Leicester Midland | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 16B | w/e | 10/07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44835 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 4A | Shrewsbury | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 16B | w/e | 23/10/1965 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45190 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4A | Shrewsbury | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 16B | w/e | 13/03/1965 | 16C | Derby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45406 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4A | Shrewsbury | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 16B | w/e | 23/10/1965 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45289 | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 15A | Leicester Midland | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 16B | w/e | 13/03/1965 | 16C | Derby |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92113 | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 16A | Toton | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 16B | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 16G | Westhouses |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45267 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 15C | Leicester Midland | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 16B | w/e | 13/03/1965 | 16C | Derby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45333 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 15C | Leicester Midland | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 16B | w/e | 23/10/1965 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48363 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 18A | Toton | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 16B | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48661 | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 18A | Toton | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 16B | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 16G | Westhouses |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92083 | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 15A | Leicester Midland | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 16B | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48024 | w/e | 27/03/1965 | 15A | Leicester Midland | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 16B | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48053 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 16B | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48356 | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 15B | Wellingborough | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 16B | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44932 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 10F | Rose Grove | w/e | 17/07/1965 | 16B | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 16C | Derby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45267 | w/e | 13/03/1965 | 16C | Derby | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 16B | w/e | 18/12/1965 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45190 | w/e | 13/03/1965 | 16C | Derby | w/e | 14/08/1965 | 16B | w/e | 23/10/1965 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield |